Fayetteville Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC. et al v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC.et al
Plaintiff: Fayetteville Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC., MCSA, L.L.C., Phillips Hospital Company, LLC, Advanced Care Hospital of White County, North Arkansas Medical System, Baptist Memorial Hospital-Jonesboro, Inc, White County Medical Center, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, White River Health System Inc. and Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC,
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC., Ortho-Mcneil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, Anda, Inc., Actavis Kadian LLC, Tasmanian Alkaloids PTY. LDC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Actavis Totowa LLC, Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Henry Schein, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Abbott Laboratories, SPECGX, LLC, Noramco, Inc,, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Arkansas CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Abbvie, Inc., Impax Laboratories, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York LLC, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Doe 1-100, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Elizabeth LLC., Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Actavis MID Atlantic LLC, Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Kroger Limited Partnership I, Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Smith Drug Company, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, H.D. Smith, LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Allergan Finance, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Kroger Co., The, KVK-TECH, Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Kroger Limited Partnership II, Allergan USA, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc., Watson Pharma Inc. and H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Case Number: 5:2020cv05036
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 47 CLERK'S ORDER Dismissing Parties: re #46 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party, filed by Arkansas CVS Pharmacy, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS Health Corporation; Party CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Arkansas CVS Pharmacy, LLC and CVS Health Corporation dismissed without prejudice. (tg)
April 2, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party, CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Arkansas CVS Pharmacy, LLC, by Arkansas CVS Pharmacy, LLC, CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Plaintiffs' and CVS Defendants' agreed notice of voluntary dismissal. (Watson, Brett)
March 25, 2020 Filing 45 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting in part and denying in part #44 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for responsive pleading for all Defendants in this matter will be 30 days after this Court enters its ruling on the pending motion to remand and motion to stay. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 25, 2020. (elg)
March 24, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Abbvie, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Henry, Robert)
March 13, 2020 Filing 43 RESPONSE by Advanced Care Hospital of White County, Baptist Memorial Hospital-Jonesboro, Inc, Fayetteville Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC., Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, MCSA, L.L.C., North Arkansas Medical System, Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC,, Phillips Hospital Company, LLC, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, White County Medical Center, White River Health System Inc. re #36 MOTION to Stay . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Thrash, Thomas)
March 13, 2020 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION for Leave to filed by Fayetteville Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC.. (Shemin, Kenneth)
March 12, 2020 Filing 41 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #40 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Plaintiffs are directed to file the Reply brief no later than March 13, 2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 12, 2020. (elg)
March 11, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to by Fayetteville Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Shemin, Kenneth)
March 10, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Powers on behalf of Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Powers, Scott)
March 10, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by David Todd Arlington on behalf of Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Arlington, David)
March 10, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Sadler on behalf of Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Sadler, Kevin)
March 9, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION to Stay by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-13)(Clark, William)
March 9, 2020 Filing 35 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #17 Emergency MOTION to Remand filed by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 12-18-19 Transfer Order in the MDL, #2 Exhibit B - JPML Dkt. No. 7214, #3 Exhibit C - Other Cases, #4 Exhibit D - Drew Mem Hsptl v. Purdue Pharma--Docket Sheet)(Henry, Robert)
March 7, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett D. Watson on behalf of Arkansas CVS Pharmacy, LLC, CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Watson, Brett)
March 4, 2020 Filing 33 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. SCOTT DANIEL POWERS is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 4, 2020. (slc)
March 4, 2020 Filing 32 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. KEVIN MARSHALL SADLER is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 4, 2020. (slc)
March 4, 2020 Filing 31 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. DAVID T. ARLINGTON is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 4, 2020. (slc)
March 3, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Attorney Scott Daniel Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2092472) by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mullally, Michael)
March 3, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Attorney Kevin Marshall Sadler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2092452) by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mullally, Michael)
March 3, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Attorney David T. Arlington to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2092414) by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mullally, Michael)
February 28, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirkman T. Dougherty on behalf of Kroger Co., The, Kroger Limited Partnership I, Kroger Limited Partnership II. (Dougherty, Kirkman)
February 27, 2020 Filing 26 TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court granted the relief sought as to all Defendants at docket entry 21 . The deadline for responsive pleading is extended to April 23, 2020 for all Defendants. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 27, 2020. (elg)
February 27, 2020 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Smith Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Rollin, Michael)
February 27, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Smith Drug Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rollin, Michael)
February 27, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Don Allen Taylor on behalf of Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Taylor, Don)
February 27, 2020 Filing 22 TEXT ONLY ORDER directing that any response to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Remand #17 be filed no later than March 9, 2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 27, 2020. (elg)
February 27, 2020 Filing 21 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 and #19 Motions for Extension of Time to Answer as to all Defendants to allow for the resolution of issues related to remand or transfer. The deadline for responsive pleading is extended to April 23, 2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 27, 2020. (elg) Modified on 2/27/2020 (src).
