IN RE: PACKAGED SEAFOOD PRODUCTS ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Plaintiff: Truyen Ton-Vuong, Steven Kratky, Melissa Bowman, Big Y Foods, Inc., Samuel Seidenburg, Albertsons Companies, LLC, Krasdale Foods, Inc., Edy Yee, Herbert H. Kliegerman, Kathy Durand Gore, Groucho's Deli of Raleigh, David Ton, Piggly Wiggly Alabama Distributing Co., Inc., Delhaize America, LLC, Corey Norris, Robby Reed, Erica Pruess, Sheryl Haley, Maquoketa Care Center, Adam Buehrens, Kathy Vangemert, Hy-Vee, Inc., US Foods, Inc., Virginia Rakipi, Joelyna A. San Agustin, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Robert Etten, Jeffrey Potvin, Sterling King, Julie Wiese, Alex Lee, Inc., Lesgo Personal Chef LLC, Barbara Buenning, Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc., Jessica Decker, Elizabeth Twitchell, Sandra Powers, Janet Machen, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Ken Dunlap, FAREWAY STORES, INC., URM Stores, Inc., Lisa Hall, Cash-Wa Distributing Co. of Kearney, Inc., SIMON-HINDI, LLC, Jennifer A. Nelson, The Kroger Co., Janelle Albarello, 99 Cents Only Stores LLC, Benjamin Foods LLC, Nay Alidad, Moran Foods, LLC, Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Rick Musgrave, John Pels, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Kristin Millican, Paul Berger, Erica C Rodriguez, Brian Levy, Dollar General Corporation, Kathrerine Larson, Associated Food Stores, Inc., Dwayne Kennedy, Carla Lown, Kaitlyn Rooney, Robert Benjamin, Marc Blumstein, End Payer Plaintiffs, Certco, Inc., Trepco Imports and Distribution LTD, Amber Sartori, Danielle Greenberg, Louise Adams, Diana Mey, Laura Childs, Affiliated Foods, Inc., Laura Montoya, Jody Cooper, Stephanie Gipson, Casey Christensen, Michael Coffey, Mary Hudson, Gladys, LLC, Elizabeth Perron, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Nancy Stiller, Larry Demonaco, John Trent, Gay Birnbaum, Tya Hughes, Amy Joseph, Andrew Gorman, Dolgencorp, LLC, Valerie Peters, Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc., Jessica Bartling, Barbara Blumstein, Colin Moore, Rushin Gold, LLC, James Walnum, Beth Milliner, Sysco Corporation, Bi-Lo Holding, LLC, Gabrielle Kurdt, Associated Grocers of Florida, Inc., Sunde Daniels, Carl Lesher, Greenbrier International, Inc., Affiliated Foods Midwest Cooperative, Inc., Janet Machin, Schnuck Markets, Inc., Bonnie Vanderlaan, Meadowbrook Meat Company, Inc., Wakefern Food Corp., Kmart Corporation, Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc, Brookshire Grocery Company, Jessica Breitbach, Joseph A. Langston, Scott Caldwell, Evelyn Olive, Clarissa Simon, Dennis Yelvington, Danielle Johnson, Sandee's Catering, Zenda Johnston, Amy E Waterman, Thomas E. Willoughby III, McLane Company, Inc., Dutch Village Restaurant, Kim Craig, Associated Grocers, Inc., John Frick, Vivek Dravid, Sam's East, Inc., Daniel Zwirlein, Associated Grocers of New England, Inc., Central Grocers, Inc., A-1 Diner, Target Corporation, Kathleen Garner, Jonathan Rizzo, Confetti's Ice Cream Shoppe, Galyna Andrusyshyn, Jason Wilson, Cherokee Nation, The, Painted Plate Catering, Barbara E. Olson, Groucho's Deli of Five Points, LLC, Lisa Burr, K-VA-T Food Stores, Inc., Family Dollar Services LLC, Super Store Industries, Grand Supercenter Inc., Robert Skaff, Edgardo Gutierrez, Gloria Emery, Kathy Lingnofski, GlowFisch Hospitality, Barbara Lybarger, WOODMAN'S FOOD MARKET, INC., Tina Grant, Thyme Cafe & Market, Inc., Michael Juetten, Meijer, Inc., Karren Fabian, Kirsten Peck, Bashas' Inc., Blair Hysni, Beverly Youngblood, Sam's West, Inc., Western Family Foods, Inc., Scott Dennis, Bryan Anthony Reo, Wegmans Food Markets, Inc., John Gross & Company, Francis T Enterprises, Michael Buff, Publix Super Markets, Inc., Nigel Warren, Family Dollar Stores, Inc., Robert Fragoso, Liza Milliner, Ana Gabriela Felix Garcia, Greg Stearns, Marc Glassman, Inc., Unified Grocers, Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., SuperValu Inc., Elizabeth Davis-Berg, John Peychal, Brookshire Brothers, Inc., Louise Ann Davis Matthews, Seth Salenger, Spartannash Company, Capitol Hill Supermarket, Amy Jackson, Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Marissa Jacobus, Ramon Ruiz, Harold Stafford, Ellen Pinto, Harvesters Enterprises, LLC, Brian Depperschmidt, Sarah Metivier Schadt, W Lee Flowers & Co Inc, Audra Rickman, Jade Canterbury, Sally Crnkovich, Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc., Giant Eagle, Inc., Jinkyoung Moon, Katherine McMahon, Pacific Groservice Inc., Steven M. Colberg, Rebecca Lee Simoens, Sally Bredberg, Debra L. Damske, Merchants Distributors, LLC, North Central Distributors, LLC and Christopher Todd
Defendant: Big Catch Cayman LP, Dongwon Enterprises Co. Ltd., Lion Capital LLP, Chicken of the Sea International, Inc., Starkist Company, Bumble Bee Foods LLC, Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Thai Union Group PLC, Christopher Lischewski, Thai Union Group Public Company, Ltd., Thai Union Frozen Products PCL, King Oscar, Inc., Del Monte Corporation, Thai Union North America, Inc., Thai Union Group Public Company, Tri Marine International, Inc., Christopher D. Lischewski, Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Thai Union Group PCL, Dongwon Industries Co. Ltd, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC, Dongwon Industries Co. Ltd., Del Monte Foods Company, Dongwon Enterprises and Lion
Not Yet Classified: Non-Party Costco Wholesale Corporation
Intervenor Plaintiff: United States Department of Justice
Consolidated Plaintiff: Affiliated Foods Plaintiffs
Case Number: 3:2015md02670
Filed: December 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 2044 MOTION for Order Approving Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs Proposed Plan for Dissemination of Class Notice by Capitol Hill Supermarket. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeanne C. Finegan, APR Concerning Class Member Notification)(Finley, Alec) (jpp).
September 25, 2019 Filing 2043 NOTICE of Joinder by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc. (Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Amended Joinder to Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Motions re: ECF Nos. 1976, 1993, 2009, and 2035) (Lebsock, Christopher) (jpp).
September 25, 2019 Filing 2042 NOTICE of Change of Address by Fred T Isquith, Jr (Isquith, Fred) (jpp).
September 24, 2019 Filing 2041 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Big Catch Cayman LP, Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP re #1982 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, #1984 MOTION to Strike Adoria Lim's Second Expert Report And Portions of Marianne DeMario's Reports, #1998 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #1995 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Paris, Adam) (jpp).
September 23, 2019 Filing 2040 NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard Lyle Coffman (Coffman, Richard) (jpp).
September 20, 2019 Filing 2039 NOTICE of Joinder by Louise Adams re #2009 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Bumble Bee on Liability, #2035 Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against StarKist Co. End Payer Plaintiffs' Joinder in Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Motions (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Manifold, Betsy)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2038 ORDER granting #2022 Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs' ex parte Motion to extend time to submit proposed notice plan to 9/30/2019. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/20/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2037 NOTICE of Joinder by Capitol Hill Supermarket re #1993 MOTION for Summary Judgment End Payer Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2009 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Bumble Bee on Liability (Finley, Alec) (jpp).
September 20, 2019 Filing 2036 Joint Statement of Undisputed Material Facts by Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc, re #2035 Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against StarKist Co. . (Ahern, Patrick) (jpp).
September 20, 2019 Filing 2035 Joint MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against StarKist Co. by Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Ahern, Patrick)(jpp).
September 20, 2019 Filing 2034 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of Dr. Kevin Murphy [Public Redacted Version] by Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Ahern, Patrick) (jpp).
September 20, 2019 Filing 2033 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #2032 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Ahern, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2019: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7a, #8 Exhibit 7b, #9 Exhibit 7c, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37) (dsn).
September 19, 2019 Filing 2032 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Ahern, Patrick)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2031 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company re #1988 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, #2021 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, #1979 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, #1966 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, #2006 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, #1972 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, #2014 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Bauer, Ashley) (jpp).
September 19, 2019 Filing 2030 NOTICE of Joinder by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc. (Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Joinder to Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Motions - re: ECF Nos. 1976, 1993, 2009) (Lebsock, Christopher) (jpp).
September 19, 2019 Filing 2029 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #2028 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Ahern, Patrick) (rmc).
September 19, 2019 Filing 2028 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Ahern, Patrick) Modified on 9/20/2019 - QC mail sent re e-filed proposed order listed as "Request for Judicial Notice", docket text modified (rmc).
September 19, 2019 Filing 2027 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #2026 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Ahern, Patrick) (rmc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2019: #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7a, #9 Exhibit 7b, #10 Exhibit 7c, #11 Exhibit 7d, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit 18, #23 Exhibit 19, #24 Exhibit 20, #25 Exhibit 21, #26 Exhibit 22, #27 Exhibit 23, #28 Exhibit 24, #29 Exhibit 25a, #30 Exhibit 25b, #31 Exhibit 25c, #32 Exhibit 26, #33 Exhibit 27a, #34 Exhibit 27b, #35 Exhibit 28, #36 Exhibit 29, #37 Exhibit 30, #38 Exhibit 31, #39 Exhibit 32, #40 Exhibit 33) (dsn).
September 19, 2019 Filing 2026 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Ahern, Patrick) Modified on 9/20/2019 - QC mail sent re e-filed proposed order listed as "Request for Judicial Notice", docket text modified (rmc).
September 19, 2019 Filing 2025 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Del Monte Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities (Redacted Version), #2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Del Monte Corporation's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Redacted Version), #3 Declaration of Barbara Sicalides, #4 Exhibit 1-37 (Placeholders - Exhibits Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 38, #6 Exhibit 39, #7 Exhibit 40, #8 Exhibit 41, #9 Exhibit 42, #10 Exhibit 43, #11 Exhibit 44, #12 Exhibit 45, #13 Exhibit 46, #14 Exhibit 47)(Sicalides, Barbara) (jpp).
September 19, 2019 Filing 2024 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #2016 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Sicalides, Barbara)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2023 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing All Claims for Purchases Made Prior to May 30, 2011 by Del Monte Corporation, Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities [Proposed Redacted Version], #2 Declaration of Belinda S Lee, #3 Exhibits 1 - 3 to Lee Decl. [Sealed], #4 Exhibit 4 to Lee Decl., #5 Exhibit 5 to Lee Decl., #6 Exhibits 6 - 52 to Lee Decl. [Sealed], #7 Exhibit 53 to Lee Decl., #8 Exhibit 54 to Lee Decl., #9 Exhibit 55 to Lee Decl., #10 Exhibits 56 - 152 to Lee Decl. [Sealed], #11 Exhibit 153 to Lee Decl.)(Lee, Belinda) (jpp).
September 19, 2019 Filing 2022 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Notice Plan by Capitol Hill Supermarket. (Finley, Alec) (jpp).
September 19, 2019 Filing 2021 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #2020 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Lee, Belinda)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2020 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Lee, Belinda)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2019 NOTICE of Joinder by Capitol Hill Supermarket re #1970 MOTION to Exclude (Certain Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Defendants' Proposed Experts) (Finley, Alec) (jpp).
September 19, 2019 Filing 2018 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #2017 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Finley, Alec)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2017 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Finley, Alec)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2016 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Sicalides, Barbara)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2015 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Private Label Claims by Bumble Bee Foods LLC, Del Monte Corporation, Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.). (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities [Proposed Redacted Version], #2 Declaration of Belinda S Lee, #3 Exhibits 1 - 76 to Lee Decl. [Sealed], #4 Exhibit 77 to Lee Decl., #5 Exhibit 78 to Lee Decl., #6 Exhibit 79 to Lee Decl., #7 Exhibit 80 to Lee Decl., #8 Exhibit 81 to Lee Decl., #9 Exhibit 82 to Lee Decl., #10 Exhibits 83 - 86 to Lee Decl. [Sealed])(Yates, Christopher) (jpp).
September 19, 2019 Filing 2014 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #2013 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Yates, Christopher)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2013 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Yates, Christopher)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2012 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #2011 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Gallo, Kenneth)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2011 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Gallo, Kenneth)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2010 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Statute of Limitations Grounds (Direct Action Plaintiffs) by Big Catch Cayman LP, Bumble Bee Foods LLC, Del Monte Corporation, Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP, Starkist Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities [Proposed Redacted Version], #2 Statement of Facts [Sealed], #3 Declaration of Craig A. Benson, #4 Exhibit 1 - 58 [Sealed])(Gallo, Kenneth) (jpp).
September 19, 2019 Filing 2009 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Bumble Bee on Liability by Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Delhaize America, LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co.. (Blechman, William)(jpp).
September 19, 2019 Filing 2008 NOTICE Plaintiffs' Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Rule 56 Motions by Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Delhaize America, LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-96)(Blechman, William) (jpp).
September 19, 2019 Filing 2007 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Statute of Limitations Grounds (Class Plaintiffs) by Bumble Bee Foods LLC, Starkist Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities [Proposed Redacted Version], #2 Statement of Facts [Proposed Redacted Version], #3 Declaration of Elizabeth C. Gettinger, #4 Exhibit 1 to Gettinger Decl. [Sealed], #5 Exhibit 2 to Gettinger Decl. [Sealed], #6 Exhibit 3 to Gettinger Decl. [Sealed])(Bauer, Ashley) (jpp).
September 19, 2019 Filing 2006 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #2004 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Bauer, Ashley)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2005 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1977 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Blechman, William)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2004 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Bauer, Ashley)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2003 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1977 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Blechman, William) (rmc). Modified on 9/20/2019 to correct link to motion per TCW filer (rmc).
September 19, 2019 Filing 2002 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #2000 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Gallo, Kenneth)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2001 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Thai Union Group PCL's Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment (REDACTED VERSION) by Thai Union Group PCL. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration of John Roberti, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31, #35 Exhibit 32, #36 Exhibit 33, #37 Exhibit 34, #38 Exhibit 35, #39 Exhibit 36, #40 Exhibit 37, #41 Exhibit 38, #42 Exhibit 39, #43 Exhibit 40, #44 Exhibit 41, #45 Exhibit 42, #46 Exhibit 43, #47 Exhibit 44, #48 Exhibit 45, #49 Exhibit 46, #50 Exhibit 47, #51 Exhibit 48, #52 Exhibit 49, #53 Exhibit 50, #54 Exhibit 51, #55 Exhibit 52, #56 Exhibit 53, #57 Exhibit 54, #58 Exhibit 55, #59 Exhibit 56, #60 Exhibit 57, #61 Exhibit 58, #62 Exhibit 59, #63 Exhibit 60, #64 Exhibit 61, #65 Exhibit 62, #66 Exhibit 63, #67 Exhibit 64, #68 Exhibit 65, #69 Exhibit 66, #70 Exhibit 67, #71 Exhibit 68, #72 Exhibit 69, #73 Exhibit 70, #74 Exhibit 71, #75 Exhibit 72, #76 Exhibit 73, #77 Exhibit 74, #78 Exhibit 75, #79 Exhibit 76, #80 Exhibit 77, #81 Exhibit 78, #82 Exhibit 79, #83 Exhibit 80, #84 Exhibit 81, #85 Exhibit 82, #86 Exhibit 83, #87 Exhibit 84, #88 Exhibit 85, #89 Exhibit 86, #90 Exhibit 87, #91 Exhibit 88, #92 Exhibit 89, #93 Exhibit 90)(Roberti, John) (jpp).
September 19, 2019 Filing 2000 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Gallo, Kenneth)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1999 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Bumble Bee Foods LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities [Proposed Redacted Version], #2 Statement of Facts [Proposed Redacted Version], #3 Declaration Craig A. Benson [Sealed], #4 Exhibit 1 - 52 [Sealed], #5 Exhibit 53, #6 Exhibit 54, #7 Exhibit 55, #8 Exhibit 56)(Gallo, Kenneth) (jpp).
September 19, 2019 Filing 1998 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Big Catch Cayman LP, Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration of I-Wen Jeff Chang, #4 Declaration of Eric Lindberg, #5 Declaration of Ilya A. Strebulaev, #6 Declaration of Adam S. Paris, #7 Exhibit A - UU)(Paris, Adam) (jpp).
September 19, 2019 Filing 1997 NOTICE of Joinder by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. (Stueve, Patrick)(jpp).
September 19, 2019 Filing 1996 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1990 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Roberti, John)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1995 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1994 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Paris, Adam)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1994 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Paris, Adam)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1993 MOTION for Summary Judgment End Payer Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Louise Adams. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Appendix A, #3 Proof of Service)(Manifold, Betsy) (jpp).
September 19, 2019 Filing 1992 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Certain State Law Claims by Big Catch Cayman LP, Bumble Bee Foods LLC, Del Monte Corporation, Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP, Starkist Company, Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.). (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Keith L. Williams, #3 Exhibit 1 to Williams Decl. [Sealed], #4 Exhibit 2 to Williams Decl. [Sealed], #5 Exhibit 3 to Williams Decl. [Sealed], #6 Exhibit 4 to Williams Decl. [Sealed], #7 Exhibit 5 to Williams Decl. [Sealed], #8 Exhibit 6 to Williams Decl. [Sealed], #9 Exhibit 7 to Williams Decl. [Sealed], #10 Exhibit 8 to Williams Decl. [Sealed])(Bauer, Ashley) (jpp).
September 19, 2019 Filing 1991 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1989 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Manifold, Betsy)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1990 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Roberti, John)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1989 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Manifold, Betsy)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1988 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1986 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Bauer, Ashley)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1987 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dennis W. Carlton by Affiliated Foods Plaintiffs, Bi-Lo Holding, LLC, Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Dr. Keith B. Leffler, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Declaration of Gregory K. Arenson, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11)(King, Laurence) (jpp).
September 19, 2019 Filing 1986 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Bauer, Ashley)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1985 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1983 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(King, Laurence)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1984 MOTION to Strike Adoria Lim's Second Expert Report And Portions of Marianne DeMario's Reports by Big Catch Cayman LP, Dongwon Industries Co. Ltd, Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP, Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Adam S. Paris In Support, #3 Exhibit 1 - 11)(Paris, Adam) (jpp).
September 19, 2019 Filing 1983 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (King, Laurence)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1982 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1980 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Paris, Adam)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1981 MOTION to Exclude Fact-Finding Testimony and Legal Conclusions of Plaintiffs' Economists by Big Catch Cayman LP, Bumble Bee Foods LLC, Del Monte Corporation, Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP, Starkist Company, Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.). (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities [Proposed Redacted Version], #2 Declaration of Corey D. Attaway, #3 Exhibit 1 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed], #4 Exhibit 2 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed], #5 Exhibit 3 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed], #6 Exhibit 4 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed], #7 Exhibit 5 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed], #8 Exhibit 6 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed], #9 Exhibit 7 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed], #10 Exhibit 8 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed], #11 Exhibit 9 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed], #12 Exhibit 10 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed], #13 Exhibit 11 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed], #14 Exhibit 12 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed], #15 Exhibit 13 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed], #16 Exhibit 14 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed], #17 Exhibit 15 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed], #18 Exhibit 16 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed], #19 Exhibit 17 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed], #20 Exhibit 18 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed], #21 Exhibit 19 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed], #22 Exhibit 20 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed], #23 Exhibit 21 to Attaway Decl., #24 Exhibit 22 to Attaway Decl., #25 Exhibit 23 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed], #26 Exhibit 24 to Attaway Decl., #27 Exhibit 25 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed], #28 Exhibit 26 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed], #29 Exhibit 27 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed], #30 Exhibit 28 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed], #31 Exhibit 29 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed], #32 Exhibit 30 to Attaway Decl. [Sealed])(Lee, Belinda) (jpp).
September 19, 2019 Filing 1980 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Paris, Adam)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1979 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1978 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Lee, Belinda)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1978 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Lee, Belinda)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1977 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Blechman, William)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1976 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against COSI by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Redacted version, #2 Statement of Facts Redacted version, #3 Declaration C. Curtis Shank, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1-5, 14-32 Placeholder, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13)(Stueve, Patrick) (jpp).
September 19, 2019 Filing 1975 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1974 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Stueve, Patrick)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1974 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Stueve, Patrick) (aef).
