Shirley Flores et al v. First Transit Inc et al
Plaintiff: Lori A Sprinkle, Wesley E Stanley, William R Stein, James T Stephens, Roy L Stephens, Jr, Jerry Stewart, Kenneth Stewart, Lupita Stewart, William J Stewart, Adale Stovall, Henry W Straughter, Steven Stremel, Kwame J Sturghall, Robin F Sudduth, Major Sullivan, Tadevos T Tadevossian, Gonzalo Tajada, Larry C Tanks, Zena Tanksley, Joseph Tanquilut, Carolyn Tatum, Barbara A Taylor, Lawrence T Taylor, Lolita Taylor, David Teal, Haik Ter-Panosyan, Faye J Terrill, David Theimer, Mindette R Thomann, Ashaki S Thomas, Channae M Thomas, Daena Thomas, Gwendolyn R Thomas, Kathaleen M Thomas, Roderick L Thomas, Sheryl N Thomer, Andrew E Thompson, Linda L Thompson, Rona J Thompson, Dale S Thornbrugh, Johnny Thornton, Stephen C Tichgelaar, Toby W Tilcock, Adrianna I Tinoco, Melinda Tinoco, Tatua R Togiola, Larry Torres, Sr, Ronald S Torrez, Amparo Tovar, Sarah M Tovar, Paul B Tovmassian, Ricardo Townsend, Greg P Tramell, Phuc Tran, Gustavo Adolfo Trejo, Jean S Trezile, George Tricas, Tuong C Trieu, Daniel N Trujillo, Regina D Tucker, Ladell A Turner, Athena M Turrey, Isadora L Tuufuli, Carolyn L Ua, Mary Ukattah, Thomas A Ullberg, Song Uong, Joanna L Uribe, Marta E Vaca, Raul Valdez, Rodolfo Valenzuela, Patricia G Van Saun, Kevin M Vaney, Russell V Vanzanten, Zhorzhik Vardanyan, Hugo Vargas, Angel G Vasquez, Gilberto Vasquez, Haroldo Vasquez, Leticia Vasquez-Juarez, Rogelio Vega, Carlos Velasquez, Isabel Velasquez, Frances Velez, Frank Venegas, Ernest M Verano, Refugio Verdizcp, Cynthia Verduzco, Regino Verduzco, Albert S Vienop, Hipolito Villalobos, John L Villanueva, Ngoc V Vo, Ken Voong, Steven Voong, John G Vromans, Bernice D Walker, Jerome L Walker, Richard L Walker, Ulyess Walker, Kerry W Walls, Daryl G Walton, Samuel Walton, III, Toraine Lynette Ward, Valerie Wardle, Khadija Z Washington, Dawn R Waters, Bettye Watkins, Rhonda V Watkins, Latanya Watson, Thomas C Watts, Andre L Webb, Sharon B Webb-Swim, William H Weber, Stacey M Welch, John Whitall, Franklin D White, Richard E White, Russill J White, William E White, Janette A Whited, Vivian P Whitehead, James E Whiteside, Postrina Whitfield, Sade K Wilburn, Christopher Wiley, Jonnie Wilkinson, Alisande G Williams, Brenda F Williams, Helen C Williams, Isaac D Williams, Kelly A Williams, Pamela D Williams, Pamela E Williams, Richard C Williams, Sybil Williams, Thomas Williams, Kimeyatta Williams-Ayitevie, Rick Willis, Bruce A Wilson, Gregory C Wilson, Jimanette L Wilson, Karen A Wilson, Nishia N Wilson, Phillip Wilson, III, Carl A Winters, Robert C Wisdom, Marilyn J Wolk, Jenny Wong, Margaret C Wong, Wilbur Wong, Ronald R Woodard, Levi R Woods, Timothy Woods, David L Wyatt, Sr, Parsya K Younan, Arbanah Young, Ervin R Young, Yvette Youngblood, Kirby Yu-Chih, Riaz Zaboori, Shariff Zamani, Dolores C Zambada, Edmundo A Zamudio, Neil Zepeda and Luis Zuniga
Case Number: 2:2012cv03309
Filed: April 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary A Feess
Referring Judge: Jay C Gandhi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Gary A. Feess: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Initiative Lega Group's Request for Court-Ordered Dismissal Without Prejudice is GRANTED. This case is herby dismissed without prejudice #25 (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (bp)
December 27, 2012 Filing 25 REQUEST to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Shirley Flores. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Request for Court-Ordered Dismissal Without Prejudice)(Balderrama, Monica)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: ILG'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR COURT AUTHORIZATION TO INFORM NAMED PLAINTIFFS AND CLIENTS OF DISMISSAL; SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED NOTICE TO PERSONS WHO WERE MAILED LETTERS IN JANUARY OF 2012 FROM INITIATIVE LEGAL GROUP by Judge Gary A. Feess denying #22 Ex Parte Application for Leave: Accordingly, ILG's ex parte application is DENIED. ILG is ORDERED to mail the notice prepared by the Court to the persons improperly solicited for the Flores action by Friday, January 4, 2013. (see document for further details) (bm)
