June 21, 2013 |
Filing
162
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/20/13 ADOPTING IN FULL 155 Findings and Recommendations; and DENYING without prejudice 154 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Meuleman, A)
|
June 3, 2013 |
Filing
161
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/3/13 ORDERING that Discovery is reopened for the limited purpose of allowing defendants Eck, Nuehring, Noriega, and Dechant to respond, within 30 days from the date of this order, to the discovery requests set forth above; The dispositive motion deadline is extended to August 15, 2013; and Plaintiffs request for judicial intervention 158 is deemed withdrawn. (Dillon, M)
|
April 15, 2013 |
Filing
157
ORDER denying 148 Motion to Compel discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 04/12/13. (Plummer, M)
|
March 22, 2013 |
Filing
155
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/21/13 RECOMMENDING that 154 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION be denied without prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Dillon, M)
|
September 26, 2012 |
Filing
142
ORDER adopting in full 133 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/26/12. Defendant Noriega's 125 motion to dismiss is granted in part, and denied in part. Defendant Noriega is ordered to file an answer within 21 days from the date of this order. (Kastilahn, A)
|
September 10, 2012 |
Filing
141
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/10/12 ordering that plaintiff's 08/06/12 request to supplement his pleading 139 is denied without prejudice. (Plummer, M)
|
June 6, 2012 |
Filing
136
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/5/12 ORDERING that Plaintiffs May 2, 2012 motion 132 is DENIED without prejudice; and plaintiffs March 26, 2012 request to amend 128 is denied without prejudice.(Dillon, M)
|
May 8, 2012 |
Filing
133
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/7/2012 RECOMMENDING that defendant Noriega's 125 motion to dismiss be granted in part and denied in part, as stated in these findings and recommendations, and defendant Noriega be ordered to file an answer within 21 days from any order of the district court adopting these findings and recommendations. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due within 21 days. (Yin, K)
|
March 31, 2012 |
Filing
130
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 03/31/2012. Defendants Shockley's and Deur's June 7, 2011 motion to dismiss 94 is granted; Defendant Sisto's July 26, 2011 motion to dismiss is granted 110 ; The findings and recommendations filed January 27, 2012, are adopted in full 124 . (Andrews, P)
|
January 27, 2012 |
Filing
124
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/26/2012 RECOMMENDING that defendant Shockley's 94 motion to dismiss be granted; defendant Sisto's 110 motion to dismiss be granted; defendant Deur's 94 motion to dismiss be granted; and plaintiff's claims against defendants Sisto, Shockley and Deur be dismissed. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due within 21 days. (Yin, K)
|
November 9, 2011 |
Filing
121
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/8/11 ORDERING that 102 Motion is partially granted; Deputy Attorney General William H. Downer shall take all steps necessary to assist the United States Marshal in locating an address for ser vice of process on defendant Alfredo Q. Noriega, M.D., and shall report to the court within twenty-one days whether he has been able to provide a valid address to the U.S. Marshal and, if not, why no address can be found. The U.S. Marshal shall main tain the confidentiality of any service address information provided by Deputy Attorney General Downer. Should an address be provided, the U.S. Marshal shall, upon receipt of that address, take all steps necessary to request a waiver of service and/or to personally serve defendant Noriega in accordance with the provisions of this courts April 5, 2011 order. The Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal. (cc USM). (Dillon, M)
|
September 19, 2011 |
Filing
120
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/16/2011 ORDERING 111 The 7/29/2011 order to show cause is DISCHARGED; and Defendant Sisto is RELIEVED of his obligation to pay the U.S. Marshal the sum of $129.38. (Reader, L)
|
September 8, 2011 |
Filing
118
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/7/11 ORDERING that the findings and recommendations 91 are adopted in full; Defendant Fleischman's motion to dismiss 74 is granted; Plaintiff's claims against defendant Fleischman are dismissed; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to modify the description of the document 112 to note that the document is an Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss 94 . (Becknal, R)
|
July 29, 2011 |
Filing
111
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/28/11: Within fourteen days from the date of this order defendant D.K. Sisto shall pay to the United States Marshal the sum of $129.38, unless within that time defendant files a written statement showing good cause for his failure to waive service. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the U.S. Marshal. (cc:USM)(Kaminski, H)
|
June 27, 2011 |
Filing
99
ORDER denying 97 Motion for Default Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/24/11. (Matson, R)