September 19, 2019 Filing 1973 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities [Proposed Redacted Version], #2 Declaration of Gabriella Kapp, #3 Exhibit 1 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #4 Exhibit 2 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #5 Exhibit 3 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #6 Exhibit 4 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #7 Exhibit 5 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #8 Exhibit 6 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #9 Exhibit 7 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #10 Exhibit 8 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #11 Exhibit 9 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #12 Exhibit 10 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #13 Exhibit 11 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #14 Exhibit 12 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #15 Exhibit 13 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #16 Exhibit 14 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #17 Exhibit 15 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #18 Exhibit 16 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #19 Exhibit 17 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #20 Exhibit 18 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #21 Exhibit 19 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #22 Exhibit 20 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #23 Exhibit 21 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #24 Exhibit 22 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #25 Exhibit 23 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #26 Exhibit 24 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #27 Exhibit 25 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #28 Exhibit 26 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #29 Exhibit 27 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #30 Exhibit 28 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #31 Exhibit 29 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #32 Exhibit 30 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #33 Exhibit 31 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #34 Exhibit 32 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #35 Exhibit 33 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #36 Exhibit 34 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #37 Exhibit 35 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #38 Exhibit 36 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #39 Exhibit 37 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #40 Exhibit 38 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #41 Exhibit 39 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #42 Exhibit 40 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #43 Exhibit 41 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #44 Exhibit 42 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #45 Exhibit 43 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #46 Exhibit 44 to Kapp Decl., #47 Exhibit 45 to Kapp Decl., #48 Exhibit 46 to Kapp Decl., #49 Exhibit 47 to Kapp Decl., #50 Exhibit 48 to Kapp Decl., #51 Exhibit 49 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #52 Exhibit 50 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #53 Exhibit 51 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #54 Exhibit 52 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #55 Exhibit 53 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #56 Exhibit 54 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #57 Exhibit 55 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #58 Exhibit 56 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #59 Exhibit 57 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #60 Exhibit 58 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #61 Exhibit 59 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #62 Exhibit 60 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #63 Exhibit 61 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #64 Exhibit 62 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #65 Exhibit 63 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #66 Exhibit 64 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #67 Exhibit 65 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #68 Exhibit 66 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #69 Exhibit 67 to Kapp Decl. [Sealed], #70 Exhibit 68 to Kapp Decl.)(Yates, Christopher) (jpp).
September 19, 2019 Filing 1972 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1971 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Yates, Christopher)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1971 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Yates, Christopher)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1970 MOTION to Exclude (Certain Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony of Defendants' Proposed Experts) by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities (Redacted version - unredacted version filed under seal at ECF No. 1969), #2 Declaration of Samantha J. Stein, #3 Exhibit 1-14, 16-19 (Placeholder - Unredacted versions filed under seal at ECF No. 1969), #4 Exhibit 15 (Article))(Lebsock, Christopher) (jpp).
September 19, 2019 Filing 1969 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1968 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Lebsock, Christopher)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1968 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Lebsock, Christopher)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1967 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Gary Hamilton by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.). (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities [Proposed Redacted Version], #2 Declaration of Elizabeth C. Gettinger, #3 Exhibit 1 to Gettinger Decl. [Sealed], #4 Exhibit 2 to Gettinger Decl. [Sealed], #5 Exhibit 3 to Gettinger Decl. [Sealed], #6 Exhibit 4 to Gettinger Decl. [Sealed], #7 Exhibit 5 to Gettinger Decl. [Sealed], #8 Exhibit 6 to Gettinger Decl. [Sealed])(Yates, Christopher) (jpp).
September 19, 2019 Filing 1966 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1965 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Yates, Christopher)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1965 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Yates, Christopher)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1964 ORDER granting #1958 Joint Motion and Stipulation for holding deadlines in abeyance. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/17/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1963 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Opinion by Dr. Garath Macartney and Motion in limine to Exclude Evidence of Purported Claims Assignment (REDACTED VERSION) by Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of John Roberti, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G)(Roberti, John) (jpp).
September 13, 2019 Filing 1962 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1961 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Roberti, John) (aef).
September 13, 2019 Filing 1961 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Roberti, John) (aef).
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1960 ORDER granting #1955 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Emily Catherine Aldridge as counsel for Plaintiff Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/13/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1959 ORDER granting #1957 Joint Motion for consolidate briefing. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/12/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1958 Joint MOTION for Stipulation Holding Deadlines in Abeyance as to Tri-Union Seafoods LLC and Thai Union Group PCL by Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC. (Roberti, John) (jpp).
September 11, 2019 Filing 1957 Joint MOTION for Order Allowing Consolidated Briefing on Motions for Summary Judgment and Related Motions by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Lee, Belinda) (jpp).
September 9, 2019 Filing 1956 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by United States Department of Justice (Wulff, Leslie) (jpp).
September 6, 2019 Filing 1955 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lesley E. Weaver)(Weaver, Lesley) (jpp).
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1954 ORDER granting Joint Motion and Stipulation for dismissal with prejudice of all claims by Publix Super Markets, Inc. and Wakenfern Food Corp. against Del Monte Corporation. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/05/2019. (cc: MDL Panel)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1953 ORDER granting Joint Motion and Stipulation for dismissal with prejudice of all claims by Meijer, Inc. and Meijer Distribution, Inc. against Defendant Del Monte Corporation. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/05/2019. (cc: MDL Panel).(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1952 ORDER granting Joint Motion and Stipulation for dismissal with prejudice of all claims by Dollar General Corporation and Delgencorp, LLC against Defendant Del Monte Corporation. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/05/2019. (cc: MDL Panel).(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1951 ORDER granting Joint Motion and Stipulation for dismissal with prejudice of all claims by Super Store Industries against Defendant Del Monte Corporation. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/05/2019. (cc: MDL Panel).(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1950 ORDER granting Joint Motion and Stipulation for dismissal with prejudice of all claims by SuperValu Inc., Associated Grocers of Florida, Inc., and Unified Grovers, Inc. against Defendant Del Monte Corporation. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/5/2019. (cc: MDL Panel).(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1949 ORDER granting Joint Motion and Stipulation for dismissal with prejudice of all claims by Moran Foods, LLC against Defendant Del Monte Corporation. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/5/2019. (cc: MDL Panel)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1948 ORDER granting #1943 Joint Motion and Stipulation for dismissal of all claims by the CFPs against Defendant Del Monte Corporation. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/03/2019. (cc: MDL Panel). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1947 ORDER clarifying Del Monte Corporation's position with respect to Class Certification Order (ECF No. #1942 . Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/03/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp). Modified on 9/3/2019 to replace image, nef resent to all parties. (jpp).
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1946 ORDER granting #1944 Joint Motion and Stipulation for dismissal of Defendant Del Monte Corporation. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/03/2019. (cc: MDL Panel). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1945 MOTION for Order Approving Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' (DPPs) Proposed Class Notice Plan and Motion to Modify Class Definition by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Samantha J. Stein, #2 Declaration of Jennifer M. Keough (JND), #3 Exhibit 1 to Keough Decl. (CV), #4 Exhibit 2 to Keough Decl. (Long Form Notice), #5 Exhibit 3 to Keough Decl. (E-Mail Notice), #6 Exhibit 4 to Keough Decl. (Publication Notice))(Lebsock, Christopher)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1944 Joint MOTION to Dismiss , and Stipulation, of Del Monte Corporation as to End Payer Plaintiffs by Del Monte Corporation. (Sicalides, Barbara) (rmc).
August 29, 2019 Filing 1943 Joint MOTION to Dismiss , and Stipulation, of Del Monte Corporation as to Commercial Food Preparers by Del Monte Corporation. (Sicalides, Barbara) (rmc).
August 29, 2019 Filing 1942 Joint MOTION for Order , pursuant to Stipulation, to Clarify Del Monte Corporation's Position with Respect to Class Certification Order (Dkt. 1931) Nunc Pro Tunc by Del Monte Corporation. (Sicalides, Barbara) (rmc).
August 29, 2019 Filing 1941 NOTICE End Payer Plaintiffs' Proposed Plan for Dissemination of Class Notice by Louise Adams (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer M. Keough, #2 Proof of Service)(Manifold, Betsy) (rmc).
August 28, 2019 Filing 1940 STATUS REPORT (Joint Report to the Court Regarding Schedule for Hearings on the Parties' Anticipated Motions for Summary Judgment and Related Motions) by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Lee, Belinda) (rmc).
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1939 ORDER granting #1938 Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs' ex parte motion to extend time to submit proposed notice plan. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/26/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1938 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Notice Plan by A-1 Diner, Capitol Hill Supermarket, Confetti's Ice Cream Shoppe, Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc., Francis T Enterprises, Groucho's Deli of Five Points, LLC, Groucho's Deli of Raleigh, Maquoketa Care Center, Rushin Gold, LLC, SIMON-HINDI, LLC, Sandee's Catering, Thyme Cafe & Market, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Finley, Alec) (jpp).
August 23, 2019 Filing 1937 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by A-1 Diner, Capitol Hill Supermarket, Confetti's Ice Cream Shoppe, Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc., Francis T Enterprises, Groucho's Deli of Five Points, LLC, Groucho's Deli of Raleigh, Maquoketa Care Center, Rushin Gold, LLC, SIMON-HINDI, LLC, Sandee's Catering, Thyme Cafe & Market, Inc. re #1936 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Notice Plan filed by SIMON-HINDI, LLC, Rushin Gold, LLC, Maquoketa Care Center, Sandee's Catering, Francis T Enterprises, Groucho's Deli of Raleigh, Groucho's Deli of Five Points, LLC, Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc., Confetti's Ice Cream Shoppe, Capitol Hill Supermarket, A-1 Diner, Thyme Cafe & Market, Inc. . (Finley, Alec) (jpp).
August 22, 2019 Filing 1936 WITHDRAWN PER #1937 - Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Notice Plan by A-1 Diner, Capitol Hill Supermarket, Confetti's Ice Cream Shoppe, Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc., Francis T Enterprises, Groucho's Deli of Five Points, LLC, Groucho's Deli of Raleigh, Maquoketa Care Center, Rushin Gold, LLC, SIMON-HINDI, LLC, Sandee's Catering, Thyme Cafe & Market, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Finley, Alec) (jpp).
August 15, 2019 Filing 1935 USCA Case Number 19-80108 for Petition for Permission to Appeal under 23(f) filed by Bumble Bee Foods LLC, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC, Starkist Company, Dongwon Industries Co. Ltd., and Thai Union Group PCL. (akr)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1934 ORDER granting #1926 Motion to modify case schedule. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/09/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1933 ORDER granting #1932 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Benjamin J. Eichel as counsel for Defendant Del Monte Corporation. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/01/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1932 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Of Benjamin J. Eichel by Del Monte Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin J. Eichel in Support)(Sicalides, Barbara) (jpp).
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1931 ORDER granting motions for Class Certification (ECF Nos. #1130 , #1140 , #1143 ) Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/30/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1930 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1926 Ex Parte MOTION re #1699 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1) Defendants' Ex Parte Motion to Modify Case Schedule filed by Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.). (Roberti, John) (jpp).
July 26, 2019 Filing 1929 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1926 Ex Parte MOTION re #1699 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1) Defendants' Ex Parte Motion to Modify Case Schedule filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Lebsock, Christopher) (jpp).
July 26, 2019 Filing 1928 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Wegmans Food Markets, Inc. of COSI Defendants. (Nussbaum, Linda) (jpp).
July 26, 2019 Filing 1927 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Krasdale Foods, Inc. of COSI Defendants. (Nussbaum, Linda) (jpp).
July 25, 2019 Filing 1926 Ex Parte MOTION re #1699 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1) Defendants' Ex Parte Motion to Modify Case Schedule by Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Roberti)(Roberti, John) (jpp).
July 17, 2019 Filing 1925 NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation by Nay Alidad, Galyna Andrusyshyn, Robert Benjamin, Barbara Buenning, Michael Buff, Lisa Burr, Steven M. Colberg, Larry Demonaco, Danielle Greenberg, Sheryl Haley, Lisa Hall, Tya Hughes, Blair Hysni, Marissa Jacobus, Michael Juetten, Dwayne Kennedy, Gabrielle Kurdt, Carla Lown, Ellen Pinto, Erica Pruess, Robby Reed, Ramon Ruiz, Seth Salenger, Harold Stafford, Dennis Yelvington (Stewart, Dennis) (jpp).
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1924 ORDER Granting #1922 Joint Motion For Stipulation Holding Deadlines in Abeyance as to Tri-Union Seafoods LLC and Thai Union Group PCL. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by Plaintiffs and the COSI Defendants that all case schedules and deadlines in the above-captioned actions shall be held in abeyance as to the COSI Defendants only and shall be revised as specified above in the event that the above-captioned cases are not dismissed as to the COSI Defendants.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 07/10/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mme)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1923 ORDER Granting #1921 Joint Motion for Stipulation Holding Deadlines in Abeyance as to Tri-Union Seafoods LLC and Thai Union Group. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by Plaintiffs and the COSIDefendants that all case schedules and deadlines in the above-captioned actions shall beheld in abeyance as to the COSI Defendants only and shall be revised as specified abovein the event that the above-captioned cases are not dismissed as to the COSI Defendants.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 07/10/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mme)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1922 Joint MOTION for Stipulation Holding Deadlines in Abeyance as to Tri-Union Seafoods LLC and Thai Union Group PCL (Direct Purchaser Actions) by Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC. (Roberti, John) (mme).
July 3, 2019 Filing 1921 Joint MOTION for Stipulation Holding Deadlines in Abeyance as to Tri-Union Seafoods LLC and Thai Union Group PCL (Indirect Purchaser Actions) by Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC. (Roberti, John) (mme).
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1920 ORDER granting #1919 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Joint Motion(s) for Determination of Discovery Dispute(s) Concerning Winn-Dixie Plaintiffs' Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Contention Interrogatories. Good cause appearing, the time within which the parties must file any joint motion for determination of the identified discovery disputes is extended to July 12, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 6/21/19. (no document attached) (Dembin, Mitchell)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1919 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Joint Motion(s) for Determination of Discovery Dispute(s) Concerning Winn-Dixie Plaintiffs' Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Contention Interrogatories by Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.). (Roberti, John) (jpp).
June 18, 2019 Filing 1918 NOTICE of Appearance Notice of Special Appearance (Paris, Adam) (jpp).
June 10, 2019 Filing 1917 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Krasdale Foods, Inc. of StarKist Defendants (Nussbaum, Linda) (jpp).
June 10, 2019 Filing 1916 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Wegmans Food Markets, Inc. of StarKist Defendants (Nussbaum, Linda) (jpp).
June 7, 2019 Filing 1915 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sam's East, Inc., Sam's West, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Against Bumble Bee Foods LLC and Lion Entities Defendants (Manne, Neal) (jpp).
June 5, 2019 Filing 1914 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. of StarKist Defendants only (Garcia, Lisa) (jpp).
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1913 ORDER granting #1911 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Joint Motion(s) for Determination of Discovery Dispute(s) Concerning Winn-Dixie Plaintiffs' Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Contention Interrogatories. Good cause appearing, the deadline to file a joint motion regarding the identified discovery dispute is extended to June 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 6/5/19. (no document attached) (Dembin, Mitchell)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1912 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Affiliated Foods Plaintiffs of the StarKist Defendants (King, Laurence) (jpp).
May 31, 2019 Filing 1911 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Joint Motion(s) for Determination of Discovery Dispute(s) Concerning Winn-Dixie Plaintiffs' Supplemental Responses and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Contention Interrogatories by Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.). (Roberti, John) (jpp).
May 24, 2019 Filing 1910 MOTION for Settlement Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement with Tri-Union Seafoods LLC D/B/A Chicken of the Sea International and Thai Union Group PCL and Provisional Certification of Settlement Class by A-1 Diner, Capitol Hill Supermarket, Confetti's Ice Cream Shoppe, Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc., Francis T Enterprises, Groucho's Deli of Five Points, LLC, Groucho's Deli of Raleigh, Maquoketa Care Center, Rushin Gold, LLC, SIMON-HINDI, LLC, Sandee's Catering, Thyme Cafe & Market, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement with Defendants Tri-Union Seafoods LLC D/B/A Chicken of the Sea International and Thai Union Group PCL and Provisional Certification of Settlement Class, #2 Exhibit A)(Finley, Alec) (jpp).
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1909 ORDER granting #1908 Joint Motion and stipulation for dismissal with prejudice of all claims by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. against Tri-Union Seafoods LLC and Thai Union Group PCL. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/21/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1908 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendants Tri-Union Seafoods LLC and Thai Union Group PCL by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Garcia, Lisa) (jpp).
May 6, 2019 Filing 1907 NOTICE (Defendants' Notice of Withdrawal of #1862 Ex Parte Application to Modify Case Schedule by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company (Lee, Belinda) (jpp).
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1905 ORDER on #1882 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. As presented in this Joint Motion, Plaintiff CFPS motion to compel production of attorney-client communications and work-product is DENIED. Plaintiffs DPPS, DAPS, and EPPS motion to compel additional testimony also is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 5/6/19. (Dembin, Mitchell)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1904 ORDER granting #1880 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Good cause appearing, a redacted version of the lodged documents having been filed publicly #1882 , the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 5/6/19. (no document attached) (Dembin, Mitchell)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1903 ORDER granting #1895 Joint Motion for dismissal for dismissal with prejudice of all claims by SuperValu, Associated Grocers of Florida, and Unified Grocers against Defendants StarKist Co. and Dongwon Industries Co.. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/24/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1902 ORDER granting #1894 Joint Motion and stipulation for dismissal with prejudice of all claims by Super Store Industries against Defendants StarKist Co. and Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd.. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/24/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1901 ORDER granting #1893 Joint Motion and stipulation for dismissal with prejudice of all claims by Publix Super Markets, Inc. and Wakefern Food Corp. against Defendants StarKist Co. and Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/24/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1900 ORDER granting #1892 Joint Motion and stipulation for dismissal with prejudice of all claims by Moran Foods, LLC against Defendants StarKist Co. and Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd.. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/24/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1899 ORDER granting #1891 Joint and stipulation for dismissal with prejudice of all claims by Meijer, Inc. and Meijer Distribution, Inc. against Defendants StarKist Co. and Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd.. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/24/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1898 ORDER granting #1896 Joint Motion and stipulation for dismissal with prejudice of all claims by the Kroger Plaintiffs against Del Monte Corporation. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/24/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1897 ORDER granting #1890 Join Motion and stipulation for dismissal with prejudice of all claims by Dollar General Corporation and Dolgencorp, LLC against Defendants StarKist Co. and Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/24/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1896 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice Against Del Monte Corporation by Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Delhaize America, LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co.. (Blechman, William) (jpp).
April 19, 2019 Filing 1895 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice Against Starkist Defendants by Associated Grocers of Florida, Inc., SuperValu Inc., Unified Grocers, Inc.. (Germaine, David) (jpp).
April 19, 2019 Filing 1894 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice Against Starkist Defendants by Super Store Industries. (Germaine, David) (jpp).
April 19, 2019 Filing 1893 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice Against Starkist Defendants by Publix Super Markets, Inc., Wakefern Food Corp.. (Germaine, David) (jpp).
April 19, 2019 Filing 1892 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice Against Starkist Defendants by Moran Foods, LLC. (Germaine, David) (jpp).
April 19, 2019 Filing 1891 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice Against Starkist Defendants by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. (Germaine, David) (jpp).
April 19, 2019 Filing 1890 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice Against Starkist Defendants by Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation. (Germaine, David) (jpp).
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1889 ORDER granting #1888 Joint Motion and Stipulation for dismissal with prejudice of all claims by the Kroger Plaintiffs against StarKist Co. and Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd.. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/10/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1888 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party and Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice Against StarKist Defendants by Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Delhaize America, LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co.. (Blechman, William) (jpp).
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1886 ORDER Granting #1879 Joint Motion and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. The Court GRANTS the joint motion and DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE all claims by Target Corporation against StarKist Co., Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., and Del Monte Corporation. As stipulated, the parties shall bear their respective fees and costs and all documents filed under seal will remain under seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/4/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1885 ORDER Granting #1878 Joint Motion and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. The Court GRANTS the joint motion and DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE all claims by US Foods, Inc. against StarKist Co., Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., and Del Monte Corporation. As stipulated, the parties shall bear their respective fees and costs and all documents filed under seal will remain under seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/4/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1887 ORDER Granting #1883 Joint Motion and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. The Court GRANTS the joint motion and DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE all claims by Target Corporation against Bumble Bee Foods, LLC. As stipulated, the parties shall bear their respective fees and costs, and all documents filed under seal will remain under seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/4/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1884 ORDER Granting #1877 Joint Motion and Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. The Court GRANTS the joint motion and DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE all claims by Sysco Corporation against StarKist Co., Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., and Del Monte Corporation. As stipulated, the parties shall bear their respective fees and costs and all documents filed under seal will remain under seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/4/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1883 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Stipulation of Dismissal between Plaintiff Target and Defendant Bumble Bee by Target Corporation. (Michaelson, Andrew)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1882 Joint MOTION to Compel Production of Attorney-Client Communications and Attorney Work Product, and DPPs' DAPs' and EPPs' Motion to Compel Testimony by A-1 Diner, Capitol Hill Supermarket, Confetti's Ice Cream Shoppe, Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc., Francis T Enterprises, Groucho's Deli of Five Points, LLC, Groucho's Deli of Raleigh, Maquoketa Care Center, Rushin Gold, LLC, SIMON-HINDI, LLC, Sandee's Catering, Thyme Cafe & Market, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of C. Hudson, #2 Exhibit Slipsheet for Exhibit 1 to Declaration of C. Hudson, #3 Exhibit Slipsheet for Exhibit 2 to Declaration of C. Hudson, #4 Declaration Declaration of C. Bower, #5 Exhibit Slipsheet for Exhibit 1 to Declaration of C. Bower, #6 Declaration Declaration of R. Meece)(Hudson, Christian)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1881 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1880 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hudson, Christian) (aef).
