Goolsby v. Cate et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Goolsby
Defendant: Matthew Cate, K. Holland, M. Stainer, J. Lundy, M. Bryant, Reed, Plumlee, Uribe and Jordan
Case Number: 1:2013cv00119
Filed: January 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Giving Full Effect to Stipulation to Dismiss Case, with Prejudice, under Rule 41, and Ordering Clerk to Close Case signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/07/2016. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER FOLLOWING Discovery and Status Hearing Held on July 19, 2016 80 ; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 81 Motion to Supplement his Opposition to Defendants' Motion; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 83 Motion for Protective Order and/or Postponement of Deposition; ORDER for Defendants to Serve Discovery Responses pursuant to this Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 07/29/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE of Telephonic Status Conference Before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/7/2016. Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/19/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Jessen, A)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 SCHEDULING ORDER Following Status Conference held on December 11, 2015; ORDER Resolving Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and for Sanctions 58 ; ORDER Denying Defendants' Motion for Court to Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant, without Pre judice to Filing All-Inclusive Motion on or Before March 8, 2016 66 ; ORDER Denying Motion for Stay 70 ; ORDER for Parties to Exchange Discovery as Discussed by this Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/15/15. Settlement Conference set for 8/1/2016 at 10:00 AM; Confidential Settlement Conference Statement Date: 7/25/2016. (Verduzco, M)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Request for Withdrawal of Motion 61 ; ORDER WITHDRAWING Motion for Court to Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant, Require Plaintiff to Post Security and Issue a Pre-Filing Order, from Court's Caledar, without prejudice 46 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/10/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Notice of Telephonic Status Conference before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean/ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/2/2015. ( Status Conference set for 12/11/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 50 Motion for Stay; ORDER GRANTING Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Court to Declare Plaintiff Vexatious Litigant; Ninety-Day Deadline for Plaintiff to File Opposition signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/10/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING 37 Motion to Compel Defendants to Preserve Records, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 03/30/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/25/2013 disregarding 27 Motion to lift stay as moot and directing Clerk to file 28 Amended Complaint lodged on September 23, 2013. (Lundstrom, T)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Lifting Stay of Action signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 09/23/2013. (Flores, E)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 19 Request for STAY of Proceedings; ORDER STAYING Action Pending Resolution of Appeal signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/25/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING 13 Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER VACATING Court's 10 Order Issued on May 3, 2013; ORDER GRANTING 2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; ORDER DIRECTING Payment of Inmate Filing Fee by California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/6/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING 11 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION and GRANTING REQUEST TO DISMISS CO-PLAINTIFFS ACTIONS, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, EXCUSING THE FILING FEE, SUBJECT TO CO-PLAINTIFFS FOLLOWING INSTRUCTIONS IN THIS ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/30/2013. (Lundstrom, T)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Denying 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; ORDER for Plaintiff to Pay $350.00 Filing Fee in Full Within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/3/13. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Denying 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/14/13. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goolsby v. Cate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Goolsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Stainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plumlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?