|
June 8, 2011 |
Filing
95
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/7/11 ORDERING that plaintiffs claims against defendants Jones and Peterson are DISMISSED without prejudice.(Dillon, M)
|
May 9, 2011 |
Filing
91
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 05/06/11 recommending that defendant's 02/01/11 motion to dismiss 74 be granted; and plaintiff's claims against defendant Fleischman be dismissed. MOTION to DISMISS 74 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
|
April 5, 2011 |
Filing
82
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/5/2011 RECOMMENDING that pltf's claims against dfts Jones and Peterson be dismissed w/out prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due w/in 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
February 2, 2011 |
Filing
75
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/1/11 ORDERING that 67 Order to show cause is DISCHARGED; Defendant Fleischman is relieved of his obligation to pay the U.S. Marshal the sum of $140.00; Defendant Fleischmans February 1, 2011 motion to dismiss is deemed timely filed; and Plaintiff shall file an opposition to defendant Fleischmans motion to dismiss within 21 days from the date of this order.(Dillon, M)
|
January 20, 2011 |
Filing
71
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/19/11, ORDERING that dfts' 69 Motion for Extension of time is GRANTED. Dfts Traquina, Freeman, Singh, Eck, Gentry, Dechant, Nuehring, and Greer are GRANTED up to and including 2/14/11, in which to respond to pltf's second set of requests for documents, and first set of requests for interrogatories. (Kastilahn, A)
|
January 19, 2011 |
Filing
70
ORDER denying without prejudice 66 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/12/2011. (Waggoner, D)
|
January 13, 2011 |
Filing
67
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 01/12/11 ordering within 21 days from the date of this order defendant Fleishman shall pay to the U.S. Marshal the sum of $140.00, unless within that time defendant files a written statement showing good caus for his failure to waive service. The court does not intend to extend this 21 day period. Defendant Fleishman show cause witihn 21 days from the date of this order, why default should not be entered against him. The clerk of the court shall forward a copy of this order to defendant Fleishman at the address the U.S. Marshal personally served defendant Fleishman. The clerk of the court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the U.S. Marshal. (Plummer, M)
|
December 21, 2010 |
Filing
61
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/21/10 ORDERING that 60 Motion is partially granted; Clerk of the Court is directed to send to plaintiff six USM-285 forms, a summons form, an instruction sheet and a copy of the amended compl aint filed February 22, 2010; On or before March 2, 2011, plaintiff shall complete and submit the Notice of Submission of Documents to the court, with the appropriate documents; Clerk of the Court shall serve upon plaintiff a copy of the Local Rules of Court. (Dillon, M)
|
November 4, 2010 |
Filing
46
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/3/10 denying 45 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
|
October 12, 2010 |
Filing
44
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/8/10 DENYING pltf's 41 motion for a more definate statement; pltf's 10/4/10 request for an extension of time is GRANTED; and pltf has 60 days to comply w/ the 8/26/10 court order. (Yin, K)
|
June 24, 2010 |
Filing
30
ORDER adopting in full 25 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/23/10. All claims are dismissed without prejudice against dfts V.D. Brumfield, Anderson, Becerra, R.L. Bond, B. Burns, Camacho, Camaya, ComyRomero, R. Cordo va, DeGorgis, Durffy, Elisara, T. Ellior, V. Fera, J.P. Fields, Francis, Freese, M. Grimm, Heath, M. Hogan, B. Johnson, Kharsa, S. Lee, Lemus, Liu, Madil, N. Marquez, Menjavar, M. Ross, Scotland, K. Sillivan, Tamayo, Weaver, G. Wong, and J. Zucker.(Kastilahn, A)
|
March 26, 2010 |
Filing
25
ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/24/2010 ORDERING that the 22 motion for leave to file a second amended cmplt is GRANTED; service is appropriate for dfts J. Freeman III, Sisto, Singh, Traquina , Cate, Greer, Gentry, Nuehring, Jones, Shockley, Fleishman, Petersen, Deur, Eck, Noriega and DeChant; the clerk to send pltf forms for service to be completed and returned w/in 30 days, along w/ the Notice of Submission; the 19 motion for an exten sion of time to serve a summons is DENIED; the 21 motion for an order directing USM to serve process is DENIED; and RECOMMENDING that all claims against dfts V.D. Brumfield, Anderson, Becerra, R.L. Bond, B. Burns, Camacho, Camaya, ComyRomero, R. C ordova, DeGorgis, Durffy, Elisara, T. Ellior, V. Fera, J.P. Fields, Francis, Freese, M. Grimm, Heath, M. Hogan, B. Johnson, Kharsa, S. Lee, Lemus, Liu, Madil, N. Marquez, Menjavar, M. Ross, Scotland, K. Sillivan, Tamayo, Weaver, G. Wong, and J. Zucker be dismissed w/out prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due w/in 21 days. (Yin, K)
|
October 26, 2009 |
Filing
18
ORDER denying 14 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/26/09. (Plummer, M)
|