Braley v. Wasco State Prison, et al
Plaintiff: Thomas D. Braley
Defendant: Wasco State Prison, C. Cooper, M Hunter, M Markmann, Williams, Martinez, J Sanchez, George, Thompson, -, Nigh, Carbahal, L.A. Miller, Barthalmews and Massa
Case Number: 1:2007cv01423
Filed: September 28, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Oliver W. Wanger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Time Schedule Order as Moot 126 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/22/14: All future motions concerning Plaintiff's appeal should be filed with the US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (Hellings, J)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER ADDRESSING Plaintiff's Request for Complete Docket Entries 117 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/13/14: The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to send a copy of the docket in this action to Plaintiff. (Hellings, J)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE and ORDER Finding that Plaintiff is Not Entitled to Proceed in Forma Pauperis on Appeal Filed August 15, 2012; ORDER Directing Clerk's Office to Serve Copy of Order on Ninth Circuit, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/14/12. (Verduzco, M)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Adopting 90 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DENYING Plaintiff's 87 Motion for a Court Order signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/19/2012. (Sant Agata, S)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Adopting 94 Findings and Recommendations and Denying 93 Plaintiff's Motion for Court Order, signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/3/12. (Verduzco, M)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 AMENDED SECOND INFORMATIONAL ORDER - Notice And Warning Of Requirements For Opposing Defendants' Motion To Dismiss (ECF No. 78 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/12/2012. (Fahrney, E)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Plaintiff's Motion For A Court Order Be DENIED (ECF No. 93 ), Objections Due Within Twenty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/21/2012. F&R's referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 7/16/2012. (Fahrney, E)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Plaintiff's Motion for a Court Order be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/09/2012. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 6/11/2012. (Flores, E)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies 78 , 81 , 82 , OBJECTIONS DUE WITHIN THIRTY DAYS, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/16/12: Matter referred to Judge Ishii. (Hellings, J)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER denying 70 Motion for transcript of hearing signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/1/2011. (Lundstrom, T)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER ADOPTING 61 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants, signed by Senior Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 9/30/2011. M. Hunter, Martinez, Massa, Thompson, Wasco State Prison, Williams, C. Cooper and George terminated. (Jessen, A)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissing Certain Claims And Defendants (ECF No. 51 ), Objections Due Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/23/2011. Objections to F&R due by 9/26/2011. (Fahrney, E)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DISREGARDING 54 Motion for Certificate of Appealability; ORDER For Clerk to Serve Copy of This Order on Ninth Circuit, signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/26/2011. (Marrujo, C)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Adopting FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS And Denying Plaintiff's Motion For A Court Order (ECF Nos. 38 , 46 , 52 ) ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For An Order To Show Cause And A Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. 48 ), signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 6/15/2011. (Fahrney, E)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Motion for a Court Order be Denied; Objections Due Within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/9/2011. Referred to Judge Oliver W. Wanger. Objections to F&R due by 6/13/2011. (Sant Agata, S)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 3/21/2011 adopting 31 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending denial of 28 , 29 Motions; adopting 32 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending dismissal in part and denying 34 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Amended Complaint due by 4/25/2011). (Lundstrom, T)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal Of Action (Doc. 27 ), Objections Due Within 30 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/8/2011. F&R's referred to Judge Oliver W. Wanger; Objections to F&R due by 3/14/2011. (Fahrney, E)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying 21 Motion for Certificate of Appealability signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/18/2009. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braley v. Wasco State Prison, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas D. Braley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wasco State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Markmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson, -
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carbahal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barthalmews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?