Jesus Aguinaga et al v. First Student Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jesus Aguinaga, Andrew Small, Jeff Proitte, Griselda Acevedo, Carlos Henriquez, Mario Ernesto Rodriguez, Veronica Alcazar, Belinda Williams, Eusebio Alonso, Kathy Tucker, Ingrid J. Aguilar, Dwayne M. Sheffield, Debra Mcelroy, Juan M. Arroyo, Diane Freeman, Jamar Corley, Danyell Daniel, Janice Small, Myrna Aceves, Terrell Addison, Elizabeth A. Campos, Nora Lee Miller, Rose Gamage, Noe Cabrales, Linda Rubio, Samuel Rangel Larios, Verna Anderson, Evette Darty, Janet L. Jackson-Henderson, Vangelina Smith, Jose A. Marquez, Cathy Downey, Tashyra Grier, Raul Rodriguez, Novalea Gibbs, Kim D. Tabor, Latesha Jacobs, Joel Gallegos, Veronica Haro, Veronica Lopez, Ana C. Sanchez, Julia Avila, Mary Portus, Marco Zepeda, Lamar Parker, Kyalo Shabazz, Elsa Aguilar, Ramon Gasca, Kenneth Dell, Danielle Dantzler, Mario Johnson, Benisha Lewis, Sandra Castillo Ledezma, Felicia Hackett, Ernestina Wilkiewicz, Jessica Rouse, Rafaela Rodriguez, Johnny Kaisaki, Edward O. Anthony, Darryl Moore, Josee Moreno Casaca, Leticia Pacheco, Alva J. Smith, Luis Palafox Casillas, Francis Bazo, Carletta Wainwright, Allex Lambert, Nicole Bartley, Gabriel Ernesto Vanegas, Allison Dulin, Rosechell Murray, Victoria Fuentes, Daegon Solorio, Luis A. Mena L., Leeann Zimmerman, Mayela Garcia, Fritzner Leonard, Amy Smith, Edward Lane III, Nicolas Shellenbarger, Stephen Burnside, Alejandra V. Castillo, Tatiana Galburth, Charlina Adams, Veronica L. Sandoval Lopez, Denise Talamantes, Linda J. Wilcher, Angela Williams, Leticia Delgado, Juan C. Gallegos, Jessie Marie Winfield, Miguel A. Asencio, Sofia Ortiz, Flora Estrada, Joyce Clarke, Noemi Rocha, Guadalupe Avalos, Elizabeth Garcia, Christina C. Lizaola, Rafael Pintor, Dominque Williams, Theodis Smith, Sergio Gutierrez, Martin Garcia, Connie Ladner, Albin T. Riemann, Edgar Armando Hernandez, Saadia Jackson, Sheila K. Handy, Carole Jones, Gloria Ocana, Stacey L. Seay, Jose A. Cabrales, Cecilia D. Cerpa, Luis Valle, Maria Elena Rodriguez, Ervin R. Young, Christy Jarvis, Patricia Page, Monique Gershon, Frieda Lee-Crockett, Vanessa Bean, Hugo Cortes, Guadalupe Amezcua, Paula Garcia, Laura Gonzales, Joyce Clay, Jill Marie King, Thomas Freeman, Mercedes Camplillo, Lynne Deaton, Virgil Cruz, Jose Baza, Bassam Saba, Rebeca Carreon, Monica June Sosa, Josephine Velasco, Beyerl Y. Burney, Marco A. Salazsar, Eddie Pruitt, Helcias Galan Hernandez, Michelle Patterson, Joseph A. Robinson, Charlesetta Grant, Demetra R. Davies, Debra L. Tatum, Guillermo Mendoza, Vicki Woods, Angelica Alvarado, Juan C. Chavez, Denisha Weaver, Blanca C. Rodriguez, Samantha Fitch, Martha Lomeli, Teresa Hollins, Annette Barron, William Hardson Jr., Cathy Mynette Ellison, Maghan Wise, Alma C. Freteluco, Lemitia C. Jackson, Araceli E. Arzate, Ella Alford, Maurice Davis, Evelyn Cuthbert, Fredrick Tovmasian, Twanda Branom, Juan Panameno, Trinette Washington, Laron Cooksey, Jr., Stephanie Garcia, Darlene Tait, William J. Neice, Pedro Jesus Padilla, Charles Penn, Billy Fraizer, Claudia Lopez, Robert Bolden, Monique Clark, Joyce Mendez, Jacqueline Tuggle, Melodie Corona, Inell Dukes, Calvin Ortega, Roberto A. Rico, Diane Richardson, Beverly J. Burns, Myrtle Burke, Shanta Wilson, Anne Cabrera, Armando Barajas, Simon Marquez, Maria Heredia, Marie Jonay Green, Nicie H. George, Sue Quintero, Venetta Douglas, Lynne Shobert, Gregory Sanders, Karon Lewis, Jessica Lydia Rojas, Jessica Figueroa, Hector Lopez, Armando Palma, Angelica Romero, Diana Greenwood, Tyreisha Kennedy, Leslie Morris, Bridget Beach, Luz Sandra Medina, Shanel Harris, Elissia A. Eddins, Deborah Taylor, Marcella E. Radford, Francisco Ovidio Lemus, Michael Custard, Sonia Brown, Araceli Saldana, Donna Jordan, Kirk Howard, Sonia Nava, Jane Knopp, Gevork Boduryan, Jorge A. Lopez, Isaac G. Velasquez, Lawanda Simpson, Willis Brown, Donna Thompson, Stephanie Coleman, Gina Knight, Ebony Brown, Patricia Medina, Shanequa Maxwell, Maria Rincon, Bobbie Bright, Dana Polk, Myisha Curtis, Joana Ortiz Amaya, Adam Williams, Alvina K. Lakey, Mable Famergriffin, Rosaland Brooks, Sergio Gonzalez, Michelle Godinez, Serena Verret, Alma Rodriguez, Janette Cortez, Lucia Garcia Cardona, Kimberly Davis, Patricia Taylor, Judith Ramos, Luis A. Amaya, Jessie Rodriguez, Venita Bell, Patrick Llamas, Hector Velasquez, Tamyia Smith, Caleb B. Brown, Lizbeth Puga, Antoinette Galarza, Brian Miller, Dana R. Clayton, Rosalin Montgomery, Madilyn Patterson-Berry, Jesse Ruano, Romona Christopher, Leo Bardo Chavez Rodriguez, Ana Dolores Solano Funes, Devery Chiles, Drucilla Denwitty, Maria Coy Arrubias, Henry Johnson, Maria R. Pena, Joy A. Vincente, Debbie Wilson, Jorge Hernandez, Donna Lee Achterberg, Teresa A. Jones, Cecilia Ann Moreno, Brenda Kay Taylor, Ruben Cardenas Nevarez Jr., Luis A. Chacon, Jr., Lashonda Ware, Tony S. Medina, Miguel A. Lopez, Isaac Martinez, Tyesha Cox, J.T. Carrillo, Patricia Hudson, Mercedes S. Gomez, Carlos Garay, Tracey Baker, James T. Snead, Beatris S. Martinez, Monica L. Redondo, Eileen Connor, Kevin Bowden, Denia Aguilera, Mardoqueo Lopez, Darri Jean Guzman, Theresa Santos, Sharon Denise Jones, Jacqueline Reed, Peter Hernandez, Rolinda Clyde, Magana Ramirez, Latrice Johnson, Yvonne Davis, Julie R. Snow, Demetrius Williams, Milady Menjivar, Janice Montgomery, Ii Carlos Paez, Marcos V. Zepeda, Yolanda Washinton, Gina Holland, Marcus Moore, Wilfredo F. Lopez, Marie E. Carrasco, Juan F. Castro, Kenneth Johnson, Steve Heredia, Robert F. Smith, Amalia R. Altamirano, Catherine Pompey Reeves, Soledad C. Guerrero Manjarrez, Walter Villacorta, Shun L. Griffin, Arlester Lavine, John G. Casarubbia, Fidel Gonzalez, Lucia Silva, Carla Booker, Jesus A. Arzate, Rodney Love, Becky Stephens, Santiago Cruz Ramirez, Carolyn Jones, Antonio Ortiz, Cherry C. Pompey, Raychel Miller, Nam Truong, Donna Ramirez, Laura Gomez, Gwendolyn Jackson, Vicky Lynn Deibert, Christopher Wright, Cellia Jones, Elisa Melgoza, Sylvia C. Baltazar, Darlene Joseph, Ricardo Hernandez, Maria Victoria Bonte, Arthur Rucker, Helen Boudreaux, Robin T. Landers, Michael Martin, Janice L. Patterson, Michael W. Smith, Juanita D. Ayala, Victoria Warren, Rachel Aguilera-Rivas, Reymundo Honesto Jr., Kim Hamlett, Patricia Hecker, Vanessa M. Johnson, Martin Nevarez, Jeanette Hartwell, Lalisa Banks, Lorenzo De La Cruz, Marion Jordan, Rene Reyes, Alton Wilkerson, Diane Robinson, Raquel Negrete, Jorge Solorzano, Shavonda Tanisha Brown, Raymond A. Manriquez, Ruby Wide, Maria D. Cruz, Boris Gharadaghi, Jose Luis Aceves Barajas, Rasul Tinsley, Maria Nidia Orellana, Regino Alonzo, Rosa E. Correa Solis, Clara Armstrong, Angelica Buston Moreno, Maik N. Serrano Calderon, Erma Jean Cooper, Elizabeth Hernandez, Rhonda L. Miranda, Sheree L. Neal, Lady Thompson, Cheryl James, Sheron B. Tucker, Eva Wade, Ollie Hinex, Donnesha Taylor, Socorro Vizarraga, Bobbie Hamilton, Victoria Williams, Lizzie Jackson, Paula Walker, Fred Minor, Monica Ledesma, Michael B. Johnson, Leona Boswell, Shaneva Wilson, Courtney Baltzgar, Condessa Morris, Ellen Bojanac, Miriam Perez, Yesenia Becerra, Javier Caballero, Karen D. Gable, Awatef Haddad, Shirley Rembert, Paul Booker, Vivian Sotelo, Tosha Lipkins, Adrian Cabral, Tacha L. Griffin, Arteisha Sanders, Richard Ellis, Francis Washington, Harvey W. Henry, Catalina Munoz, Jake Bell Jr., Georgette Morales, Brenda Walls, Elena Ramirez, Geronimo Sanchez, Sony A. Franklin, Mario I. Trevizo, Margaret Hernandez, Pamela Stipes, Lashondra Jimmerson, Anthony Phelps, Arturo Perez Marquez, Nelvia M. Reinoso Tocuero, Efren Rodriguez, Terri A. Crone, Arlette Hawkins, Robert M. Grayes, Omar R. Sepulveda, Noreen Thomas, Luis Alberto Montoya, Esther Carter, Guadalupe Guizar, Derrick E.L. Hayes, Maricela Candelaria, Patricia Mogart, Soledad Miramontes, Tammie Harper, Barbara Neilly, Javier R. Munos, Donette E. Byrd, Tuong Trieu Chat, Michael Scott Kenna, Josie B. Soto, Jasmine Taylor, Domingo Gonzalez, Amanda Hicks, Francisco Brena, Pauline Marie Hasselbrook, Debra Caro, Lashawndra Butler, John L. Dills, Laura Guadalupe Gomez Sandoval, Katrina Colston, Paula Phillips, Maria Plancarte, Deloris Ann Walls, Janet Henderson, Tanya Nolan, Shannon Dickinson, James T. Stephens, Lora D. Collis, Miriam Harris, Joanna Harrison, Jeanette Rubio Linthicum, Angel A. Alonzo, Venita Irene Flournoy, Eric Jones, Gregory C. Hood, Anna Christine Castano, Irma Yesenia Geller, Zonia L. Zuniga, Rayas Mirian Cruz, Manuel Lopez, Demetria Jones, Digna Enamorado, Carlos Anaya, Tina D. Grajeda, Cristobal Tebalan Sonta Y., Alice Lopez, Antonia Davis, Patricia A. Turnage, Susana Duran Alonso, Vivian Guillen, Eunice Jean Davis, Eugene Howard, Mario Rodriguez, Margaret Zizolfo Stratton, Toy A. Thompson, Terrell Rice, Maria de Lourdes Hernandez Garcia, Alejandro C. Rios, Danielle Wright, Chelsea Wilson, Netyone Chavarria, Rita Alanis, Juan P. Garcia, Erica English, Irene C. Renova, Tony A. Sarni, Martha Avila, Helen Murrietta, Jose R. Orellana, Annette Barlett, Rochelle Boyd, Tracy L. Grady, Aurora Najera, Rosario Tirado, Linda Munniks, Lucia Sampayo, Albert L. Caballes, Bernice Smith, Juan Gonzalez, Miguel F. Menjivar Sr., Latonia Sheppard, Martha Bedolla, Ana A. Sandoval, Christy Lane, Olivia Zuniga, Tamika Brooks, Frankie Vasquez, Elizabeth Montijo, Maria G. Flores, Jose Roberto Somoza, Dolly Edna Johnson, Angelica E. Rodriguez, Shaquandia Lewis, Lether Lewis, Gerardo Vargas, Rachel Dorado, Javier Juarez Cruz, Juan A. Benavides, Tonette Jackson, Henry D. Jacobs, Guadalupe Padilla, Shoandrika Boyette, Glenda Sealy, Larry Lujan, James Smyth, Nickicha Sibley, Irece Williams, Teresa Rubio, Carla Tennell, Janice Newman, Roslyn Dunn, Michael D. Carson, Annie M. Myles, Sharon Dunning, Juan Valdez Perez, Christopher A. Kelly, Angelica Ramirez, Mychalai Boyd, Manuel J. Chavez, Raymond House, Erika Mungia, Yolanda Hernandez, Lori A. Gafford, Alejandra Gonzalez Sanchez, Cruz Rodriguez, Mary A. Smith, Daniel Parga, Sonia Zapian and Maribel Campillo
Defendant: First Student Inc. Cases, Hireright Solutions, Inc. and First Transit, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv10286
Filed: November 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Filing 21 Receipt of Acknowledgment of documents received by Los Angeles Superior Court, cae no. JCCP4624. (lom)
