Jihad Adbul-Mumit v. Hyundai Motor America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christopher Legendre, Ben Sullenger, Benjamin Basham, Jared Castro, David Reynolds, Tammy Franklin, Rebecca Catlett, Aaron Sanders, Atef Zayd, Robert McCurdy, Timothy Holroyd, Nancy Rowsey, Christina Jones, Chelsea Johnson, Arnold Gutman, Mark Hustead, Victor C. Kvietkus, Suzanne Mowbray, Brittany Hoban, Nicole Elsesser, Adrian Odya-Weis, Brad Ransom, Kim Keating, Jennifer Demarco, Nicholas Perez, Roger Davis, Kenneth Yates, Greg Perigard, Christopher Arauza, Sandra Jordan, Christy Miller, Sung Cho, Betty Hornick, Robert Hendrickson, Christopher Weaver, Hannah Wilson, Adam Grayberg, Patsy Kizer, Diana Kite, Wanda G. Amos, David Aub, Janie Gray, Amy Smith, William Bonner, Lauren Hagy, Annie Robinson, Edward Scearce, Carly Connelly, Kyle Russell, Floyd Fallin, Jr., Mary Roberts, Hannah Kight, Lee Ann Hartmann, John Olsen, Sharon Ekstrand, Jan Burford, Tana Rae Oropeza, Melanie Brown, Rodney Matthews, Carl Kuri, Jeremy Hillberry, Vincent Williams, Tanya Peake, Mase Fabar, Thomas Freeze, Mr. James Turner, Lisa Smith, Gary Boyette, Sandra Lubeck, Michelle Debrosse, Brenda Lackey, Mark Perry, Jonathan Starks, William McFadden, Kimberley Amick, Laura Weisiger, Nancy Hickman, Alyssa Hronowski, Richard Gould, Jamie Young, William Hester, Jr., Cynthia Devane, Kathleen Hedrick, Diane Wien, Charles Seltman, Ron Miller, Caitlin Feeley, Dennis Oleary, John Picciano, Carol Viergutz, Drew Roper, Nancy N. Hamlett, Joseph Caldarelli, Ruth Diaz, Carol Mieggs, Jeanne Brown, Carol Wright, Philip F. Corrao, Bernard Presgraves, Anita Madison, Monica Adair Sargent, Shelia Ward, Brian Feldman, Donna Gaddis, Rachel Poliquin, Deborah Edge, Donna Pearson, Kimberly Vest, Karen Nolan, Derwood Johnston, Stephanie Shelor, Patricia Hauser, Tim Stoessel, Brian Osborne, Jacklyn Casselle-Tupponce, Yolanda Sullivan, Mary Vaughan, Christie Gray, Dion Tomer, Elaine Gibson, Sara Pullen, Wesley Songer, Linda Pratt, Gary Brown, John Brancato, Carol Hutchinson, Brian Glaub, Randall Singhas, Ann Jansen, John Rowley, Jeremy Conrad, Monte Morgan, Michelle Atkins, Jeffrey Horchner, Matthew Mattro, Gary Walton, Chris Pena, Asif Aziz, Kendall Harris, Sung Chun, Lynn Settle, Amine Berbale, Jihad Adbul-Mumit, Sydney Brumbelow, Dan Amatruda, Charles Martin, Eric Stewart, Kelly Kusek, Leslie Hearn, Jessica Groves, Alma Delia Deleon, Mary Singhas, William Lipford, Timm Betcher, Joseph Bartell, Sharon Wiser, Sara Stramel, Stacy Waller, Richard McGruder, Tanya Palik, Laura Potter, Arlove Plunkett, Larry Strayhorn, Judy Bender, Karen Mooney, Paul L. Grover, Juliet Rowland, Mark McGinley, Denise Pryor, John A. Knight, George Ioannou, David W. Loving, Cody Kelly, Jennifer Ryan, Linda Chesseboro, Nina Sibert, Karen Duncan, Carl Arsenault, Pam Hodges, Nathen Illidge, Tanja Gilmore, Harry Paulette, Jennifer Justice, Robert T. Wiener, Scott Flora, Donna Knoell, Sheryl Jordan, Lori Brodie, Debra Pines, Ashli Thurston, Donna Taylor, Lilia Pinson, Helen Gillespie, Pamela Edwards, Jeff Eddy, Mark Stephens, Michael Thome, Jason Call, Robena Vaughan, Margie D. Fauls, Aliz Agoston, Gregory Woods, Jeffery Drugatz, Terry Barnes, Angel Collins, Dorothy Halpin, Robert Hite, Sivathanu Pillai, Katherine Vandenbrieje, Kirt Chappelle, Linda Clune, Suzanne Smith, Brian Rowe, Shawna Mattocks, Janice Jenkins, Harold Mayhew, Jr., Eric Rothman, Soha Ayyash, John Malizia, Mary Harris, John Johnstone, Shawn Maynor, Christopher Thome, Eva Ralston, Tamara Krobert, Christine Maccaslin, Valerie Gray, Anthony Frederick, Pennie Newell, Sandra Young, April Crocker, Rasheedah Johnson, Arlene Drewry, John Kerr, Bonnie Moore, Ronald Stafford, Mary Curtis, David Whitley, Mike Vammino, Amanda Heinlein, Christopher Wilcher, Susan McClelland, Michael Ranger, David Miller, Robert Younie, II, Penny McCeney, Ryan Nolette, Steve Childress, Walter Jeffries, Sandra Shifflett, Miriah Eisenman, Emily Sparks, Thomas Sanchez, Victoria Puckett, Brandi Gray, Joseph Elton, Mark Agee, Shay Hunter, Sheri Dixson, Robin Robert, Anne Picciano, Victoria McGruder, Jesenia Dominguez, Stanley Marcus, Danny Riddle, Timothy Wright, Jr., Brianna Harrison, Timothy Pohlig, Ken Lu, William Ralston, Sarah Stevenson, David Lehman, Jung Moon, Randall Samples, Jerry Hudson, Sr., Svetlana Spencer, Carl Gussgard, Carrie Van Hook, Rebecca Samuelson, Wanda Ferguson, Roxanne Stith, Barbara Leggett, William Lyons, Owens Turner, Jr., Lt John Franklin, Karen Baker, Bryon Moss, Emily Wong, Thomas Wright, Lori Spik, Joshua Roberts, Shirley Fickle, Ashley Lippolis-Aviles, Brian Spencer, Terry Donaldson, Mark Woehler, John Pedersen, Terrie Mitchell, Howard L. Carpenter, Robert Silber, Wade Schwanke, Jr., Donald McIntire, Joshua Lubeck, Rocky Rockburn, Patrice A. Harris, Major M. Horton, Monica Johnson, Carmen Mercado, Denise Poindexter, Raymond O. Atkins, Larry King, Else Brown, Roger Myers, Joseph McDaniel, Henry Shane Colvin, Kevin Newsome, Patricia Jacocks, Karen Meller, Guillermo Galarza, Roger Chesley, Jr., Markus Lange, Kathy Powers, Christopher Tokar, Mary Mitchell, William Clark, Ayndria Green, Delores Lindblom, Susan Bailey, Mindy Williams, Elizabeth Farrell, Karen Bradbury, Thomas Petit, Howard Snyder, Franklin Sturkey, Matthew Atwell, Billy Llewellyn, John Baxter, Margaret Webb, Yvonne Alston, Donna Davis, Andrew Taylor, Frank Kulovitz, Edward Kizer, Juanita Wilson, Tarun Ghai, Troy Rosier, Jonathon O'Brien, Jamie Burton, Maria Ming Li, Randall Nixon, Clifford Trimble, Tessie Gutterman, Jonathan Wright, Susan Petrie, Todd Bradbury, Greg E. Hines, Joshua Pucci, Sergio Tromba, Nancy Murray, Jason Price, Gloria Brooks, Patrick Nance, Elizabeth Belevan, Bryan Nordquist, Gloria Lewis, Stephen Smith, Boyd Davis, Jennifer Horning, Robert McCarraher, William Brewster, Adrian Phillips, Jr., Charles Cochrane, Rona Palmer, Patricia Nicosia, Mary Wright, Kristine Smolens, Hubert Hughes, Sharon Bisdee, Frederick Eitel, Derek St. Onge, Tammy Lackey, Benjamin Moher, Cynthia Quattlebaum, Patty Senter, Angela Brown, Stacey Jansen, Jacqui Newitt, Ann Taylor, Amanda Kozak, Deborah Edgefield, William Kight, Milca Vargas, Mary Lang, Latavia Drew, Brooke Asher, Harry L. Barton, Jessyca Venice, Charles Helms, Troy L. Graham, Karri Colvin, Matthew Abedi, Stephen Rubis, Calvin Lewis, Regina Lewis, Cyane Lowden, Cedon J. Haley, Jr., Phillip Morgan, Gwen Seal, William Morgan, Robert Daniels, Suzanne Malizia, Carl Pierce, Tony Pulley, Bitsy House, William O'Flynn, Lynn Page, Tracy Frederick, Ji Ji Thekkeveedu, Maryann Villies, Julian Gutterman, Susan McFadden, Sharon Harrison, Christian Simmers, Rebecca Petrella, Henry Requejo, Sally James, Tom Scarcella, Richard Pearson, David Thompson, Walter Bordeaux, Candace Owens, Wanda Sutphin, Deanna Haverly, Heather Matsey, D. Shawn Shumake, Christopher Hoehn, Thomas Ryder, Stephany Whipple, Patricia Spier, Carolyn S. Kines, James Fickle, Kristy Ambrose, Michelle Shifflett, Barry Goldberg, Sarah Whitlock, Sara Burruss, Erestine Harding, Terry Stepp, Patrice Vossler, Glenn Lavinder, Marilyn Twine, Jacqueline Randolph, Todd Carlson, Aquisi Harris, Asok Kumar Sarkar, Carolyn Horchner, Patricia Lyons, -, Matthew Basilone, Robert R. Lucas, Scott Meyers, Nancy Ransome, Leslie Yamnicky, Tom Thompson, Gabriela Grajeda, David Mulligan, Lonnie Urquhart, Diandra Mayo, Angie Conner, Amy Seay, Daphne Hope Smith, Kasey Eike, Lisa Davis, Richard Jordan, George D. Despert, III, Mikyung Kim, Kurt Gergle, Karen Evans, Joyce Janto, Barry Feldman, Teresa Kelly, Cynthia Carter, Barbara Bell, Kimberly Ward, Sergei Novitsky, Anthony Depaul, Jr., Elizabeth Grant, Hannah Ramey, Jean Stotler, Kimberly Crawford, Willis M. Gary, Ivan Galloway, Jr., Diana Griffin, June Shores, Pamela Jones, James Matsey, Michael McClenning, Margaret Pomeroy, Cheri Valverde, Sonya Dodson, James Herrington, John Beasley, Stephen Herman, Edward Newman, Jr., Karen Peters, Susan Cave, Sharon Swinburne, Shane Schlesman, Melanie Kenyon, Antonio Robinson, James Berling, Catherine Lantz, Connie Kniseley, James Basham, Tim Seymour, Hab Baker, III, Shirley Shaw, William Cromer, Jason Jaffeux, John Sutor, Brady Peters, Daniel Waxman, Christina Drugatz, Adeline Trotter, Ronald Sharp, Deborah Hare, Teddy Huddleston, Katheryn Woosley, David Molinari, Thomas Malone, Robin Lovett, Charles Wiser, Thomas Robert Franco, Sharon Hart, Alicia Fusco, Charles Pinkard, Amada Wagoner, Jay Cunningham, Scott Goodman, Wilber B. Jones, Todd Johnson, Stella Tang, Mary Mulligan, Thomas Randolph, Reveredy Nicholson, Debbie Hetterly, Robert McClelland, Rose Ricker, Melody Gilley, Dan Cho, Shea Kersey, Sandra K. Dunton, Kim Perkins, Ron Dickman, Gretchen Ward, Michael Decanio, Frederick Carter, Dedra Gueno, Mike Littman, Glen Newitt, Joseph Salazar, Susan King, Roy Mason Pennington, III, Banks Mitchum, Vernon Kirby, Margaret Crittendon, Jeffrey Turner, Jeff May, Stuart Cochran, Dennis Negran, Frances Jacocks, Lisa Hagerty, Bradley Seay, David Poore, III, Ida Garner, Adam Furman, Karen O'Neil, Thurman Hodges, Ashley Pannell, Ernest Sharpe, Ried Wilson and Kenneth Womack
Defendant: Alexandria Hyunda, LLC, Gateway Hyundai, Inc., Harrisonburg Auto Mall, LLC, Brown's Manassas Hyundai, LLC, Cavalier Hyundai, Inc., Fairfax Hyundai, Inc., Miller Auto Sales Inc, Checkered Flag Store #6, LLC, Checkered Flag Imports, Inc., Tysinger Motor Company, Inc., Hall Hyundai, LLC, Robert Woodall Chevrolet, Inc., Hall Automotive Group, Inc., Priority Imports Newport News, Inc., James City County Associates, inc., Pohanka Auto Center, Inc., Brown's Leesburg Hyundai, LLC, Priority Greenbrier Automotive, Inc., First Team Inc, WBM, Inc., Craft Automotive, Inc., Malloy Hyundai, Price Hyundai Corp., Wright Way Automotive, Inc., Duncan Imports, Inc., Hall Hyundai Newport News, LLC, Hyundai Motor America Inc and WBM, Inc. doing business as West Broad Hyundai
Interested Party: Circuit Court for the City of Roanoke, VA
Case Number: 2:2014cv04367
Filed: June 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2015 Filing 50 SEPARATION OF CERTAIN CLAIMS AND CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2424, The transferee court in this litigation has advised the Panel that coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings have been completed and that remand of certain claims in the actions on the attached schedule to their transferor court, Western District of Virginia, as provided in 28 U.S.C. Section 1407(a), is appropriate. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the following claims are separated and remanded to the transferor court: (1) the claims of plaintiffs in the classes defined in these cases, which do not overlap with the class set out in MDL No. 2424 (i.e., persons who purchased 2011-13 Hyundai Elantra vehicles in the State of Virginia after the 11/2/2012, notice date); and (2) the claims of any MDL No. 2424 class member plaintiffs in these cases who timely opted out of the MDL settlement. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Docket Sheet, #2 Master MDL Docket Sheet) (gk)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu: This action has been assigned to the HONORABLE GEORGE H. WU, United States District Judge. TheHonorable Frederick F. Mumm is assigned as Magistrate Judge.Judge Wu is located in Courtroom 10, on the Spring Street level of the United States Courthouse at 312 N.Spring Street. Additional information about Judge Wus procedures and schedule can be found on the Courts website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov.Counsel are advised that this is consolidated into In Re: Hyundai and Kia Economy Litigation, MDL 13-2424-GW(FFMx) for all further proceedings. A Notice of Appearance in the MDL action will be requiredin order for you to receive notice of all subsequent filings. Counsel will also be responsible for adding theirparties into the MDL docket.The Court appointed Eric H. Gibbs as liaison counsel for Plaintiffs in the MDL matter. Parties are advised that Plaintiffs' Motion for Certification of Settlement Class 184 , Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement and Order Directing Notice to the Class 185 and Plaintiffs' in Gentry, et al. v. Hyundai Motor America's Motion for Suggestion of Remand and Enforcement of Stipulation in Open Court 230 , are set for June 26, 2014 at 9:30 a.m.: (pj)
June 13, 2014 Filing 48 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU. (kss)