December 4, 2012 Filing 23 OPPOSITION opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to Inform Named Plaintiffs and Clients of Dismissal Before Dismissing Their Case and Terminating Representation #22 First Transit Inc.'s Opposition to ILG's Ex Parte Application for Court Authorization to Inform Named Plaintiffs and Clients of Dismissal Before Dismissing Their Case and Terminating Representation filed by Defendant First Transit Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of David J. Dow)(Dow, David)
December 3, 2012 Filing 22 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to Inform Named Plaintiffs and Clients of Dismissal Before Dismissing Their Case and Terminating Representation filed by Plaintiff Shirley Flores. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Monica Balderrama, #3 Proposed Order re Ex Parte Application, #4 Proof of Service)(Balderrama, Monica)
October 30, 2012 Filing 21 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Gary A. Feess. The Court VACATES the Scheduling Conference in this matter set for January 28, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 29, 2012 Filing 20 REQUEST for Consideration of Request for Clarification Re Order Regarding Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference and Joint Report filed by Defendant First Transit Inc. (Dow, David)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REGARDING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND JOINT REPORT by Judge Gary A. Feess. Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2013 at 1:30 PM before Judge Gary A. Feess. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (rfi)
August 10, 2012 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Joshua D Levine counsel for Defendants First Transit Inc, First Transit Transportation LLC, FirstGroup America Inc. Filed by Defendants First Transit, Inc.; First Transit Transporation LLC; FirstGroup America, Inc. (Levine, Joshua)
August 10, 2012 Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Theodore R Scott counsel for Defendants First Transit Inc, First Transit Transportation LLC, FirstGroup America Inc. Filed by Defendants First Transit, Inc.; First Transit Transportation LLC; FirstGroup America, Inc. (Scott, Theodore)
August 7, 2012 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shirley Flores, upon Defendant First Transit Transportation LLC served on 8/1/2012, answer due 8/22/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Scott Lascala - Agent for Service of Process for First Transit Transportation LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Balderrama, Monica)
August 3, 2012 Filing 14 NOTICE Notice of Pendency of Other Actions filed by Defendants First Transit Inc, First Transit Transportation LLC, FirstGroup America Inc. (Dow, David)
August 3, 2012 Filing 13 Defendants' NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants First Transit Inc, First Transit Transportation LLC, FirstGroup America Inc, identifying First Transit, Inc.; First Transit Transportation LLC; FirstGroup America, Inc.; FirstGroup America Holdings, Inc.; Laidlaw Transportation, Inc.; FirstGroup International, Inc.; FirstGroup America, Inc.; FirstGroup PLC. (Dow, David)
August 3, 2012 Filing 12 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants First Transit Inc, First Transit Transportation LLC, FirstGroup America Inc. Notice of Related Cases Related Case(s): CV 07-06476 GAF (JCGx) (Dow, David)
August 3, 2012 Filing 11 ANSWER to Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 Defendants' Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants First Transit Inc, First Transit Transportation LLC, FirstGroup America Inc.(Dow, David)
July 24, 2012 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shirley Flores, upon Defendant FirstGroup America Inc served on 7/13/2012, answer due 8/3/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Margaret Wilson, Process Clerk, Agent for Service of Summons in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Balderrama, Monica)
July 24, 2012 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shirley Flores, upon Defendant First Transit Inc served on 7/13/2012, answer due 8/3/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Margaret Wilson, Process Clerk, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Balderrama, Monica)