January 14, 2021 Filing 20 Mail Returned addressed to Rod M Fliegel re Letter of Transmittal #18 . (lom)
January 12, 2021 Filing 19 Notice of Electronic Filing re Sealed Document #17 , Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form #18 e-mailed to Catha Worthman bounced due to 4.1.0- Unknown address error. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 11, 2021 Filing 18 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (lom)
January 11, 2021 Filing 17 SEALED DOCUMENT re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #15 filed by Plaintiffs Alice Lopez, Cecilio Lopez, Claudia Lopez, Cynthia Lopez, Gerardo Lopez, Gilberto Lopez, Hector Lopez, Jorge A. Lopez, Julio A. Lopez, M. Alfredo Lopez, Manuel Lopez, Mardoqueo Lopez, Maribel Lopez, Miguel A. Lopez, Norma Lopez, Paulette A. Lopez, Peter Lopez, Regina Lopez, Sanjuana Lujano Lopez, Tanya Lopez, Alton Wilkerson, Ernestina Wilkiewicz, Adam Williams, Andrina Williams, Angela Williams, Belinda Williams, Betty Williams, Demetrius Williams, Dominque Williams, Hildred Huggins Williams, Irece Williams, Jackie Williams, James Albert Williams, Lushon Williams, Regina Williams, Victoria Williams, Kevin Wilridge, Chelsea Wilson, Debbie Wilson, Jessica Wilson, Ana Dolores Solano Funes, Karen D. Gable, Lori A. Gafford, Joseph B. Gaines, Helcias Galan Hernandez, Antoinette Galarza, Tatiana Galburth, Dalila A. Galdamez, Joel Gallegos, Juan C. Gallegos, Connie Y. Gallimore, Rose Gamage, Bertha N. Gamez, Troylyn Brown Gammage, Carlos Garay, Alejandra Garcia, Angela P. Garcia, Carol Garcia, Elizabeth Garcia, Jose Luis Garcia, Antonio Alcaraz, Veronica Alcazar, Erwin S. Alcorn, Barbara Alexander, Deora Alexander, Francisco Alfaro, Marta Alfaro, Transito Alferez, Ella Alford, Ramon Alfred Bedolla, Joshua Allen, Donell Allison, Eusebio Alonso, Ruby Alonso, Angel A. Alonzo, Regino Alonzo, Amalia R. Altamirano, Angelica Alvarado, Rosalino Alvarado, Jacqueline L. Amaya, Brittney Hockett, Marvella P. Hogan, Erika Holguin Mungia, Gina Holland, Teresa Hollins, Lashonda Holloway, Roy Holmes, Damon Holmes Sr., Reymundo Honesto Jr., Diana Honore, Gregory C. Hood, Kevin Hosannah, Raymond House, Eugene Howard, Kirk Howard, Oscar G. Howard, Elizabeth Hudson, Patricia Hudson, Sharon Hudson, Jacqueline D. Hudson, Chana Edwards, Mario Eli Enriquez, Karen Elliott, Richard Ellis, Cathy Mynette Ellison, Digna Enamorado, Eric English, Erica English, Enrique, Francisca Erazo, Denicia A. Espinola, Esmeralda Espinola, Teresa Espinosa, Roberto Espinoza, Victor H. Espinoza, Flora Estrada, Pedro C. Euquiano, Samuel A. Evangelista, Mishonda Everett, Vincent Everett, Clayton S. Kraft, Damian A. La Verde, Monica Lacy, Connie Ladner, Alvina K. Lakey, Allex Lambert, Robin T. Landers, Margaret Lands, Christy Lane, Edward Lane III, Arlester Lavine, Ansert Lawrence, Wanda Lechuga, Monica Ledesma, Lucille Lee, Betty Ann Lee, Latoya R. Lee, Frieda Lee-Crockett, Francisco Ovidio Lemus, Hilario Leon, Danita Hayes, Derrick E.L. Hayes, Patricia Hecker, Ileen Hemphill, Janet Henderson, Shakena Henderson, Ward Henderson, Gloria Hendrix, Carlos Henriquez, Cindy Henriquez, Harvey W. Henry, Maria Heredia, Steve Heredia, Edgar Armando Hernandez, Elizabeth Hernandez, Irene Hernandez, Jesse M. Hernandez, Joaquin Hernandez, Jorge Hernandez, Margaret Hernandez, Darla Moreno, Jorge R. Moreno, Linda V. Moreno, Condessa Morris, Leslie Morris, Stephanie Morris, Paul Terrell Morris Jr., Leah M. Moten, James Motty, Ciwilla Mouton, Theresa Moye, Erika Mungia, Linda Munniks, Javier R. Munos, Catalina Munoz, Dolores Murcia, Camella T. Murillo, Mary Louise Murphy, Beatrice Murray, Michael Murray, David L. Jorgensen, Darlene Joseph, Rafael E. Jovee, Jean Juarez, Javier Juarez Cruz, Tammy Jump, Johnny Kaisaki, Mekonnen Kassa, Christopher A. Kelly, Jacqueline Kendrick, Michael Scott Kenna, Tyreisha Kennedy, Jill Marie King, Peggy King, Ronidia King-Mccall, Paula Kizzee, Gina Knight, Jane Knopp, Grigor Kokoyan, Daniel Kolling, Debra L. Tatum, Brenda Kay Taylor, Deborah Taylor, Dimica Taylor, Donnesha Taylor, Jasmine Taylor, Marlene Taylor, Patricia Taylor, Michael D. Taylor Jr., Cristobal Tebalan Sonta Y., Carla Tennell, Margaret M. Terrones, Noreen Thomas, Rosemary Thomas, Tammie L. Thomas, Lena Thompkins, Donna Thompson, Kimberly Thompson, Lady Thompson, Toni Thompson, Dessie Walls, Monica Walton, Saraan Ward, Cynthia F. Ward Montoy A, Lashonda Ware, Vivian Ware, Brandi Warren, Victoria Warren, Antoinette Washington, Francis Washington, Trinette Washington, Yolanda Washinton, Darrian Wayne, Denisha Weaver, Monique Webb, Tanisha West, Ruby Wide, Erika Wilburn, Linda J. Wilcher, Tammy L. Wilcox, Donette E. Byrd, Javier Caballero, Albert L. Caballes, Adrian Cabral, Jose A. Cabrales, Noe Cabrales, Anne Cabrera, Juana Calderon, Kanisha Calhoun, Renee C. Calloway, Maribel Campillo, Mercedes Camplillo, Andrew Campos, Elizabeth A. Campos, Maricela Candelaria, Edith Cano, Laura Cardenas, Ruben Cardenas Nevarez Jr., Eugene Carnes, Debra Caro, Ebony Brown, Joyce A. Brown, Katanya Brown, Nakia Brown, Raychell L. Brown, Renee Brown, Sharon Brown, Shavonda Tanisha Brown, Sonia Brown, Willis Brown, Venita Bruce, Carla Burgess, Myrtle Burke, Beyerl Y. Burney, Beverly J. Burns, Sarah Burns, Stephen Burnside, Ken Burroughs, Angelica Buston Moreno, Lashawndra Butler, Enrique Martinez, Guillermo Martinez, Isaac Martinez, Joe Martinez, Linda Martinez, Lita Martinez, Lynn Martinez, Miguel Martinez, Judy Maslow, Cheryl Matthews, Shanequa Maxwell, Harry McCall, Shirley McGee, Taryn McGill, Sharion McNeal, Gayretta Mcclendon, Geri Mcclure, El vetras B. Mccray, Joanne Mccray, Michael Jones Mccray Sr., Enrique Rubio, Linda Rubio, Teresa Rubio, Jeanette Rubio Linthicum, Arthur Rucker, Albert Ruiz, Sergio Ruiz, Stella Ruiz, Kim Rulon, Lynette Russell, Bassam Saba, Pogos Salakhorian, Yolanda Salamanca, Roxana Salazar, Marco A. Salazsar, Andres Salcedo, Carmen Salcedo, Araceli Saldana, Joey Saldate, Peggy Salmon, Felicia Foster, Michael Foster, Billy Fraizer, Galeana Francisco, Anselmo Franco Ramos, Sony A. Franklin, Trinell Franklin, Diane Freeman, Joann Freeman, Thomas Freeman, Delia Freitas, James French, Tasha French, Alma C. Freteluco, Rafael Delgado Fructuoso, Isabel Fuentes, Maria Fuentes, Ofelia Fuentes, Victoria Fuentes, Yaneth Fuerte, Felicia Hackett, Awatef Haddad, Bobbie Hamilton, Kim Hamlett, Doris Hanah, Sheila K. Handy, Deborah Hardson, William Hardson Jr., Fredonia Hargrove, Veronica Haro, Tammie Harper, Miriam Harris, Shanel Harris, Joanna Harrison, Samuele Harsin, Lisa D. Hart, Jeanette Hartwell, Anthony J. Haskin, Pauline Marie Hasselbrook, Arlette Hawkins, Fritzner Leonard, Uriel G. Leslie III, Benisha Lewis, Lether Lewis, Lloyd Lewis, Miracle Lewis, Monique Lewis, Shaquandia Lewis, Karon Lewis, Wiliam E. Lewis Jr., Sandra Lezama, Marisela Linares, Tosha Lipkins, Key Ana Little, Andre Littlejohn, Christina C. Lizaola, Patrick Llamas, Rosemary Llamas, Laura Lock, Martha Lomeli, Gail Reyes, Martha Reyes, Rene Reyes, Carl Reynolds, Mable R. Reynolds, Vevelyn Reynolds, Terrell Rice, Lisa Rich, Brenda K. Richardson, Diane Richardson, Delbra A. Ricketts, Roberto A. Rico, Miko Riddick, Sharon Ridenour, Albin T. Riemann, Canarie R. Riles, Colleen Gail Johnson Riley, Maria Rincon, Alejandro C. Rios, Jesus M. Rios, Gene Saulsberry, Tanisha Savage, Renee Sawyer, Marchell N. Scott, Rosa E. Seals, Glenda Sealy, Stacey L. Seay, Roseann Segura, Antonio D. Sena, Omar R. Sepulveda, Maik N. Serrano Calderon, Sherry Lynne Seymore, Kyalo Shabazz, Corey Shaw, Dwayne M. Sheffield, Mclessie Shell, Nicolas Shellenbarger, Tamara Shelmon-Beaver, Linda Shepherd, Cynthia Sheppard, Guillermo Mendoza, Manuel Jesus Menjivar, Manuel Menjivar, Miguel Menjivar, Milady Menjivar, Miguel F. Menjivar Sr., Maura Meza, Maria Milagro, Brian Miller, Melinda A. Miller, Nora Lee Miller, Raychel Miller, Tina Miller, Wilma Minix, Fred Minor, Soledad Miramontes, Rhonda L. Miranda, Patricia Mogart, Rosal Molina, Marisela Moncada, Henry D. Jacobs, Latesha Jacobs, Gertrude Jamerson, Cheryl James, Betty A. Jamison, Robin Jamison, Christy Jarvis, Rufus Jemison, Israel Jimenez, Lashondra Jimmerson, Brenda J. Johnson, Delois P. Johnson, Dolly Edna Johnson, Henry Johnson, Kenneth Johnson, Latrice Johnson, Mario Johnson, Michael B. Johnson, Olega V. Johnson, Sazbra Johnson, J.T. Carr, William Carranza, Armando Carranza-RioFrio, Marie E. Carrasco, Rebeca Carreon, Amparo Carrero, J.T. Carrillo, Josephina Carrillo, Maria Carrillo, Harry Carrington, Lisha Carson, Michael D. Carson, Esther Carter, Ronald E. Carter, Ronique L. Carter, Josee Moreno Casaca, John G. Casarubbia, Anna Christine Castano, Oscar Castellon, Alejandra V. Castillo, Jackquelyn Portis, Mary Portus, Gwendolyn L. Pounds, Valerie Powns, Katrina Pratt, Raul Preza, Deleon Price, Jeff Proitte, Eddie Pruitt, Lizbeth Puga, Jose F. Pulido, Lodema Purtty, Sue Quintero, Marcella E. Radford, Cathy L. Raeck, Julie Raigoza, Vernon Railey, Angelica Ramirez, Donna Ramirez, Elena Ramirez, Janette Cortez, Rodolfo Cortez, Helena Nelson Cottrell, Tyesha Cox, Sharon A. Crawford, Terri A. Crone, Edna Croutch, Dina Cruz, Francisco Cruz, Irma Yolanda Cruz, Javier Juarez Cruz, Marcos Cruz, Maria D. Cruz, Rayas Mirian Cruz, Virgil Cruz, Sylvia Cruz Baltazar, Santiago Cruz Ramirez, Juan A. Cuan De Leon, Jose Antonio Cubillo, Juan Chavez Cubillo, Jesus Preciado Barraza, Isabel Barrientes, Annette Barron, Nicole Bartley, Art Bates, Cameo Bates, Theola Baugh, Michael Bay, Jose Baza, Francis Bazo, Bridget Beach, Vanessa Bean, Tayell Beans, Yesenia Becerra, Martha Bedolla, Teyonye Belcher, Latrice Bell, Venita Bell, Jake Bell Jr., Jeanette Belmudez, Joana Ortiz Amaya, Omar G. Osorio, Armando Oviedo, Carol Pacheco, Leticia Pacheco, Bernice Pack, Guadalupe Padilla, Lisa W. Padilla, Patricia Padilla, Pedro Jesus Padilla, Ii Carlos Paez, Patricia Page, Demsy O. Paiz, Zoraida Palacios, Luis Palafox Casillas, Armando Palma, Juan Panameno, Daniel Parga, George Parga, Vanessa Parker, John L. Dills, Vivian Dinkins, Ronald S. Doody, Rachel Dorado, Doris Douglas, Venetta Douglas, Cathy Downey, Sharron Dozier, Inell Dukes, Allison Dulin, Geraldine Dunn, Roslyn Dunn, Sharon Dunning, Rafael Duran, Susana Duran Alonso, Laura Ebeling, Darlene Eberline, Pete Echavarria, Elissia A. Eddins, Jose Daniel Colato, Richard Coleman, Stephanie Coleman, Lora D. Collis, Katrina Colston, Eileen Connor, Margarita Contreras, Vicki Contreras, Laron Cooksey, Laron Cooksey, Jr., Erma Jean Cooper, Constance M. Coplan, Jamar Corley, Luis R. Corona, Melodie Corona, Susan Corona, Florentino Correa, Salvador Correa III, Rosa E. Correa Solis, Hugo Cortes, Jose Gonzalez, Jose Luis Gonzal
