December 27, 2012 |
Filing
87
ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT MUHAMMAD; DENYING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL re 86 Response ( Non Motion ), filed by Danny Gerome Young. Plaintiff is unable to provide sufficient to effectuate service. Accordingly, the claims against Defendant Muhammad are DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m). the Clerk shall terminated Defendant Muhammad from this action. Rodney Muhammad (M.D.) terminated. Plaintiff also requested appointment of counsel. (Doc. No. 86). Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED without prejudice for lack of exceptional circumstances. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/21/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
|
September 4, 2012 |
Filing
83
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE COURT WITH MORE INFORMATION ON UNSERVED DEFENDANT. Accordingly, Plaintiff must provide the Court with this Defendant's accurate current location such that the Marshal is able to effect service. If Plaintiff f ails to provide the Court with an accurate current location for this Defendant within thirty (30) days of the date this order is filed, Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Muhammad will be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/31/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
|
June 19, 2012 |
Filing
73
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION. Plaintiff shall file an opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss no later than July 19, 212. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/18/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
|
June 4, 2012 |
Filing
61
ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANTS JARDINI AND NGUYEN; DIRECTING CLERK TO REISSUE SUMMONSES. All claims against Defendants Jardina and Nguyen are DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk shall term inate said defendants from this action. The Clerk of the Court shall reissue summons and the United States Marshal shall serve, without prepayment of fees, a copy of the complaint in this matter,all attachments thereto, a copy of the Court Order file d October 26, 2011, (Docket No. 6) and a copy of this order upon the following Defendants at Salinas Valley State Prison, (P.O. Box 1020, Soledad, CA 93960-1020): A. Reyes, CCI, Recorder, S. Miranda, Correctional Supervising Cook , Rodney Muhammad , M.D., E. Ramos and B. Dixon. The Clerk shall also mail a courtesy copy of this order to the California Attorney General's Office. The Clerk shall update the docket to reflect the corrections provided by Plaintiff with respect to these Defendants. *** Jardini and Nguyen terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/4/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2012)
|
April 2, 2012 |
Filing
55
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE COURT WITH MORE INFORMATION FOR UNSERVEDDEFENDANTS. Plaintiff must file notice and provide the Court with the accurate current location, and the first name initial if available, of Defendants Muhammand, Rayes, Dix ion, Jardini, Miranda, Nguyen, and Ramos such that the Marshal is able to effect service. If Plaintiff fails to provide the Court with an accurate current location for these Defendants within thirty (30) days of the date this order is filed, Plaintif f's claims against Muhammand, Rayes, Dixion, Jardini, Miranda, Nguyen, and Ramos will be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/30/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
|
October 26, 2011 |
Filing
6
ORDER OF SERVICE; DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION OR NOTICE REGARDING SUCH MOTION; INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons and the United States Marshal shall serve, without prepayment of fees, a copy of the complaint, all attachments thereto, and a copy of this order upon the following Defendants at Salinas Valley State Prison, (P.O. Box 1020, Soledad, CA 93960-1020): Anthony Hedgpeth, Warden; Charles Watson, Dietician; Sepulveda, Health Care Manager; S . Gomez, Rayes, C. Ramos, and T. J. Mantel, Correctional Counselors; S. Hatton, J. McCall, V. Solis, R. Fritz, and M. Ross, Facility Captains ; Sergeant M. Thomas; Lieutenant R. Parin; Bolton and K. Soper, Supervising Cooks; N. Stone, Assistant Food Manager; B. Dixion, Administrator; V. Lomeli, Counselor; K. Wall, Health Care Manager; Miranda (title unknown); Dr. Nguyen, Dr. Pajong, Dr. R. Muhammad, Dr. Richard Mack, Dr. E. Birdson, Dr. D. Jardini, Dr. Eric Bridgnell, Dr. Robert Bowman, and Dr. L. Gamboa; and C. Kates, Healthcare Appeals Coordinator. The Clerk shall also issues summons to Defendant Dr. J. Walker at the California Prison Health Care Services (Sacramento, CA 95812-4038), and Defendants C. Holstrom and D. Foston, Appeals Exami ners, at the Appeals Branch (P.O. Box 94283, Sacramento, CA 94283-0001). The Clerk shall replace "A. Reyes" with "Rayes," and "E. Romas" with "C. Ramos, Correctional Counselor II" on the Docket, and add Defendants N. Stone and D. L. Gamboa as parties to this action. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/26/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
|