June 10, 2014 Filing 47 Letter to Counsel issued on case number 2:14-cv-04367 GW (FFMx). (et)
June 10, 2014 Filing 44 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Virginia Western
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order transferring case to Central District of California. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 6/9/2014. (mab) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
June 9, 2014 Filing 42 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-2:14-cv-04367), from Central District of California, Western Division; MDL No. 2424 (Attachments: #1 Letter requesting MDL Transfer)(mab) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
June 6, 2014 Filing 45 Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 6/4/2014 regarding transfer of Case No. 3:14-cv-0005-NKM from USDC Western District of Virginia (Charlottesville). Case assigned to Judge George H. Wu for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:13-ml-02424-GW (FFMx). (et)
June 5, 2014 Filing 46 LETTER Requesting Transfer of MDL case to this District sent to USDC Western District of Virginia (Charlottesville) re transfer of their case number 3:14-cv-0005-NKM for consolidation with 2:13-ml-02424-GW (FFMx). (et)
May 12, 2014 Filing 41 NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing on Motion #29 MOTION to Stay Pending Approval of Nationwide Settlement, #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION to Sever Motion to Organize Plaintiffs Who Obtained Elantras After November 2,2012 for LItigation Purposes Separately From Those Who Obtained Elantras Prior to November 2, 2012 : previously set for 5/14/14 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Norman K. Moon in Charlottesville: Motion Hearing RESET for 7/29/2014 10:00 AM in Charlottesville before Judge Norman K. Moon. (hnw) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
May 8, 2014 Filing 40 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Anthony Depaul, Jr, Sonya Dodson, Sandra K. Dunton, Deborah Edgefield, Pamela Edwards, Kasey Eike, Miriah Eisenman, Wanda Ferguson, James Fickle, Shirley Fickle, Thomas Robert Franco, Alicia Fusco, Guillermo Galarza, Ivan Galloway, Jr, Richard Gould, Adam Grayberg, Ayndria Green, Jessica Groves, Lauren Hagy, Dorothy Halpin, Aquisi Harris, Mary Harris, Brianna Harrison, Leslie Hearn, Kathleen Hedrick, Debbie Hetterly, Brittany Hoban, Christopher Hoehn, Timothy Holroyd, Teddy Huddleston, Hubert Hughes, Jason Jaffeux, Sally James, Walter Jeffries, Christina Jones, Vernon Kirby, Diana Kite, Edward Kizer, Patsy Kizer, Calvin Lewis, Regina Lewis, Ashley Lippolis-Aviles, Billy Llewellyn, Robin Lovett, David W. Loving, Ken Lu, Patricia Lyons, William Lyons, Thomas Malone, Stanley Marcus, Shawna Mattocks, Penny McCeney, Richard McGruder, Victoria McGruder, Donald McIntire, Karen Meller, Carmen Mercado, Mary Mitchell, Suzanne Mowbray, David Mulligan, Mary Mulligan, Kevin Newsome, Jonathon O'Brien, Brian Osborne, Candace Owens, Ashley Pannell, Donna Pearson, Chris Pena, Roy Mason Pennington, III, Mark Perry, Karen Peters, Rebecca Petrella, Susan Petrie, Debra Pines, David Poore, III, Linda Pratt, Jason Price, Sara Pullen, Jacqueline Randolph, Michael Ranger, Nancy Ransome, Mary Roberts, Annie Robinson, Antonio Robinson, Rocky Rockburn, Eric Rothman, Brian Rowe, Juliet Rowland, Jennifer Ryan, Joseph Salazar, Gwen Seal, Amy Seay, Lynn Settle, Stephanie Shelor, Michelle Shifflett, Nina Sibert, Mary Singhas, Randall Singhas, Suzanne Smith, Wesley Songer, Jonathan Starks, Tim Stoessel, Yolanda Sullivan, John Sutor, Wanda Sutphin, Stella Tang, Andrew Taylor, Ann Taylor, Christopher Tokar, Adeline Trotter, James Turner, Carrie Van Hook, Milca Vargas, Robena Vaughan, Kimberly Vest, Carol Viergutz, Maryann Villies, Stacy Waller, Gary Walton, Kimberly Ward, Stephany Whipple, Sarah Whitlock, Robert T. Wiener, Christopher Wilcher, Charles Wiser, Sharon Wiser, Thomas Wright, Jamie Young, Atef Zayd (Feinman, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
May 2, 2014 Filing 39 NOTICE by Hyundai Motor America, Inc. (Notice of Continuation of MDL Hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Nationwide Class Settlement) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Neale, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
April 22, 2014 Filing 38 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #29 MOTION to Stay Pending Approval of Nationwide Settlement : Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2014 10:00 AM in Charlottesville before Judge Norman K. Moon. (hnw) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
April 3, 2014 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #29 MOTION to Stay Pending Approval of Nationwide Settlement (Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby). filed by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Neale, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
April 3, 2014 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #29 MOTION to Stay Pending Approval of Nationwide Settlement . filed by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Neale, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
March 24, 2014 Filing 35 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #30 Brief / Memorandum in Support, #29 MOTION to Stay Pending Approval of Nationwide Settlement . filed by Matthew Abedi, Monica Adair Sargent, Jihad Adbul-Mumit, Mark Agee, Aliz Agoston, Yvonne Alston, Dan Amatruda, Kristy Ambrose, Kimberley Amick, Wanda G. Amos, Christopher Arauza, Carl Arsenault, Brooke Asher, Michelle Atkins, Raymond O. Atkins, Matthew Atwell, David Aub, Soha Ayyash, Asif Aziz, Susan Bailey, Hab Baker, III, Karen Baker, Terry Barnes, Joseph Bartell, Harry L. Barton, Benjamin Basham, James Basham, Matthew Basilone, John Baxter, John Beasley, Elizabeth Belevan, Barbara Bell, Judy Bender, Amine Berbale, James Berling, Timm Betcher, Sharon Bisdee, William Bonner, Walter Bordeaux, Gary Boyette, Karen Bradbury, Todd Bradbury, John Brancato, William Brewster, Lori Brodie, Gloria Brooks, Angela Brown, Else Brown, Gary Brown, Jeanne Brown, Melanie Brown, Sydney Brumbelow, Jan Burford, Sara Burruss, Jamie Burton, Joseph Caldarelli, Jason Call, Todd Carlson, Howard L. Carpenter, Cynthia Carter, Frederick Carter, Jacklyn Casselle-Tupponce, Jared Castro, Rebecca Catlett, Susan Cave, Kirt Chappelle, Roger Chesley, Jr, Linda Chesseboro, Steve Childress, Dan Cho, Sung Cho, Sung Chun, William Clark, Linda Clune, Stuart Cochran, Charles Cochrane, Angel Collins, Henry Shane Colvin, Karri Colvin, Carly Connelly, Angie Conner, Jeremy Conrad, Philip F. Corrao, Kimberly Crawford, Margaret Crittendon, April Crocker, William Cromer, Jay Cunningham, Mary Curtis, Robert Daniels, Boyd Davis, Donna Davis, Lisa Davis, Roger Davis, Michelle Debrosse, Michael Decanio, Alma Delia Deleon, Jennifer Demarco, Anthony Depaul, Jr, George D. Despert, III, Cynthia Devane, Ruth Diaz, Ron Dickman, Sheri Dixson, Sonya Dodson, Jesenia Dominguez, Terry Donaldson, Latavia Drew, Arlene Drewry, Christina Drugatz, Jeffery Drugatz, Karen Duncan, Sandra K. Dunton, Jeff Eddy, Deborah Edge, Deborah Edgefield, Pamela Edwards, Kasey Eike, Miriah Eisenman, Frederick Eitel, Sharon Ekstrand, Nicole Elsesser, Joseph Elton, Karen Evans, Mase Fabar, Floyd Fallin, Jr, Elizabeth Farrell, Margie D. Fauls, Caitlin Feeley, Barry Feldman, Brian Feldman, Wanda Ferguson, James Fickle, Shirley Fickle, Scott Flora, Thomas Robert Franco, John Franklin, Tammy Franklin, Anthony Frederick, Tracy Frederick, Thomas Freeze, Adam Furman, Alicia Fusco, Donna Gaddis, Guillermo Galarza, Ivan Galloway, Jr, Ida Garner, Willis M. Gary, Kurt Gergle, Tarun Ghai, Elaine Gibson, Helen Gillespie, Melody Gilley, Tanja Gilmore, Brian Glaub, Barry Goldberg, Scott Goodman, Richard Gould, Troy L. Graham, Gabriela Grajeda, Elizabeth Grant, Brandi Gray, Christie Gray, Janie Gray, Valerie Gray, Adam Grayberg, Ayndria Green, Diana Griffin, Paul L. Grover, Jessica Groves, Dedra Gueno, Carl Gussgard, Arnold Gutman, Julian Gutterman, Tessie Gutterman, Lisa Hagerty, Lauren Hagy, Cedon J. Haley, Jr, Dorothy Halpin, Nancy N. Hamlett, Erestine Harding, Deborah Hare, Aquisi Harris, Kendall Harris, Mary Harris, Patrice A. Harris, Brianna Harrison, Sharon Harrison, Sharon Hart, Lee Ann Hartmann, Patricia Hauser, Deanna Haverly, Leslie Hearn, Kathleen Hedrick, Amanda Heinlein, Charles Helms, Robert Hendrickson, Stephen Herman, James Herrington, William Hester, Jr, Debbie Hetterly, Nancy Hickman, Jeremy Hillberry, Greg E. Hines, Robert Hite, Brittany Hoban, Pam Hodges, Thurman Hodges, Christopher Hoehn, Timothy Holroyd, Carolyn Horchner, Jeffrey Horchner, Betty Hornick, Jennifer Horning, Major M. Horton, Bitsy House, Alyssa Hronowski, Teddy Huddleston, Jerry Hudson, Sr, Hubert Hughes, Shay Hunter, Mark Hustead, Carol Hutchinson, Nathen Illidge, George Ioannou, Frances Jacocks, Patricia Jacocks, Jason Jaffeux, Sally James, Ann Jansen, Stacey Jansen, Joyce Janto, Walter Jeffries, Janice Jenkins, Chelsea Johnson, Monica Johnson, Rasheedah Johnson, Todd Johnson, Derwood Johnston, John Johnstone, Christina Jones, Pamela Jones, Wilber B. Jones, Richard Jordan, Sandra Jordan, Sheryl Jordan, Jennifer Justice, Kim Keating, Cody Kelly, Teresa Kelly, Melanie Kenyon, John Kerr, Shea Kersey, Hannah Kight, William Kight, Mikyung Kim, Carolyn S. Kines, Larry King, Susan King, Vernon Kirby, Diana Kite, Edward Kizer, Patsy Kizer, John A. Knight, Connie Kniseley, Donna Knoell, Amanda Kozak, Tamara Krobert, Frank Kulovitz, Carl Kuri, Kelly Kusek, Victor C. Kvietkus, Brenda Lackey, Tammy Lackey, Mary Lang, Markus Lange, Catherine Lantz, Glenn Lavinder, Christopher Legendre, Barbara Leggett, David Lehman, Calvin Lewis, Gloria Lewis, Regina Lewis, Delores Lindblom, William Lipford, Ashley Lippolis-Aviles, Mike Littman, Billy Llewellyn, Robin Lovett, David W. Loving, Cyane Lowden, Ken Lu, Joshua Lubeck, Sandra Lubeck, Robert R. Lucas, Patricia Lyons, William Lyons, Christine Maccaslin, Anita Madison, John Malizia, Suzanne Malizia, Thomas Malone, Stanley Marcus, Charles Martin, Heather Matsey, James Matsey, Rodney Matthews, Shawna Mattocks, Matthew Mattro, Jeff May, Harold Mayhew, Jr, Shawn Maynor, Diandra Mayo, Robert McCarraher, Penny McCeney, Robert McClelland, Susan McClelland, Michael McClenning, Robert McCurdy, Joseph McDaniel, Susan McFadden, William McFadden, Mark McGinley, Richard McGruder, Victoria McGruder, Donald McIntire, Karen Meller, Carmen Mercado, Scott Meyers, Carol Mieggs, Christy Miller, David Miller, Ron Miller, Maria Ming Li, Mary Mitchell, Terrie Mitchell, Banks Mitchum, Benjamin Moher, David Molinari, Jung Moon, Karen Mooney, Bonnie Moore, Monte Morgan, Phillip Morgan, William Morgan, Bryon Moss, Suzanne Mowbray, David Mulligan, Mary Mulligan, Nancy Murray, Roger Myers, Patrick Nance, Dennis Negran, Pennie Newell, Glen Newitt, Jacqui Newitt, Edward Newman, Jr, Kevin Newsome, Reveredy Nicholson, Patricia Nicosia, Randall Nixon, Karen Nolan, Ryan Nolette, Bryan Nordquist, Sergei Novitsky, Jonathon O'Brien, William O'Flynn, Karen O'Neil, Adrian Odya-Weis, Dennis Oleary, John Olsen, Tana Rae Oropeza, Brian Osborne, Candace Owens, Lynn Page, Tanya Palik, Rona Palmer, Ashley Pannell, Harry Paulette, Tanya Peake, Donna Pearson, Richard Pearson, John Pedersen, Chris Pena, Roy Mason Pennington, III, Nicholas Perez, Greg Perigard, Kim Perkins, Mark Perry, Brady Peters, Karen Peters, Thomas Petit, Rebecca Petrella, Susan Petrie, Adrian Phillips, Jr, Anne Picciano, John Picciano, Carl Pierce, Sivathanu Pillai, Debra Pines, Charles Pinkard, Lilia Pinson, Arlove Plunkett, Timothy Pohlig, Denise Poindexter, Rachel Poliquin, Margaret Pomeroy, David Poore, III, Laura Potter, Kathy Powers, Linda Pratt, Bernard Presgraves, Jason Price, Denise Pryor, Joshua Pucci, Victoria Puckett, Sara Pullen, Tony Pulley, Cynthia Quattlebaum, Eva Ralston, William Ralston, Hannah Ramey, Jacqueline Randolph, Thomas Randolph, Michael Ranger, Brad Ransom, Nancy Ransome, Henry Requejo, David Reynolds, Rose Ricker, Danny Riddle, Robin Robert, Joshua Roberts, Mary Roberts, Annie Robinson, Antonio Robinson, Rocky Rockburn, Drew Roper, Troy Rosier, Eric Rothman, Brian Rowe, Juliet Rowland, John Rowley, Nancy Rowsey, Stephen Rubis, Kyle Russell, Jennifer Ryan, Thomas Ryder, Joseph Salazar, Randall Samples, Rebecca Samuelson, Thomas Sanchez, Aaron Sanders, Asok Kumar Sarkar, Tom