MDL No. 1917 In Re: Cathode Ray Tube (CRT) Antitrust Litigation
Plaintiff: ABC Appliance, Inc., Janet Ackerman, James E. Allee, Patricia Andrews, Arch Electronics, Inc, Art's TV & Appliance, Adrienne Belai, Charles Benson, Best Buy Co., Inc., Best Buy Enterprise Services, Inc., Best Buy Purchasing LLC, Best Buy Stores, L.P., Best Buy.com LLC, Edward Breivik, James Brown, Jim Brown, Travis Burau, Barbara Caldwell, Paula Call, Carroll Cut-Rate Furniture, Conrad Carty, Central New York Univision Video Systems, Inc., Choice Suites, ("Law Suites"), Rosemary Ciccone, Gloria Comeaux, Compucom Systems Inc, Giovanni Constabile, Jerry Cook, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Brady Lane Cotton, Crago, Inc., Albert Sidney Crigler, Crimson Tech, Inc., Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P., Department of Legal Affairs, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Christopher Donnelly, Electrograph Systems, Inc, Electrograph Technologies Corp., Electronic Design Company, Donna Ellingson, Donna Marie Ellington, Bridget Ten Eyck, Jeffrey Figone, Steven Fink, Brighid Flaherty, Scott Friedson, Steven Ganz, Anthony Gianasca, Gio's Inc, Greg A Glanz, Carmen Gonzalez, Good Guys, Inc., Kerry Lee Hall, Gary Hanson, Constance Hare, Hawel A. Hawel d/b/a City Electronics, Daniel R. Hergert, Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Industrial Computing, Inc., Interbond Corporation of America, Charles Jenkins, Michael Juetten, KMart Corporation, Andrew Kindt, Chad Klebs, Barry Kushner, John Larch, Brian A. Luscher, Magnolia Hi-Fi, Inc., Magnolia Hi-Fi, LLC, Joshua Maida, Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Monikraft, Inc, Samuel J. Nasto, Nathan Muchnick, Inc., David G. Norby, OK TV & Appliances, LLC, Office Depot, Inc., Office of the Attorney General, Old Comp Inc., Orion Home Systems, LLC, P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Dennis Patrick, Kory Pentland, Mark Pierce, Patrick Piper, Princeton Display Technologies, Inc., Radio & TV Equipment, Inc, Radioshack Corp., Richard Reid, Lisa Reynolds, Daniel Riebow, Ryan Rizzo, David Rooks, Dana Ross, Alan Rotman, Royal Data Services, Inc., SOUND INVESTMENTS CORPORATION, Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Sears, Roebuck and Co., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Sharp Electronics Manufacturing Company of America, Inc., Alfred H. Siegel, Margaret Slagle, Colleen Sobotka, Southern Office Supply, Inc, Jeff Speaect, Margo Stack, William E. Stack, State of Florida, State of Washington, Craig Stephenson, James Stringwell, Studio Spectrum, Inc., Target Corp., Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc., Brigid Terry, The Stroud Group, Inc., Jimmy Jahar Thule, Tweeter Newco, LLC, Univisions-Crimson Holding Inc., Viewsonic Corporation, Misti Walker, Frank Warner, Wettstein and Sons, Inc, Christopher Wirth, Louise Wood, Ramzi Yusef, INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF CLASS, Kirby McInerney LLP, MINA ASHKANNEJHAD, Patrick Carleo, Jr., Eleanor Lewis, Sears Roebuck and Company, JEFF CRAIG, ESTATE OF LATE R. DERYL EDWARDS JR, Kathryn Gumm, Jeffrey Schapira, Mike Bratcher, Jay Erickson, Jeff Johnson, Kerry Murphy, Hope Hitchcock, Robert Stephenson, D. Bruce Johnson, William J Trentham, Tyler Ayres, Nikki Crawley, Chris Seufert, Omitted Repealer State Indirect-Purchaser Plaintiffs, John Heenan, Government of Puerto Rico, Felicia Blackwood, Susan LaPage, George Maglaras, Warren Cutlip, Donna Muccino, Donald Oelze, Steven Harrelson, Mark Wissinger, Walker, Warren and Watkins, LLC and Non-Repealer State Plaintiffs
Defendant: Technicolor S.A, Beijing Matsushita Color Crt Company, LTD., Beijing-Matsushita Color CRT Company, Ltd., Chunghwa Picture Tubes (Malaysia), Chunghwa Picture Tubes (Malaysia) Sdn. Bhd., Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD., Daewoo Electronics Corporation, Daewoo International Corporation, Hitachi America, Ltd, Hitachi America, Ltd., Hitachi Asia, Ltd., Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi, Ltd., Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Group Corp., Irico Group Corporation, Irico Group Electronics Co., Ltd., Koninklijke Philips N.V., LG Displays International, Ltd., LG Electronics Taiwan Taipei Co., Ltd., LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., LG Eletronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Philips Display USA, Inc., LG.Philips Display Holding B.V., LG.Philips Displays International B.V., LP Displays, LP Displays International Ltd., LP Displays International, Ltd., MT Picture Display, MT Picture Display Co., LTD, MT Picture Display Company, MT Picture Display Corp. of America, MT Picture Display Corporation of America (New York), MT Picture Display Corporation of America (Ohio), Matsushita Electric Industrial Co, Ltd., Matsushita Electronic Corporation (Malaysia) Sdn Bhd., Matsushita Toshiba Picture Display Co., Ltd., Meridian Solar & Display Co., Ltd., Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Visual Solutions America, Inc, New York Direct Purchaser, Orion America, Inc., Orion Electric Co., Ltd., PT.MT Picture Display Indonesia, Panasonic Consumer Electronics Co., Panasonic Consumer Electronics Company, Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of America, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Philips Consumer Electronics Co., Philips Electronics Industries (Taiwan), Ltd., Philips Electronics Industries Ltd., Philips Electronics North America, Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Philips Taiwan Limited, Philips da Amazonia Industria Electronica Ltda., Philips do Brasil Ltda., Royal Philips Electronics N.V., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Electronics Co., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Samsung SDI (Hong Kong), Ltd., Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI (Malaysia) Sdn Bhd., Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Brasil LTDA, Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Samsung SDI Co. Ltd, Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Samtel Color Ltd., Samtel Color, Ltd., Shenzhen SEG Color Display Devices, Ltd, Shenzhen SEG Hitachi Color Display Devices, Ltd, Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co. LTD., Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co. Ltd, Shenzhen Seg Hitachi Color Display Devices, LTD., TCL International Holdings LTD. (TCL), TCL Thomson Electronics Corporation, TVP International (USA), Inc, TVP Technology Ltd., Co, Tatung Company, Tatung Company of America, Inc., Technicolor USA, Inc., Technologies Displays Americas LLC, Technologies Displays Mexicana, S.A. de C.V., Thai CRT Company, Ltd., Thomas S.A., Thomson Consumer Electronics, Inc., Thomson S.A., Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Toshiba America Consumer Products, Inc., Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba America, Inc, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Display Devices (Thailand) Company, Ltd., Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co, LTD, Victor Company of Japan, LTD, Videocon Industries, Ltd., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V., Technicolor SA, Japan Display Inc, MT Picture Display Co., Technicolor USA and Spectrum Settlement Recovery, LLC
Petitioner: Jonathan Rich
Respondent: Alan Frankel
Interested Party: Wettstein & Sons, Inc, Mitsubishi Digital Electronics Americas, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric & Electronics USA, Inc., Newegg Inc., State of California, Atty for Non-Party Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP and The State of California
Intervenor: State of Illinois, U.S. Department of Justice, Antitrust Division and State of Oregon
Other: Douglas W. St. John, Donnie Clifton, Harry Garavanian, Paul Palmer, Sean Hull, Gordon Morgan, John Finn, Dan L. Williams & Co., Gary Talewsky, Josie Saik, Laura Fortman, Rockhurst University, Brian Barry and Financial Recovery Services, Inc.
Not Yet Classified: State of Connecticut, YRC, INC., Douglas A. Kelley, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, John R. Stoebner, Intervenor Plaintiffs, McCallum, Methvin & Terrell, P.C., Certain Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class Members, George Feldman and Douglas King
Special Master: James Larson, Honorable Vaughn R. Walker, Honorable Charles A. Legge and Mr. Martin Quinn
Case Number: 4:2007cv05944
Filed: November 26, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 5584 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONDITIONALLY AMEND COMPLAINTS FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed IPP Fifth CAC, #2 B - Proposed IPP Second Amended Class Action Complaint)(Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5583 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Lauren C. Capurro ISO Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #3 Redacted Version of Proposed Second Amended Class Action Complaint, #4 Unredacted Version of Proposed Second Amended Class Action Complaint)(Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5582 NOTICE of Change of Address by Anna Marie Konradi (Konradi, Anna) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5581 ORDER TERMINATING MOTION TO INTERVENE re #5579 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #5564 MOTION to Intervene , Regarding Transfer of Tag-Along Action and the Government of Puerto Rico's Motion to Intervene, filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Motions terminated: #5579 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #5564 MOTION to Intervene , Regarding Transfer of Tag-Along Action and the Government of Puerto Rico's Motion to Intervene, filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 9, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5580 Joinder re #5579 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #5564 MOTION to Intervene , Regarding Transfer of Tag-Along Action and the Government of Puerto Rico's Motion to Intervene, by Tatung Company of America, Inc.. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5579 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #5564 MOTION to Intervene , Regarding Transfer of Tag-Along Action and the Government of Puerto Rico's Motion to Intervene, filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America(("PCNA") is a Delaware corporation). (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5578 ORDER RE APPOINTMENT OF LIAISON COUNSEL FOR NON-REPEALER STATES re #5576 NOTICE filed by Non-Repealer State Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 6, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5577 ORDER RE APPOINTMENT OF LIAISON COUNSEL FOR STATES OF ARKANSAS, MASSACHUSETTS, MISSOURI, MONTANA, NEW HAMPSHIRE, OREGON, RHODE ISLAND, SOUTH CAROLINA, AND UTAH. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 6, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5576 NOTICE re Submission of [Proposed] Order Appointing Liaison Counsel by Non-Repealer State Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kirkham, Tracy) (Filed on 9/4/2019) Modified on 9/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2019 Filing 5575 NOTICE of submission of [proposed] order appointing liaison counsel by Omitted Repealer State Indirect-Purchaser Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 9/4/2019) Modified on 9/5/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5574 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION TO APPROVEAMENDMENTS TO SETTLEMENTS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #5572 Stipulation. Motions due by 9/16/2019.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5573 Statement re #5572 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION TO APPROVE AMENDMENTS TO SETTLEMENTS by Omitted Repealer State Indirect-Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5572 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION TO APPROVE AMENDMENTS TO SETTLEMENTS, filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 8/30/2019) Modified on 9/3/2019 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/3/2019 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2019 Filing 5571 NOTICE of Appearance by Kassra Powell Nassiri (Nassiri, Kassra) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5570 EXHIBITS re #5567 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Amend/Correct COMPLAINT CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [5567-1], [5567-2] filed byMINA ASHKANNEJHAD, Tyler Ayres, Felicia Blackwood, Mike Bratcher, JEFF CRAIG, Nikki Crawley, Warren Cutlip, Jay Erickson, Harry Garavanian, Anthony Gianasca, Steven Harrelson, John Heenan, Hope Hitchcock, D. Bruce Johnson, Jeff Johnson, Susan LaPage, George Maglaras, Donna Muccino, Kerry Murphy, Donald Oelze, Jeffrey Schapira, Chris Seufert, Robert Stephenson, Gary Talewsky, William J Trentham, Walker, Warren and Watkins, LLC, Mark Wissinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Replacing Dkt. 5567-1, #2 Exhibit Replacing Dkt. 5567-2)(Related document(s) #5567 ) (Crabtree, John) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5569 ***DISREGARD. SEE DOCKET #5570*** EXHIBITS re #5567 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Amend/Correct COMPLAINT CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [5567-2] filed byMINA ASHKANNEJHAD, Tyler Ayres, Felicia Blackwood, Mike Bratcher, JEFF CRAIG, Nikki Crawley, Warren Cutlip, Jay Erickson, Harry Garavanian, Anthony Gianasca, Steven Harrelson, John Heenan, Hope Hitchcock, D. Bruce Johnson, Jeff Johnson, Susan LaPage, George Maglaras, Donna Muccino, Kerry Murphy, Donald Oelze, Jeffrey Schapira, Chris Seufert, Robert Stephenson, Gary Talewsky, William J Trentham, Walker, Warren and Watkins, LLC, Mark Wissinger. (Related document(s) #5567 ) (Crabtree, John) (Filed on 8/27/2019) Modified on 8/28/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2019 Filing 5568 ***DISREGARD. SEE DOCKET #5570*** EXHIBITS re #5567 MOTION to Intervene MOTION to Amend/Correct COMPLAINT CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [5567-1] filed byMINA ASHKANNEJHAD, Tyler Ayres, Felicia Blackwood, Mike Bratcher, JEFF CRAIG, Nikki Crawley, Warren Cutlip, Jay Erickson, Harry Garavanian, Anthony Gianasca, Steven Harrelson, John Heenan, Hope Hitchcock, D. Bruce Johnson, Jeff Johnson, Susan LaPage, George Maglaras, Donna Muccino, Kerry Murphy, Donald Oelze, Jeffrey Schapira, Chris Seufert, Robert Stephenson, Gary Talewsky, William J Trentham, Walker, Warren and Watkins, LLC, Mark Wissinger. (Related document(s) #5567 ) (Crabtree, John) (Filed on 8/27/2019) Modified on 8/28/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2019 Filing 5567 MOTION to Intervene , MOTION to Amend/Correct COMPLAINT filed by MINA ASHKANNEJHAD, Tyler Ayres, Mike Bratcher, JEFF CRAIG, Nikki Crawley, Jay Erickson, Harry Garavanian, Anthony Gianasca, John Heenan, Hope Hitchcock, D. Bruce Johnson, Jeff Johnson, Kerry Murphy, Jeffrey Schapira, Chris Seufert, Robert Stephenson, Gary Talewsky, William J Trentham, Felicia Blackwood, Warren Cutlip, Steven Harrelson, D. Bruce Johnson, Susan LaPage, George Maglaras, Donna Muccino, Donald Oelze, Walker, Warren and Watkins, LLC, Mark Wissinger. Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 9/20/2019. Replies due by 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Crabtree, John) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5566 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Tracy R. Kirkham (Kirkham, Tracy) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5565 MOTION for Leave to File Motion of Non-Repealer State Subclass Member Eleanor Lewis for Leave to File Amended Complaint to Add an Additional Party, or in the Alternative, to Intervene and Amend filed by Non-Repealer State Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kirkham, Tracy) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5564 MOTION to Intervene filed by Government of Puerto Rico. Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 9/20/2019. Replies due by 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Girardi, John) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5563 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/08/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Brody, Michael) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5562 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING LOCATION CHANGE FOR JUDGE JON S. TIGAR Effective August 26, 2019:Judge Jon S. Tigar's courtroom and chambers will be located at the Ronald V. Dellums Federal Building and United States Courthouse, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612.On or after the effective date, all court appearances, filings, and deliveries of chambers copies must be made at the Oakland Courthouse (https://cand.uscourts.gov/locations). For updated scheduling information, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/jst. Judge Tigar's case assignments will be updated to reflect the correct office assignment (for example: 3:19-cv-00123-JST will now be 4:19-cv-00123-JST) (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5561 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/08/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by JEFF CRAIG, Rosemary Ciccone, Gloria Comeaux, Anthony Gianasca, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Bonsignore, Robert) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5560 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/06/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by MINA ASHKANNEJHAD, JEFF CRAIG, Rosemary Ciccone, Gloria Comeaux, Anthony Gianasca, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Bonsignore, Robert) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5559 ***AMENDED TRANSCRIPT - REPLACES DOCKET NO. 5558*** Transcript of Proceedings held on 8-8-2019, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2019. (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5558 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8-8-2019, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #5547 Transcript Order, #5550 Transcript Order, #5549 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2019. (Related documents(s) #5547 , #5550 , #5549 ) (pasdl50S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5557 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/08/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Hitachi America, Ltd., Hitachi Asia, Ltd., Hitachi Displays, Ltd.(("Hitachi Displays") is a Japanese company), Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Adelson, Eliot) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5555 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on August 8, 2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.(("TAIP") is headquartered in Irvine, California), Toshiba America, Inc(("Toshiba America") is a Delaware corporation), Toshiba Corporation(("TC") is a Japanese company), for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Foster, Dana) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5554 NOTICE of Appearance by John Granville Crabtree SUPPLEMENTAL (Crabtree, John) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5553 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/8/19 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Koons, Erik) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 9, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Cross Motions due by 9/27/2019. Motion for preliminary approval of an amended settlement due by 8/30/2019. Opening Reports due by 8/23/2019. Responses due by 9/20/2019. Replies due by 10/4/2019. Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5552 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08-08-2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Financial Recovery Services, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Bornstein, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5551 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 9, 2019. (jstlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5550 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/8/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Harry Garavanian, Rockhurst University, Gary Talewsky, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Moore, Theresa) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5549 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on August 8, 2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Samsung SDI (Malaysia) Sdn Bhd., Samsung SDI America, Inc.(("Samsung SDI America") is a California corporation), Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V.(("Samsung SDI Mexico") is a Mexican company), Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co. Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Davies, Andrew) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5548 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on August 8, 2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Panasonic Corporation(fka Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. ("MEI"), is a Japanese entity), Panasonic Corporation of North America(("PCNA") is a Delaware corporation), for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Goldstein, Kevin) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5547 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on August 8, 2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(("SEAI") is a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5556 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/8/2019.Total Time in Court: 54 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Attachment: minute order. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/8/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5546 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian L Papendick for Defendants Panasonic Corporation and Panasonic Corporation of North America (Papendick, Ian) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5545 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #5540 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jane Becker Whitaker.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5544 Statement re #5530 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, - Statement of Mitsubishi Electric Corporation in Response to Court's Order Converting Hearing to Case Management Conference by Mitsubishi Electric Corporation. (Brody, Michael) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5543 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5542 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Filed by Defendants, The ORS Plaintiffs, and the NRS Plaintiffs in Response to the Court's Order Dated July 30, 2019 (ECF No. 5530) filed by Samsung SDI (Malaysia) Sdn Bhd., Samsung SDI America, Inc.(("Samsung SDI America") is a California corporation), Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co. Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V.(("Samsung SDI Mexico") is a Mexican company), Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co. Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.. (Davies, Andrew) (Filed on 8/6/2019) Modified on 8/7/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2019 Filing 5541 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 26JAN3VE.) Filing fee previously paid on 8/6/2019 filed by Government of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Becker Whitaker, Jane) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5540 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13583826.) filed by Government of Puerto Rico. (Becker Whitaker, Jane) (Filed on 8/6/2019)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5539 NOTICE by Government of Puerto Rico of Potential Tag-Along Action (Attachments: #1 Complaint in 19-1246(ADC), #2 Docket in 19-1246(ADC))(Kuchinsky, Alexei) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5538 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #5527 MOTION to Vacate #4740 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, #4712 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #4717 Order, ) Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Vacate Orders and Judgment Certifying Settlement Class, Approving Settlement and Awarding Attorneys' Fees (Dkt. 4712, 4717, 4740) filed byToshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.(("TAIP") is headquartered in Irvine, California), Toshiba America, Inc(("Toshiba America") is a Delaware corporation), Toshiba Corporation(("TC") is a Japanese company). (Curran, Christopher) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5537 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #5527 MOTION to Vacate #4740 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, #4712 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #4717 Order, ) filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5536 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/06/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.(("SEAI") is a New York corporation), Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5535 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying #5368 Motion to Intervene. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5534 ORDER DENYING IPPS' REQUEST TO VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 31, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5533 Letter from Counsel for Omitted Repealer States . (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5532 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Set Trial Date, ECF No. 5519 filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5530 ORDER CONVERTING HEARING TO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING REGARDING IPPS MOTION TO SET TRIAL DATE. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 30, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5531 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement Conference held on 7/26/2019. (Not Reported)(Time 10:00)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/26/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5529 REPLY (re #5519 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Trial Date) filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5528 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Motion to Vacate Hearing set for 9/4/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. The briefing schedule will remain as previously set.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Related documents(s) #5527 )(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5527 NOTICE OF MOTION, MOTION AND MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of MOTION to Vacate Orders and Judgment Certifying Settlement Class, Approving Settlement and Awarding Attorneys' Fees re #4740 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, re #4712 Order, re #4717 Order filed by Omitted Repealer State Indirect-Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 8/2/2019. Replies due by 8/9/2019. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Bonsignore, Robert) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5526 NOTICE by Jeffrey Figone of Change of Firm Affiliation (Stewart, Dennis) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5525 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5519 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Trial Date) -- Defendants' Opposition to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Trial Date filed by MT Picture Display Co., LTD, Panasonic Corporation(fka Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. ("MEI"), is a Japanese entity), Panasonic Corporation of North America(("PCNA") is a Delaware corporation). (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5524 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5519 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Trial Date) filed by Dan L. Williams & Co.. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5523 AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference with defendants and counsel for the 22 repealer states is set for 7/26/2019 at 9:00 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5522 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/6/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5521 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference set for 7/26/2019 at 09:00 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5520 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/06/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by LG Electronics Taiwan Taipei Co., Ltd.(("LGETT") is a Taiwanese entity), LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Kim, Miriam) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5519 MOTION Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Trial Date filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 7/17/2019. Replies due by 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting IPPs' Motion to Set Trial Date)(Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5518 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE 2010 STIPULATION AND ORDER; GRANTING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL FOR INDIRECT PURCHASER OMITTED REPEALER STATE SUBCLASS; AND GRANTING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL FOR INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS WITH CLAIMS IN NON-REPEALER STATES by Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5517 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeffrey Scott Roberts (Roberts, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5516 NOTICE of Change of Address by Peggy Wedgworth (Wedgworth, Peggy) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5515 Supplemental Brief re #5514 Supplemental Brief, #5494 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings Supplemental Reply Brief on Personal Jurisdiction Waiver filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #5514 , #5494 ) (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5514 Supplemental Brief re #5502 Supplemental Brief - Irico Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief on Waiver filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd.(("IDDC") is a Chinese entity), Irico Group Corp.. (Related document(s) #5502 ) (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5513 ORDER re #5506 Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 17, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 15, 2019 Filing 5512 Letter from Theresa D. Moore . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Moore, Theresa) (Filed on 6/15/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5511 OBJECTIONS to OBJECTORS' PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE 2010 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5510 Proposed Order re #5469 MOTION to Vacate or Clarify 2010 Stipulation and Order (Dkt. 799) Additional Filing Defendants Listed on Document by Samsung SDI (Malaysia) Sdn Bhd., Samsung SDI America, Inc.(("Samsung SDI America") is a California corporation), Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co. Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V.(("Samsung SDI Mexico") is a Mexican company), Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co. Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.. (Davies, Andrew) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5509 Letter from Theresa D. Moore . (Moore, Theresa) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5508 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/30/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Group Corp., for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5507 NOTICE of Appearance by John Granville Crabtree (Crabtree, John) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5506 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel; [Proposed] Order filed by Terry Gross (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5505 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/06/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5504 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on June 6, 2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Capurro, Lauren) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5503 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/30/19, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #5493 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/10/2019. (Related documents(s) #5493 ) (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5502 Supplemental Brief re #5494 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings on Personal Jurisdiction Waiver filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #5494 ) (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5501 ORDER RE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5500 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5499 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/6/19, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #5495 Transcript Order, #5496 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/5/2019. (Related documents(s) #5495 , #5496 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5498 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/06/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Brody, Michael) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5496 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/06/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Harry Garavanian, Rockhurst University, Gary Talewsky, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Moore, Theresa) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5495 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on June 6, 2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Samsung SDI (Malaysia) Sdn Bhd., Samsung SDI America, Inc.