July 11, 2012 Filing 18 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiffs George Fisher, Floyd L Flagg, Sr, Robert C Flippin, Cesar Flores, Hugo Flores, Jesus Flores, Ruben Flores, Shirley Flores, Gary L Followell, Michael R Fontanilla, Lora Ford, Susette M Ford, Rocky Fordyce, Pierre Fort, Linda J Forte-Robinson, John C Fortson, Bradford S Fox, John Fox, Allen Gene Francis, Salnaze Francois, Diane Freeman, Raymond J Freeman, Elisabet Fregoso, Mtichell A Friend, Monica Fuentes, Paula R Fulkerson, Yvette D Gaddis, Kimberly E Gaines, Ramiro A Galeano, Emerson G Galicia, Audrey Gallegos, Ramiro T Gallegos, Pascal R Gallo, Cedric O Galloway, Mary Galvez, William F Galvez, Shawndee M Gantt, Daniel R Garcia, David W Garcia, Jennifer C Garcia, Juan A Garcia, Kessler D Garcia, Michael H Garcia, Monica V Garcia, Olivia Garcia, Sylvia E Garcia, Kimberly Gardner, Oliver T Garispe, Tracey Garland, Lawrence G Garrett, Edgar O Garza, Russell Garza, Alberto Gastelum, Richard B Gaudette, Don R Gauss, Rudy Gaviola, Pedro L Gazca, Robby A Gentle, Robert B George, Jr, Nora C Gil, Mark A Gill, Debroah Gillard, Michelle Renee Glasper, Verlton B Glaspie, Cheryl Goddard, Virginia Godinez, Eddie Roy Golden, Art R Gomez, Joanna E Gomez, Jorge S Gomez, Jose A Gomez, Santiago Gomez, Daniel S Gonzales, Daniel Gonzales, Isaac A Gonzales, Sandra Gonzales, Agustin R Gonzalez, Henry A Gonzalez, Ibrahim Gonzalez, Jorge Gonzalez, Jose D Gonzalez, Luz Gonzalez, Maria E Gonzalez, Rufino Gonzalez, Victor H Gonzalez, Victor Gonzalez, Omar A Gonzalez-Mata, Patricia A Goodlett, Mario D Goodman, Gregory J Gordon, Michael T Grace, Brenton M Graham, Alfred J Grandy, Christopher A Grant, Gwendolyn Gray, D Nesha Grayes, Cynthia Greeley, Antoinette E Green, Brian L Green, Lenn M Green, Sherman Green, Marilyn R Greeno, Ruth C Greer, David J Gregory, Stephanie Gregory, Georgina Gregory, Andrea Griffin, Jacqueline Griffin, Kenneth H Griffin, Sharon Cook Groff, Maria T Groschup-Black, Cyndy P Groves, Oscar Gudiel, Andrea Guerrero, Danny P Guerrero, Imelda Guerrero, Johnny Guerrero, Stephen F Gularte, Cynthia Gullatt, Bernard Gunatilake, Flor D Gutierrez, Francisco Gutierrez, Juan Gutierrez, Araceli Guzman, Salvador Guzman, Yvette Hale, Paula K Hall, William Hall, Jr, Tim M Halloran, Domonique R Hamilton, Regina M Hamilton, Margaret Hammond, Sheila K Handy, Ashley C Harbin, Deborah F Hardson, Sherman L Hardy, Brian R Harkness, Keimata C Harris, Tom G Harrison, Lisa D Hart, Brian D Hartje, Jerry Harvell, Kenneth W Harvey, Laurita L Harvey, Lorraine Harvey, Henry Hawkins, John G Hay, Deborah Hayes, Melvin J Hayes, Debra J Haynes, Gary L Heckler, Ronald S Henderson, Sr, Stephanie Henderson, Lourdes Hendra, Fredrick Henry, Billy B Heredia, Cristian Hernandez, Elio Hernandez, Henry Hernandez, Jessica Hernandez, Octavio Hernandez, Pamela R Hernandez, Roberto Hernandez, Santos E Hernandez, Debbie Herrera, Miguel Herrera, Eunice R Herring, Ramona Hicks, Elizabeth Hidalgo, Daniell G Hill, Donald R Hill, Kenneth E Hill, Kevin Hill, Leroy R Hill, Kent G Hines, Laverne A Hines, N Chon E Hines, Mitchell B Hinkle, Rahsaan Hinton, Andrew R Hirsch, Aaron K Hoban, Maria Hoeflich, Lara G Holguer, Carmen Holguin, Kristal Holley, Andrew Hollinquest, William C Hooks, Brian S Hopson, Duane J Horka, Shawntay D Horsley, Raymond L House, Timothy A House, Lorilee A Houston, Daniel Howard, Rose A Howard, Stephen D Howard, Kenneth C Howayeck, David M Hubbard, Sheretta Hubbard, Joseph A Hudson, Warren A Hudson, Jr, Andy Huerta, Jose R Huezo, Carlotta Huff, Penny A Huff, James Hughes, Efren Humaran Nahed, Krasaundra Hunter, Lelisa Hunter, Minnie P Hunter, Ricole Hunter, Charles G Hurst, Jesus Hurtado, Mohamed Hussein, Tuiono Ilaisanne, John H Ingram, Kenneth F Iriarte, Shannon Raymond Iverson, Nnemarsha Jack, Debra Jacks, Cherise Jackson, Glenda D Jackson, Gwendolyn Jackson, Jonathan Jackson, Leonard A Jackson, Malinda Jackson, Wanjuku K Jackson, Yvonne F Jackson, Warren Jacquet, Christopher Jaimez, Cecil H James, Farley James, Myiesha O James, Yolanda James, Darcell R Jefferson, David R Jeffries, Kenneth Jeffries, Regina G Jeuitt, Carlos Jimenez, Gabriel Jimenez, Irma Jimenez, Jennifer Jimenez, Leticia Jimenez, Paul Jimenez, Jose D Jimenez-Sanchez, Duran Joaquin, Robert T Joaquin, Carla Johnson, Earl M Johnson, Evelyn S