April 3, 2019 Filing 1880 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hudson, Christian) (aef).
April 2, 2019 Filing 1879 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Stipulation of Dismissal between Plaintiff Target and the StarKist Defendants by Target Corporation. (Gant, Scott) (tcf).
April 2, 2019 Filing 1878 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Stipulation of Dismissal between Plaintiff US Foods and the StarKist Defendants by US Foods, Inc.. (Gant, Scott) (tcf).
April 2, 2019 Filing 1877 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Stipulation of Dismissal between Plaintiff Sysco and the StarKist Defendants by Sysco Corporation. (Gant, Scott) (tcf).
March 27, 2019 Filing 1876 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jill M. Manning (Manning, Jill) (jpp).
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1875 ORDER granting #1874 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. If the Parties are unable to reach an agreement concerning a deposition of Jill Irvin, or an alternative thereto, the Parties shall file any joint motion for determination of discovery dispute by April 15, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 3/26/19. (no document attached) (Dembin, Mitchell)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1874 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion Determination of Discovery Dispute by Affiliated Foods Plaintiffs. (King, Laurence) (jpp).
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1873 ORDER granting #1866 Joint and Stipulation for dismissal with prejudice of claims against Tri-Union Seafoods LLC and Thai Union Group PCL. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/22/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1872 ORDER granting #1868 Joint Motion and Stipulation for Dismissal with prejudice of claims against Tri-Unoin Seafoods LLC and Thai Union Group PCL. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/22/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1871 ORDER granting #1867 Joint Motion and Stipulation for dismissal with prejudice of claims against Tri-Union Seafoods LLC and Thai Union Group PCL. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/22/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service). Modified on 3/26/2019 to replace image, nef resent. (jpp).
March 22, 2019 Filing 1870 REPLY - Other re #1869 Response in Opposition to Motion, #1865 Response to Motion, Reply in support of ex parte motion to modify case schedule #1862 filed by Dongwon Industries Co. Ltd, Starkist Company. (Lee, Belinda) (jpp).
March 21, 2019 Filing 1869 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1862 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Modify Case Schedule #1699 filed by Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Delhaize America, LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Blechman, William) (jpp).
March 21, 2019 Filing 1868 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Stipulation of Dismissal between Plaintiff Target and Defendant Chicken of the Sea by Target Corporation. (Gant, Scott) (jpp).
March 21, 2019 Filing 1867 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Stipulation of Dismissal between Plaintiff Sysco and Defendant Chicken of the Sea by US Foods, Inc. by Sysco Corporation. (Gant, Scott) (jpp).
March 21, 2019 Filing 1866 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Stipulation of Dismissal between Plaintiff US Foods and Defendant Chicken of the Sea by US Foods, Inc. by US Foods, Inc.. (Gant, Scott) (jpp).
March 20, 2019 Filing 1865 RESPONSE to Motion re #1862 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Modify Case Schedule #1699 (Class Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Schedule) filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Lebsock, Christopher) (jpp).
March 19, 2019 Filing 1864 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jason S Hartley (Hartley, Jason) (jpp).
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1863 ORDER granting #1861 Motion to Withdraw appearance of counsel Zacharaiah A. Tafoya as Attorney for Defendants Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP, and Big Catch Cayman LP. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/18/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1862 WITHDRAWN PER #1907 - Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Modify Case Schedule #1699 by Dongwon Industries Co. Ltd, Starkist Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Belinda S Lee)(Lee, Belinda) (jpp).
March 15, 2019 Filing 1861 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Big Catch Cayman LP, Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zachariah A. Tafoya)(Tafoya, Zachariah) (jpp).
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1860 ORDER granting #1853 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File a Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. Good cause appearing, if the Parties are unable to resolve their disputes concerning the 30(b)(6) deposition of Alex Lee, the Parties shall file any joint motion(s) for determination of discovery dispute(s) by April 15, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 3/6/19. (no document attached) (Dembin, Mitchell)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1859 ORDER granting #1847 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs' Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Admission. Good cause appearing, the time within which the parties must bring the remnants of this dispute before the Court by joint motion is extended to March 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 3/6/19. (no document attached) (Dembin, Mitchell)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1858 ORDER finding as moot #1843 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories and Requests for Admission. Having requested until February 26, 2019, to bring the remnants of the underlying dispute before the Court, and no such motion having been filed, the Court finds this motion moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 3/6/19. (no document attached) (Dembin, Mitchell)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1857 ORDER finding as moot #1842 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning Direct Action Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories and Requests for Admission. Having requested until March 1, 2019, to bring the remnants of the underlying dispute before the Court, and no such motion having been filed, the Court finds this motion moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 3/6/19. (no document attached) (Dembin, Mitchell)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1856 ORDER finding as moot #1841 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion For Determination Of Discovery Dispute Concerning Affiliated Foods Midwest Cooperative Inc.S Objections And Responses To Defendants Interrogatories And Requests For Admission. The parties requested until February 28, 2019, to bring the remnants of the underlying dispute to the Court. Having not filed a joint motion to determine the discovery dispute by then, the Court finds this motion moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 3/6/19. (no document attached) (Dembin, Mitchell)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1855 ORDER finding as moot #1833 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning Direct Action Plaintiff CVS Pharmacy Inc.'s Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories and Requests for Admission. Having requested an extension of time to February 28, 2019, to present the underlying dispute to the Court, and no discovery dispute motion having been filed, this Court finds this motion moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 3/6/19. (no document attached) (Dembin, Mitchell)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1854 ORDER granting #1832 Joint Motion for Extension of Certain Discovery Deadlines. Good cause appearing: 1. By March 1, 2019, AFM will serve any initial expert reports and produce within three (3) days their experts supporting material, including backup materials. 2. By May 24, 2019, Defendants will serve any opposition expert reports to AFMs initial expert report(s) and produce within three (3) days their experts supporting material, including backup materials. 3. The remaining deadlines in the case remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 3/6/19. (no document attached) (Dembin, Mitchell)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1853 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Any Joint Motions for Determination of Discovery Disputes by Bumble Bee Foods LLC. (Benson, Craig) (jpp).
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1852 ORDER granting #1850 Motion to Substitute counsel. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/04/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1851 ORDER granting #1849 Motion to Substitute counsel. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/04/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1850 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Thyme Cafe & Market, Inc.. (Finley, Alec) (jpp).
March 1, 2019 Filing 1849 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by SIMON-HINDI, LLC. (Finley, Alec) (jpp).
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1848 ORDER granting #1846 Joint Motion and Stipulation for dismissal with prejudice of U.S. Foods' claims against Bumble Bee Foods, LLC. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/26/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1847 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs' Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Admission by Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.). (Roberti, John) (jpp).
February 25, 2019 Filing 1846 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Stipulation of Dismissal between Plaintiff US Foods and Defendant Bumble Bee by US Foods, Inc.. (Gant, Scott) (jpp).
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1845 ORDER granting #1844 Motion to Withdraw appearance of Laila Arand as counsel for Defendant Bumble Bee Foods, LLC. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/22/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1844 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bumble Bee Foods LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laila Arand)(Arand, Laila) (jpp).
February 15, 2019 Filing 1843 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories and Requests for Admission by Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.). (Roberti, John) (jpp).
February 15, 2019 Filing 1842 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning Direct Action Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories and Requests for Admission by Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.). (Roberti, John) (jpp).
February 15, 2019 Filing 1841 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion For Determination Of Discovery Dispute Concerning Affiliated Foods Midwest Cooperative Inc.S Objections And Responses To Defendants Interrogatories And Requests For Admission by Del Monte Corporation. (Sicalides, Barbara) (jpp).
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1840 ORDER granting #1836 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for determination of discovery dispute to on or before 2/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 2/15/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1839 ORDER granting #1828 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for determination of discovery dispute to on or before 2/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 2/15/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1838 ORDER granting #1835 Joint Motion for dismissal with prejudice of Plaintiff Sysco Corporation and Defendant Bumble Bee Foods, LLC. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/15/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) CC: MDL Panel(jpp)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1837 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Starkist Company with Prejudice as to Claims of Plaintiff Brian Anthony Reo (Yates, Christopher) (jpp).
February 14, 2019 Filing 1836 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning Winn-Dixie Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories and Requests for Admission by Bumble Bee Foods LLC. (Parikh, Michelle) (jpp).
February 13, 2019 Filing 1835 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Stipulation of Dismissal between Plaintiff Sysco and Defendant Bumble Bee by Sysco Corporation. (Gant, Scott)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1834 ORDER granting #1831 Motion to Substitute Attorney Patrick J. Stueve in place of Laurence D. King for Plaintiff Affiliated Foods Midwest Cooperative Inc. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/13/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1833 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning Direct Action Plaintiff CVS Pharmacy Inc.'s Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories and Requests for Admission by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Yates, Christopher) (jpp).
February 13, 2019 Filing 1832 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Affiliated Foods Midwest Cooperative, Inc.. (Stueve, Patrick) (jpp).
February 12, 2019 Filing 1831 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Affiliated Foods Midwest Cooperative, Inc.. (Stueve, Patrick) (jpp).
February 11, 2019 Filing 1830 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re # 1807 Pro Hac Vice Approved. Mail sent to Alan Arnold. (mdc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1829 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re # 1807 Pro Hac Vice Approved. Mail sent to Roger Sachar. (mdc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1828 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning EPPs' Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories and Requests for Admission by Bumble Bee Foods LLC. (Parikh, Michelle) (jpp).
February 7, 2019 Filing 1826 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sam's East, Inc., Sam's West, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Against Starkist Defendants (Manne, Neal) (acc).
February 5, 2019 Filing 1825 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert J. Gralewski, Jr (Gralewski, Robert) (jpp).
February 4, 2019 Filing 1827 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1802 Transcript #1801 Transcript #1803 Transcript. Mail sent to Roger Sachar. (acc)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1824 ORDER granting #1823 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Theodore B. Bell as Attorney. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/04/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1823 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion to Withdraw Theodore B. Bell as an Attorney for the Indirect Purchaser End Payer Plaintiffs and Request to be Removed from the CM/ECF Electronic Service List by Louise Adams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Betsy C. Manifold, #2 Proof of Service)(Manifold, Betsy) (jpp).
February 1, 2019 Filing 1822 NOTICE of Change of Address by Betsy Carol Manifold (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Manifold, Betsy) (jpp).
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1817 ORDER: (1) Approving Joint Stipulation Re Exhibits Admitted into the Record in January 14-16, 2019 Evidentiary Hearing; and (2) Granting #1785 Motion to File Certain Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/31/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1816 ORDER vacating hearing on #1631 motion to dismiss set for 2/14/2019. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/31/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1815 ORDER granting #1814 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dana Statsky Smith terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/29/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjm)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1814 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney NOTICE OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW DANA STATSKY SMITH AS COUNSEL AND REMOVE DANA STATSKY SMITH FROM CM/ECF AND ELECTRONIC SERVICE LIST by Benjamin Foods LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Seidman, Joseph) (sjm).
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1813 ORDER Approving #1811 Stipulation to Dismiss Claims. The Parties agree that, within thirty days of the entry of the Court's order on class certification, EPPs and Del Monte will file a joint motion and dismissal of Del Monte from the action, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(iii). The Parties agree, and the dismissal will state, that each of the Parties will bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/28/2019. (rmc)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1812 ORDER Granting Joint Motions for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute re #1779 , #1780 , #1782 , #1783 , #1784 , #1794 , #1795 , #1796 , #1797 , #1798 , #1799 , #1804 , #1805 , #1806 and #1808 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 1/25/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1811 Joint MOTION to Dismiss /Stipulation Re: Dismissal of Class Action Claims of Indirect Purchaser End Payor Plaintiffs as Against Defendant Del Monte Corporation by Del Monte Corporation. (Sicalides, Barbara) (rmc).
January 24, 2019 Filing 1810 NOTICE of Recent Authority by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lee, Belinda)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1809 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR PROTECTIVE ORDERS REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL MATERIALECF Nos. #1765 , #1768 , #1769 , #1770 , #1771 , #1773 . Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/24/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjm)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1808 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion For Determination Of Discovery Dispute Concerning Bumble Bees Responses And Objections To Plaintiffs Interrogatories And Requests For Admission by Sam's East, Inc., Sam's West, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Manne, Neal) (sjm).
January 23, 2019 Filing 1807 PRO HAC APPROVED re #1800 : Joseph R. Seidman, Jr appearing for Plaintiff Benjamin Foods LLC. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (no document attached) (mdc)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1806 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Requests for Production by Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Delhaize America, LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co.. (Blechman, William) (jpp).
January 23, 2019 Filing 1805 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories and Requests for Admission by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Yates, Christopher) (jpp).
January 23, 2019 Filing 1804 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning the Kroger Co. Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories and Requests for Admission by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Yates, Christopher) (jpp).
January 23, 2019 Filing 1803 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Volume 3 of 3) held on 1/16/2019 before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Court Reporters/Transcribers: Frank J. Rangus and Gayle Wakefield.. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 2/13/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/23/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of Filing of Official Transcript only.) (akr)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1802 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Volume 2 of 3) held on 1/15/2019 before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Court Reporters/Transcribers: Frank J. Rangus and Gayle Wakefield. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 2/13/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/23/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of Filing of Official Transcript only.) (akr)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1801 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Volume 1 of 3) held on 1/14/2019 before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Court Reporters/Transcribers: Frank J. Rangus and Gayle Wakefield. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 2/13/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/23/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of Filing of Official Transcript only.) (akr)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1800 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-12117944.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Seidman, Joseph) (mdc)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1799 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning Winn-Dixie Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories and Requests for Admission by Bumble Bee Foods LLC. (Parikh, Michelle) (jpp).
January 23, 2019 Filing 1798 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendant's Interrogatories and Requests for Admission by Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.). (Roberti, John) (jpp).
January 23, 2019 Filing 1797 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories and Requests for Admission by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Yates, Christopher) (jpp).
January 23, 2019 Filing 1796 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories and Requests for Admission by Del Monte Corporation. (Sicalides, Barbara) (jpp).
January 23, 2019 Filing 1795 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning Direct Action Plaintiff CVS Pharmacy Inc.'s Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories and Requests for Admission by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Yates, Christopher) (jpp).
January 22, 2019 Filing 1794 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning EPPs' Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories and Requests for Admission by Bumble Bee Foods LLC. (Parikh, Michelle) (jpp).
January 21, 2019 Filing 1793 DECLARATION re #1792 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, #1785 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal by Plaintiffs A-1 Diner, Capitol Hill Supermarket, Confetti's Ice Cream Shoppe, Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc., Francis T Enterprises, Groucho's Deli of Five Points, LLC, Groucho's Deli of Raleigh, Maquoketa Care Center, Rushin Gold, LLC, SIMON-HINDI, LLC, Sandee's Catering, Thyme Cafe & Market, Inc.. (Finley, Alec) (jpp).
January 21, 2019 Filing 1792 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 1/31/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1785 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Finley, Alec) (aef). Modified on 2/1/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
January 21, 2019 Filing 1791 RESPONSE re #1785 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal and Stipulation for Proposed Order re Exhibits Admitted into the Record in January 14-16, 2019 Evidentiary Hearing on Class Plaintiffs' Motions to Certify Class filed by Bumble Bee Foods LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig A. Benson, #2 Exhibit DX DPP 4, #3 Exhibit DX DPP 5, #4 Exhibit DX DPP 7, #5 Exhibit DX DPP 8, #6 Exhibit DX DPP 9, #7 Exhibit DX DPP 10, #8 Exhibit DX EPP 4, #9 Exhibit DX EPP 5, #10 Exhibit DX EPP 9, #11 Exhibit DX EPP 10, #12 Exhibit DX EPP 11, #13 Exhibit DX EPP 12, #14 Exhibit DX EPP 13, #15 Exhibit DX CFP 4, #16 Exhibit DX CFP 5, #17 Exhibit DX CFP 6, #18 Exhibit DX CFP 7, #19 Exhibit DX CFP 9)(Benson, Craig) (jpp).
January 21, 2019 Filing 1790 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 1/31/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1785 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Benson, Craig) (aef). Modified on 2/1/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
January 21, 2019 Filing 1789 Exhibit List [Redacted] End Payer Plaintiffs' Submission of [Proposed] Exhibits Admitted into the Record at January 14-16, 2019 Evidentiary Hearing on Class Plaintiffs' Motions to Certify Class (ECF Nos. 1130, 1143, 1140) Pursuant to Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order (ECF No. 1777) by Louise Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 11, #3 Exhibit 12, #4 Exhibit 14, #5 Exhibit 15, #6 Exhibit 16 (Redacted), #7 Exhibit 17 (Redacted), #8 Exhibit 19 (Redacted), #9 Exhibit 42 (Redacted), #10 Proof of Service)(Manifold, Betsy) (jpp).
January 21, 2019 Filing 1788 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 1/31/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1785 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Manifold, Betsy) (aef). Modified on 2/1/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
January 21, 2019 Filing 1787 DECLARATION re #1786 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, #1785 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Declaration of Samantha J. Stein filed in Support of Motion for Class Certification and Testimony at Evidentiary Hearing) by Plaintiff Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Stein, Samantha) (jpp).
January 21, 2019 Filing 1786 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 1/31/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1785 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Stein, Samantha) (aef). Modified on 2/1/2019 to add filed date of lodgment (aef).
January 21, 2019 Filing 1785 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Manifold, Betsy) (aef).
January 18, 2019 Filing 1784 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning Target's Responses to Defendant's Interrogatories and Requests for Admission by Bumble Bee Foods LLC. (Parikh, Michelle)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1783 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning W. Lee Flowers & Co., Inc.'s Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories and Requests for Admission by Bumble Bee Foods LLC. (Parikh, Michelle)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1782 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning the Affiliated Foods Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories and Requests for Admission by Del Monte Corporation. (Sicalides, Barbara)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1781 ORDER granting #1776 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Amended Complaint. Dongwon Industries Co. Ltd and Starkist response due on or before 2/18/2019. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/18/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1780 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning Walmart's Responses to Defendant's Interrogatories and Requests for Admission by Bumble Bee Foods LLC. (Parikh, Michelle) (jpp).
January 17, 2019 Filing 1779 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning US Foods' and Sysco's Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories and Requests for Admission by Bumble Bee Foods LLC. (Parikh, Michelle) (jpp).
January 16, 2019 Filing 1778 Joint Witness List (acr)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1777 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Janis L. Sammartino: (3rd/Final Day) Hearing on Motion to Certify Class #1143 held; Matter taken under submission. Parties to submit Stipulation and Proposed Order re Admitted Exhibits by 1/21/2019 (Court Reporter/ECR Gayle Wakefield (AM) and Frank Rangus (PM) / CRD A Ramos / Plaintiff Attorney Jonathan Cuneo / Defendant Attorney Belinda Lee, Ken Gallo & John Roberti) (no document attached) (acr)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1776 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Wal-Mart Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Lynch, Niall) (jpp).
January 15, 2019 Filing 1775 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Janis L. Sammartino: (Day 2) Hearing on Motion to Certify Class #1130 held; Matter continued to 1/16/2019 at 9:00 AM before Judge Janis L. Sammartino (Court Reporter/ECR Gayle Wakefield (AM) & Frank Rangus (PM) / CRD A Ramos / Plaintiff Attorney Betsy Manifold, Thomas Burt & Dennis Stewart / Defendant Attorney Belinda Lee, Ken Gallo & William Michael) (no document attached) (acr)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1774 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Janis L. Sammartino: (Day 1) Hearing on Motion to Certify Class #1140 Held. Matter continued to 11/15/2019 at 9:00 AM before Judge Janis L. Sammartino (Court Reporter/ECR Frank Rangus (AM) & Gayle Wakefield (PM) / CRD A Ramos / Plaintiff Attorney Bonny Sweeney & Chris Lebsock / Defendant Attorney Belinda Lee, Ashley Bauer and Ken Gallo) (no document attached) (acr)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1773 MOTION for Protective Order regarding certain Confidential Materials to be used at Evidentiary Hearing on Motions for Class Certification by Associated Grocers of Florida, Inc., Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Moran Foods, LLC, Publix Super Markets, Inc., Super Store Industries, SuperValu Inc., Unified Grocers, Inc., Wakefern Food Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Germaine, David) (jpp).
January 14, 2019 Filing 1772 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Delhaize America, LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co. re #1768 MOTION for Protective Order of Materials to be used at Evidentiary Hearing on Motions for Class Certification . (Blechman, William) (jpp).
January 11, 2019 Filing 1771 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Certain Target Corp. Materials to be Used at Evidentiary Hearing on Motions for Class Certification by Target Corporation. (Michaelson, Andrew) (jpp).
January 11, 2019 Filing 1770 MOTION for Protective Order by Non-Party Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric P. Tuttle, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Tuttle, Eric)Attorney Eric P. Tuttle added to party Non-Party Costco Wholesale Corporation(pty:misc) (jpp).