(("Samsung SDI America") is a California corporation), Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co. Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V.(("Samsung SDI Mexico") is a Mexican company), Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co. Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Davies, Andrew) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5494 ORDER INVITING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Joint Brief due by 6/11/2019.Responses due by 6/18/2019. Replies due by 6/25/2019. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 3, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5493 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/30/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5492 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Motion Hearing held on 5/30/2019 re #5409 Amended Motion to Dismiss Irico Group Corporation's Claims of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. #5410 Amended Motion to Dismiss Irico Group Corporation's Claims of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. #5411 Amended Motion to Dismiss Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd's Claims of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. #5412 Amended Motion to Dismiss Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd.'s Claims of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Motions taken under submission.Total Time in Court: 1 hour 14 minutes. Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. Plaintiff Attorney: Counsel for Direct Purchasers: R. Alexander Saveri, Gregory Rapawy, Geoffrey Rushing Counsel for Indirect Purchasers: Qianwei Fu, Mario Alioto Counsel from DOJ: Nickolai Levin. Defendant Attorney: Stuart Plunkett, Brian Jacobsmeyer, John Talafday, Kaylee Young. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/30/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5491 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs OF CORRECTIONS TO DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF CURTIS J. MILHAUPT (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5490 JOINT NOTICE filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Group Corp. of Resolution of Translation Objections Pursuant to re #5341 Stipulation and Order re Translation Protocol (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5489 REPLY (re #5469 MOTION to Vacate or Clarify 2010 Stipulation and Order (Dkt. 799) ) filed by Harry Garavanian, Rockhurst University, Gary Talewsky. (Moore, Theresa) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5488 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney - Notice of Motion and Motion to Withdraw filed by Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Visual Solutions America, Inc. Responses due by 6/6/2019. Replies due by 6/13/2019. (Fuentes, Gabriel) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5487 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5469 MOTION to Vacate or Clarify 2010 Stipulation and Order (Dkt. 799) ) Joinder in Chunghwa's Opposition to Motion to Vacate or Clarify 2010 Stipulation and Order filed byLG Electronics Taiwan Taipei Co., Ltd., LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Kim, Miriam) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5486 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5469 MOTION to Vacate or Clarify 2010 Stipulation and Order (Dkt. 799)) filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Mario N. Alioto ISO IPPs' Response to Motion to Vacate or Clarify 2010 Stipulation And Order, #2 Declaration Declaration of Qianwei Fu ISO IPPs' Response to Motion to Vacate or Clarify 2010 Stipulation And Order)(Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5485 Statement of Recent Decision in Support of re #5468 Defendants' Response to Motion of Cooper & Kirkham, P.C. for Appointment as Lead Counsel for Indirect-Purchaser Plaintiffs with Respect to Claims in Non-Repealer States filed by Samsung SDI (Malaysia) Sdn Bhd., Samsung SDI America, Inc.(("Samsung SDI America") is a California corporation), Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co. Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V.(("Samsung SDI Mexico") is a Mexican company), Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co. Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.. (Davies, Andrew) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5484 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5469 MOTION to Vacate or Clarify 2010 Stipulation and Order (Dkt. 799)) - Additional Responding Parties Listed on Document filed by Samsung SDI (Malaysia) Sdn Bhd., Samsung SDI America, Inc.(("Samsung SDI America") is a California corporation), Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co. Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V.(("Samsung SDI Mexico") is a Mexican company), Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co. Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.. (Davies, Andrew) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5483 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5469 MOTION to Vacate or Clarify 2010 Stipulation and Order (Dkt. 799)) filed by Chunghwa Picture Tubes (Malaysia) Sdn. Bhd., Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD.. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5482 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #5473 Motion for Leave to Participate in May 30 Hearing. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5481 REPLY (re #5473 MOTION for Leave to Appear At the May 30 Hearing ) filed byU.S. Department of Justice, Antitrust Division. (Levin, Nickolai) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5480 REPLY (re #5409 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Irico Group Corporation's Claims of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (FRCP 12(b)(1), re #5411 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd's Claims of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (FRCP 12(b)(1)) filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd.(("IDDC") is a Chinese entity), Irico Group Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Stuart C. Plunkett ISO, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5479 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucius Bernard Lau of Heather Burke (Lau, Lucius) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5478 NOTICE filed by Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.(("TAIP") is headquartered in Irvine, California), Toshiba America, Inc(("Toshiba America") is a Delaware corporation), Toshiba Corporation(("TC") is a Japanese company) of Notice of Withdrawal of Jeremy Kent Ostrander (Lau, Lucius) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5477 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5473 MOTION for Leave to Appear At the May 30 Hearing) filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd.(("IDDC") is a Chinese entity), Irico Group Corp.. (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5476 REPLY (re #5451 MOTION to Appoint Counsel for putative IPP Classes of Omitted Repealer States) filed by Dan L. Williams & Co.. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5475 Letter from Frank C. Warner Objecting to Reopening 3:07-05944. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5474 OBJECTIONS to re #5463 Reply to Opposition/Response - Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Objections to New Evidence in the Irico Defendants Reply in Support of Their Motions to Dismiss Claims of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of David Y. Hwu)(Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5473 MOTION for Leave to Participate at the May 30 Hearing; [Proposed] Order filed by U.S. Department of Justice, Antitrust Division. (Levin, Nickolai) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5472 REPLY (re #5449 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel -- Motion of Cooper & Kirkham, P.C., for Appointment as Lead Counsel for Indirect-Purchaser Plaintiffs with Claims in Non-Repealer States ) filed byEleanor Lewis. (Bogdanov, John) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5471 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #5470 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5470 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13325826.) filed by Studio Spectrum, Inc.. (Rapawy, Gregory) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5469 MOTION to Vacate or Clarify 2010 Stipulation and Order (Dkt. 799) filed by Harry Garavanian, Rockhurst University, Gary Talewsky. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 5/17/2019. Replies due by 5/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moore, Theresa) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5468 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #5451 MOTION to Appoint Counsel for putative IPP Classes of Omitted Repealer States, #5449 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel -- Motion of Cooper & Kirkham, P.C., for Appointment as Lead Counsel for Indirect-Purchaser Plaintiffs with Claims in Non-Repealer States ) Additional Responding Parties Listed on Document filed bySamsung SDI (Malaysia) Sdn Bhd., Samsung SDI America, Inc.(("Samsung SDI America") is a California corporation), Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co. Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V.(("Samsung SDI Mexico") is a Mexican company), Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co. Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Rhys Davies)(Davies, Andrew) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5467 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #5451 MOTION to Appoint Counsel for putative IPP Classes of Omitted Repealer States, #5449 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel -- Motion of Cooper & Kirkham, P.C., for Appointment as Lead Counsel for Indirect-Purchaser Plaintiffs with Claims in Non-Repealer States ) filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5466 Statement re #5451 MOTION to Appoint Counsel for putative IPP Classes of Omitted Repealer States by Mitsubishi Electric Corporation. (Brody, Michael) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5465 Statement re #5449 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel -- Motion of Cooper & Kirkham, P.C., for Appointment as Lead Counsel for Indirect-Purchaser Plaintiffs with Claims in Non-Repealer States by Mitsubishi Electric Corporation. (Brody, Michael) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5464 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/09/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by MINA ASHKANNEJHAD, JEFF CRAIG, Rosemary Ciccone, Gloria Comeaux, Anthony Gianasca, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Bonsignore, Robert) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5463 REPLY (re #5412 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd.'s Claims of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (FRCP 12(b)(1), #5410 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Irico Group Corporation's Claims of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (FRCP 12(b)(1) ) filed byIrico Display Devices Co., Ltd.(("IDDC") is a Chinese entity), Irico Group Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Stuart C. Plunkett ISO, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5462 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING MOTION HEARING DATES as to #5451 MOTION to Appoint Counsel for putative IPP Classes of Omitted Repealer States, #5449 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. The hearing on the pending motions currently set for 6/11/2019 is advanced to 6/6/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. The hearing date for the anticipated motion to vacate Stipulation and Order Modifying and Adopting Special Master's Report is also advanced to 6/6/2019 at 2:00 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5461 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert J. Gralewski, Jr CORRECTION OF DOCKET #5460 (Gralewski, Robert) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5460 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert J. Gralewski, Jr (Gralewski, Robert) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5459 FURTHER SCHEDULING ORDER. Motion(s) for appointment as interim class counsel for certain state classes ("New States") due 4/19/2019. Responses to motion(s) for appointment as interim class counsel for New States due 5/3/2019. Last day for objectors to file motion to vacate Stipulation and Order Modifying and Adopting Special Master's Report, Recommendations and Tentative Rulings Regarding Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint of the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, ECF No. 799 ("2010 Stipulated Order") 5/3/2019. Replies in support of motion(s) for appointment as interim class counsel for New States due 5/10/2019. Responses to motion to vacate 2010 Stipulated Order due 5/17/2019. Replies in support of motion to vacate 2010 Stipulated Order due 5/24/2019. Hearing on interim class counsel motions and motion to vacate 2010 Stipulated Order set for 6/11/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 25, 2019. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5449 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, #5451 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Responses due by 5/3/2019. Replies due by 5/10/2019. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5458 NOTICE filed by Beijing-Matsushita Color CRT Company, Ltd. of Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Calvani, Terry) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5457 Statement of Interest of the United States filed by U.S. Department of Justice, Antitrust Division. (Levin, Nickolai) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5456 NOTICE of Appearance by Nickolai G Levin (Levin, Nickolai) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5455 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs re #5419 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, Notice of Errata in Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Irico Defendants' Amended Motions to Dismiss (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5454 [PROPOSED] SCHEDULING ORDER SUBMITTED BY COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF THE GIANASCA IPPs filed by MINA ASHKANNEJHAD, JEFF CRAIG, Rosemary Ciccone, Gloria Comeaux, ESTATE OF LATE R. DERYL EDWARDS JR, Anthony Gianasca. (Attachments: #(1) Attachment A - Exemplar Items)(Bonsignore, Robert) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5453 Class Plaintiffs' Proposed Schedule for Class Certification and Trial Date filed by Harry Garavanian, Rockhurst University, Gary Talewsky. (Moore, Theresa) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5452 [PROPOSED] SCHEDULING ORDER SUBMITTED BY LEAD COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF IPPs AND DEFENDANTS filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5451 MOTION to Appoint Counsel for putative IPP Classes of Omitted Repealer States filed by Dan L. Williams & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of Mr. Scarpulla, #3 Affidavit of Ms. Moore, #4 Affidavit of Mr. Bonsignore, #5 Affidavit of Mr. Crabtree, #6 Proposed Order)(Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5451 MOTION to Appoint Counsel for putative IPP Classes of Omitted Repealer States. Responses due by 5/3/2019. Replies due by 5/10/2019. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5450 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/09/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5449 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel -- Motion of Cooper & Kirkham, P.C., for Appointment as Lead Counsel for Indirect-Purchaser Plaintiffs with Claims in Non-Repealer States filed by Steven Ganz, Eleanor Lewis. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 5/3/2019. Replies due by 5/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tracy R. Kirkham in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order)(Kirkham, Tracy) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5448 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/09/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Certain Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class Members, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5447 Declaration of Rachel S. Brass in Support of #5439 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byChunghwa Picture Tubes (Malaysia) Sdn. Bhd., Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #5439 ) (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5446 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by John Dennis O'Connor (O'Connor, John) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5445 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs re #5443 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #5418 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Behti, Anjalee) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5444 Final "Amended" Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/9/19, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, Official Reporter, telephone number Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #5430 Transcript Order, #5429 Transcript Order, #5436 Transcript Order, #5432 Transcript Order, #5435 Transcript Order, #5431 Transcript Order, #5425 Transcript Order, #5434 Transcript Order, #5433 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2019. (Related documents(s) #5430 , #5429 , #5436 , #5432 , #5435 , #5431 , #5425 , #5434 , #5433 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5443 EXHIBITS to re #5418 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal - Corrected Unredacted Version of Exhibit 18 to Saveri Declaration in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to Irico Defendants' Amended Motions to Dismiss filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #5418 ) (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5442 Declaration of Stuart C. Plunkett in Support of #5439 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) filed byIrico Display Devices Co., Ltd.(("IDDC") is a Chinese entity), Irico Group Corp.. (Related document(s) #5439 ) (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5441 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/9/19, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #5430 Transcript Order, #5429 Transcript Order, #5436 Transcript Order, #5432 Transcript Order, #5435 Transcript Order, #5431 Transcript Order, #5425 Transcript Order, #5434 Transcript Order, #5433 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 5/6/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2019. (Related documents(s) #5430 , #5429 , #5436 , #5432 , #5435 , #5431 , #5425 , #5434 , #5433 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5440 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #5409 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Irico Group Corporation's Claims of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (FRCP 12(b)(1), #5411 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd's Claims of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (FRCP 12(b)(1) ) filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Mario N. Alioto, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, #3 Exhibit Redacted Ex. 2, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4, #6 Exhibit Redacted Exs. 5-11, #7 Exhibit Ex. 12, #8 Exhibit Redacted Exs. 13-17, #9 Exhibit Ex. 18, #10 Exhibit Redacted Exs. 19-25, #11 Exhibit Ex. 26, #12 Exhibit Redacted Exs. 27-36, #13 Exhibit Ex. 37, #14 Exhibit Ex. 38, #15 Exhibit Redacted Ex. 39)(Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5439 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Lauren C. Capurro, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Brief, #4 Unredacted Brief, #5 Declaration Redacted Declaration of Mario N. Alioto, #6 Declaration Unredacted Declaration of Mario N. Alioto, #7 Exhibit Redacted Ex. 2, #8 Exhibit Unredacted Ex. 2, #9 Exhibit Redacted Exs. 5-11, #10 Exhibit Unredacted Exs. 5-11, #11 Exhibit Redacted Exs. 13-17, #12 Exhibit Unredacted Exs. 13-17, #13 Exhibit Redacted Ex. 19-25, #14 Exhibit Unredacted Ex. 19-25, #15 Exhibit Redacted Exs. 27-36, #16 Exhibit Unredacted Exs. 27-36, #17 Exhibit Redacted Ex. 39, #18 Exhibit Unredacted Ex. 39)(Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5438 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #5428 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Re Page Limits for Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to re #5409 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Irico Group Corporation's Claims of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (FRCP 12(b)(1), re #5411 Amended MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 10, 2019. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5437 Declaration of Curtis J. Milhaupt in Support of #5419 Opposition/Response to Motion - CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [5419-3] filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #5419 ) (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5436 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/09/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Capurro, Lauren) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/9/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Spectrum Settlement Recovery, LLC, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Goldsmith, Eileen) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5434 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/09/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Financial Recovery Services, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Bornstein, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5433 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/09/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Brody, Michael) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5432 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/09/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by George Feldman, Douglas King, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Dallal, James) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5431 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/09/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Harry Garavanian, Rockhurst University, Gary Talewsky, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Moore, Theresa) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5430 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/09/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc(("TAEP") is headquartered in Irvine, California), Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba America, Inc, Toshiba Corporation, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Foster, Dana) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5429 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/09/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Capurro, Lauren) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5428 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Re Page Limits for Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to re #5409 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Irico Group Corporation's Claims of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (FRCP 12(b)(1), re #5411 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd's Claims of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (FRCP 12(b)(1) - Stipulation and Proposed Order Re Page Limits for Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Irico Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 10, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5427 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 9, 2019. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5426 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/9/2019. Motion to appoint subclass due by 4/19/2019. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Total Time in Court: 44 minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/9/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5425 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/09/2019 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Dan L. Williams & Co., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 5424 Declaration of Stuart C. Plunkett in Support of #5418 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) filed byIrico Display Devices Co., Ltd.(("IDDC") is a Chinese entity), Irico Group Corp.. (Related document(s) #5418 ) (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5423 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #5422 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5422 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice Joseph Goldberg, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13233457) filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Goldberg, Joseph) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5421 EXHIBITS to re #5418 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Unredacted Exhibits to Saveri Declaration)(Related document(s) #5418 ) (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5420 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs of re #5419 Opposition/Response to Motion, re #5418 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Behti, Anjalee) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5419 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5412 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd.'s Claims of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (FRCP 12(b)(1), re #5410 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Irico Group Corporation's Claims of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (FRCP 12(b)(1)) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Alexander Saveri, #2 Declaration of David Y. Hwu, #3 Declaration of Professor Curtis J. Milhaupt, #4 Proposed Order denying the Irico Defendants' Amended Motions to Dismiss Claims of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction)(Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5418 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Alexander Saveri in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Documents, #2 Proposed Order Granting Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Documents, #3 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Irico Defendants' Amended Motions to Dismiss Claims of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Redacted), #4 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Irico Defendants' Amended Motions to Dismiss Claims of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Unredacted), #5 Exhibit to Saveri Declaration (Redacted), #6 Exhibit to Saveri Declaration (Unredacted), #7 Declaration of David Y. Hwu in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Irico Defendants' Amended Motions to Dismiss (Redacted), #8 Declaration of David Y. Hwu in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Irico Defendants' Amended Motions to Dismiss (Unredacted))(Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5417 Letter from Spectrum Settlement Recovery, LLC . (Goldsmith, Eileen) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5416 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5415 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #5414 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER re #5412 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd.'s Claims of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (FRCP 12(b)(1), re #5410 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Iric filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 22, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5414 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #5412 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd.'s Claims of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (FRCP 12(b)(1), #5410 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Irico Group Corporation's Claims of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (FRCP 12(b)(1) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5412 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd.'s Claims of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (FRCP 12(b)(1), #5410 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Irico Group Corporation's Claims of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (FRCP 12(b)(1). Responses due by 4/1/2019. Replies due by 5/2/2019. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5411 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd's Claims of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (FRCP 12(b)(1), #5409 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Irico Group Corporation's Claims of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (FRCP 12(b)(1). Responses due by 4/12/2019. Replies due by 5/13/2019. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5413 Declaration of Stuart Plunkett in Support of #5409 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Irico Group Corporation's Claims of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (FRCP 12(b)(1), #5411 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd's Claims of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (FRCP 12(b)(1), #5412 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd.'s Claims of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (FRCP 12(b)(1), #5410 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Irico Group Corporation's Claims of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (FRCP 12(b)(1) filed byIrico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd.(("IDDC") is a Chinese entity), Irico Group Corp., Irico Group Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-7, #2 Exhibit 8-19, #3 Exhibit 20-25, #4 Exhibit 26-32, #5 Exhibit 33-38, #6 Exhibit 39-41, #7 Exhibit 42-45, #8 Exhibit 46-52, #9 Exhibit 53-56)(Related document(s) #5409 , #5411 , #5412 , #5410 ) (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5412 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd.'s Claims of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (FRCP 12(b)(1) filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd.(("IDDC") is a Chinese entity), Irico Group Corp., Irico Group Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 4/2/2019. Replies due by 4/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Zhaojie Wang ISO, #2 Proposed Order)(Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5411 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd's Claims of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (FRCP 12(b)(1) filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd.(("IDDC") is a Chinese entity), Irico Group Corp., Irico Group Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 4/2/2019. Replies due by 4/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Zhaojie Wang ISO, #2 Proposed Order)(Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5410 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Irico Group Corporation's Claims of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (FRCP 12(b)(1) filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd.(("IDDC") is a Chinese entity), Irico Group Corp., Irico Group Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 4/2/2019. Replies due by 4/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Zhaojie Wang ISO, #2 Proposed Order)(Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5409 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Irico Group Corporation's Claims of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (FRCP 12(b)(1) filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd.(("IDDC") is a Chinese entity), Irico Group Corp., Irico Group Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 4/2/2019. Replies due by 4/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Zhaojie Wang ISO, #2 Proposed Order)(Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 3/19/2019) Modified on 3/21/2019 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5408 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #5407 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Re The Amended Declaration of Zhaojie Wang and Irico's Amended Motions to Dismiss filed by Irico Group Corp., Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 19, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5407 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Re The Amended Declaration of Zhaojie Wang and Irico's Amended Motions to Dismiss filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd.(("IDDC") is a Chinese entity), Irico Group Corp.. (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5313 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction /Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Fed.R. Civ. P. 12(b(1)), #5312 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction /Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Fed.R. Civ. P. 12(b(1)). Motion Hearings continued from 5/9/2019 to 5/30/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar per #5381 STIPULATION AND ORDER. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5406 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #5405 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5405 First MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13170497) filed by Dan L. Williams & Co.. (Torres, Brian) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 5404 MANDATE of USCA as to #4752 Notice of Appeal filed by Anthony Gianasca, re #4747 Notice of Appeal filed by Dan L. Williams & Co., re #4749 Notice of Appeal filed by Harry Garavanian, Rockhurst University, Gary Talewsky, re #4741 Notice of Appeal filed by John Finn, Laura Fortman, re #4743 Notice of Appeal filed by Gordon Morgan, Sean Hull, re #4753 Notice of Appeal filed by Anthony Gianasca, re #4744 Notice of Appeal filed by JEFF CRAIG, Rosemary Ciccone, ESTATE OF LATE R. DERYL EDWARDS JR, INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF CLASS, Anthony Gianasca, Gloria Comeaux, Jeff Speaect, MINA ASHKANNEJHAD. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 5403 NOTICE by Monikraft, Inc of Withdrawal of Attorney Jayne A. Peeters (Steyer, Allan) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5402 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Due to a change in the Court's availability, the Further Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2019 is continued to 4/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. A Joint Case Management Statement is due 3/26/2019 by 5:00 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5401 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #5398 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5400 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #5399 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5399 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice John G. Crabtree, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13160718) filed by Dan L. Williams & Co.. (Crabtree, John) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5398 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice Brian C. Tackenberg, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971- 13160655) filed by Dan L. Williams & Co.. (Crabtree, John) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5397 NOTICE by Eleanor Lewis of Association of Counsel (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5396 NOTICE of Appearance by James Gerard Beebe Dallal (Dallal, James) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5395 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Noel Williams (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5394 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Saveri (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5393 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Fed.R. Civ. P. 12(b(1)) filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 3/15/2019. Replies due by 3/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Guo, #2 Declaration of Z. Wang, #3 Declaration of D. Clarke, #4 Declaration of P. Huston, #5 Exhibit 01-07, #6 Exhibit 08-19, #7 Exhibit 20-25, #8 Exhibit 26-32, #9 Exhibit 33-38, #10 Exhibit 39-41, #11 Exhibit 42-45, #12 Exhibit 46-52, #13 Exhibit 53-56, #14 Proposed Order)(Huston, Peter) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5392 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Fed.R. Civ. P. 12(b(1)) filed by Irico Group Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 3/15/2019. Replies due by 3/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Guo, #2 Declaration of Z. Wang, #3 Declaration of D. Clarke, #4 Declaration of P. Huston, #5 Exhibit 01-07, #6 Exhibit 08-19, #7 Exhibit 20-25, #8 Exhibit 26-32, #9 Exhibit 33-38, #10 Exhibit 39-41, #11 Exhibit 42-45, #12 Exhibit 46-52, #13 Exhibit 53-56, #14 Proposed Order)(Huston, Peter) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5391 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Michael T. Brody (Brody, Michael) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5390 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #5389 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5389 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13121890) filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Group Corp.. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Lucarelli, Andrew) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5388 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian James Jacobsmeyer (Jacobsmeyer, Brian) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5387 NOTICE by Harry Garavanian, Rockhurst University, Gary Talewsky of Appearance of Christopher A. Nedeau as Counsel (Moore, Theresa) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5386 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND VACATING HEARING re #5368 MOTION to Intervene filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs. Case Management Statement due by 3/25/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 15, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5385 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert J. Gralewski, Jr (Gralewski, Robert) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5384 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #5383 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5383 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice by Andrew J. McGuinness, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13060264) filed by George Feldman, Douglas King. (McGuinness, Andrew) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5382 REPLY (re #5368 MOTION to Intervene) filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5381 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #5379 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER RE THIRD AMENDED JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY DEADLINE, BRIEFING SCHEDULE, AND HEARING DATE filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 30, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5380 NOTICE of Position filed by Harry Garavanian, Rockhurst University, Gary Talewsky on re #5368 MOTION to Intervene (Moore, Theresa) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5379 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER RE THIRD AMENDED JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY DEADLINE, BRIEFING SCHEDULE, AND HEARING DATE filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5378 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MELISSA H. MAXMAN, PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #5377 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5377 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice for Melissa H. Maxman, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13040678) filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Maxman, Melissa) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5376 ORDER GRANTING STATE OF ILLINOIS', STATE OF OREGON'S AND CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBE LTD.'S MOTION TO DISBURSE THE ILLINOIS AND OREGON SHARES OF THE CHUNGHWA SETTLEMENT FUNDS re re #5365 MOTION Disburse Illinois and Oregon funds filed by State of Illinois. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 28, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5375 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5368 MOTION to Intervene) filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Mario N. Alioto In Support of Opposition to Motion to Intervene)(Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5374 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5368 MOTION to Intervene) -- Defendants' Joint Opposition to Motion to Intervene, filed by MT Picture Display Co., LTD, Panasonic Corporation(fka Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. ("MEI"), is a Japanese entity), Panasonic Corporation of North America(("PCNA") is a Delaware corporation). (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5373 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5368 MOTION to Intervene) filed by Mitsubishi Electric Corporation. (Truax, Terrence) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5372 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re #5365 MOTION to Disburse Illinois and Oregon funds - Joint Submission Re: State of Illinois' State of Oregon's, and Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd.'s MOTION to Disburse the Illinois and Oregon Shares of the Chunghwa Settlement Funds filed by State of Illinois. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Harrop, Blake) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5371 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5368 MOTION to Intervene) filed by Dan L. Williams & Co.. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5370 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #5365 MOTION to Disburse Illinois and Oregon funds filed by State of Illinois. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 23, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5369 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica Courtney Lai (Lai, Erica) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5368 MOTION to Intervene filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/25/2019. Replies due by 2/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Saveri (and Exhibits), #2 Declaration of Melissa H. Maxman (and Exhibits), #3 Declaration of Andrew J. McGuinness)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5367 REPLY (re #5365 MOTION to Disburse the Illinois and Oregon Shares of the Chunghwa Settlement funds) filed by State of Illinois. (Harrop, Blake) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 4, 2019 Filing 5366 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5365 MOTION Disburse Illinois and Oregon funds) - INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF OREGONS, AND CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD.S MOTION TO DISBURSE THE ILLINOIS AND OREGON SHARES OF THE CHUNGHWA SETTLEMENT FUNDS filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5365 MOTION to Disburse the Illinois and Oregon Shares of the Chunghwa Settlement Funds filed by State of Illinois. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/4/2019. Replies due by 1/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Harrop, Blake) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5364 NOTICE of Change of Address by Alan R. Plutzik (Plutzik, Alan) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5363 FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.NOTICE by MINA ASHKANNEJHAD, JEFF CRAIG, Rosemary Ciccone, Gloria Comeaux, ESTATE OF LATE R. DERYL EDWARDS JR, Anthony Gianasca for Supplemental Authority (Bonsignore, Robert) (Filed on 11/8/2018) Modified on 11/9/2018 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5362 ORDER DENYING INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 62.1 FOR AN INDICATIVE RULING ON THEIR MOTION TO AMEND THE IPP FEE ORDER AND AMEND THE PLAN OF DISTRIBUTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying #5335 Motion for an Indicative Ruling on their MOTION to Amend the IPP Fee Order and Amend the Plan of Distribution filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5361 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #5359 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Second Amended Jurisdictional Discovery Deadline, Briefing Schedule, and Hearing Date filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Jurisdictional Discovery due by 2/22/2019. Iricos opening motion(s) regarding jurisdictional issues in the IPP Action due by 2/8/2019. IPPs' opposition to Irico's motion(s) in the IPP Action due by 3/22/2019. Iricos reply in support of its motion(s) in the IPP Action due by 4/22/2019. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 5, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5360 Declaration of Richard Flamm In Support of Joint Opposition/Response of Indicative Ruling (5351) filed by MINA ASHKANNEJHAD, JEFF CRAIG, Rosemary Ciccone, Gloria Comeaux, ESTATE OF LATE R. DERYL EDWARDS JR, Anthony Gianasca. (Bonsignore, Robert) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5313 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction /Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Fed.R. Civ. P. 12(b(1)), #5312 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction /Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Fed.R. Civ. P. 12(b(1)). Responses due by 3/4/2019. Replies due by 4/4/2019. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5359 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER re Second Amended Jurisdictional Discovery Deadline, Briefing Schedule, and Hearing Date filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5358 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #5357 Administrative Motion FOR LEAVE FOR EXCESS PAGES. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5357 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION PURSUANT TO L.R. 7-11 FOR LEAVE FOR EXCESS PAGES re #5356 Reply to Opposition/Response filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Responses due by 10/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5356 REPLY (re #5335 MOTION for Indicative Ruling Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 62.1) filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 17, 2018 Filing 5355 Letter Brief filed by MINA ASHKANNEJHAD, Rosemary Ciccone, Gloria Comeaux, ESTATE OF LATE R. DERYL EDWARDS JR, Harry Garavanian, Anthony Gianasca, Rockhurst University, Gary Talewsky. (Bonsignore, Robert) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5354 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5335 MOTION Motion for Indicative Ruling Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 62.1) filed by Spectrum Settlement Recovery, LLC. (Thoreen, Peder) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5353 ORDER GRANTING IPPS' MOTION TO COMPEL JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY re #5301 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 16, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5352 ORDER GRANTING DPPS' MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH 8/2/2018 ORDER RE JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY re #5324 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, #5320 SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER RE DPPS' MOTION FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 16, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5351 JOINT OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5335 MOTION for Indicative Ruling Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 62.1) filed by MINA ASHKANNEJHAD, Rosemary Ciccone, Gloria Comeaux, ESTATE OF LATE R. DERYL EDWARDS JR, Anthony Gianasca. (Bonsignore, Robert) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5350 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5335 MOTION for Indicative Ruling Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 62.1) filed by Dan L. Williams & Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5349 *** FILED IN ERROR,REFER TO DOCUMENT #5351 *** OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #5335 MOTION Motion for Indicative Ruling Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 62.1 ) filed byMINA ASHKANNEJHAD, Rosemary Ciccone, Gloria Comeaux, ESTATE OF LATE R. DERYL EDWARDS JR, Harry Garavanian, Rockhurst University, Gary Talewsky. (Bonsignore, Robert) (Filed on 10/15/2018) Modified on 10/16/2018 (fff, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2018 Filing 5348 Letter from Certain Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class Members . (Arbabi, Deborah) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5347 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5335 MOTION for Indicative Ruling Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 62.1) - FRS' Response in Support of IPPs' Motion for An Indicative Ruling filed by Financial Recovery Services, Inc.. (Bien, Michael) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5346 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jenny Snay Yelin (Yelin, Jenny) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 5345 Declaration of Kathryn Gumm in Support of #5335 MOTION for Indicative Ruling Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 62.1 - Declaration of Kathryn Gumm In Response to IPPs' Motion for Indicative Ruling Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 62.1 filed by Kathryn Gumm. (Related document(s) #5335 ) (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 5344 Declaration of Patrick Carleo in Support of #5335 MOTION for Indicative Ruling Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 62.1 - Declaration of Patrick Carleo In Response to IPPs' Motion for Indicative Ruling Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 62.1 filed by Patrick Carleo, Jr.. (Related document(s) #5335 ) (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 5343 Declaration of Jeffrey Schapira in Support of #5335 MOTION for Indicative Ruling Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 62.1 - Declaration of Jeffrey Schapira In Response to IPPs' Motion for an Indicative Ruling Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 62.1 filed by Jeffrey Schapira. (Related document(s) #5335 ) (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5342 Statement of Non-Opposition re #5335 MOTION Motion for Indicative Ruling Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 62.1 [Defendants' Joint Statement Re: Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62.1], filed byMT Picture Display Co., LTD, Panasonic Corporation(fka Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. ("MEI"), is a Japanese entity), Panasonic Corporation of North America(("PCNA") is a Delaware corporation). (Related document(s) #5335 ) (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5341 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #5337 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE TRANSLATION PROTOCOL filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 9, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5340 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #5336 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE AMENDED JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY DEADLINE, BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 9, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018).
October 9, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5313 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction /Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Fed.R. Civ. P. 12(b(1)), #5312 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction /Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Fed.R. Civ. P. 12(b(1)). Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5339 Appendix to re #5332 Order - APPENDIX OF RECORD REGARDING SPECIAL MASTER'S SEPTEMBER 28, 2018 ORDER filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Group Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Document 1, #2 Document 2, #3 Document 3, #4 Document 4, #5 Document 5, #6 Document 6, #7 Document 7)(Related document(s) #5332 ) (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5338 OBJECTIONS to re #5332 Order - OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER OF SEPTEMBER 28, 2018 filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Group Corp.. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Stuart C. Plunkett, #(2) [Proposed] Order)(Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5337 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE TRANSLATION PROTOCOL filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5336 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #5323 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #5282 Stipulation and Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, #5317 Order STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE AMENDED JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY DEADLINE, BRIEFING SCHEDULE, AND HEARING DATE filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5335 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62.1 for an Indicative Ruling on their MOTION to Amend the IPP Fee Order and Amend the Plan of Distribution filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/15/2018. Replies due by 10/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Mario N. Alioto In Support of IPPs' Motion for Indicative Ruling Pursuant to FRCP 62.1, #2 Declaration Declaration of Jonathan E. Schwartz Regarding Value of Projected Claims from Massachusetts, Missouri and New Hampshire)(Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5334 Appendix re #5331 Order - Appendix of Record Regarding Special Master dated September 26, 2018 filed byIrico Display Devices Co., Ltd.(("IDDC") is a Chinese entity), Irico Group Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Document 1, #2 Document 2, #3 Document 3, #4 Document 4, #5 Document 5, #6 Document 6, #7 Document 7, #8 Document 8, #9 Document 9, #10 Document 10, #11 Document 11, #12 Document 12, #13 Document 13, #14 Document 14, #15 Document 15, #16 Document 16)(Related document(s) #5331 ) (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5333 OBJECTIONS to re #5331 Order - Objections to Special Master Dated September 26, 2018 filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd.(("IDDC") is a Chinese entity), Irico Group Corp.. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Stuart C. Plunkett, #(2)[Proposed] Order)(Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5332 ORDER Granting IPPS' MOTION to Compel Jurisdictional Discovery re #5301 Order Regarding Discovery Dispute. Signed by Judge Vaughn R. Walker on 9/27/2018. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5331 ORDER GRANTING DPPS' MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH 8/2/2018 ORDER RE JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY re #5320 SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER RE DPPS' MOTION FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY re #5301 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE; #5324 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #5320 SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER RE DPPS' MOTION FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Vaughn R. Walker on September 25, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5330 MANDATE of USCA as to #4746 Notice of Appeal filed by Josie Saik. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5329 ORDER of USCA as to #4746 Notice of Appeal filed by Josie Saik. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5328 SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DPP's SECOND MOTION TO COMPEL JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY re #5324 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 5320 SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER RE DPPS' MOTION FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Vaughn R. Walker on September 12, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5327 ORDER DENYING IRICO'S REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN OPPOSITION BRIEF TO IPP'S MOTION RE JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY re #5301 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Vaughn R. Walker on September 12, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5326 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATING MOTION re (5245 in 3:07-cv-05944-JST) Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Defendant Mitsubishi Electric Corporation filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 28, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 5325 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER by the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL No. 1917. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 24, 2018 case electronically transmitted to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5324 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #5320 SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER RE DPPS' MOTION FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY re #5301 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 20, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5323 ORDER re #5312 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Irico Group Corporation, #5313 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., #5322 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 13, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5313 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction /Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Fed.R. Civ. P. 12(b(1)), #5312 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction /Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Fed.R. Civ. P. 12(b(1)). Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Irico Defendants' motions to dismiss the IPPs' Consolidated Amended Complaint due by 10/4/2018. Replies due by 12/20/2018. Responses due by 11/15/2018. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 6, 2018 Filing 5322 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5321 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #5319 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING SUBMISSION OF JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Irico Group Corp., Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 3, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5320 SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER RE DPPS' MOTION FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY re #5301 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Vaughn R. Walker on August 2, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
August 2, 2018 Filing 5319 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SUBMISSION OF JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Group Corp.. (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
July 26, 2018 Filing 5318 Letter from Counsel for MARTA re: Order Suggesting Remand (ECF 5308) . (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/26/2018)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5317 ORDER RE IPPS' MOTION FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY re #5301 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 24, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2018)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5316 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #5315 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Case Management Statement due by 8/2/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 24, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2018)
July 20, 2018 Filing 5315 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 20, 2018 Filing 5314 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Steven F. Benz Regarding Collin R. White (Benz, Steven) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 5313 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Fed.R. Civ. P. 12(b(1)) filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/15/2018. Replies due by 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Guo, #2 Declaration of Z. Wang, #3 Declaration of D. Clarke, #4 Declaration of S. Plunkett, #5 Exhibit 1-7, #6 Exhibit 8-19, #7 Exhibit 20-25, #8 Exhibit 26-32, #9 Exhibit 33-38, #10 Exhibit 39-41, #11 Exhibit 42-45, #12 Exhibit 46-52, #13 Exhibit 53-56, #14 Proposed Order)(Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 5312 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Fed.R. Civ. P. 12(b(1)) filed by Irico Group Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/15/2018. Replies due by 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Guo, #2 Declaration of Z. Wang, #3 Declaration of D. Clarke, #4 Declaration of S. Plunkett, #5 Exhibit 1-7, #6 Exhibit 8-19, #7 Exhibit 20-25, #8 Exhibit 26-32, #9 Exhibit 33-38, #10 Exhibit 39-41, #11 Exhibit 42-45, #12 Exhibit 46-52, #13 Exhibit 53-56, #14 Proposed Order)(Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5311 ORDER of USCA as to #5142 Notice of Cross Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, re #5129 Notice of Appeal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, re #5131 Notice of Appeal filed by Brian Barry, re #5132 Notice of Appeal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5310 SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER RE IPPS' MOTION FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY re #5301 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Vaughn R. Walker on July 6, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5309 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #5307 SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE MEDIATION re #5296 ORDER REGARDING MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 5, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2018)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5308 ORDER GRANTING MOTION SUGGESTING REMAND by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting (5288) Motion to Remand in case 3:07-cv-05944-JST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2018)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5307 SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE MEDIATION re #5296 ORDER REGARDING MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Vaughn R. Walker on June 18, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5306 ORDER VACATING HEARING re (5288 in 3:07-cv-05944-JST) MOTION to Remand Direct Action Plaintiff MARTA's Motion Suggesting Remand filed by Marta Cooperative of America, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 18, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5305 ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC re #5304 Letter filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, #5245 MOTION for Settlement Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Defendant Mitsubishi Electric Corporation filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, #5279 Letter filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 11, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
June 10, 2018 Filing 5304 Letter from Mario N. Alioto to Hon. Jon S. Tigar . (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 6/10/2018)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5303 SPECIAL MASTER REVISED ORDER RE MEDIATION STATEMENTS re #5296 ORDER REGARDING MEDIATION; #5302 ORDER RE MEDIATION SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Vaughn R. Walker on June 4, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2018)).