Johnson, Herman Johnson, Jamal C Johnson, Jimmy L Johnson, Kim Y Johnson, LaVoyce M Johnson, Lance M Johnson, Michael C Johnson, Ricky L Johnson, Robert Johnson, Rochelle T Johnson, Rodney S Johnson, Romondo K Johnson, Tina Yvonne Johnson, Wesley Johnson, Yolanda P Johnson, Zakiya A Johnson, Leroy Joiner, Andrea J Jones, Anthony E Jones, Cardan Jovon Jones, Gloria F Jones, Jemimah J Jones, Johnny L Jones, Jr, Joyce J Jones, Kenya N Jones, Larry Jones, Mary Jones, Michael J Jones, Reunald C Jones, IV, Zelena Jones, Pamela Jordan, Regina M Jordan, Roosevelt Jordan, Sabrina G Jordan, Paul D Joseph, Linda Juarez, Ricardo Juarez, Matthew L Kafkaloff, Desiree S Kahapea-Chow, Howard L Kaner, Paul C Kaney, Catherine L Kantor, Alonzo Kelly, Paulette Kemp, Yolanda Kenniston-Alvarez, Robert Kerfoot, Dennis R Kettering, Winston Kilkenny, Tamika A King, Carrie L Kinsey, Craig J Kirchheirmer, Michael Klein, Linda K Kleinwatcher, Anntoinette M Knight, Kyana Knight, Marlene Knox, Eric L Koch, Charles Kronschnabel, Vijay Kumar, Sabrena D LaVerette, Marlon G Lacey, Monica S Lacy, Hubert A Laigo, Fred M Lambert, Gerardo Landin, Dawn M Landisi, Edgar C Landry, Jesus J Larios, Norma I Laureano-Ramirez, Joyce E Lavely, Larry Layva, Richard Le Sieur, Tim J LeMaitre, Andrea W Lee, James E Lee, Kenneth R Lee, Lauret E Lee, Pak Lee, Wycola Lee, Vilma Lemos, Luisa Lemus, Pamela J Leonard, Juan V Leonor, Larry D Lepley, Kam H Leung, Joanna Levingston, Charlie W Lewis, Leon E Lewis, Lether Lewis, Rachella C Lewis, Rick D Lewis, Yvette Lewis, Dora Leyva, Raul R Linares, Jane M Lincoln, Sheila Vidette Lindsay, Teresa C Lira, Keyana G Little, Juan A Livers, Patrick E Llamas, Andre M Llanes, Keith P Lloyd, Charade L Lofton, Daniel Long, Anne M Lopez, Armando Lopez, Ezequiel A Lopez, Gerardo T Lopez, Leticia I Lopez, Paul Lopez, Raul P Lopez, Richard Lopez, Latasha S Lottie, James J Love, Mark A Lovett, Jaron C Lucas, Oralia Lujan, Wendy Lujan, Rod C Lumry, Javier G Luna, Danielle Lynch, Alan Macduff, Jose Macias, Valarie A Macias, Hector Maciel, Diane Mack, Hylisha Mack, Maria Mackay, Charles E Mackey, Kim I Maclean, Will Madden, Jenny M Madrid, Laura R Madrid, Maria Madrigal, Olga L Madrigal, Patricia T Madrigal, Alba E Magana, Juan P Magana, Timothy J Magruder, Raymond L Majeski, Pavel Makarenko, Oliver Maldonado, Teresa Mannarelli, Eugene Mapp, Jose M Marin, Roberto Marin, Leon A Marmarian, Annette M Marrero, Alva L Marroquin, Barbara R Marshall, Carlton J Marshall, Joseph Martin, Alfred Martinez, Armando Martinez, Evelyn Y Martinez, Joel Martinez, Maria T Martinez, Tammy Martinez, Meshawn L Marts, Bob H Marzetta, Arthur D Mascarenas, Latasha M Mason, Talishia Massey, Peggy Matlock, Patricia A Matthews, Corneall Maxwell, Russell C Mayer, Larry J Mazon, Latoya R McAdoo, Shayla McAllister, Larry D McCafferty, Harry McCall, Robert W McCarty, Michael McCauley, Carolyn A McComico, Catherine M McCraw, Darryl McCray, Denise E McCuthen, Douglas J McDaniel, Terry McDaniels, Helen L McDonald, Edna J McGee, Robert L McGowen, Carol E McGuire, Ryan McIntosh, Trina A McIntosh, Delores McKinney, Joseph E McKinnis, Tammy A McLane, Calvin McLemore, Ernest D McReynolds, Carlos Medrano, Jose A Medrano, Adelita A Mejia, Maggie Mejia, Yamileth Mejia, Joshua S Melalipi, Armando M Mendez, Cheryl L Mendez, Christina Mendez, Denise S Mendizabal, Florencio Mendoza, Carla D Meneweather, Alma C Mercado, Kayla L Merchant, Lester J Meredith, Afework W Meshesha, Jessica M Miles, Darlene J Miller, Robbie R Miller, Ron Miller, Thomas Miller, Tonya Miller, Jolene Mills, Niesha Mills, Regina L Minor, Reggie O Mireles, Miguel Angel Molina, Janet Mollah, Tyone J Monette, Ericka Y Monge, Evelio Monge, William J Monroe, Jr, Julio R Monroy, Delie Montano, Francisco E Montero, Patricia Montes, Carlos M Montoya, Tom Montoya, Michelle L Mooney, James Moore, Lennie Moore, Natasha Moore, Robert B Moore, Tarnecia L Moorer, Damaris Morales, Dianne Lee Morales, Jason Morales, Carlos Moran, Jose D Moran, Maryetta Moreland, Vincent Moreno, Sr, Ahmed Morris, Calvin L Morris, Charles Morrison, Sandra L Morrison, Gregory Morton, Andrea L Moses, Christopher J Mosher, Monique Moss, Catalina Munoz, Lenore J Murphy, Maria M Murphy, Robert J Murray, Gregory D Myers, Charlie R Myles, Shashi Naidu, Rahman Natouf, Juanita