January 11, 2019 Filing 1769 MOTION for Protective Order for Materials to be Used at Evidentiary Hearing on Motions for Class Certification by Giant Eagle, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Moira Cain-Mannix in Support of Giant Eagle's Motion for Protection, #2 Declaration of Timothy Tackett in Support of Giant Eagle's Motion for Protection)(King, Laurence)(jpp).
January 11, 2019 Filing 1768 MOTION for Protective Order of Materials to be used at Evidentiary Hearing on Motions for Class Certification by Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Delhaize America, LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Kroger Declaration, #2 Exhibit Albertsons Declaration, #3 Exhibit Hy-Vee Declaration, #4 Exhibit HEB Declaration, #5 Exhibit Ahold Declaration)(Blechman, William) (jpp).
January 11, 2019 Filing 1767 RESPONSE re #1762 Order Response of the Plaintiff Class Action Tracks to Court Order of January 8, 2019 filed by Louise Adams. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Manifold, Betsy) (jpp).
January 11, 2019 Filing 1766 RESPONSE re #1762 Order Defendant's Response to the Court's Order Re Evidentiary Hearing on Motions for Class Certification filed by Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC. (Fitzpatrick, Brian) (jpp).
January 10, 2019 Filing 1765 MOTION for Protection of Materials to be Used at Evidentiary Hearing on Motions for Class Certification re #1762 Order by Sam's East, Inc., Sam's West, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Catriona Lavery, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Declaration Russell Boyle)(Manne, Neal) (jpp).
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1764 ORDER granting #1761 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File re: Discovery Dispute (Target). Good cause appearing, the deadline to file a joint motion regarding the discovery dispute arising from the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of Target is extended to January 31, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 1/10/19. (no document attached) (Dembin, Mitchell)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1763 RESPONSE re #1762 Order DAPs' Response to Court's Order Re: Evidentiary Hearing on Motions for Class Certification filed by Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Delhaize America, LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co.. (Blechman, William)(jpp).
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1762 ORDER re: evidentiary hearing on motions for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/08/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1761 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File re: Discovery Dispute (Target) by Bumble Bee Foods LLC. (Benson, Craig) (jpp).
January 4, 2019 Filing 1760 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1631 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed Consolidated Motion to Dismiss the Complaints of EPPs, CFPs, DPPs, DAPs, and The Cherokee Nation filed by Big Catch Cayman LP, Lion Capital LLP. (Paris, Adam) (jpp).
January 4, 2019 Filing 1759 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1758 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Paris, Adam) (aef).
January 4, 2019 Filing 1758 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Paris, Adam) (aef).
January 3, 2019 Filing 1757 NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation by Associated Grocers of Florida, Inc., Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Moran Foods, LLC, Publix Super Markets, Inc., Super Store Industries, SuperValu Inc., Unified Grocers, Inc., Wakefern Food Corp. (Vanek, Joseph)Attorney Joseph Michael Vanek added to party Associated Grocers of Florida, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph Michael Vanek added to party Dolgencorp, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph Michael Vanek added to party Dollar General Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph Michael Vanek added to party Moran Foods, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph Michael Vanek added to party Super Store Industries(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph Michael Vanek added to party SuperValu Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Joseph Michael Vanek added to party Unified Grocers, Inc.(pty:pla)
January 2, 2019 Filing 1756 ANSWER to Complaint of the SpartnNash Company by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd.(Bauer, Ashley) (acc).
January 2, 2019 Filing 1755 ANSWER to Complaint of the SpartnNash Company by Starkist Company.(Bauer, Ashley) (acc).
January 2, 2019 Filing 1754 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer to Complaint by Spartannash) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara) (acc).
January 2, 2019 Filing 1753 ANSWER to Complaint of SpartanNash Company by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth) (acc).
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1752 ORDER granting #1750 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File re: Discovery Dispute (Target). Good cause appearing, the parties may file a joint motion regarding the identified discovery dispute no later than January 11, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 12/28/18. (no document attached) (Dembin, Mitchell)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1751 ORDER granting #1748 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories to EPPs. Good cause appearing, any joint motion regarding the identified discovery dispute must be filed by January 23, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 12/28/18. (no document attached) (Dembin, Mitchell)
December 24, 2018 Filing 1750 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File re: Discovery Dispute (Target) by Bumble Bee Foods LLC. (Benson, Craig) (jpp).
December 24, 2018 Filing 1748 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Concerning Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories to EPPs by Bumble Bee Foods LLC. (Bial, Joseph) (jpp).
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1749 ORDER re Evidentiary Hearings on #1130 Motions for Class Certification. On 12/21/2018, Counsel for the Commercial Food Preparers, John Cuneo and Counsel for StarKist Co., Belinda Lee, contacted the Court telephonically to discuss rescheduling the upcoming hearings on the Motions for Class certification. In an attempt to best accommodate the all the parties involved, the Court will amend the hearing schedule as follows: End Payer Plaintiffs will now argue on 1/15/2019 and the Commercial Food Preparers will now argue on 1/16/2019. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/21/2018.(rmc)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1747 ORDER re: #1745 Clarification or Modification of Order. Defendants seek clarification of what types of demonstratives the Court intends for the parties to exchange in advance of the hearing. Defendants also request that the deadline to exchange any demonstratives be continued to 1/7/2019. Good cause appearing, the Court hereby orders that Section III of its Order (ECF No. 1742) is modified as follows. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/21/2018. (rmc)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1746 RESPONSE to Motion re #1745 Ex Parte MOTION to Clarify or Modify Order Class Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Clarification of Modification of this Court's December 17, 2018 Order filed by Louise Adams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Manifold, Betsy) (jpp).
December 20, 2018 Filing 1745 Ex Parte MOTION to Clarify or Modify Order by Dongwon Industries Co. Ltd, Starkist Company. (Lee, Belinda) (jpp).
December 18, 2018 Filing 1744 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Bumble Bee Foods LLC (Benson, Craig) (jpp).
December 18, 2018 Filing 1743 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Affiliated Foods Plaintiffs (King, Laurence) (jpp).
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1742 ORDER re: agenda for evidentiary hearing on motions for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/17/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1741 ORDER granting #1737 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. Good cause appearing, if the Parties are unable to resolve their disputes concerning Targets 30(b)(6) deposition, the Parties shall file any joint motion(s) for determination of discovery dispute(s) by January 4, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 12/13/18. (no document attached) (Dembin, Mitchell)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1740 ORDER granting #1739 Joint Motion for approval of Stipulation regarding briefing extension. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/13/2018. (jpp)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1739 Joint MOTION For Approval of Stipulation Regarding Briefing Extension by Big Catch Cayman LP, Lion Capital LLP. (Paris, Adam) (jpp).
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1738 ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Stephen Teti, re #1734 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/11/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1737 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File re: Discovery Dispute (Target) by Bumble Bee Foods LLC. (Benson, Craig) (jpp).
December 11, 2018 Filing 1736 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Bumble Bee Foods LLC re #1735 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File re: Discovery Dispute (Target) filed by Bumble Bee Foods LLC . (Benson, Craig)
December 11, 2018 Filing 1735 WITHDRAWN PER #1736 - Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File re: Discovery Dispute (Target) by Bumble Bee Foods LLC. (Benson, Craig) (jpp). Modified on 12/12/2018 to term motion, efiling withdrawn per 1735 (jpp).
December 10, 2018 Filing 1734 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11978699 - See #1731 .) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Teti, Stephen) Modified text on 12/10/2018 to add filing fee info. (mdc)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1733 NOTICE (Defendants' Proposed Agenda for Evidentiary Hearing on Class Certification Motions) by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company re #1719 Order on Motion to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the Courtroom, (Lee, Belinda) (jpp).
December 7, 2018 Filing 1732 NOTICE Class Plaintiffs' Proposed Agenda For Evidentiary Hearings On Motions For Class Certification by Benjamin Foods LLC, Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc., Piggly Wiggly Alabama Distributing Co., Inc., Trepco Imports and Distribution LTD re #1719 Order on Motion to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the Courtroom, (Lehmann, Michael) (jpp).
December 7, 2018 Filing 1731 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11978699.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Teti, Stephen) 12/7/2018 - Sent QC e-mail re missing signature. (mdc)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1730 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1525 MOTION to Dismiss Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint #1437 filed by Christopher D. Lischewski. (Peters, Elliot) (jpp).
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1726 ORDER Granting #1706 , #1714 , #1720 Motions to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/5/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1725 ORDER Vacating Hearing. Presently before the Court is Defendant Christopher Lischewski's Motion to Dismiss Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint, (ECF No. 1525). The Court HEREBY VACATES the hearing scheduled for 12/13/2018. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/5/2018.(acc)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1724 ORDER Continuing Hearing as to #1631 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed Consolidated Motion to Dismiss the Complaints of EPPs, CFPs, DPPs, DAPs, and The Cherokee Nation. Presently before the Court is Defendants Big Catch Caymen LLP and Lion Capital LLP's consolidated Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, (ECF No. 1631). On its own motion, the Court CONTINUES the hearing on the Motion to 2/14/2019, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 4D. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/5/2018.(acc)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1723 ORDER re deposition of John Sawyer. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/04/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1722 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1631 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed Consolidated Motion to Dismiss the Complaints of EPPs, CFPs, DPPs, DAPs, and The Cherokee Nation filed by Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Delhaize America, LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandon Floch, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #3 Affidavit of David Chivers and Materials Referenced - Part 1, #4 Affidavit of David Chivers and Materials Referenced - Part 2, #5 Affidavit of David Chivers and Materials Referenced - Part 3)(Blechman, William) (jpp).
December 3, 2018 Filing 1721 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1720 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Blechman, William) (aef).
December 3, 2018 Filing 1720 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Blechman, William) (aef).
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1719 ORDER granting #1658 Defendants' Motion for live testimony. The hearing on Plaintiffs Motions for Class Certification will now begin on 1/14/2019 at 9:00am. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/30/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1718 ORDER granting #1710 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Affiliated Foods Plaintiffs' Fourth Consolidated Amended Complaint. Tri-Union Seafoods LLC answer response due 1/2/2018. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/30/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1717 NOTICE of Appearance on Behalf of Bumble Bee Foods, LLC (Arand, Laila)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1716 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1714 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Stueve, Patrick) (aef).
November 29, 2018 Filing 1715 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1525 MOTION to Dismiss Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint #1437 filed by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.. (Stueve, Patrick)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1714 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Stueve, Patrick)(aef).
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1711 ORDER Granting #1654 , #1702 ) Motions to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/28/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1710 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1433 Amended Complaint, by Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.). (Roberti, John) (jpp).
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1709 ORDER granting #1701 Joint Motion for approval of stipulation regarding service of process and response to complaint. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/28/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1708 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1140 MOTION to Certify Class (Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Motion for Class Certification) filed by Benjamin Foods LLC, Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc., Piggly Wiggly Alabama Distributing Co., Inc., Trepco Imports and Distribution LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (Supplemental) of Samantha Stein, #2 Exhibit 76 (StarKist Plea Agreement), #3 Exhibit 77-79 (Filed Under Seal), #4 Declaration (Reply) of Russell W. Mangum III, Ph.D. (Filed Under Seal))(Lehmann, Michael) (jpp).
November 27, 2018 Filing 1707 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1706 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Lehmann, Michael) (aef).
November 27, 2018 Filing 1706 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Lehmann, Michael) (aef).
November 21, 2018 Filing 1705 NOTICE of Appearance on Behalf of Bumble Bee Foods, LLC (Sterling, Amanda) (jpp).
November 20, 2018 Filing 1704 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1130 MOTION to Certify Class End Payer Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification [Redacted] Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Further Support of Motion for Class Certification filed by Louise Adams. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 [Redacted] Declaration of Thomas H. Burt, #3 Declaration of Betsy C. Manifold, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Proof of Service)(Manifold, Betsy) (dlg).
November 20, 2018 Filing 1703 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1702 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Manifold, Betsy) (aef).
November 20, 2018 Filing 1702 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Manifold, Betsy) (aef).
November 20, 2018 Filing 1701 Joint MOTION for Approval of Stipulation Regarding Service of Process and Response to Complaint by Big Catch Cayman LP, Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP. (Paris, Adam) (dlg).
November 20, 2018 Filing 1700 REPLY - Other re #1658 Ex Parte MOTION to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the Courtroom and Present and Take Live Testimony filed by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Lee, Belinda)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1699 ORDER granting #1659 Joint Scheduling Proposal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/20/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1698 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of Bumble Bee Foods, LLC (Mebratu, Bethlehem)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1697 ANSWER to #1470 Amended Complaint,,, - Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1696 ANSWER to #1470 Amended Complaint,,, - Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by Starkist Company.(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1695 ANSWER to #1467 Amended Complaint - Krasdale Foods, Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1694 ANSWER to #1467 Amended Complaint - Krasdale Foods, Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint by Starkist Company.(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1693 ANSWER to #1466 Amended Complaint - Wegmans' Fourth Amended Complaint by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1692 ANSWER to #1466 Amended Complaint - Wegmans' Fourth Amended Complaint by Starkist Company.(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1691 ANSWER to #1461 Amended Complaint, - Indirect Purchaser End Payer Plaintiffs' Sixth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1690 ANSWER to #1461 Amended Complaint, - Indirect Purchaser End Payer Plaintiffs' Sixth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Starkist Company.(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1689 ANSWER to #1460 Amended Complaint,, - Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Fourth Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1688 ANSWER to #1460 Amended Complaint,, - Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Fourth Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Starkist Company.(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1687 ANSWER to #1454 Amended Complaint - Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1686 ANSWER to #1454 Amended Complaint - Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint by Starkist Company.(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1685 ANSWER to #1449 Amended Complaint, - Supervalu Inc. Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1684 ANSWER to #1449 Amended Complaint, - Supervalu Inc. Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Starkist Company.(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1683 ANSWER to #1448 Amended Complaint, - Super Store Industries' Second Amended Complaint by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1682 ANSWER to #1448 Amended Complaint, - Super Store Industries' Second Amended Complaint by Starkist Company.(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1681 ANSWER to #1447 Amended Complaint, - Moran Foods, LLC's Second Amended Complaint by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1680 ANSWER to #1447 Amended Complaint, - Moran Foods, LLC's Second Amended Complaint by Starkist Company.(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1679 ANSWER to #1446 Amended Complaint, - Dollar General Corporation Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1678 ANSWER to #1446 Amended Complaint, - Dollar General Corporation Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Starkist Company.(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1677 ANSWER to #1445 Amended Complaint, - Meijer, Inc. Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1676 ANSWER to #1445 Amended Complaint, - Meijer, Inc. Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by Starkist Company.(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1675 ANSWER to #1444 Amended Complaint, - Publix Super Markets, Inc. Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1674 ANSWER to #1444 Amended Complaint, - Publix Super Markets, Inc. Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by Starkist Company.(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1673 ANSWER to #1437 Amended Complaint, - Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1672 ANSWER to #1437 Amended Complaint, - Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint by Starkist Company.(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1671 ANSWER to #1433 Amended Complaint, - Affiliated Foods Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1670 ANSWER to #1433 Amended Complaint, - Affiliated Foods Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by Starkist Company.(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1669 ANSWER to #1432 Amended Complaint - W. Lee Flowers & Co., Inc.'s Third Amended Complaint by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1668 ANSWER to #1432 Amended Complaint - W. Lee Flowers & Co., Inc.'s Third Amended Complaint by Starkist Company.(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1667 ANSWER to #1427 Amended Complaint, - CVS Pharmacy, Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1666 ANSWER to #1427 Amended Complaint, - CVS Pharmacy, Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint by Starkist Company.(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1665 ANSWER to #1423 Amended Complaint, - Kroger Co. Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by Dongwon Industries Co. Ltd.(Bauer, Ashley)Attorney Ashley M. Bauer added to party Dongwon Industries Co. Ltd(pty:dft)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1664 ANSWER to #1423 Amended Complaint, - Kroger Co. Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by Starkist Company.(Bauer, Ashley)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1663 ORDER granting #1660 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Third Amended Complaint. StarKist Co. and Dongwon Industries Co. Ltd answers on or before 1/18/2019. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/19/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1662 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cherokee Nation, The (Anzidei, Rebecca) (jpp).
November 16, 2018 Filing 1661 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1658 Ex Parte MOTION to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the Courtroom and Present and Take Live Testimony - Class Plaintiffs' Joint Opposition filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Lehmann, Michael) (jpp).
November 16, 2018 Filing 1660 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Walmart Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Dongwon Industries Co. Ltd, Starkist Company. (Lynch, Niall)Attorney Niall E. Lynch added to party Dongwon Industries Co. Ltd(pty:dft) (jpp).
November 16, 2018 Filing 1659 Joint MOTION for Revised Scheduling Order by Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Delhaize America, LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co.. (Patton, Douglas)Attorney Douglas H Patton added to party Ahold U.S.A., Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Douglas H Patton added to party Delhaize America, LLC(pty:pla) (jpp).
November 15, 2018 Filing 1658 Ex Parte MOTION to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the Courtroom and Present and Take Live Testimony by Dongwon Industries Co. Ltd, Starkist Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Belinda S Lee)(Lee, Belinda) (jpp).
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1657 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Anthony T. Greene, re #1650 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/13/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1656 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1143 MOTION to Certify Class Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Lead Counsel filed by A-1 Diner, Capitol Hill Supermarket, Confetti's Ice Cream Shoppe, Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc., Francis T Enterprises, Groucho's Deli of Five Points, LLC, Groucho's Deli of Raleigh, Maquoketa Care Center, Rushin Gold, LLC, SIMON-HINDI, LLC, Sandee's Catering, Thyme Cafe & Market, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jonathan W. Cuneo, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11)(Finley, Alec)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1655 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1654 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Finley, Alec) (aef).
November 13, 2018 Filing 1654 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Finley, Alec)(aef).
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1653 ORDER finding as moot #1553 Ex Parte MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Cooperation with Respect to Scheduling Depositions and Related Document Productions. The Court having approved the parties' stipulations regarding this discovery dispute 1652 , this instant motion is moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 11/8/18. (no document attached) (Dembin, Mitchell)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1652 ORDER granting #1605 Joint MOTION to Resolve Pending Motion to Compel Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Cooperation with Respect to Scheduling Depositions and Related Document Productions. Good cause appearing, the Court will abide by and enforce the stipulations presented in the Joint Motion. The Court will deny as moot the underlying discovery dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 11/9/18. (no document attached)(Dembin, Mitchell)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1651 ORDER granting #1497 Joint MOTION for Order on Parties' Proposed Discovery Procedure Regarding Contention Interrogatories. Good cause appearing, the Court will enforce the parties' stipulation as provided in the Joint Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 11/8/18. (no document attached) (Dembin, Mitchell)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1650 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11879568.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Greene, Anthony) (mdc)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1649 ORDER granting #1647 Joint Motion to Strike Christopher D. Lischewski as a defendant from the Cherokee Nations Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/07/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1648 NOTICE of Change of Address by Solomon B Cera (Cera, Solomon) (jpp).
November 6, 2018 Filing 1647 Joint MOTION to Strike and Stipulation by Plaintiff the Cherokee Nation and Defendant Christopher D. Lischewski by Christopher D. Lischewski. (Hur, Benedict) (jpp).
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1646 ORDER granting #1584 Joint Motion for approval of Stipulation. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/06/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1645 ORDER granting #1560 Joint Motion for approval of Stipulation. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/06/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1644 ORDER granting #1559 Joint Motion to Dismiss CVS Pharmacy, Inc's claim for injunctive relief. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/06/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1639 ORDER Granting #1534 , #1540 , #1549 , #1629 Motions to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/5/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1638 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.) re #1600 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC . (Roberti, John) (jpp).
November 5, 2018 Filing 1637 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion for Leave to File Surreply by Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Delhaize America, LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co. re #1556 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply (Blechman, William) (jpp).
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1636 ORDER granting #1557 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to complaint. Tri-Union Seafoods LLC response to complaint due on or before 12/3/2018. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/05/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1635 ORDER granting #1552 Joint Motion for approval of stipulation. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/05/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1634 ORDER granting #1548 Motion for Leave to File over length brief. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/05/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1633 ORDER denying #1494 The United States' Motion to stay certain discovery. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/05/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1632 ORDER granting the United States' Motion to stay discovery (ECF Nos. #1365 , #1371 ). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/05/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1631 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed Consolidated Motion to Dismiss the Complaints of EPPs, CFPs, DPPs, DAPs, and The Cherokee Nation by Big Catch Cayman LP, Lion Capital LLP. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Adam S. Paris, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Paris, Adam) (jpp).
November 2, 2018 Filing 1630 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1629 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Paris, Adam) (aef).
November 2, 2018 Filing 1629 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Paris, Adam) (aef).