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5302 ORDER RE MEDIATION SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Vaughn R. Walker on 6/1/2018. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5301 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE re #5298 Discovery Letter BriefRegarding Discovery and Briefing Schedule for Irico's FSIA Motion in the IPP Action filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 31, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 30, 2018 Filing 5300 Letter Brief Responding to #5298 Letter Request filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Group Corp.. (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
May 30, 2018 Filing 5299 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5288 MOTION to Remand - Direct Action Plaintiff MARTA's Motion Suggesting Remand) on Behalf of the Samsung SDI Defendants and the Panasonic Defendants filed by Samsung SDI (Malaysia) Sdn Bhd., Samsung SDI America, Inc.("Samsung SDI America") is a California corporation), Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co. Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V.("Samsung SDI Mexico") is a Mexican company), Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co. Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.. (Roberti, John) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
May 29, 2018 Filing 5298 Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Discovery and Briefing Schedule for Irico's FSIA Motion in the IPP Action filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Re Jurisdictional Discovery, Briefing Schedule, and Hearing Date)(Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 29, 2018 Filing 5297 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Sofia Arguello - Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Arguello, Sofia) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5296 ORDER REGARDING MEDIATION re #5286 Letter filed by Financial Recovery Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 29, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 22, 2018 Filing 5295 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING MOTION HEARING DATE as to #5288 MOTION to Remand Direct Action Plaintiff MARTA's Motion Suggesting Remand. The Court will conduct a Motion Hearing on 6/28/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 5294 Letter from Jeffrey L. Bornstein re Financial Recovery Services, Inc.. (Bornstein, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 5293 Letter from Mario N. Alioto in Response to Letter from Financial Recovery Services . (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 5292 Letter from Certain Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Class Members . (Arbabi, Deborah) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 5291 RESPONSE to re #5286 Letter - Response of Mitsubishi Electric Corporation to Letter of Financial Recovery Services by Mitsubishi Electric Corporation. (Truax, Terrence) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Set Briefing Deadlines re #5288 MOTION to Remand - Direct Action Plaintiff MARTA's Motion Suggesting Remand. Responses due by 5/30/2018. Replies due by 6/6/2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5290 ORDER of USCA as to #5142 Notice of Cross Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, re #5129 Notice of Appeal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, re #5131 Notice of Appeal filed by Brian Barry & re #5132 Notice of Appeal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 18, 2018 Filing 5289 Letter Brief re #5287 Order, #5286 Letter filed bySpectrum Settlement Recovery, LLC. (Related document(s) #5287 , #5286 ) (Thoreen, Peder) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 16, 2018 Filing 5288 MOTION to Remand - Direct Action Plaintiff MARTA's Motion Suggesting Remand filed by Marta Cooperative of America, Inc.. Responses due by 5/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5287 ORDER REGRADING LETTER FROM FINANCIAL RECOVERY STRATEGIES re #5286 Letter from Financial Recovery Strategies filed by Financial Recovery Services, Inc. Responses due 5/21/2018. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 14, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 5286 Letter from Financial Recovery Strategies . (Bornstein, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5285 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #5284 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Marta Cooperative of America, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 7, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 4, 2018 Filing 5284 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Marta Cooperative of America, Inc.. (Isaacson, William) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5283 ORDER of USCA as to #4752 Notice of Appeal filed by Anthony Gianasca, re #4747 Notice of Appeal filed by Dan L. Williams & Co., re #4749 Notice of Appeal filed by Harry Garavanian, Rockhurst University, Gary Talewsky, re #4745 Notice of Appeal filed by Donnie Clifton, re #4741 Notice of Appeal filed by John Finn, Laura Fortman, re #4743 Notice of Appeal filed by Gordon Morgan, Sean Hull, re #4753 Notice of Appeal filed by Anthony Gianasca, re #4746 Notice of Appeal filed by Josie Saik & re #4744 Notice of Appeal filed by JEFF CRAIG, Rosemary Ciccone, ESTATE OF LATE R. DERYL EDWARDS JR, INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF CLASS, Anthony Gianasca, Gloria Comeaux, Jeff Speaect, MINA ASHKANNEJHAD. (tnS) (Filed on 5/2/2018)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5282 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #5281 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER RE JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY, BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATES filed by Irico Group Corp., Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd. Jurisdictional discovery due by 10/3/2018. Motion due by 7/18/2018. Responses due by 10/15/2018. Replies due by 11/15/2018. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 1, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
April 30, 2018 Filing 5281 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY, BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATES filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Group Corp.. (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 27, 2018 Filing 5279 Letter from Mario N. Alioto Re: Motion for Preliminary Approval of Mitsubishi Electric Settlement . (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
April 26, 2018 Filing 5278 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/24/2018 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Group Corp., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5277 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying #5266 Motion to Compel. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 25, 2018 Filing 5276 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/24/2018 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 24, 2018 Filing 5275 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Motion Hearing held on 4/24/2018 re #5266 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from the Irico Defendants filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs; Further Case Management Conference held on 4/24/2018. Total Time in Court: 36 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/24/2018)
April 17, 2018 Filing 5274 REPLY (re #5266 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from the Irico Defendants); -DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM THE IRICO DEFENDANTS filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
April 17, 2018 Filing 5273 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 16-10(d) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
April 10, 2018 Filing 5272 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5266 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from the Irico Defendants) filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Group Corp.. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Plunkett in Support, #(2) Exhibit A to Plunkett Decl., #(3) Exhibit B to Plunkett Decl., #(4) Exhibit C to Plunkett Decl.)(Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5271 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #5270 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Vacating Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 6, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 5, 2018 Filing 5270 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Vacating Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 5269 Supplemental Brief re #5267 Supplemental Brief - Corrected Supplemental Opposition To Modified Proposed Notice Of Settlement filed by Financial Recovery Services, Inc.. (Related document(s) #5267 ) (Bornstein, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 3, 2018 Filing 5268 Supplemental Opposition to Modified Proposed Notice of Settlement re #5267 Supplemental Brief filed by Financial Recovery Services, Inc.. (Related document(s) #5267 ) (Bornstein, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 5267 Joint Supplemental Brief re #5245 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Defendant Mitsubishi Electric Corporation filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration Declaration of Mario N. Alioto ISO Suppl. Submission Re: Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with Mitsubishi Electric Corp.)(Related document(s) #5245 ) (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
March 27, 2018 Filing 5266 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses from the Irico Defendants filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 4/10/2018. Replies due by 4/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF R. ALEXANDER SAVERI IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM THE IRICO DEFENDANTS, #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM THE IRICO DEFENDANTS)(Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5265 ORDER VACATING HEARING re (5245 in 3:07-cv-05944-JST) Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Defendant Mitsubishi Electric Corporation filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 26, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 26, 2018 Filing 5264 SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER. Signed by Special Master Vaughn R. Walker. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 5263 [Proposed] Order Rejecting Proposed Plan of Distribution in Class Action Settlement with Defendant Mitsubishi Electric Corporation re #5259 Letter filed by Financial Recovery Services, Inc.. (Bornstein, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 5262 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenny Snay Yelin - Notice of Appearance of Counsel Jenny S. Yelin for Non-Party Objectors Financial Recovery Strategies, Inc., dba Financial Recovery Strategies (Yelin, Jenny) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 5261 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Bornstein - Notice of Appearance of Counsel Jeffrey L. Bornstein for Non-Party Objectors Financial Recovery Strategies, Inc., dba Financial Recovery Strategies (Bornstein, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 5260 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael William Bien - Notice of Appearance of Counsel Michael W. Bien for Non-Party Objectors Financial Recovery Strategies, Inc., dba Financial Recovery Strategies (Bien, Michael) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 16, 2018 Filing 5259 Letter from Jeffrey N. Leibell, Financial Recovery Strategies. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 12, 2018 Filing 5258 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE per #5257 STIPULATION STIPULATED REQUEST FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 16-10(c). At the request of the parties, the Court will conduct a Further Case Management Conference for the DPP and Irico Defendants on 4/24/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. A Joint Case Management Statement is due by 4/17/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 9, 2018 Filing 5257 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 16-10(c) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
March 9, 2018 Filing 5256 Letter Brief re #5245 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Defendant Mitsubishi Electric Corporation filed by Spectrum Settlement Recovery, LLC. (Related document(s) #5245 ) (Thoreen, Peder) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
March 7, 2018 Filing 5255 REPLY (re #5245 MOTION for Settlement Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Defendant Mitsubishi Electric Corporation ) [Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Reply to Financial Recovery Strategies' Objection to Proposed Plan of Distribution in Class Action Settlement with Defendant Mitsubishi Electric Corporation] filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph M. Fisher Re: Response to FRS)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5254 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying #5234 Motion for Hearing. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5253 ORDER VACATING HEARING re (5234 in 3:07-cv-05944-JST) MOTION for Hearing Defendants' Motion for Evidentiary Hearing RE: MARTA's Standing filed by Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc, Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America, Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 27, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
February 27, 2018 Filing 5252 Letter from Jeffrey N. Leibell, Financial Recovery Strategies. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5251 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE MOTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #5250 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
February 26, 2018 Filing 5250 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12140156) filed by Samsung SDI (Malaysia) Sdn Bhd., Samsung SDI America, Inc.(("Samsung SDI America") is a California corporation), Samsung SDI Brasil Ltda., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V.(("Samsung SDI Mexico") is a Mexican company), Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co. Ltd, Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Davies, Andrew) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
February 23, 2018 Filing 5249 Letter from Defendants in Remanded Actions re Continuance of EDNY Trial Date. (Curran, Christopher) (Filed on 2/23/2018)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5248 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #5244 Administrative Motion for Excess Pages. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2018)
February 20, 2018 Filing 5247 Supplemental Declaration of Mario N. Alioto in Support of re #5245 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Defendant Mitsubishi Electric Corporation Suppl. Declaration of Mario N. Alioto filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #5245 ) (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
February 16, 2018 Filing 5246 NOTICE filed by LG Electronics, Inc. of Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel [Cathleen H. Hartge and Gregory Weingart (Kim, Miriam) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
February 14, 2018 Filing 5245 Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Defendant Mitsubishi Electric Corporation; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/28/2018. Replies due by 3/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Mario N. Alioto In Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Mitsubishi Electric Corp., #2 Declaration Declaration of Joseph M. Fisher Re: Mitsubishi Notice Program, #3 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Mitsubishi Electric Corporation)(Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
February 13, 2018 Filing 5244 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Excess Pages for IPPs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Mitsubishi Electric Corp. filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/20/2018. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration Declaration of Lauren C. Capurro In Support of Admin. Motion for Excess Pages, #(2) [Proposed] Order Granting Administrative Motion for Excess Pages)(Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
February 12, 2018 Filing 5243 NOTICE by Samsung SDI America, Inc.(("Samsung SDI America") is a California corporation), Samsung SDI Co. Ltd of withdrawal for attorney Matthew Boucher (Roberti, John) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
February 6, 2018 Filing 5242 MANDATE of USCA as to #4973 Notice of Appeal filed by Marta Cooperative of America, Inc.. (tnS) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
February 6, 2018 Filing 5241 REPLY (re #5234 Defendants' Motion for Evidentiary Hearing RE: MARTA's Standing) filed by Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.(("TAIP") is headquartered in Irvine, California), Toshiba America, Inc(("Toshiba America") is a Delaware corporation), Toshiba Corporation(("TC") is a Japanese company). (Lau, Lucius) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5240 ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying as moot #5191 Motion for Default Judgment; granting #5215 Motion to Set Aside Default. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
January 31, 2018 Filing 5239 USCA Memorandum as to #4973 Notice of Appeal filed by Marta Cooperative of America, Inc.. (tnS) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 5238 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5234 Defendants' Motion for Evidentiary Hearing RE: MARTA's Standing) filed by Marta Cooperative of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 25, 2018 Filing 5237 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/11/18, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #5233 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 2/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2018. (Related documents(s) #5233 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5236 ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re (5235 in 3:07-cv-05944-JST) STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 24, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
January 22, 2018 Filing 5235 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 16, 2018 Filing 5234 Defendants' Notice of Motion & Motion for Evidentiary Hearing RE: MARTA's Standing filed by Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc. (("TAEP") is headquartered in Irvine, California), Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. (("TAIP") is headquartered in Irvine, California), Toshiba America, Inc. (("Toshiba America") is a Delaware corporation), Toshiba Corporation ("TC") is a Japanese company). (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Lau, Lucius) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
January 16, 2018 Filing 5233 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/11/18 before Judge Jon S. Tigar by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Group Corp., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
January 16, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5234 Defendants' Motion for Evidentiary Hearing RE: MARTA's Standing. Responses due by 1/30/2018. Replies due by 2/6/2018. Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 5232 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name and Address filed by James Brown, Travis Burau, Joshua Maida, Kory Pentland, Ryan Rizzo (McKenna, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 11, 2018 Filing 5231 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Motion Hearing held on 1/11/2018 re #5215 MOTION to Set Aside Default (Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(c)) filed by Irico Group Corporation, Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., #5191 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to the Irico Defendants filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Total Time in Court: 1 hour, 14 minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/11/2018)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5230 ORDER of USCA as to #4752 Notice of Appeal filed by Anthony Gianasca, re #4747 Notice of Appeal filed by Dan L. Williams & Co., re #4749 Notice of Appeal filed by Harry Garavanian, Rockhurst University, Gary Talewsky, #4745 Notice of Appeal, filed by Donnie Clifton, re #4741 Notice of Appeal filed by John Finn, Laura Fortman, re #4743 Notice of Appeal filed by Gordon Morgan, Sean Hull, re #4753 Notice of Appeal filed by Anthony Gianasca, re #4746 Notice of Appeal filed by Josie Saik, re #4744 Notice of Appeal filed by JEFF CRAIG, Rosemary Ciccone, ESTATE OF LATE R. DERYL EDWARDS JR, INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF CLASS, Anthony Gianasca, Gloria Comeaux, Jeff Speaect, MINA ASHKANNEJHAD. (tnS) (Filed on 12/27/2017)
December 21, 2017 Filing 5229 REPLY (re #5215 MOTION to Set Aside Default (Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(c)) ) filed byIrico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Group Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Plunkett in Support of Motion to Set Aside Default, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 15, 2017 Filing 5228 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5215 MOTION to Set Aside Default (Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(c))) - (Refiled Redacted Version per Court Order, ECF No. 5225) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF R. ALEXANDER SAVERI IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE IRICO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND EXHIBITS 1-11 THERETO, #2 Exhibit EXHIBITS 12-32 TO DECLARATION OF R. ALEXANDER SAVERI IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE IRICO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT, #3 Declaration DECLARATION OF CADIO ZIRPOLI IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE IRICO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT, #(4) PROPOSED ORDER DENYING IRICO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT)(Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5227 ORDER TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULE 5-1(e)(2) re #5226 Opposition/Response to Motion. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 15, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 14, 2017 Filing 5226 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5215 MOTION to Set Aside Default (Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(c))) - (Refiled Redacted Version per Court Order, ECF No. 5225) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF R. ALEXANDER SAVERI IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE IRICO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND EXHIBITS 1-11 THERETO, #2 Exhibit EXHIBITS 12-32 TO DECLARATION OF R. ALEXANDER SAVERI IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE IRICO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT, #3 Declaration DECLARATION OF CADIO ZIRPOLI IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE IRICO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT, #4 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER DENYING IRICO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT)(Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5225 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part #5220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 11, 2017 Filing 5224 Declaration of Stuart C. Plunkett in Support of #5220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(D) filed byIrico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Group Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #5220 ) (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
December 7, 2017 Filing 5223 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs re #5221 Opposition/Response to Motion, re #5220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Van Culin, Sarah) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
December 7, 2017 Filing 5222 REPLY (re #5191 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to the Irico Defendants (filed pursuant to Order ECF No. 5187)); -DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY THE COURT AGAINST THE IRICO DEFENDANTS filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
December 7, 2017 Filing 5221 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5215 MOTION to Set Aside Default (Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(c))) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration DECLARATION OF R. ALEXANDER SAVERI IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE IRICO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT, #(2) Exhibit EXHIBIT 11 TO DECLARATION OF R. ALEXANDER SAVERI IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE IRICO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT, #(3) Exhibit EXHIBITS 12-32 TO DECLARATION OF R. ALEXANDER SAVERI IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE IRICO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT, #(4) Declaration DECLARATION OF CADIO ZIRPOLI IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE IRICO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT, #(5) Exhibit EXHIBIT 4 TO DECLARATION OF CADIO ZIRPOLI IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE IRICO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT, #(6) [PROPOSED] ORDER DENYING IRICO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT)(Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
December 7, 2017 Filing 5220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED VERSION OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE IRICO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT, #4 UNREDACTED VERSION OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE IRICO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT, #5 REDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT 11 TO DECLARATION OF R. ALEXANDER SAVERI IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE IRICO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT, #6 UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT 11 TO DECLARATION OF R. ALEXANDER SAVERI IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE IRICO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT, #7 REDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBITS 12-32 TO DECLARATION OF R. ALEXANDER SAVERI IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE IRICO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT, #8 UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT 12-32 TO DECLARATION OF R. ALEXANDER SAVERI IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE IRICO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT, #9 REDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT 4 TO DECLARATION OF CADIO ZIRPOLI IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE IRICO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT, #10 UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT 4 TO DECLARATION OF CADIO ZIRPOLI IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE IRICO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT)(Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
December 4, 2017 Filing 5219 Letter from Mario N. Alioto to the Honorable Jon S. Tigar . (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
November 8, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5215 MOTION to Set Aside Default (Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(c)). Responses due by 12/7/2017. Replies due by 12/21/2017. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 8, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5191 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to the Irico Defendants (filed pursuant to Order ECF No. 5187). Replies due by 12/7/2017. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5218 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #5217 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re Briefing Schedule and Hearing Dates filed by Irico Group Corp., Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 7, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 6, 2017 Filing 5217 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re Briefing Schedule and Hearing Dates filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Group Corp.. (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