Q Navarrette, Benjamin O Navarro, Diana L Navarro, Ernest E Navarro, Linda Navarro, Raul H Navarro, Rafael Nazario, Robert R Neal, Valerie Nelson, Thomas W Newby, Alanda D Newell, Kennetha D Newell, Bunchorn Ngor, Mark J Nicholas, Antoinette T Nicholson, Jeffrey G Nickels, Sammie M Nickles, Gene C Norris, Samuel Nsiah, William J Nuanes, Carmen A Nunez, Joel Nunez, Socorro Nusbaum, Cressida M Nwana, Loretta J O Campo, Gail O Donnell, Ronda Oakley, Johel Ocegueda, Kelly T Odum, Crystal Oglesby, Eugenio Ojeda, Jr, Rogelio R Ojeda, Ron Olin, Patricia Olison-Robbins, Hector Olivas, Javier Olvera, Grace P Omar, Maria G Ontiveros, Godwin R Onyegbulem, Myat H Oo, Edward Opferman, Susana Ordinola, Carlos Ordonez, Richard L Orellana, Carlos Orgaz-Zamora, Gonzalo Orozco, Oscar A Orozco, Vivian Ortega, Francisco J Ortiz, Guadalupe M Ortiz, Hector R Ortiz, Martin Ortiz, Darnell M Owens, Leroy H Owens, Jr, Elva G Pacheco, Gabriel N Padilla, Venancio A Pagsuyuin, Carla D Paige, Carlos Palma, Gilbert Paniagua, Phillip E Papa, Crystal N Parker, Rafael Parra, Raymond Parra, Roberto Patron, Michelle Patterson, Robert Patterson, Tommy L Patterson, Maurshun N Patton, Kevin Pell, Rosario Pena, Carlos F Perez, Erick Perez, Gail L Perez, Gilbert Perez, Maria Perez, Raymond Perez, Ricardo Perez, Rigoberto R Perez, Sharon A Perkins, Marilyn K Petersen, Catherine Pierucci, Tony R Pippins, Debbie L Pitts, James C Pollard, Catherine M Pompey, Karen Pope, Irene Prado, Andrew G Pratt, Clarence Pree, Leroy E Preston, Alicia Y Price, Cecil J Price, Denise E Prince, Jacqueline D Pryor, Sheena S Purify-Mack, La Trina Purnell, Geraldine Purvis, Kamea
July 11, 2012 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants First Transit Inc, First Transit Transportation LLC, FirstGroup America Inc; Party First Transit Transportation and FirstGroup America Company terminated amending Complaint - (Discovery), #1 ,filed by Plaintiffs Martin Abarca, Aiman M Abdalla, Shagen Abelyan, Regena Abernathy, Travis K Abner, Jr, Crystal Acosta, Adam Adalat, Maria C Adame, Chante M Adams, Joe R Adams, Sharon Adams, Eduardo M Aguilar, Rosa M Aguilar, Luis F Aguirre, Michael E Alarid, George Alcala, Linda G Alexander, Valerie A Alexander, Nisar Ali, Gurtha Allen, Lavern Allen, Donell E Allison, Sr, Jerry G Allison, Regino A Alonzo, Cesar A Alvarado, Felicia L Ames, Melody D Amos, Debora R Anderson, Keyshi Anderson, Tomico R Anderson, Dimas Andrade, Felix P Andrade, Theresa B Andrews, Eustacia A Angelo, Michelle Anguiano, Arthur Antwine, Linda M Anzel, Manuel A Anzures, Ana M Arana, Wilfredo Arce, Graciela Arellano, Maribel Ariza, Bennie Arlon, Martha R Armstead, Jesse Armstrong, Patricia M Armstrong, James B Aroche, Carlos Arroyo, Diego F Arroyo, Maria Arteaga, Gail A Ashby, Michelle Assali, Justin Astengo, Luis E Atenco, Robert L Atkinson, Shyam S Aulakh, Jess Avila, Samuel D Ayala, Robert B Baker, Willa M Baldwin, Edilberto Barajas, Eddie A Barham, Jacqueline O Barnes, Carl Barnhill, Ramiro Barragan, Jesus P Barraza, Arturo F Barrios, Kobi L Battle, Tamara R Bauer, Karla Bautista, Bridget E Beach, Amber E Beard, Darrell A Bell, Janell S Bell, Patrick Bell, Willie G Bell, Noureddine Bellili, Michael J Bellow, Teresa J Beltran, St Elmo R Benjamin, Phillip W Benton, Lonnie Jr Berry, Nakia A Bertrand, Lee D Betts, Guillermo Bilinsky, Harry Bills, Larry Bissic, Gus Blacio, Michele D Black, Jay C Blackmun, Franco Blas, Jr, Samuel Blow, Jackie R Bodine, Angela R Borja, Melissa A Boston, Hector N Botero, Dean Bouamrane, Tommy S Bounheuang, Ronald Bowen, Lawrence M Boyd, Felton L Boykin, John M Bragdon, Mona Lisa S Bragdon, Pamela R Bragg, Alvetta M Brannon, Mark S Brauns, Ruben Bravo, Ericka M Braxton, Jody A Breedwell, Ronnie E Briggs, Lourdes Briseno, Marvyl J Brizeno, Randolph E Brock, Mary E Brodine, Darryl D Brooks, Donald D Brooks, Darlene Brousard, Adrian E Brown, Desandra Brown, Gelenda D Brown, Mark L Brown, Walter Brown Stephenson, Sean S Bruce, Markisha L Brunious, Caesar L Bryant, Edith M Bryant, Vanessa M Bryant, Nicanor Buban, Robert F Buccelli, Rickey J Burford, Charles N Burke, Joshua Burnett, Brigitte Burns, Don M Burns, Eddie C Bustamante, Juan Bustamante, Errol D Butler, Crystal Bybee, Patrice Byrd-Sanders, Ruby C Cabrera, Andy R Calderon, Jesus V Camacho, David R