November 2, 2018 Filing 1628 ANSWER to #1466 Amended Complaint by Thai Union Group PCL.(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1627 ANSWER to #1466 Amended Complaint by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1626 ANSWER to #1444 Amended Complaint, by Thai Union Group PCL.(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1625 ANSWER to #1444 Amended Complaint, by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1624 ANSWER to #1432 Amended Complaint by Thai Union Group PCL.(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1623 ANSWER to #1432 Amended Complaint by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1622 ANSWER to #1449 Amended Complaint, by Thai Union Group PCL.(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1621 ANSWER to #1449 Amended Complaint, by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1620 ANSWER to #1454 Amended Complaint by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1619 ANSWER to #1454 Amended Complaint by Thai Union Group Public Company, Ltd..(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1618 ANSWER to #1448 Amended Complaint, by Thai Union Group PCL.(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1617 ANSWER to #1448 Amended Complaint, by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1616 ANSWER to #1447 Amended Complaint, by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1615 ANSWER to #1447 Amended Complaint, by Thai Union Group PCL.(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1614 ANSWER to #1445 Amended Complaint, by Thai Union Group PCL.(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1613 ANSWER to #1445 Amended Complaint, by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1612 ANSWER to #1423 Amended Complaint, by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1611 ANSWER to #1423 Amended Complaint, by Thai Union Group PCL.(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1610 ANSWER to #1466 Amended Complaint of Wegmans Food Markets, Inc. by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1609 ANSWER to #1454 Amended Complaint of the Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. Plaintiffs by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1608 ANSWER to #1467 Amended Complaint by Thai Union Group PCL.(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1607 ANSWER to #1432 Amended Complaint of W. Lee Flowers & Co., Inc. by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1606 ANSWER to Complaint (Corrected) Tri-Union Seafoods LLC d/b/a Chicken of the Sea's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Direct Purchaser Plaintiff Putative Class's Fourth Consolidated Complaint (Docket #1460) by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1605 Joint MOTION to Resolve Pending Motion to Compel Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Cooperation with Respect to Scheduling Depositions and Related Document Productions by Del Monte Corporation. (Sicalides, Barbara)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1604 ANSWER to #1467 Amended Complaint by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1603 ANSWER to #1461 Amended Complaint, by Thai Union Group PCL.(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1602 ANSWER to #1461 Amended Complaint, by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1601 ANSWER to #1460 Amended Complaint,, by Thai Union Group Public Company, Ltd..(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1600 WITHDRAWN PER #1638 - ANSWER to #1460 Amended Complaint,, by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John) Modified on 11/5/2018 to edit text, efiling withdrawn per 1638 (jpp).
November 2, 2018 Filing 1599 ANSWER to #1446 Amended Complaint, by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC.(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1598 ANSWER to #1446 Amended Complaint, by Thai Union Group PCL.(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1597 ANSWER to #1427 Amended Complaint, by Thai Union Group PCL.(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1596 ANSWER to #1427 Amended Complaint, by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1595 ANSWER to #1470 Amended Complaint,,, by Thai Union Group Public Company, Ltd..(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1594 ANSWER to #1470 Amended Complaint,,, by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1593 ANSWER to #1437 Amended Complaint, by Thai Union Group PLC.(Roberti, John)Attorney John Roberti added to party Thai Union Group PLC(pty:dft)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1592 ANSWER to #1455 Amended Complaint, of the Wal-Mart Plaintiffs by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1591 ANSWER to #1449 Amended Complaint, of the SuperValu, Inc. Plaintiffs by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1590 ANSWER to #1448 Amended Complaint, of Super Store Industries by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1589 ANSWER to #1437 Amended Complaint, by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1588 ANSWER to #1445 Amended Complaint, of the Meijer, Inc. Plaintiffs by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1587 ANSWER to #1444 Amended Complaint, of Publix Super Markets, Inc. and Wakefern Food Corp. by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1586 ANSWER to #1437 Amended Complaint, of Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1585 ANSWER to #1427 Amended Complaint, of CVS Pharmacy, Inc. by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1584 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Stipulation of Dismissal of Class Action Claims of Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs as Against Defendant Del Monte Corporation by Del Monte Corporation. (Sicalides, Barbara)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1583 ORDER Granting #1558 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/2/18. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1582 ANSWER to #1427 Amended Complaint, (Second Amended Complaint by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1581 ANSWER to #1454 Amended Complaint (Fifth Amended Complaint by Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. and Bi-Lo Holdings, LLC) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1580 ANSWER to #1466 Amended Complaint (Fourth Amended Complaint by Wegmans Food Markets) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1579 ANSWER to #1432 Amended Complaint (Third Amended Complaint by W. Lee Flowers & Co., Inc.) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1578 ANSWER to #1449 Amended Complaint, (Second Amended Complaint by Supervalu, Inc.) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1577 ANSWER to #1448 Amended Complaint, (Second Amended Complaint by Super Store Industries) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1576 ANSWER to #1444 Amended Complaint, (Fourth Amended Complaint by Publix Super Markets, Inc. and Wakefern Food Corp.) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara) (jpp).
November 2, 2018 Filing 1575 ANSWER to #1447 Amended Complaint, (Second Amended Complaint by Moran Foods, LLC.) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara) (jpp).
November 2, 2018 Filing 1574 ANSWER to #1445 Amended Complaint, (Fourth Amended Complaint by Meijer, Inc. and Meijer Distribution, Inc.) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara) (jpp).
November 2, 2018 Filing 1573 ANSWER to #1423 Amended Complaint, (Fourth Amended Complaint by Kroger Co., et al.) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara) (jpp).
November 2, 2018 Filing 1572 ANSWER to #1467 Amended Complaint (Second Amended Complaint by Krasdale Foods, Inc.) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara) (jpp).
November 2, 2018 Filing 1571 ANSWER to #1446 Amended Complaint, (Second Amended Complaint by Dollar General Corporation, et al.) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara) (jpp).
November 2, 2018 Filing 1570 ANSWER to #1437 Amended Complaint, (Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara) (jpp).
November 2, 2018 Filing 1569 ANSWER to #1467 Amended Complaint of Krasdale Foods, Inc. by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth) (jpp).
November 2, 2018 Filing 1568 ANSWER to #1447 Amended Complaint, of Moran Foods by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth) (jpp).
November 2, 2018 Filing 1567 ANSWER to #1446 Amended Complaint, of the Dollar General Plaintiffs by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth) (jpp).
November 2, 2018 Filing 1566 ANSWER to #1433 Amended Complaint, (Fourth Consolidated Amended Complaint by Affiliated Foods, Inc., et al.) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara) (jpp).
November 2, 2018 Filing 1565 ANSWER to #1433 Amended Complaint, of the Affiliated Foods Plaintiffs by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth) (jpp).
November 2, 2018 Filing 1564 ANSWER to #1423 Amended Complaint, of the Kroger Plaintiffs by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth) (jpp).
November 2, 2018 Filing 1563 ANSWER to #1470 Amended Complaint,,, of the Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth) (jpp).
November 2, 2018 Filing 1562 ANSWER to #1461 Amended Complaint, of the Indirect Purchaser End Payer Plaintiffs by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth) (jpp).
November 2, 2018 Filing 1561 ANSWER to #1460 Amended Complaint,, of the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth) (jpp).
November 2, 2018 Filing 1560 Joint MOTION Approval of Stipulation regarding Service of Process and Responses to Complaint by Spartannash Company. (King, Laurence) (jpp).
November 2, 2018 Filing 1559 Joint MOTION for Approval of Stipulation Regarding Withdraw and Dismissal of Claim for Injunctive Relief by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Garcia, Lisa) (jpp).
November 1, 2018 Filing 1558 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Certain Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Yates, Christopher) (jpp).
November 1, 2018 Filing 1557 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1433 Amended Complaint, by Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC. (Roberti, John) (jpp).
October 31, 2018 Filing 1556 WITHDRAWN PER #1637 - MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Delhaize America, LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Surreply)(Blechman, William) (jpp). Modified on 11/5/2018 to terminate, efiling withdrawn per 1637 (jpp).
October 29, 2018 Filing 1555 NOTICE of Errata to the Expert Report of Dr. John H. Johnson, IV by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company (Lee, Belinda) (jpp).
October 26, 2018 Filing 1554 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1494 MOTION Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Stay of Certain Depositions filed by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leslie Wulff in Support of United States' Reply)(Wulff, Leslie) (jpp).
October 26, 2018 Filing 1553 Ex Parte MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Cooperation with Respect to Scheduling Depositions and Related Document Productions by Bumble Bee Foods LLC, Del Monte Corporation, Dongwon Enterprises, Starkist Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Megan Morley)(Sicalides, Barbara) (jpp).
October 25, 2018 Filing 1552 Joint MOTION for Approval of Stipulation Regarding Response to Complaint by Big Catch Cayman LP, Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP. (Paris, Adam) (jpp).
October 25, 2018 Filing 1551 NOTICE of Errata to the Expert Report of Dr. Laila Haider by Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC re #1410 Response in Opposition to Motion,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted Document Filed Under Seal))(Roberti, John) (jpp).
October 25, 2018 Filing 1550 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1549 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Roberti, John) (aef).
October 25, 2018 Filing 1549 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Roberti, John) (aef).
October 25, 2018 Filing 1548 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Joint Motion for an Order to File Overlength Brief by Specific Plaintiff Groups by Louise Adams. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Manifold, Betsy) (jpp).
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1547 ORDER granting #1526 Motion for extension of time to file reply to 11/20/2018 Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/24/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1546 ORDER vacating hearing on #1494 Motion for Stay of Discovery set for 1/01/2018. The motion is taken under submission without oral argument. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/24/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1545 ORDER granting #1496 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for determination of discovery dispute. The parties may file any motions related to Defendants Fourth Set of RFPs on or before 10/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 10/24/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1544 NOTICE of Errata by Louise Adams re #1526 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed Ex Parte Application for Order Extending the Deadline for End Payer Plaintiffs to File Their Reply in Further Support of Class Certification by One Week (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proof of Service)(Manifold, Betsy)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1543 RESPONSE to Motion re #1494 MOTION Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Stay of Certain Depositions filed by Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kelse Moen in Response to United States' Motion for Partial Stay of Certain Depositions, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Roberti, John) (jpp).
October 22, 2018 Filing 1542 RESPONSE to Motion re #1494 MOTION Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Stay of Certain Depositions by United States Department of Justice [Proposed Redacted Version] filed by Starkist Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew M.W. Bertolli [Proposed Redacted Version], #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Yates, Christopher) (jpp).
October 22, 2018 Filing 1541 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1540 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Yates, Christopher) (aef).
October 22, 2018 Filing 1540 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Yates, Christopher) (aef).
October 22, 2018 Filing 1539 RESPONSE to Motion re #1494 MOTION Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Stay of Certain Depositions filed by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Stephen Six)(Stueve, Patrick) (jpp).
October 22, 2018 Filing 1538 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1494 MOTION Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Stay of Certain Depositions filed by Christopher D. Lischewski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Peters, Elliot) (jpp).
October 22, 2018 Filing 1537 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1494 MOTION Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Stay of Certain Depositions (PUBLIC VERSION) filed by Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Delhaize America, LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration)(Blechman, William) (jpp).
October 22, 2018 Filing 1536 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 18-cv-02412-JLS-MDD. (Transfer from Ohio Northern, Case Number 1:18-cv-01518.) (no document attached) (jdt)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1535 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1534 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Blechman, William) (aef).
October 22, 2018 Filing 1534 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Blechman, William)(aef).
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1530 ORDER Granting #1520 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/22/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1529 ORDER Granting #1524 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaints. The Lion Capital Defendants must move to dismiss the Amended Complaints pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) on or before November 2, 2018. Upon receipt of the Omnibus Motion, Plaintiffs will file their opposition brief(s) on or before December 3, 2018. The Lion Capital Defendants will file their reply brief(s) on or before December 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/19/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1528 ORDER Granting #1523 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaints. Defendants' Answers to Amended Complaints must be filed on or before November 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/19/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1527 STATUS REPORT Regarding Information Filed in the Northern District of California by United States Department of Justice. (Wulff, Leslie) (jpp).
October 19, 2018 Filing 1526 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed Ex Parte Application for Order Extending the Deadline for End Payer Plaintiffs to File Their Reply in Further Support of Class Certification by One Week by Louise Adams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas H. Burt, #2 Proof of Service)(Burt, Thomas) (jpp).
October 19, 2018 Filing 1525 MOTION to Dismiss Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.'s Second Amended Complaint #1437 by Christopher D. Lischewski. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Peters, Elliot) (jpp).
October 19, 2018 Filing 1524 Joint MOTION for Approval of Stipulation Regarding Response to Complaints by Big Catch Cayman LP, Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP. (Paris, Adam) (aef).
October 18, 2018 Filing 1523 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints by Bumble Bee Foods LLC. (Gallo, Kenneth) (aef).
October 18, 2018 Filing 1522 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Second Amended Complaint Redacted against All Defendants, filed by Cherokee Nation, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Redline Second Amended Complaint) (Anzidei, Rebecca)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1521 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 10/22/2018*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1520 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Anzidei, Rebecca) (aef). Modified on 10/22/2018 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
October 18, 2018 Filing 1520 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Anzidei, Rebecca) (aef).
October 18, 2018 Filing 1519 SUR-REPLY - re #1518 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Sur-Reply to #1365 Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Christopher D. Lischewski. (Peters, Elliot)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1518 ORDER Granting #1512 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to the United States' Motion for Stay of Discovery. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/17/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1516 ORDER Granting #1513 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/17/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1533 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 18cv2421-JLS-MDD (Transfer from Ohio Northern, 1:18-cv-01415) (no document attached) (jdt)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1532 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 18cv2419-JLS-MDD. (Transfer from Ohio Northern, 1:18-cv-01477) (no document attached) (jdt)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1515 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1140 MOTION to Certify Class Defendants Opposition to Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification (Proposed Redacted Version) filed by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Belinda S Lee, #2 Exhibit 1 [Sealed], #3 Exhibit 2 [Sealed], #4 Exhibit 3 [Sealed], #5 Exhibit 4 [Sealed], #6 Exhibit 5 [Sealed], #7 Exhibit 6 [Sealed], #8 Exhibit 7 [Sealed], #9 Exhibit 8 [Sealed], #10 Exhibit 9 [Sealed])(Lee, Belinda) (acc).
October 16, 2018 Filing 1514 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 10/17/2018*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1513 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Lee, Belinda) (aef). Modified on 10/17/2018 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
October 16, 2018 Filing 1513 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Lee, Belinda) (aef).
October 16, 2018 Filing 1512 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to #1365 Motion to Stay Discovery by Christopher D. Lischewski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Peters, Elliot) (acc).
October 15, 2018 Filing 1511 NOTICE of MDL Member Case Opening: 18cv2366-JLS-MDD (Case opened in CASD). (no document attached) (jdt)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1510 RESPONSE to Motion re #1365 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Delhaize America, LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co. (Blechman, William) (acc).
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1507 ORDER Granting #1501 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/15/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1506 ORDER Granting #1504 Motion for Enlargement of Time. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/15/18. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1505 ORDER Granting Joint #1495 Motion and Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Plaintiff Grand Supercenter, Inc.;s lawsuit. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/15/18. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1504 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1365 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Delhaize America, LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Blechman, William) (dlg).
October 12, 2018 Filing 1503 NOTICE of Errata to Expert Report of Dr. Laila Haider by Bumble Bee Foods LLC (Gallo, Kenneth) qc email re errata. Attorney should withdraw and refile properly (dlg).
October 12, 2018 Filing 1502 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 10/15/2018*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1501 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Gallo, Kenneth) (aef). Modified on 10/15/2018 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
October 12, 2018 Filing 1501 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Gallo, Kenneth) (aef).
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1500 ORDER granting [1Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time [ECF. No. #1493 ] Responses due by 10/22/2018 Replies due by 10/26/2018. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2018 01:30 PM before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/12/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1499 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kimberly A. Kralowec (Kralowec, Kimberly) (dlg).
October 12, 2018 Filing 1498 Joint MOTION for Order Regarding Pre-Trial Procedure for Rules 901 and 803(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Sweeney, Bonny) (dlg).
October 12, 2018 Filing 1497 Joint MOTION for Order on Parties' Proposed Discovery Procedure Regarding Contention Interrogatories by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Sweeney, Bonny) (dlg).
October 12, 2018 Filing 1496 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion(s) for Determination of Discovery Dispute(s) Concerning Defendants' Fourth Set of Document Requests by Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC. (Roberti, John) (dlg).
October 12, 2018 Filing 1495 MOTION re NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Grand Supercenter Inc. Rule 41 Stipulation Dismissing Action without Prejudice as to Grand Supercenter, Inc., Only (Maslo, Paul) wrong event selected, changed to motion (dlg).
October 11, 2018 Filing 1494 MOTION Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Stay of Certain Depositions by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leslie A. Wulff in Support of United States' Notice of Motion and Motion, #2 Exhibit A)(Wulff, Leslie) (jpp).
October 11, 2018 Filing 1493 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time by United States Department of Justice. (Wulff, Leslie) (dlg).
October 11, 2018 Filing 1492 RESPONSE in Support re #1365 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by United States Department of Justice. (Wulff, Leslie) (dlg).
October 11, 2018 Filing 1491 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1371 MOTION to Stay Christopher D. Lischewskis Notice of Motion to Stay Discovery Against Him and for a Protective Order filed by Christopher D. Lischewski. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas S. Goldberg, #2 Exhibit G)(Peters, Elliot)(dlg).
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1490 ORDER granting #1462 Joint Motion to Dismiss Party. Del Monte Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/9/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1489 ORDER Vacating Hearing [ECF Nos. #1365 , #1371 ]. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/10/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1488 ORDER Granting Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute [ECF. No. #1426 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 10/10/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1487 ORDER Granting Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute [ECF. No. #1351 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 10/9/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1471 ORDER Granting #1408 , #1412 , #1418 , #1421 , #1424 , #1428 , #1429 , #1434 , #1436 , #1450 , #1452 , #1456 , #1457 , #1463 , #1468 Motions to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/9/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1509 Notice of MDL Transfer ORDER, re MDL No. 2670. CC: MDL Panel(jdt)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1470 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint against Big Catch Cayman LP, Bumble Bee Foods LLC, Del Monte Corporation, Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP, Starkist Company, Thai Union Group Public Company, Ltd., Tri-Union Seafoods LLC, filed by Harvesters Enterprises, LLC, Rushin Gold, LLC, Painted Plate Catering, Sandee's Catering, Francis T Enterprises, Lesgo Personal Chef LLC, Maquoketa Care Center, GlowFisch Hospitality, Groucho's Deli of Five Points, LLC, Groucho's Deli of Raleigh, A-1 Diner, Thyme Cafe & Market, Inc., Capitol Hill Supermarket, Confetti's Ice Cream Shoppe, Janet Machen, Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc., Dutch Village Restaurant, SIMON-HINDI, LLC. (Finley, Alec)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1469 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1468 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Finley, Alec) (rmc).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1468 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Finley, Alec) (rmc).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1467 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Second Amended Complaint (Public Version) against All Defendants, filed by Krasdale Foods, Inc.. (Nussbaum, Linda)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1466 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Fourth Amended Complaint (Public Version) against All Defendants, filed by Wegmans Food Markets, Inc.. (Nussbaum, Linda)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1465 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1463 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Nussbaum, Linda) (rmc).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1464 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1463 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Nussbaum, Linda) (rmc).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1463 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Nussbaum, Linda) (rmc).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1462 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party (Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' and Defendant Del Monte Corporation's Joint Motion and Stipulation for the Dismissal of Defendant Del Monte Corporation) by Benjamin Foods LLC, Central Grocers, Inc., John Gross & Company, Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc., Pacific Groservice Inc., Piggly Wiggly Alabama Distributing Co., Inc., Trepco Imports and Distribution LTD. (Sweeney, Bonny) (rmc).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1461 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Sixth Amended Consolidated Class Action Compliant of the Indirect Purchaser End Payer Plaintiffs against All Defendants, filed by Louise Adams. (Attachments: #1 Redlined Sixth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #2 Proof of Service)New Summons Requested. (Manifold, Betsy)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1460 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint [REDACTED] against Big Catch Cayman LP, Bumble Bee Foods LLC, Chicken of the Sea International, Inc., Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP, Starkist Company, Thai Union Group Public Company, Ltd., Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.), filed by Piggly Wiggly Alabama Distributing Co., Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc., Central Grocers, Inc., Benjamin Foods LLC, Trepco Imports and Distribution LTD, Pacific Groservice Inc.. (Sweeney, Bonny) Modified on 11/27/2018 - per request from attorney, edited docket text to reflect Fourth Amended Complaint. (jdt).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1459 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1456 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Sweeney, Bonny) (rmc).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1458 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1457 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Manifold, Betsy) (rmc).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1457 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Manifold, Betsy) (rmc).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1456 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Sweeney, Bonny) (rmc).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1455 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) against Big Catch Cayman LP, Bumble Bee Foods LLC, Del Monte Corporation, Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP, Starkist Company, filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Sam's West, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Sam's East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Manne, Neal)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1454 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Fifth Amended Complaint (Redacted) against All Defendants, filed by Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. (Ahern, Patrick)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1453 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1452 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Ahern, Patrick) (rmc).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1452 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Ahern, Patrick) (rmc).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1451 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1450 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Manne, Neal) (rmc).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1450 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Manne, Neal) (rmc).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1449 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Second Amended Complaint - Redacted Public Version) against Big Catch Cayman LP, Bumble Bee Foods LLC, Del Monte Corporation, Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP, Starkist Company, Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC, filed by Associated Grocers of Florida, Inc., Unified Grocers, Inc., SuperValu Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Germaine, David)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1448 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Second Amended Complaint - Redacted Public Version) against Big Catch Cayman LP, Bumble Bee Foods LLC, Del Monte Corporation, Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP, Starkist Company, Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC, filed by Super Store Industries. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Germaine, David)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1447 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Second Amended Complaint - Redacted Public Version) against Big Catch Cayman LP, Bumble Bee Foods LLC, Del Monte Corporation, Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP, Starkist Company, Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC, filed by Moran Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Germaine, David)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1446 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Second Amended Complaint - Redacted Public Version) against Big Catch Cayman LP, Bumble Bee Foods LLC, Del Monte Corporation, Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP, Starkist Company, Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC, filed by Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Germaine, David)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1445 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (4th Amended Complaint - Redacted Public Version) against Big Catch Cayman LP, Bumble Bee Foods LLC, Del Monte Corporation, Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP, Starkist Company, Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC, filed by Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Germaine, David)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1444 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (4th Amended Complaint - Redacted Public Version) against Big Catch Cayman LP, Bumble Bee Foods LLC, Del Monte Corporation, Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP, Starkist Company, Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC, filed by Wakefern Food Corp., Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Germaine, David)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1443 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1436 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Germaine, David) (aef).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1442 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1436 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Germaine, David) (aef).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1441 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1436 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Germaine, David) (aef).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1440 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1436 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Germaine, David) (aef).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1439 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1436 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Germaine, David)(aef).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1438 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1436 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Germaine, David) (aef).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1437 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Second Amended Complaint - Redacted Public Version) against Big Catch Cayman LP, Bumble Bee Foods LLC, Chicken of the Sea International, Inc., Del Monte Corporation, Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., King Oscar, Inc., Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP, Christopher Lischewski, Christopher D. Lischewski, Starkist Company, Thai Union Group PLC, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC, filed by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.. (Stueve, Patrick) (rmc).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1436 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Germaine, David) (rmc).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1435 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1434 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Stueve, Patrick) (aef).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1434 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Stueve, Patrick) (aef).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1433 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Fourth Amended (Redacted Public Version) against Big Catch Cayman LP, Bumble Bee Foods LLC, Del Monte Corporation, Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP, Starkist Company, Thai Union Group Public Company, Ltd., Tri-Union Seafoods LLC, filed by Affiliated Foods Plaintiffs. (King, Laurence) (rmc).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1432 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Third Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by W Lee Flowers & Co Inc. (Black, Elizabeth) (rmc).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1431 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1429 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (King, Laurence) (aef).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1430 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1428 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Black, Elizabeth) (aef).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1429 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (King, Laurence) (aef).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1428 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Black, Elizabeth) (aef).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1427 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Second Amended Complaint (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) against Big Catch Cayman LP, Bumble Bee Foods LLC, Del Monte Corporation, Dongwon Industries Co. Ltd, Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP, Starkist Company, Thai Union Frozen Products PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.), filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Garcia, Lisa) (rmc).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1426 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion(s) for Determination of Discovery Dispute(s) Concerning Defendants' Fourth Set of Document Requests by Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC. (Roberti, John) (rmc).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1425 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1424 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Garcia, Lisa) (aef).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1424 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Garcia, Lisa) (aef).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1423 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Fourth Amended Complaint (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) against Big Catch Cayman LP, Bumble Bee Foods LLC, Del Monte Corporation, Dongwon Industries Co. Ltd, Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP, Starkist Company, Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC, filed by Hy-Vee, Inc., Ahold U.S.A., Inc., The Kroger Co., Albertsons Companies, LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Delhaize America, LLC. (Blechman, William) (rmc).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1422 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1421 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Blechman, William) (aef).