October 25, 2017 Filing 5216 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND RULE 26(F) REPORT filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 Filing 5215 MOTION to Set Aside Default (Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(c)) filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Group Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 11/8/2017. Replies due by 11/15/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zhang in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 25, 2017 Filing 5214 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5191 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to the Irico Defendants (filed pursuant to Order ECF No. 5187)) filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Group Corporation. (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 2, 2017 Filing 5213 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #5191 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to the Irico Defendants (filed pursuant to Order ECF No. 5187). The briefing and hearing schedule for this motion are set as follows (ECF No. #5212 ): Responses due by 10/25/2017. Replies due by 11/8/2017. The Motion Hearing is continued to 12/7/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5212 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #5210 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Application for Default Judgment by the Court Against the Irico Defendants filed by Irico Group Corp., Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 2, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5211 ORDER re #5209 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Irico Group Corp., Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 2, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
September 29, 2017 Filing 5210 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Application for Default Judgment by the Court Against the Irico Defendants filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Group Corp.. (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 28, 2017 Filing 5209 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Stuart Christopher Plunkett - Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (Plunkett, Stuart) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5208 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #5207 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #5191 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to the Irico Defendants (filed pursuant to Order ECF No. 5187) for new briefing schedule filed by Irico Group Corp., Irico Group Corporation, Irico Group Electronics Co., Ltd., Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 13, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
September 13, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5191 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to the Irico Defendants (filed pursuant to Order ECF No. 5187). Responses due by 10/4/2017. Replies due by 10/11/2017. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
September 12, 2017 Filing 5207 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule re #5191 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to the Irico Defendants (filed pursuant to Order ECF No. 5187) filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd.(("IDDC") is a Chinese entity), Irico Group Corp., Irico Group Corporation, Irico Group Electronics Co., Ltd., Irico Group Electronics Co., Ltd.(("IGE") is a Chinese entity). (Oberdier, Carl) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5206 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CARL W. OBERDIER PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #5203 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5205 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY SARA K. HUNKLER PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #5202 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5204 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY KELLEN G. RESSMEYER PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #5201 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 8, 2017 Filing 5203 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11702057). filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd.(("IDDC") is a Chinese entity), Irico Group Corp., Irico Group Corporation, Irico Group Electronics Co., Ltd., Irico Group Electronics Co., Ltd.(("IGE") is a Chinese entity). (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Exhibit A -- Certificate of Good Standing, #(2) Proposed Order)(Oberdier, Carl) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 8, 2017 Filing 5202 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice Sara K. Hunkler, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11701936). filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd.(("IDDC") is a Chinese entity), Irico Group Corp., Irico Group Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Granting the Application of Sara K. Hunkler for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Hunkler, Sara) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 8, 2017 Filing 5201 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice Kellen G. Ressmeyer, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11701806). filed by Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd., Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd.(("IDDC") is a Chinese entity), Irico Group Corp., Irico Group Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting the Application of Kellen G. Ressmeyer for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Ressmeyer, Kellen) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 8, 2017 Filing 5200 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald F. George for Irico Group Corp. and Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd. (George, Gerald) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
August 30, 2017 Filing 5199 AFFIDAVIT re #5192 Order, #5191 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to the Irico Defendants (filed pursuant to Order ECF No. 5187) DECLARATION OF MATTHEW D. HEAPHY RE: NOTICE TO THE IRICO DEFENDANTS OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY THE COURT; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Heaphy, Matthew) (Filed on 8/30/2017)
August 29, 2017 Filing 5198 NOTICE filed by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP re #5192 Order of Notice of Compliance with Forwarding Obligation (Sweeney, Dianne) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
August 23, 2017 Filing 5197 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Chadwick Oliver Brooker (Brooker, Chadwick) (Filed on 8/23/2017)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5196 ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 22, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2017)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5195 ORDER of USCA as to #5142 Notice of Cross Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, re #4752 Notice of Appeal, filed by Anthony Gianasca, re #5129 Notice of Appeal, filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, re #4747 Notice of Appeal, filed by Dan L. Williams & Co., re #4749 Notice of Appeal, filed by Harry Garavanian, Rockhurst University, Gary Talewsky, re #5131 Notice of Appeal filed by Brian Barry, re #4745 Notice of Appeal, filed by Donnie Clifton, re #4741 Notice of Appeal, filed by John Finn, Laura Fortman, re #4743 Notice of Appeal filed by Gordon Morgan, Sean Hull, re #4973 Notice of Appeal, filed by Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., re #4753 Notice of Appeal, filed by Anthony Gianasca, re #4746 Notice of Appeal filed by Josie Saik, re #5132 Notice of Appeal, filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, re #4744 Notice of Appeal, filed by JEFF CRAIG, Rosemary Ciccone, ESTATE OF LATE R. DERYL EDWARDS JR, INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF CLASS, Anthony Gianasca, Gloria Comeaux, Jeff Speaect, MINA ASHKANNEJHAD. (tnS) (Filed on 8/17/2017)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5194 ORDER of USCA as to #4752 Notice of Appeal, filed by Anthony Gianasca, re #4747 Notice of Appeal, filed by Dan L. Williams & Co., re #4749 Notice of Appeal, filed by Harry Garavanian, Rockhurst University, Gary Talewsky, re #4745 Notice of Appeal, filed by Donnie Clifton, re #4741 Notice of Appeal, filed by John Finn, Laura Fortman, re #4743 Notice of Appeal filed by Gordon Morgan, Sean Hull, re #4753 Notice of Appeal, filed by Anthony Gianasca, re #4746 Notice of Appeal filed by Josie Saik, re #4744 Notice of Appeal, filed by JEFF CRAIG, Rosemary Ciccone, ESTATE OF LATE R. DERYL EDWARDS JR, INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF CLASS, Anthony Gianasca, Gloria Comeaux, Jeff Speaect, MINA ASHKANNEJHAD. (tnS) (Filed on 8/17/2017)
August 17, 2017 Filing 5193 NOTICE by Central New York Univision Video Systems, Inc., Crimson Tech, Inc., Univisions-Crimson Holding Inc. of Change of Firm Name (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 8/17/2017)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5192 ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 15, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
August 14, 2017 Filing 5191 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to the Irico Defendants (filed pursuant to Order ECF No. 5187) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 8/17/2017. Replies due by 8/24/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF R.ALEXANDER SAVERI IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY THE COURT AGAINST THE IRICO DEFENDANTS, #2 Exhibit AP TO SAVERI DECLARATION, #3 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY THE COURT AGAINST THE IRICO DEFENDANTS)(Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
August 14, 2017 Filing 5190 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Vincent J. Esades (Esades, Vincent) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5189 ORDER of USCA as to #5142 Notice of Cross Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, re #5129 Notice of Appeal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, re #5132 Notice of Appeal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (tnS) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 5188 RESPONSE to re #5185 Opposition/Response to Motion, re #5186 Order; -DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO PILLSBURY WINTHROP SHAW PITTMAN LLP'S LETTER RE APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY THE COURT AGAINST THE IRICO DEFENDANTS filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5187 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying #5182 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5186 ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 9, 2017. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2017)
August 8, 2017 Filing 5185 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5183 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to the Irico Defendants) filed by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP. (Sweeney, Dianne) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
August 3, 2017 Filing 5184 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs of re #5182 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d), re #5183 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to the Irico Defendants (Van Culin, Sarah) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
August 3, 2017 Filing 5183 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to the Irico Defendants filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 8/17/2017. Replies due by 8/24/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF R. ALEXANDER SAVERI IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY THE COURT AGAINST THE IRICO DEFENDANTS, #2 Exhibit EXHIBITS A-P TO SAVERI DECLARATION, #3 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY THE COURT AGAINST THE IRICO DEFENDANTS)(Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
August 3, 2017 Filing 5182 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF R. ALEXANDER SAVERI IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5(d), #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5(d), #3 REDACTED VERSION OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY THE COURT AGAINST THE IRICO DEFENDANTS, #4 UNREDACTED VERSION OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY THE COURT AGAINST THE IRICO DEFENDANTS, #5 REDACTED VERSION OF DECLARATION OF R. ALEXANDER SAVERI IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY THE COURT AGAINST THE IRICO DEFENDANTS, #6 UNREDACTED VERSION OF DECLARATION OF R. ALEXANDER SAVERI IN SUPPORT OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY THE COURT AGAINST THE IRICO DEFENDANTS, #7 REDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT A TO SAVERI DECLARATION, #8 UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT A TO SAVERI DECLARATION, #9 REDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBITS D-P TO SAVERI DECLARATION, #10 UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT D TO SAVERI DECLARATION, #11 UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT E TO SAVERI DECLARATION, #12 UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBITS F-H TO SAVERI DECLARATION, #13 UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBITS I-M TO SAVERI DECLARATION, #14 UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBITS N-P TO SAVERI DECLARATION)(Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
July 31, 2017 Filing 5181 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING LETTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
July 27, 2017 Filing 5180 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Videocon Industries, Ltd. by Sharp Electronics Corporation, Sharp Electronics Manufacturing Company of America, Inc. (Benson, Craig) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
July 26, 2017 Filing 5179 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Gilah Kupfer (Kupfer, Susan) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5178 RELATED CASE ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (5174) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:07-cv-05944-JST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5177 ORDER RE IRICO DEFENDANTSThe Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs recently stated their intention to file a motion for entry of default judgment against the defendants Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd. and Irico Group Corporation. ECF No. 5175 at 2. That motion is due by August 4, 2017 at 5:00 p.m. Correction of order at ECF No. 5176. This is a text only order. There is no document associated with this entry. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5176 SEE ECF NO. 5177 FOR CORRECTED ORDERORDER RE IRICO DEFENDANTSThe Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs recently stated their intention to file a motion for entry of default judgment against the defendants Irico Display Devices Co., Ltd. and Irico Group Corporation. ECF No. 5175 at 2; see also ECF No. 4722 at 2 ("[N]ow that the IPP class settlement has been approved, it is time for the IPPs to reduce their remaining claims to judgment"). That motion is due by August 4, 2017 at 5:00 p.m.(Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar) (Filed on 7/21/2017) Modified on 7/21/2017 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2017 Filing 5175 OBJECTIONS to re #5172 Order; -DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTION RE: CLOSURE OF CASE filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
July 20, 2017 Filing 5174 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order Relating Action)(Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
July 20, 2017 Filing 5173 OBJECTION BY INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS TO ORDER DATED JULY 6, 2017 (ECF NO. 5172) filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5172 ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 6, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
June 20, 2017 Filing 5171 NOTICE by Crago, Inc., Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs of Withdrawal of Attorney Aaron Sheanin (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 12, 2017 Filing 5170 FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 12, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2017)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5169 ORDER ON ATTORNEYS' FEES, EXPENSES, AND INCENTIVE AWARDS by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #5133 Motion for Attorneys' Fees. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5168 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 8, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 8, 2017 Filing 5167 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Fairness Hearing held on 6/8/2017, Motion Hearing held on 6/8/2017 re #5133 MOTION for Attorney Fees Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Second Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and Incentive Awards filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Total Time in Court: 11 minutes. Court Reporter: Pam Batalo. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/8/2017)
June 7, 2017 Filing 5166 CLERK'S NOTICE UPDATING LOCATION OF HEARINGS as to Fairness Hearing and #5133 MOTION for Attorney Fees. The Motion Hearing and Fairness Hearnig set for 6/8/2017 at 2:00 PM will be held in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
June 7, 2017 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Fairness Hearing set for 6/8/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5165 ORDER of USCA as to #4756 Notice of Appeal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, #4757 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Sean Hull. (tnS) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
May 18, 2017 Filing 5164 REPLY Brief (re #5133 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Second Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and Incentive Awards: Notice of Motion and Motion; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
May 18, 2017 Filing 5163 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement with the Mitsubishi Electric Defendants re #5116 Order filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Alexander Saveri, #2 Declaration of Rachel Christman, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proposed Final Judgment of Dismissal)(Related document(s) #5116 ) (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
May 16, 2017 Filing 5162 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING. The Case Management Conference previously set for May 24, 2017 is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
May 15, 2017 Filing 5161 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by LG Electronics, Inc.. (Brian, Brad) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
May 10, 2017 Filing 5160 USCA Case Number 17-15902 for #5142 Notice of Cross Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, and re #5159 Amended Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (tnS) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
May 2, 2017 Filing 5159 AMENDED NOTICE OF CROSS-APPEAL filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs as to #5122 Order. Appeal Record due by 6/1/2017. (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 5/2/2017) USCA#:17-15902
May 2, 2017 Filing 5158 CLERK'S NOTICE TERMINATING MOTION AS MOOT. The #3473 MOTION to Exclude Late-Disclosed Evidence Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(c)(1) is terminated as moot per the #4596 ORDER DENYING CERTAIN MOTIONS AS MOOT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2017)
April 27, 2017 Filing 5157 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 2/28/17, 10/5/16 before Judge Tigar and Special Master Quinn, (Bogdanov, John) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
April 26, 2017 Filing 5156 NOTICE filed by MT Picture Display Co., LTD, Panasonic Corporation(fka Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. ("MEI"), is a Japanese entity), Panasonic Corporation of North America(("PCNA") is a Delaware corporation) of Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Ryan Goodland (Hemlock, Adam) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
April 26, 2017 Filing 5155 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 2/28/17, 10/3/16, 10/5/16 before Judge Tigar and Special Master Quinn, (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5154 ORDER WITH RESPECT TO ATTORNEYS' FEES re #5133 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Second Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and Incentive Awards: Notice of Motion and Motion filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 26, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
April 24, 2017 Filing 5153 CLERK'S NOTICE TERMINATING ELECTRONIC SERVICE TO SPECIAL MASTER QUINN. The Court grants Special Master Martin Quinn's request to be removed from the notice of electronic filings in this matter. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017).
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5152 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY NNEKA UKPAI PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #5149 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5151 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MICHAEL S. FELDBERG PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #5150 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
April 19, 2017 Filing 5150 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11326853) filed by Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.. (Feldberg, Michael) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
April 19, 2017 Filing 5149 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11326467) filed by Samsung SDI America, Inc.(("Samsung SDI America") is a California corporation), Samsung SDI Co. Ltd. (Ukpai, Nneka) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
April 18, 2017 Filing 5148 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER by the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL No. 1917. (tnS) (Filed on 4/18/2017)
April 18, 2017 Filing 5147 NOTICE filed by Samsung SDI (Malaysia) SDN BHD, Samsung SDI America, Inc.(("Samsung SDI America") is a California corporation), Samsung SDI Brasil LTDA, Samsung SDI Co. Ltd, Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V.(("Samsung SDI Mexico") is a Mexican company), Shenzhen Samsung SDI Co. LTD. & Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. of Withdrawal of Counsel (Scarborough, Michael) (Filed on 4/18/2017)
April 17, 2017 Filing 5146 NOTICE by Technologies Displays Americas LLC to be Removed from Service List (Murphy, William) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
April 13, 2017 Filing 5145 Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation filed by Kevin B. Goldstein. (Goldstein, Kevin) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5144 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MATTHEW R. BOUCHER PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #5143 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2017)
April 12, 2017 Filing 5143 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11309703) filed by Samsung SDI America, Inc.(("Samsung SDI America") is a California corporation), Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.. (Boucher, Matthew) (Filed on 4/12/2017)
April 12, 2017 Filing 5142 NOTICE OF CROSS-APPEAL as to #5122 Order by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Appeal Fee of $505.00, receipt number 0971-11308571 paid). Appeal Record due by 5/12/2017. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Exhibit A, Representation Statement)(Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 4/12/2017) USCA#:17-15902
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5141 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JOHN ROBERTI PRO HAC VICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #5138 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
April 11, 2017 Filing 5140 USCA Case Number 17-15598 for #5132 Notice of Appeal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (tnS) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
April 11, 2017 Filing 5139 USCA Case Number 17-15597 for #5131 Notice of Appeal filed by Brian Barry. (tnS) (Filed on 4/11/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/11/2017: #1 usca case #:17-15597) (tnS, ).
April 11, 2017 Filing 5138 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-11306747) filed by Samsung SDI America, Inc.(("Samsung SDI America") is a California corporation), Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.. (Roberti, John) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5137 ORDER GRANTING MOTION SUGGESTING REMAND by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (4985) Motion to Remand in case 3:07-cv-05944-JST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5136 ORDER DENYING SDI DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. STEPHAN HAGGARD by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying (3172) Motion in Limine in case 3:07-cv-05944-JST. Pursuant to ECF No. #4477 par. 5, if no party files a motion to keep all or part of the underlying order under seal within 10 days of the filing date, the Court will unseal the order. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2017 Filing 5135 Declaration of Rachel Christman re Posting of Fees and Expense Application and Supporting Materials to Class Website re #5116 Order on Motion for Settlement, re #5133 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Second Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and Incentive Awards: Notice of Motion and Motion; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 4/4/2017)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5134 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting (4556) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:07-cv-05944-JST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2017)
March 30, 2017 Filing 5133 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Second Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and Incentive Awards: Notice of Motion and Motion; and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 4/20/2017. Replies due by 5/18/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of R. Alexander Saveri in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Second Application for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses and Incentive Awards, #2 Declaration Freed Kanner London & Millen, LLC Declaration (Douglas A. Millen), #3 Declaration Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP Declaration (Anthony D. Shapiro), #4 Declaration Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, PLLC Declaration (Steven F. Benz), #5 Declaration Bolognese & Associates, LLC Declaration (Anthony J. Bolognese), #6 Declaration Polsinelli PC Declaration (Daniel D. Owen), #7 Declaration Law Offices of Mary Jane Fait PLLC Declaration (Mary Jane Fait), #8 Declaration Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP Declaration (Steven N. Williams), #9 Declaration Hausfeld LLP Declaration (Michael P. Lehmann), #10 Declaration Gustafson Gluek PLLC Declaration (Jason S. Kilene), #11 Declaration Gross & Belsky PC Declaration (Terry Gross), #12 Declaration Berger & Montague, PC Declaration (Ruthanne Gordon), #13 Declaration Vanek, Vickers & Masini PC Declaration (David P. Germaine), #14 Declaration Steyer Lowenthal Boodrookas Alvarez & Smith LLP Declaration (Allan Steyer), #15 Declaration Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, PC Declaration (William G. Caldes), #16 Declaration Heins Mills & Olson, PLC Declaration (Vincent J. Esades), #17 Declaration Pearson, Simon & Warshaw, LLP Declaration (Bruce L. Simon), #18 Declaration Hadsell Stormer & Renick, LLP Declaration (Randy Renick), #19 Declaration Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP Declaration (Eric B. Fastiff), #20 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 3/30/2017)
March 30, 2017 Filing 5132 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Appeal of Order #5122 , (Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 261IVLJ1) re Cooper & Kirkham, P.C. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A)(Cooper, Josef) (Filed on 3/30/2017) - USCA#:17-15598
March 28, 2017 Filing 5131 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Brian Barry. (Appeal Fee of $505.00, receipt number 0971-11266268 paid), and Notice of related case (Barry, Brian) (Filed on 3/28/2017) - USCA#:17-15597
March 22, 2017 Filing 5130 USCA Case Number 17-15496 for #5129 Notice of Appeal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (tnS) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 15, 2017 Filing 5129 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Appeal of Order #5122 , (Appeal Fee of $505.00 receipt number 0971-11234368 paid.) for Appellants Francis O. Scarpulla and the Law Offices of Francis O. Scarpulla (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 3/15/2017) USCA CASE#:17-15496..Modified on 3/22/2017 (tnS).