January 7, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND #10 held before Judge George H. Wu. The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling. The Court GRANTS the motion to remand. Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) Modified on 1/11/2021 (lom).
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SETTLEMENT COMMUNICATION UNDER SEAL #14 by Judge George H. Wu. The Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs' Application for Leave to file under seal Plaintiffs' Settlement Communication to Defendants dated October 15, 2020 and referenced in the Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. The Plaintiffs may file the document under seal. (lom)
January 6, 2021 Filing 14 APPLICATION to file document Settlement Communication under seal filed by Plaintiffs Alice Lopez, Cecilio Lopez, Claudia Lopez, Cynthia Lopez, Gerardo Lopez, Gilberto Lopez, Hector Lopez, Jorge A. Lopez, Julio A. Lopez, M. Alfredo Lopez, Manuel Lopez, Mardoqueo Lopez, Maribel Lopez, Miguel A. Lopez, Norma Lopez, Paulette A. Lopez, Peter Lopez, Regina Lopez, Sanjuana Lujano Lopez, Tanya Lopez, Alton Wilkerson, Ernestina Wilkiewicz, Adam Williams, Andrina Williams, Angela Williams, Belinda Williams, Betty Williams, Demetrius Williams, Dominque Williams, Hildred Huggins Williams, Irece Williams, Jackie Williams, James Albert Williams, Lushon Williams, Regina Williams, Victoria Williams, Kevin Wilridge, Chelsea Wilson, Debbie Wilson, Jessica Wilson, Ana Dolores Solano Funes, Karen D. Gable, Lori A. Gafford, Joseph B. Gaines, Helcias Galan Hernandez, Antoinette Galarza, Tatiana Galburth, Dalila A. Galdamez, Joel Gallegos, Juan C. Gallegos, Connie Y. Gallimore, Rose Gamage, Bertha N. Gamez, Troylyn Brown Gammage, Carlos Garay, Alejandra Garcia, Angela P. Garcia, Carol Garcia, Elizabeth Garcia, Jose Luis Garcia, Antonio Alcaraz, Veronica Alcazar, Erwin S. Alcorn, Barbara Alexander, Deora Alexander, Francisco Alfaro, Marta Alfaro, Transito Alferez, Ella Alford, Ramon Alfred Bedolla, Joshua Allen, Donell Allison, Eusebio Alonso, Ruby Alonso, Angel A. Alonzo, Regino Alonzo, Amalia R. Altamirano, Angelica Alvarado, Rosalino Alvarado, Jacqueline L. Amaya, Brittney Hockett, Marvella P. Hogan, Erika Holguin Mungia, Gina Holland, Teresa Hollins, Lashonda Holloway, Roy Holmes, Damon Holmes Sr., Reymundo Honesto Jr., Diana Honore, Gregory C. Hood, Kevin Hosannah, Raymond House, Eugene Howard, Kirk Howard, Oscar G. Howard, Elizabeth Hudson, Patricia Hudson, Sharon Hudson, Jacqueline D. Hudson, Chana Edwards, Mario Eli Enriquez, Karen Elliott, Richard Ellis, Cathy Mynette Ellison, Digna Enamorado, Eric English, Erica English, Enrique, Francisca Erazo, Denicia A. Espinola, Esmeralda Espinola, Teresa Espinosa, Roberto Espinoza, Victor H. Espinoza, Flora Estrada, Pedro C. Euquiano, Samuel A. Evangelista, Mishonda Everett, Vincent Everett, Clayton S. Kraft, Damian A. La Verde, Monica Lacy, Connie Ladner, Alvina K. Lakey, Allex Lambert, Robin T. Landers, Margaret Lands, Christy Lane, Edward Lane III, Arlester Lavine, Ansert Lawrence, Wanda Lechuga, Monica Ledesma, Lucille Lee, Betty Ann Lee, Latoya R. Lee, Frieda Lee-Crockett, Francisco Ovidio Lemus, Hilario Leon, Danita Hayes, Derrick E.L. Hayes, Patricia Hecker, Ileen Hemphill, Janet Henderson, Shakena Henderson, Ward Henderson, Gloria Hendrix, Carlos Henriquez, Cindy Henriquez, Harvey W. Henry, Maria Heredia, Steve Heredia, Edgar Armando Hernandez, Elizabeth Hernandez, Irene Hernandez, Jesse M. Hernandez, Joaquin Hernandez, Jorge Hernandez, Margaret Hernandez, Darla Moreno, Jorge R. Moreno, Linda V. Moreno, Condessa Morris, Leslie Morris, Stephanie Morris, Paul Terrell Morris Jr., Leah M. Moten, James Motty, Ciwilla Mouton, Theresa Moye, Erika Mungia, Linda Munniks, Javier R. Munos, Catalina Munoz, Dolores Murcia, Camella T. Murillo, Mary Louise Murphy, Beatrice Murray, Michael Murray, David L. Jorgensen, Darlene Joseph, Rafael E. Jovee, Jean Juarez, Javier Juarez Cruz, Tammy Jump, Johnny Kaisaki, Mekonnen Kassa, Christopher A. Kelly, Jacqueline Kendrick, Michael Scott Kenna, Tyreisha Kennedy, Jill Marie King, Peggy King, Ronidia King-Mccall, Paula Kizzee, Gina Knight, Jane Knopp, Grigor Kokoyan, Daniel Kolling, Debra L. Tatum, Brenda Kay Taylor, Deborah Taylor, Dimica Taylor, Donnesha Taylor, Jasmine Taylor, Marlene Taylor, Patricia Taylor, Michael D. Taylor Jr., Cristobal Tebalan Sonta Y., Carla Tennell, Margaret M. Terrones, Noreen Thomas, Rosemary Thomas, Tammie L. Thomas, Lena Thompkins, Donna Thompson, Kimberly Thompson, Lady Thompson, Toni Thompson, Dessie Walls, Monica Walton, Saraan Ward, Cynthia F. Ward Montoy A, Lashonda Ware, Vivian Ware, Brandi Warren, Victoria Warren, Antoinette Washington, Francis Washington, Trinette Washington, Yolanda Washinton, Darrian Wayne, Denisha Weaver, Monique Webb, Tanisha West, Ruby Wide, Erika Wilburn, Linda J. Wilcher, Tammy L. Wilcox, Donette E. Byrd, Javier Caballero, Albert L. Caballes, Adrian Cabral, Jose A. Cabrales, Noe Cabrales, Anne Cabrera, Juana Calderon, Kanisha Calhoun, Renee C. Calloway, Maribel Campillo, Mercedes Camplillo, Andrew Campos, Elizabeth A. Campos, Maricela Candelaria, Edith Cano, Laura Cardenas, Ruben Cardenas Nevarez Jr., Eugene Carnes, Debra Caro, Ebony Brown, Joyce A. Brown, Katanya Brown, Nakia Brown, Raychell L. Brown, Renee Brown, Sharon Brown, Shavonda Tanisha Brown, Sonia Brown, Willis Brown, Venita Bruce, Carla Burgess, Myrtle Burke, Beyerl Y. Burney, Beverly J. Burns, Sarah Burns, Stephen Burnside, Ken Burroughs, Angelica Buston Moreno, Lashawndra Butler, Enrique Martinez, Guillermo Martinez, Isaac Martinez, Joe Martinez, Linda Martinez, Lita Martinez, Lynn Martinez, Miguel Martinez, Judy Maslow, Cheryl Matthews, Shanequa Maxwell, Harry McCall, Shirley McGee, Taryn McGill, Sharion McNeal, Gayretta Mcclendon, Geri Mcclure, El vetras B. Mccray, Joanne Mccray, Michael Jones Mccray Sr., Enrique Rubio, Linda Rubio, Teresa Rubio, Jeanette Rubio Linthicum, Arthur Rucker, Albert Ruiz, Sergio Ruiz, Stella Ruiz, Kim Rulon, Lynette Russell, Bassam Saba, Pogos Salakhorian, Yolanda Salamanca, Roxana Salazar, Marco A. Salazsar, Andres Salcedo, Carmen Salcedo, Araceli Saldana, Joey Saldate, Peggy Salmon, Felicia Foster, Michael Foster, Billy Fraizer, Galeana Francisco, Anselmo Franco Ramos, Sony A. Franklin, Trinell Franklin, Diane Freeman, Joann Freeman, Thomas Freeman, Delia Freitas, James French, Tasha French, Alma C. Freteluco, Rafael Delgado Fructuoso, Isabel Fuentes, Maria Fuentes, Ofelia Fuentes, Victoria Fuentes, Yaneth Fuerte, Felicia Hackett, Awatef Haddad, Bobbie Hamilton, Kim Hamlett, Doris Hanah, Sheila K. Handy, Deborah Hardson, William Hardson Jr., Fredonia Hargrove, Veronica Haro, Tammie Harper, Miriam Harris, Shanel Harris, Joanna Harrison, Samuele Harsin, Lisa D. Hart, Jeanette Hartwell, Anthony J. Haskin, Pauline Marie Hasselbrook, Arlette Hawkins, Fritzner Leonard, Uriel G. Leslie III, Benisha Lewis, Lether Lewis, Lloyd Lewis, Miracle Lewis, Monique Lewis, Shaquandia Lewis, Karon Lewis, Wiliam E. Lewis Jr., Sandra Lezama, Marisela Linares, Tosha Lipkins, Key Ana Little, Andre Littlejohn, Christina C. Lizaola, Patrick Llamas, Rosemary Llamas, Laura Lock, Martha Lomeli, Gail Reyes, Martha Reyes, Rene Reyes, Carl Reynolds, Mable R. Reynolds, Vevelyn Reynolds, Terrell Rice, Lisa Rich, Brenda K. Richardson, Diane Richardson, Delbra A. Ricketts, Roberto A. Rico, Miko Riddick, Sharon Ridenour, Albin T. Riemann, Canarie R. Riles, Colleen Gail Johnson Riley, Maria Rincon, Alejandro C. Rios, Jesus M. Rios, Gene Saulsberry, Tanisha Savage, Renee Sawyer, Marchell N. Scott, Rosa E. Seals, Glenda Sealy, Stacey L. Seay, Roseann Segura, Antonio D. Sena, Omar R. Sepulveda, Maik N. Serrano Calderon, Sherry Lynne Seymore, Kyalo Shabazz, Corey Shaw, Dwayne M. Sheffield, Mclessie Shell, Nicolas Shellenbarger, Tamara Shelmon-Beaver, Linda Shepherd, Cynthia Sheppard, Guillermo Mendoza, Manuel Jesus Menjivar, Manuel Menjivar, Miguel Menjivar, Milady Menjivar, Miguel F. Menjivar Sr., Maura Meza, Maria Milagro, Brian Miller, Melinda A. Miller, Nora Lee Miller, Raychel Miller, Tina Miller, Wilma Minix, Fred Minor, Soledad Miramontes, Rhonda L. Miranda, Patricia Mogart, Rosal Molina, Marisela Moncada, Henry D. Jacobs, Latesha Jacobs, Gertrude Jamerson, Cheryl James, Betty A. Jamison, Robin Jamison, Christy Jarvis, Rufus Jemison, Israel Jimenez, Lashondra Jimmerson, Brenda J. Johnson, Delois P. Johnson, Dolly Edna Johnson, Henry Johnson, Kenneth Johnson, Latrice Johnson, Mario Johnson, Michael B. Johnson, Olega V. Johnson, Sazbra Johnson, J.T. Carr, William Carranza, Armando Carranza-RioFrio, Marie E. Carrasco, Rebeca Carreon, Amparo Carrero, J.T. Carrillo, Josephina Carrillo, Maria Carrillo, Harry Carrington, Lisha Carson, Michael D. Carson, Esther Carter, Ronald E. Carter, Ronique L. Carter, Josee Moreno Casaca, John G. Casarubbia, Anna Christine Castano, Oscar Castellon, Alejandra V. Castillo, Jackquelyn Portis, Mary Portus, Gwendolyn L. Pounds, Valerie Powns, Katrina Pratt, Raul Preza, Deleon Price, Jeff Proitte, Eddie Pruitt, Lizbeth Puga, Jose F. Pulido, Lodema Purtty, Sue Quintero, Marcella E. Radford, Cathy L. Raeck, Julie Raigoza, Vernon Railey, Angelica Ramirez, Donna Ramirez, Elena Ramirez, Janette Cortez, Rodolfo Cortez, Helena Nelson Cottrell, Tyesha Cox, Sharon A. Crawford, Terri A. Crone, Edna Croutch, Dina Cruz, Francisco Cruz, Irma Yolanda Cruz, Javier Juarez Cruz, Marcos Cruz, Maria D. Cruz, Rayas Mirian Cruz, Virgil Cruz, Sylvia Cruz Baltazar, Santiago Cruz Ramirez, Juan A. Cuan De Leon, Jose Antonio Cubillo, Juan Chavez Cubillo, Jesus Preciado Barraza, Isabel Barrientes, Annette Barron, Nicole Bartley, Art Bates, Cameo Bates, Theola Baugh, Michael Bay, Jose Baza, Francis Bazo, Bridget Beach, Vanessa Bean, Tayell Beans, Yesenia Becerra, Martha Bedolla, Teyonye Belcher, Latrice Bell, Venita Bell, Jake Bell Jr., Jeanette Belmudez, Joana Ortiz Amaya, Omar G. Osorio, Armando Oviedo, Carol Pacheco, Leticia Pacheco, Bernice Pack, Guadalupe Padilla, Lisa W. Padilla, Patricia Padilla, Pedro Jesus Padilla, Ii Carlos Paez, Patricia Page, Demsy O. Paiz, Zoraida Palacios, Luis Palafox Casillas, Armando Palma, Juan Panameno, Daniel Parga, George Parga, Vanessa Parker, John L. Dills, Vivian Dinkins, Ronald S. Doody, Rachel Dorado, Doris Douglas, Venetta Douglas, Cathy Downey, Sharron Dozier, Inell Dukes, Allison Dulin, Geraldine Dunn, Roslyn Dunn, Sharon Dunning, Rafael Duran, Susana Duran Alonso, Laura Ebeling, Darlene Eberline, Pete Echavarria, Elissia A. Eddins, Jose Daniel Colato, Richard Coleman, Stephanie Coleman, Lora D. Collis, Katrina Colston, Eileen Connor, Margarita Contreras, Vicki Contreras, Laron Cooksey, Laron Cooksey, Jr., Erma Jean Cooper, Constance M. Coplan, Jamar Corley, Luis R. Corona, Melodie Corona, Susan Corona, Florentino Correa, Salvador Correa III, Rosa E. Correa Solis, Hugo Cortes, Jose Gonzalez, Jose Luis Gonzalez, Juan Gonz
