Garcia et al v. Smith et al

Plaintiff: Ruben Dario Garcia, Jr and Lenin Garcia
Defendant: Smith, Chance, Moore, Stewart, Brown, Vasquez, S Wall, Elias, Savala, Merchant, Suglich, E A Contreras, Strickland, Cluck, DOES and Cortez
Case Number: 3:2010cv01187
Filed: June 1, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2017 250 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 248 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Court finds the issues are not complex, Plaintiff has proven his ability to articulate his claims pro se, and there is not a likelihood of success on the merits. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 3/7/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
April 17, 2014 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 153 Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/17/14. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
January 16, 2014 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Denying Defendants' 128 Motion for Entry of Judgment; and (2) Denying Plaintiff's 120 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/16/14. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (cge)(Modified text to indicate mail service on 1/17/2014, NEF regenerated)(cge)(jrd)
June 27, 2012 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 82 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 6/27/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)(jrd)
March 14, 2012 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 64 ; denying 59 Motion to Amend Civil Complaint; and granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 50 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/14/12.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
March 21, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Order Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 60 re 20 , 28 . Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 03/21/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)(jrd).
February 3, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Dismissing Claims from Second Amended Complaint for failing to State a Claim Without leave to Amend; and (2) Directing U.S. Marshal to Effect Service of Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/3/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
November 8, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING First Amended Complaint without Prejudice for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff is granted forty five (45) days leave to file a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/5/2010.(Sent 1983 complaint form to Plaintiff)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
October 19, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Denying Lenin Garcia's Motion to File a Joint Extended Complaint (Doc. No. 10 ); and (2) Denying Lenin Garcia's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis as moot (Doc. No. 8 ). Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/19/2010.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
October 14, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/14/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
August 9, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, DISMISSING PLAINTIFF LENIN GARCIA, AND DISMISSING COMPLAINT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiff Lenin Garcia is DISMISSED from this Action. Plaintiff Ruben Garcia's Motion t o proceed IFP is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28USC1915(e)(2)(b) and 1915A(b). However, Plaintiff is GRANTED forty five (45) days leave from the date this Order is "Fi led" in which to file a First Amended Complaint. (Order electronically transmitted to Matthew Cate, Secretary CDCR). Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/8/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; mailed Plaintiff a form 1983 complaint; mailed a hard copy of order to Matthew Cate )(jer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia et al v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Dario Garcia, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenin Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merchant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suglich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E A Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cluck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cortez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?