February 27, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by William Fitzgerald Clark on behalf of Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Clark, William)
February 27, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint by H.D. Smith, LLC. (Clark, Suzanne)
February 26, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #17 Emergency MOTION to Remand by Advanced Care Hospital of White County, Baptist Memorial Hospital-Jonesboro, Inc, Fayetteville Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC., Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, MCSA, L.L.C., North Arkansas Medical System, Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC,, Phillips Hospital Company, LLC, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, White County Medical Center, White River Health System Inc.. (Thrash, Thomas)
February 26, 2020 Filing 17 Emergency MOTION to Remand by Advanced Care Hospital of White County, Baptist Memorial Hospital-Jonesboro, Inc, Fayetteville Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC., Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, MCSA, L.L.C., North Arkansas Medical System, Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC,, Phillips Hospital Company, LLC, Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC, White County Medical Center, White River Health System Inc.. (Thrash, Thomas)
February 26, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Simpson on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-Mcneil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Simpson, James)
February 26, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David Matthews on behalf of Henry Schein, Inc. (Matthews, David) Modified on 2/27/2020 to edit text (tg).
February 26, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Mullally on behalf of Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Mullally, Michael)
February 25, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin A. Kasten on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-Mcneil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Kasten, Martin)
February 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant E. Fortson on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Fortson, Grant)
February 25, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Tom Donaldson on behalf of Mallinckrodt, LLC, SPECGX, LLC. (Donaldson, Tom)
February 25, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Abbvie, Inc.. (Hurst, Harry)
February 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Harry S Hurst, Jr on behalf of Abbvie, Inc.. (Hurst, Harry)
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne G. Clark on behalf of H.D. Smith, LLC. (Clark, Suzanne)
February 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Donovan on behalf of Actavis Elizabeth LLC., Actavis Kadian LLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis MID Atlantic LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Donovan, David)
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (src)
February 24, 2020 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2086042.. (Henry, Robert)
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jess L. Askew, III on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.. (Askew, Jess)
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew King on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.. (King, Andrew)
February 24, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE: The following attorneys listed on Notice of Removal, #1 are not registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas:John A. Freedman, Kevin M. Sadler, Scott D. Powers, David Arlington, Ronda L. Harvey, Fazal A. Shere, Unaiza R. Tyree, Charles C. Lifland, John A. McCauley, Nancy L. Patterson, John P. McDonald, Brandan Montminy, Donna Welch, Martin L. Roth, Timothy Knapp, Jennifer G. Levy, Rocky Tsai, Kia Grant-Smith, Thomas E. Rice, Conor B. OCroinin, Daniel G. Jarcho, Cari K. Dawson, Jenny A. Hergenrother, Jason R. Fulmer, James W. Matthews, Ana M. Francisco, Katy E. Koski,John J. Haggerty,Paul J. Cosgrove, Jeffrey D. Geoppinger . An attorney can register through PACER for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to our website http://www.arwd.uscourts.gov/attorney-information for further information. (src)
February 24, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. Notice of Removal, #1 lists multiple attorneys. The following attorneys, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: James Simpson, Martin Kasten, Michael Mullally, Jess Askew, Andrew King, Tom Donaldson, Suzanne Clark, David Matthews, Grant Fortson, William Clark, Kirkman T. Dougherty, Don Taylor, and David Donovan. (src) Modified on 2/24/2020 (src).
February 24, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 2/26/2020 (src)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT (filed in state court) with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by all Plaintiffs.(src)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (src)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Washington County, AR, case number 72cv-20-00156., filed by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-1 Summons, #4 Exhibit B-2 Motions and Orders, #5 Exhibit B-3 Mallinckordt Doc, #6 Exhibit B-4 Threet Letter, #7 Exhibit B-5 Entry of Appearance, #8 Exhibit B-6 Entry of Appearance)(src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fayetteville Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC. et al v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC.et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fayetteville Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC.
Represented By: Kenneth R Shemin
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCSA, L.L.C.
Represented By: Kenneth R Shemin
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillips Hospital Company, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth R Shemin
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Care Hospital of White County
Represented By: Kenneth R Shemin
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Arkansas Medical System
Represented By: Kenneth R Shemin
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baptist Memorial Hospital-Jonesboro, Inc
Represented By: Kenneth R Shemin
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White County Medical Center
Represented By: Kenneth R Shemin
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siloam Springs Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth R Shemin
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forrest City Arkansas Hospital Company, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth R Shemin
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White River Health System Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth R Shemin
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC,
Represented By: Kenneth R Shemin
Represented By: Thomas P. Thrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Represented By: Martin A. Kasten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Represented By: Martin A. Kasten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Represented By: Tom Donaldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasmanian Alkaloids PTY. LDC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa LLC
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
Represented By: William Fitzgerald Clark
Represented By: Don Allen Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein, Inc.
Represented By: David R. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECGX, LLC
Represented By: Tom Donaldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Brett D. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbvie, Inc.
Represented By: Harry S Hurst, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC.
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis MID Atlantic LLC
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Powers
Represented By: Michael E. Mullally
Represented By: David Todd Arlington
Represented By: Kevin M. Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L Henry, III
Represented By: J. Carter Fairley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: William Fitzgerald Clark
Represented By: Don Allen Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company
Represented By: Michael A. Rollin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: William Fitzgerald Clark
Represented By: Don Allen Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Represented By: Martin A. Kasten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC
Represented By: Suzanne G. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Grant E. Fortson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Represented By: Martin A. Kasten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Co., The
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-TECH, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Represented By: Martin A. Kasten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership II
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Brett D. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Brett D. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Jess L. Askew, III
Represented By: Andrew King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc.
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Represented By: Suzanne G. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?