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5128 ORDER DENYING MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re #3033 Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Mitsubishi Electric US, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Visual Solutions America, Inc, Mitsubishi Electric Corporation. Pursuant to ECF No. #4477 par. 5, if no party files a motion to keep all or part of the underlying order under seal within 10 days of the filing date, the Court will unseal the order. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017) (wsnS, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5127 ORDER of USCA as to re #4752 Notice of Appeal filed by Anthony Gianasca, re #4747 Notice of Appeal filed by Dan L. Williams & Co., re #4749 Notice of Appeal filed by Harry Garavanian, Rockhurst University, Gary Talewsky, re #4756 Notice of Appeal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, re #4745 Notice of Appeal filed by Donnie Clifton, re #4741 Notice of Appeal filed by John Finn, Laura Fortman, re #4757 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Sean Hull, re #4743 Notice of Appeal filed by Gordon Morgan, Sean Hull, re #4753 Notice of Appeal filed by Anthony Gianasca, re #4746 Notice of Appeal filed by Josie Saik, re #4744 Notice of Appeal filed by JEFF CRAIG, Rosemary Ciccone, ESTATE OF LATE R. DERYL EDWARDS JR, INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF CLASS, Anthony Gianasca, Gloria Comeaux, Jeff Speaect, MINA ASHKANNEJHAD, re #4751 Notice of Appeal filed by Eleanor Lewis. (tnS) (Filed on 3/7/2017)
March 6, 2017 Filing 5126 DECLARATION OF RACHEL CHRISTMAN RE DISSEMINATION OF NOTICE TO CLASS MEMBERS RE MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC SETTLEMENT AND APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES AND INCENTIVE AWARDS re #5116 Order on Motion for Settlement filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
March 3, 2017 Filing 5125 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/28/2017 before Hon. Jon S. Tigar by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc., for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Wagner, Scott) (Filed on 3/3/2017)
March 3, 2017 Filing 5124 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/28/2017, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #5123 Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2017. (Related documents(s) #5123 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 3/3/2017)
March 1, 2017 Filing 5123 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/28/2017 before Hon. Jon S. Tigar by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5122 ORDER RE: ALLOCATION OF IPP ATTORNEYS' FEE AWARD re #4976 Special Masters Order, filed by Martin Quinn. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 28, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
February 28, 2017 Filing 5121 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: #4976 Special Master's Report & Recommendation Re Allocation of IPP Class Counsel Attorneys' Fees, Motion Hearing held on 2/28/2017. Total Time in Court: 57 minutes. Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/28/2017)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5120 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re #3039 Koninklijke Philips N.V.'s Motion for Summary Judgment. Pursuant to ECF No. #4477 par. 5, if no party files a motion to keep all or part of the underlying order under seal within 10 days of the filing date, the Court will unseal the order. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 27, 2017. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017) (wsnS, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5119 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re #2998 Defendants Panasonic of North America's and Panasonic Corporation's (f/k/a Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd.) Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Corporation. Pursuant to ECF No. #4477 par. 5, if no party files a motion to keep all or part of the underlying order under seal within 10 days of the filing date, the Court will unseal the order. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017) (wsnS, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2017 Filing 5118 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING DPP PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES. The Pretrial Conference dates of July 5 and 6, 2017, and trial set for July 31, 2017 in the Order at ECF No. #4628 are vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
February 13, 2017 Filing 5117 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING DATES. The motion hearing dates of 4/17/2017 and 4/18/2017 set by the Order at ECF No. #4628 are vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5116 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC DEFENDANTS by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #5099 Motion for Settlement. Final Approval Hearing set for 6/8/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco, before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
February 10, 2017 Filing 5115 Letter from Direct Action Plaintiffs and Defendants Responding to the Court's February 7, 2017 Order (ECF No. 5112) . (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 2/10/2017)
February 9, 2017 Filing 5114 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING re #4976 Special Master's Report & Recommendation. The Court will conduct a hearing on the #4976 Special Master's Report & Recommendation Re Allocation of IPP Class Counsel Attorneys' Fees on 2/28/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Time for argument will be limited to 10 minutes for each objector and 20 minutes for lead counsel. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5113 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #5108 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF THOMSON AND TDA filed by Sharp Electronics Manufacturing Company of America, Inc., Sharp Electronics Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 7, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017) Modified on 2/7/2017 (wsnS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5112 ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 7, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5111 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART HITACHI PARTIES' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part (2976) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:07-cv-05944-JST. Pursuant to ECF No. #4477 par. 5, if no party files a motion to keep all or part of the underlying order under seal within 10 days of the filing date, the Court will unseal the order. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017) Modified on 2/7/2017 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2017 Filing 5110 Letter from Jeffrey L. Kessler to Hon. Jon S. Tigar, on behalf of certain Defendants, re: non-California cases subject to remand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
February 3, 2017 Filing 5109 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Richard Alexander Saveri (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
February 2, 2017 Filing 5108 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF THOMSON AND TDA filed by Sharp Electronics Corporation, Sharp Electronics Manufacturing Company of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Dismissal of Thomson and TDA)(Benson, Craig) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5107 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #5104 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF TOSHIBA filed by Sharp Electronics Manufacturing Company of America, Inc., Sharp Electronics Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 30, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5106 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #5103 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Dismissal With Prejudice as to the Chunghwa Defendants filed by Viewsonic Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 30, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5105 ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT TECHNOLOGIES DISPLAYS AMERICAS LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part (2984) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:07-cv-05944-JST. Pursuant to ECF No. #4477 par. 5, if no party files a motion to keep all or part of the underlying order under seal within 10 days of the filing date, the Court will unseal the order. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2017 Filing 5104 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF TOSHIBA filed by Sharp Electronics Corporation, Sharp Electronics Manufacturing Company of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order re Dismissal of Toshiba) (Benson, Craig) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 27, 2017 Filing 5103 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Dismissal With Prejudice as to the Chunghwa Defendants filed by Viewsonic Corporation. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Murphy, Jerome) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5102 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO PARTIALLY EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORT AND OPINIONS OF JANUSZ A. ORDOVER, PH.D. by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting in part and denying in part #3170 Motion in Limine. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
January 20, 2017 Filing 5101 REPLY (re #5096 Request for Oral Argument); -DECLARATION OF JOHN D. OCONNOR IN REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
January 19, 2017 Filing 5100 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION to re #5096 Request for Oral Argument filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Capurro, Lauren) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
January 19, 2017 Filing 5099 DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR: 1) PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH THE MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC DEFENDANTS; 2) DIRECTING NOTICE TO THE CLASS; AND 3) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/2/2017. Replies due by 2/9/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Alexander Saveri, #2 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
January 19, 2017 Filing 5098 NOTICE by U.S. Department of Justice, Antitrust Division of Removal of Counsel (Maher, Lidia) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
January 19, 2017 Filing 5097 Letter from the Toshiba, LGE, and Thomson Defendants to the Honorable Jon S. Tigar re #5094 . (Lau, Lucius) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
January 17, 2017 Filing 5096 Request for Oral Argument filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
January 17, 2017 Filing 5095 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis Onofrei Scarpulla; -[Notice of Association of Counsel and Notice of Appearance] (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5094 ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 13, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5093 ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REQUIRE LEAD COUNSEL TO DISCLOSE THE NUMBER OF INDIRECT-PURCHASER CLAIMANTS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying #5085 Administrative Motion to Require Lead Counsel to Disclose the Number of Indirect-Purchaser Claimants. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5092 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #5091 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Sharp Plaintiffs' and Toshiba Defendants' Stipulation and Proposed Order to Suspend Pretrial Deadlines filed by Sharp Electronics Manufacturing Company of America, Inc., Sharp Electronics Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 11, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 11, 2017 Filing 5091 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Sharp Plaintiffs' and Toshiba Defendants' Stipulation and Proposed Order to Suspend Pretrial Deadlines filed by Sharp Electronics Corporation, Sharp Electronics Manufacturing Company of America, Inc.. (Benson, Craig) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 5, 2017 Filing 5090 NOTICE by Beijing Matsushita Color Crt Company, LTD. (Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel) (Minerva, Craig) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
January 4, 2017 Filing 5089 NOTICE of Change of Address by Terry Gross (Gross, Terry) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
January 3, 2017 Filing 5088 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #5085 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Require Lead Counsel to Disclos the Number of Indirect-Purchaser Claimants ) LEAD COUNSELS OPPOSITION TO ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REQUIRE LEAD COUNSEL TO DISCLOSE NUMBER OF INDIRECT PURCHASER CLAIMANTS; MOTION TO STRIKE SAME filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5087 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #5086 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal as to Defendant LG Electronics, Inc. filed by Sears, Roebuck and Co., KMart Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 30, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2016)
December 29, 2016 Filing 5086 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal as to Defendant LG Electronics, Inc. filed by KMart Corporation, Sears, Roebuck and Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blechman, William) (Filed on 12/29/2016)
December 28, 2016 Filing 5085 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Require Lead Counsel to Disclos the Number of Indirect-Purchaser Claimants filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 12/28/2016)
December 22, 2016 Filing 5084 NOTICE by Sharp Electronics Corporation, Sharp Electronics Manufacturing Company of America, Inc. NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESSES (Taylor, Stephen) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
December 22, 2016 Filing 5083 Letter from Philip J. Iovieno Regarding Settlement Between Certain DAPs and LG . (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
December 22, 2016 Filing 5082 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 1/20/2016 before Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar, (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5081 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #5080 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Technicolor and TDA Defendants filed by Sears, Roebuck and Co., KMart Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 22, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
December 21, 2016 Filing 5080 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Technicolor and TDA Defendants filed by KMart Corporation, Sears, Roebuck and Co.. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Blechman, William) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5079 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying #5063 Motion to Unseal Document. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5078 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #5063 MOTION to Unseal Document filed by State of Illinois. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 19, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 16, 2016 Filing 5077 REPLY (re #5063 MOTION to Unseal Document) filed by State of Illinois. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order (revised), #(2) Certificate/Proof of Service) (Brooker, Chadwick) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5076 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #5075 Sharp Plaintiffs and Thomson and TDA Defendants Stipulation and [Proposed]Order to Suspend Pretrial Deadlines filed by Thomson Consumer Electronics, Inc., Thomas S.A. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 15, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
December 14, 2016 Filing 5075 Sharp Plaintiffs and Thomson and TDA Defendants Stipulation and [Proposed]Order to Suspend Pretrial Deadlines filed by Thomas S.A., Thomson Consumer Electronics, Inc.. (Roberts, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
December 12, 2016 Filing 5074 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5063 MOTION to Unseal Document ) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co Ltd. (Feder, Kevin) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
December 12, 2016 Filing 5073 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5063 MOTION to Unseal Document ) filed by Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A (Decl. of D. Bernstein)) (Bernstein, Debra) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
December 12, 2016 Filing 5072 Statement of Non-Opposition to re #5063 MOTION to Unseal Document by State of Illinois filed by Sharp Electronics Corporation, Sharp Electronics Manufacturing Company of America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #5063 ) (Benson, Craig) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
December 12, 2016 Filing 5071 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5063 MOTION to Unseal Document ); -Certain Defendants' Response to State of Illinois's Motion to File Documents on the Public Record, filed byMT Picture Display Co., LTD, Panasonic Corporation(fka Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. ("MEI"), is a Japanese entity), Panasonic Corporation of North America(("PCNA") is a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Eva W. Cole in Support, #(2) Exhibit A, #(3) Exhibit B, #(4) Exhibit C) (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
December 12, 2016 Filing 5070 DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO re #5063 THE STATE OF ILLINOIS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS ON THE PUBLIC RECORD filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #5063 ) (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
December 12, 2016 Filing 5069 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5063 MOTION to Unseal Document ) filed by LG Electronics, Inc.. (Estrada, Esteban) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5068 ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO FILE REPLY by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying #5066 Motion for Leave to File. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5067 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #4985 MOTION to Remand filed by Electrograph Systems, Inc, P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Interbond Corporation of America, Electrograph Technologies Corp., Office Depot, Inc., Compucom Systems Inc, Schultze Agency Services, LLC, ABC Appliance, Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 6, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
December 6, 2016 Filing 5066 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief filed by Sean Hull. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Hull Reply)(Hanigan, Timothy) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5065 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #5064 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 28, 2016 Filing 5064 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by State of Illinois. (Brooker, Chadwick) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 28, 2016 Filing 5063 MOTION to Unseal Document; -State of Illinois' Motion to File Documents on the Public Record filed by State of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Proposed Order, #11 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brooker, Chadwick) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 28, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5063 MOTION to Unseal Document (Motion to File Documents on the Public Record). Responses due by 12/12/2016. Replies due by 12/19/2016. Motion Hearing set for 1/5/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 25, 2016 Filing 5062 Response To Lead Counsel's Partial Objection To Special Master's Corrected Report And Recommendation Of Allocation Of IPP Class Counsel Attorneys' Fees re #5026 Objection filed by INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF CLASS. (Moore, Theresa) (Filed on 11/25/2016)
November 25, 2016 Filing 5061 Cooper & Kirkham, P.C.'s Response to Lead Counsel's Partial Objection to Special Master's Corrected Report and Recommendation re Allocation of IPP Class Counsel Attorneys' Fees re #5026 Objection filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Cooper, Josef) (Filed on 11/25/2016)
November 25, 2016 Filing 5060 Lead Counsel's Response to Moore's Objection to Special Master's Report and Recommendation re Allocation of IPP Class Counsel Attorneys' Fees re #5025 Objection filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Capurro, Lauren) (Filed on 11/25/2016)
November 25, 2016 Filing 5059 Lead Counsel's Response to Cooper & Kirkham P.C.'s Objection to Special Master's Report and Recommendation re Allocation of IPP Class Counsel Attorneys' Fees re #5024 Objection filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Capurro, Lauren) (Filed on 11/25/2016)
November 25, 2016 Filing 5058 Lead Counsel's Response to Scarpulla's Objection to Special Master's Report and Recommendation re Allocation of IPP Class Counsel Attorneys' Fees re #5023 Objection filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Jerome Fishkin, #(2) Exhibit A, #(3) Exhibit B)(Capurro, Lauren) (Filed on 11/25/2016)
November 25, 2016 Filing 5057 /Lead Counsel's Response to Filing by Lingel Winters re Special Master's Report and Recommendation re Allocation of IPP Class Counsel Attorneys' Fees re #5041 Declaration filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Mario N. Alioto, #2 Exhibit 1)(Capurro, Lauren) (Filed on 11/25/2016)
November 25, 2016 Filing 5056 Response of Straus & Boies, LLP, Kirby McInerney LLP, Milberg LLP, and Green & Noblin, P.C. to The Law Offices of Francis O. Scarpullas Objections to Special Masters Report & Recommendation Re Allocation of IPP Class Counsel Attorneys' Fees filed by INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF CLASS. (Battin, Timothy) (Filed on 11/25/2016)
November 25, 2016 Filing 5055 REPLY OF LAW OFFICES OF FRANCIS O. SCARPULLA TO LEAD COUNSELS PARTIAL OBJECTION TO SPECIAL MASTERS CORRECTED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE ALLOCATION OF IPP CLASS COUNSEL ATTORNEYS FEES filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 11/25/2016)
November 25, 2016 Filing 5054 Lead Counsel's Response to Objection of Law Office of Brian Barry to Special Master's Report and Recommendation re Allocation of Attorneys' Fees re #5013 Objection filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Capurro, Lauren) (Filed on 11/25/2016)
November 23, 2016 Filing 5053 ZELLE LLP'S RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS OF LAW OFFICES OF FRANCIS O. SCARPULLA TO SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE ALLOCATION OF IPP CLASS COUNSEL ATTORNEYS' FEES re #5023 Objection filed by Kerry Lee Hall. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
November 22, 2016 Filing 5052 RESPONSE to re #5021 Objection to Corrected Special Master's Report and Recommendation Re Allocation of IPP Class Counsel Attorneys' Fees filed by INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF CLASS. (Birkhaeuser, Daniel) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 18, 2016 Filing 5051 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING TRIAL DATES AND SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONERENCE RE #5050 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Suspend Pretrial Deadlines. The Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2016, 12/13/2016 and the Jury Trial set to begin on 01/09/2017 are VACATED. A Further Case Management Conference is set for 5/24/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. An updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due by 5/15/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5050 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #5047 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Suspend Pretrial Deadlines filed by Sears, Roebuck and Co., KMart Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 17, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
November 17, 2016 Filing 5049 USCA Case Number 16-16982 for #4973 Notice of Appeal filed by Marta Cooperative of America, Inc.. (tnS) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
November 17, 2016 Filing 5048 Declaration of Richard Zitrin in Support of #5023 Objection, filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF JACK I. GARVEY IN SUPPORT OF LAW OFFICES OF FRANCIS O. SCARPULLAS OBJECTION TO SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT & RECOMMENDATION RE ALLOCATION OF IPP CLASS COUNSEL ATTORNEYS FEES, #2 Exhibit 8 to DECLARATION OF FRANCIS O. SCARPULLA IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTION TO SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE ALLOCATION OF IPP CLASS COUNSEL ATTORNEYS FEES)(Related document(s) #5023 ) (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
November 17, 2016 Filing 5047 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Suspend Pretrial Deadlines filed by KMart Corporation, Sears, Roebuck and Co.. (Blechman, William) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5046 ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying #5022 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
November 17, 2016 Filing 5045 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING. The hearing previously scheduled for 11/17/2016 at 2:00 PM is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
November 17, 2016 Filing 5044 NOTICE filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs of NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
November 17, 2016 Filing 5043 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 14, 2016, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, telephone number joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com 510-367-3043. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2017. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
November 16, 2016 Filing 5042 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by Sean Hull as to #5040 Order - Exhibit 1, Representation Statement. Appeal Record due by 12/16/2016. (Hanigan, Timothy) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 16, 2016 Filing 5041 Declaration of LINGEL H. WINTERS filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Winters, Lingel) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5040 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL re #4953 INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF FINAL APPROVAL OF PLAN OF DISTRIBUTION OF CHUNGHWA SETTLEMENT FUND filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 16, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5039 ORDER CONTINUING SUBPOENA by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #4958 Motion to Continue. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 16, 2016 Filing 5038 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF PLAN OF DISTRIBUTION OF CHUNGHWA SETTLEMENT FUND re #4953 Brief filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 16, 2016 Filing 5037 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/08/2016, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number (41) 722-7045; leomank@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #5007 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 12/7/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2017. (Related documents(s) #5007 ) (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 15, 2016 Filing 5036 Declaration of Mario N. Alioto in Support of #5022 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #5022 ) (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5035 ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE RE PASS-ON ISSUES AND BARGAINING POWER by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting (3558) Motion in Limine in case 3:07-cv-05944-JST; denying (3597) Motion in Limine in case 3:07-cv-05944-JST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5034 ORDER RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying (3558) Motion in Limine in case 3:07-cv-05944-JST; denying (3583) Motion in Limine in case 3:07-cv-05944-JST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 15, 2016 Filing 5033 NOTICE filed by YRC, INC. of Withdrawal of Notice of Lis Pendens Against Electrograph Systems, Inc. & Electrograph Technologies re #2644 Notice of Lis Pendens (Judd, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 15, 2016 Filing 5032 NOTICE filed by YRC, INC. of Termination of Lien & Withdrawal of Notice of Lien Against Electrograph Systems, Inc. re #2647 Notice (Judd, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 15, 2016 Filing 5031 NOTICE filed by YRC, INC. of Termination of Lien & Withdrawal of Notice of Lien Against Electrograph Technologies re #2646 Notice (Judd, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5030 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #5000 Administrative Motion Relief Concerning LGE's Failure to Adhere to the Order Regarding Pretrial Disclosures. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5029 ORDER RESOLVING JAPANESE TRANSLATION OBJECTIONS - TRANCHE 2 for #4987 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master re ORDER RESOLVING JAPANESE TRANSLATION OBJECTIONS - TRANCHE 2. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 14, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
November 14, 2016 Filing 5028 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #5000 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Relief Concerning LGE's Failure to Adhere to the Order Regarding Pretrial Disclosures (ECF 4781)) filed by LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Hartge, Cathleen) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
November 14, 2016 Filing 5027 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Fairness Hearing held on 11/14/2016. FTR Time 9:35 - 9:40 a.m. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/14/2016) Modified on 11/16/2016: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
November 11, 2016 Filing 5026 /Lead Counsel's Partial Objection to re #4976 Special Master's Corrected Report and Recommendation re Allocation of IPP Class Counsel Attorneys' Fees filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Mario N. Alioto, #(2) Exhibit 1 (Part 1), #(3) Exhibit 1 (Part 2))(Capurro, Lauren) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
November 11, 2016 Filing 5025 Theresa D. Moore's Objection To re #4976 Corrected Special Master's Report and Recommendation Re Allocation of IPP Class Counsel Attorneys Fees filed by INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF CLASS. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Theresa D. Moore, #(2) Exhibit A, #(3) Exhibit B)(Moore, Theresa) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
November 11, 2016 Filing 5024 Cooper & Kirkham, P.C.'s Objection to re #4976 Corrected Special Master's Report & Recommendation re Allocation of IPP Class Counsel Attorneys' Fees filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Cooper, Josef) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
November 11, 2016 Filing 5023 OBJECTIONS to Special Master's Report & Recommendation re Allocation of IPP Class Counsel Attorneys' Fees filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF FRANCIS O. SCARPULLA IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTION TO SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE ALLOCATION OF IPP CLASS COUNSEL ATTORNEYS FEES, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 9)(Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
