Gilleland v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Randy Gilleland
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and NCR Corporation
Case Number: 5:2021cv05188
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATED RECORD SCHEDULING ORDER setting deadlines as set forth: Stipulated Record is due by 1/14/2022. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on November 22, 2021. (jas)
November 22, 2021 Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. James M. Brodzik is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on November 22, 2021. (jas)
November 22, 2021 Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Daniel K. Ryan is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on November 22, 2021. (jas)
November 19, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NCR Corporation. (Williams, A.)
November 19, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by NCR Corporation.(Williams, A.)
November 18, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Williams, A.)
November 18, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney James M. Brodzik to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2498914) by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, NCR Corporation. (Williams, A.)
November 18, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2498899) by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, NCR Corporation. (Williams, A.)
November 18, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Williams, A.)
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Gene Williams on behalf of All Defendants. (Williams, A.)
November 2, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Randy Gilleland. NCR Corporation served on 10/29/2021, answer due 11/19/2021. (Lacy, Brandon)
November 2, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Randy Gilleland. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company served on 10/28/2021, answer due 11/18/2021. (Lacy, Brandon)
October 19, 2021 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, NCR Corporation and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
October 19, 2021 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and NCR Corporation for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Lacy, Brandon)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, NCR Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2479520), filed by Randy Gilleland.(Lacy, Brandon)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Randy Gilleland. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilleland v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Gilleland
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: A. Gene Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCR Corporation
Represented By: A. Gene Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?