Lloyd's, London, Certain Underwriters at v. Chastain et al
Plaintiff: Lloyd's, London, Certain Underwriters at
Defendant: Edward J. Byrnes, Adams Trust UAD September 8, 2004, The, Charles Fair, Diane Adams Mann, Chastain Financial Services, LLC, Carla Chastain, Steve Chastain and Kendra Kilker
Case Number: 5:2020cv05130
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint, by Adams Trust UAD September 8, 2004, The, Charles Fair, Kendra Kilker, Diane Adams Mann.(Tarvin, Andrew)
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #2 Complaint against Lloyd's, London, Certain Underwriters at , filed by Lloyd's, London, Certain Underwriters at. Related document: #2 Complaint filed by Lloyd's, London, Certain Underwriters at. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Hall, Ben)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 10/27/2020 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/13/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 2, 2020. (slc)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Samuel Tarvin on behalf of Adams Trust UAD September 8, 2004, The, Charles Fair, Kendra Kilker, Diane Adams Mann. (Tarvin, Andrew)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Adams Trust UAD September 8, 2004, The, Charles Fair, Kendra Kilker, Diane Adams Mann.(Unser, Kyle)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle T. Unser on behalf of Adams Trust UAD September 8, 2004, The, Charles Fair, Kendra Kilker, Diane Adams Mann. (Unser, Kyle)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Carla Chastain and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd) (tg).
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Carla Chastain for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Hall, Ben)
July 29, 2020 Complaint filing fee paid re #2 Complaint : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2188312.. (Hall, Ben)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg)
July 29, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 7/31/2020 (tg)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Lloyd's, London, Certain Underwriters at, filed by Lloyd's, London, Certain Underwriters at. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Hall, Ben)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Lloyd's, London, Certain Underwriters at. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lloyd's, London, Certain Underwriters at v. Chastain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward J. Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams Trust UAD September 8, 2004, The
Represented By: Andrew Samuel Tarvin
Represented By: Kyle T. Unser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Fair
Represented By: Andrew Samuel Tarvin
Represented By: Kyle T. Unser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Adams Mann
Represented By: Andrew Samuel Tarvin
Represented By: Kyle T. Unser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chastain Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Chastain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Chastain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendra Kilker
Represented By: Andrew Samuel Tarvin
Represented By: Kyle T. Unser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd's, London, Certain Underwriters at
Represented By: Ben C. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?