Campbell, Eloise Campbell, Jeffrey P Campbell, Louis E Campbell, Joseph F Campo, Aurelio Campos, Bertha Campos, Daniel Campos, Fabian Campos, Genaro Campos, John P Campos, Frances M Cannon, Nicole Cannon, Serafin Cantero, Ruth M Cardenas, Hugo E Cardoza, Juan J Carmona, Raymond Carnighan, Andres Carrillo, Jaime Carrillo-Rivera, Adriane L Carrington, Anna I Carrion, Lavell R Carroll, Billy J Carter, Bryan Carter, Felicia M Carter, Jermaine L Carter, Sandra A Carter, Sheryl D Carter, Sebastian Casas, Julio Casasola, Hilda L Casillas, Martha Castellanos, Alejandra V Castillo, Daniel Castillo, Erwin L Castillo, Davina J Castro, Fernando S Castro, Gilberto Castro, Francisco J Cerrato, Enrique Cervantes, Jose Cervantes, Larry L Chaney, Chester C Chang, Lashaun Chaplin, Frederick J Chapman, Andrea Chavez, Christopher E Chavez, Juan M Chavez, Shantell B Chavez, Brian Chen, Richard D Ciesielski, Jameelah Clark, Lashange Clark, Merconie L Clark, Patricia Clark, Roberto E Clavel, Curtis L Claxton, Mable P Clayborn, Kendrick Clayton, Walter Clemons, Billy Clyne, Joseph Cole, Kimberly Cole, Michelle E Cole, Rosalind Coleman, Sharelle L Coleman, Carlos S Comeaux, Juan A Constanza, Fred Contreras, Gustavo Contreras, Rodolfo J Contreras, La Porsha N Conwell, Raymond A Cooper, Jr, Rosa Corchado, Florencia R Cordova, Virginia P Cordova, Mario Coronado, Juan C Cortes-Garcia, Frank Cortez, Thomas Cortez, George M Cosh, Frank J Costello, Bulmaro L Cota, Latanya Cotton, John M Covarrubias, Ernest Lewis Cox, Mark Cox, Robin R Cox, Patty S Coyle, Sonia T Craig, Sandra Crary, Donald R Crawford, Rhonda D Crawford, Vondella K Crawford, Mary Creedy, Carol P Criss, Darrell T Crockett, Jacqueline L Cross, Patrick N Crowell, Christopher Crump, Jose A Cruz, Peggy E Cruz, Robert Cruz, Maria Cubillo, Manuel E Cuellar, Leon Currie, Claybourne Curry, Mylvin Curry, Mark A Dally, Patrick A Daniel, Jason L Daniels, Inskip G Dasent, Yvette Davalos, Stephen C Davenport, Debra L Davila, Santiago Davila, Adrian S Davis, Andra Davis, Chester F Davis, David D Davis, Eleanor Davis, Jolynn Davis, Lavon E Davis, Martha A Davis, Maurice Davis, Michael Davis, Herier Davoodian, Windell L Dawson, Annette R De Jesus, Gabriel De La Torre, Nancy L De Lauer, Juan L DeHoyos, Jeremy Dean, John A Del-Zio, Luis A Delgado, Mercedes Delgado, Pruneda Delgado, Tina Delgado, Angelina Dennis, John H Dennis, Pervilla L Dennis, Natema C Denton, Maurice Diarian, Antonio A Diaz, Armando Diaz, Jose L Diaz, Luisa Diaz, Pablo Diaz, Joyce E Dickens, Patsy Dickerson, Preston M Dickerson, William Ditchkus, Cicely S Dixon, Jason Dixon, Rhonda D Dixon, Ryan E Dixson, Felix Doh, Guillermo Dominguez, Daniel Dorado, Sybil M Dorsey, Lakeya Doss, Deon M Douglas, Teresa Duarte, Beatriz O Dubon, Carlos E Dubon, Delia L Dubon, Michael W Dude, Martin Duenas, Edward Duenez, Jr, Phyllis D Dunlap, Annette M Dunn, Christina Duran, Edgar Duran, Joaquin Duran, Davena J Durham, Suwit Durongwong, Norman Dy, Jerry J Earby, Ken Ebrahim, Martha L Echevarria, Zakiyyah T El Amin, Raquel Elizalde, Brian Ellison, Albert Y Enriquez, Maria Enriquez, Rene E Enriquez, Eugene G Eoff, Robert J Erwin, Vincent Escobar, Wilfredo C Escobar, Daniel T Escobedo, David E Espinosa, Audelino C Espinoza, Marcella Espinoza, Lupe M Espitia, Beverly S Estrada, Elvira Estrada, Ernesto J Estrada, Juan Estrada, Andrew P Evans, Cathy R Evans, Donald Evans, Elouise Evans, Thomas E Evans, Clyde W Ewing, Tochukwu Eze, Robert D Factoran, Alexander Fajardo, Barbara L Falo, Joe L Fanco, Billy J Faniel, Mable P Farmer-Griffin, Ryan M Featherstone, Tim C Feldhaus, Gerald P Feria, Rosenda Fernandez, Donelle E Ferretti, Tashauwn C Fields, Juvenai Figueroa, Harold Finney, Jr, George Fisher, Floyd L Flagg, Sr, Robert C Flippin, Cesar Flores, Hugo Flores, Jesus Flores, Ruben Flores, Shirley Flores, Gary L Followell, Michael R Fontanilla, Lora Ford, Susette M Ford, Rocky Fordyce, Pierre Fort, Linda J Forte-Robinson, John C Fortson, Bradford S Fox, John Fox, Allen Gene Francis, Salnaze Francois, Diane Freeman, Raymond J Freeman, Elisabet Fregoso, Mtichell A Friend, Monica Fuentes, Paula R Fulkerson, Yvette D Gaddis, Kimberly E Gaines, Ramiro A Galeano, Emerson G Galicia, Audrey Gallegos, Ramiro T Gallegos, Pascal R Gallo, Cedric O Galloway, Mary Galvez, William F