Scarcella, Edward Scearce, Shane Schlesman, Wade Schwanke, Jr, Gwen Seal, Amy Seay, Bradley Seay, Charles Seltman, Patty Senter, Lynn Settle, Tim Seymour, Ronald Sharp, Ernest Sharpe, Shirley Shaw, Stephanie Shelor, Michelle Shifflett, Sandra Shifflett, June Shores, D. Shawn Shumake, Nina Sibert, Robert Silber, Christian Simmers, Mary Singhas, Randall Singhas, Amy Smith, Daphne Hope Smith, Lisa Smith, Stephen Smith, Suzanne Smith, Kristine Smolens, Howard Snyder, Wesley Songer, Emily Sparks, Brian Spencer, Svetlana Spencer, Patricia Spier, Lori Spik, Derek St. Onge, Ronald Stafford, Jonathan Starks, Mark Stephens, Terry Stepp, Sarah Stevenson, Eric Stewart, Roxanne Stith, Tim Stoessel, Jean Stotler, Sara Stramel, Larry Strayhorn, Franklin Sturkey, Ben Sullenger, Yolanda Sullivan, John Sutor, Wanda Sutphin, Sharon Swinburne, Stella Tang, Andrew Taylor, Ann Taylor, Donna Taylor, Ji Ji Thekkeveedu, Christopher Thome, Michael Thome, David Thompson, Tom Thompson, Ashli Thurston, Christopher Tokar, Dion Tomer, Clifford Trimble, Sergio Tromba, Adeline Trotter, James Turner, Jeffrey Turner, Owens Turner, Jr, Marilyn Twine, Lonnie Urquhart, Cheri Valverde, Mike Vammino, Carrie Van Hook, Katherine Vandenbrieje, Milca Vargas, Mary Vaughan, Robena Vaughan, Jessyca Venice, Kimberly Vest, Carol Viergutz, Maryann Villies, Patrice Vossler, Amada Wagoner, Stacy Waller, Gary Walton, Gretchen Ward, Kimberly Ward, Shelia Ward, Daniel Waxman, Christopher Weaver, Margaret Webb, Laura Weisiger, Stephany Whipple, David Whitley, Sarah Whitlock, Diane Wien, Robert T. Wiener, Christopher Wilcher, Mindy Williams, Vincent Williams, Hannah Wilson, Juanita Wilson, Ried Wilson, Charles Wiser, Sharon Wiser, Mark Woehler, Kenneth Womack, Emily Wong, Gregory Woods, Katheryn Woosley, Carol Wright, Jonathan Wright, Mary Wright, Thomas Wright, Timothy Wright, Jr, Leslie Yamnicky, Kenneth Yates, Jamie Young, Sandra Young, Robert Younie, II, Atef Zayd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Feinman, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
March 13, 2014 Filing 34 NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION to Sever Motion to Organize Plaintiffs Who Obtained Elantras After November 2,2012 for LItigation Purposes Separately From Those Who Obtained Elantras Prior to November 2, 2012 : previously set for 4/9/14 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Norman K. Moon in Charlottesville: Motion Hearing RESET for 5/14/2014 10:00 AM in Charlottesville before Judge Norman K. Moon. (hnw) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Continue Hearing. Hearing is rescheduled for May 14, 2014 at 10:00 AM in Charlottesville.. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/13/2014. (mab) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #27 MOTION for Karin Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/12/2014. (mab) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
March 11, 2014 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #29 MOTION to Stay Pending Approval of Nationwide Settlement (Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby). filed by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Neale, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
March 11, 2014 Filing 30 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #29 MOTION to Stay Pending Approval of Nationwide Settlement . filed by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Neale, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
March 11, 2014 Filing 29 MOTION to Stay Pending Approval of Nationwide Settlement by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Neale, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
March 10, 2014 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #27 MOTION for Karin Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. . filed by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Neale, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
March 10, 2014 Filing 27 MOTION for Karin Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Neale, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
March 6, 2014 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss (Supplemental Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby). filed by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Neale, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
March 6, 2014 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 22, #2 Exhibit 23, #3 Exhibit 24, #4 Exhibit 25, #5 Exhibit 26, #6 Exhibit 27, #7 Exhibit 28)(Neale, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
March 6, 2014 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Support re #10 MOTION to Continue Motion to Reschedule April 9, 2014 Hearing Date . filed by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Neale, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
March 6, 2014 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Sever Motion to Organize Plaintiffs Who Obtained Elantras After November 2,2012 for LItigation Purposes Separately From Those Who Obtained Elantras Prior to November 2, 2012 (Declaration of James F. Neale). filed by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Neale, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
March 6, 2014 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Sever Motion to Organize Plaintiffs Who Obtained Elantras After November 2,2012 for LItigation Purposes Separately From Those Who Obtained Elantras Prior to November 2, 2012 (Declaration of Shon Morgan). filed by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Neale, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
March 6, 2014 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Sever Motion to Organize Plaintiffs Who Obtained Elantras After November 2,2012 for LItigation Purposes Separately From Those Who Obtained Elantras Prior to November 2, 2012 (Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby). filed by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Neale, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
March 6, 2014 Filing 20 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Sever Motion to Organize Plaintiffs Who Obtained Elantras After November 2,2012 for LItigation Purposes Separately From Those Who Obtained Elantras Prior to November 2, 2012 . filed by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Neale, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 MOTION for Shon Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/6/14. (jcj) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
March 5, 2014 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #17 MOTION for Shon Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Exhibit A to Motion). filed by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Neale, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
March 5, 2014 Filing 17 MOTION for Shon Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Neale, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 MOTION for Joseph Robert Ashby to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 2/27/2014. (mab) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
February 26, 2014 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #14 MOTION for Joseph R. Ashby to Appear Pro Hac Vice. . filed by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Neale, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
February 26, 2014 Filing 14 MOTION for Joseph R. Ashby to Appear Pro Hac Vice. by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Neale, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
February 24, 2014 Filing 13 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #7 Brief / Memorandum in Support,, #8 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Matthew Abedi, Monica Adair Sargent, Jihad Adbul-Mumit, Mark Agee, Aliz Agoston, Yvonne Alston, Dan Amatruda, Kristy Ambrose, Kimberley Amick, Wanda G. Amos, Christopher Arauza, Carl Arsenault, Brooke Asher, Michelle Atkins, Raymond O. Atkins, Matthew Atwell, David Aub, Soha Ayyash, Asif Aziz, Susan Bailey, Hab Baker, III, Karen Baker, Terry Barnes, Joseph Bartell, Harry L. Barton, Benjamin Basham, James Basham, Matthew Basilone, John Baxter, John Beasley, Elizabeth Belevan, Barbara Bell, Judy Bender, Amine Berbale, James Berling, Timm Betcher, Sharon Bisdee, William Bonner, Walter Bordeaux, Gary Boyette, Karen Bradbury, Todd Bradbury, John Brancato, William Brewster, Lori Brodie, Gloria Brooks, Angela Brown, Else Brown, Gary Brown, Jeanne Brown, Melanie Brown, Sydney Brumbelow, Jan Burford, Sara Burruss, Jamie Burton, Joseph Caldarelli, Jason Call, Todd Carlson, Howard L. Carpenter, Cynthia Carter, Frederick Carter, Jacklyn Casselle-Tupponce, Jared Castro, Rebecca Catlett, Susan Cave, Kirt Chappelle, Roger Chesley, Jr, Linda Chesseboro, Steve Childress, Dan Cho, Sung Cho, Sung Chun, William Clark, Linda Clune, Stuart Cochran, Charles Cochrane, Angel Collins, Henry Shane Colvin, Karri Colvin, Carly Connelly, Angie Conner, Jeremy Conrad, Philip F. Corrao, Kimberly Crawford, Margaret Crittendon, April Crocker, William Cromer, Jay Cunningham, Mary Curtis, Robert Daniels, Boyd Davis, Donna Davis, Lisa Davis, Roger Davis, Michelle Debrosse, Michael Decanio, Alma Delia Deleon, Jennifer Demarco, Anthony Depaul, Jr, George D. Despert, III, Cynthia Devane, Ruth Diaz, Ron Dickman, Sheri Dixson, Sonya Dodson, Jesenia Dominguez, Terry Donaldson, Latavia Drew, Arlene Drewry, Christina Drugatz, Jeffery Drugatz, Karen Duncan, Sandra K. Dunton, Jeff Eddy, Deborah Edge, Deborah Edgefield, Pamela Edwards, Kasey Eike, Miriah Eisenman, Frederick Eitel, Sharon Ekstrand, Nicole Elsesser, Joseph Elton, Karen Evans, Mase Fabar, Floyd Fallin, Jr, Elizabeth Farrell, Margie D. Fauls, Caitlin Feeley, Barry Feldman, Brian Feldman, Wanda Ferguson, James Fickle, Shirley Fickle, Scott Flora, Thomas Robert Franco, John Franklin, Tammy Franklin, Anthony Frederick, Tracy Frederick, Thomas Freeze, Adam Furman, Alicia Fusco, Donna Gaddis, Guillermo Galarza, Ivan Galloway, Jr, Ida Garner, Willis M. Gary, Kurt Gergle, Tarun Ghai, Elaine Gibson, Helen Gillespie, Melody Gilley, Tanja Gilmore, Brian Glaub, Barry Goldberg, Scott Goodman, Richard Gould, Troy L. Graham, Gabriela Grajeda, Elizabeth Grant, Brandi Gray, Christie Gray, Janie Gray, Valerie Gray, Adam Grayberg, Ayndria Green, Diana Griffin, Paul L. Grover, Jessica Groves, Dedra Gueno, Carl Gussgard, Arnold Gutman, Julian Gutterman, Tessie Gutterman, Lisa Hagerty, Lauren Hagy, Cedon J. Haley, Jr, Dorothy Halpin, Nancy N. Hamlett, Erestine Harding, Deborah Hare, Aquisi Harris, Kendall Harris, Mary Harris, Patrice A. Harris, Brianna Harrison, Sharon Harrison, Sharon Hart, Lee Ann Hartmann, Patricia Hauser, Deanna Haverly, Leslie Hearn, Kathleen Hedrick, Amanda Heinlein, Charles Helms, Robert Hendrickson, Stephen Herman, James Herrington, William Hester, Jr, Debbie Hetterly, Nancy Hickman, Jeremy Hillberry, Greg E. Hines, Robert Hite, Brittany Hoban, Pam Hodges, Thurman Hodges, Christopher Hoehn, Timothy Holroyd, Carolyn Horchner, Jeffrey Horchner, Betty Hornick, Jennifer Horning, Major M. Horton, Bitsy House, Alyssa Hronowski, Teddy Huddleston, Jerry Hudson, Sr, Hubert Hughes, Shay Hunter, Mark Hustead, Carol Hutchinson, Nathen Illidge, George Ioannou, Frances Jacocks, Patricia Jacocks, Jason Jaffeux, Sally James, Ann Jansen, Stacey Jansen, Joyce Janto, Walter Jeffries, Janice Jenkins, Chelsea Johnson, Monica Johnson, Rasheedah Johnson, Todd Johnson, Derwood Johnston, John Johnstone, Christina Jones, Pamela Jones, Wilber B. Jones, Richard Jordan, Sandra Jordan, Sheryl Jordan, Jennifer Justice, Kim Keating, Cody Kelly, Teresa Kelly, Melanie Kenyon, John Kerr, Shea Kersey, Hannah Kight, William Kight, Mikyung Kim, Carolyn S. Kines, Larry King, Susan King, Vernon Kirby, Diana Kite, Edward Kizer, Patsy Kizer, John A. Knight, Connie Kniseley, Donna Knoell, Amanda Kozak, Tamara Krobert, Frank Kulovitz, Carl Kuri, Kelly Kusek, Victor C. Kvietkus, Brenda Lackey, Tammy Lackey, Mary Lang, Markus Lange, Catherine Lantz, Glenn Lavinder, Christopher Legendre, Barbara Leggett, David Lehman, Calvin Lewis, Gloria Lewis, Regina Lewis, Delores Lindblom, William Lipford, Ashley Lippolis-Aviles, Mike Littman, Billy Llewellyn, Robin Lovett, David W. Loving, Cyane Lowden, Ken Lu, Joshua Lubeck, Sandra Lubeck, Robert R. Lucas, Patricia Lyons, William Lyons, Christine Maccaslin, Anita