October 5, 2018 Filing 1421 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Blechman, William) (aef).
October 4, 2018 Filing 1420 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1371 MOTION to Stay Christopher D. Lischewskis Notice of Motion to Stay Discovery Against Him and for a Protective Order filed by Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Delhaize America, LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Blechman, William) (rmc).
October 4, 2018 Filing 1419 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1418 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Blechman, William) (aef).
October 4, 2018 Filing 1418 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Blechman, William) (aef).
October 4, 2018 Filing 1417 DECLARATION re #1416 Response in Support of Motion by Plaintiff Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.. (Stueve, Patrick) (rmc).
October 4, 2018 Filing 1416 RESPONSE in Support re #1365 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.. (Stueve, Patrick) (rmc).
October 4, 2018 Filing 1415 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1365 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Christopher Lischewski. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Elizabeth K. McCloskey, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Peters, Elliot) (rmc).
October 4, 2018 Filing 1414 RESPONSE to Motion re #1371 MOTION to Stay Christopher D. Lischewskis Notice of Motion to Stay Discovery Against Him and for a Protective Order filed by United States Department of Justice. (Wulff, Leslie) (rmc).
October 2, 2018 Filing 1413 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1412 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Gallo, Kenneth)(aef).
October 2, 2018 Filing 1412 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Gallo, Kenneth) (aef).
October 2, 2018 Filing 1411 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1130 MOTION to Certify Class End Payer Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification - [Redacted] Defendants' Opposition to End Payer Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Bumble Bee Foods LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Craig A. Benson in Support of Defendant's Opposition to EPPs' Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28)(Gallo, Kenneth) (jpp).
October 2, 2018 Filing 1410 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1143 MOTION to Certify Class Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Lead Counsel REDACTED VERSION filed by Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Roberti, #2 Table of Contents, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P)(Roberti, John) (jpp).
October 2, 2018 Filing 1409 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1408 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Roberti, John) (aef).
October 2, 2018 Filing 1408 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Roberti, John) (aef).
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1407 ORDER Granting #1391 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. The parties may file any motions related to Defendant's Fourth Set of RFPs on or before October 12, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 10/2/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1406 ORDER Granting #1390 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. The parties may file any motions related to Defendant's Fourth Set of RFPs on or before October 5, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 10/2/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1405 ORDER Granting #1389 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. The parties may file any motions related to Defendant's Fourth Set of RFPs on or before October 5, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 10/2/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1404 ORDER Granting #1388 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. The parties may file any motions related to Defendant's Fourth Set of RFPs on or before October 5, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 10/2/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1403 ORDER Granting #1387 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. The parties may file any motions related to Defendant's Fourth Set of RFPs on or before October 5, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 10/2/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1402 ORDER Granting #1385 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. The parties may file any motions related to Defendant's Fourth Set of RFPs on or before October 5, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 10/2/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1401 ORDER Granting #1384 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. The parties may file any motions related to Defendant's Fourth Set of RFPs on or before October 5, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 10/2/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1400 ORDER Granting #1383 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. The parties may file any motions related to Defendant's Fourth Set of RFPs on or before October 5, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 10/2/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1399 ORDER Granting #1382 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. The parties may file any motions related to Defendant's Fourth Set of RFPs on or before October 5, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 10/2/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1398 ORDER Granting #1374 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. The parties may file any motions related to Direct Action Plaintiffs Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.'s responses and objections to Defendants' Fourth Set of Requests for Production on or before October 4, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 10/2/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1397 ORDER Granting #1367 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. The parties may file any motions related to Plaintiffs' Third Set of Interrogatories on or before October 12, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 10/2/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1396 ORDER granting #1393 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to #1140 Motion for Class Certification. Opposition due on or before 10/16/2018. Replies due on oe before 11/27/2018. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/28/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1395 ORDER granting #1392 Joint Motion to file overlength brief by Defendants. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/27/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1394 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1374 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Discovery Dispute Joint Motion Deadline) filed by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen Six, #2 Exhibit A to Six Declaration)(Stueve, Patrick) (jpp).
September 27, 2018 Filing 1393 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Lee, Belinda) (jpp).
September 26, 2018 Filing 1392 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages / Overlength Brief by Bumble Bee Foods LLC. (Gallo, Kenneth) (jpp).
September 25, 2018 Filing 1391 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion(s) for Determination of Discovery Dispute(s) Concerning Defendants' Fourth Set of Document Requests to Kenny Nachwalter, P.A. and Vanek, Vickers & Masini, P.C. Plaintiffs by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Yates, Christopher) (jpp).
September 25, 2018 Filing 1390 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion(s) for Determination of Discovery Dispute(s) Concerning Defendants' Fourth Set of Document Requests to DPPs by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Yates, Christopher) (jpp).
September 25, 2018 Filing 1389 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion(s) for Determination of Discovery Dispute(s) Concerning Defendants' Fourth Set of Document Requests to Sysco and US Foods by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Yates, Christopher) (jpp).
September 25, 2018 Filing 1388 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion(s) for Determination of Discovery Dispute(s) Concerning Defendants' Fourth Set of Document Requests to Winn-Dixie by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Yates, Christopher) (jpp).
September 25, 2018 Filing 1387 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion(s) for Determination of Discovery Dispute(s) Concerning Defendants' Fourth Set of Document Requests by Del Monte Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sicalides, Barbara) (jpp).
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1386 ORDER granting #1380 Joint Motion regarding Amended Schedule for responding to Plaintiff Associated Wholesale Grocers' First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/25/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1385 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion(s) for Determination of Discovery Dispute(s) Concerning Defendants' Fourth Set of Document Requests to Target Corporation. by Bumble Bee Foods LLC. (Bial, Joseph) (jpp).
September 25, 2018 Filing 1384 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion(s) for Determination of Discovery Dispute(s) Concerning Defendants' Fourth Set of Document Requests to W. Lee Flowers & Co., Inc. by Bumble Bee Foods LLC. (Bial, Joseph) (jpp).
September 24, 2018 Filing 1383 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion(s) for Determination of Discovery Dispute(s) Concerning Defendants' Fourth Set of Document Requests to Wegmans Food Markets Inc. and Krasdale Foods, Inc. by Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC. (Roberti, John) (jpp).
September 24, 2018 Filing 1382 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion(s) for Determination of Discovery Dispute(s) Concerning Defendants' Fourth Set of Document Requests to CVS Pharmacy, Inc. by Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC. (Roberti, John) (jpp).
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1381 ORDER granting #1376 Joint Motion for approval of Stipulation regarding response to Plaintiff Associated Wholesale Grocers' First Amended Complaint.. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/24/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1380 Joint MOTION by Plaintiff Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc., and Defendant Christopher D. Lischewski regarding amended schedule for responding to Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.'s Complaint by Christopher D. Lischewski. (Peters, Elliot) (jpp).
September 24, 2018 Filing 1379 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of Defendants Tri-Union Seafoods LLC d/b/a Chicken of the Sea International, and Thai Union Group PCL (Shapiro, Joshua) (jpp).
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1378 ORDER granting #1375 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/21/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1377 ORDER granting #1372 Joint Motion for approval of stipulation regarding dismissal of claim and amended schedule for responding to Associated Wholsale Grocers, Inc,'s First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/21/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) Modified on 9/21/2018 to edit text, nef resent. (jpp).
September 21, 2018 Filing 1376 Joint MOTION for Approval of Stipulation Regarding Response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Big Catch Cayman LP, Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP. (Paris, Adam) (jpp).
September 20, 2018 Filing 1375 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint by Cherokee Nation, The. (Anzidei, Rebecca) (jpp).
September 20, 2018 Filing 1374 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Discovery Dispute Joint Motion Deadline) by Bumble Bee Foods LLC, Chicken of the Sea International, Inc., Del Monte Corporation, Dongwon Industries Co. Ltd, Starkist Company, Thai Union Group Public Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Megan Morley, #2 Proposed Order)(Sicalides, Barbara) (jpp).
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1373 ORDER granting #1369 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint to on or before 10/19/2018. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/20/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1372 Joint MOTION for Order for Approval of Stipulation Regarding Dismissal of Claim and Amended Schedule for Responding to AWG's First Amended Complaint by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.. (Stueve, Patrick) (jpp).
September 20, 2018 Filing 1371 MOTION to Stay Christopher D. Lischewskis Notice of Motion to Stay Discovery Against Him and for a Protective Order by Christopher D. Lischewski. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Nicholas Goldberg, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)(Peters, Elliot)Attorney Elliot R Peters added to party Christopher D. Lischewski(pty:dft)(jpp).
September 18, 2018 Filing 1370 NOTICE of Appearance of Nicholas Goldberg (Goldberg, Nicholas) (jpp).
September 18, 2018 Filing 1369 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint by Cherokee Nation, The. (Anzidei, Rebecca) (jpp).
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1368 ORDER setting briefing schedule on #1365 . Defendant Christopher Lischewski's opposition due 10/4/2018. United States reply in support of the motion due 10/11/2018. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/13/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1367 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute concerning Plaintiffs Third Set of Interrogatories by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Sweeney, Bonny) (jpp).
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1366 ORDER overruling #1312 Sysco Corporation and US Food Inc.'s Objection to the Magistrate Judge's Order. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/10/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1365 MOTION to Stay Discovery by United States Department of Justice. (Wulff, Leslie) (jpp).
September 5, 2018 Filing 1364 NOTICE of Appearance of V Prentice (Prentice, V.) (jpp).
September 5, 2018 Filing 1363 NOTICE of Appearance of Steven Williams (Williams, Steven) (jpp).
September 5, 2018 Filing 1361 NOTICE of Appearance of Ryan McEwan (McEwan, Ryan) (jpp).
September 5, 2018 Filing 1360 NOTICE of Appearance of Joshua Davis (Davis, Joshua) (jpp).
September 5, 2018 Filing 1359 NOTICE of Appearance of Joseph Saveri (Saveri, Joseph) (jpp).
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1358 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. #997 , #999 , #1248 ). The Court grants leave to amend the respective Complaints to all Plaintiffs. Plaintiffs may file amended Complaints within thirty (30) days of the date on which this Order is electronically docketed.Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/05/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1357 ORDER granting #983 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Cherokee Nations First Amended complaint. Plaintiff may file an amended Complaint within thirty (30) days of the date on which this Order is electronically docketed.. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/05/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1356 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1350 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. The Court finds good cause to extend the deadline to file a joint motion for determination of discovery dispute(s) regarding Defendants' Fourth Set of RFPs. The parties must file their joint motion as provided in the Court's chambers rules not later than fifteen (15) days following Judge Sammartino's ruling on ECF No. 1312. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 09/05/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (atk)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1355 ORDER on #1342 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute: Plaintiffs' Motion to Depose Jae-Chul Kim. As presented in this Joint Motion, Plaintiffs motion to compel deposition testimony from Mr. Jae-Chul Kim is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 9/4/18. (Dembin, Mitchell)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1354 DECLARATION re #1353 Notice (Other),, Declaration of Samuel J. Randall in Support of Kroger and Publix DAPs' Opposition to Ex Parte Motion by Plaintiffs Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Delhaize America, LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co.. (Randall, Samuel) (jpp).
September 4, 2018 Filing 1353 NOTICE Kroger and Publix DAPs' Notice of Intent to Respond and Response in Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Motion by Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Delhaize America, LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co. re #1351 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Dispute Joint Motion (Randall, Samuel)Attorney Samuel J Randall added to party Ahold U.S.A., Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Samuel J Randall added to party Delhaize America, LLC(pty:pla) (jpp).
August 30, 2018 Filing 1352 REPLY - Other re #1331 Response - Other, #1312 MOTION Sysco Corp. and US Foods, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Objection to Non-Dispositive Pre-Trial Order of Magistrate Judge filed by Sysco Corporation, US Foods, Inc.. (Gant, Scott) (mpl).
August 28, 2018 Filing 1351 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Dispute Joint Motion by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Meaghan Thomas-Kennedy, #2 Exhibit 1)(Yates, Christopher) (mpl).
August 28, 2018 Filing 1350 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion(s) for Determination of Discovery Dispute(s) Concerning Defendants' Fourth Set of Document Requests by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Yates, Christopher) (mpl).
August 23, 2018 Filing 1349 NOTICE of Appearance for Defendants Tri-Union Seafoods LLC d/b/a Chicken of the Sea International and Thai Union Group PCL (Myers, Jonathan) (mpl).
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1348 ORDER Overruling Objection re #1322 RESPONSE in Opposition. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/21/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1347 RESPONSE re #1344 Response to Motion, #1343 Response - Other, Defendant Christopher Lischewski's Response to Filings by Plaintiffs and Department of Justice Re Stipulated Order for Partial Stay of Discovery and Joint Motion for Order filed by Christopher D. Lischewski. (Peters, Elliot) (mpl)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1345 ORDER Granting #1340 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/17/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1344 RESPONSE to Motion re #1320 Joint MOTION for Order filed by United States Department of Justice. (Wulff, Leslie) (mpl).
August 17, 2018 Filing 1343 RESPONSE re #1323 Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Plaintiffs' Response to Christopher Lischewski's Opposition to Joint Motion for Order filed by Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Delhaize America, LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co. (Blechman, William) (mpl).
August 15, 2018 Filing 1342 Joint MOTION for Discovery (Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute) by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher S. Yates, #2 Exhibit 1 to Yates Decl. [Sealed], #3 Exhibit 2 to Yates Decl. [Sealed], #4 Exhibit 3 to Yates Decl. [Sealed], #5 Exhibit 4 to Yates Decl. [Sealed], #6 Declaration of Scott Meece, #7 Declaration of Samantha J. Stein, #8 Exhibit 1 to Stein Decl. [Sealed], #9 Exhibit 2 to Stein Decl. [Sealed], #10 Exhibit 3 to Stein Decl. [Sealed], #11 Exhibit 4 to Stein Decl. [Sealed], #12 Exhibit 5 to Stein Decl. [Sealed], #13 Exhibit 6 to Stein Decl. [Sealed], #14 Exhibit 7 to Stein Decl. [Sealed], #15 Exhibit 8 to Stein Decl. [Sealed], #16 Exhibit 9 to Stein Decl. [Sealed], #17 Exhibit 10 to Stein Decl. [Sealed], #18 Exhibit 11 to Stein Decl. [Sealed], #19 Exhibit 12 to Stein Decl. [Sealed], #20 Exhibit 13 to Stein Decl. [Sealed], #21 Exhibit 14 to Stein Decl. [Sealed], #22 Proof of Service)(Yates, Christopher) (mpl).
August 15, 2018 Filing 1341 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 8/17/2018*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1340 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Yates, Christopher) (dlg). Modified on 8/20/2018 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
August 15, 2018 Filing 1340 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Yates, Christopher)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1339 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Redacted) against Big Catch Cayman LP, Bumble Bee Foods LLC, Del Monte Corporation, Dongwon Industries Co. Ltd, Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP, Christopher Lischewski, Starkist Company, Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC, filed by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. (Stueve, Patrick) (mpl).
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1338 ORDER Granting #1333 Motion to Strike #1326 First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/14/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2018: #1 Stricken Document) (mpl).
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1337 ORDER Granting #1320 Joint Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/14/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1334 ORDER Granting #1324 , #1327 Motions to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/13/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1333 MOTION to Strike Document #1326 Amended Complaint, by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. (Stueve, Patrick)(mpl).
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1332 ORDER Denying #1330 Ex Parte Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/13/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1331 RESPONSE re #1312 MOTION (Defendants' Opposition to Sysco Corp.'s and US Foods, Inc.'s Objection to Non-Dispositive Pre-Trial Order of Magistrate Judge Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 72) filed by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Yates, Christopher) (mpl).
August 10, 2018 Filing 1330 Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule on Sysco Corp.'s and US Foods, Inc.'s Objection to Non-Dispositive Pre-Trial Order of Magistrate Judge by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Yates, Christopher) (mpl).
August 10, 2018 Filing 1329 OBJECTION by Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Delhaize America, LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co. re #1316 Order on Motion for Discovery, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Floch, Brandon) Modified event to motion on 8/13/2018 (mpl).
August 10, 2018 Filing 1328 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1327 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Floch, Brandon) (dlg).
August 10, 2018 Filing 1327 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Floch, Brandon) Modified on 8/10/2018-QC mailer sent re wrong s/ (aef).
August 10, 2018 Filing 1326 ***DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ECF NO #1338 ***AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Big Catch Cayman LP, Bumble Bee Foods LLC, Del Monte Corporation, Dongwon Industries Co. Ltd, Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP, Christopher D. Lischewski, Starkist Company, Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC, filed by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. (Stueve, Patrick) (mpl). Modified to strike doc on 8/14/2018 (mpl). (Main Document 1326 replaced on 8/14/2018) (mpl).
August 10, 2018 Filing 1325 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1324 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Stueve, Patrick) (aef).
August 10, 2018 Filing 1324 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Stueve, Patrick) (aef).
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1323 ORDER Requesting Response to Mr. Lischewski's #1322 Opposition. Responses due by 8/17/2018. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/10/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1322 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1320 Joint MOTION for Order filed by Christopher D. Lischewski. (Peters, Elliot) (mpl).
August 8, 2018 Filing 1321 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/30/2018, before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Frank J. Rangus. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/29/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/6/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of Filing of Official Transcript only.) (akr)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1320 Joint MOTION for Order by Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Delhaize America, LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co. (Blechman, William) (mpl).