November 11, 2016 Filing 5022 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF FRANCIS O. SCARPULLA IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5, #2 Proposed Order GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Declaration REDACTED DECLARATION OF RICHARD ZITRIN IN SUPPORT OF LAW OFFICES OF FRANCIS O. SCARPULLAS OBJECTION TO SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT & RECOMMENDATION RE ALLOCATION OF IPP CLASS COUNSEL ATTORNEYS FEES, #5 Declaration REDACTED DECLARATION OF JACK I. GARVEY IN SUPPORT OF LAW OFFICES OF FRANCIS O. SCARPULLAS OBJECTION TO SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT & RECOMMENDATION RE ALLOCATION OF IPP CLASS COUNSEL ATTORNEYS FEES, #6 Exhibit REDACTED EXHIBIT 8 TO DECLARATION OF FRANCIS O. SCARPULLA IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTION TO SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE ALLOCATION OF IPP CLASS COUNSEL ATTORNEYS FEES, #7 Declaration UNREDACTED DECLARATION OF RICHARD ZITRIN IN SUPPORT OF LAW OFFICES OF FRANCIS O. SCARPULLAS OBJECTION TO SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT & RECOMMENDATION RE ALLOCATION OF IPP CLASS COUNSEL ATTORNEYS FEES, #8 Declaration UNREDACTED DECLARATION OF JACK I. GARVEY IN SUPPORT OF LAW OFFICES OF FRANCIS O. SCARPULLAS OBJECTION TO SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT & RECOMMENDATION RE ALLOCATION OF IPP CLASS COUNSEL ATTORNEYS FEES, #9 Exhibit UNREDACTED EXHIBIT 8 TO DECLARATION OF FRANCIS O. SCARPULLA IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTION TO SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE ALLOCATION OF IPP CLASS COUNSEL ATTORNEYS FEES)(Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
November 11, 2016 Filing 5021 OBJECTIONS to re #4976 Special Masters Order, by Sean Hull. (Hanigan, Timothy) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
November 11, 2016 Filing 5020 NOTICE filed by KMart Corporation, Sears, Roebuck and Co. of Exhibit List Pursuant to Court Order to Show Cause Adopting Procedures to Resolve Protective Order Issues Pretrial re #5012 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Exhibit List)(Blechman, William) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
November 11, 2016 Filing 5019 NOTICE filed by KMart Corporation, Sears, Roebuck and Co. of Witness List Pursuant to Court Order to Show Cause Adopting Procedures to Resolve Protective Order Issues Pretrial re #5012 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11. (Blechman, William) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
November 11, 2016 Filing 5018 NOTICE by KMart Corporation, Sears, Roebuck and Co. of Exhibit List Pursuant to Court Order to Show Cause Adopting Procedures to Resolve Protective Order Issues Pretrial re #5012 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Exhibit List) (Blechman, William) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
November 11, 2016 Filing 5017 NOTICE filed by LG Electronics, Inc. Regarding Pretrial Disclosures of Defendant LG Electronics, Inc. Pursuant to re #5012 Order to Show Cause re #5012 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Exhibit B, #(3) Exhibit C, #(4) Exhibit D)(Kim, Miriam) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
November 10, 2016 Filing 5016 NOTICE of Change In Counsel filed by Adam C. Hemlock - (Withdrawal of Attorneys Joseph Wetzel, Diane Arlen Aguilar and Marjan Hajibandeh) (Hemlock, Adam) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
November 10, 2016 Filing 5015 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/08/2016 before Hon. Jon S. Tigar by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., for Court Reporter Leo Mankiewicz. (Hartge, Cathleen) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
November 10, 2016 Filing 5013 OBJECTIONS to Special Masters' Report and Recommendation Re Allocation of IPP attorneys' fees filed by brian barry. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit)(Barry, Brian) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5014 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #4978 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master re ORDER RESOLVING CHINESE TRANSLATION OBJECTIONS - TRANCHE 2. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 9, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5012 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ADOPTING PROCEDURE TO RESOLVE PROTECTIVE ORDER ISSUES PRETRIAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting (5002) Administrative Motion For Adoption Of Procedure To Resolve Protective Order Issues Pretrial in case 3:07-cv-05944-JST. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
November 9, 2016 Filing 5011 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #4985 MOTION Suggesting Remand) filed by MT Picture Display Co., LTD, Panasonic Corporation(fka Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. ("MEI"), is a Japanese entity), Panasonic Corporation of North America(("PCNA") is a Delaware corporation). (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
November 9, 2016 Filing 5010 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2016-11-08 before Hon. Jon S. Tigar by Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc(("TAEP") is headquartered in Irvine, California), Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba America, Inc, Toshiba Corporation, for Court Reporter Leo Mankiewicz. (Sharp, Samuel) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
November 9, 2016 Filing 5009 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11-08-2016 before Hon. Jon S. Tigar by KMart Corporation, Sears, Roebuck and Co., for Court Reporter Leo Mankiewicz. (Blechman, William) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
November 9, 2016 Filing 5008 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/08/2016 before Hon. Jon S. Tigar by ABC Appliance, Inc., Compucom Systems Inc, Electrograph Systems, Inc, Electrograph Technologies Corp., Interbond Corporation of America, Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC, for Court Reporter Leo Mankiewicz. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
November 8, 2016 Filing 5007 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/8/2016 before Hon. Jon S. Tigar by Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Sharp Electronics Manufacturing Company of America, Inc., for Court Reporter Leo Mankiewicz. (Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5006 ORDER RE JURY QUESTIONNAIRE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 7, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
November 8, 2016 Filing 5004 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/8/2016. Total Time in Court: 56 minutes. Court Reporter: Leo Mankiewicz. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/8/2016)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5005 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #4939 MOTION to Continue Trial Subpoena and Issue Adverse Jury Instruction in the Event of a Failure to Appear at Trial filed by Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc, Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America, Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 7, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5003 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #4681 Administrative Motion to Terminate Pillsbury's Obligation to Forward Pleadings to Its Former Clients. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 5002 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Adoption Of Procedure To Resolve Protective Order Issues Pretrial filed by LG Electronics, Inc.. Responses due by 11/14/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit /Stipulation Regarding Motion For Adoption Of Procedure To Resolve Protective Order Issues Pretrial, #2 Proposed Order To Show Cause Adopting Procedure To Resolve Protective Order Issues Pretrial)(Hartge, Cathleen) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5001 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #4995 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Admissibility and Authentication of Trial Exhibits and Procedure for Playing Translated Deposition Testimony filed by Sears, Roebuck and Co., KMart Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 7, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 5000 MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE Relief Concerning LGE's Failure to Adhere to the Order Regarding Pretrial Disclosures (ECF 4781) filed by KMart Corporation, Sears, Roebuck and Co.. Responses due by 11/14/2016. (Blechman, William) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4999 ORDER DENYING DOUGLAS W. ST. JOHN'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND EXPENSES by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying #4779 Motion for Attorney Fees. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4998 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING NOVEMBER 8 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCEThe Court advises the parties that it will not entertain oral argument concerning the pending motions in limine at the Case Management Conference scheduled for November 8, 2016. See ECF No. 4992 at 8-9. (Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar) (Filed on 11/6/2016) This is a text-only order; there is no document associated with this entry
November 4, 2016 Filing 4997 Letter from Attorney Dianne Sweeney of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman to the Honorable Judge Jon S. Tigar. (Sweeney, Dianne) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
November 4, 2016 Filing 4996 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #4991 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re #4989 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit A to Sears' and Kmart's Administrative Motion to Establish a Procedure to Streamline Trial and Minimize Unfounded Evidentiary Objections - (Reda) filed by LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Hartge, Cathleen) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
November 4, 2016 Filing 4995 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Admissibility and Authentication of Trial Exhibits and Procedure for Playing Translated Deposition Testimony filed by KMart Corporation, Sears, Roebuck and Co.. (Blechman, William) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4994 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO INTERVENE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #4941 Motion to Intervene. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
November 2, 2016 Filing 4993 NOTICE of Change of Address by William Francis Murphy (Murphy, William) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 4992 JOINT STATUS REPORT filed by KMart Corporation, Sears, Roebuck and Co.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Updated MSJ Chart, #(2) Exhibit Daubert and In Limine Chart)(Blechman, William) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
October 31, 2016 Filing 4991 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Establish a Procedure to Streamline Trial and Minimize Unfounded Evidentiary Objections re #4989 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit A to Sears' and Kmart's Administrative Motion to Establish a Procedure to Streamline Trial and Minimize Unfounded Evidentiary Objections - (Redacted Public Version) filed by KMart Corporation, Sears, Roebuck and Co.. Responses due by 11/4/2016. (Blechman, William) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 4990 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #4985 MOTION to Remand. This motion has been noticed for hearing on a date closed to further settings. The Motion Hearing previously noticed for 12/1/2016 is continued to 12/15/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. All briefing deadlines are unchanged. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 27, 2016 Filing 4989 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit A to Sears' and Kmart's Administrative Motion to Establish a Procedure to Streamline Trial and Minimize Unfounded Evidentiary Objections filed by KMart Corporation, Sears, Roebuck and Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Redacted Version, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Version)(Blechman, William) (Filed on 10/27/2016)
October 27, 2016 Filing 4988 REPLY (re #4939 MOTION to Continue Trial Subpoena and Issue Adverse Jury Instruction in the Event of a Failure to Appear at Trial, re #4958 MOTION to Continue Trial Subpoena and Issue Adverse Jury Instruction in the Event of a Failure to Appear at Trial, Filed Pursuant to #4956 ); -The Toshiba Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Continue Trial Subpoena filed by Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.(("TAIP") is headquartered in Irvine, California), Toshiba America, Inc(("Toshiba America") is a Delaware corporation), Toshiba Corporation(("TC") is a Japanese company). (Lau, Lucius) (Filed on 10/27/2016)
October 27, 2016 Filing 4987 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master re ORDER RESOLVING JAPANESE TRANSLATION OBJECTIONS - TRANCHE 2. Objections due by 11/10/2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/27/2016: #1 Exhibit A - Under Seal) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2016 Filing 4986 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING PAGE LIMITS re #4976 CORRECTED Special Master's Report & Recommendation Re Allocation of IPP Class Counsel Attorneys' Fees. The Court sets the following page limits: 12 for oppositions; 12 for response briefs. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2016)
October 26, 2016 Filing 4985 MOTION Suggesting Remand filed by ABC Appliance, Inc., Compucom Systems Inc, Electrograph Systems, Inc, Electrograph Technologies Corp., Interbond Corporation of America, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 11/9/2016. Replies due by 11/16/2016. (Attachments: #(1)[Proposed] Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/26/2016)
October 26, 2016 Filing 4984 RESPONSE to re #4975 Letter; -Opposition of Theresa D. Moore To Lead Counsel's Motion by Letter for a Five Page Limit on Objections to the Special Master's Report and Recommendation filed by INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF CLASS. (Moore, Theresa) (Filed on 10/26/2016)
October 26, 2016 Filing 4983 RESPONSE to re #4975 Letter; -[OPPOSITION OF LAW OFFICES OF FRANCIS O. SCARPULLA TO ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION RE PAGE LIMITS ON OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT & RECOMMENDATION RE ALLOCATION OF IPP CLASS COUNSEL ATTORNEYS' FEES] filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 10/26/2016)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4982 ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE REGARDING THE ALLEGED CONSPIRACY'S OPERATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Motion for Pretrial Proffer and Ruling on Admissibility of Alleged Co-Conspirator Statements; DENYING Motion to Exclude Plaintiffs' Price-Ladder Theory of Recovery; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Motion to Exclude Argument or Evidence Regarding Purportedly Pro-Competitive Justifications for Defendants' Agreements Regarding CRT Price, Supply, Production, or Customers; DENYING Motion to Exclude References to Documents or Behavior Not In Evidence; DENYING; Mitsubishi Electric's Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Any Reference at Trial to Any Party's Participation in the EIAJ and EIAJ Activities; GRANTING Mitsubishi Electric's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude the SDI Interrogatory Response. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2016)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4981 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #4947 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2016)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4980 ORDER DENYING MOTION IN LIMINE RE TESTIMONY OF KENNETH ELZINGA by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying #3174 Motion in Limine. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2016)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4979 ORDER RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE RE PLAINTIFFS' OTHER ACTIONS AND DAMAGES by Judge Jon S. Tigar GRANTING Defendants' MIL No. 7: Motion to Exclude Dr. Frankels Inflation Adjusted Damages; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DAPs MIL No. 1: Motion To Exclude Evidence Or Argument Regarding Plaintiffs' Competitive Intelligence Practices; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DAPs' MIL No. 5: Motion To Exclude Evidence Or Argument Regarding Plaintiffs' Ability To Seek Treble Damages and Attorneys' Fees And Costs; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DAPs MIL No. 6: Motion to Exclude Evidence Or Argument Regarding Other Actions And Settlements In This MDL; GRANTING DAPs MIL No. 6: Motion to Exclude Evidence Or Argument Regarding Plaintiffs' Alleged Failure to Mitigate Their Damages. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2016)
October 25, 2016 Filing 4978 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master re ORDER RESOLVING CHINESE TRANSLATION OBJECTIONS - TRANCHE 2. Objections due by 11/8/2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2016: #1 Exhibit A - Under Seal) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4977 ORDER RE OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTER'S PROPOSED FEE ALLOCATIONThe Court is in receipt of the request of Lead Counsel for the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Mario Alioto, to limit objections to the Special Master's Proposed Fee Allocation to five pages each. ECF No. 4975. Any party opposing the request must file a written response of not longer than two pages by Wednesday, October 26, 2016. (Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar) (Filed on 10/24/2016) This is a text-only order; there is no document associated with this entry.
October 24, 2016 Filing 4976 CORRECTED Special Master's Report & Recommendation Re Allocation of IPP Class Counsel Attorneys' Fees (Corrected Only to Add Exhibit A). (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Proposed Allocation of IPP Attorneys Fees)(Quinn, Martin) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
October 21, 2016 Filing 4975 Letter from Mario N. Alioto to the Honorable Jon S. Tigar . (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
October 21, 2016 Filing 4974 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING OBJECTIONS TO #4971 Special Masters Order Report & Recommendation Re Allocation of IPP Class Counsel Attorneys' Fees. Objections to the Report and Recommendations are due 11/11/2016. Replies to any objections are due 11/25/2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
October 21, 2016 Filing 4973 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Marta Cooperative of America, Inc.. Appeal of Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) #4927 ; (Appeal Fee of $505.00, receipt number 0971-10868459 paid.) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/21/2016) - USCA Case Number 16-16982..Modified on 11/17/2016 (tnS).
October 20, 2016 Filing 4972 RESPONSE to (re #4939 MOTION to Continue Trial Subpoena and Issue Adverse Jury Instruction in the Event of a Failure to Appear at Trial); -Sharp Electronics Corporation and Sharp Electronics Manufacturing Company of America, Inc.'s Opposition To The Toshiba Defendants Motion To Continue Trial Subpoena filed by Sharp Electronics Corporation, Sharp Electronics Manufacturing Company of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Craig A. Benson, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Benson, Craig) (Filed on 10/20/2016)
October 20, 2016 Filing 4971 Special Master's Report & Recommendation Re Allocation of IPP Class Counsel Attorneys' Fees. (Quinn, Martin) (Filed on 10/20/2016)
October 18, 2016 Filing 4970 Reply Brief in support of re #4779 Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Winters, Lingel) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4969 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #4907 Report and Recommendations - Special Master. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 17, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 17, 2016 Filing 4968 NOTICE filed by LG Electronics, Inc. of Joint Suggestion for Prioritization of Daubert Motions and Motions In Limine (Estrada, Esteban) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 17, 2016 Filing 4967 Letter from Andrea Valdez to Honorable Jon S. Tigar. (Valdez, Andrea) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 4966 Amended MOTION for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Special Master re #4802 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master - This is a correction of #4877 being refiled per the order at #4935 filed by Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Visual Solutions America, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/11/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Terrence J. Truax, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26)(Truax, Terrence) (Filed on 10/14/2016) Modified on 10/17/2016 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2016 Filing 4965 Letter from Mario N. Alioto to Honorable Jon S. Tigar . (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4964 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #4961 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Date to Submit Expert Reports and Date for DPPs to Respond to Mitsubishi Electric Defendants' Motion For Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Special Master filed by Mitsubishi Electric US, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Visual Solutions America, Inc, Mitsubishi Electric Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 14, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4963 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #4912 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4962 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #4933 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
October 13, 2016 Filing 4961 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Date to Submit Expert Reports and Date for DPPs to Respond to Mitsubishi Electric Defendants' Motion For Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Special Master filed by Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Visual Solutions America, Inc. (Brody, Michael) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
October 12, 2016 Filing 4960 RESPONSE to re #4944 Special Masters Order; -DECLARATION OF JOSEPH M. PATANE IN RESPONSE TO SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER NO. 6 RE FEE ALLOCATION filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 10/12/2016)
October 12, 2016 Filing 4959 Joinder to re #4939 MOTION to Continue Trial Subpoena and Issue Adverse Jury Instruction in the Event of a Failure to Appear at Trial filed by Thomas S.A., Thomson Consumer Electronics, Inc.. (Osborn, Kathy) (Filed on 10/12/2016)
October 12, 2016 Filing 4958 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Continue Trial Subpoena and Issue Adverse Jury Instruction in the Event of a Failure to Appear at Trial, Filed Pursuant to #4956 filed by Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.(("TAIP") is headquartered in Irvine, California), Toshiba America, Inc(("Toshiba America") is a Delaware corporation), Toshiba Corporation(("TC") is a Japanese company). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lucius B. Lau in Support of The Toshiba Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Continue Trial Subpoena and Issue Adverse Jury Instruction in the Event of a Failure to Appear at Trial, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Proposed Order)(Lau, Lucius) (Filed on 10/12/2016)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4957 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #4942 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4956 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying #4938 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4955 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #4779 MOTION for Attorneys' Fees filed by Douglas W. St. John. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 11, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
October 11, 2016 Filing 4954 Declaration of John D. Bogdanov in Support of #4933 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Cooper & Kirkham, P.C. filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #4933 ) (Bogdanov, John) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
October 11, 2016 Filing 4953 INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF FINAL APPROVAL OF PLAN OF DISTRIBUTION OF CHUNGHWA SETTLEMENT FUND filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF JOSEPH M. FISHER REPORTING ON CHUNGHWA NOTICE, #2 Exhibit EXHIBITS A-R, #3 Declaration DECLARATION OF JOSEPH M. PATANE IN SUPPORT OF FINAL APPROVAL OF PLAN OF DISTRIBUTION OF CHUNGHWA SETTLEMENT FUND)(Related document(s) #4712 ) (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
October 11, 2016 Filing 4952 Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of #4933 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Cooper & Kirkham, P.C. filed byKerry Lee Hall. (Related document(s) #4933 ) (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
October 11, 2016 Filing 4951 Declaration of Mario N. Alioto in Support of #4933 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Cooper & Kirkham, P.C. filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #4933 ) (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4950 ORDER re #4939 MOTION to Continue Trial Subpoena and Issue Adverse Jury Instruction in the Event of a Failure to Appear at Trial filed by Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc, Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America, Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 11, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
October 11, 2016 Filing 4949 Special Masters Order on Motion by Cooper & Kirkham to Strike Declaration of Mario N. Alioto (Dkt. 4874) (No hrg.). (Quinn, Martin) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4948 RESPONSE to re #4790 Response; -Zelle LLP's Response to Special Master's Request for Documents filed by Kerry Lee Hall. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit 1)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2016)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4947 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Kerry Lee Hall. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1)(Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 10/10/2016)
October 10, 2016 Filing 4946 REDACTION to #4917 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Redacted Version of Document Filed Under Seal Pursuant to Dkt. No. 4917 - Second Declaration of Josef D. Cooper in Support of Cooper & Kirkham, P.C.'s Objection to Lead Counsel's Revised Proposed Allocation of Aggregate Fee Award to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Counsel filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Cooper, Josef) (Filed on 10/10/2016)
October 7, 2016 Filing 4945 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/29/2016 before Hon. Jon S. Tigar by MT Picture Display Co., LTD, Panasonic Corporation(fka Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. ("MEI"), is a Japanese entity), Panasonic Corporation of North America(("PCNA") is a Delaware corporation), for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Cole, Eva) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
October 7, 2016 Filing 4944 Special Master's Order No.6 Re Allocation of Fees. (Quinn, Martin) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4943 ORDER RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE RELEVANT ONLY TO THE SHARP TRIAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying #3574 Motion in Limine; denying #3577 Motion in Limine; denying #3591 Motion in Limine; denying #3593 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part #3599 Motion in Limine. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
October 7, 2016 Filing 4942 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by State of Illinois. (Brooker, Chadwick) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
October 7, 2016 Filing 4941 MOTION to Intervene for Limited Purposes filed by State of Illinois. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/21/2016. Replies due by 10/28/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chadwick O. Brooker ISO Motion to Intervene, #2 Exhibit A--Motion to Clarify, #3 Exhibit B--Motion to File on Public Record, #4 Exhibit C--IL's Am. Complaint, #5 Exhibit D--LGE's 8th Aff. Defense, #6 Exhibit E--LGE USA's 10th Aff. Defense, #7 Proposed Order, #8 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Brooker, Chadwick) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
October 7, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4939 MOTION to Continue Trial Subpoena and Issue Adverse Jury Instruction in the Event of a Failure to Appear at Trial. Responses due by 10/20/2016. Replies due by 10/27/2016. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
October 6, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4939 MOTION to Continue Trial Subpoena and Issue Adverse Jury Instruction in the Event of a Failure to Appear at Trial. Responses due by 10/20/2016. Replies due by 10/27/2016. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
October 6, 2016 Filing 4940 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.(("TAIP") is headquartered in Irvine, California), Toshiba America, Inc(("Toshiba America") is a Delaware corporation), Toshiba Corporation(("TC") is a Japanese company) re #4938 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Lau, Lucius) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
October 6, 2016 Filing 4939 MOTION to Continue Trial Subpoena and Issue Adverse Jury Instruction in the Event of a Failure to Appear at Trial filed by Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.(("TAIP") is headquartered in Irvine, California), Toshiba America, Inc(("Toshiba America") is a Delaware corporation), Toshiba Corporation(("TC") is a Japanese company). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lucius B. Lau in Support of The Toshiba Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Continue Trial Subpoena and Issue Adverse Jury Instruction in the Event of a Failure to Appear at Trial, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B [REDACTED], #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F [REDACTED], #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Proposed Order)(Lau, Lucius) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
October 6, 2016 Filing 4938 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.(("TAIP") is headquartered in Irvine, California), Toshiba America, Inc(("Toshiba America") is a Delaware corporation), Toshiba Corporation(("TC") is a Japanese company). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Frutig in Support of Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 The Toshiba Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Continue Trial Subpoena and Issue Adverse Jury Instruction in the Event of a Failure to Appear at Trial [REDACTED], #4 The Toshiba Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Continue Trial Subpoena and Issue Adverse Jury Instruction in the Event of a Failure to Appear at Trial [UNREDACTED], #5 Declaration of Lucius B. Lau in Support of The Toshiba Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Continue Trial Subpoena and Issue Adverse Jury Instruction in the Event of a Failure to Appear at Trial, #6 Proposed Order Granting The Toshiba Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Continue Trial Subpoena and Issue Adverse Jury Instruction in the Event of a Failure to Appear at Trial, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit B [REDACTED], #9 Exhibit B [UNREDACTED], #10 Exhibit C, #11 Exhibit D, #12 Exhibit E, #13 Exhibit F [REDACTED], #14 Exhibit F [UNREDACTED], #15 Exhibit G, #16 Exhibit H)(Lau, Lucius) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4937 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE "ALL-CRT" CONSPIRACY LIABILITY re #2981 Motion for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment filed by Thomson Consumer Electronics, Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 6, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
October 6, 2016 Filing 4936 Joinder and Reply of Law Offices of Francis O. Scarpulla to Opposition to Motion to Strike FILED by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4935 ORDER granting #4930 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to withdraw; denying as moot #4876 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 6, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016).