Madison, John Malizia, Suzanne Malizia, Thomas Malone, Stanley Marcus, Charles Martin, Heather Matsey, James Matsey, Rodney Matthews, Shawna Mattocks, Matthew Mattro, Jeff May, Harold Mayhew, Jr, Shawn Maynor, Diandra Mayo, Robert McCarraher, Penny McCeney, Robert McClelland, Susan McClelland, Michael McClenning, Robert McCurdy, Joseph McDaniel, Susan McFadden, William McFadden, Mark McGinley, Richard McGruder, Victoria McGruder, Donald McIntire, Karen Meller, Carmen Mercado, Scott Meyers, Carol Mieggs, Christy Miller, David Miller, Ron Miller, Maria Ming Li, Mary Mitchell, Terrie Mitchell, Banks Mitchum, Benjamin Moher, David Molinari, Jung Moon, Karen Mooney, Bonnie Moore, Monte Morgan, Phillip Morgan, William Morgan, Bryon Moss, Suzanne Mowbray, David Mulligan, Mary Mulligan, Nancy Murray, Roger Myers, Patrick Nance, Dennis Negran, Pennie Newell, Glen Newitt, Jacqui Newitt, Edward Newman, Jr, Kevin Newsome, Reveredy Nicholson, Patricia Nicosia, Randall Nixon, Karen Nolan, Ryan Nolette, Bryan Nordquist, Sergei Novitsky, Jonathon O'Brien, William O'Flynn, Karen O'Neil, Adrian Odya-Weis, Dennis Oleary, John Olsen, Tana Rae Oropeza, Brian Osborne, Candace Owens, Lynn Page, Tanya Palik, Rona Palmer, Ashley Pannell, Harry Paulette, Tanya Peake, Donna Pearson, Richard Pearson, John Pedersen, Chris Pena, Roy Mason Pennington, III, Nicholas Perez, Greg Perigard, Kim Perkins, Mark Perry, Brady Peters, Karen Peters, Thomas Petit, Rebecca Petrella, Susan Petrie, Adrian Phillips, Jr, Anne Picciano, John Picciano, Carl Pierce, Sivathanu Pillai, Debra Pines, Charles Pinkard, Lilia Pinson, Arlove Plunkett, Timothy Pohlig, Denise Poindexter, Rachel Poliquin, Margaret Pomeroy, David Poore, III, Laura Potter, Kathy Powers, Linda Pratt, Bernard Presgraves, Jason Price, Denise Pryor, Joshua Pucci, Victoria Puckett, Sara Pullen, Tony Pulley, Cynthia Quattlebaum, Eva Ralston, William Ralston, Hannah Ramey, Jacqueline Randolph, Thomas Randolph, Michael Ranger, Brad Ransom, Nancy Ransome, Henry Requejo, David Reynolds, Rose Ricker, Danny Riddle, Robin Robert, Joshua Roberts, Mary Roberts, Annie Robinson, Antonio Robinson, Rocky Rockburn, Drew Roper, Troy Rosier, Eric Rothman, Brian Rowe, Juliet Rowland, John Rowley, Nancy Rowsey, Stephen Rubis, Kyle Russell, Jennifer Ryan, Thomas Ryder, Joseph Salazar, Randall Samples, Rebecca Samuelson, Thomas Sanchez, Aaron Sanders, Asok Kumar Sarkar, Tom Scarcella, Edward Scearce, Shane Schlesman, Wade Schwanke, Jr, Gwen Seal, Amy Seay, Bradley Seay, Charles Seltman, Patty Senter, Lynn Settle, Tim Seymour, Ronald Sharp, Ernest Sharpe, Shirley Shaw, Stephanie Shelor, Michelle Shifflett, Sandra Shifflett, June Shores, D. Shawn Shumake, Nina Sibert, Robert Silber, Christian Simmers, Mary Singhas, Randall Singhas, Amy Smith, Daphne Hope Smith, Lisa Smith, Stephen Smith, Suzanne Smith, Kristine Smolens, Howard Snyder, Wesley Songer, Emily Sparks, Brian Spencer, Svetlana Spencer, Patricia Spier, Lori Spik, Derek St. Onge, Ronald Stafford, Jonathan Starks, Mark Stephens, Terry Stepp, Sarah Stevenson, Eric Stewart, Roxanne Stith, Tim Stoessel, Jean Stotler, Sara Stramel, Larry Strayhorn, Franklin Sturkey, Ben Sullenger, Yolanda Sullivan, John Sutor, Wanda Sutphin, Sharon Swinburne, Stella Tang, Andrew Taylor, Ann Taylor, Donna Taylor, Ji Ji Thekkeveedu, Christopher Thome, Michael Thome, David Thompson, Tom Thompson, Ashli Thurston, Christopher Tokar, Dion Tomer, Clifford Trimble, Sergio Tromba, Adeline Trotter, James Turner, Jeffrey Turner, Owens Turner, Jr, Marilyn Twine, Lonnie Urquhart, Cheri Valverde, Mike Vammino, Carrie Van Hook, Katherine Vandenbrieje, Milca Vargas, Mary Vaughan, Robena Vaughan, Jessyca Venice, Kimberly Vest, Carol Viergutz, Maryann Villies, Patrice Vossler, Amada Wagoner, Stacy Waller, Gary Walton, Gretchen Ward, Kimberly Ward, Shelia Ward, Daniel Waxman, Christopher Weaver, Margaret Webb, Laura Weisiger, Stephany Whipple, David Whitley, Sarah Whitlock, Diane Wien, Robert T. Wiener, Christopher Wilcher, Mindy Williams, Vincent Williams, Hannah Wilson, Juanita Wilson, Ried Wilson, Charles Wiser, Sharon Wiser, Mark Woehler, Kenneth Womack, Emily Wong, Gregory Woods, Katheryn Woosley, Carol Wright, Jonathan Wright, Mary Wright, Thomas Wright, Timothy Wright, Jr, Leslie Yamnicky, Kenneth Yates, Jamie Young, Sandra Young, Robert Younie, II, Atef Zayd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Feinman, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
February 21, 2014 Filing 12 State Court Records from Circuit Court for the City of Roanoke, VA (Attachments: #1 Part two)(mab) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
February 18, 2014 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #9 MOTION to Sever Motion to Organize Plaintiffs Who Obtained Elantras After November 2,2012 for LItigation Purposes Separately From Those Who Obtained Elantras Prior to November 2, 2012, #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2014 10:00 AM in Charlottesville before Judge Norman K. Moon. (hnw) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
February 17, 2014 Filing 10 MOTION to Continue Motion to Reschedule April 9, 2014 Hearing Date by Matthew Abedi, Monica Adair Sargent, Jihad Adbul-Mumit, Mark Agee, Aliz Agoston, Yvonne Alston, Dan Amatruda, Kristy Ambrose, Kimberley Amick, Wanda G. Amos, Christopher Arauza, Carl Arsenault, Brooke Asher, Michelle Atkins, Raymond O. Atkins, Matthew Atwell, David Aub, Soha Ayyash, Asif Aziz, Susan Bailey, Hab Baker, III, Karen Baker, Terry Barnes, Joseph Bartell, Harry L. Barton, Benjamin Basham, James Basham, Matthew Basilone, John Baxter, John Beasley, Elizabeth Belevan, Barbara Bell, Judy Bender, Amine Berbale, James Berling, Timm Betcher, Sharon Bisdee, William Bonner, Walter Bordeaux, Gary Boyette, Karen Bradbury, Todd Bradbury, John Brancato, William Brewster, Lori Brodie, Gloria Brooks, Angela Brown, Else Brown, Gary Brown, Jeanne Brown, Melanie Brown, Sydney Brumbelow, Jan Burford, Sara Burruss, Jamie Burton, Joseph Caldarelli, Jason Call, Todd Carlson, Howard L. Carpenter, Cynthia Carter, Frederick Carter, Jacklyn Casselle-Tupponce, Jared Castro, Rebecca Catlett, Susan Cave, Kirt Chappelle, Roger Chesley, Jr, Linda Chesseboro, Steve Childress, Dan Cho, Sung Cho, Sung Chun, Circuit Court for the City of Roanoke, VA, William Clark, Linda Clune, Stuart Cochran, Charles Cochrane, Angel Collins, Henry Shane Colvin, Karri Colvin, Carly Connelly, Angie Conner, Jeremy Conrad, Philip F. Corrao, Kimberly Crawford, Margaret Crittendon, April Crocker, William Cromer, Jay Cunningham, Mary Curtis, Robert Daniels, Boyd Davis, Donna Davis, Lisa Davis, Roger Davis, Michelle Debrosse, Michael Decanio, Alma Delia Deleon, Jennifer Demarco, Anthony Depaul, Jr, George D. Despert, III, Cynthia Devane, Ruth Diaz, Ron Dickman, Sheri Dixson, Sonya Dodson, Jesenia Dominguez, Terry Donaldson, Latavia Drew, Arlene Drewry, Christina Drugatz, Jeffery Drugatz, Karen Duncan, Sandra K. Dunton, Jeff Eddy, Deborah Edge, Deborah Edgefield, Pamela Edwards, Kasey Eike, Miriah Eisenman, Frederick Eitel, Sharon Ekstrand, Nicole Elsesser, Joseph Elton, Karen Evans, Mase Fabar, Floyd Fallin, Jr, Elizabeth Farrell, Margie D. Fauls, Caitlin Feeley, Barry Feldman, Brian Feldman, Wanda Ferguson, James Fickle, Shirley Fickle, Scott Flora, Thomas Robert Franco, John Franklin, Tammy Franklin, Anthony Frederick, Tracy Frederick, Thomas Freeze, Adam Furman, Alicia Fusco, Donna Gaddis, Guillermo Galarza, Ivan Galloway, Jr, Ida Garner, Willis M. Gary, Kurt Gergle, Tarun Ghai, Elaine Gibson, Helen Gillespie, Melody Gilley, Tanja Gilmore, Brian Glaub, Barry Goldberg, Scott Goodman, Richard Gould, Troy L. Graham, Gabriela Grajeda, Elizabeth Grant, Brandi Gray, Christie Gray, Janie Gray, Valerie Gray, Adam Grayberg, Ayndria Green, Diana Griffin, Paul L. Grover, Jessica Groves, Dedra Gueno, Carl Gussgard, Arnold Gutman, Julian Gutterman, Tessie Gutterman, Lisa Hagerty, Lauren Hagy, Cedon J. Haley, Jr, Dorothy Halpin, Nancy N. Hamlett, Erestine Harding, Deborah Hare, Aquisi Harris, Kendall Harris, Mary Harris, Patrice A. Harris, Brianna Harrison, Sharon Harrison, Sharon Hart, Lee Ann Hartmann, Patricia Hauser, Deanna Haverly, Leslie Hearn, Kathleen Hedrick, Amanda Heinlein, Charles Helms, Robert Hendrickson, Stephen Herman, James Herrington, William Hester, Jr, Debbie Hetterly, Nancy Hickman, Jeremy Hillberry, Greg E. Hines, Robert Hite, Brittany Hoban, Pam Hodges, Thurman Hodges, Christopher Hoehn, Timothy Holroyd, Carolyn Horchner, Jeffrey Horchner, Betty Hornick, Jennifer Horning, Major M. Horton, Bitsy House, Alyssa Hronowski, Teddy Huddleston, Jerry Hudson, Sr, Hubert Hughes, Shay Hunter, Mark Hustead, Carol Hutchinson, Nathen Illidge, George Ioannou, Frances Jacocks, Patricia Jacocks, Jason Jaffeux, Sally James, Ann Jansen, Stacey Jansen, Joyce Janto, Walter Jeffries, Janice Jenkins, Chelsea Johnson, Monica Johnson, Rasheedah Johnson, Todd Johnson, Derwood Johnston, John Johnstone, Christina Jones, Pamela Jones, Wilber B. Jones, Richard Jordan, Sandra Jordan, Sheryl Jordan, Jennifer Justice, Kim Keating, Cody Kelly, Teresa Kelly, Melanie Kenyon, John Kerr, Shea Kersey, Hannah Kight, William Kight, Mikyung Kim, Carolyn S. Kines, Larry King, Susan King, Vernon Kirby, Diana Kite, Edward Kizer, Patsy Kizer, John A. Knight, Connie Kniseley, Donna Knoell, Amanda Kozak, Tamara Krobert, Frank Kulovitz, Carl Kuri, Kelly Kusek, Victor C. Kvietkus, Brenda Lackey, Tammy Lackey, Mary Lang, Markus Lange, Catherine Lantz, Glenn Lavinder, Christopher Legendre, Barbara Leggett, David Lehman, Calvin Lewis, Gloria Lewis, Regina Lewis, Delores Lindblom, William Lipford, Ashley Lippolis-Aviles, Mike Littman, Billy Llewellyn, Robin Lovett, David W. Loving, Cyane Lowden, Ken Lu, Joshua Lubeck, Sandra Lubeck, Robert R. Lucas, Patricia Lyons, William Lyons, Christine Maccaslin, Anita Madison, John Malizia, Suzanne Malizia, Thomas Malone, Stanley Marcus, Charles Martin, Heather Matsey, James Matsey, Rodney Matthews, Shawna Mattocks, Matthew Mattro, Jeff May, Harold Mayhew, Jr, Shawn Maynor, Diandra Mayo, Robert McCarraher, Penny McCeney, Robert McClelland, Susan McClelland, Michael McClenning, Robert McCurdy, Joseph McDaniel, Susan McFadden, William McFadden, Mark McGinley, Richard McGruder, Victoria McGruder, Donald McIntire, Karen Meller, Carmen Mercado, Scott Meyers, Carol Mieggs, Christy Miller, David Miller, Ron Miller, Maria Ming Li, Mary Mitchell, Terrie Mitchell, Banks Mitchum, Benjamin Moher, David Molinari, Jung Moon, Karen Mooney, Bonnie Moore, Monte Morgan, Phillip Morgan, William Morgan, Bryon Moss, Suzanne Mowbray, David Mulligan, Mary Mulligan, Nancy Murray, Roger Myers, Patrick Nance, Dennis Negran, Pennie Newell, Glen Newitt, Jacqui Newitt, Edward Newman, Jr, Kevin Newsome, Reveredy Nicholson, Patricia Nicosia, Randall Nixon, Karen Nolan, Ryan Nolette, Bryan Nordquist, Sergei Novitsky, Jonathon O'Brien, William O'Flynn, Karen O'Neil, Adrian Odya-Weis, Dennis Oleary, John Olsen, Tana Rae Oropeza, Brian Osborne, Candace Owens, Lynn Page, Tanya Palik, Rona Palmer, Ashley Pannell, Harry Paulette, Tanya Peake, Donna Pearson, Richard Pearson, John Pedersen, Chris Pena, Roy Mason Pennington, III, Nicholas Perez, Greg Perigard, Kim Perkins, Mark Perry, Brady Peters, Karen Peters, Thomas Petit, Rebecca Petrella, Susan Petrie, Adrian Phillips, Jr, Anne Picciano, John Picciano, Carl Pierce, Sivathanu Pillai, Debra Pines, Charles Pinkard, Lilia Pinson, Arlove Plunkett, Timothy Pohlig, Denise Poindexter, Rachel Poliquin, Margaret Pomeroy, David Poore, III, Laura Potter, Kathy Powers, Linda Pratt, Bernard Presgraves, Jason Price, Denise Pryor, Joshua Pucci, Victoria Puckett, Sara Pullen, Tony Pulley, Cynthia Quattlebaum, Eva Ralston, William Ralston, Hannah Ramey, Jacqueline Randolph, Thomas Randolph, Michael Ranger, Brad Ransom, Nancy Ransome, Henry Requejo, David Reynolds, Rose Ricker, Danny Riddle, Robin Robert, Joshua Roberts, Mary Roberts, Annie Robinson, Antonio Robinson, Rocky Rockburn, Drew Roper, Troy Rosier, Eric Rothman, Brian Rowe, Juliet Rowland, John Rowley, Nancy Rowsey, Stephen Rubis, Kyle Russell, Jennifer Ryan, Thomas Ryder, Joseph Salazar, Randall Samples, Rebecca Samuelson, Thomas Sanchez, Aaron Sanders, Asok Kumar Sarkar, Tom Scarcella, Edward Scearce, Shane Schlesman, Wade Schwanke, Jr, Gwen Seal, Amy Seay, Bradley Seay, Charles Seltman, Patty Senter, Lynn Settle, Tim Seymour, Ronald Sharp, Ernest Sharpe, Shirley Shaw, Stephanie Shelor, Michelle Shifflett, Sandra Shifflett, June Shores, D. Shawn Shumake, Nina Sibert, Robert Silber, Christian Simmers, Mary Singhas, Randall Singhas, Amy Smith, Daphne Hope Smith, Lisa Smith, Stephen Smith, Suzanne Smith, Kristine Smolens, Howard Snyder, Wesley Songer, Emily Sparks, Brian Spencer, Svetlana Spencer, Patricia Spier, Lori Spik, Derek St. Onge, Ronald Stafford, Jonathan Starks, Mark Stephens, Terry Stepp, Sarah Stevenson, Eric Stewart, Roxanne Stith, Tim Stoessel, Jean Stotler, Sara Stramel, Larry Strayhorn, Franklin Sturkey, Ben Sullenger, Yolanda Sullivan, John Sutor, Wanda Sutphin, Sharon Swinburne, Stella Tang, Andrew Taylor, Ann Taylor, Donna Taylor, Ji Ji Thekkeveedu, Christopher Thome, Michael Thome, David Thompson, Tom Thompson, Ashli Thurston, Christopher Tokar, Dion Tomer, Clifford Trimble, Sergio Tromba, Adeline Trotter, James Turner, Jeffrey Turner, Owens Turner, Jr, Marilyn Twine, Lonnie Urquhart, Cheri Valverde, Mike Vammino, Carrie Van Hook, Katherine Vandenbrieje, Milca Vargas, Mary Vaughan, Robena Vaughan, Jessyca Venice, Kimberly Vest, Carol Viergutz, Maryann Villies, Patrice Vossler, Amada Wagoner, Stacy Waller, Gary Walton, Gretchen Ward, Kimberly Ward, Shelia Ward, Daniel Waxman, Christopher Weaver, Margaret Webb, Laura Weisiger, Stephany Whipple, David Whitley, Sarah Whitlock, Diane Wien, Robert T. Wiener, Christopher Wilcher, Mindy Williams, Vincent Williams, Hannah Wilson, Juanita Wilson, Ried Wilson, Charles Wiser, Sharon Wiser, Mark Woehler, Kenneth Womack, Emily Wong, Gregory Woods, Katheryn Woosley, Carol Wright, Jonathan Wright, Mary Wright, Thomas Wright, Timothy Wright, Jr, Leslie Yamnicky, Kenneth Yates, Jamie Young, Sandra Young, Robert Younie, II, Atef Zayd. (Feinman, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
