Voellinger v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Harold M. Voellinger
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc., Donald J. Smith and Dennis Leatherby
Movant: Employees' Retirement System of the State of Hawaii and Blue Sky
Case Number: 5:2016cv05340
Filed: November 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Timothy L. Brooks
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 54 Motion for Leave To Amend Consolidated Complaint. Further Ordered that Consolidated Complaint Doc. 43 is now Dismissed With Prejudice. NOTE: Page 29 has been replaced to correct scrivener's error. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 31, 2018. (Brooks, Timothy) Modified on 4/2/2018 (slc). Modified on 4/2/2018 to correct text(rg).
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting 47 Motion to Dismiss and Dismissing Case Without Prejudice. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 26, 2017. Associated Cases: 5:16-cv-05340-TLB, 5:16-cv-05354-TLB, 5:16-cv-05362-TLB, 5:16-cv-05371-TLB(src)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 OPINION AND ORDER granting 14 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Hawaii ERS and Blue Sky are appointed as lead Plaintiffs; and Hawaii ERS's and Blue Sky's choice of Bernstein Litowitz as lead counsel is approved. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 25, 2017. (src)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Voellinger v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold M. Voellinger
Represented By: James Allen Carney
Represented By: Danielle Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Smith
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Leatherby
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Employees' Retirement System of the State of Hawaii
Represented By: Amy C. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Blue Sky
Represented By: Amy C. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?