December 23, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT filed by Plaintiffs Alice Lopez, Cecilio Lopez, Claudia Lopez, Cynthia Lopez, Gerardo Lopez, Gilberto Lopez, Hector Lopez, Jorge A. Lopez, Julio A. Lopez, M. Alfredo Lopez, Manuel Lopez, Mardoqueo Lopez, Maribel Lopez, Miguel A. Lopez, Norma Lopez, Paulette A. Lopez, Peter Lopez, Regina Lopez, Sanjuana Lujano Lopez, Tanya Lopez, Alton Wilkerson, Ernestina Wilkiewicz, Adam Williams, Andrina Williams, Angela Williams, Belinda Williams, Betty Williams, Demetrius Williams, Dominque Williams, Hildred Huggins Williams, Irece Williams, Jackie Williams, James Albert Williams, Lushon Williams, Regina Williams, Victoria Williams, Kevin Wilridge, Chelsea Wilson, Debbie Wilson, Jessica Wilson, Ana Dolores Solano Funes, Karen D. Gable, Lori A. Gafford, Joseph B. Gaines, Helcias Galan Hernandez, Antoinette Galarza, Tatiana Galburth, Dalila A. Galdamez, Joel Gallegos, Juan C. Gallegos, Connie Y. Gallimore, Rose Gamage, Bertha N. Gamez, Troylyn Brown Gammage, Carlos Garay, Alejandra Garcia, Angela P. Garcia, Carol Garcia, Elizabeth Garcia, Jose Luis Garcia, Antonio Alcaraz, Veronica Alcazar, Erwin S. Alcorn, Barbara Alexander, Deora Alexander, Francisco Alfaro, Marta Alfaro, Transito Alferez, Ella Alford, Ramon Alfred Bedolla, Joshua Allen, Donell Allison, Eusebio Alonso, Ruby Alonso, Angel A. Alonzo, Regino Alonzo, Amalia R. Altamirano, Angelica Alvarado, Rosalino Alvarado, Jacqueline L. Amaya, Brittney Hockett, Marvella P. Hogan, Erika Holguin Mungia, Gina Holland, Teresa Hollins, Lashonda Holloway, Roy Holmes, Damon Holmes Sr., Reymundo Honesto Jr., Diana Honore, Gregory C. Hood, Kevin Hosannah, Raymond House, Eugene Howard, Kirk Howard, Oscar G. Howard, Elizabeth Hudson, Patricia Hudson, Sharon Hudson, Jacqueline D. Hudson, Chana Edwards, Mario Eli Enriquez, Karen Elliott, Richard Ellis, Cathy Mynette Ellison, Digna Enamorado, Eric English, Erica English, Enrique, Francisca Erazo, Denicia A. Espinola, Esmeralda Espinola, Teresa Espinosa, Roberto Espinoza, Victor H. Espinoza, Flora Estrada, Pedro C. Euquiano, Samuel A. Evangelista, Mishonda Everett, Vincent Everett, Clayton S. Kraft, Damian A. La Verde, Monica Lacy, Connie Ladner, Alvina K. Lakey, Allex Lambert, Robin T. Landers, Margaret Lands, Christy Lane, Edward Lane III, Arlester Lavine, Ansert Lawrence, Wanda Lechuga, Monica Ledesma, Lucille Lee, Betty Ann Lee, Latoya R. Lee, Frieda Lee-Crockett, Francisco Ovidio Lemus, Hilario Leon, Danita Hayes, Derrick E.L. Hayes, Patricia Hecker, Ileen Hemphill, Janet Henderson, Shakena Henderson, Ward Henderson, Gloria Hendrix, Carlos Henriquez, Cindy Henriquez, Harvey W. Henry, Maria Heredia, Steve Heredia, Edgar Armando Hernandez, Elizabeth Hernandez, Irene Hernandez, Jesse M. Hernandez, Joaquin Hernandez, Jorge Hernandez, Margaret Hernandez, Darla Moreno, Jorge R. Moreno, Linda V. Moreno, Condessa Morris, Leslie Morris, Stephanie Morris, Paul Terrell Morris Jr., Leah M. Moten, James Motty, Ciwilla Mouton, Theresa Moye, Erika Mungia, Linda Munniks, Javier R. Munos, Catalina Munoz, Dolores Murcia, Camella T. Murillo, Mary Louise Murphy, Beatrice Murray, Michael Murray, David L. Jorgensen, Darlene Joseph, Rafael E. Jovee, Jean Juarez, Javier Juarez Cruz, Tammy Jump, Johnny Kaisaki, Mekonnen Kassa, Christopher A. Kelly, Jacqueline Kendrick, Michael Scott Kenna, Tyreisha Kennedy, Jill Marie King, Peggy King, Ronidia King-Mccall, Paula Kizzee, Gina Knight, Jane Knopp, Grigor Kokoyan, Daniel Kolling, Debra L. Tatum, Brenda Kay Taylor, Deborah Taylor, Dimica Taylor, Donnesha Taylor, Jasmine Taylor, Marlene Taylor, Patricia Taylor, Michael D. Taylor Jr., Cristobal Tebalan Sonta Y., Carla Tennell, Margaret M. Terrones, Noreen Thomas, Rosemary Thomas, Tammie L. Thomas, Lena Thompkins, Donna Thompson, Kimberly Thompson, Lady Thompson, Toni Thompson, Dessie Walls, Monica Walton, Saraan Ward, Cynthia F. Ward Montoy A, Lashonda Ware, Vivian Ware, Brandi Warren, Victoria Warren, Antoinette Washington, Francis Washington, Trinette Washington, Yolanda Washinton, Darrian Wayne, Denisha Weaver, Monique Webb, Tanisha West, Ruby Wide, Erika Wilburn, Linda J. Wilcher, Tammy L. Wilcox, Donette E. Byrd, Javier Caballero, Albert L. Caballes, Adrian Cabral, Jose A. Cabrales, Noe Cabrales, Anne Cabrera, Juana Calderon, Kanisha Calhoun, Renee C. Calloway, Maribel Campillo, Mercedes Camplillo, Andrew Campos, Elizabeth A. Campos, Maricela Candelaria, Edith Cano, Laura Cardenas, Ruben Cardenas Nevarez Jr., Eugene Carnes, Debra Caro, Ebony Brown, Joyce A. Brown, Katanya Brown, Nakia Brown, Raychell L. Brown, Renee Brown, Sharon Brown, Shavonda Tanisha Brown, Sonia Brown, Willis Brown, Venita Bruce, Carla Burgess, Myrtle Burke, Beyerl Y. Burney, Beverly J. Burns, Sarah Burns, Stephen Burnside, Ken Burroughs, Angelica Buston Moreno, Lashawndra Butler, Enrique Martinez, Guillermo Martinez, Isaac Martinez, Joe Martinez, Linda Martinez, Lita Martinez, Lynn Martinez, Miguel Martinez, Judy Maslow, Cheryl Matthews, Shanequa Maxwell, Harry McCall, Shirley McGee, Taryn McGill, Sharion McNeal, Gayretta Mcclendon, Geri Mcclure, El vetras B. Mccray, Joanne Mccray, Michael Jones Mccray Sr., Enrique Rubio, Linda Rubio, Teresa Rubio, Jeanette Rubio Linthicum, Arthur Rucker, Albert Ruiz, Sergio Ruiz, Stella Ruiz, Kim Rulon, Lynette Russell, Bassam Saba, Pogos Salakhorian, Yolanda Salamanca, Roxana Salazar, Marco A. Salazsar, Andres Salcedo, Carmen Salcedo, Araceli Saldana, Joey Saldate, Peggy Salmon, Felicia Foster, Michael Foster, Billy Fraizer, Galeana Francisco, Anselmo Franco Ramos, Sony A. Franklin, Trinell Franklin, Diane Freeman, Joann Freeman, Thomas Freeman, Delia Freitas, James French, Tasha French, Alma C. Freteluco, Rafael Delgado Fructuoso, Isabel Fuentes, Maria Fuentes, Ofelia Fuentes, Victoria Fuentes, Yaneth Fuerte, Felicia Hackett, Awatef Haddad, Bobbie Hamilton, Kim Hamlett, Doris Hanah, Sheila K. Handy, Deborah Hardson, William Hardson Jr., Fredonia Hargrove, Veronica Haro, Tammie Harper, Miriam Harris, Shanel Harris, Joanna Harrison, Samuele Harsin, Lisa D. Hart, Jeanette Hartwell, Anthony J. Haskin, Pauline Marie Hasselbrook, Arlette Hawkins, Fritzner Leonard, Uriel G. Leslie III, Benisha Lewis, Lether Lewis, Lloyd Lewis, Miracle Lewis, Monique Lewis, Shaquandia Lewis, Karon Lewis, Wiliam E. Lewis Jr., Sandra Lezama, Marisela Linares, Tosha Lipkins, Key Ana Little, Andre Littlejohn, Christina C. Lizaola, Patrick Llamas, Rosemary Llamas, Laura Lock, Martha Lomeli, Gail Reyes, Martha Reyes, Rene Reyes, Carl Reynolds, Mable R. Reynolds, Vevelyn Reynolds, Terrell Rice, Lisa Rich, Brenda K. Richardson, Diane Richardson, Delbra A. Ricketts, Roberto A. Rico, Miko Riddick, Sharon Ridenour, Albin T. Riemann, Canarie R. Riles, Colleen Gail Johnson Riley, Maria Rincon, Alejandro C. Rios, Jesus M. Rios, Gene Saulsberry, Tanisha Savage, Renee Sawyer, Marchell N. Scott, Rosa E. Seals, Glenda Sealy, Stacey L. Seay, Roseann Segura, Antonio D. Sena, Omar R. Sepulveda, Maik N. Serrano Calderon, Sherry Lynne Seymore, Kyalo Shabazz, Corey Shaw, Dwayne M. Sheffield, Mclessie Shell, Nicolas Shellenbarger, Tamara Shelmon-Beaver, Linda Shepherd, Cynthia Sheppard, Guillermo Mendoza, Manuel Jesus Menjivar, Manuel Menjivar, Miguel Menjivar, Milady Menjivar, Miguel F. Menjivar Sr., Maura Meza, Maria Milagro, Brian Miller, Melinda A. Miller, Nora Lee Miller, Raychel Miller, Tina Miller, Wilma Minix, Fred Minor, Soledad Miramontes, Rhonda L. Miranda, Patricia Mogart, Rosal Molina, Marisela Moncada, Henry D. Jacobs, Latesha Jacobs, Gertrude Jamerson, Cheryl James, Betty A. Jamison, Robin Jamison, Christy Jarvis, Rufus Jemison, Israel Jimenez, Lashondra Jimmerson, Brenda J. Johnson, Delois P. Johnson, Dolly Edna Johnson, Henry Johnson, Kenneth Johnson, Latrice Johnson, Mario Johnson, Michael B. Johnson, Olega V. Johnson, Sazbra Johnson, J.T. Carr, William Carranza, Armando Carranza-RioFrio, Marie E. Carrasco, Rebeca Carreon, Amparo Carrero, J.T. Carrillo, Josephina Carrillo, Maria Carrillo, Harry Carrington, Lisha Carson, Michael D. Carson, Esther Carter, Ronald E. Carter, Ronique L. Carter, Josee Moreno Casaca, John G. Casarubbia, Anna Christine Castano, Oscar Castellon, Alejandra V. Castillo, Jackquelyn Portis, Mary Portus, Gwendolyn L. Pounds, Valerie Powns, Katrina Pratt, Raul Preza, Deleon Price, Jeff Proitte, Eddie Pruitt, Lizbeth Puga, Jose F. Pulido, Lodema Purtty, Sue Quintero, Marcella E. Radford, Cathy L. Raeck, Julie Raigoza, Vernon Railey, Angelica Ramirez, Donna Ramirez, Elena Ramirez, Janette Cortez, Rodolfo Cortez, Helena Nelson Cottrell, Tyesha Cox, Sharon A. Crawford, Terri A. Crone, Edna Croutch, Dina Cruz, Francisco Cruz, Irma Yolanda Cruz, Javier Juarez Cruz, Marcos Cruz, Maria D. Cruz, Rayas Mirian Cruz, Virgil Cruz, Sylvia Cruz Baltazar, Santiago Cruz Ramirez, Juan A. Cuan De Leon, Jose Antonio Cubillo, Juan Chavez Cubillo, Jesus Preciado Barraza, Isabel Barrientes, Annette Barron, Nicole Bartley, Art Bates, Cameo Bates, Theola Baugh, Michael Bay, Jose Baza, Francis Bazo, Bridget Beach, Vanessa Bean, Tayell Beans, Yesenia Becerra, Martha Bedolla, Teyonye Belcher, Latrice Bell, Venita Bell, Jake Bell Jr., Jeanette Belmudez, Joana Ortiz Amaya, Omar G. Osorio, Armando Oviedo, Carol Pacheco, Leticia Pacheco, Bernice Pack, Guadalupe Padilla, Lisa W. Padilla, Patricia Padilla, Pedro Jesus Padilla, Ii Carlos Paez, Patricia Page, Demsy O. Paiz, Zoraida Palacios, Luis Palafox Casillas, Armando Palma, Juan Panameno, Daniel Parga, George Parga, Vanessa Parker, John L. Dills, Vivian Dinkins, Ronald S. Doody, Rachel Dorado, Doris Douglas, Venetta Douglas, Cathy Downey, Sharron Dozier, Inell Dukes, Allison Dulin, Geraldine Dunn, Roslyn Dunn, Sharon Dunning, Rafael Duran, Susana Duran Alonso, Laura Ebeling, Darlene Eberline, Pete Echavarria, Elissia A. Eddins, Jose Daniel Colato, Richard Coleman, Stephanie Coleman, Lora D. Collis, Katrina Colston, Eileen Connor, Margarita Contreras, Vicki Contreras, Laron Cooksey, Laron Cooksey, Jr., Erma Jean Cooper, Constance M. Coplan, Jamar Corley, Luis R. Corona, Melodie Corona, Susan Corona, Florentino Correa, Salvador Correa III, Rosa E. Correa Solis, Hugo Cortes, Jose Gonzalez, Jose Luis Gonzalez, Juan Gonzalez, Lidia Gonzalez, Maria C. Gonzalez,