February 17, 2014 Filing 9 MOTION to Sever Motion to Organize Plaintiffs Who Obtained Elantras After November 2,2012 for LItigation Purposes Separately From Those Who Obtained Elantras Prior to November 2, 2012 by Matthew Abedi, Monica Adair Sargent, Jihad Adbul-Mumit, Mark Agee, Aliz Agoston, Yvonne Alston, Dan Amatruda, Kristy Ambrose, Kimberley Amick, Wanda G. Amos, Christopher Arauza, Carl Arsenault, Brooke Asher, Michelle Atkins, Raymond O. Atkins, Matthew Atwell, David Aub, Soha Ayyash, Asif Aziz, Susan Bailey, Hab Baker, III, Karen Baker, Terry Barnes, Joseph Bartell, Harry L. Barton, Benjamin Basham, James Basham, Matthew Basilone, John Baxter, John Beasley, Elizabeth Belevan, Barbara Bell, Judy Bender, Amine Berbale, James Berling, Timm Betcher, Sharon Bisdee, William Bonner, Walter Bordeaux, Gary Boyette, Karen Bradbury, Todd Bradbury, John Brancato, William Brewster, Lori Brodie, Gloria Brooks, Angela Brown, Else Brown, Gary Brown, Jeanne Brown, Melanie Brown, Sydney Brumbelow, Jan Burford, Sara Burruss, Jamie Burton, Joseph Caldarelli, Jason Call, Todd Carlson, Howard L. Carpenter, Cynthia Carter, Frederick Carter, Jacklyn Casselle-Tupponce, Jared Castro, Rebecca Catlett, Susan Cave, Kirt Chappelle, Roger Chesley, Jr, Linda Chesseboro, Steve Childress, Dan Cho, Sung Cho, Sung Chun, Circuit Court for the City of Roanoke, VA, William Clark, Linda Clune, Stuart Cochran, Charles Cochrane, Angel Collins, Henry Shane Colvin, Karri Colvin, Carly Connelly, Angie Conner, Jeremy Conrad, Philip F. Corrao, Kimberly Crawford, Margaret Crittendon, April Crocker, William Cromer, Jay Cunningham, Mary Curtis, Robert Daniels, Boyd Davis, Donna Davis, Lisa Davis, Roger Davis, Michelle Debrosse, Michael Decanio, Alma Delia Deleon, Jennifer Demarco, Anthony Depaul, Jr, George D. Despert, III, Cynthia Devane, Ruth Diaz, Ron Dickman, Sheri Dixson, Sonya Dodson, Jesenia Dominguez, Terry Donaldson, Latavia Drew, Arlene Drewry, Christina Drugatz, Jeffery Drugatz, Karen Duncan, Sandra K. Dunton, Jeff Eddy, Deborah Edge, Deborah Edgefield, Pamela Edwards, Kasey Eike, Miriah Eisenman, Frederick Eitel, Sharon Ekstrand, Nicole Elsesser, Joseph Elton, Karen Evans, Mase Fabar, Floyd Fallin, Jr, Elizabeth Farrell, Margie D. Fauls, Caitlin Feeley, Barry Feldman, Brian Feldman, Wanda Ferguson, James Fickle, Shirley Fickle, Scott Flora, Thomas Robert Franco, John Franklin, Tammy Franklin, Anthony Frederick, Tracy Frederick, Thomas Freeze, Adam Furman, Alicia Fusco, Donna Gaddis, Guillermo Galarza, Ivan Galloway, Jr, Ida Garner, Willis M. Gary, Kurt Gergle, Tarun Ghai, Elaine Gibson, Helen Gillespie, Melody Gilley, Tanja Gilmore, Brian Glaub, Barry Goldberg, Scott Goodman, Richard Gould, Troy L. Graham, Gabriela Grajeda, Elizabeth Grant, Brandi Gray, Christie Gray, Janie Gray, Valerie Gray, Adam Grayberg, Ayndria Green, Diana Griffin, Paul L. Grover, Jessica Groves, Dedra Gueno, Carl Gussgard, Arnold Gutman, Julian Gutterman, Tessie Gutterman, Lisa Hagerty, Lauren Hagy, Cedon J. Haley, Jr, Dorothy Halpin, Nancy N. Hamlett, Erestine Harding, Deborah Hare, Aquisi Harris, Kendall Harris, Mary Harris, Patrice A. Harris, Brianna Harrison, Sharon Harrison, Sharon Hart, Lee Ann Hartmann, Patricia Hauser, Deanna Haverly, Leslie Hearn, Kathleen Hedrick, Amanda Heinlein, Charles Helms, Robert Hendrickson, Stephen Herman, James Herrington, William Hester, Jr, Debbie Hetterly, Nancy Hickman, Jeremy Hillberry, Greg E. Hines, Robert Hite, Brittany Hoban, Pam Hodges, Thurman Hodges, Christopher Hoehn, Timothy Holroyd, Carolyn Horchner, Jeffrey Horchner, Betty Hornick, Jennifer Horning, Major M. Horton, Bitsy House, Alyssa Hronowski, Teddy Huddleston, Jerry Hudson, Sr, Hubert Hughes, Shay Hunter, Mark Hustead, Carol Hutchinson, Nathen Illidge, George Ioannou, Frances Jacocks, Patricia Jacocks, Jason Jaffeux, Sally James, Ann Jansen, Stacey Jansen, Joyce Janto, Walter Jeffries, Janice Jenkins, Chelsea Johnson, Monica Johnson, Rasheedah Johnson, Todd Johnson, Derwood Johnston, John Johnstone, Christina Jones, Pamela Jones, Wilber B. Jones, Richard Jordan, Sandra Jordan, Sheryl Jordan, Jennifer Justice, Kim Keating, Cody Kelly, Teresa Kelly, Melanie Kenyon, John Kerr, Shea Kersey, Hannah Kight, William Kight, Mikyung Kim, Carolyn S. Kines, Larry King, Susan King, Vernon Kirby, Diana Kite, Edward Kizer, Patsy Kizer, John A. Knight, Connie Kniseley, Donna Knoell, Amanda Kozak, Tamara Krobert, Frank Kulovitz, Carl Kuri, Kelly Kusek, Victor C. Kvietkus, Brenda Lackey, Tammy Lackey, Mary Lang, Markus Lange, Catherine Lantz, Glenn Lavinder, Christopher Legendre, Barbara Leggett, David Lehman, Calvin Lewis, Gloria Lewis, Regina Lewis, Delores Lindblom, William Lipford, Ashley Lippolis-Aviles, Mike Littman, Billy Llewellyn, Robin Lovett, David W. Loving, Cyane Lowden, Ken Lu, Joshua Lubeck, Sandra Lubeck, Robert R. Lucas, Patricia Lyons, William Lyons, Christine Maccaslin, Anita Madison, John Malizia, Suzanne Malizia, Thomas Malone, Stanley Marcus, Charles Martin, Heather Matsey, James Matsey, Rodney Matthews, Shawna Mattocks, Matthew Mattro, Jeff May, Harold Mayhew, Jr, Shawn Maynor, Diandra Mayo, Robert McCarraher, Penny McCeney, Robert McClelland, Susan McClelland, Michael McClenning, Robert McCurdy, Joseph McDaniel, Susan McFadden, William McFadden, Mark McGinley, Richard McGruder, Victoria McGruder, Donald McIntire, Karen Meller, Carmen Mercado, Scott Meyers, Carol Mieggs, Christy Miller, David Miller, Ron Miller, Maria Ming Li, Mary Mitchell, Terrie Mitchell, Banks Mitchum, Benjamin Moher, David Molinari, Jung Moon, Karen Mooney, Bonnie Moore, Monte Morgan, Phillip Morgan, William Morgan, Bryon Moss, Suzanne Mowbray, David Mulligan, Mary Mulligan, Nancy Murray, Roger Myers, Patrick Nance, Dennis Negran, Pennie Newell, Glen Newitt, Jacqui Newitt, Edward Newman, Jr, Kevin Newsome, Reveredy Nicholson, Patricia Nicosia, Randall Nixon, Karen Nolan, Ryan Nolette, Bryan Nordquist, Sergei Novitsky, Jonathon O'Brien, William O'Flynn, Karen O'Neil, Adrian Odya-Weis, Dennis Oleary, John Olsen, Tana Rae Oropeza, Brian Osborne, Candace Owens, Lynn Page, Tanya Palik, Rona Palmer, Ashley Pannell, Harry Paulette, Tanya Peake, Donna Pearson, Richard Pearson, John Pedersen, Chris Pena, Roy Mason Pennington, III, Nicholas Perez, Greg Perigard, Kim Perkins, Mark Perry, Brady Peters, Karen Peters, Thomas Petit, Rebecca Petrella, Susan Petrie, Adrian Phillips, Jr, Anne Picciano, John Picciano, Carl Pierce, Sivathanu Pillai, Debra Pines, Charles Pinkard, Lilia Pinson, Arlove Plunkett, Timothy Pohlig, Denise Poindexter, Rachel Poliquin, Margaret Pomeroy, David Poore, III, Laura Potter, Kathy Powers, Linda Pratt, Bernard Presgraves, Jason Price, Denise Pryor, Joshua Pucci, Victoria Puckett, Sara Pullen, Tony Pulley, Cynthia Quattlebaum, Eva Ralston, William Ralston, Hannah Ramey, Jacqueline Randolph, Thomas Randolph, Michael Ranger, Brad Ransom, Nancy Ransome, Henry Requejo, David Reynolds, Rose Ricker, Danny Riddle, Robin Robert, Joshua Roberts, Mary Roberts, Annie Robinson, Antonio Robinson, Rocky Rockburn, Drew Roper, Troy Rosier, Eric Rothman, Brian Rowe, Juliet Rowland, John Rowley, Nancy Rowsey, Stephen Rubis, Kyle Russell, Jennifer Ryan, Thomas Ryder, Joseph Salazar, Randall Samples, Rebecca Samuelson, Thomas Sanchez, Aaron Sanders, Asok Kumar Sarkar, Tom Scarcella, Edward Scearce, Shane Schlesman, Wade Schwanke, Jr, Gwen Seal, Amy Seay, Bradley Seay, Charles Seltman, Patty Senter, Lynn Settle, Tim Seymour, Ronald Sharp, Ernest Sharpe, Shirley Shaw, Stephanie Shelor, Michelle Shifflett, Sandra Shifflett, June Shores, D. Shawn Shumake, Nina Sibert, Robert Silber, Christian Simmers, Mary Singhas, Randall Singhas, Amy Smith, Daphne Hope Smith, Lisa Smith, Stephen Smith, Suzanne Smith, Kristine Smolens, Howard Snyder, Wesley Songer, Emily Sparks, Brian Spencer, Svetlana Spencer, Patricia Spier, Lori Spik, Derek St. Onge, Ronald Stafford, Jonathan Starks, Mark Stephens, Terry Stepp, Sarah Stevenson, Eric Stewart, Roxanne Stith, Tim Stoessel, Jean Stotler, Sara Stramel, Larry Strayhorn, Franklin Sturkey, Ben Sullenger, Yolanda Sullivan, John Sutor, Wanda Sutphin, Sharon Swinburne, Stella Tang, Andrew Taylor, Ann Taylor, Donna Taylor, Ji Ji Thekkeveedu, Christopher Thome, Michael Thome, David Thompson, Tom Thompson, Ashli Thurston, Christopher Tokar, Dion Tomer, Clifford Trimble, Sergio Tromba, Adeline Trotter, James Turner, Jeffrey Turner, Owens Turner, Jr, Marilyn Twine, Lonnie Urquhart, Cheri Valverde, Mike Vammino, Carrie Van Hook, Katherine Vandenbrieje, Milca Vargas, Mary Vaughan, Robena Vaughan, Jessyca Venice, Kimberly Vest, Carol Viergutz, Maryann Villies, Patrice Vossler, Amada Wagoner, Stacy Waller, Gary Walton, Gretchen Ward, Kimberly Ward, Shelia Ward, Daniel Waxman, Christopher Weaver, Margaret Webb, Laura Weisiger, Stephany Whipple, David Whitley, Sarah Whitlock, Diane Wien, Robert T. Wiener, Christopher Wilcher, Mindy Williams, Vincent Williams, Hannah Wilson, Juanita Wilson, Ried Wilson, Charles Wiser, Sharon Wiser, Mark Woehler, Kenneth Womack, Emily Wong, Gregory Woods, Katheryn Woosley, Carol Wright, Jonathan Wright, Mary Wright, Thomas Wright, Timothy Wright, Jr, Leslie Yamnicky, Kenneth Yates, Jamie Young, Sandra Young, Robert Younie, II, Atef Zayd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One)(Feinman, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
February 10, 2014 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss (Declaration of Joseph R. Ashby). filed by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Neale, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
February 10, 2014 Filing 7 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21)(Neale, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
February 10, 2014 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Neale, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