October 5, 2016 Filing 4934 REPLY (re #4874 MOTION to Strike #4853 Response (Non Motion); -MOTION TO STRIKE DECLARATION OF MARIO N. ALIOTO IN SUPPORT OF LEAD COUNSELS OMNIBUS RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED ALLOCATION OF AGGREGATE FEE AWARD TO INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL< ) AND MOTION TO STRIKE LATE-FILED ALIOTO AND CAPURRO DECLARATIONS filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Third Bogdanov Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Cooper, Josef) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
October 5, 2016 Filing 4933 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Cooper & Kirkham, P.C. filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Bogdanov, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 (Redacted), #4 Exhibit 1 (Unredacted), #5 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), #6 Exhibit 2 (Unredacted), #7 Exhibit 3 (Redacted), #8 Exhibit 3 (Unredacted), #9 Exhibit 4 (Redacted), #10 Exhibit 4 (Unredacted), #11 Exhibit 5 (Redacted), #12 Exhibit 5 (Unredacted), #13 Exhibit 6 (Redacted), #14 Exhibit 6 (Unredacted), #15 Exhibit 7 (Redacted), #16 Exhibit 7 (Unredacted), #17 Exhibit 8 (Redacted), #18 Exhibit 8 (Unredacted), #19 Exhibit 9 (Redacted), #20 Exhibit 9 (Unredacted), #21 Exhibit 11 (Redacted), #22 Exhibit 11 (Unredacted))(Cooper, Josef) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4932 ORDER RE RECENT DIRECT ACTION PLAINTIFF SETTLEMENTS re #4611 ORDER ACCEPTING RECOMMENDED ORDER OF THE SPECIAL MASTER RE ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR DAP SETTLEMENT REPORT. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 5, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
October 5, 2016 Filing 4931 RESPONSE to re #4820 Objection, re #4822 Objection, re #4818 Objection; -SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF LAWRENCE PAPALE IN RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED FEE ALLOCATION filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit to Suppl Decl of LGP)(Papale, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
October 5, 2016 Filing 4930 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to withdraw Mitsubishi Electric Defendants' administrative motion to file under seal re #4876 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Visual Solutions America, Inc. Responses due by 10/11/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fuentes, Gabriel) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
October 5, 2016 Filing 4929 AFFIDAVIT re #4818 Objection; -Declaration of Francis O. Scarpulla re Agreement Between the Firms of Trump Alioto Trump & Prescott and Zelle LLP filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
October 5, 2016 Filing 4928 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/29/2016, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #4909 Transcript Order, #4904 Transcript Order, #4905 Transcript Order, ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2017. (Related documents(s) #4909 , #4904 , #4905 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4927 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR RULE 54(B) CERTIFICATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #4793 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
October 5, 2016 Filing 4926 Special Masters Order No. 5 on Procedure for Fee Allocation. (Quinn, Martin) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
October 4, 2016 Filing 4925 Letter from Josef D. Cooper to Special Master Martin Quinn. (Cooper, Josef) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
October 4, 2016 Filing 4924 Letter from Mario N. Alioto to Special Master Martin Quinn . (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
October 4, 2016 Filing 4923 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 09/20/16, before Judge Jon S. Tigar. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number 8584537590. Tape Number: FTR 2:01 - 3:13. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #4881 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 10/25/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2017. (Related documents(s) #4881 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
October 4, 2016 Filing 4922 NOTICE by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs re #4862 Notice; --Withdrawal of Cooper & Kirkham, P.C.'s Request for Oral Argument (Cooper, Josef) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
October 4, 2016 Filing 4921 Letter from Josef D. Cooper to Special Master Martin Quinn. (Cooper, Josef) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4920 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATIONThe parties' Stipulation Regarding Date to Submit Expert Reports and Date for DPPs to Respond to Mitsubishi Electric Defendants' Objections to Special Masters' Proposed Order, ECF No. 4919, is granted. The October 7, 2016 deadline for (1) the Mitsubishi Electric Defendants to submit rebuttal reportsof their expert witnesses, and (2) any parties (here the DPPs)to respond to the Mitsubishi Electric Defendants' Objections to the Special Master's August 29, 2016 Proposed Order, ECF No. 4802, is EXTENDED to October 21, 2016.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
October 3, 2016 Filing 4919 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Date to Submit Expert Reports and Date for DPPs to Respond to Mitsubishi Electric Defendants' Objections to Special Masters' Proposed Order filed by Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Visual Solutions America, Inc.. (Brody, Michael) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4918 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL re #4876 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Mitsubishi Electric US, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Visual Solutions America, Inc, Mitsubishi Electric Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 3, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4917 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting in part and denying in part #4879 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4916 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR BIFURCATION AND BENCH TRIAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying #4759 Motion to Bifurcate. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4915 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #4901 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER of Samsung SDI Defendants filed by Dell Products L.P., Dell Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 3, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4914 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #4899 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Resetting Case Management Conference to November 8, 2016 filed by Sears, Roebuck and Co., KMart Corporation. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 3, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4913 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF SPECIAL MASTER for #4799 Report and Recommendations - Special Master. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 1, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
September 30, 2016 Filing 4912 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren C. Capurro, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 (Redacted), #4 Exhibit 1 (Unredacted), #5 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), #6 Exhibit 2 (Unredacted), #7 Exhibit 6 (Redacted), #8 Exhibit 6 (Unredacted), #9 Exhibit 7 (Redacted), #10 Exhibit 7 (Unredacted), #11 Exhibit 8 (Redacted), #12 Exhibit 8 (Unredacted), #13 Exhibit 9 (Redacted), #14 Exhibit 9 (Unredacted), #15 Exhibit 11 (Redacted), #16 Exhibit 11 (Unredacted), #17 Exhibit 12 (Redacted), #18 Exhibit 12 (Unredacted), #19 Exhibit 13 (Redacted), #20 Exhibit 13 (Unredacted))(Capurro, Lauren) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 30, 2016 Filing 4911 RESPONSE to (re #4874 MOTION to Strike #4853 Response; -OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE DECLARATION OF MARIO N. ALIOTO IN SUPPORT OF LEAD COUNSELS OMNIBUS RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED ALLOCATION OF AGGREGATE FEE AWARD TO INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL<) filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mario N. Alioto, #2 Declaration of Lauren C. Capurro, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13)(Capurro, Lauren) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4910 ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT CONCERNING THE FTAIA by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying #3008 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #3032 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 30, 2016 Filing 4909 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/29/2016 before Hon. Jon S. Tigar by LG Electronics, Inc., for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Kim, Miriam) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 30, 2016 Filing 4908 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/20/2016 before Hon. Jon S. Tigar by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Kim, Miriam) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 30, 2016 Filing 4907 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master re ORDER RESOLVING KOREAN TRANSLATION OBJECTIONS - TRANCHE 2. Objections due by 10/14/2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2016: #1 Exhibit A - Under Seal) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2016 Filing 4906 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/20/2016 before Hon. Jon S. Tigar by MT Picture Display Co., LTD, Panasonic Corporation(fka Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. ("MEI"), is a Japanese entity), Panasonic Corporation of North America(("PCNA") is a Delaware corporation), for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Cole, Eva) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 30, 2016 Filing 4905 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/29/2016 before Hon. Jon S. Tigar by ABC Appliance, Inc., Compucom Systems Inc, Electrograph Systems, Inc, Electrograph Technologies Corp., Interbond Corporation of America, Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 30, 2016 Filing 4904 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2016-09-29 before Hon. Jon S. Tigar by Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.(("TAIP") is headquartered in Irvine, California), Toshiba America, Inc(("Toshiba America") is a Delaware corporation), Toshiba Corporation(("TC") is a Japanese company), for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Sharp, Samuel) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 29, 2016 Filing 4903 Declaration of Joseph Goldberg in Support of #4879 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #4879 ) (Capurro, Lauren) (Filed on 9/29/2016)
September 29, 2016 Filing 4902 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Motion Hearing held on 9/29/2016 re #4793 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by Marta Cooperative of America, Inc. Total Time in Court: 12 minutes. Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/29/2016)
September 29, 2016 Filing 4901 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER of Dismissal of Samsung SDI Defendants filed by Dell Inc., Dell Products L.P.. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order) (Kenny, Michael) (Filed on 9/29/2016)
September 29, 2016 Filing 4899 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Resetting Case Management Conference to November 8, 2016 filed by KMart Corporation, Sears, Roebuck and Co.. (Blechman, William) (Filed on 9/29/2016)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4900 ORDER re #4808 MOTION for Attorneys' Fees filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 28, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
September 28, 2016 Filing 4898 Declaration of Lauren C. Capurro in Support of #4879 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #4879 ) (Capurro, Lauren) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
September 28, 2016 Filing 4897 Declaration of Christopher T. Micheletti in Support of #4879 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byKerry Lee Hall. (Related document(s) #4879 ) (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
September 28, 2016 Filing 4896 Supplemental Statement of Law Offices of Francis O. Scarpulla re Fee Allocation filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit 1) (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
September 28, 2016 Filing 4895 Special Masters Order No. 4 Re Process for Allocation of Attorneys' Fees. (Quinn, Martin) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
September 28, 2016 Filing 4894 Letter from Case Manager to Special Master Martin Quinn Confrming Hearings on Allocation of Attorneys Fees . (Quinn, Martin) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
September 28, 2016 Filing 4893 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING AND SETTING RESPONSE DEADLINE as to #4877 MOTION For Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Special Master re #4802 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master. This motion has been noticed for hearing on a date when Judge Tigar does not hear regularly scheduled civil law and motion. The hearing previously noticed for 11/3/2016 is continued to 11/17/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Any party wishing to file a response to the motion shall do so by 10/7/2016. Responses shall be limited to a length of 20 pages. No replies are due. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
September 27, 2016 Filing 4892 Declaration of Theresa D. Moore in Support of #4873 Response to Lead Counsel's Proposed Allocation of Aggregate Fee Award to Indired Purchaser Plaintiff's Couinsel - Ex A filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #4873 ) (Moore, Theresa) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
September 27, 2016 Filing 4891 Letter from Francis O. Scarpulla to Special Master Martin Quinn. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
September 27, 2016 Filing 4890 Joinder in re #4874 MOTION to Strike re #4853 DECLARATION OF MARIO N. ALIOTO IN SUPPORT OF LEAD COUNSELS OMNIBUS RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED ALLOCATION OF AGGREGATE FEE AWARD TO INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL< Law Offices of Francis O. Scarpulla's Joinder in Cooper < Kirkham, P.C.'s Motion to Strike Declaration of Mario N. Alioto and Motion to Strike Certain Paragraphs Thereof filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
September 27, 2016 Filing 4889 Letter from Lingel H. Winters to Special Master Quinn. (Winters, Lingel) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
September 27, 2016 Filing 4888 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 20, 2016 before Hon. Jon S. Tigar by Technicolor S.A, Technicolor USA, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Konradi, Anna) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
September 26, 2016 Filing 4887 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/20/2016 before Hon. Jon S. Tigar by Sharp Electronics Corporation, Sharp Electronics Manufacturing Company of America, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Galvin, Cheryl) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
September 26, 2016 Filing 4886 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Steven Noel Williams re Withdrawal of Niki B. Okcu (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
September 26, 2016 Filing 4885 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: #4861 Motion Hearing) by Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.(("TAIP") is headquartered in Irvine, California), Toshiba America, Inc(("Toshiba America") is a Delaware corporation), Toshiba Corporation(("TC") is a Japanese company). Court will send to Sara King at sara.king@whitecase.com a link to the files requested in this order. (Filing Fee: $30.00, receipt number 0971-10800080). (Sharp, Samuel) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
September 26, 2016 Filing 4884 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2016-09-20 before Hon. Jon S. Tigar by Toshiba America Consumer Products, LLC, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.(("TAIP") is headquartered in Irvine, California), Toshiba America, Inc(("Toshiba America") is a Delaware corporation), Toshiba Corporation(("TC") is a Japanese company), for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Sharp, Samuel) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
September 26, 2016 Filing 4883 Special Masters Order No. 3 Re Process for Allocation: Motion of Lingel Winters. (Quinn, Martin) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
September 26, 2016 Filing 4882 TRANSCRIPT ORDER before Hon. Jon S. Tigar by KMart Corporation, Sears, Roebuck and Co., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Blechman, William) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
September 26, 2016 Filing 4881 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/20/2016 before Hon. Jon S. Tigar by ABC Appliance, Inc., Compucom Systems Inc, Electrograph Systems, Inc, Electrograph Technologies Corp., Interbond Corporation of America, Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
September 26, 2016 Filing 4880 Special Masters Order: Special Master's Order No. 2 Re Process for Allocation of Attorneys' Fees. (Quinn, Martin) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
September 24, 2016 Filing 4879 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John D. Bogdanov, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Josef D. Cooper in Support of Cooper & Kirkham, P.C.'s Objection to Lead Counsel's Revised Proposed Allocation of Aggregate Fee Award to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Counsel, #4 Declaration of Josef D. Cooper in Support of Cooper & Kirkham, P.C.'s Objection to Lead Counsel's Revised Proposed Allocation of Aggregate Fee Award to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Counsel)(Cooper, Josef) (Filed on 9/24/2016)
September 24, 2016 Filing 4878 REPLY to re #4853 Response; -Reply in Support of Cooper & Kirkham, P.C.'s Objection to Lead Counsel's Revised Proposed Allocation of Aggregate Fee Award to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Counsel filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration (2nd) of John D. Bogdanov) (Cooper, Josef) (Filed on 9/24/2016)
September 24, 2016 Filing 4877 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION For Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Special Master re #4802 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master filed by Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Visual Solutions America, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 11/3/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/11/2016. Replies due by 10/18/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Terrance J. Truax, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26)(Truax, Terrence) (Filed on 9/24/2016)
September 23, 2016 Filing 4876 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Visual Solutions America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Terrance J. Truax, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Notice of Motion and Motion for Relief (Unredacted), #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 20, #19 Exhibit 24, #20 Exhibit 25)(Truax, Terrence) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
September 23, 2016 Filing 4875 Kirby McInerney LLP's Response to Lead Counsel's Omnibus re #4853 Response to Objections to Proposed Allocation of Aggregate Fee Award to IPPs' Counsel filed by Kirby McInerney LLP. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Robert J. Gralewski, Jr. ISO Kirby McInerney LLP's Response to Lead Counsel's Omnibus Response to Objections to Proposed Allocation of Aggregate Fee Award to IPPs' Counsel)(Gralewski, Robert) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
September 23, 2016 Filing 4874 MOTION to Strike re #4853 Response; -MOTION TO STRIKE DECLARATION OF MARIO N. ALIOTO IN SUPPORT OF LEAD COUNSELS OMNIBUS RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED ALLOCATION OF AGGREGATE FEE AWARD TO INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Responses due by 10/7/2016. Replies due by 10/14/2016. (Cooper, Josef) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
September 23, 2016 Filing 4873 REPLY to re #4853 Response To Lead Counsel's Proposed Allocation of Aggregate Fee Award To Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Counsel filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration, Ex A)(Moore, Theresa) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
September 23, 2016 Filing 4872 REPLY to Lead Counsel's Omnibus re #4853 Response to Objections to Proposed Allocation of Aggregate Fee Award to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Counsel filed by Janet Ackerman. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Jeffrey C. Shea, #(2) Exhibit 1 - Lodestar, #(3) Exhibit 2- Lodestar) (Shea, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
September 23, 2016 Filing 4871 DECLARATION of Susan G. Kupfer in Opposition to #4853 Response to Lead Counsel's Declaration in Response to Objections to Lead Counsel's Allocation of Aggregate Fee Award to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Attorneys; Hearing Requested Before The Special Master filed by Dana Ross. (Related document(s) #4853 ) (Kupfer, Susan) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4870 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #4867 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
September 23, 2016 Filing 4869 RESPONSE to re #4853 Response; -RESPONSE TO LEAD COUNSEL'S OMNIBUS RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED FEE ALLOCATIONS; OBJECTION TO LEAD COUNSEL'S UNTIMELY FILINGS; NON-CONSENT TO LEAD COUNSEL'S REQUEST FOR EX PARTE COMMUNICATIONS filed by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarpulla, Francis) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4868 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #4809 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master re ORDER RESOLVING KOREAN TRANSLATION OBJECTIONS - TRANCHE 1. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 22, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2016)
September 22, 2016 Filing 4867 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Unopposed) filed by Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Visual Solutions America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Truax, Terrence) (Filed on 9/22/2016)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4866 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying #4860 Stipulation Regarding Extension of Page Length for Objections to the Special Master's Proposed Order. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
September 21, 2016 Filing 4865 NOTICE by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs re #4748 Special Masters Order; -Lead Counsel's Request for Oral Hearing re: certain objections to proposed allocation of aggregate fee award to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Counsel (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
September 21, 2016 Filing 4864 RESPONSE to (re #4799 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master) filed by ABC Appliance, Inc., Compucom Systems Inc, Electrograph Systems, Inc, Electrograph Technologies Corp., Interbond Corporation of America, Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
September 21, 2016 Filing 4863 NOTICE by Kirby McInerney LLP re #4748 Special Masters Order Re Process for Allocation of Attorneys' Fees - Requesting for Oral Hearing (Gralewski, Robert) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
September 21, 2016 Filing 4862 NOTICE by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs re #4748 Special Masters Order; -Request for Oral Argument and Statement of Non-Consent to Lead Counsel's Request for Off-Record Communications with the Special Master (Cooper, Josef) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
September 21, 2016 Filing 4861 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Motion Hearing held on 9/20/2016. #4759 MOTION to Bifurcate and for Bench Trial is taken under submission. Further Case Management Conference held on 9/20/2016. Status Report due by 9/8/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. FTR Time 2:01 - 3:13 (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/21/2016) Modified on 9/26/2016: Matter transcribed by Tara Bauer (ECHO Reporting). (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2016 Filing 4860 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Extension of Page Length for Objections to the Special Master's Proposed Order [Dkt. 4802] filed by Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric US, Inc., Mitsubishi Electric Visual Solutions America, Inc. (Truax, Terrence) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4859 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #4858 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 20, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
September 20, 2016 Filing 4858 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order) (Chiappetta, David) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
September 20, 2016 Filing 4857 Letter from Mario N. Alioto to Special Master Martin Quinn . (Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
September 19, 2016 Filing 4856 CORRECTED CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES. Telephonic appearances will not be taken by the Court at the time of the hearing on September 20, 2016. Any party appearing by telephone that wishes to have their name recorded on the minutes shall, no later than 3:00 PM on the day of the hearing, provide their appearance information to the Clerk at jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Correction of ECF No. 4855 (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2016).
September 19, 2016 Filing 4855 FILED IN ERROR. SEE ECF NO. 4856.CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES. Telephonic appearances will not be taken by the Court at the time of the hearing on September 19, 2016. Any party appearing by telephone that wishes to have their name recorded on the minutes shall, no later than 3:00 PM on the day of the hearing, provide their appearance information to the Clerk at jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2016).
September 18, 2016 Filing 4854 NOTICE by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs re #4850 Response ( Non Motion ), Request for Oral Argument (Papale, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/18/2016)
September 17, 2016 Filing 4853 RESPONSE to LEAD COUNSELS OMNIBUS RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED ALLOCATION OF AGGREGATE FEE AWARD TO INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL by Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECL. OF MARIO N. ALIOTO ISO LEAD COUNSELS OMNIBUS RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED ALLOCATION OF AGGREGATE FEE AWARD, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 3)(Alioto, Mario) (Filed on 9/17/2016)
September 16, 2016 Filing 4852 DECLARATION of William J. Blechman in Opposition to #4820 Objection, #4822 Objection, #4821 Objection, #4818 Objection, #4817 Objection, #4824 Objection, #4836 Objection to IPP Lead Counsel Fee Allocation filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #4820 , #4822 , #4821 , #4818 , #4817 , #4824 ) (Capurro, Lauren) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
September 16, 2016 Filing 4851 DECLARATION of Joseph Goldberg in Opposition to #4820 Objection, #4822 Objection, #4821 Objection, #4818 Objection, #4817 Objection, #4824 Objection, #4836 Objection to IPP Lead Counsel Fee Allocation filed byIndirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #4820 , #4822 , #4821 , #4818 , #4817 , #4824 ) (Capurro, Lauren) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
September 16, 2016