December 23, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court #10 filed by Plaintiffs Alice Lopez, Cecilio Lopez, Claudia Lopez, Cynthia Lopez, Gerardo Lopez, Gilberto Lopez, Hector Lopez, Jorge A. Lopez, Julio A. Lopez, M. Alfredo Lopez, Manuel Lopez, Mardoqueo Lopez, Maribel Lopez, Miguel A. Lopez, Norma Lopez, Paulette A. Lopez, Peter Lopez, Regina Lopez, Sanjuana Lujano Lopez, Tanya Lopez, Alton Wilkerson, Ernestina Wilkiewicz, Adam Williams, Andrina Williams, Angela Williams, Belinda Williams, Betty Williams, Demetrius Williams, Dominque Williams, Hildred Huggins Williams, Irece Williams, Jackie Williams, James Albert Williams, Lushon Williams, Regina Williams, Victoria Williams, Kevin Wilridge, Chelsea Wilson, Debbie Wilson, Jessica Wilson, Ana Dolores Solano Funes, Karen D. Gable, Lori A. Gafford, Joseph B. Gaines, Helcias Galan Hernandez, Antoinette Galarza, Tatiana Galburth, Dalila A. Galdamez, Joel Gallegos, Juan C. Gallegos, Connie Y. Gallimore, Rose Gamage, Bertha N. Gamez, Troylyn Brown Gammage, Carlos Garay, Alejandra Garcia, Angela P. Garcia, Carol Garcia, Elizabeth Garcia, Jose Luis Garcia, Antonio Alcaraz, Veronica Alcazar, Erwin S. Alcorn, Barbara Alexander, Deora Alexander, Francisco Alfaro, Marta Alfaro, Transito Alferez, Ella Alford, Ramon Alfred Bedolla, Joshua Allen, Donell Allison, Eusebio Alonso, Ruby Alonso, Angel A. Alonzo, Regino Alonzo, Amalia R. Altamirano, Angelica Alvarado, Rosalino Alvarado, Jacqueline L. Amaya, Brittney Hockett, Marvella P. Hogan, Erika Holguin Mungia, Gina Holland, Teresa Hollins, Lashonda Holloway, Roy Holmes, Damon Holmes Sr., Reymundo Honesto Jr., Diana Honore, Gregory C. Hood, Kevin Hosannah, Raymond House, Eugene Howard, Kirk Howard, Oscar G. Howard, Elizabeth Hudson, Patricia Hudson, Sharon Hudson, Jacqueline D. Hudson, Chana Edwards, Mario Eli Enriquez, Karen Elliott, Richard Ellis, Cathy Mynette Ellison, Digna Enamorado, Eric English, Erica English, Enrique, Francisca Erazo, Denicia A. Espinola, Esmeralda Espinola, Teresa Espinosa, Roberto Espinoza, Victor H. Espinoza, Flora Estrada, Pedro C. Euquiano, Samuel A. Evangelista, Mishonda Everett, Vincent Everett, Clayton S. Kraft, Damian A. La Verde, Monica Lacy, Connie Ladner, Alvina K. Lakey, Allex Lambert, Robin T. Landers, Margaret Lands, Christy Lane, Edward Lane III, Arlester Lavine, Ansert Lawrence, Wanda Lechuga, Monica Ledesma, Lucille Lee, Betty Ann Lee, Latoya R. Lee, Frieda Lee-Crockett, Francisco Ovidio Lemus, Hilario Leon, Danita Hayes, Derrick E.L. Hayes, Patricia Hecker, Ileen Hemphill, Janet Henderson, Shakena Henderson, Ward Henderson, Gloria Hendrix, Carlos Henriquez, Cindy Henriquez, Harvey W. Henry, Maria Heredia, Steve Heredia, Edgar Armando Hernandez, Elizabeth Hernandez, Irene Hernandez, Jesse M. Hernandez, Joaquin Hernandez, Jorge Hernandez, Margaret Hernandez, Darla Moreno, Jorge R. Moreno, Linda V. Moreno, Condessa Morris, Leslie Morris, Stephanie Morris, Paul Terrell Morris Jr., Leah M. Moten, James Motty, Ciwilla Mouton, Theresa Moye, Erika Mungia, Linda Munniks, Javier R. Munos, Catalina Munoz, Dolores Murcia, Camella T. Murillo, Mary Louise Murphy, Beatrice Murray, Michael Murray, David L. Jorgensen, Darlene Joseph, Rafael E. Jovee, Jean Juarez, Javier Juarez Cruz, Tammy Jump, Johnny Kaisaki, Mekonnen Kassa, Christopher A. Kelly, Jacqueline Kendrick, Michael Scott Kenna, Tyreisha Kennedy, Jill Marie King, Peggy King, Ronidia King-Mccall, Paula Kizzee, Gina Knight, Jane Knopp, Grigor Kokoyan, Daniel Kolling, Debra L. Tatum, Brenda Kay Taylor, Deborah Taylor, Dimica Taylor, Donnesha Taylor, Jasmine Taylor, Marlene Taylor, Patricia Taylor, Michael D. Taylor Jr., Cristobal Tebalan Sonta Y., Carla Tennell, Margaret M. Terrones, Noreen Thomas, Rosemary Thomas, Tammie L. Thomas, Lena Thompkins, Donna Thompson, Kimberly Thompson, Lady Thompson, Toni Thompson, Dessie Walls, Monica Walton, Saraan Ward, Cynthia F. Ward Montoy A, Lashonda Ware, Vivian Ware, Brandi Warren, Victoria Warren, Antoinette Washington, Francis Washington, Trinette Washington, Yolanda Washinton, Darrian Wayne, Denisha Weaver, Monique Webb, Tanisha West, Ruby Wide, Erika Wilburn, Linda J. Wilcher, Tammy L. Wilcox, Donette E. Byrd, Javier Caballero, Albert L. Caballes, Adrian Cabral, Jose A. Cabrales, Noe Cabrales, Anne Cabrera, Juana Calderon, Kanisha Calhoun, Renee C. Calloway, Maribel Campillo, Mercedes Camplillo, Andrew Campos, Elizabeth A. Campos, Maricela Candelaria, Edith Cano, Laura Cardenas, Ruben Cardenas Nevarez Jr., Eugene Carnes, Debra Caro, Ebony Brown, Joyce A. Brown, Katanya Brown, Nakia Brown, Raychell L. Brown, Renee Brown, Sharon Brown, Shavonda Tanisha Brown, Sonia Brown, Willis Brown, Venita Bruce, Carla Burgess, Myrtle Burke, Beyerl Y. Burney, Beverly J. Burns, Sarah Burns, Stephen Burnside, Ken Burroughs, Angelica Buston Moreno, Lashawndra Butler, Enrique Martinez, Guillermo Martinez, Isaac Martinez, Joe Martinez, Linda Martinez, Lita Martinez, Lynn Martinez, Miguel Martinez, Judy Maslow, Cheryl Matthews, Shanequa Maxwell, Harry McCall, Shirley McGee, Taryn McGill, Sharion McNeal, Gayretta Mcclendon, Geri Mcclure, El vetras B. Mccray, Joanne Mccray, Michael Jones Mccray Sr., Enrique Rubio, Linda Rubio, Teresa Rubio, Jeanette Rubio Linthicum, Arthur Rucker, Albert Ruiz, Sergio Ruiz, Stella Ruiz, Kim Rulon, Lynette Russell, Bassam Saba, Pogos Salakhorian, Yolanda Salamanca, Roxana Salazar, Marco A. Salazsar, Andres Salcedo, Carmen Salcedo, Araceli Saldana, Joey Saldate, Peggy Salmon, Felicia Foster, Michael Foster, Billy Fraizer, Galeana Francisco, Anselmo Franco Ramos, Sony A. Franklin, Trinell Franklin, Diane Freeman, Joann Freeman, Thomas Freeman, Delia Freitas, James French, Tasha French, Alma C. Freteluco, Rafael Delgado Fructuoso, Isabel Fuentes, Maria Fuentes, Ofelia Fuentes, Victoria Fuentes, Yaneth Fuerte, Felicia Hackett, Awatef Haddad, Bobbie Hamilton, Kim Hamlett, Doris Hanah, Sheila K. Handy, Deborah Hardson, William Hardson Jr., Fredonia Hargrove, Veronica Haro, Tammie Harper, Miriam Harris, Shanel Harris, Joanna Harrison, Samuele Harsin, Lisa D. Hart, Jeanette Hartwell, Anthony J. Haskin, Pauline Marie Hasselbrook, Arlette Hawkins, Fritzner Leonard, Uriel G. Leslie III, Benisha Lewis, Lether Lewis, Lloyd Lewis, Miracle Lewis, Monique Lewis, Shaquandia Lewis, Karon Lewis, Wiliam E. Lewis Jr., Sandra Lezama, Marisela Linares, Tosha Lipkins, Key Ana Little, Andre Littlejohn, Christina C. Lizaola, Patrick Llamas, Rosemary Llamas, Laura Lock, Martha Lomeli, Gail Reyes, Martha Reyes, Rene Reyes, Carl Reynolds, Mable R. Reynolds, Vevelyn Reynolds, Terrell Rice, Lisa Rich, Brenda K. Richardson, Diane Richardson, Delbra A. Ricketts, Roberto A. Rico, Miko Riddick, Sharon Ridenour, Albin T. Riemann, Canarie R. Riles, Colleen Gail Johnson Riley, Maria Rincon, Alejandro C. Rios, Jesus M. Rios, Gene Saulsberry, Tanisha Savage, Renee Sawyer, Marchell N. Scott, Rosa E. Seals, Glenda Sealy, Stacey L. Seay, Roseann Segura, Antonio D. Sena, Omar R. Sepulveda, Maik N. Serrano Calderon, Sherry Lynne Seymore, Kyalo Shabazz, Corey Shaw, Dwayne M. Sheffield, Mclessie Shell, Nicolas Shellenbarger, Tamara Shelmon-Beaver, Linda Shepherd, Cynthia Sheppard, Guillermo Mendoza, Manuel Jesus Menjivar, Manuel Menjivar, Miguel Menjivar, Milady Menjivar, Miguel F. Menjivar Sr., Maura Meza, Maria Milagro, Brian Miller, Melinda A. Miller, Nora Lee Miller, Raychel Miller, Tina Miller, Wilma Minix, Fred Minor, Soledad Miramontes, Rhonda L. Miranda, Patricia Mogart, Rosal Molina, Marisela Moncada, Henry D. Jacobs, Latesha Jacobs, Gertrude Jamerson, Cheryl James, Betty A. Jamison, Robin Jamison, Christy Jarvis, Rufus Jemison, Israel Jimenez, Lashondra Jimmerson, Brenda J. Johnson, Delois P. Johnson, Dolly Edna Johnson, Henry Johnson, Kenneth Johnson, Latrice Johnson, Mario Johnson, Michael B. Johnson, Olega V. Johnson, Sazbra Johnson, J.T. Carr, William Carranza, Armando Carranza-RioFrio, Marie E. Carrasco, Rebeca Carreon, Amparo Carrero, J.T. Carrillo, Josephina Carrillo, Maria Carrillo, Harry Carrington, Lisha Carson, Michael D. Carson, Esther Carter, Ronald E. Carter, Ronique L. Carter, Josee Moreno Casaca, John G. Casarubbia, Anna Christine Castano, Oscar Castellon, Alejandra V. Castillo, Jackquelyn Portis, Mary Portus, Gwendolyn L. Pounds, Valerie Powns, Katrina Pratt, Raul Preza, Deleon Price, Jeff Proitte, Eddie Pruitt, Lizbeth Puga, Jose F. Pulido, Lodema Purtty, Sue Quintero, Marcella E. Radford, Cathy L. Raeck, Julie Raigoza, Vernon Railey, Angelica Ramirez, Donna Ramirez, Elena Ramirez, Janette Cortez, Rodolfo Cortez, Helena Nelson Cottrell, Tyesha Cox, Sharon A. Crawford, Terri A. Crone, Edna Croutch, Dina Cruz, Francisco Cruz, Irma Yolanda Cruz, Javier Juarez Cruz, Marcos Cruz, Maria D. Cruz, Rayas Mirian Cruz, Virgil Cruz, Sylvia Cruz Baltazar, Santiago Cruz Ramirez, Juan A. Cuan De Leon, Jose Antonio Cubillo, Juan Chavez Cubillo, Jesus Preciado Barraza, Isabel Barrientes, Annette Barron, Nicole Bartley, Art Bates, Cameo Bates, Theola Baugh, Michael Bay, Jose Baza, Francis Bazo, Bridget Beach, Vanessa Bean, Tayell Beans, Yesenia Becerra, Martha Bedolla, Teyonye Belcher, Latrice Bell, Venita Bell, Jake Bell Jr., Jeanette Belmudez, Joana Ortiz Amaya, Omar G. Osorio, Armando Oviedo, Carol Pacheco, Leticia Pacheco, Bernice Pack, Guadalupe Padilla, Lisa W. Padilla, Patricia Padilla, Pedro Jesus Padilla, Ii Carlos Paez, Patricia Page, Demsy O. Paiz, Zoraida Palacios, Luis Palafox Casillas, Armando Palma, Juan Panameno, Daniel Parga, George Parga, Vanessa Parker, John L. Dills, Vivian Dinkins, Ronald S. Doody, Rachel Dorado, Doris Douglas, Venetta Douglas, Cathy Downey, Sharron Dozier, Inell Dukes, Allison Dulin, Geraldine Dunn, Roslyn Dunn, Sharon Dunning, Rafael Duran, Susana Duran Alonso, Laura Ebeling, Darlene Eberline, Pete Echavarria, Elissia A. Eddins, Jose Daniel Colato, Richard Coleman, Stephanie Coleman, Lora D. Collis, Katrina Colston, Eileen Connor, Margarita Contreras, Vicki Contreras, Laron Cooksey, Laron Cooksey, Jr., Erma Jean Cooper, Constance M. Coplan, Jamar Corley, Luis R. Corona, Melodie Corona, Susan Corona, Florentino Correa, Salvador Correa III, Rosa E. Correa Solis, Hugo Cortes, Jose