February 7, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE by Matthew Abedi, Monica Adair Sargent, Jihad Adbul-Mumit, Mark Agee, Aliz Agoston, Yvonne Alston, Dan Amatruda, Kristy Ambrose, Kimberley Amick, Wanda G. Amos, Christopher Arauza, Carl Arsenault, Brooke Asher, Michelle Atkins, Raymond O. Atkins, Matthew Atwell, David Aub, Soha Ayyash, Asif Aziz, Susan Bailey, Hab Baker, III, Karen Baker, Terry Barnes, Joseph Bartell, Harry L. Barton, Benjamin Basham, James Basham, Matthew Basilone, John Baxter, John Beasley, Elizabeth Belevan, Barbara Bell, Judy Bender, Amine Berbale, James Berling, Timm Betcher, Sharon Bisdee, William Bonner, Walter Bordeaux, Gary Boyette, Karen Bradbury, Todd Bradbury, John Brancato, William Brewster, Lori Brodie, Gloria Brooks, Angela Brown, Else Brown, Gary Brown, Jeanne Brown, Melanie Brown, Sydney Brumbelow, Jan Burford, Sara Burruss, Jamie Burton, Joseph Caldarelli, Jason Call, Todd Carlson, Howard L. Carpenter, Cynthia Carter, Frederick Carter, Jacklyn Casselle-Tupponce, Jared Castro, Rebecca Catlett, Susan Cave, Kirt Chappelle, Roger Chesley, Jr, Linda Chesseboro, Steve Childress, Dan Cho, Sung Cho, Sung Chun, William Clark, Linda Clune, Stuart Cochran, Charles Cochrane, Angel Collins, Henry Shane Colvin, Karri Colvin, Carly Connelly, Angie Conner, Jeremy Conrad, Philip F. Corrao, Kimberly Crawford, Margaret Crittendon, April Crocker, William Cromer, Jay Cunningham, Mary Curtis, Robert Daniels, Boyd Davis, Donna Davis, Lisa Davis, Roger Davis, Michelle Debrosse, Michael Decanio, Alma Delia Deleon, Jennifer Demarco, Anthony Depaul, Jr, George D. Despert, III, Cynthia Devane, Ruth Diaz, Ron Dickman, Sheri Dixson, Sonya Dodson, Jesenia Dominguez, Terry Donaldson, Latavia Drew, Arlene Drewry, Christina Drugatz, Jeffery Drugatz, Karen Duncan, Sandra K. Dunton, Jeff Eddy, Deborah Edge, Deborah Edgefield, Pamela Edwards, Kasey Eike, Miriah Eisenman, Frederick Eitel, Sharon Ekstrand, Nicole Elsesser, Joseph Elton, Karen Evans, Mase Fabar, Floyd Fallin, Jr, Elizabeth Farrell, Margie D. Fauls, Caitlin Feeley, Barry Feldman, Brian Feldman, Wanda Ferguson, James Fickle, Shirley Fickle, Scott Flora, Thomas Robert Franco, John Franklin, Tammy Franklin, Anthony Frederick, Tracy Frederick, Thomas Freeze, Adam Furman, Alicia Fusco, Donna Gaddis, Guillermo Galarza, Ivan Galloway, Jr, Ida Garner, Willis M. Gary, Kurt Gergle, Tarun Ghai, Elaine Gibson, Helen Gillespie, Melody Gilley, Tanja Gilmore, Brian Glaub, Barry Goldberg, Scott Goodman, Richard Gould, Troy L. Graham, Gabriela Grajeda, Elizabeth Grant, Brandi Gray, Christie Gray, Janie Gray, Valerie Gray, Adam Grayberg, Ayndria Green, Diana Griffin, Paul L. Grover, Jessica Groves, Dedra Gueno, Carl Gussgard, Arnold Gutman, Julian Gutterman, Tessie Gutterman, Lisa Hagerty, Lauren Hagy, Cedon J. Haley, Jr, Dorothy Halpin, Nancy N. Hamlett, Erestine Harding, Deborah Hare, Aquisi Harris, Kendall Harris, Mary Harris, Patrice A. Harris, Brianna Harrison, Sharon Harrison, Sharon Hart, Lee Ann Hartmann, Patricia Hauser, Deanna Haverly, Leslie Hearn, Kathleen Hedrick, Amanda Heinlein, Charles Helms, Robert Hendrickson, Stephen Herman, James Herrington, William Hester, Jr, Debbie Hetterly, Nancy Hickman, Jeremy Hillberry, Greg E. Hines, Robert Hite, Brittany Hoban, Pam Hodges, Thurman Hodges, Christopher Hoehn, Timothy Holroyd, Carolyn Horchner, Jeffrey Horchner, Betty Hornick, Jennifer Horning, Major M. Horton, Bitsy House, Alyssa Hronowski, Teddy Huddleston, Jerry Hudson, Sr, Hubert Hughes, Shay Hunter, Mark Hustead, Carol Hutchinson, Nathen Illidge, George Ioannou, Frances Jacocks, Patricia Jacocks, Jason Jaffeux, Sally James, Ann Jansen, Stacey Jansen, Joyce Janto, Walter Jeffries, Janice Jenkins, Chelsea Johnson, Monica Johnson, Rasheedah Johnson, Todd Johnson, Derwood Johnston, John Johnstone, Christina Jones, Pamela Jones, Wilber B. Jones, Richard Jordan, Sandra Jordan, Sheryl Jordan, Jennifer Justice, Kim Keating, Cody Kelly, Teresa Kelly, Melanie Kenyon, John Kerr, Shea Kersey, Hannah Kight, William Kight, Mikyung Kim, Carolyn S. Kines, Larry King, Susan King, Vernon Kirby, Diana Kite, Edward Kizer, Patsy Kizer, John A. Knight, Connie Kniseley, Donna Knoell, Amanda Kozak, Tamara Krobert, Frank Kulovitz, Carl Kuri, Kelly Kusek, Victor C. Kvietkus, Brenda Lackey, Tammy Lackey, Mary Lang, Markus Lange, Catherine Lantz, Glenn Lavinder, Christopher Legendre, Barbara Leggett, David Lehman, Calvin Lewis, Gloria Lewis, Regina Lewis, Delores Lindblom, William Lipford, Ashley Lippolis-Aviles, Mike Littman, Billy Llewellyn, Robin Lovett, David W. Loving, Cyane Lowden, Ken Lu, Joshua Lubeck, Sandra Lubeck, Robert R. Lucas, Patricia Lyons, William Lyons, Christine Maccaslin, Anita Madison, John Malizia, Suzanne Malizia, Thomas Malone, Stanley Marcus, Charles Martin, Heather Matsey, James Matsey, Rodney Matthews, Shawna Mattocks, Matthew Mattro, Jeff May, Harold Mayhew, Jr, Shawn Maynor, Diandra Mayo, Robert McCarraher, Penny McCeney, Robert McClelland, Susan McClelland, Michael McClenning, Robert McCurdy, Joseph McDaniel, Susan McFadden, William McFadden, Mark McGinley, Richard McGruder, Victoria McGruder, Donald McIntire, Karen Meller, Carmen Mercado, Scott Meyers, Carol Mieggs, Christy Miller, David Miller, Ron Miller, Maria Ming Li, Mary Mitchell, Terrie Mitchell, Banks Mitchum, Benjamin Moher, David Molinari, Jung Moon, Karen Mooney, Bonnie Moore, Monte Morgan, Phillip Morgan, William Morgan, Bryon Moss, Suzanne Mowbray, David Mulligan, Mary Mulligan, Nancy Murray, Roger Myers, Patrick Nance, Dennis Negran, Pennie Newell, Glen Newitt, Jacqui Newitt, Edward Newman, Jr, Kevin Newsome, Reveredy Nicholson, Patricia Nicosia, Randall Nixon, Karen Nolan, Ryan Nolette, Bryan Nordquist, Sergei Novitsky, Jonathon O'Brien, William O'Flynn, Karen O'Neil, Adrian Odya-Weis, Dennis Oleary, John Olsen, Tana Rae Oropeza, Brian Osborne, Candace Owens, Lynn Page, Tanya Palik, Rona Palmer, Ashley Pannell, Harry Paulette, Tanya Peake, Donna Pearson, Richard Pearson, John Pedersen, Chris Pena, Roy Mason Pennington, III, Nicholas Perez, Greg Perigard, Kim Perkins, Mark Perry, Brady Peters, Karen Peters, Thomas Petit, Rebecca Petrella, Susan Petrie, Adrian Phillips, Jr, Anne Picciano, John Picciano, Carl Pierce, Sivathanu Pillai, Debra Pines, Charles Pinkard, Lilia Pinson, Arlove Plunkett, Timothy Pohlig, Denise Poindexter, Rachel Poliquin, Margaret Pomeroy, David Poore, III, Laura Potter, Kathy Powers, Linda Pratt, Bernard Presgraves, Jason Price, Denise Pryor, Joshua Pucci, Victoria Puckett, Sara Pullen, Tony Pulley, Cynthia Quattlebaum, Eva Ralston, William Ralston, Hannah Ramey, Jacqueline Randolph, Thomas Randolph, Michael Ranger, Brad Ransom, Nancy Ransome, Henry Requejo, David Reynolds, Rose Ricker, Danny Riddle, Robin Robert, Joshua Roberts, Mary Roberts, Annie Robinson, Antonio Robinson, Rocky Rockburn, Drew Roper, Troy Rosier, Eric Rothman, Brian Rowe, Juliet Rowland, John Rowley, Nancy Rowsey, Stephen Rubis, Kyle Russell, Jennifer Ryan, Thomas Ryder, Joseph Salazar, Randall Samples, Rebecca Samuelson, Thomas Sanchez, Aaron Sanders, Asok Kumar Sarkar, Tom Scarcella, Edward Scearce, Shane Schlesman, Wade Schwanke, Jr, Gwen Seal, Amy Seay, Bradley Seay, Charles Seltman, Patty Senter, Lynn Settle, Tim Seymour, Ronald Sharp, Ernest Sharpe, Shirley Shaw, Stephanie Shelor, Michelle Shifflett, Sandra Shifflett, June Shores, D. Shawn Shumake, Nina Sibert, Robert Silber, Christian Simmers, Mary Singhas, Randall Singhas, Amy Smith, Daphne Hope Smith, Lisa Smith, Stephen Smith, Suzanne Smith, Kristine Smolens, Howard Snyder, Wesley Songer, Emily Sparks, Brian Spencer, Svetlana Spencer, Patricia Spier, Lori Spik, Derek St. Onge, Ronald Stafford, Jonathan Starks, Mark Stephens, Terry Stepp, Sarah Stevenson, Eric Stewart, Roxanne Stith, Tim Stoessel, Jean Stotler, Sara Stramel, Larry Strayhorn, Franklin Sturkey, Ben Sullenger, Yolanda Sullivan, John Sutor, Wanda Sutphin, Sharon Swinburne, Stella Tang, Andrew Taylor, Ann Taylor, Donna Taylor, Ji Ji Thekkeveedu, Christopher Thome, Michael Thome, David Thompson, Tom Thompson, Ashli Thurston, Christopher Tokar, Dion Tomer, Clifford Trimble, Sergio Tromba, Adeline Trotter, James Turner, Jeffrey Turner, Owens Turner, Jr, Marilyn Twine, Lonnie Urquhart, Cheri Valverde, Mike Vammino, Carrie Van Hook, Katherine Vandenbrieje, Milca Vargas, Mary Vaughan, Robena Vaughan, Jessyca Venice, Kimberly Vest, Carol Viergutz, Maryann Villies, Patrice Vossler, Amada Wagoner, Stacy Waller, Gary Walton, Gretchen Ward, Kimberly Ward, Shelia Ward, Daniel Waxman, Christopher Weaver, Margaret Webb, Laura Weisiger, Stephany Whipple, David Whitley, Sarah Whitlock, Diane Wien, Robert T. Wiener, Christopher Wilcher, Mindy Williams, Vincent Williams, Hannah Wilson, Juanita Wilson, Ried Wilson, Charles Wiser, Sharon Wiser, Mark Woehler, Kenneth Womack, Emily Wong, Gregory Woods, Katheryn Woosley, Carol Wright, Jonathan Wright, Mary Wright, Thomas Wright, Timothy Wright, Jr, Leslie Yamnicky, Kenneth Yates, Jamie Young, Sandra Young, Robert Younie, II, Atef Zayd of Filing in JPML (Attachments: #1 Exhibit JPML Order)(Feinman, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
February 7, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE by Matthew Abedi, Monica Adair Sargent, Jihad Adbul-Mumit, Mark Agee, Aliz Agoston, Yvonne Alston, Dan Amatruda, Kristy Ambrose, Kimberley Amick, Wanda G. Amos, Christopher Arauza, Carl Arsenault, Brooke Asher, Michelle Atkins, Raymond O. Atkins, Matthew Atwell, David Aub, Soha Ayyash, Asif Aziz, Susan Bailey, Hab Baker, III, Karen Baker, Terry Barnes, Joseph Bartell, Harry L. Barton, Benjamin Basham, James Basham, Matthew Basilone, John Baxter, John Beasley, Elizabeth Belevan, Barbara Bell, Judy Bender, Amine Berbale, James Berling, Timm Betcher, Sharon Bisdee, William Bonner, Walter Bordeaux, Gary Boyette, Karen Bradbury, Todd Bradbury, John Brancato, William Brewster, Lori Brodie, Gloria Brooks, Angela Brown, Else Brown, Gary Brown, Jeanne Brown, Melanie Brown, Sydney Brumbelow, Jan Burford, Sara Burruss, Jamie Burton, Joseph Caldarelli, Jason Call, Todd Carlson, Howard L. Carpenter, Cynthia Carter, Frederick Carter, Jacklyn Casselle-Tupponce, Jared Castro, Rebecca Catlett, Susan Cave, Kirt Chappelle, Roger Chesley, Jr, Linda Chesseboro, Steve Childress, Dan Cho, Sung Cho, Sung Chun, William Clark, Linda Clune, Stuart Cochran, Charles Cochrane, Angel Collins, Henry Shane Colvin, Karri Colvin, Carly Connelly, Angie Conner, Jeremy Conrad, Philip F. Corrao, Kimberly Crawford, Margaret Crittendon, April Crocker, William Cromer, Jay Cunningham, Mary Curtis, Robert Daniels, Boyd Davis, Donna Davis, Lisa Davis, Roger Davis, Michelle Debrosse, Michael Decanio, Alma Delia Deleon, Jennifer Demarco, Anthony Depaul, Jr, George D. Despert, III, Cynthia Devane, Ruth Diaz, Ron Dickman, Sheri Dixson, Sonya Dodson, Jesenia Dominguez, Terry Donaldson, Latavia Drew, Arlene Drewry, Christina Drugatz, Jeffery Drugatz, Karen Duncan, Duncan Imports, Inc., Sandra K. Dunton, Jeff Eddy, Deborah Edge, Deborah Edgefield, Pamela Edwards, Kasey Eike, Miriah Eisenman, Frederick Eitel, Sharon Ekstrand, Nicole Elsesser, Joseph Elton, Karen Evans, Mase Fabar, Floyd Fallin, Jr, Elizabeth Farrell, Margie D. Fauls, Caitlin Feeley, Barry Feldman, Brian Feldman, Wanda Ferguson, James Fickle, Shirley Fickle, Scott Flora, Thomas Robert Franco, John Franklin, Tammy Franklin, Anthony Frederick, Tracy Frederick, Thomas Freeze, Adam Furman, Alicia Fusco, Donna Gaddis, Guillermo Galarza, Ivan Galloway, Jr, Ida Garner, Willis M. Gary, Kurt Gergle, Tarun Ghai, Elaine Gibson, Helen Gillespie, Melody Gilley, Tanja Gilmore, Brian Glaub, Barry Goldberg, Scott Goodman, Richard Gould, Troy L. Graham, Gabriela Grajeda, Elizabeth Grant, Brandi Gray, Christie Gray, Janie Gray, Valerie Gray, Adam Grayberg, Ayndria Green, Diana Griffin, Paul L. Grover, Jessica Groves, Dedra Gueno, Carl Gussgard, Arnold Gutman, Julian Gutterman, Tessie Gutterman, Lisa Hagerty, Lauren Hagy, Cedon J. Haley, Jr, Dorothy Halpin, Nancy N. Hamlett, Erestine Harding, Deborah Hare, Aquisi Harris, Kendall Harris, Mary Harris, Patrice A. Harris, Brianna Harrison, Sharon Harrison, Sharon Hart, Lee Ann Hartmann, Patricia Hauser, Deanna Haverly, Leslie Hearn, Kathleen Hedrick, Amanda Heinlein, Charles Helms, Robert Hendrickson, Stephen Herman, James Herrington, William Hester, Jr, Debbie Hetterly, Nancy Hickman, Jeremy Hillberry, Greg E. Hines, Robert Hite, Brittany Hoban, Pam Hodges, Thurman Hodges, Christopher Hoehn, Timothy Holroyd, Carolyn Horchner, Jeffrey Horchner, Betty Hornick, Jennifer Horning, Major M. Horton, Bitsy House, Alyssa Hronowski, Teddy Huddleston, Jerry Hudson, Sr, Hubert Hughes, Shay Hunter, Mark Hustead, Carol Hutchinson, Nathen Illidge, George Ioannou, Frances Jacocks, Patricia Jacocks, Jason Jaffeux, Sally James, Ann Jansen, Stacey Jansen, Joyce Janto, Walter Jeffries, Janice Jenkins, Chelsea Johnson, Monica Johnson, Rasheedah Johnson, Todd Johnson, Derwood Johnston, John Johnstone, Christina Jones, Pamela Jones, Wilber B. Jones, Richard Jordan, Sandra Jordan, Sheryl Jordan, Jennifer Justice, Kim Keating, Cody Kelly, Teresa Kelly, Melanie