August 3, 2018 Filing 1319 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/30/2018, before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Amanda M. LeGore. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/24/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of Filing of Official Transcript only.) (akr)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1317 ORDER Granting #1309 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/2/2018. (rmc)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1316 ORDER on #1261 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute: Plaintiffs' Request for Early Discovery from Lion Entities. As provided herein, Plaintiff's request for early discovery is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 7/31/18. (Dembin, Mitchell)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1314 ORDER Requesting Response to Objections re #1293 Order on Motion for Discovery. Defendants shall file a response to the objections on or before 8/21/2018. Plaintiffs may file a reply in support of their objections on or before 8/31/2018. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/31/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1315 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Janis L. Sammartino: Hearing on Motion to Dismiss #983 #997 #999 and #1248 held and taken under submission (Court Reporter/ECR Frank Rangus and Amanda LeGore / CRD A Ramos / (Plaintiff Attorney William Jay Blechman, Rebecca Anzidei, Alec Blaine Finley, Fred T. Isquith, Robert N. Kaplan, Betsy Manifold, Samantha Stein, Bonny Sweeney, Elena Katcher and Samuel J. Randall / Defendant Attorney Christopher Yates, Elizabeth McCloskey, William B. Michael, Heather Milligan, Adam Paris, Barbara Sicalides, Brian T. Fitzpatrick and Elliot Peters / Telephonic Appearance by Leslie A. Wulff and Jonathan Cuneo) (no document attached) (acr)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1313 NOTICE of Change of Address by Dennis James Stewart (Stewart, Dennis) (mpl).
July 27, 2018 Filing 1312 OBJECTION by Sysco Corporation, US Foods, Inc. re #1293 Order on Motion for Discovery, . (Gant, Scott) (mpl). Modified on 7/30/2018 (mpl).
July 27, 2018 Filing 1311 NOTICE (Plaintiffs' Joint Notice of Supplementation of the Record in Support of their Oppositions to the Lion Entities' Motions to Dismiss) by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Samantha Stein in Support of Plaintiffs' Joint Notice, #2 Exhibit 1 (filed under seal))(Stein, Samantha)(mpl).
July 27, 2018 Filing 1310 ** Filed as Sealed Document 1318 on 8/2/2018 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1309 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Stein, Samantha) (rmc). (Main Document 1310 replaced on 8/2/2018) (rmc). Modified on 8/2/2018 to add file date of lodgment (rmc).
July 27, 2018 Filing 1309 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Stein, Samantha) (rmc).
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1308 ORDER Granting #1303 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/27/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1307 ORDER Granting #1301 Joint Motion for Approval of Stipulation Regarding Service of Process. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/27/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1304 ORDER Granting #1294 , #1297 Motions to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/27/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
July 25, 2018 Filing 1303 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Request to be Removed from CM/ECF Electronic Service List by Big Catch Cayman LP, Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert J. Quigley)(Quigley, Robert) (mpl).
July 24, 2018 Filing 1302 NOTICE of Special Appearance of Zachariah A. Tafoya by Big Catch Cayman LP, Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP (Paris, Adam) (jpp).
July 24, 2018 Filing 1301 MOTION for Order Joint Motion by Plaintiff Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc., and Christopher D. Lischewski for Approval of Stipulation Regarding Service of Process by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.. (Stueve, Patrick) (jpp).
July 24, 2018 Filing 1300 NOTICE of Appearance of Elliot R. Peters (Peters, Elliot) (jpp).
July 23, 2018 Filing 1299 STATUS REPORT / Joint Status Report by Bumble Bee Foods LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Michael, William) (jpp).
July 23, 2018 Filing 1298 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 7/27/2018*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1297 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Michael, William) (dlg). Modified on 7/27/2018-to add file date of lodgment(aef).
July 23, 2018 Filing 1297 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Michael, William) (dlg).
July 23, 2018 Filing 1296 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 7/27/2018*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1294 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Paris, Adam) (dlg). Modified on 7/27/2018 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
July 23, 2018 Filing 1295 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1248 MOTION to Dismiss Complaints of EPPs, CFPs, DPPs, and DAPs filed by Big Catch Cayman LP, Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP. (Paris, Adam) (jpp).
July 23, 2018 Filing 1294 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Paris, Adam) (dlg).
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1293 ORDER on #1260 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. As presented in this Joint Motion, Defendants Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production No. 16 (Third Set) is GRANTED. As provided by Fed. R. Civ. P. 34(b)(2)(B), Plaintiffs must provide to Defendants a reasonable date by which the production will be completed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 7/23/18. (Dembin, Mitchell)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1288 ORDER Granting #1271 , #1274 , #1277 , #1280 Motions to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/17/2018. (rmc)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1287 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of Tri-Union Seafoods LLC d/b/a Chicken of the Sea International, and Thai Union Group PCL (Steenholdt, Jana)(mpl).
July 17, 2018 Filing 1286 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of Tri-Union Seafoods LLC d/b/a Chicken of the Sea International, and Thai Union Group PCL (Moen, Kelse) (mpl).
July 17, 2018 Filing 1285 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of Tri-Union Seafoods LLC d/b/a Chicken of the Sea International, and Thai Union Group PCL (Fitzpatrick, Brian) (mpl).
July 16, 2018 Filing 1284 REPLY to Response to Motion re #983 Joint MOTION to Dismiss #823 The Cherokee Nation's First Amended Complaint filed by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Yates, Christopher) (acc).
July 16, 2018 Filing 1283 NOTICE of Appearance of Grace Lee (Lee, Grace) (acc).
July 13, 2018 Filing 1282 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1248 MOTION to Dismiss Complaints of EPPs, CFPs, DPPs, and DAPs (Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Lion Entities Motion to Dismiss [Redacted]) filed by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Samantha Stein [Redacted], #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibits 24-42 [Submitted Under Seal])(Sweeney, Bonny) (mpl).
July 13, 2018 Filing 1281 ** Filed as Sealed Document 1292 on 7/17/2018 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1280 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Sweeney, Bonny) (aef). (Main Document 1281 replaced on 7/18/2018) (rmc). Modified on 7/18/2018 to add filing date of lodgment (rmc).
July 13, 2018 Filing 1280 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Stein, Samantha) (aef).
July 13, 2018 Filing 1279 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1248 MOTION to Dismiss Complaints of EPPs, CFPs, DPPs, and DAPs [Redacted] Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Joint Opposition to the Lion Entities' Motion to Dismiss the Complaints of the End Payer and Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs filed by Louise Adams. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Manifold, Betsy) (mpl).
July 13, 2018 Filing 1278 ** Filed as Sealed Document 1291 on 7/17/2018 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1277 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Manifold, Betsy) (aef). (Main Document 1278 replaced on 7/18/2018) (rmc). Modified on 7/18/2018 to add filing date of lodgment (rmc).
July 13, 2018 Filing 1277 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Manifold, Betsy) (aef).
July 13, 2018 Filing 1276 ** Filed as Sealed Document 1290 on 7/17/2018 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1274 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Paris, Adam) (aef). (Main Document 1276 replaced on 7/18/2018) (rmc). Modified on 7/18/2018 to add filing date of lodgment (rmc).
July 13, 2018 Filing 1275 REPLY to Response to Motion re #997 MOTION to Dismiss the Cherokee Nation's Complaint, #999 MOTION to Dismiss the Bashas' Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Big Catch Cayman LP, Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP. (Paris, Adam) (mpl).
July 13, 2018 Filing 1274 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Paris, Adam) (aef).
July 13, 2018 Filing 1273 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1248 MOTION to Dismiss Complaints of EPPs, CFPs, DPPs, and DAPs Direct Action Plaintiffs' Joint Omnibus Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Delhaize America, LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co. (Blechman, William) (mpl).
July 13, 2018 Filing 1272 ** Filed as Sealed Document 1289 on 7/17/2018 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1271 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Blechman, William) (aef). (Main Document 1272 replaced on 7/18/2018) (rmc). Modified on 7/18/2018 to add filing date of lodgment (rmc).
July 13, 2018 Filing 1271 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Blechman, William) (aef).
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1269 ORDER Granting #1262 Renewed Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/10/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1268 ORDER Granting #1264 Joint Motion for Approval of Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time to File Renewed Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/10/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
July 9, 2018 Filing 1267 RESPONSE in Opposition re #983 Joint MOTION to Dismiss #823 The Cherokee Nation's First Amended Complaint filed by Cherokee Nation, The. (Anzidei, Rebecca)(mpl).
July 6, 2018 Filing 1266 NOTICE of MDL Filing: Order Vacating Conditional Transfer Order re #1265 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-12 insofar as it relates to Reo v. Bumble Bee Foods, LLC, N.D. Ohio, C.A. No. 1:18-01416. (rmc)
July 6, 2018 Filing 1265 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer ORDER CTO-12, re MDL No. 2670 (rmc)
July 5, 2018 Filing 1264 Joint MOTION for Approval of Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time to File Renewed Motion to Seal re #1262 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC, Bashas' Inc., Marc Glassman, Inc.. (King, Laurence) (mpl).
July 5, 2018 Filing 1263 RESPONSE in Opposition re #999 MOTION to Dismiss the Bashas' Plaintiffs' Complaint (Publicly Redacted Version) filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC, Bashas' Inc., Marc Glassman, Inc.. (King, Laurence) (mpl).
July 5, 2018 Filing 1262 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(King, Laurence) QC email, missing Sealed Lodged Proposed Document. (dlg). Modified on 7/9/2018QC mailer sent re sealed lodged proposed documents (aef).
July 5, 2018 Filing 1261 Joint MOTION for Discovery (Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute on Plaintiffs' Request for Early Discovery) by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Stein, Samantha) (mpl).
June 29, 2018 Filing 1260 Joint MOTION for Discovery (Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute) by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Yates, Christopher) (mpl).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1259 ORDER Granting #1258 Joint Motion to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/29/2018. (mpl)
June 28, 2018 Filing 1258 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Cherokee Nation, The. (Anzidei, Rebecca) (mpl).
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1257 ORDER Granting #1252 Joint Motion for Approval of Stipulation Regarding Service of Process. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/26/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1256 ORDER Granting #1251 Joint Motion for Approval of Stipulation Regarding Service of Process. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/26/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1255 ORDER Denying #1245 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. The Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Bashas' Plaintiffs' Motion and GRANTS Bashas' Plaintiffs leave to file a renewed motion to file documents under seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/26/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1253 ORDER Granting #1244 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/26/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
June 25, 2018 Filing 1252 Joint MOTION for Order for Approval of Stipulation Regarding Service of Process by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.. (Stueve, Patrick). (jah).
June 25, 2018 Filing 1251 Joint MOTION for Order for Approval of Stipulation Regarding Service of Process by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.. (Stueve, Patrick). (jah).
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1250 ORDER granting #1241 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk shall update the docket to reflect the withdrawal of Attorney Solomon B Cera as counsel for Associated Grocers of Florida, Inc. (AGFLA). Attorney Cera continues to represent Plaintiffs Howard Samuels as Trustee in Bankruptcy for Central Grocers, Inc. and Piggly Wiggly Alabama Distributing Co., Inc.. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/25/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
June 22, 2018 Filing 1249 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/26/2018*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1244 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Paris, Adam) (aef). Modified on 6/26/2018 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
June 22, 2018 Filing 1248 MOTION to Dismiss Complaints of EPPs, CFPs, DPPs, and DAPs by Big Catch Cayman LP, Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Appendix)(Paris, Adam). (jah).
June 22, 2018 Filing 1247 RESPONSE in Opposition re #999 MOTION to Dismiss the Bashas' Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC, Bashas' Inc., Marc Glassman, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2 (Public), #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4-8 (Public), #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10-26 (Public), #8 Exhibit 27, #9 Exhibit 28, #10 Exhibit 29, #11 Exhibit 30, #12 Exhibit 31, #13 Exhibit 32, #14 Exhibit 33, #15 Exhibit 34-35 (Public), #16 Exhibit 37-44 (Public), #17 Exhibit 45, #18 Exhibit 46-48 (Public), #19 Exhibit 49, #20 Exhibit 50, #21 Exhibit 51, #22 Exhibit 52, #23 Exhibit 53, #24 Exhibit 54, #25 Exhibit 55, #26 Exhibit 56-85 (Public), #27 Exhibit 86)(King, Laurence). (jah).
June 22, 2018 Filing 1246 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 7/10/2018*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1245 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(King, Laurence) (aef). (Main Document 1246 replaced on 7/10/2018) (aef). Modified on 7/10/2018 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
June 22, 2018 Filing 1245 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (King, Laurence) (aef).
June 22, 2018 Filing 1244 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Paris, Adam) (aef).
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1242 ORDER Granting #1231 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/21/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
June 21, 2018 Filing 1241 MOTION to Withdraw Appearance of Counsel by Associated Grocers of Florida, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Solomon B. Cera in Support of Motion to Withdraw Appearance of Counsel)(Cera, Solomon) (mpl). Modified on 6/25/2018 - Wrong event. Corrected motion event (jah).
June 19, 2018 Filing 1240 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer to the Indirect Purchaser End Payer Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd.(Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 19, 2018 Filing 1239 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer to the Indirect Purchaser End Payer Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Starkist Company.(Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 19, 2018 Filing 1238 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Fifth Amended Complaint of Indirect Purchaser End Payer Plaintiffs by Thai Union Group PCL.(Roberti, John) (mpl).
June 19, 2018 Filing 1237 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Fifth Amended Complaint of Indirect Purchaser End Payer Plaintiffs by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John) (mpl).
June 19, 2018 Filing 1236 ANSWER to Complaint of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth) (mpl).
June 15, 2018 Filing 1235 ANSWER to Complaint (to Fifth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint of the Indirect Purchaser End Payer Plaintiffs) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara) (mpl).
June 15, 2018 Filing 1234 RESPONSE re #1230 Order on Motion for Hearing Plaintiffs' Response to The Court's Order Dated June 13, 2018 filed by Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Delhaize America, LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co.. (Blechman, William) (aef).
June 15, 2018 Filing 1233 RESPONSE in Opposition re #997 MOTION to Dismiss the Cherokee Nation's Complaint [Redacted] filed by Cherokee Nation, The. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In support of The Cherokee Nation's Opposition to Lion Entities' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Anzidei, Rebecca) (aef).
June 15, 2018 Filing 1232 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/21/2018*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1231 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Anzidei, Rebecca)(aef) Modified on 6/22/2018 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
June 15, 2018 Filing 1231 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Anzidei, Rebecca) (aef).
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1230 ORDER Denying #1225 Plaintiffs' Request for Status Conference. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/13/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
June 13, 2018 Filing 1229 NOTICE of Appearance (Hudson, Christian) (mpl).
June 13, 2018 Filing 1228 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by A-1 Diner, Capitol Hill Supermarket, Dutch Village Restaurant, Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc., Francis T Enterprises, Gladys, LLC, GlowFisch Hospitality, Harvesters Enterprises, LLC, Lesgo Personal Chef LLC, Janet Machin, Maquoketa Care Center, Painted Plate Catering, Rushin Gold, LLC, SIMON-HINDI, LLC, Thyme Cafe & Market, Inc. re #1211 Notice of Appearance . (Hudson, Christian) (mpl).
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1227 ORDER Granting #1223 Joint Motion for Approval of Stipulation Regarding Service of Process and Response to Complaints. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/12/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1226 ORDER Granting #1224 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. Bashas' Plaintiffs and The Cherokee Nation shall file their Oppositions to the Motions to Dismiss on or before 6/22/2018. Defendants shall file a joint Reply in Support of the Motions on or before 7/13/2018. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/12/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
June 12, 2018 Filing 1225 NOTICE Plaintiffs' Requerst for Status Conference by Ahold U.S.A., Inc., Albertsons Companies, LLC, Delhaize America, LLC, H.E. Butt Grocery Company, Hy-Vee, Inc., The Kroger Co. (Blechman, William) QC Mail re wrong event used (mpl).
June 11, 2018 Filing 1224 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Bashas' Inc.; Marc Glassman, Inc.; 99 Cents Only Stores LLC; The Cherokee Nation, and Lion Capital LLP, Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., and Big Catch Cayman LP by Big Catch Cayman LP, Lion Capital (Americas), Inc., Lion Capital LLP. (Paris, Adam) (mpl).
June 11, 2018 Filing 1223 Joint MOTION for Order Joint Motion by All Plaintiffs and Lion Capital (Americas), Inc. and Specially Appearing Defendants Lion Capital LLP, and Big Catch Cayman LP for Approval of Stipulation Regarding Service of Process and Response to Complaints by Louise Adams. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Manifold, Betsy) (mpl).
June 8, 2018 Filing 1222 ANSWER to #929 Amended Complaint,,, by Krasdale Foods, Inc. by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth) Modified (mpl).
June 8, 2018 Filing 1221 ANSWER to #918 Amended Complaint, by Moran Foods, LLC by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth) (mpl).
June 8, 2018 Filing 1220 ANSWER to #916 Amended Complaint, of Dollar General by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth) (mpl).
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1219 ORDER denying without prejudice #1145 Defendant's Ex Parte MOTION to Compel. As provided in the Court's Order on a related matter #1218 , this Motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 6/8/18. (no document attached) (Dembin, Mitchell)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1218 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1214 Joint MOTION for Approval of Stipulation Regarding Extension of Discovery Dispute Joint Motion Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 6/8/18. (Dembin, Mitchell)
June 7, 2018 Filing 1217 AMENDED DOCUMENT by A-1 Diner, Capitol Hill Supermarket, Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc., Francis T Enterprises, Maquoketa Care Center, Rushin Gold, LLC, SIMON-HINDI, LLC, Thyme Cafe & Market, Inc.. Memorandum in Support of Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Lead Counsel. (Finley, Alec) (mpl).
June 7, 2018 Filing 1216 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by A-1 Diner, Capitol Hill Supermarket, Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc., Francis T Enterprises, Maquoketa Care Center, Rushin Gold, LLC, SIMON-HINDI, LLC, Thyme Cafe & Market, Inc. re #1197 Notice (Other),,, filed by SIMON-HINDI, LLC, Rushin Gold, LLC, Maquoketa Care Center, Francis T Enterprises, Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc., Capitol Hill Supermarket, A-1 Diner, Thyme Cafe & Market, Inc., #1143 MOTION to Certify Class Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Lead Counsel filed by SIMON-HINDI, LLC, Rushin Gold, LLC, Maquoketa Care Center, Francis T Enterprises, Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc., Capitol Hill Supermarket, Thyme Cafe & Market, Inc., A-1 Diner . (Finley, Alec) (mpl).
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1215 ORDER finding as moot #1209 Joint MOTION for Approval of Stipulation Regarding Extension of Discovery Dispute Joint Motion Deadline. A corrected Joint Motion #1214 was filed on June 6, 2018. This Joint Motion, therefore, is moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 6/7/18. (no document attached) (Dembin, Mitchell)
June 6, 2018 Filing 1214 Joint MOTION for Approval of Stipulation Regarding Extension of Discovery Dispute Joint Motion Deadline by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Appendix A)(Yates, Christopher) (mpl).
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1212 ORDER Granting #1206 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/6/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
June 6, 2018 Filing 1211 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF No. #1228 *** NOTICE of Appearance (Hudson, Christian)QC Mail Re Party Association (mpl). (mpl).
June 6, 2018 Filing 1210 Amended Summons Issued re #1208 Fifth Amended Complaint Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mpl)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1209 Joint MOTION for Approval of Stipulation Regarding Extension of Discovery Dispute Joint Motion Deadline by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Yates, Christopher) (mpl).
June 5, 2018 Filing 1208 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Fifth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint of the Indirect Purchaser End Payer Plaintiffs against Louise Adams, filed by Louise Adams. (Attachments: #1 Redlined Fifth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint)New Summons Requested. (Manifold, Betsy) (mpl).
June 5, 2018 Filing 1207 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/6/2018*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1206 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Manifold, Betsy)(aef). Modified on 6/6/2018 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
June 5, 2018 Filing 1206 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Manifold, Betsy) (aef).
June 5, 2018 Filing 1205 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1012 Order re Pro Hac Vice Application. Mail sent to Roger Sachar. (mpl)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1204 ORDER Granting in Part #1155 Joint Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule and Setting Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff shall file its Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss on or before 7/9/2018. Defendants shall file their Reply in Support of the Motion on or before 7/16/2018. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/5/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1202 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Thai Union Group PCL, Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.) with Prejudice as to Claims of Plaintiffs Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Sam's West Inc., and Sam's East, Inc. (Roberti, John) (mpl).
June 4, 2018 Filing 1203 PRO HAC APPROVED: Sumee Oh appearing for Plaintiff John Gross & Company (no document attached) (dsn)
June 4, 2018 Filing 1201 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11290077.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Oh, Sumee) (dsn)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1198 ORDER Granting #1191 , #1195 Motions to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/4/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
June 1, 2018 Filing 1197 NOTICE of Errata to Memorandum in Support of Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Lead Counsel by A-1 Diner, Capitol Hill Supermarket, Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc., Francis T Enterprises, Maquoketa Care Center, Rushin Gold, LLC, SIMON-HINDI, LLC, Thyme Cafe & Market, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Lead Counsel - Redline, #2 Memorandum in Support of Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Lead Counsel)(Finley, Alec) QC Mailer sent re no provision of acceptance for notice of errata; instructed to withdraw and refile (mxn).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1196 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/4/2018*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1195 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Finley, Alec) (aef). Modified on 6/4/2018 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1195 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Finley, Alec)(aef).
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1194 ORDER denying #1125 Joint MOTION for Determination of Discovery Dispute. This dispute involves discovery requests served upon the "Lion Entities." The Lion Entities recently were added as parties but have challenged their inclusion in this case with two Motions to Dismiss. The Lion Entities have not filed an Answer to the complaints and have not participated in a discovery conference under Rule 26(f), Fed. R. Civ. P. Formal discovery as to the Lion Entities has not commenced and no motion for early discovery has been filed and granted. Accordingly, this motion is premature and is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 6/1/18. (no document attached) (Dembin, Mitchell)
June 1, 2018 Filing 1193 ANSWER to #897 Amended Complaint of CVS Pharmacy, Inc. by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth)(mxn).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1192 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/4/2018*** -SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1191 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Stein, Samantha)(aef). Modified on 6/4/2018 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1191 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Stein, Samantha) (aef).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1190 NOTICE of Errata by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs to the Declaration of Russell Mangum, Ph.D. and the Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Class Certification by Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc. re #1140 MOTION to Certify Class (Stein, Samantha) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1189 ORDER finding as moot #1105 Defendant's Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. As provided in this Order, Defendants Ex Parte for Extension of Discovery Dispute Joint Motion Deadline is DENIED AS MOOT because of the filing of Defendants Motion to Compel on May 30, 2018. #1145 . Plaintiffs are ORDERED to respond to the Motion to Compel no later than 7 days from the date of this Order. In their response, Plaintiffs must explain their refusal to stipulate to any extension requested by Defendants and their decision not to participate in a Joint Motion as required by this Courts Chambers Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 6/1/18. (Dembin, Mitchell)
June 1, 2018 Filing 1188 AMENDED ANSWER to #929 Amended Complaint,,, of Krasdale Foods, Inc. by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd.. (Lee, Belinda)(mxn).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1187 AMENDED ANSWER to #929 Amended Complaint,,, of Krasdale Foods, Inc. by Starkist Company. (Lee, Belinda)(mxn).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1186 AMENDED ANSWER to #918 Amended Complaint, of Moran Foods, LLC by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd.. (Lee, Belinda)(mxn).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1185 AMENDED ANSWER to #918 Amended Complaint, of Moran Foods, LLC by Starkist Company. (Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1184 AMENDED ANSWER to #916 Amended Complaint, of the Dollar General Corporation Plaintiffs by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd. (Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1183 AMENDED ANSWER to #916 Amended Complaint, of the Dollar General Corporation Plaintiffs by Starkist Company. (Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1182 AMENDED ANSWER to #933 Amended Complaint, of the Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd. (Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1181 AMENDED ANSWER to #933 Amended Complaint, of the Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs by Starkist Company. (Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1180 AMENDED ANSWER to #930 Amended Complaint, of Wegmans by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd. (Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1179 AMENDED ANSWER to #930 Amended Complaint, of Wegmans by Starkist Company. (Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1178 AMENDED ANSWER to #925 Amended Complaint of the Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. Plaintiffs by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd.. (Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1177 AMENDED ANSWER to #925 Amended Complaint of the Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. Plaintiffs by Starkist Company. (Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1176 AMENDED ANSWER to #923 Amended Complaint,, of the Affiliated Foods Plaintiffs by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd.. (Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1175 AMENDED ANSWER to #923 Amended Complaint,, of the Affiliated Foods Plaintiffs by Starkist Company. (Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1174 AMENDED ANSWER to #920 Amended Complaint,, of W. Lee Flowers & Co., Inc. by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd.. (Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1173 AMENDED ANSWER to #920 Amended Complaint,, of W. Lee Flowers & Co., Inc. by Starkist Company. (Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1172 AMENDED ANSWER to #915 Amended Complaint, of Super Store Industries by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd.(Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1171 AMENDED ANSWER to #915 Amended Complaint, of Super Store Industries by Starkist Company. (Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1170 AMENDED ANSWER to #913 Amended Complaint,, of the SuperValu Inc. Plaintiffs by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd.. (Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1169 AMENDED ANSWER to #913 Amended Complaint,, of the SuperValu Inc. Plaintiffs by Starkist Company. (Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1168 AMENDED ANSWER to #912 Amended Complaint,, of the Publix Super Markets, Inc. Plaintiffs by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd.. (Lee, Belinda)(mxn).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1167 AMENDED ANSWER to #912 Amended Complaint,, of the Publix Super Markets, Inc. Plaintiffs by Starkist Company. (Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1166 AMENDED ANSWER to #911 Amended Complaint,,, of the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd.. (Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1165 AMENDED ANSWER to #911 Amended Complaint,,, of the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs by Starkist Company. (Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1164 AMENDED ANSWER to #910 Amended Complaint of the Kroger Co. Plaintiffs by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd. (Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1163 AMENDED ANSWER to #910 Amended Complaint of the Kroger Co. Plaintiffs by Starkist Company. (Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1162 AMENDED ANSWER to #908 Amended Complaint, of the Meijer, Inc. Plaintiffs by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd.. (Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1161 AMENDED ANSWER to #908 Amended Complaint, of the Meijer, Inc. Plaintiffs by Starkist Company. (Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1160 AMENDED ANSWER to #894 Amended Complaint,,, of the Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Plaintiffs by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd. (Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1159 AMENDED ANSWER to #894 Amended Complaint,,, of the Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Plaintiffs by Starkist Company. (Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1158 ANSWER to #897 Amended Complaint of CVS Pharmacy Inc. by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd.(Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1157 ANSWER to #897 Amended Complaint of CVS Pharmacy Inc. by Starkist Company.(Lee, Belinda)(mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1156 RESPONSE to Motion re #1105 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion regarding Discovery Dispute, #1145 Ex Parte MOTION to Compel Sysco and US Foods's Notice of Intent to Respond to Ex Parte Discovery Motion filed by Sysco Corporation, US Foods, Inc. (Gant, Scott) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1155 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Yates, Christopher) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1154 ANSWER to #897 Amended Complaint (Answer to First Amended Complaint by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1153 ANSWER to #897 Amended Complaint by Thai Union Group PCL.(Roberti, John) (mpl).
June 1, 2018 Filing 1152 ANSWER to #897 Amended Complaint by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John) (mpl).
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1148 ORDER Granting #1128 , #1131 , #1137 Motions to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/31/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1147 ORDER Granting #1144 Joint Motion for Approval of Stipulation to Add and Remove Named Parties. Groucho's Deli of Five Points, LLC, Grouchos Deli of Raleigh, Sandee's Catering and Confetti's Ice Cream Shoppe added. Gladys, LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/31/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1146 ORDER Granting End Payer Plaintiffs' #1104 Unopposed Motion. The Court permits the withdrawal and voluntary dismissal of the individual claims and underlying individual cases of withdrawing named plaintiffs Jessica Decker, Joseph A. Langston, and Kaitlyn Rooney. The Court permits the substitution of Robert Etten into this action as a named plaintiff. EPPs may amend the First Amended Complaint (FAC, ECF No. #888 ) to remove Jessica Decker, Joseph A. Langston, Katherine Larson, and Kaitlyn Rooney as named plaintiffs (see FAC 22, 44, 45, 63), and add Robert Etten as a named plaintiff. Robert Etten added. Kaitlyn Rooney, Jessica Decker, Katherine Larson and Joseph A. Langston terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/31/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
May 30, 2018 Filing 1145 Ex Parte MOTION to Compel by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Bower, #2 Exhibit 1)(Lee, Belinda)(mpl).
May 30, 2018 Filing 1144 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party by A-1 Diner, Capitol Hill Supermarket, Dutch Village Restaurant, Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc., Francis T Enterprises, Harvesters Enterprises, LLC, Lesgo Personal Chef LLC, Maquoketa Care Center, Rushin Gold, LLC, SIMON-HINDI, LLC, Thyme Cafe & Market, Inc., Janet Machen, Gladys, LLC, Painted Plate Catering, GlowFisch Hospitality. (Finley, Alec)Attorney Alec Blaine Finley, Jr added to party Dutch Village Restaurant(pty:pla), Attorney Alec Blaine Finley, Jr added to party Harvesters Enterprises, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Alec Blaine Finley, Jr added to party Lesgo Personal Chef LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Alec Blaine Finley, Jr added to party Janet Machen(pty:pla), Attorney Alec Blaine Finley, Jr added to party Gladys, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Alec Blaine Finley, Jr added to party Painted Plate Catering(pty:pla), Attorney Alec Blaine Finley, Jr added to party GlowFisch Hospitality(pty:pla) (mpl).
May 29, 2018 Filing 1143 MOTION to Certify Class Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Lead Counsel by A-1 Diner, Capitol Hill Supermarket, Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc., Francis T Enterprises, Maquoketa Care Center, Rushin Gold, LLC, SIMON-HINDI, LLC, Thyme Cafe & Market, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Lead Counsel, #2 Declaration of Peter Gil-Montllor in Support of Motion for Class Certification, #3 Expert Report of Michael A. Williams, PhD, #4 Proposed Order Granting Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Lead Counsel)(Finley, Alec) QC Mail re attached proposed order/missing hearing date/time(mpl).
May 29, 2018 Filing 1142 DECLARATION re #1140 MOTION to Certify Class [Declaration of Samantha Stein In Support Of DPPs' Motion for Class Certification] (Redacted) by Plaintiffs Benjamin Foods LLC, Central Grocers, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc., Pacific Groservice Inc., Piggly Wiggly Alabama Distributing Co., Inc., SIMON-HINDI, LLC, Trepco Imports and Distribution LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DPPs' No. 1, #2 Exhibit DPPs' No. 2, #3 Exhibit DPPs' No. 3, #4 Exhibit DPPs' No. 4, #5 Exhibit DPPs' No. 5, #6 Exhibit DPPs' No. 6, #7 Exhibit DPPs' No. 7, #8 Exhibit DPPs' No. 8-74 (Filed Under Seal), #9 Exhibit DPPs' No. 75)(Sweeney, Bonny) (mpl).
May 29, 2018 Filing 1141 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1137 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Finley, Alec) (aef).
May 29, 2018 Filing 1140 MOTION to Certify Class by Benjamin Foods LLC, Central Grocers, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc., Pacific Groservice Inc., Piggly Wiggly Alabama Distributing Co., Inc., Trepco Imports and Distribution LTD. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Redacted))(Sweeney, Bonny) (mpl).
May 29, 2018 Filing 1139 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1131 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Sweeney, Bonny) (aef).
May 29, 2018 Filing 1138 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1131 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Sweeney, Bonny) (aef).
May 29, 2018 Filing 1137 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Finley, Alec) (aef).
May 29, 2018 Filing 1136 Amended ANSWER to Complaint of Sysco Corporation by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
May 29, 2018 Filing 1135 Amended ANSWER to Complaint of Sysco Corporation by Starkist Company.(Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
May 29, 2018 Filing 1134 Amended ANSWER to Complaint of US Foods, Inc. by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd.(Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
May 29, 2018 Filing 1133 Amended ANSWER to Complaint of US Foods, Inc. by Starkist Company.(Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
May 29, 2018 Filing 1132 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1131 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Sweeney, Bonny) (aef).
May 29, 2018 Filing 1131 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Sweeney, Bonny) (aef).
May 29, 2018 Filing 1130 MOTION to Certify Class End Payer Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification by Louise Adams. (Attachments: #1 [Redacted] Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Appendix A, #3 Declaration of Betsy C. Manifold, #4 Exhibit 1-15, #5 Exhibit 16-30, #6 Exhibit 31-45, #7 Exhibit 46-60, #8 Exhibit 61-69, #9 [Redacted] Declaration of Thomas H. Burt, #10 Proof of Service)(Manifold, Betsy) (mpl).
May 29, 2018 Filing 1129 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1128 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Manifold, Betsy) (aef).
May 29, 2018 Filing 1128 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Manifold, Betsy) (aef).
May 29, 2018 Filing 1127 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint of Sysco Corp. by Bumble Bee Foods LLC. (Gallo, Kenneth) (mpl).
May 29, 2018 Filing 1126 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint of US Foods, Inc. by Bumble Bee Foods LLC. (Gallo, Kenneth) (mpl).
May 29, 2018 Filing 1125 Joint MOTION for Determination of Discovery Dispute by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC, Bashas' Inc., Marc Glassman, Inc. (King, Laurence) (mpl).
May 29, 2018 Filing 1124 ANSWER to Complaint of Sysco Corporation by Thai Union Group PCL.(Roberti, John) (mpl).
May 29, 2018 Filing 1123 ANSWER to Complaint of Sysco Corporation by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John) (mpl).
May 29, 2018 Filing 1122 ANSWER to Complaint of US Foods, Inc. by Thai Union Group PCL.(Roberti, John) (mpl).
May 29, 2018 Filing 1121 ANSWER to Complaint of US Foods, Inc. by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John) (mpl).
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1119 ORDER Granting #1099 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/29/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
May 25, 2018 Filing 1118 ANSWER to #933 Amended Complaint, by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth) (jjg).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1117 ANSWER to #920 Amended Complaint,, by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth) (jjg).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1116 ANSWER to #911 Amended Complaint,,, by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth) (jjg).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1115 ANSWER to #894 Amended Complaint,,, by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth) (jjg).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1114 ANSWER to #888 Amended Complaint,, by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth) (jjg).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1113 ANSWER to #930 Amended Complaint, by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth) (jjg).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1112 ANSWER to #925 Amended Complaint by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth) (jjg).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1111 ANSWER to #923 Amended Complaint,, by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth) (jjg).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1110 ANSWER to #915 Amended Complaint, by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth) (jjg).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1109 ANSWER to #913 Amended Complaint,, by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth) (jjg).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1108 ANSWER to #912 Amended Complaint,, by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth) (jjg).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1107 ANSWER to Complaint #910 Amended Complaint by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth) (jjg).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1106 ANSWER to #908 Amended Complaint, by Bumble Bee Foods LLC.(Gallo, Kenneth) (jjg).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1105 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion regarding Discovery Dispute by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd., Starkist Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Bower, #2 Exhibit 1 to Bower Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 to Bower Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 to Bower Decl.)(Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1104 MOTION to Substitute Party , MOTION to Withdraw End Payer Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Unopposed Motion for Order: (1) Substituting Robert Etten for Plaintiff Katherine Larson Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b); and (2) Allowing Withdrawal and Voluntary Dismissal of Individual Claims of Jessica Decker, Joseph A. Langston, and Kaitlyn Rooney Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 or 41(a)(1) by Louise Adams. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Betsy C. Manifold, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Proof of Service)(Manifold, Betsy) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1103 ANSWER to #929 Amended Complaint,,, of Krasdale Foods, Inc. by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1102 ANSWER to #929 Amended Complaint,,, of Krasdale Foods, Inc. by Starkist Company.(Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1101 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 5/29/2018*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1099 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Manifold, Betsy) (aef) Modified on 5/29/2018 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1100 ANSWER to #918 Amended Complaint, of Moran Foods, LLC by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Lee, Belinda) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1099 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Manifold, Betsy) (aef).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1098 ANSWER to #918 Amended Complaint, of Moran Foods, LLC by Starkist Company.(Lee, Belinda) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1097 ANSWER to #916 Amended Complaint, of the Dollar General Corporation Plaintiffs by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd.(Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1096 ANSWER to #916 Amended Complaint, of the Dollar General Corporation Plaintiffs by Starkist Company.(Lee, Belinda)(mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1095 ANSWER to #933 Amended Complaint, of the Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1094 ANSWER to #933 Amended Complaint, of the Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs by Starkist Company.(Lee, Belinda) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1093 ANSWER to #930 Amended Complaint, of Wegmans by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Lee, Belinda) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1092 ANSWER to #930 Amended Complaint, of Wegmans by Starkist Company.(Lee, Belinda) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1091 ANSWER to #925 Amended Complaint of the Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. Plaintiffs by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Lee, Belinda) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1090 ANSWER to #925 Amended Complaint of the Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. Plaintiffs by Starkist Company.(Lee, Belinda) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1089 ANSWER to #923 Amended Complaint,, of the Affiliated Foods Plaintiffs by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Lee, Belinda) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1088 ANSWER to #923 Amended Complaint,, of the Affiliated Foods Plaintiffs by Starkist Company.(Lee, Belinda) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1087 ANSWER to #920 Amended Complaint,, of W. Lee Flowers & Co., Inc. by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Lee, Belinda) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1086 ANSWER to #920 Amended Complaint,, of W. Lee Flowers & Co., Inc. by Starkist Company.(Lee, Belinda) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1085 ANSWER to #915 Amended Complaint, of Super Store Industries by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd.(Lee, Belinda) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1084 ANSWER to #915 Amended Complaint, of Super Store Industries by Starkist Company.(Lee, Belinda)(ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1083 ANSWER to #918 Amended Complaint, (Answer to First Amended Complaint by Moran Foods, Inc.) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1082 ANSWER to #913 Amended Complaint,, of the SuperValu Inc. Plaintiffs by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd.(Lee, Belinda) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1081 ANSWER to #929 Amended Complaint,,, (Answer to First Amended Complaint by Krasdale Foods, Inc.) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara)(ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1080 ANSWER to #913 Amended Complaint,, of the SuperValu Inc. Plaintiffs by Starkist Company.(Lee, Belinda)(ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1079 ANSWER to #911 Amended Complaint,,, (Answer to Third Consolidated Direct Purchaser Class Complaint) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1078 ANSWER to #912 Amended Complaint,, of the Publix Super Markets, Inc. Plaintiffs by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Lee, Belinda) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1077 ANSWER to #912 Amended Complaint,, of the Publix Super Markets, Inc. Plaintiffs by Starkist Company.(Lee, Belinda) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1076 ANSWER to #916 Amended Complaint, (Answer to First Amended Complaint by Dollar General Corporation, et al.) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1075 ANSWER to #911 Amended Complaint,,, of the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Lee, Belinda) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1074 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer to Commercial Food Preparer Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1073 ANSWER to #911 Amended Complaint,,, of the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs by Starkist Company.(Lee, Belinda) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1072 ANSWER to #925 Amended Complaint (Answer to Fourth Amended Complaint by Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. and Bi-Lo Holdings, LLC) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1071 ANSWER to Complaint #910 of Kroger Co. by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Lee, Belinda) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1070 ANSWER to #930 Amended Complaint, (Answer to Third Amended Complaint by Wegmans Food Markets Inc.) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara)(ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1069 ANSWER to Complaint #910 of Kroger Co. by Starkist Company.(Lee, Belinda) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1068 ANSWER to #894 Amended Complaint,,, (Answer to Second Amended Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al.) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1067 ANSWER to #908 Amended Complaint, of the Meijer, Inc. Plaintiffs by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Lee, Belinda) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1066 ANSWER to #920 Amended Complaint,, (Answer to Second Amended Complaint by W. Lee Flowers & Co., Inc.) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara) (ajs).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1065 ANSWER to #908 Amended Complaint, of the Meijer, Inc. Plaintiffs by Starkist Company.(Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1064 ANSWER to #913 Amended Complaint,, (Answer to First Amended Complaint by SuperValu, Inc.) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1063 ANSWER to #915 Amended Complaint, (Answer to First Amended Complaint by Super Store Industries) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1062 ANSWER to #912 Amended Complaint, (Answer to Third Amended Complaint by Publix Super Markets, Inc. and Wakefern Food Corp.) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1061 ANSWER to #894 Amended Complaint,,, of the Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Plaintiffs by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd.(Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1060 ANSWER to #908 Amended Complaint, (Answer to Third Amended Complaint by Meijer, Inc. and Meijer Distribution, Inc.) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1059 ANSWER to #894 Amended Complaint,,, of the Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Plaintiffs by Starkist Company.(Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1058 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer to Third Amended Complaint by Kroger Co., et al.) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1057 ANSWER to #888 Amended Complaint,, of the Indirect Purchaser End Payer Plaintiffs by Dongwon Industries Co., Ltd..(Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1056 ANSWER to #888 Amended Complaint,, (Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint of the Indirect Purchaser End Payer Plaintiffs) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1055 ANSWER to #888 Amended Complaint, of the Indirect Purchaser End Payer Plaintiffs by Starkist Company.(Lee, Belinda) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1054 ANSWER to #923 Amended Complaint,, (Third Consolidated Amended Complaint by Affiliated Foods, Inc., et al.) by Del Monte Corporation.(Sicalides, Barbara) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1053 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Third Amended Complaint of the Kroger Plaintiffs by Thai Union Group PCL.(Roberti, John)(mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1052 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to the Third Amended Complaint of the Kroger Plaintiffs by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John)(mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1051 ANSWER to #929 Amended Complaint,,, by Thai Union Group PCL.(Roberti, John) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1050 ANSWER to #929 Amended Complaint,,, by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John)(mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1049 ANSWER to #888 Amended Complaint,, by Thai Union Group Public Company, Ltd. (Roberti, John) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1048 ANSWER to #888 Amended Complaint,, by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1047 ANSWER to #916 Amended Complaint, by Thai Union Group PCL.(Roberti, John) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1046 ANSWER to #916 Amended Complaint, by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1045 ANSWER to #911 Amended Complaint,,, by Thai Union Group Public Company, Ltd..(Roberti, John) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1044 ANSWER to #911 Amended Complaint,,, by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John)(mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1043 ANSWER to #908 Amended Complaint, by Thai Union Group PCL.(Roberti, John) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1042 ANSWER to #908 Amended Complaint, by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1041 ANSWER to #930 Amended Complaint, by Thai Union Group PCL.(Roberti, John) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1040 ANSWER to #930 Amended Complaint, by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1039 ANSWER to #915 Amended Complaint, by Thai Union Group PCL.(Roberti, John) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1038 ANSWER to #915 Amended Complaint, by Tri-Union Seafoods LLC(doing business as Chicken of the Sea International, Inc.).(Roberti, John) (mpl).
May 25, 2018 Filing 1037 ANSWER to #913 Amended Complaint,, by Thai Union Group PCL.(Roberti, John) (mpl).
May 25, 2018