Galvez, Shawndee M Gantt, Daniel R Garcia, David W Garcia, Jennifer C Garcia, Juan A Garcia, Kessler D Garcia, Michael H Garcia, Monica V Garcia, Olivia Garcia, Sylvia E Garcia, Kimberly Gardner, Oliver T Garispe, Tracey Garland, Lawrence G Garrett, Edgar O Garza, Russell Garza, Alberto Gastelum, Richard B Gaudette, Don R Gauss, Rudy Gaviola, Pedro L Gazca, Robby A Gentle, Robert B George, Jr, Nora C Gil, Mark A Gill, Debroah Gillard, Michelle Renee Glasper, Verlton B Glaspie, Cheryl Goddard, Virginia Godinez, Eddie Roy Golden, Art R Gomez, Joanna E Gomez, Jorge S Gomez, Jose A Gomez, Santiago Gomez, Daniel S Gonzales, Daniel Gonzales, Isaac A Gonzales, Sandra Gonzales, Agustin R Gonzalez, Henry A Gonzalez, Ibrahim Gonzalez, Jorge Gonzalez, Jose D Gonzalez, Luz Gonzalez, Maria E Gonzalez, Rufino Gonzalez, Victor H Gonzalez, Victor Gonzalez, Omar A Gonzalez-Mata, Patricia A Goodlett, Mario D Goodman, Gregory J Gordon, Michael T Grace, Brenton M Graham, Alfred J Grandy, Christopher A Grant, Gwendolyn Gray, D Nesha Grayes, Cynthia Greeley, Antoinette E Green, Brian L Green, Lenn M Green, Sherman Green, Marilyn R Greeno, Ruth C Greer, David J Gregory, Stephanie Gregory, Georgina Gregory, Andrea Griffin, Jacqueline Griffin, Kenneth H Griffin, Sharon Cook Groff, Maria T Groschup-Black, Cyndy P Groves, Oscar Gudiel, Andrea Guerrero, Danny P Guerrero, Imelda Guerrero, Johnny Guerrero, Stephen F Gularte, Cynthia Gullatt, Bernard Gunatilake, Flor D Gutierrez, Francisco Gutierrez, Juan Gutierrez, Araceli Guzman, Salvador Guzman, Yvette Hale, Paula K Hall, William Hall, Jr, Tim M Halloran, Domonique R Hamilton, Regina M Hamilton, Margaret Hammond, Sheila K Handy, Ashley C Harbin, Deborah F Hardson, Sherman L Hardy, Brian R Harkness, Keimata C Harris, Tom G Harrison, Lisa D Hart, Brian D Hartje, Jerry Harvell, Kenneth W Harvey, Laurita L Harvey, Lorraine Harvey, Henry Hawkins, John G Hay, Deborah Hayes, Melvin J Hayes, Debra J Haynes, Gary L Heckler, Ronald S Henderson, Sr, Stephanie Henderson, Lourdes Hendra, Fredrick Henry, Billy B Heredia, Cristian Hernandez, Elio Hernandez, Henry Hernandez, Jessica Hernandez, Octavio Hernandez, Pamela R Hernandez, Roberto Hernandez, Santos E Hernandez, Debbie Herrera, Miguel Herrera, Eunice R Herring, Ramona Hicks, Elizabeth Hidalgo, Daniell G Hill, Donald R Hill, Kenneth E Hill, Kevin Hill, Leroy R Hill, Kent G Hines, Laverne A Hines, N Chon E Hines, Mitchell B Hinkle, Rahsaan Hinton, Andrew R Hirsch, Aaron K Hoban, Maria Hoeflich, Lara G Holguer, Carmen Holguin, Kristal Holley, Andrew Hollinquest, William C Hooks, Brian S Hopson, Duane J Horka, Shawntay D Horsley, Raymond L House, Timothy A House, Lorilee A Houston, Daniel Howard, Rose A Howard, Stephen D Howard, Kenneth C Howayeck, David M Hubbard, Sheretta Hubbard, Joseph A Hudson, Warren A Hudson, Jr, Andy Huerta, Jose R Huezo, Carlotta Huff, Penny A Huff, James Hughes, Efren Humaran Nahed, Krasaundra Hunter, Lelisa Hunter, Minnie P Hunter, Ricole Hunter, Charles G Hurst, Jesus Hurtado, Mohamed Hussein, Tuiono Ilaisanne, John H Ingram, Kenneth F Iriarte, Shannon Raymond Iverson, Nnemarsha Jack, Debra Jacks, Cherise Jackson, Glenda D Jackson, Gwendolyn Jackson, Jonathan Jackson, Leonard A Jackson, Malinda Jackson, Wanjuku K Jackson, Yvonne F Jackson, Warren Jacquet,
July 11, 2012 Filing 7 Amended Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Plaintiff Shirley Flores (Balderrama, Monica)
June 11, 2012 Filing 6 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Shirley Floresto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #5 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Balderrama, Monica)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Gary A. Feess. (bp)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and General Order 08.05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 07-06476 GAF(JCGx). Case referred from Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle to Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi for DISCOVERY. The case number will now read as follows: CV 12-03309 GAF(JCGx). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (rn)
April 16, 2012 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
April 16, 2012 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by All Plaintiffs. (et) (mg).
April 16, 2012 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendants First Transit, First Transit Inc, First Transit Transportation, First Transit Transportation LLC, FirstGroup America Company, FirstGroup America Inc. (et)
April 16, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants First Transit, First Transit Inc, First Transit Transportation, First Transit Transportation LLC, FirstGroup America Company, FirstGroup America Inc.Case assigned to Judge Gary A. Feess for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Martin Abarca, Aiman M Abdalla, Shagen Abelyan, Regena Abernathy, Travis K Abner, Jr, Crystal Acosta, Adam Adalat, Maria C Adame, Chante M Adams, Joe R Adams, Sharon Adams, Eduardo M Aguilar, Rosa M Aguilar, Luis F Aguirre, Michael E Alarid, George Alcala, Linda G Alexander, Valerie A Alexander, Nisar Ali, Gurtha Allen, Lavern Allen, Donell E Allison, Sr, Jerry G Allison, Regino A Alonzo, Cesar A Alvarado, Felicia L Ames, Melody D Amos, Debora R Anderson, Keyshi Anderson, Tomico R Anderson, Dimas Andrade, Felix P Andrade, (see attachment for more plaintiffs) (et). (mg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/20/2012: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mg). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/20/2012) (mg). (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/6/2013) (mg). (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/6/2013) (mg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/6/2013: # 2 Complaint) (mg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/6/2013: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shirley Flores et al v. First Transit Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori A Sprinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley E Stanley
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R Stein
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James T Stephens
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy L Stephens, Jr
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Stewart
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Stewart
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lupita Stewart
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J Stewart
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adale Stovall
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry W Straughter
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Stremel
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kwame J Sturghall
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin F Sudduth
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Major Sullivan
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tadevos T Tadevossian
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gonzalo Tajada
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry C Tanks
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zena Tanksley
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Tanquilut
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Tatum
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara A Taylor
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence T Taylor
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lolita Taylor
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Teal
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haik Ter-Panosyan
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faye J Terrill
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Theimer
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mindette R Thomann
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashaki S Thomas
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Channae M Thomas
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daena Thomas
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn R Thomas
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathaleen M Thomas
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick L Thomas
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl N Thomer
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew E Thompson
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda L Thompson
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rona J Thompson
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale S Thornbrugh
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Thornton
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen C Tichgelaar
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toby W Tilcock
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrianna I Tinoco
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Tinoco
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatua R Togiola
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Torres, Sr
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald S Torrez
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amparo Tovar
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah M Tovar
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul B Tovmassian
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Townsend
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg P Tramell
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phuc Tran
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Adolfo Trejo
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean S Trezile
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Tricas
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tuong C Trieu
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel N Trujillo
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina D Tucker
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladell A Turner
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Athena M Turrey
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isadora L Tuufuli
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn L Ua
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ukattah
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas A Ullberg
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Song Uong
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna L Uribe
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marta E Vaca
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Valdez
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Valenzuela
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia G Van Saun
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin M Vaney
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell V Vanzanten
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhorzhik Vardanyan
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugo Vargas
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel G Vasquez
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilberto Vasquez
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haroldo Vasquez
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leticia Vasquez-Juarez
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogelio Vega
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Velasquez
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel Velasquez
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Velez
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Venegas
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest M Verano
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Refugio Verdizcp
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Verduzco
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regino Verduzco
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert S Vienop
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hipolito Villalobos
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John L Villanueva
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ngoc V Vo
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Voong
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Voong
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John G Vromans
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernice D Walker
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome L Walker
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L Walker
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ulyess Walker
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry W Walls
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl G Walton
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Walton, III
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toraine Lynette Ward
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Wardle
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khadija Z Washington
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn R Waters
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bettye Watkins
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda V Watkins
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latanya Watson
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas C Watts
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre L Webb
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon B Webb-Swim
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H Weber
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey M Welch
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Whitall
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin D White
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard E White
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russill J White
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E White
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janette A Whited
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian P Whitehead
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Whiteside
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Postrina Whitfield
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sade K Wilburn
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Wiley
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonnie Wilkinson
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisande G Williams
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda F Williams
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen C Williams
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac D Williams
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly A Williams
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela D Williams
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela E Williams
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard C Williams
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sybil Williams
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Williams
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimeyatta Williams-Ayitevie
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Willis
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce A Wilson
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory C Wilson
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimanette L Wilson
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen A Wilson
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nishia N Wilson
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Wilson, III
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl A Winters
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C Wisdom
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn J Wolk
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Wong
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret C Wong
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbur Wong
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald R Woodard
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi R Woods
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Woods
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L Wyatt, Sr
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parsya K Younan
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arbanah Young
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ervin R Young
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Youngblood
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirby Yu-Chih
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riaz Zaboori
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shariff Zamani
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores C Zambada
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmundo A Zamudio
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Zepeda
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Zuniga
Represented By: Monica Balderrama
Represented By: Gene F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?