Kenyon, John Kerr, Shea Kersey, Hannah Kight, William Kight, Mikyung Kim, Carolyn S. Kines, Larry King, Susan King, Vernon Kirby, Diana Kite, Edward Kizer, Patsy Kizer, John A. Knight, Connie Kniseley, Donna Knoell, Amanda Kozak, Tamara Krobert, Frank Kulovitz, Carl Kuri, Kelly Kusek, Victor C. Kvietkus, Brenda Lackey, Tammy Lackey, Mary Lang, Markus Lange, Catherine Lantz, Glenn Lavinder, Christopher Legendre, Barbara Leggett, David Lehman, Calvin Lewis, Gloria Lewis, Regina Lewis, Delores Lindblom, William Lipford, Ashley Lippolis-Aviles, Mike Littman, Billy Llewellyn, Robin Lovett, David W. Loving, Cyane Lowden, Ken Lu, Joshua Lubeck, Sandra Lubeck, Robert R. Lucas, Patricia Lyons, William Lyons, Christine Maccaslin, Anita Madison, John Malizia, Suzanne Malizia, Thomas Malone, Stanley Marcus, Charles Martin, Heather Matsey, James Matsey, Rodney Matthews, Shawna Mattocks, Matthew Mattro, Jeff May, Harold Mayhew, Jr, Shawn Maynor, Diandra Mayo, Robert McCarraher, Penny McCeney, Robert McClelland, Susan McClelland, Michael McClenning, Robert McCurdy, Joseph McDaniel, Susan McFadden, William McFadden, Mark McGinley, Richard McGruder, Victoria McGruder, Donald McIntire, Karen Meller, Carmen Mercado, Scott Meyers, Carol Mieggs, Christy Miller, David Miller, Ron Miller, Maria Ming Li, Mary Mitchell, Terrie Mitchell, Banks Mitchum, Benjamin Moher, David Molinari, Jung Moon, Karen Mooney, Bonnie Moore, Monte Morgan, Phillip Morgan, William Morgan, Bryon Moss, Suzanne Mowbray, David Mulligan, Mary Mulligan, Nancy Murray, Roger Myers, Patrick Nance, Dennis Negran, Pennie Newell, Glen Newitt, Jacqui Newitt, Edward Newman, Jr, Kevin Newsome, Reveredy Nicholson, Patricia Nicosia, Randall Nixon, Karen Nolan, Ryan Nolette, Bryan Nordquist, Sergei Novitsky, Jonathon O'Brien, William O'Flynn, Karen O'Neil, Adrian Odya-Weis, Dennis Oleary, John Olsen, Tana Rae Oropeza, Brian Osborne, Candace Owens, Lynn Page, Tanya Palik, Rona Palmer, Ashley Pannell, Harry Paulette, Tanya Peake, Donna Pearson, Richard Pearson, John Pedersen, Chris Pena, Roy Mason Pennington, III, Nicholas Perez, Greg Perigard, Kim Perkins, Mark Perry, Brady Peters, Karen Peters, Thomas Petit, Rebecca Petrella, Susan Petrie, Adrian Phillips, Jr, Anne Picciano, John Picciano, Carl Pierce, Sivathanu Pillai, Debra Pines, Charles Pinkard, Lilia Pinson, Arlove Plunkett, Timothy Pohlig, Denise Poindexter, Rachel Poliquin, Margaret Pomeroy, David Poore, III, Laura Potter, Kathy Powers, Linda Pratt, Bernard Presgraves, Jason Price, Denise Pryor, Joshua Pucci, Victoria Puckett, Sara Pullen, Tony Pulley, Cynthia Quattlebaum, Eva Ralston, William Ralston, Hannah Ramey, Jacqueline Randolph, Thomas Randolph, Michael Ranger, Brad Ransom, Nancy Ransome, Henry Requejo, David Reynolds, Rose Ricker, Danny Riddle, Robin Robert, Joshua Roberts, Mary Roberts, Annie Robinson, Antonio Robinson, Rocky Rockburn, Drew Roper, Troy Rosier, Eric Rothman, Brian Rowe, Juliet Rowland, John Rowley, Nancy Rowsey, Stephen Rubis, Kyle Russell, Jennifer Ryan, Thomas Ryder, Joseph Salazar, Randall Samples, Rebecca Samuelson, Thomas Sanchez, Aaron Sanders, Asok Kumar Sarkar, Tom Scarcella, Edward Scearce, Shane Schlesman, Wade Schwanke, Jr, Gwen Seal, Amy Seay, Bradley Seay, Charles Seltman, Patty Senter, Lynn Settle, Tim Seymour, Ronald Sharp, Ernest Sharpe, Shirley Shaw, Stephanie Shelor, Michelle Shifflett, Sandra Shifflett, June Shores, D. Shawn Shumake, Nina Sibert, Robert Silber, Christian Simmers, Mary Singhas, Randall Singhas, Amy Smith, Daphne Hope Smith, Lisa Smith, Stephen Smith, Suzanne Smith, Kristine Smolens, Howard Snyder, Wesley Songer, Emily Sparks, Brian Spencer, Svetlana Spencer, Patricia Spier, Lori Spik, Derek St. Onge, Ronald Stafford, Jonathan Starks, Mark Stephens, Terry Stepp, Sarah Stevenson, Eric Stewart, Roxanne Stith, Tim Stoessel, Jean Stotler, Sara Stramel, Larry Strayhorn, Franklin Sturkey, Ben Sullenger, Yolanda Sullivan, John Sutor, Wanda Sutphin, Sharon Swinburne, Stella Tang, Andrew Taylor, Ann Taylor, Donna Taylor, Ji Ji Thekkeveedu, Christopher Thome, Michael Thome, David Thompson, Tom Thompson, Ashli Thurston, Christopher Tokar, Dion Tomer, Clifford Trimble, Sergio Tromba, Adeline Trotter, James Turner, Jeffrey Turner, Owens Turner, Jr, Marilyn Twine, Lonnie Urquhart, Cheri Valverde, Mike Vammino, Carrie Van Hook, Katherine Vandenbrieje, Milca Vargas, Mary Vaughan, Robena Vaughan, Jessyca Venice, Kimberly Vest, Carol Viergutz, Maryann Villies, Patrice Vossler, Amada Wagoner, Stacy Waller, Gary Walton, Gretchen Ward, Kimberly Ward, Shelia Ward, Daniel Waxman, Christopher Weaver, Margaret Webb, Laura Weisiger, Stephany Whipple, David Whitley, Sarah Whitlock, Diane Wien, Robert T. Wiener, Christopher Wilcher, Mindy Williams, Vincent Williams, Hannah Wilson, Juanita Wilson, Ried Wilson, Charles Wiser, Sharon Wiser, Mark Woehler, Kenneth Womack, Emily Wong, Gregory Woods, Katheryn Woosley, Carol Wright, Jonathan Wright, Mary Wright, Thomas Wright, Timothy Wright, Jr, Leslie Yamnicky, Kenneth Yates, Jamie Young, Sandra Young, Robert Younie, II, Atef Zayd of Filing in JPML (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Tag-Along, #2 Exhibit Motion to Quash Notice)(Feinman, James) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Original Case File from the Circuit Court for the City of Roanoke, VA. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 2/4/2014. (mab) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/5/2014) (mab). Modified on 2/5/2014-corrected state court case number (mab). [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
February 3, 2014 Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hyundai Motor America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hyundai Motor Company for Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (mab) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]
February 3, 2014 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the City of Roanoke, VA, case number CL1400068. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400; Receipt number 0423-1940018), filed by Hyundai Motor America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Declaration of Lien Nguyen, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(mab) Modified on 2/5/2014-corrected state court case number (mab). [Transferred from Virginia Western on 6/10/2014.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jihad Adbul-Mumit v. Hyundai Motor America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Legendre
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Sullenger
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Basham
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Castro
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Reynolds
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Franklin
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Catlett
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Sanders
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atef Zayd
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert McCurdy
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Holroyd
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Rowsey
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Jones
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Johnson
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Gutman
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hustead
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor C. Kvietkus
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Mowbray
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Hoban
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Elsesser
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Odya-Weis
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Ransom
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Keating
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Demarco
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Perez
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Davis
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Yates
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Perigard
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Arauza
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Jordan
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Miller
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sung Cho
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Hornick
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hendrickson
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Weaver
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Wilson
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Grayberg
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy Kizer
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Kite
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda G. Amos
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Aub
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janie Gray
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Smith
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bonner
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Hagy
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Robinson
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Scearce
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carly Connelly
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Russell
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Fallin, Jr.
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Roberts
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Kight
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Ann Hartmann
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Olsen
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Ekstrand
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Burford
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tana Rae Oropeza
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Brown
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Matthews
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Kuri
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Hillberry
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Williams
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Peake
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mase Fabar
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Freeze
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. James Turner
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Smith
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Boyette
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Lubeck
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Debrosse
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Lackey
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Perry
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Starks
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William McFadden
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberley Amick
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Weisiger
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Hickman
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Hronowski
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Gould
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Young
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hester, Jr.
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Devane
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Hedrick
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Wien
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Seltman
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Miller
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caitlin Feeley
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Oleary
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Picciano
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Viergutz
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew Roper
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy N. Hamlett
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Caldarelli
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Diaz
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Mieggs
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Brown
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Wright
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip F. Corrao
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Presgraves
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Madison
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Adair Sargent
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelia Ward
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Feldman
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Gaddis
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Poliquin
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Edge
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Pearson
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Vest
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Nolan
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derwood Johnston
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Shelor
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Hauser
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Stoessel
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Osborne
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacklyn Casselle-Tupponce
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Sullivan
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Vaughan
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christie Gray
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dion Tomer
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Gibson
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Pullen
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Songer
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Pratt
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Brown
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Brancato
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Hutchinson
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Glaub
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Singhas
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Jansen
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rowley
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Conrad
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monte Morgan
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Atkins
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Horchner
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Mattro
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Walton
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Pena
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asif Aziz
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall Harris
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sung Chun
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Settle
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amine Berbale
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jihad Adbul-Mumit
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sydney Brumbelow
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Amatruda
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Martin
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Stewart
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Kusek
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Hearn
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Groves
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Delia Deleon
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Singhas
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lipford
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timm Betcher
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bartell
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Wiser
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Stramel
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Waller
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard McGruder
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Palik
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Potter
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlove Plunkett
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Strayhorn
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Bender
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Mooney
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul L. Grover
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliet Rowland
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark McGinley
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Pryor
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A. Knight
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Ioannou
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W. Loving
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Kelly
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Ryan
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Chesseboro
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Sibert
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Duncan
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Arsenault
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pam Hodges
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathen Illidge
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanja Gilmore
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Paulette
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Justice
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert T. Wiener
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Flora
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Knoell
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Jordan
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Brodie
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Pines
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashli Thurston
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Taylor
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilia Pinson
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Gillespie
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Edwards
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Eddy
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Stephens
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Thome
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Call
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robena Vaughan
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margie D. Fauls
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aliz Agoston
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Woods
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Drugatz
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Barnes
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Collins
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Halpin
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hite
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sivathanu Pillai
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Vandenbrieje
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirt Chappelle
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Clune
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Smith
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Rowe
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawna Mattocks
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Jenkins
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Mayhew, Jr.
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Rothman
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soha Ayyash
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Malizia
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Harris
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Johnstone
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Maynor
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Thome
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Ralston
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Krobert
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Maccaslin
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Gray
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Frederick
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pennie Newell
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Young
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Crocker
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rasheedah Johnson
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Drewry
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kerr
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Moore
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Stafford
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Curtis
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Whitley
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Vammino
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Heinlein
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Wilcher
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan McClelland
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ranger
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Miller
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Younie, II
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny McCeney
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Nolette
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Childress
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Jeffries
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Shifflett
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriah Eisenman
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Sparks
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Sanchez
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Puckett
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Gray
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Elton
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Agee
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shay Hunter
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Dixson
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Robert
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Picciano
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria McGruder
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesenia Dominguez
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Marcus
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Riddle
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Wright, Jr.
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna Harrison
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Pohlig
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Lu
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ralston
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Stevenson
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lehman
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jung Moon
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Samples
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Hudson, Sr.
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Svetlana Spencer
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Gussgard
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Van Hook
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Samuelson
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Ferguson
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Stith
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Leggett
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lyons
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owens Turner, Jr.
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lt John Franklin
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Baker
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryon Moss
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Wong
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Wright
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Spik
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Roberts
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Fickle
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Lippolis-Aviles
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Spencer
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Donaldson
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Woehler
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Pedersen
Represented By: James Ben Feinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch |