Windom v. Hatch et al
Plaintiff: Cameron O Windom
Defendant: Charles E Schumer, Mitch McConnell, Orrin G. Hatch, Donald M. Payne, David Durenburger, Robert Garcia, Bill Frenzel, Mikey Leland and Patrick J. Leath
Case Number: 3:2018cv07660
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 14 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/22/19. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 1/22/19 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/22/19. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 1/22/19 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge; by Cameron O. Windom. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #10 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 1/4/19 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/4/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing ; filed by Cameron O. Windom. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to Dismiss by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Objections due by 1/17/2019. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 1/3/2019 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019) Modified on 1/3/2019 (shyS, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Re Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #2 Application. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 1/3/2019 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019) Modified on 1/3/2019 (shyS, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge; by Cameron O. Windom. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/9/2019. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cameron O Windom. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; (NO PROCESS); against Cameron O Windom, Orrin G. Hatch, Mitch McConnell et al. Filed by Cameron O Windom. Consent/Declination due by 1/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018) Modified on 12/22/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Windom v. Hatch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E Schumer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orrin G. Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald M. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Durenburger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Frenzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikey Leland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. Leath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron O Windom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?