Allen v. Stanislaus County et al
Plaintiff: Columbus Allen, Jr.
Defendant: Stanislaus County, Mark Puthuff, Adam Christianson, William Duncan, Ronald Lloyd, Brenda Suarez, Gregg Clifton, Galles, Ernie Radza, V. L. Truffa, White, Wright, Cardoza, Escarceza, Mauldin, Maze, McLeland, Meyers and Williams
Case Number: 1:2013cv00012
Filed: January 3, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to CLOSE Action Pursuant to Parties' Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/17/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER That Inmate Columbus Allen, Jr. CDCR# AE-1543 is no Longer Needed as a Participate in These Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum if Discharged, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/22/18. (Marrujo, C)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STIPULATION and ORDER to excuse individual Defendants from attending Settlement Conference 114 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/9/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 TENTATIVE PRETRIAL ORDER, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/7/2018. (Motions in limine shall be filed no later than 3/6/2018; Oppositions shall be filed no later than 3/16/2018; The court will hear arguments on any motions in limine on 3/22/2018, at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Each party is granted 14 days from the date of this order to file objections to the same. Each party is also granted 7 days thereafter to respond to the other party's objections. If no objections are filed, the order will become final without further order of this court.) (Gaumnitz, R) Modified (added MIL ddls) on 2/8/2018 (Gaumnitz, R).
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER to facilitate telephone call signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/6/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/22/2018. Jury Trial RESET for 4/10/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Jessen, A)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER setting Settlement Conference on 2/22/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (MJS) before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/3/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/17/2017. Attorney Joan R. Camagong, Frank P. Kelly, III, Amir M. Nassihi for Columbus Allen, Jr added. Status Conference set for 8/1/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Jessen, A)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 87 Motion for Reconsideration and DISMISSING 90 Motion to Stay as Moot, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/30/17. (Marrujo, C)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS WHY TERMINATING SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S SCHEDULING ORDER 84 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/15/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER DENYING, without Prejudice, Plaintiff's Third 85 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/16/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER ADOPTING 76 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN PART and ORDER DENYING 71 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/24/2017. (Jessen, A)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' 71 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/2/17. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER directing Defendants to submit complete copy of Deposition Transcript within Five Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/17/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Ex Parte Request to Extend the Page Limit on Filing of Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/13/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying 64 MOTION for Reconsideration of 11/12/2015 Order denying Request for Appointment of Counsel signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/11/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER DENYING 64 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/10/2015. (Jessen, A)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER OVERRULING PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE A DISPOSITIVE MOTION RELATING TO EXHAUSTION OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE REMEDIES AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL re 56 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/21/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO EXTEND THE TIME TO FILE A DISPOSITIVE MOTION RELATING TO EXHAUSTION OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE REMEDIES re 54 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/8/2015. (Dispositive Motions filed by 8/11/2015). (Lundstrom, T)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/24/2015 granting 52 Request to disregard Request for Entry of Default as moot. (Lundstrom, T)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DENYING 46 Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/20/2015. (Jessen, A)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ADOPTING 39 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL; ORDER DENYING 22 , 34 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to File a Further Response to Complaint Within Thirty (30) Days, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/12/2015. (Jessen, A)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 22 , 34 , 37 , 38 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/18/14: 30-Day Deadline; Matter referred to District Judge Ishii. (Hellings, J)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER VACATING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS ISSUED NOVEMBER 3, 2014 AND DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 29 , 35 , 36 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/4/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/3/2014 recommending that action be dismissed, with prejudice re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due within 14-days.(Lundstrom, T)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING Request for Reimbursement of U.S. Marshal's Service Fees signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/24/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/24/2014. Show Cause Response due by 10/28/2014.(Lundstrom, T)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Doc. 19 ) signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/30/2014. (Jessen, A)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 15 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/5/14: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING Certain Claims and Parties From Action for Failure to State a Claim and Referring Matter Back to Magistrate Judge for Further Proceedings, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/29/2014. Defendants White, Wright, Escarceza and McLeland terminated. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Stanislaus County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbus Allen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanislaus County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Puthuff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Christianson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Suarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Clifton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernie Radza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. L. Truffa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Escarceza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?