December 17, 2020 Filing 11 Defendants First Student, Inc. and First Transit, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court #10 filed by Defendants First Student Inc., First Transit, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin A. Emmert in Support of Defendants First Student, Inc. and First Transit, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand)(Emmert, Benjamin)
December 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Alice Lopez, Cecilio Lopez, Claudia Lopez, Cynthia Lopez, Gerardo Lopez, Gilberto Lopez, Hector Lopez, Jorge A. Lopez, Julio A. Lopez, M. Alfredo Lopez, Manuel Lopez, Mardoqueo Lopez, Maribel Lopez, Miguel A. Lopez, Norma Lopez, Paulette A. Lopez, Peter Lopez, Regina Lopez, Sanjuana Lujano Lopez, Tanya Lopez, Alton Wilkerson, Ernestina Wilkiewicz, Adam Williams, Andrina Williams, Angela Williams, Belinda Williams, Betty Williams, Demetrius Williams, Dominque Williams, Hildred Huggins Williams, Irece Williams, Jackie Williams, James Albert Williams, Lushon Williams, Regina Williams, Victoria Williams, Kevin Wilridge, Chelsea Wilson, Debbie Wilson, Jessica Wilson, Ana Dolores Solano Funes, Karen D. Gable, Lori A. Gafford, Joseph B. Gaines, Helcias Galan Hernandez, Antoinette Galarza, Tatiana Galburth, Dalila A. Galdamez, Joel Gallegos, Juan C. Gallegos, Connie Y. Gallimore, Rose Gamage, Bertha N. Gamez, Troylyn Brown Gammage, Carlos Garay, Alejandra Garcia, Angela P. Garcia, Carol Garcia, Elizabeth Garcia, Jose Luis Garcia, Antonio Alcaraz, Veronica Alcazar, Erwin S. Alcorn, Barbara Alexander, Deora Alexander, Francisco Alfaro, Marta Alfaro, Transito Alferez, Ella Alford, Ramon Alfred Bedolla, Joshua Allen, Donell Allison, Eusebio Alonso, Ruby Alonso, Angel A. Alonzo, Regino Alonzo, Amalia R. Altamirano, Angelica Alvarado, Rosalino Alvarado, Jacqueline L. Amaya, Brittney Hockett, Marvella P. Hogan, Erika Holguin Mungia, Gina Holland, Teresa Hollins, Lashonda Holloway, Roy Holmes, Damon Holmes Sr., Reymundo Honesto Jr., Diana Honore, Gregory C. Hood, Kevin Hosannah, Raymond House, Eugene Howard, Kirk Howard, Oscar G. Howard, Elizabeth Hudson, Patricia Hudson, Sharon Hudson, Jacqueline D. Hudson, Chana Edwards, Mario Eli Enriquez, Karen Elliott, Richard Ellis, Cathy Mynette Ellison, Digna Enamorado, Eric English, Erica English, Enrique, Francisca Erazo, Denicia A. Espinola, Esmeralda Espinola, Teresa Espinosa, Roberto Espinoza, Victor H. Espinoza, Flora Estrada, Pedro C. Euquiano, Samuel A. Evangelista, Mishonda Everett, Vincent Everett, Clayton S. Kraft, Damian A. La Verde, Monica Lacy, Connie Ladner, Alvina K. Lakey, Allex Lambert, Robin T. Landers, Margaret Lands, Christy Lane, Edward Lane III, Arlester Lavine, Ansert Lawrence, Wanda Lechuga, Monica Ledesma, Lucille Lee, Betty Ann Lee, Latoya R. Lee, Frieda Lee-Crockett, Francisco Ovidio Lemus, Hilario Leon, Danita Hayes, Derrick E.L. Hayes, Patricia Hecker, Ileen Hemphill, Janet Henderson, Shakena Henderson, Ward Henderson, Gloria Hendrix, Carlos Henriquez, Cindy Henriquez, Harvey W. Henry, Maria Heredia, Steve Heredia, Edgar Armando Hernandez, Elizabeth Hernandez, Irene Hernandez, Jesse M. Hernandez, Joaquin Hernandez, Jorge Hernandez, Margaret Hernandez, Darla Moreno, Jorge R. Moreno, Linda V. Moreno, Condessa Morris, Leslie Morris, Stephanie Morris, Paul Terrell Morris Jr., Leah M. Moten, James Motty, Ciwilla Mouton, Theresa Moye, Erika Mungia, Linda Munniks, Javier R. Munos, Catalina Munoz, Dolores Murcia, Camella T. Murillo, Mary Louise Murphy, Beatrice Murray, Michael Murray, David L. Jorgensen, Darlene Joseph, Rafael E. Jovee, Jean Juarez, Javier Juarez Cruz, Tammy Jump, Johnny Kaisaki, Mekonnen Kassa, Christopher A. Kelly, Jacqueline Kendrick, Michael Scott Kenna, Tyreisha Kennedy, Jill Marie King, Peggy King, Ronidia King-Mccall, Paula Kizzee, Gina Knight, Jane Knopp, Grigor Kokoyan, Daniel Kolling, Debra L. Tatum, Brenda Kay Taylor, Deborah Taylor, Dimica Taylor, Donnesha Taylor, Jasmine Taylor, Marlene Taylor, Patricia Taylor, Michael D. Taylor Jr., Cristobal Tebalan Sonta Y., Carla Tennell, Margaret M. Terrones, Noreen Thomas, Rosemary Thomas, Tammie L. Thomas, Lena Thompkins, Donna Thompson, Kimberly Thompson, Lady Thompson, Toni Thompson, Dessie Walls, Monica Walton, Saraan Ward, Cynthia F. Ward Montoy A, Lashonda Ware, Vivian Ware, Brandi Warren, Victoria Warren, Antoinette Washington, Francis Washington, Trinette Washington, Yolanda Washinton, Darrian Wayne, Denisha Weaver, Monique Webb, Tanisha West, Ruby Wide, Erika Wilburn, Linda J. Wilcher, Tammy L. Wilcox, Donette E. Byrd, Javier Caballero, Albert L. Caballes, Adrian Cabral, Jose A. Cabrales, Noe Cabrales, Anne Cabrera, Juana Calderon, Kanisha Calhoun, Renee C. Calloway, Maribel Campillo, Mercedes Camplillo, Andrew Campos, Elizabeth A. Campos, Maricela Candelaria, Edith Cano, Laura Cardenas, Ruben Cardenas Nevarez Jr., Eugene Carnes, Debra Caro, Ebony Brown, Joyce A. Brown, Katanya Brown, Nakia Brown, Raychell L. Brown, Renee Brown, Sharon Brown, Shavonda Tanisha Brown, Sonia Brown, Willis Brown, Venita Bruce, Carla Burgess, Myrtle Burke, Beyerl Y. Burney, Beverly J. Burns, Sarah Burns, Stephen Burnside, Ken Burroughs, Angelica Buston Moreno, Lashawndra Butler, Enrique Martinez, Guillermo Martinez, Isaac Martinez, Joe Martinez, Linda Martinez, Lita Martinez, Lynn Martinez, Miguel Martinez, Judy Maslow, Cheryl Matthews, Shanequa Maxwell, Harry McCall, Shirley McGee, Taryn McGill, Sharion McNeal, Gayretta Mcclendon, Geri Mcclure, El vetras B. Mccray, Joanne Mccray, Michael Jones Mccray Sr., Enrique Rubio, Linda Rubio, Teresa Rubio, Jeanette Rubio Linthicum, Arthur Rucker, Albert Ruiz, Sergio Ruiz, Stella Ruiz, Kim Rulon, Lynette Russell, Bassam Saba, Pogos Salakhorian, Yolanda Salamanca, Roxana Salazar, Marco A. Salazsar, Andres Salcedo, Carmen Salcedo, Araceli Saldana, Joey Saldate, Peggy Salmon, Felicia Foster, Michael Foster, Billy Fraizer, Galeana Francisco, Anselmo Franco Ramos, Sony A. Franklin, Trinell Franklin, Diane Freeman, Joann Freeman, Thomas Freeman, Delia Freitas, James French, Tasha French, Alma C. Freteluco, Rafael Delgado Fructuoso, Isabel Fuentes, Maria Fuentes, Ofelia Fuentes, Victoria Fuentes, Yaneth Fuerte, Felicia Hackett, Awatef Haddad, Bobbie Hamilton, Kim Hamlett, Doris Hanah, Sheila K. Handy, Deborah Hardson, William Hardson Jr., Fredonia Hargrove, Veronica Haro, Tammie Harper, Miriam Harris, Shanel Harris, Joanna Harrison, Samuele Harsin, Lisa D. Hart, Jeanette Hartwell, Anthony J. Haskin, Pauline Marie Hasselbrook, Arlette Hawkins, Fritzner Leonard, Uriel G. Leslie III, Benisha Lewis, Lether Lewis, Lloyd Lewis, Miracle Lewis, Monique Lewis, Shaquandia Lewis, Karon Lewis, Wiliam E. Lewis Jr., Sandra Lezama, Marisela Linares, Tosha Lipkins, Key Ana Little, Andre Littlejohn, Christina C. Lizaola, Patrick Llamas, Rosemary Llamas, Laura Lock, Martha Lomeli, Gail Reyes, Martha Reyes, Rene Reyes, Carl Reynolds, Mable R. Reynolds, Vevelyn Reynolds, Terrell Rice, Lisa Rich, Brenda K. Richardson, Diane Richardson, Delbra A. Ricketts, Roberto A. Rico, Miko Riddick, Sharon Ridenour, Albin T. Riemann, Canarie R. Riles, Colleen Gail Johnson Riley, Maria Rincon, Alejandro C. Rios, Jesus M. Rios, Gene Saulsberry, Tanisha Savage, Renee Sawyer, Marchell N. Scott, Rosa E. Seals, Glenda Sealy, Stacey L. Seay, Roseann Segura, Antonio D. Sena, Omar R. Sepulveda, Maik N. Serrano Calderon, Sherry Lynne Seymore, Kyalo Shabazz, Corey Shaw, Dwayne M. Sheffield, Mclessie Shell, Nicolas Shellenbarger, Tamara Shelmon-Beaver, Linda Shepherd, Cynthia Sheppard, Guillermo Mendoza, Manuel Jesus Menjivar, Manuel Menjivar, Miguel Menjivar, Milady Menjivar, Miguel F. Menjivar Sr., Maura Meza, Maria Milagro, Brian Miller, Melinda A. Miller, Nora Lee Miller, Raychel Miller, Tina Miller, Wilma Minix, Fred Minor, Soledad Miramontes, Rhonda L. Miranda, Patricia Mogart, Rosal Molina, Marisela Moncada, Henry D. Jacobs, Latesha Jacobs, Gertrude Jamerson, Cheryl James, Betty A. Jamison, Robin Jamison, Christy Jarvis, Rufus Jemison, Israel Jimenez, Lashondra Jimmerson, Brenda J. Johnson, Delois P. Johnson, Dolly Edna Johnson, Henry Johnson, Kenneth Johnson, Latrice Johnson, Mario Johnson, Michael B. Johnson, Olega V. Johnson, Sazbra Johnson, J.T. Carr, William Carranza, Armando Carranza-RioFrio, Marie E. Carrasco, Rebeca Carreon, Amparo Carrero, J.T. Carrillo, Josephina Carrillo, Maria Carrillo, Harry Carrington, Lisha Carson, Michael D. Carson, Esther Carter, Ronald E. Carter, Ronique L. Carter, Josee Moreno Casaca, John G. Casarubbia, Anna Christine Castano, Oscar Castellon, Alejandra V. Castillo, Jackquelyn Portis, Mary Portus, Gwendolyn L. Pounds, Valerie Powns, Katrina Pratt, Raul Preza, Deleon Price, Jeff Proitte, Eddie Pruitt, Lizbeth Puga, Jose F. Pulido, Lodema Purtty, Sue Quintero, Marcella E. Radford, Cathy L. Raeck, Julie Raigoza, Vernon Railey, Angelica Ramirez, Donna Ramirez, Elena Ramirez, Janette Cortez, Rodolfo Cortez, Helena Nelson Cottrell, Tyesha Cox, Sharon A. Crawford, Terri A. Crone, Edna Croutch, Dina Cruz, Francisco Cruz, Irma Yolanda Cruz, Javier Juarez Cruz, Marcos Cruz, Maria D. Cruz, Rayas Mirian Cruz, Virgil Cruz, Sylvia Cruz Baltazar, Santiago Cruz Ramirez, Juan A. Cuan De Leon, Jose Antonio Cubillo, Juan Chavez Cubillo, Jesus Preciado Barraza, Isabel Barrientes, Annette Barron, Nicole Bartley, Art Bates, Cameo Bates, Theola Baugh, Michael Bay, Jose Baza, Francis Bazo, Bridget Beach, Vanessa Bean, Tayell Beans, Yesenia Becerra, Martha Bedolla, Teyonye Belcher, Latrice Bell, Venita Bell, Jake Bell Jr., Jeanette Belmudez, Joana Ortiz Amaya, Omar G. Osorio, Armando Oviedo, Carol Pacheco, Leticia Pacheco, Bernice Pack, Guadalupe Padilla, Lisa W. Padilla, Patricia Padilla, Pedro Jesus Padilla, Ii Carlos Paez, Patricia Page, Demsy O. Paiz, Zoraida Palacios, Luis Palafox Casillas, Armando Palma, Juan Panameno, Daniel Parga, George Parga, Vanessa Parker, John L. Dills, Vivian Dinkins, Ronald S. Doody, Rachel Dorado, Doris Douglas, Venetta Douglas, Cathy Downey, Sharron Dozier, Inell Dukes, Allison Dulin, Geraldine Dunn, Roslyn Dunn, Sharon Dunning, Rafael Duran, Susana Duran Alonso, Laura Ebeling, Darlene Eberline, Pete Echavarria, Elissia A. Eddins, Jose Daniel Colato, Richard Coleman, Stephanie Coleman, Lora D. Collis, Katrina Colston, Eileen Connor, Margarita Contreras, Vicki Contreras, Laron Cooksey, Laron Cooksey, Jr., Erma Jean Cooper, Constance M. Coplan, Jamar Corley, Luis R. Corona, Melodie Corona, Susan Corona, Florentino Correa, Salvador Correa III, Rosa E. Correa Solis, Hugo Cortes, Jose Gonzalez, Jose Luis Gonz
December 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bridget R. O'Hara on behalf of Defendants HireRight, Inc., Hireright Solutions, Inc. (Attorney Bridget R. O'Hara added to party HireRight, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget R. O'Hara added to party HireRight, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget R. O'Hara added to party Hireright Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget R. O'Hara added to party Hireright Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(O'Hara, Bridget)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rod M Fliegel on behalf of Defendant Hireright Solutions, Inc. (Attorney Rod M Fliegel added to party Hireright Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rod M Fliegel added to party Hireright Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Fliegel, Rod)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/23/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car)
November 10, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF CONSOLIDATED FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-20, inclusive, First Student Inc., Hireright Solutions, Inc. Amending Consolidated Third Amended Complaint, Submitted with Attachment 10 Exhibit 44 to Notice of Removal #1 , filed by All Plaintiffs (car)
November 10, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF DEFENDANT FIRST STUDENT, INC. AND FIRST TRANSIT, INC.'S ANSWERS AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT Submitted with Attachment 10 Exhibit 37 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
November 10, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF DEFENDANT FIRST STUDENT, INC. AND FIRST TRANSIT, INC.'S ANSWERS AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Submitted with Attachment 8 Exhibit 28 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
November 10, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF CONSOLIDATED THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Hireright Solutions, Inc., Does 1-20, First Transit, Inc. amending Consolidated Second Amended Complaint - (Discovery), Submitted with Attachment 10 Exhibit 35 to Notice of Removal #1 Filed by Plaintiffs.(car) Modified on 11/24/2020 (car).
November 10, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF CONSOLIDATED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Hireright Solutions, Inc., Does 1-20, inclusive, First Student Inc. amending Consolidated First Amended Complaint - (Discovery), Submitted with Attachment 8 Exhibit 26 to Notice of Removal #1 Filed by Plaintiffs. (car) Modified on 11/24/2020 (car).
November 10, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF CONSOLIDATED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Hireright Solutions, Inc., Does 1-20, inclusive, First Student Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery), Submitted with Attachment 8 Exhibit 24 to Notice of Removal #1 Filed by Plaintiffs. (car)
November 10, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants First Student Inc., US Investigative Services, Inc., Does 1-20. Jury Demanded Filed in State Court on 10/13/2009 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 Filed by Plaintiffs. (car)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT DEFENDANTS FIRST STUDENT, INC. AND FIRST TRANSIT, INC.S CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS filed by Defendant First Student Inc. Cases identifying FirstGroup American Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Emmert, Benjamin)
November 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant First Student Inc. Cases. (Emmert, Benjamin)
November 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number JCCP4624 Receipt No: ACACDC-28942061 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant First Student Inc. Cases. (Attachments: #1 Compendium of Documents, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 3, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 4 - 5, #4 Exhibit Exhibits 6 -7, #5 Exhibit Exhibits 8 - 19, #6 Exhibit Exhibits 20 - 21, #7 Exhibit Exhibits 22, #8 Exhibit Exhibits 23 - 29, #9 Exhibit Exhibits 30, #10 Exhibit Exhibits 31 - 44, #11 Exhibit Exhibits 45 - 49, #12 Exhibit Exhibits 50 - 59, #13 Exhibit Exhibits 60 - 65, #14 Exhibit Exhibits 66 - 71, #15 Exhibit Exhibits 72, #16 Exhibit Exhibits 73, #17 Exhibit Exhibits 74 - 77, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 78 - 80, #19 Declaration, #20 Declaration) (Attorney Benjamin A Emmert added to party First Student Inc. Cases(pty:dft))(Emmert, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jesus Aguinaga et al v. First Student Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Student Inc. Cases
Represented By: Benjamin A Emmert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hireright Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Rod M Fliegel
Represented By: Bridget R O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Transit, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin A Emmert
Represented By: Ronald A Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Aguinaga
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Small
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Proitte
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Griselda Acevedo
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Henriquez
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Ernesto Rodriguez
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Alcazar
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Williams
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eusebio Alonso
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Tucker
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid J. Aguilar
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne M. Sheffield
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Mcelroy
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan M. Arroyo
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Freeman
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamar Corley
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danyell Daniel
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Small
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrna Aceves
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrell Addison
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A. Campos
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora Lee Miller
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Gamage
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noe Cabrales
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Rubio
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Rangel Larios
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verna Anderson
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evette Darty
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet L. Jackson-Henderson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vangelina Smith
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Marquez
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Downey
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tashyra Grier
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Rodriguez
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novalea Gibbs
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim D. Tabor
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latesha Jacobs
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Gallegos
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Haro
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Lopez
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana C. Sanchez
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Avila
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Portus
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Zepeda
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamar Parker
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyalo Shabazz
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsa Aguilar
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Gasca
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Dell
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Dantzler
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Johnson
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benisha Lewis
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Castillo Ledezma
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Hackett
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernestina Wilkiewicz
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Rouse
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafaela Rodriguez
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Kaisaki
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward O. Anthony
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Moore
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josee Moreno Casaca
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leticia Pacheco
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alva J. Smith
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Palafox Casillas
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Bazo
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carletta Wainwright
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allex Lambert
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Bartley
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Ernesto Vanegas
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Dulin
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosechell Murray
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Fuentes
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daegon Solorio
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis A. Mena L.
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leeann Zimmerman
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayela Garcia
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fritzner Leonard
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Smith
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Lane III
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolas Shellenbarger
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Burnside
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandra V. Castillo
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatiana Galburth
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlina Adams
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica L. Sandoval Lopez
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Talamantes
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda J. Wilcher
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Williams
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leticia Delgado
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan C. Gallegos
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Marie Winfield
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel A. Asencio
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sofia Ortiz
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flora Estrada
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Clarke
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noemi Rocha
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Avalos
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Garcia
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina C. Lizaola
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Pintor
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominque Williams
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodis Smith
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Gutierrez
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Garcia
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Ladner
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albin T. Riemann
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Armando Hernandez
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saadia Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila K. Handy
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole Jones
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Ocana
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey L. Seay
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose A. Cabrales
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia D. Cerpa
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Valle
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Elena Rodriguez
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ervin R. Young
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Jarvis
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Page
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Gershon
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frieda Lee-Crockett
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Bean
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugo Cortes
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Amezcua
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Garcia
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Gonzales
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Clay
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Marie King
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Freeman
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes Camplillo
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynne Deaton
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgil Cruz
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Baza
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bassam Saba
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebeca Carreon
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica June Sosa
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine Velasco
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beyerl Y. Burney
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco A. Salazsar
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Pruitt
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helcias Galan Hernandez
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Patterson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph A. Robinson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlesetta Grant
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetra R. Davies
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra L. Tatum
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Mendoza
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Woods
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica Alvarado
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan C. Chavez
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denisha Weaver
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca C. Rodriguez
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Fitch
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Lomeli
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Hollins
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Barron
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hardson Jr.
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Mynette Ellison
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maghan Wise
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma C. Freteluco
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lemitia C. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Araceli E. Arzate
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ella Alford
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Davis
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Cuthbert
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrick Tovmasian
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twanda Branom
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Panameno
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinette Washington
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laron Cooksey, Jr.
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Garcia
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Tait
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Neice
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Jesus Padilla
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Penn
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Fraizer
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Lopez
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bolden
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Clark
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Mendez
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Tuggle
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melodie Corona
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inell Dukes
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Ortega
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto A. Rico
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Richardson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly J. Burns
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrtle Burke
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanta Wilson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Cabrera
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Barajas
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Marquez
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Heredia
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Jonay Green
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicie H. George
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Quintero
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venetta Douglas
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynne Shobert
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Sanders
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karon Lewis
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Lydia Rojas
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Figueroa
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Lopez
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Palma
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica Romero
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Greenwood
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyreisha Kennedy
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Morris
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Beach
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Sandra Medina
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanel Harris
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elissia A. Eddins
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Taylor
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcella E. Radford
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Ovidio Lemus
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Custard
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Brown
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Araceli Saldana
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Jordan
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Howard
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Nava
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Knopp
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gevork Boduryan
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge A. Lopez
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac G. Velasquez
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawanda Simpson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willis Brown
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Thompson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Coleman
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Knight
Represented By: Randolph Hunter Pyle
Represented By: Tanya Tambling
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Catha Worthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers |