Intl Refugee Assistance v. Donald J. Trump
Plaintiff / Appellee: INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT, a project of the Urban Justice Center, Inc., on behalf of itself and its clients, HIAS, INC., on behalf of itself and its clients, MUHAMMED METEAB, PAUL HARRISON, IBRAHIM AHMED MOHOMED, JOHN DOES #1 & 3, JANE DOE #2 and MIDDLE EAST STUDIES ASSOCIATION OF NORTH AMERICA, INC., on behalf of itself and its members
Defendant / Appellant: DONALD J. TRUMP, in his official capacity as President of the United States, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, JOHN F. KELLY, in his official capacity as Secretary of Homeland Security, REX TILLERSON, in his official capacity as Secretary of State and DANIEL R. COATS, in his official capacity as Director of National Intelligence
Amicus Curiae: STATE OF TEXAS, STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF ARIZONA, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, PHIL BRYANT, Governor of the State of Mississippi, AMERICAN CIVIL RIGHTS UNION, AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE, IMMIGRATION REFORM LAW INSTITUTE, U. S. JUSTICE FOUNDATION, CITIZENS UNITED, CITIZENS UNITED FOUNDATION, ENGLISH FIRST FOUNDATION, ENGLISH FIRST, PUBLIC ADVOCATE OF THE UNITED STATES, GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC., CONSERVATIVE LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, U. S. BORDER CONTROL FOUNDATION, POLICY ANALYSIS CENTER, SOUTHEASTERN LEGAL FOUNDATION, VICTOR WILLIAMS, INTERFAITH COALITION, COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES, T.A., COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WASHINGTON, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, AMERICAN-ARAB ANTI-DISCRIMINATION COMMITTEE, CITY OF CHICAGO, BEND THE ARC, SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER, AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, CITY OF NEW YORK, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, CITY OF AUSTIN, JAMES A. DIOSSA, Mayor of Central Falls, Rhode Island, CITY OF GARY, CITY OF IOWA CITY, SVANTE L. MYRICK, Mayor of Ithaca, CITY OF JERSEY CITY, CITY OF MADISON, CITY OF MINNEAPOLIS, MONTGOMERY COUNTY, CITY OF OAKLAND, CITY OF PITTSBURGH, WILLIAM PEDUTO, Mayor of Pittsburgh, CITY OF PORTLAND, CITY OF PROVIDENCE, JORGE O. ELORZA, Mayor of Providence, CITY OF ST. LOUIS, CITY OF SAINT PAUL, CITY OF SAN FRANCISCO, COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, CITY OF SAN JOSE, CITY OF SANTA MONICA, SANTA CLARA COUNTY, CITY OF SEATTLE, VILLAGE OF SKOKIE, CITY OF SOUTH BEND, CITY OF TUSCON, CITY OF WEST HOLLYWOOD, FORMER NATIONAL SECURITY OFFICIALS, NEW YORK UNIVERSITY, RODERICK & SOLANGE MACARTHUR JUSTICE CENTER, UNIVERSITY PROFESSORS AND HIGHER EDUCATION ASSOCIATIONS, INTERNATIONAL LAW SCHOLARS, NONGOVERNMENTAL ORGANIZATIONS, ISMAIL ELSHIKH, ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE, JEWISH COUNCIL FOR PUBLIC AFFAIRS, UNION FOR REFORM JUDAISM, CENTRAL CONFERENCE OF AMERICAN RABBIS, WOMEN OF REFORM JUDAISM, AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION, MUSLIM JUSTICE LEAGUE, MUSLIM PUBLIC AFFAIRS COUNCIL, ISLAMIC CIRCLE OF NORTH AMERICA, COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS, ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE-ASIAN LAW CAUCUS, NATIONAL IMMIGRANT JUSTICE CENTER, ASISTA, AMERICANS FOR IMMIGRANT JUSTICE, FUTURES WITHOUT VIOLENCE, NORTH CAROLINA COALITION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, SANCTUARY FOR FAMILIES, MEMBERS OF CONGRESS, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY & MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, HISTORY PROFESSORS & SCHOLARS, LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, CENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS, SOUTHERN COALITION FOR SOCIAL JUSTICE, NATIONAL CENTER FOR LESBIAN RIGHTS, JUDGE DAVID L. BAZELON CENTER FOR MENTAL HEALTH LAW, CHICAGO LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, MISSISSIPPI CENTER FOR JUSTICE, TECHNOLOGY COMPANIES, FRED T. KOREMATSU CENTER FOR LAW & EQUALITY, JAY HIRABAYASHI, HOLLY YASUI, KAREN KOREMATSU, CIVIL RIGHTS ORGANIZATIONS, NATIONAL BAR ASSOCIATIONS OF COLOR, FOUNDATION FOR THE CHILDREN OF IRAN, IRANIAN ALLIANCES ACROSS BORDERS, MASSACHUSETTS TECHNOLOGY LEADERSHIP COUNCIL, EPISCOPAL BISHOPS, IMMIGRATION LAW SCHOLARS & CLINICIANS ON STATUTORY CLAIMS, FORMER FEDERAL IMMIGRATION & HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICIALS, CONSTITUTIONAL LAW SCHOLARS, MEDICAL INSTITUTIONS, ADVOCACY ORGANIZATIONS, INDIVIDUAL PHYSICIANS, TAHIRIH JUSTICE CENTER, ASIAN PACIFIC INSTITUTE ON GENDER-BASED VIOLENCE, CASA DE ESPERANZA, NATIONAL DOMESTIC VIOLENCE HOTLINE, INTERFAITH GROUP OF RELIGIOUS & INTERRELIGIOUS ORGANIZATIONS, OXFAM AMERICA, INC., CONSTITUTIONAL LAW PROFESSORS, AMERICAN JEWISH COMMITTEE, MUSLIM RIGHTS, PROFESSIONAL & PUBLIC HEALTH ORGANIZATIONS, CATO INSTITUTE, NATIONAL ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION OF ART MUSEUM DIRECTORS, AMERICAN ALLIANCE OF MUSEUMS, COLLEGE ART ASSOCIATION, 94 ART MUSEUMS, AMERICAN PROFESSIONAL SOCIETY ON THE ABUSE OF CHILDREN, ADVOCATES FOR HUMAN RIGHTS, ASIAN LAW ALLIANCE, ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN NETWORK OF OREGON, CASA, COMMUNITY REFUGEE & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, INTEGRATED REFUGEE & IMMIGRANT SERVICES, IMMIGRANT LAW CENTER OF MINNESOTA, SOUTHEAST ASIA RESOURCE ACTION CENTER, IMMIGRANT RIGHTS CLINIC OF WASHINGTON, AIRPORT ATTORNEYS COALITION, SQUARE LEGAL SERVICES, INC., MEMBERS OF THE CLERGY, RIVERSIDE CHURCH IN THE CITY OF NEW YORK, A JEWISH PARTNERSHIP FOR JUSTICE, CITY OF BOSTON, MARTIN J. WALSH, Mayor of Boston, TOWN OF CARRBORO, COOK COUNTY, ILLINOIS, CITY OF NEW HAVEN, TONI N. HARP, Mayor of New Haven, CITY COUNCIL OF NEW YORK, MAYOR OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK, WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS and HOWARD UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW CIVIL RIGHTS CLINIC
Case Number: 17-1351
Filed: March 17, 2017
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER filed [1000454076] granting Motion to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel [ # 316 ]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 02/07/2019 04:55 PM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 316 MOTION by Muslim Rights, Professional & Public Health Organizations to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel.Attorney or client motion? Attorney. Was a copy of the motion served on the defendant? N. Was the defendant advised of right to file response within 7 days? N. Date and method of service: 02/07/2019 ecf. [1000454064] [17-1351] Johnathan Smith [Entered: 02/07/2019 04:47 PM]
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER filed [1000276791] granting Motion to withdraw counsel [ # 314 ]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351] TW [Entered: 04/16/2018 03:46 PM]
April 16, 2018 Filing 314 MOTION by Amicus Supporting Appellee Interfaith Coalition to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel.Attorney or client motion? Attorney... Date and method of service: 04/16/2018 ecf. [1000276588] [17-1351] William Zapf [Entered: 04/16/2018 01:11 PM]
January 9, 2018 Filing 313 Mandate issued. Referencing: [ # 312 ] Judgment Order , [ # 311 ] court Order. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00361-TDC.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 01/09/2018 09:31 AM]
November 17, 2017 Filing 312 JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method: Order. Decision: Dismissed. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00361-TDC. Entered on Docket Date: 11/17/2017. [1000194769] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency.. [17-1351] JHM [Entered: 11/17/2017 06:30 PM]
November 17, 2017 Filing 311 Corrected COURT ORDER filed [1000194764] dismissing appeal [311] Copies to all parties.. [17-1351]. JHM [Entered: 11/17/2017 05:55 PM]
November 17, 2017 Filing 310 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) COURT ORDER filed [1000194760] dismissing appeal [310] Copies to all parties.. [17-1351]--[Edited 11/21/2017 by SAC] JHM [Entered: 11/17/2017 05:40 PM]
November 17, 2017 Filing 309 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellee Members of Congress in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/17/2017. [1000194731] [17-1351]--[Edited 11/20/2017 by JSN] Peter Karanjia [Entered: 11/17/2017 04:46 PM]
November 14, 2017 Filing 308 SUPREME COURT REMARK--judgment remanding case received. REMANDED vacated, 11/14/2017. [17-1351] SJC [Entered: 11/14/2017 11:35 AM]
October 10, 2017 Filing 307 SUPREME COURT REMARK--order remanding case received. 10/10/2017, REMANDED vacated. [17-1351] SJC [Entered: 10/12/2017 03:42 PM]
August 1, 2017 RECORD requested by Supreme Court from court of appeals and district court/agency. Supreme Court Docket No.: 16-1436. [17-1351] SJC [Entered: 08/01/2017 12:01 PM]
August 1, 2017 RECORD (4CCA) transmitted to Supreme Court. Supreme Court Docket No.: 16-1436. [17-1351] SJC [Entered: 08/01/2017 12:05 PM]
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER filed [1000119441] recalling mandate. Copies to all parties.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 07/17/2017 12:20 PM]
July 17, 2017 Filing 305 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) Mandate issued. ENTRY WITHDRAWN DUE TO CLERICAL ERROR.. [17-1351]--[Edited 07/17/2017 by JSN] JSN [Entered: 07/17/2017 09:44 AM]
June 29, 2017 Filing 303 SUPREME COURT REMARK--petition for writ of certiorari granted and application for stay of preliminary injunction granted in part. 06/26/2017 [17-1351] SJC [Entered: 06/29/2017 10:30 AM]
June 15, 2017 Filing 302 AMENDED OPINION filed amending and superseding opinion dated 5/25/17. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00361-TDC. Copies to all parties. Annotation added to opinion reflecting Supreme Court history [17-1351]--[Edited 07/12/2017 by SJC] TW [Entered: 06/15/2017 12:47 PM]
June 15, 2017 Filing 301 AMENDING ORDER filed. Copies to all parties. [17-1351] TW [Entered: 06/15/2017 12:45 PM]
June 5, 2017 Filing 300 SUPREME COURT REMARK--petition for writ of certiorari filed. 06/01/2017. 16-1436. [17-1351] SJC [Entered: 06/05/2017 02:23 PM]
May 31, 2017 Filing 299 AMENDED OPINION filed amending and superseding opinion dated 05/25/2017. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00361-TDC Copies to all parties.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 05/31/2017 11:58 AM]
May 31, 2017 Filing 298 AMENDING ORDER filed. Copies to all parties.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 05/31/2017 11:56 AM]
May 25, 2017 Filing 297 OPINION ATTACHMENT. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 05/25/2017 03:14 PM]
May 25, 2017 Filing 296 JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method: 17-1351 opn.p.arg. Decision: Affirmed in part, vacated in part. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00361-TDC. Entered on Docket Date: 05/25/2017. [1000088546] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 05/25/2017 01:54 PM]
May 25, 2017 Filing 295 PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Motion disposition in opinion denying Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 35 ]. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00361-TDC. [1000088535]. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 05/25/2017 01:47 PM]
May 10, 2017 Filing 294 COURT ORDER filed [1000079712] granting Motion to supplement [ # 287 ]. Copies to all parties.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 05/10/2017 05:21 PM]
May 8, 2017 Filing 293 EN BANC ORAL ARGUMENT heard before the Honorable Roger L. Gregory, Paul V. Niemeyer, Diana Gribbon Motz, William B. Traxler, Jr., Robert B. King, Dennis W. Shedd, G. Steven Agee, Barbara Milano Keenan, James A. Wynn, Jr., Albert Diaz, Henry F. Floyd, Stephanie D. Thacker and Pamela A. Harris. Attorneys arguing case: Mr. Jeffrey Bryan Wall for Appellants United States Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Rex Tillerson, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, John F. Kelly, Donald J. Trump and Daniel R. Coats and Mr. Omar C. Jadwat for Appellees Paul Harrison, Jane Doe #2, International Refugee Assistance Project, HIAS, Inc., Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Muhammed Meteab, Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed and John Does #1 & 3. Courtroom Deputy: RJ Warren. [1000077923] [17-1351] RW [Entered: 05/08/2017 04:40 PM]
May 7, 2017 Filing 292 REPLY by Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed to Response [ # 291 ], Motion to supplement [ # 287 ].. [17-1351] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 05/07/2017 06:56 PM]
May 5, 2017 Filing 291 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security to Motion to supplement [ # 287 ]. [17-1351] Sharon Swingle [Entered: 05/05/2017 07:10 PM]
May 5, 2017 Filing 290 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX (PAPER) file-stamped on behalf of Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed. Sealed volume: N. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): 1. Total number of pages in all volumes: 4. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? N. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/05/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/05/2017. [1000076942] [17-1351] AB [Entered: 05/05/2017 02:47 PM]
May 5, 2017 Filing 289 Corrected Supplemental FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellees Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 05/04/2017. [1000076932] [17-1351] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 05/05/2017 02:40 PM]
May 4, 2017 Filing 288 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) Supplemental FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellees Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 05/04/2017. [1000076361] [17-1351]--[Edited 05/05/2017 by ABW] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 05/04/2017 06:41 PM]
May 4, 2017 Filing 287 MOTION by Appellees Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed to supplement record. Date and method of service: 05/04/2017 ecf. [1000076357] [17-1351] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 05/04/2017 06:30 PM]
May 4, 2017 Filing 286 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Sonia Kumar for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed.[1000076118] [17-1351] Sonia Kumar [Entered: 05/04/2017 02:12 PM]
May 3, 2017 Filing 284 COURT ORDER filed [1000075350] denying Motion to participate in oral argument [ # 282 ]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Victor Williams. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 05/03/2017 04:05 PM]
May 3, 2017 Filing 283 COURT ORDER filed [1000075346] denying Motion to intervene [ # 254 ]. Copies to all parties.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 05/03/2017 04:03 PM]
May 3, 2017 Filing 282 MOTION by Amicus Supporting Appellant Victor Williams to participate in oral argument. Date and method of service: 05/02/2017 US mail. [1000074892] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 05/03/2017 10:19 AM]
April 27, 2017 Filing 280 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security to Motion to intervene [ # 254 ], Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 254 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [17-1351] Lowell Sturgill [Entered: 04/27/2017 04:14 PM]
April 27, 2017 Filing 278 Docket correction requested from Yolanda Cher Rondon for American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee. Re: [277] amicus curiae Brief (paper). [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/27/2017 11:52 AM]
April 26, 2017 Filing 276 COURT ORDER filed [1000070135] approving/authorizing C-Span request for live audio feed of oral argument. Copies to all parties.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/26/2017 04:52 PM]
April 26, 2017 Filing 271 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Peter Karanjia for Members of Congress.[1000069551] [17-1351] Peter Karanjia [Entered: 04/26/2017 10:22 AM]
April 25, 2017 Filing 285 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of University Professors and Higher Education Associations. Number of pages: [55]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/04/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/04/2017. [1000075864] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 05/04/2017 11:07 AM]
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER filed [1000069191] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 269 ]. Copies to all parties.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/25/2017 03:48 PM]
April 25, 2017 Filing 269 MOTION by Amicus Supporting Appellee Howard University School of Law Civil Rights Clinic to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 04/25/2017 ecf. [1000069128] [17-1351] Karla McKanders [Entered: 04/25/2017 02:51 PM]
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER filed [1000069031] granting amended Petition/ motion for leave to file [ # 224 ]. Copies to all parties.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/25/2017 02:05 PM]
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER filed [1000069022] granting Motion for leave to file [ # 208 ]. Copies to all parties.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/25/2017 02:02 PM]
April 25, 2017 Filing 264 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed to notice requesting response [ # 256 ]. [17-1351] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 04/25/2017 12:54 PM]
April 25, 2017 Filing 263 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed to notice requesting response [ # 251 ]. [17-1351] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 04/25/2017 12:52 PM]
April 25, 2017 Filing 262 Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellee Howard University School of Law Civil Rights Clinic in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 10/25/2017. [1000068875] [17-1351] Karla McKanders [Entered: 04/25/2017 12:27 PM]
April 24, 2017 Filing 279 Supplemental ADDENDUM/ATTACHMENT (PAPER) file-stamped on behalf of Airport Attorneys Coalition. Number of pages: [11]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on docket date: 04/27/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/26/2017. [1000070696] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/27/2017 12:03 PM]
April 24, 2017 Filing 261 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Advocacy Organizations, Individual Physicians and Medical Institutions. Number of pages: [37]. Number of Copies: [17]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/25/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/25/2017. [1000068826] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/25/2017 11:44 AM]
April 24, 2017 Filing 259 DOCUMENT referencing [ # 258 ] Motion for leave to file, [ # 195 ] Document , [ # 194 ] Motion for leave to file, [ # 193 ] amicus curiae Brief , [ # 192 ] Motion for leave to file by Amicus Supporting Appellee Airport Attorneys Coalition. [1000068180] [17-1351] Michael Roberts [Entered: 04/24/2017 08:36 PM]
April 24, 2017 Filing 258 MOTION by Amicus Supporting Appellee Airport Attorneys Coalition leave to file Supplemental Attachments to Brief of Amici Curiae Airport Attorneys Coalition Document [ # 195 ], Motion for leave to file [ # 194 ], amicus curiae Brief [ # 193 ], Motion for leave to file [ # 192 ]. Date and method of service: 04/24/2017 ecf. [1000068177] [17-1351] Michael Roberts [Entered: 04/24/2017 08:33 PM]
April 24, 2017 Filing 257 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security to notice requesting response [ # 251 ]. [17-1351] Sharon Swingle [Entered: 04/24/2017 05:47 PM]
April 24, 2017 Filing 256 NOTICE ISSUED to Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Rex Tillerson, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, John F. Kelly, Daniel R. Coats, International Refugee Assistance Project, Paul Harrison, Jane Doe #2, HIAS, Inc., Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Muhammed Meteab, Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed and John Does #1 & 3, requesting response to Motion to intervene [ # 254 ] . Responses due:04/27/2017.[1000068038].. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/24/2017 04:14 PM]
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER filed [1000068007] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 252 ]. Copies to all parties.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/24/2017 03:55 PM]
April 24, 2017 Filing 254 MOTION by John Doe #8, Proposed Intervenor to intervene, to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) without consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 04/24/2017 ecf. [1000067990] [17-1351] Lena Masri [Entered: 04/24/2017 03:43 PM]
April 24, 2017 Filing 253 Amended AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amici Supporting Appellee Advocacy Organizations, Individual Physicians and Medical Institutions in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/24/2017. [1000067962] [17-1351] Manvin Mayell [Entered: 04/24/2017 03:30 PM]
April 24, 2017 Filing 252 Amended MOTION by Amici Supporting Appellee Advocacy Organizations, Individual Physicians and Medical Institutions to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 04/24/2017 ecf. [1000067937] [17-1351] Manvin Mayell [Entered: 04/24/2017 03:21 PM]
April 24, 2017 Filing 251 NOTICE ISSUED to Donald J. Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, John F. Kelly, Rex Tillerson, Daniel R. Coats, International Refugee Assistance Project, Hias, Inc., Muhammed Meteab, Paul Harrison, Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed, John Does #1 & 3, Jane Doe #2, and Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., requesting response to amended Petition for leave to file amicus brief[ # 224 ], Motion for leave to file amicus brief [ # 208 ]. Responses due: 04/25/2017.[1000067873]. [17-1351]-[Edited 04/24/2017 by JSN] JSN [Entered: 04/24/2017 02:59 PM]
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER filed [1000067418] granting Motion for leave to file [ # 166 ]. Copies to all parties.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/24/2017 11:21 AM]
April 24, 2017 Filing 248 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed.[1000067247] [17-1351] Nicholas Steiner [Entered: 04/24/2017 09:51 AM]
April 22, 2017 Filing 224 Amended petition/motion by National Asian Pacific American Bar Association amending [ # 188 ] Motion to file amicus curiae brief. Document: NAPABA Am. Mot. Leave.pdf. [1000066933] [17-1351] Joshua Rogaczewski [Entered: 04/22/2017 12:15 PM]
April 22, 2017 Filing 223 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Sirine Shebaya for Airport Attorneys Coalition.[1000066923] [17-1351] Sirine Shebaya [Entered: 04/22/2017 09:24 AM]
April 21, 2017 Filing 273 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Immigration Law Scholars & Clinicians On Statutory Claims. Number of pages: [44]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/26/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/26/2017. [1000069738] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/26/2017 12:41 PM]
April 21, 2017 Filing 260 REPLY BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security. Number of pages: [40]. Sufficient: YES. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/25/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/25/2017. [1000068818] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/25/2017 11:41 AM]
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER filed [1000066915] granting Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) [ # 220 ]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/21/2017 09:30 PM]
April 21, 2017 Filing 221 BRIEF by Appellants Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: REPLY. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/24/2017. [1000066914] [17-1351] Anne Murphy [Entered: 04/21/2017 09:22 PM]
April 21, 2017 Filing 220 Corrected MOTION by Amicus Supporting Appellee Immigration Law Scholars & Clinicians On Statutory Claims leave to file amicus curiae Brief [ # 219 ]. Date and method of service: 04/21/2017 ecf. [1000066901] [17-1351] Fatma Marouf [Entered: 04/21/2017 05:49 PM]
April 21, 2017 Filing 219 Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellee Immigration Law Scholars & Clinicians On Statutory Claims in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/20/2017. [1000066900] [17-1351] Fatma Marouf [Entered: 04/21/2017 05:45 PM]
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER filed [1000066726] granting Motion for leave to file amicus brief (FRAP 29(e)) [ # 192 ]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/21/2017 03:07 PM]
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER filed [1000066724] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 186 ]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/21/2017 03:03 PM]
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER filed [1000066714] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 184 ]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/21/2017 02:58 PM]
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER filed [1000066705] granting Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) [ # 181 ]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/21/2017 02:54 PM]
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER filed [1000066696] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 169 ]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/21/2017 02:50 PM]
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER filed [1000066690] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 159 ].Copies to all parties. [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/21/2017 02:45 PM]
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER filed [1000066681] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 151 ]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/21/2017 02:40 PM]
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER filed [1000066670] granting Motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 20(e)) [ # 145 ]. Copies to all parties.. [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/21/2017 02:37 PM]
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER filed [1000066661] granting filing of amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) [ # 144 ]. Copies to all parties. [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/21/2017 02:31 PM]
April 21, 2017 Filing 208 Corrected MOTION by Amicus Supporting Appellee Massachusetts Technology Leadership Council leave to file Amicus Brief Motion for leave to file [ # 168 ]. Date and method of service: 04/21/2017 ecf. [1000066448] [17-1351] Gare Smith [Entered: 04/21/2017 11:15 AM]
April 21, 2017 Filing 207 Calendar notice sent.. Nature of notice: Updated check-in time. [17-1351] JLC [Entered: 04/21/2017 10:45 AM]
April 21, 2017 Filing 206 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by J. Wells Harrell for Former Federal Immigration & Homeland Security Officials.[1000066300] [17-1351] James Harrell [Entered: 04/21/2017 09:16 AM]
April 21, 2017 Filing 205 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Lynne Bernabei for Center for Reproductive Rights, Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Mississippi Center for Justice, National Center for Lesbian Rights and Southern Coalition for Social Justice.[1000066258] [17-1351] Lynne Bernabei [Entered: 04/21/2017 08:29 AM]
April 20, 2017 Filing 204 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Marielena Hincapie for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed.[1000066179] [17-1351] Marielena Hincapie [Entered: 04/20/2017 11:36 PM]
April 20, 2017 Filing 203 Follow Up Notice issued to Karla McKanders re: docket correction requested, re: [ # 133 ] amicus curiae Brief..Corrected brief due: 04/24/2017. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/20/2017 08:38 PM]
April 20, 2017 Filing 202 Docket correction requested from Fatma Essam Marouf for Immigration Law Scholars & Clinicians On Statutory Claims. Re: [ # 183 ] amicus curiae Brief. Corrected brief due: 04/24/2017. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/20/2017 07:46 PM]
April 20, 2017 Filing 201 Docket correction requested from Fatma Essam Marouf for Immigration Law Scholars & Clinicians On Statutory Claims, Manvin Singh Mayell for Medical Institutions, Advocacy Organizations and Individual Physicians, Joshua David Rogaczewski for National Asian Pacific American Bar Association and Gare Alan Smith for Massachusetts Technology Leadership Council. Re: [ # 168 ] Motion for leave to file, [ # 170 ] Motion to file amicus curiae brief, [ # 174 ] Motion to file amicus curiae brief, [ # 188 ] Motion to file amicus curiae brief; requesting amended motions. Amended motions due: 04/24/2017. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/20/2017 07:33 PM]
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER filed [1000066157] granting Motion for leave to file [ # 157 ]. Copies to all parties.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/20/2017 07:14 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 281 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee. Number of pages: [38]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/02/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/02/2017. [1000073915] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 05/02/2017 11:26 AM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 277 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee. Number of pages: [30]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/27/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/27/2017. [1000070666] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/27/2017 11:51 AM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 275 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of American Professional Society on the Abuse of Children. Number of pages: [41]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/26/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/21/2017. [1000069956] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/26/2017 03:21 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 274 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Constitutional Law Professors. Number of pages: [41]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/26/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/21/2017. [1000069853] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/26/2017 02:27 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 272 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of City Council of New York, City of Austin, City of Boston, City of Chicago, City of Gary, City of Iowa City, City of Jersey City, City of Los Angeles, City of Madison, City of Minneapolis, City of New Haven, City of New York, City of Oakland, City of Philadelphia, City of Portland, City of Providence, City of Saint Paul, City of San Francisco, City of San Jose, City of Santa Monica, City of Seattle, City of South Bend, City of St. Louis, City of Tuscon, City of West Hollywood, Cook County, Illinois, County of San Francisco, James A. Diossa, Jorge O. Elorza, Toni N. Harp, Mayor of the City of New York, Montgomery County, Svante L. Myrick, Santa Clara County, Town of Carrboro, Village of Skokie and Martin J. Walsh. Number of pages: [49]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/26/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/26/2017. [1000069734] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/26/2017 12:32 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 268 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of National Asian Pacific American Bar Association. Number of pages: [39]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/25/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000069045] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/25/2017 02:13 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 267 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Massachusetts Technology Leadership Council. Number of pages: [38]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/25/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000069042] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/25/2017 02:11 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 250 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of American Professional Society on the Abuse of Children. Number of pages: [41]. Number of Copies: [1]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/24/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/24/2017. [1000067846] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/24/2017 02:47 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 247 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Technology Companies. Number of pages: [66]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066973] [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/22/2017 08:14 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 246 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Members of Congress. Number of pages: [53]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066972] [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/22/2017 08:07 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 245 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Center for Reproductive Rights, Chicago Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Mississippi Center for Justice, National Center for Lesbian Rights, Southern Coalition for Social Justice and Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights and Urban Affairs. Number of pages: [55]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/21/2017. [1000066971] [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/22/2017 07:59 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 244 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Advocates for Human Rights, Asian Law Alliance, Asian Pacific American Network of Oregon, CASA, Community Refugee & Immigration Services, Immigrant Law Center of Minnesota, Immigrant Rights Clinic of Washington, Integrated Refugee & Immigrant Services, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center and Square Legal Services, Inc.. Number of pages: [42]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066970] [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/22/2017 07:53 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 243 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Foundation for the Children of Iran. Number of pages: [39]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066969] [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/22/2017 07:17 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 242 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Constitutional Law Scholars. Number of pages: [45]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/21/2017. [1000066968] [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/22/2017 07:12 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 241 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Asian Law Caucus, Council on American-Islamic Relations, Islamic Circle of North America, Muslim Justice League and Muslim Public Affairs Council. Number of pages: [39]. Number of Copies: [15]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066967] [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/22/2017 07:07 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 240 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Interfaith Group of Religious & Interreligious Organizations. Number of pages: [49]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/21/2017. [1000066964] [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/22/2017 06:43 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 239 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Muslim Rights, Professional & Public Health Organizations. Number of pages: [41]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/21/2017. [1000066963] [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/22/2017 06:35 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 238 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Asian Pacific Institute on Gender-Based Violence, Casa de Esperanza, National Domestic Violence Hotline and Tahirih Justice Center. Number of pages: [32]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/21/2017. [1000066962] [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/22/2017 06:27 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 237 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of 94 Art Museums, American Alliance of Museums, Association of Art Museum Directors and College Art Association. Number of pages: [25]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/21/2017. [1000066959] [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/22/2017 06:07 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 236 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Oxfam America, Inc.. Number of pages: [28]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/21/2017. [1000066956] [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/22/2017 05:50 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 235 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Civil Rights Organizations, FRED T. KOREMATSU CENTER FOR LAW & EQUALITY, Jay Hirabayashi, Karen Korematsu, National Bar Associations of Color and Holly Yasui. Number of pages: [30]. Number of Copies: [13]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066955] [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/22/2017 05:45 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 234 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Americans United for Separation of Church and State, Bend the Arc, Members of the Clergy, Riverside Church in the City of New York and Southern Poverty Law Center. Number of pages: [47]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066954] [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/22/2017 05:35 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 233 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Cato Institute. Number of pages: [41]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066952] [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/22/2017 05:05 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 232 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Former Federal Immigration & Homeland Security Officials. Number of pages: [39]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066951] [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/22/2017 04:53 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 231 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of American Jewish Committee. Number of pages: [32]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066949] [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/22/2017 04:25 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 230 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of ASISTA, Americans for Immigrant Justice, Futures Without Violence, NIJC, North Carolina Coalition Against Domestic Violence and Sanctuary for Families. Number of pages: [29]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066948] [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/22/2017 04:18 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 229 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington. Number of pages: [45]. Number of Copies: [17]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066947] [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/22/2017 04:00 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 228 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of American Bar Association. Number of pages: [34]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066944] [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/22/2017 03:18 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 227 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Dr. Ismail Elshikh. Number of pages: [17]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/20/2017. [1000066943] [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/22/2017 03:10 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 226 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Anti-Defamation League, Central Conference of American Rabbis, Jewish Council for Public Affairs, Union for Reform Judaism and Women of Reform Judaism. Number of pages: [47]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/19/2017. [1000066940] [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/22/2017 02:49 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 225 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of History Professors & Scholars. Number of pages: [29]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/19/2017. [1000066939] [17-1351] AB [Entered: 04/22/2017 02:25 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 198 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellee National Asian Pacific American Bar Association in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. [1000066153] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/20/2017 06:35 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 197 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellee Massachusetts Technology Leadership Council in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000066131] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/20/2017 04:48 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 196 Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellee American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000065253] [17-1351] Yolanda Rondon [Entered: 04/19/2017 11:57 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 195 DOCUMENT referencing [ # 194 ] Motion for leave to file, [ # 193 ] amicus curiae Brief by Airport Attorneys Coalition, Amici Curiae in support of Appellees. [1000065252] [17-1351] Michael Roberts [Entered: 04/19/2017 11:52 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 194 MOTION by Airport Attorneys Coalition, Amici Curiae in Support of Appellees leave to file Attachments in Support of Brief of Amici Curiae Airport Attorneys Coalition amicus curiae Brief [ # 193 ]. Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000065251] [17-1351] Michael Roberts [Entered: 04/19/2017 11:38 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 193 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Airport Attorneys Coalition, Amici Curiae in Support of Appellees in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/20/2017. [1000065250] [17-1351] Michael Roberts [Entered: 04/19/2017 11:35 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 192 MOTION by Airport Attorneys Coalition, Amicus Supporting Appellees leave to file Brief of Amici Curiae Airport Attorneys Coalition in Support of Appellees. Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000065249] [17-1351] Michael Roberts [Entered: 04/19/2017 11:30 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 191 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Advocates for Human Rights, et al., as amici curiae in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000065248] [17-1351] Alina Das [Entered: 04/19/2017 11:27 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 190 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by American Professional Society on the Abuse of Children, Amicus Supporting Appellees in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/20/2017. [1000065242] [17-1351] Mary Kelly Persyn [Entered: 04/19/2017 10:48 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 189 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by The Association of Art Museum Directors, The American Alliance of Museums, The College Art Association, and 94 Art Museums in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/20/2017. [1000065236] [17-1351] Abraham Gesser [Entered: 04/19/2017 10:05 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 188 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) MOTION by National Asian Pacific American Bar Association to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) without consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000065232] [17-1351]--[Edited 04/22/2017 by ABW] Joshua Rogaczewski [Entered: 04/19/2017 09:29 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 187 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Muslim Advocates, American Muslim Health Professionals, Muppies, Inc., National Arab American Medical Association, Network of Arab American Professionals; Amici Curiae Supporting Appellees in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/20/2017. [1000065229] [17-1351] Robert DeRise [Entered: 04/19/2017 09:02 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 186 MOTION by Cato Institute, Amicus to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000065227] [17-1351] Peter Jaffe [Entered: 04/19/2017 08:51 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 185 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Cato Institute, Amicus Supporting Appellees in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000065226] [17-1351] Peter Jaffe [Entered: 04/19/2017 08:47 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 184 MOTION by Muslim Advocates, American Muslim Health Professionals, Muppies, Inc., National Arab American Medical Association, Network of Arab American Professionals; Amici Curiae Supporting Appellees to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000065225] [17-1351] Robert DeRise [Entered: 04/19/2017 08:39 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 183 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Immigration Law Scholars and Clinicians as Amici Supporting Appellees in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/20/2017. [1000065224] [17-1351]--[Edited 04/21/2017 by ABW] Fatma Marouf [Entered: 04/19/2017 08:22 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 182 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by American Jewish Committee in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000065223] [17-1351] Adam Lurie [Entered: 04/19/2017 08:10 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 181 MOTION by American Jewish Committee leave to file Amicus Brief. Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 Courier delivery. [1000065222] [17-1351] Adam Lurie [Entered: 04/19/2017 08:05 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 180 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Fred A. Rowley, Jr. - Counsel for Amici Curiae in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/20/2017. [1000065221] [17-1351] Fred Rowley [Entered: 04/19/2017 07:58 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 179 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amici Supporting Appellee Americans United for Separation of Church and State, Bend the Arc and Southern Poverty Law Center in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: AMICUS CURIAE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000065220] [17-1351]--[Edited 04/20/2017 by JSN] Richard Katskee [Entered: 04/19/2017 07:43 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 178 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Oxfam America, Inc. as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs-Appellees in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000065218] [17-1351] Richard Bress [Entered: 04/19/2017 07:19 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 177 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Interfaith Group of Religious and Interreligious Organizations as Amici Curiae Supporting Plaintiffs-Appellees in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/20/2017. [1000065216] [17-1351] Marc Hearron [Entered: 04/19/2017 07:06 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 176 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Tahirih Justice Center, The Asian Pacific Institute on Gender-Based Violence, Casa de Esperanza, and National Domestic Violence Hotline, Amicus Supporting Appellants and Affirmance in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000065211] [17-1351] Scott Winkelman [Entered: 04/19/2017 07:01 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 175 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Medical Institutions, Advocacy Organizations, and Individual Physicians, Amicus Supporting Appellees in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000065205] [17-1351]--[Edited 04/26/2017 by JSN] Manvin Mayell [Entered: 04/19/2017 06:50 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 174 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) MOTION by Medical Institutions, Advocacy Organizations, and Individual Physicians, Amicus Supporting Appellees to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) without consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000065202] [17-1351]--[Edited 04/26/2017 by JSN] Manvin Mayell [Entered: 04/19/2017 06:40 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 173 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Constitutional Law Scholars as Amici Curiae in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000065196] [17-1351] Joshua Matz [Entered: 04/19/2017 05:35 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 172 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by The Episcopal Bishops in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/20/2017. [1000065195] [17-1351] Michael Scott [Entered: 04/19/2017 05:31 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 171 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by FORMER FEDERAL IMMIGRATION AND HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICIALS AS AMICI CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS-APPELLEES AND AFFIRMANCE, AND IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS-APPELLANTS MOTION TO STAY in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/20/2017. [1000065194] [17-1351] Michael Gottlieb [Entered: 04/19/2017 05:28 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 170 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) MOTION by Immigration Law Scholars and Clinicians to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) without consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000065191] [17-1351]--[Edited 04/21/2017 by ABW] Fatma Marouf [Entered: 04/19/2017 05:23 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 169 MOTION by The Episcopal Bishops to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000065189] [17-1351] Michael Scott [Entered: 04/19/2017 05:18 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 168 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) MOTION by Massachusetts Technology Leadership Council, Inc. leave to file Amicus Brief in Support of Appellee's Response. Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000065188] [17-1351]--[Edited 04/21/2017 by ABW] Gare Smith [Entered: 04/19/2017 05:10 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 167 Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Service Employees International Union Amicus Curiae in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000065185] [17-1351] Claire Prestel [Entered: 04/19/2017 05:03 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 166 MOTION by Service Employees International Union Amicus Curiae leave to file Corrected Brief Amici Curiae of Service Employees International Union, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, and American Federation of Teachers Supporting Plaintiffs-Appellees. Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000065183] [17-1351] Claire Prestel [Entered: 04/19/2017 05:00 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 165 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amici Curiae The Foundation for the Children of Iran and Iranian Alliances Across Borders in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000065170] [17-1351] Kevin Martin [Entered: 04/19/2017 04:51 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 164 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: Amicus Curiae. [1000065118] [17-1351] Pratik Shah [Entered: 04/19/2017 04:03 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 163 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Technology Companies - Amici Curiae in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000065112] [17-1351] Andrew Pincus [Entered: 04/19/2017 03:57 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 162 Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law; Center for Reproductive Rights; Southern Coalition for Social Justice; National Center for Lesbian Rights; Judge David T. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law et al. (Amicus) in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000065039] [17-1351] Alan Kabat [Entered: 04/19/2017 03:26 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 161 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law; Center for Reproductive Rights; Southern Coalition for Social Justice; National Center for Lesbian Rights; Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, et al. (Amicus) in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000065018] [17-1351]--[Edited 04/20/2017 by JSN] Alan Kabat [Entered: 04/19/2017 03:20 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 160 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) Supplemental AMICUS BRIEF on Petition for Rehearing (with appearance of counsel) by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law; Center for Reproductive Rights; Southern Coalition for Social Justice; National Center for Lesbian Rights; Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law; Chicago Lawyers' Comm. for Civil Rights (Amicus). Position on petition for rehearing: not applicable. [1000064990] [17-1351]--[Edited 04/20/2017 by JSN] Alan Kabat [Entered: 04/19/2017 03:08 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 159 MOTION by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law (Amicus); Center for Reproductive Rights (Amicus); Southern Coalition for Social Justice (Amicus); National Center for Lesbian Rights (Amicus); Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law (Amicus) to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000064985] [17-1351] Alan Kabat [Entered: 04/19/2017 03:05 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 158 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) MOTION by Service Employees International Union Amicus Curiae leave to file Brief Amici Curiae of Service Employees International Union, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, and American Federation of Teachers Supporting Plaintiffs-Appellees. Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000064968] [17-1351]--[Edited 04/20/2017 by JSN] Claire Prestel [Entered: 04/19/2017 03:00 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 157 MOTION by leave to file amicus curiae Brief [ # 148 ]. Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000064885] [17-1351] Benna Solomon [Entered: 04/19/2017 02:21 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 156 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Members of Congress as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs-Appellees in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000064881] [17-1351] Elizabeth Wydra [Entered: 04/19/2017 02:18 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 155 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by National Immigrant Justice Center in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000064861] [17-1351] Robert Hochman [Entered: 04/19/2017 02:04 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 154 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by History Professors and Scholars, Amici Curiae in support of Plaintiffs-Appellees in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000064851] [17-1351] Carlos Singer [Entered: 04/19/2017 01:55 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 153 Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amici Supporting Appellee Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/20/2017. [1000064846] [17-1351] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 04/19/2017 01:50 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 152 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Muslim Justice League; Muslim Public Affairs Council; Islamic Circle of North America; Council on American-Islamic Relations, California; and Asian Americans Advancing JusticeAsian Law Caucus as Amici Curiae supporting Plaintiffs-Appellees and Affirmance in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000064837] [17-1351] Benjamin Shatz [Entered: 04/19/2017 01:40 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 151 MOTION by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000064804] [17-1351] Sidney Rosdeitcher [Entered: 04/19/2017 01:00 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 150 Docket correction requested from Benna Ruth Solomon for City of Chicago. Re: [ # 148 ] amicus curiae Brief. Access to amicus curiae Brief has been restricted to case participants... [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/19/2017 12:46 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 149 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000064793] [17-1351] Sidney Rosdeitcher [Entered: 04/19/2017 12:43 PM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 148 Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellee City of Chicago in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000064741] [17-1351] Benna Solomon [Entered: 04/19/2017 11:56 AM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 147 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Anti-Defamation League; Jewish Council for Public Affairs; Union for Reform Judaism; Central Conference of American Rabbis; Women of Reform Judaism in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/17/2017. [1000064640] [17-1351] David Mills [Entered: 04/19/2017 10:57 AM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 146 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Curiae Ismail Elshikh in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/19/2017. [1000064604] [17-1351] Neal Katyal [Entered: 04/19/2017 10:30 AM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 145 MOTION by Amicus Curiae Ismail Elshikh leave to file Brief Amicus Curiae Supporting Plaintiffs-Appellees. Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000064600] [17-1351] Neal Katyal [Entered: 04/19/2017 10:27 AM]
April 19, 2017 Filing 144 MOTION by History Professors and Scholars, Amici Curiae Supporting Plaintiffs-Appellees for leave to file amici curiae brief court Order [ # 108 ],court Order for initial hearing en banc (FRAP 35) [ # 108 ]. Date and method of service: 04/19/2017 ecf. [1000064535] [17-1351] Carlos Singer [Entered: 04/19/2017 09:17 AM]
April 18, 2017 Filing 142 Corrected BRIEF by Appellees Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/17/2017. [1000064113] [17-1351] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 04/18/2017 02:59 PM]
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER filed [1000063719] granting Motion for leave to file [ # 139 ]. Copies to all parties.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/18/2017 11:21 AM]
April 18, 2017 Filing 140 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amici Curiae International Law Scholars and Non-Governmental Organizations in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/18/2017. [1000063717] [17-1351] Elisabeth Frost [Entered: 04/18/2017 11:20 AM]
April 18, 2017 Filing 139 MOTION by Amici Curiae International Law Scholars and Non-Governmental Organizations leave to file Amicus Curiae Brief. Date and method of service: 04/18/2017 ecf. [1000063708] [17-1351] Elisabeth Frost [Entered: 04/18/2017 11:17 AM]
April 17, 2017 Filing 143 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations. Number of pages: [69]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/18/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/18/2017. [1000064129] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/18/2017 03:05 PM]
April 17, 2017 Filing 138 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amici Curiae International Law Scholars and Non-Governmental Organizations in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/18/2017. [1000063230] [17-1351]--[Edited 04/18/2017 by JSN] Elisabeth Frost [Entered: 04/17/2017 04:03 PM]
April 17, 2017 Filing 135 Docket correction requested from Karla Mari McKanders for University Professors and Higher Education Associations. Re: [ # 133 ] amicus curiae Brief. Access to amicus curiae Brief has been restricted to case participants... [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/17/2017 09:54 AM]
April 17, 2017 Filing 134 Docket correction requested from Omar C. Jadwat, Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur, Justin Bryan Cox, Nicholas David Espiritu, Lee P. Gelernt, Deborah Jeon, Daniel Mach, Esther Hsiao-In Sung, Karen C. Tumlin, Cecillia D. Wang, Heather Lynn Weaver, and Cody H. Wofsy for International Refugee Assistance Project, HIAS, Inc., Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Muhammed Meteab, Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed, Paul Harrison, Jane Doe #2 and John Does #1 & 3. Re: [ # 132 ] Response. Access to Response has been restricted to case participants... [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/17/2017 09:08 AM]
April 16, 2017 Filing 133 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Howard University Civil Rights Clinic, Amicus Supporting Appellee in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/17/2017. [1000062455] [17-1351]--[Edited 04/26/2017 by JSN] Karla McKanders [Entered: 04/16/2017 09:30 PM]
April 14, 2017 Filing 137 RESPONSE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed. Number of pages: [69]. Sufficient: YES. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/17/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/17/2017. [1000062773] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/17/2017 11:28 AM]
April 14, 2017 Filing 132 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) RESPONSE/ANSWER by Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed to opening Brief [41]. [17-1351]--[Edited 04/20/2017 by JSN] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 04/14/2017 11:54 PM]
April 14, 2017 Filing 131 Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from Victor Williams. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/14/2017 11:32 AM]
April 14, 2017 Filing 130 Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from Immigration Reform Law Institute. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/14/2017 11:31 AM]
April 13, 2017 Filing 136 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Roderick & Solange MacArthur Justice Center. Number of pages: [34]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/17/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/17/2017. [1000062771] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/17/2017 11:26 AM]
April 13, 2017 Filing 129 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Former National Security Officials. Number of pages: [43]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/14/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/14/2017. [1000062064] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/14/2017 11:27 AM]
April 13, 2017 Filing 128 Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by MacArthur Justice Center as Amicus Supporting Appellees in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/13/2017. [1000061816] [17-1351] Amir Ali [Entered: 04/13/2017 04:51 PM]
April 13, 2017 Filing 127 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by MacArthur Justice Center, Amicus Supporting Appellees in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/13/2017. [1000061791] [17-1351]--[Edited 04/13/2017 by JSN] Amir Ali [Entered: 04/13/2017 04:19 PM]
April 13, 2017 Filing 126 Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellee Former National Security Officials in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/13/2017. [1000061735] [17-1351] Jonathan Freiman [Entered: 04/13/2017 03:49 PM]
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER filed [1000061649] scheduling oral argument. Argument Date or Session: 05/08/17 at 2:30 pm. Copies to all parties.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/13/2017 02:47 PM]
April 13, 2017 Filing 123 Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from American Civil Rights Union. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/13/2017 11:05 AM]
April 13, 2017 Filing 122 Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from Citizens United, Citizens United Foundation, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, English First, English First Foundation, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Policy Analysis Center, Public Advocate of the United States, U.S. Border Control Foundation and U.S. Justice Foundation. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/13/2017 11:05 AM]
April 13, 2017 Filing 121 Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from Interfaith Coalition. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/13/2017 11:03 AM]
April 13, 2017 Filing 120 Additional copies of the APPENDIX received from Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/13/2017 11:03 AM]
April 13, 2017 Filing 119 Additional copies of the OPENING BRIEF received from Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/13/2017 11:02 AM]
April 12, 2017 Filing 124 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of T.A.. Number of pages: [38]. Number of Copies: [16]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/13/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/13/2017. [1000061394] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/13/2017 11:06 AM]
April 12, 2017 Filing 118 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Christopher J. Hajec for Immigration Reform Law Institute.[1000061071] [17-1351] Christopher Hajec [Entered: 04/12/2017 04:42 PM]
April 12, 2017 Filing 117 Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from Phil Bryant, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Montana, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas and State of West Virginia. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/12/2017 02:18 PM]
April 12, 2017 Filing 116 Addendum/attachment to [ # 114 ] amicus curiae Brief by Amicus Supporting Appellee T.A. in electronic and paper format. Method of filing paper copies: US Mail. Date copies mailed, dispatched, or delivered: 04/12/2017 If paper copies filed, number of copies filed: 16 Number of pages per copy if paper copies filed: 10 [17-1351] Richard Bernstein [Entered: 04/12/2017 01:38 PM]
April 12, 2017 Filing 115 MOTION by Amicus Supporting Appellee T.A. file addendum/attachment to Corrected Brief of Amicus Curiae T.A... Date and method of service: 04/12/2017 ecf. [1000060776] [17-1351] Richard Bernstein [Entered: 04/12/2017 01:27 PM]
April 12, 2017 Filing 114 Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellee T.A. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/12/2017. [1000060774] [17-1351] Richard Bernstein [Entered: 04/12/2017 01:23 PM]
April 12, 2017 Filing 113 Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from New York University. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/12/2017 12:17 PM]
April 12, 2017 Filing 112 Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from Colleges and Universities. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/12/2017 12:16 PM]
April 12, 2017 Filing 111 Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from Southeastern Legal Foundation. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/12/2017 12:16 PM]
April 12, 2017 Filing 110 Additional copies of the AMICUS BRIEF received from American Center for Law and Justice. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/12/2017 12:15 PM]
April 12, 2017 Filing 109 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Deborah A. Jeon for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed.[1000060563] [17-1351] Deborah Jeon [Entered: 04/12/2017 11:09 AM]
April 10, 2017 Filing 108 COURT ORDER filed [1000059317] granting initial hearing en banc (FRAP 35) Copies to all parties. [17-1351] PSC [Entered: 04/10/2017 05:36 PM]
April 10, 2017 Filing 106 Docket correction requested from Mr. Richard D. Bernstein for T.A.. Re: [ # 105 ] amicus curiae Brief. Access to amicus curiae Brief has been restricted to case participants... [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/10/2017 10:29 AM]
April 7, 2017 Filing 105 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellee T.A. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/07/2017. [1000058195] [17-1351]--[Edited 04/13/2017 by JSN] Richard Bernstein [Entered: 04/07/2017 03:30 PM]
April 6, 2017 Filing 103 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Trevor S. Cox for Commonwealth of Virginia.[1000057296] [17-1351] Trevor Cox [Entered: 04/06/2017 12:38 PM]
April 5, 2017 Filing 102 REPLY by Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security to Response [ # 74 ].. [17-1351] Sharon Swingle [Entered: 04/05/2017 04:27 PM]
April 5, 2017 Filing 101 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellees Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, Paul Harrison, Muhammed Meteab and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000056862] [17-1351] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 04/05/2017 04:04 PM]
April 5, 2017 Filing 100 Docket correction requested from Richard Brian Katskee for Americans United for Separation of Church and State, Southern Poverty Law Center and Bend the Arc and Yolanda Cher Rondon for American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee. Re: [ # 72 ] amicus curiae Brief , [ # 69 ] amicus curiae Brief. Access to amicus curiae Brief , amicus curiae Brief has been restricted to case participants. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/05/2017 03:01 PM]
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER filed [1000056640] suspending acceptance of amicus brief of Americans United for Separation of Church and State, Bend the Arc, and the Southern Poverty Law Center pending filing of a corrected amicus brief in accordance with the docket correction notice of April 3, 2017. Copies to all parties.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/05/2017 12:51 PM]
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER filed [1000056397] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 81 ].Copies to all parties.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/05/2017 09:37 AM]
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER filed [1000056382] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 68 ].Copies to all parties.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/05/2017 09:31 AM]
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER filed [1000056372] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 67 ].Copies to all parties.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/05/2017 09:28 AM]
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER filed [1000056340] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 62 ].Copies to all parties.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/05/2017 09:15 AM]
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER filed [1000056333] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 49 ]. Copies to all parties.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/05/2017 09:10 AM]
April 4, 2017 Filing 98 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of New York University. Number of pages: [36]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/05/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/04/2017. [1000056568] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/05/2017 11:51 AM]
April 4, 2017 Filing 84 Notice issued re: email messages sent to court. [17-1351] PSC [Entered: 04/04/2017 06:00 PM]
April 4, 2017 Filing 83 Docket correction requested from Jonathan Marc Freiman for Former National Security Officers. Re: [ # 64 ] Motion for leave to file, [ # 65 ] amicus curiae Brief. Access to Motion for leave to file, amicus curiae Brief have been restricted to case participants. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/04/2017 04:52 PM]
April 4, 2017 Filing 82 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by New York University, Amicus Curiae in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/04/2017. [1000056102] [17-1351] Steven Obus [Entered: 04/04/2017 04:26 PM]
April 4, 2017 Filing 81 MOTION by New York University, Amicus Curiae to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 04/04/2017 ecf. [1000056098] [17-1351] Steven Obus [Entered: 04/04/2017 04:23 PM]
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER filed [1000055587] granting Motion for leave to file [ # 76 ]; terminating notice requesting response [ # 77 ]. Copies to all parties.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/04/2017 10:42 AM]
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER filed [1000055087] suspending acceptance of amicus brief of T.A. pending filing of a corrected amicus brief in accordance with the docket correction notice of April 3, 2017. Copies to all parties. [17-1351] PSC [Entered: 04/03/2017 06:25 PM]
April 3, 2017 Filing 78 Docket correction requested from Richard D. Bernstein for T. A., Stuart Alan Raphael for Commonwealth of Virginia, et.al, and Benna Ruth Solomon for City of Chicago, et. al. Re: [ # 56 ] amicus curiae Brief , [ # 58 ] amicus curiae Brief , [ # 60 ] amicus curiae Brief. Access to amicus curiae Briefs have been restricted to case participants... [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/03/2017 05:22 PM]
April 3, 2017 Filing 77 NOTICE ISSUED to H. Thomas Byron, III, August E. Flentje, Arjun Garg, Edwin Smiley Kneedle , Douglas Neal Letter, Anne Murphy, Chad A. Readler, Rod J. Rosenstein, Daniel Stephen Schwei, Lowell Vernon Sturgill, Jr., Sharon Swingle, Jeffrey Bryan Wall for United States Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, Rex Tillerson, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, John F. Kelly, Donald J. Trump and Daniel R. Coats, Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur, Justin Bryan Cox , Nicholas David Espiritu, Lee P. Gelernt, Omar C. Jadwat. Deborah Jeon, Melissa S. Keaney,Daniel Mach, David Robert Rocah, Esther Hsiao-In Sung, Karen C. Tumlin, Cecillia D. Wang, Heather Lynn Weaver and Cody H. Wofsy for Paul Harrison, Jane Doe #2, International Refugee Assistance Project, HIAS, Inc., Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Muhammed Meteab, Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed and John Does #1 & 3 requesting response to Motion for leave to file [ # 76 ]. Responses due: 04/06/2017.[1000055060].. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/03/2017 05:07 PM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 107 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Immigration Reform Law Institute. Number of pages: [28]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/10/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/10/2017. [1000058822] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/10/2017 12:36 PM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 104 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellant Victor Williams in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/30/2017. [1000057373] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/06/2017 02:14 PM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 97 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Colleges and Universities. Number of pages: [41]. Number of Copies: [3]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/05/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/03/2017. [1000056565] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/05/2017 11:49 AM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 96 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Colleges and Universities. Number of pages: [41]. Number of Copies: [1]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/05/2017. Received by clerk date: 03/31/2017. [1000056418] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/05/2017 09:57 AM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 95 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Victor Williams. Number of pages: [36]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/05/2017. Received by clerk date: 03/31/2017. [1000056416] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/05/2017 09:53 AM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 93 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of American Civil Rights Union. Number of pages: [31]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/05/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/03/2017. [1000056412] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/05/2017 09:45 AM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 92 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Citizens United, Citizens United Foundation, Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, English First, English First Foundation, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Policy Analysis Center, U.S. Border Control Foundation and U.S. Justice Foundation. Number of pages: [38]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/05/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/03/2017. [1000056410] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/05/2017 09:44 AM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 91 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Southeastern Legal Foundation. Number of pages: [34]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/05/2017. Received by clerk date: 03/31/2017. [1000056407] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/05/2017 09:41 AM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 90 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of American Center for Law and Justice. Number of pages: [28]. Number of Copies: [3]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/05/2017. Received by clerk date: 04/03/2017. [1000056403] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/05/2017 09:40 AM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 76 MOTION by Victor Williams leave to file amicus curiae brief. Date and method of service: 03/31/2017 US mail. [1000055052] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/03/2017 04:58 PM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 75 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Immigration Reform Law Institute in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/31/2017. [1000055034] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/03/2017 04:44 PM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 74 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed to Motion for stay pending appeal [ # 35 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [17-1351] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 03/31/2017 11:08 PM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 73 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by US Justice Fndn, Citizens United, Citizens United Fndn, English First Fndn, English First, Public Advocate of the US, Gun Owners Fndn, Gun Owners of America, Conservative Legal Defense & Edu. Fund, US Border Control Fndn, Policy Analysis Center, amici in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/03/2017. [1000053890] [17-1351] William Olson [Entered: 03/31/2017 08:53 PM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 72 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Yolanda Rondon, Attorney for Amici Curiae, American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/31/2017. [1000053888] [17-1351]--[Edited 04/20/2017 by JSN] Yolanda Rondon [Entered: 03/31/2017 08:46 PM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 71 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) MOTION by Appellee International Refugee Assistance Project Yolanda Rondon, Attorney for Amici Curiae, American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee, Motion for Leave to File Brief & Brief to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 03/31/2017 ecf. [1000053886] [17-1351]--[Edited 04/20/2017 by JSN] Yolanda Rondon [Entered: 03/31/2017 08:24 PM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 70 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Yolanda C. Rondon, Attorney for Amici Curiae, American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee filing amicus brief in support of Appellees for International Refugee Assistance Project.[1000053885] [17-1351] Yolanda Rondon [Entered: 03/31/2017 08:17 PM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 69 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Americans United for Separation of Church and State, Bend the Arc, and the Southern Poverty Law Center as Amici Curiae in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/31/2017. [1000053883] [17-1351]--[Edited 04/20/2017 by JSN] Richard Katskee [Entered: 03/31/2017 06:42 PM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 68 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) MOTION by Americans United for Separation of Church and State, Bend the Arc, and the Southern Poverty Law Center as Amici Curiae to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 03/31/2017 ecf. [1000053881] [17-1351]--[Edited 04/20/2017 by JSN] Richard Katskee [Entered: 03/31/2017 06:37 PM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 67 MOTION by Immigration Law Reform Institute, amicus to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 03/31/2017 ecf. [1000053879] [17-1351] Christopher Hajec [Entered: 03/31/2017 05:43 PM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 66 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellant American Civil Rights Union in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/31/2017. [1000053876] [17-1351] Kenneth Klukowski [Entered: 03/31/2017 05:32 PM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 65 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Former National Security Officials, Amicus Curiae, in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/31/2017. [1000053688] [17-1351]--[Edited 04/13/2017 by JSN] Jonathan Freiman [Entered: 03/31/2017 03:16 PM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 64 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) MOTION by Former National Security Officials, Amici Curiae, leave to file Brief. Date and method of service: 03/31/2017 ecf. [1000053668] [17-1351]--[Edited 04/13/2017 by JSN] Jonathan Freiman [Entered: 03/31/2017 03:08 PM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 63 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by SOUTHEASTERN LEGAL FOUNDATION, INC. TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF APPELLANTS AND REVERSAL in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/31/2017. [1000053630] [17-1351] William Consovoy [Entered: 03/31/2017 02:50 PM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 62 MOTION by SOUTHEASTERN LEGAL FOUNDATION, INC. AS AMICUS CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF APPELLANTS AND REVERSAL to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 03/31/2017 ecf. [1000053626] [17-1351] William Consovoy [Entered: 03/31/2017 02:47 PM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 61 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by City of Chicago in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/03/2017. [1000053529] [17-1351]--[Edited 04/06/2017 by JSN] Benna Solomon [Entered: 03/31/2017 01:19 PM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 60 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by City of Chicago in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/31/2017. [1000053497] [17-1351]--[Edited 04/20/2017 by JSN] Benna Solomon [Entered: 03/31/2017 12:53 PM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 59 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) MOTION by to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 03/31/2017 ecf. [1000053493] [17-1351]--[Edited 04/20/2017 by JSN] Benna Solomon [Entered: 03/31/2017 12:52 PM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 58 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Commonwealth of Virginia, State of Maryland, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, District of Columbia in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/03/2017. [1000053479] [17-1351]--[Edited 04/20/2017 by JSN] Stuart Raphael [Entered: 03/31/2017 12:47 PM]
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER filed [1000053413] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 53 ], granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 55 ].Copies to all parties. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 03/31/2017 12:16 PM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 56 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by T.A., Amicus Supporting Appellee in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/31/2017. [1000053353] [17-1351]--[Edited 04/13/2017 by JSN] Richard Bernstein [Entered: 03/31/2017 11:34 AM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 55 MOTION by T.A., Amicus Supporting Appellee to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 03/31/2017 ecf. [1000053348] [17-1351] Richard Bernstein [Entered: 03/31/2017 11:31 AM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 54 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by American Center for Law and Justice in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/31/2017. [1000053339] [17-1351] Edward White [Entered: 03/31/2017 11:22 AM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 53 MOTION by American Center for Law and Justice (Amicus Curiae) to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 03/31/2017 ecf. [1000053279] [17-1351] Edward White [Entered: 03/31/2017 10:41 AM]
March 31, 2017 Filing 52 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amici Curiae Boston University, Brandeis University, Brown University, Bucknell University, Carnegie Mellon University, Case Western Reserve University, Columbia University, Cornell University, Dartmouth College, Duke University, Emory University et al. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/31/2017. [1000053140] [17-1351] Lindsay Harrison [Entered: 03/31/2017 09:00 AM]
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER filed [1000052950] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 46 ]. Copies to all parties.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 03/30/2017 05:10 PM]
March 30, 2017 Filing 50 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed to court Order [ # 40 ],court Order to court inquiry [ # 40 ]. [17-1351] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 03/30/2017 12:37 PM]
March 29, 2017 Filing 94 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Interfaith Coalition. Number of pages: [63]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/05/2017. Received by clerk date: 03/31/2017. [1000056414] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 04/05/2017 09:50 AM]
March 29, 2017 Filing 49 MOTION by Kenneth A. Klukowski, Counsel for American Civil Rights Union as Amicus Supporting Appellants to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 03/29/2017 ecf. [1000051880] [17-1351] Kenneth Klukowski [Entered: 03/29/2017 04:20 PM]
March 29, 2017 Filing 48 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security to court Order [ # 40 ],court Order to court inquiry [ # 40 ]. [17-1351] Sharon Swingle [Entered: 03/29/2017 03:20 PM]
March 29, 2017 Filing 47 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amici Curiae Interfaith Coalition in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/30/2017. [1000051763] [17-1351] Kevin Collins [Entered: 03/29/2017 03:16 PM]
March 29, 2017 Filing 46 MOTION by Amici Curiae Interfaith Coalition to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 03/29/2017 ecf. [1000051749] [17-1351] Kevin Collins [Entered: 03/29/2017 03:01 PM]
March 28, 2017 Filing 45 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellees Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed. Counsel arguing: Omar Jadwat Answering argument time: 20 [1000051116] [17-1351] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 03/28/2017 06:24 PM]
March 28, 2017 Filing 44 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellants Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security. Counsel arguing: Jeffrey B. Wall [1000050819] [17-1351] Lowell Sturgill [Entered: 03/28/2017 01:52 PM]
March 27, 2017 Filing 43 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Phil Bryant, State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Montana, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas and State of West Virginia. Number of pages: [38]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 03/28/2017. Received by clerk date: 03/28/2017. [1000050615] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 03/28/2017 11:43 AM]
March 27, 2017 Filing 40 COURT ORDER filed [1000049798] directing filing of responses to court inquiry. Reponses due by 03/30/2017. Copies to all parties. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 03/27/2017 02:36 PM]
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER filed [1000049648] granting Motion for leave to file amicus brief [ # 38 ]. Copies to all parties.. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 03/27/2017 01:02 PM]
March 27, 2017 Filing 38 MOTION by State of Alabama, State of Arizona, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Montana, State of Oklahoma, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of West Virginia, and Phil Bryant for leave to file amicus curiae brief. Date and method of service: 03/27/2017 ecf. [1000049647] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 03/27/2017 01:01 PM]
March 27, 2017 Filing 37 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by State of Texas, Amicus Curiae in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/27/2017. [1000049488] [17-1351] Scott Keller [Entered: 03/27/2017 11:23 AM]
March 24, 2017 Filing 42 APPENDIX (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): 1. Total number of pages in all volumes: 823. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of Copies: 4. Entered on Docket Date: 03/28/2017. Received by clerk date: 03/28/2017. [1000050610] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 03/28/2017 11:41 AM]
March 24, 2017 Filing 41 OPENING BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security. Number of pages: [73]. Sufficient: YES. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 03/28/2017. Received by clerk date: 03/28/2017. [1000050605] [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 03/28/2017 11:40 AM]
March 24, 2017 Filing 36 BRIEF by Appellants Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/27/2017. [1000049096] [17-1351] Sharon Swingle [Entered: 03/24/2017 06:34 PM]
March 24, 2017 Filing 35 MOTION by Appellants Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security for stay pending appeal. Date of action to be stayed, if applicable:3/16/17.. Date and method of service: 03/24/2017 ecf. [1000049095] [17-1351] Sharon Swingle [Entered: 03/24/2017 06:32 PM]
March 24, 2017 Filing 34 Joint FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellants Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 03/27/2017. [1000049094] [17-1351] H. Byron [Entered: 03/24/2017 06:27 PM]
March 24, 2017 Filing 33 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Jeffrey B. Wall for Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security.[1000048995] [17-1351] Lowell Sturgill [Entered: 03/24/2017 04:41 PM]
March 24, 2017 Filing 32 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Cody Wofsy for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed.[1000048858] [17-1351] Cody Wofsy [Entered: 03/24/2017 02:50 PM]
March 24, 2017 Filing 31 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000048690] [17-1351] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 03/24/2017 12:23 PM]
March 24, 2017 Filing 30 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee HIAS, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000048687] [17-1351] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 03/24/2017 12:21 PM]
March 24, 2017 Filing 29 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee International Refugee Assistance Project. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000048681] [17-1351] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 03/24/2017 12:16 PM]
March 24, 2017 Filing 28 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Spencer E. Amdur for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed.[1000048668] [17-1351] Spencer Amdur [Entered: 03/24/2017 12:07 PM]
March 24, 2017 Filing 27 CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 05/08/2017. Registration Time: 12:15 - 12:30. Daily Arguments Begin: 1:00. Oral argument acknowledgment form due within 5 days. (BY ORDER ENTERED 4/13/2017, ARGUMENT START TIME CHANGED TO 2:30 P.M. ON MAY 8, 2017) [17-1351]--[Edited 05/07/2017 by PSC] JLC [Entered: 03/24/2017 10:28 AM]
March 23, 2017 Filing 26 Accelerated BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/24/2017. Response Brief due 04/14/2017. Reply Brief due 04/21/2017. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 03/23/2017 04:30 PM]
March 23, 2017 Filing 25 COURT ORDER filed [1000048277] granting Motion to accelerate case processing [ # 14 ]; granting Motion to expedite decision [ # 14 ]; scheduling oral argument. Argument Date or Session: 05/08/2017. Copies to all parties. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 03/23/2017 04:25 PM]
March 23, 2017 Filing 24 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Anne Murphy for Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security.[1000048223] [17-1351] Anne Murphy [Entered: 03/23/2017 03:59 PM]
March 23, 2017 Filing 23 REPLY by Daniel R. Coats, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson, Donald J. Trump and United States Department of Homeland Security to Motion to expedite decision [ # 14 ], Motion to accelerate case processing [ # 14 ].. [17-1351] H. Byron [Entered: 03/23/2017 12:46 PM]
March 22, 2017 Filing 22 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed to Motion to expedite decision [ # 14 ], Motion to accelerate case processing [ # 14 ]. [17-1351] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 03/22/2017 10:41 PM]
March 22, 2017 Filing 21 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Nicholas Espiritu for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed.[1000047461] [17-1351] Nicholas Espiritu [Entered: 03/22/2017 04:42 PM]
March 22, 2017 Filing 20 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Esther Sung for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed.[1000047456] [17-1351] Esther Sung [Entered: 03/22/2017 04:36 PM]
March 22, 2017 Filing 19 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Justin B. Cox for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed.[1000047446] [17-1351] Justin Cox [Entered: 03/22/2017 04:32 PM]
March 22, 2017 Filing 18 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Melissa S. Keaney for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed.[1000047435] [17-1351] Melissa Keaney [Entered: 03/22/2017 04:29 PM]
March 22, 2017 Filing 17 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Karen C. Tumlin for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc. and Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed.[1000047419] [17-1351] Karen Tumlin [Entered: 03/22/2017 04:23 PM]
March 22, 2017 Filing 16 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Heather L. Weaver for Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed and Samaneh Takaloo.[1000047259] [17-1351] Heather Weaver [Entered: 03/22/2017 02:59 PM]
March 22, 2017 Filing 15 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Daniel Mach for Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed and Samaneh Takaloo.[1000047248] [17-1351] Daniel Mach [Entered: 03/22/2017 02:52 PM]
March 22, 2017 Filing 14 Corrected MOTION by Appellants Daniel R. Coats, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump to expedite decision, to accelerate case processing.. Date and method of service: 03/22/2017 ecf. [1000047229] [17-1351] H. Byron [Entered: 03/22/2017 02:39 PM]
March 22, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE ISSUED to Justin Bryan Cox, Nicholas David Espiritu, Lee P. Gelernt, Omar C. Jadwat, Deborah Jeon, Melissa S. Keaney, Daniel Mach, David Robert Rocah, Karen C. Tumlin, Cecillia D. Wang and Heather Lynn Weaver for Paul Harrison, Jane Doe #2, International Refugee Assistance Project, HIAS, Inc., Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Muhammed Meteab, Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed and John Does #1 & 3 requesting response to Motion to expedite decision [ # 12 ], Motion to accelerate case processing [ # 12 ]. Response due: 03/22/2017. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 03/22/2017 02:29 PM]
March 22, 2017 Filing 12 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) MOTION by Appellants Daniel R. Coats, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump to expedite decision, to accelerate case processing.. Date and method of service: 03/22/2017 ecf. [1000047126] [17-1351]--[Edited 03/23/2017 by JSN] H. Byron [Entered: 03/22/2017 01:17 PM]
March 21, 2017 Filing 11 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Cecillia Wang for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed and Samaneh Takaloo.[1000046682] [17-1351] Cecillia Wang [Entered: 03/21/2017 05:34 PM]
March 21, 2017 Filing 10 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Lee Gelernt for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed and Samaneh Takaloo.[1000046681] [17-1351] Lee Gelernt [Entered: 03/21/2017 05:32 PM]
March 21, 2017 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Omar Jadwat for Jane Doe #2, John Does #1 & 3, HIAS, Inc., Allan Hakky, Paul Harrison, International Refugee Assistance Project, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1-4, Muhammed Meteab, Middle East Studies Association of North America, Inc., Ibrahim Ahmed Mohomed and Samaneh Takaloo.[1000046501] [17-1351] Omar Jadwat [Entered: 03/21/2017 02:54 PM]
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed [1000046140] substituting party (FRAP 43). Daniel R. Coats substituted for Michael Dempsey. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Sonia Kumar, Brad Rosenberg, Nicholas Steiner. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 03/21/2017 11:19 AM]
March 20, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption modified. Mailed to: Sonia Kumar, Brad Rosenberg, Nicholas Steiner. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 03/20/2017 12:07 PM]
March 17, 2017 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by H. Thomas Byron III for Michael Dempsey, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump.[1000044774] [17-1351] Lowell Sturgill [Entered: 03/17/2017 07:45 PM]
March 17, 2017 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Sharon Swingle for Michael Dempsey, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump.[1000044773] [17-1351] Lowell Sturgill [Entered: 03/17/2017 07:44 PM]
March 17, 2017 Filing 4 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Lowell V. Sturgill Jr. for Michael Dempsey, Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, John F. Kelly, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Rex Tillerson and Donald J. Trump.[1000044772] [17-1351] Lowell Sturgill [Entered: 03/17/2017 07:43 PM]
March 17, 2017 Filing 3 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/26/2017. Response Brief due 05/26/2017. Mailed to Sonia Kumar, Brad Rosenberg, Nicholas Steiner. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 03/17/2017 04:43 PM]
March 17, 2017 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] Case Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00361-TDC. Mailed to: Sonia Kumar, Brad Rosenberg, Nicholas Steiner. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 03/17/2017 04:40 PM]
March 17, 2017 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-00361-TDC. Case manager: JeffNeal. [17-1351] JSN [Entered: 03/17/2017 04:37 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Intl Refugee Assistance v. Donald J. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: INTERNATIONAL REFUGEE ASSISTANCE PROJECT, a project of the Urban Justice Center, Inc., on behalf of itself and its clients
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: David Cole
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Lee P. Gelernt
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Marielena Hincapie
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Deborah Jeon
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Sarah L. Mehta
Represented By: David Robert Rocah
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weaver Esq.
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HIAS, INC., on behalf of itself and its clients
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: David Cole
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Lee P. Gelernt
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Marielena Hincapie
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Deborah Jeon
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Sarah L. Mehta
Represented By: David Robert Rocah
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weaver Esq.
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MUHAMMED METEAB
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: David Cole
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Lee P. Gelernt
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Marielena Hincapie
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Deborah Jeon
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Sarah L. Mehta
Represented By: David Robert Rocah
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weaver Esq.
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PAUL HARRISON
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: David Cole
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Lee P. Gelernt
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Marielena Hincapie
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Deborah Jeon
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Sarah L. Mehta
Represented By: David Robert Rocah
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weaver Esq.
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: IBRAHIM AHMED MOHOMED
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: David Cole
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Lee P. Gelernt
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Marielena Hincapie
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Deborah Jeon
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Sarah L. Mehta
Represented By: David Robert Rocah
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weaver Esq.
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHN DOES #1 & 3
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: David Cole
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Lee P. Gelernt
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Marielena Hincapie
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Deborah Jeon
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Sarah L. Mehta
Represented By: David Robert Rocah
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weaver Esq.
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JANE DOE #2
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: David Cole
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Lee P. Gelernt
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Marielena Hincapie
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Deborah Jeon
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Sarah L. Mehta
Represented By: David Robert Rocah
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weaver Esq.
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MIDDLE EAST STUDIES ASSOCIATION OF NORTH AMERICA, INC., on behalf of itself and its members
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: David Cole
Represented By: Justin Bryan Cox
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Lee P. Gelernt
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Marielena Hincapie
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Deborah Jeon
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Sonia Kumar
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Sarah L. Mehta
Represented By: David Robert Rocah
Represented By: Hina Shamsi
Represented By: Nicholas Taichi Steiner Esq.
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia D. Wang
Represented By: Heather Lynn Weaver Esq.
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DONALD J. TRUMP, in his official capacity as President of the United States
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Represented By: August E. Flentje
Represented By: Edwin Smiley Kneedler
Represented By: Douglas Neal Letter
Represented By: Anne Murphy
Represented By: Chad A. Readler
Represented By: Rod J. Rosenstein
Represented By: Lowell Vernon Sturgill Jr.
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Represented By: Jeffrey Bryan Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Represented By: August E. Flentje
Represented By: Edwin Smiley Kneedler
Represented By: Douglas Neal Letter
Represented By: Anne Murphy
Represented By: Chad A. Readler
Represented By: Rod J. Rosenstein
Represented By: Lowell Vernon Sturgill Jr.
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Represented By: Jeffrey Bryan Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Represented By: August E. Flentje
Represented By: Edwin Smiley Kneedler
Represented By: Douglas Neal Letter
Represented By: Anne Murphy
Represented By: Chad A. Readler
Represented By: Rod J. Rosenstein
Represented By: Lowell Vernon Sturgill Jr.
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Represented By: Jeffrey Bryan Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Represented By: August E. Flentje
Represented By: Edwin Smiley Kneedler
Represented By: Douglas Neal Letter
Represented By: Anne Murphy
Represented By: Chad A. Readler
Represented By: Rod J. Rosenstein
Represented By: Lowell Vernon Sturgill Jr.
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Represented By: Jeffrey Bryan Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOHN F. KELLY, in his official capacity as Secretary of Homeland Security
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Represented By: August E. Flentje
Represented By: Edwin Smiley Kneedler
Represented By: Douglas Neal Letter
Represented By: Anne Murphy
Represented By: Chad A. Readler
Represented By: Rod J. Rosenstein
Represented By: Lowell Vernon Sturgill Jr.
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Represented By: Jeffrey Bryan Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: REX TILLERSON, in his official capacity as Secretary of State
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Represented By: August E. Flentje
Represented By: Edwin Smiley Kneedler
Represented By: Douglas Neal Letter
Represented By: Anne Murphy
Represented By: Chad A. Readler
Represented By: Rod J. Rosenstein
Represented By: Lowell Vernon Sturgill Jr.
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Represented By: Jeffrey Bryan Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DANIEL R. COATS, in his official capacity as Director of National Intelligence
Represented By: H. Thomas Byron III
Represented By: August E. Flentje
Represented By: Edwin Smiley Kneedler
Represented By: Douglas Neal Letter
Represented By: Anne Murphy
Represented By: Chad A. Readler
Represented By: Rod J. Rosenstein
Represented By: Lowell Vernon Sturgill Jr.
Represented By: Sharon Swingle
Represented By: Jeffrey Bryan Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF TEXAS
Represented By: J. Campbell Barker
Represented By: Ari Cuenin
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Represented By: Jeffrey Carl Mateer
Represented By: Ken Paxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF ALABAMA
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Represented By: Steven T. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF ARIZONA
Represented By: Mark Brnovich
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF ARKANSAS
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Represented By: Leslie Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF FLORIDA
Represented By: Pam Bondi
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF KANSAS
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Represented By: Derek Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF LOUISIANA
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Represented By: Jeff Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MONTANA
Represented By: Timothy C. Fox
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF OKLAHOMA
Represented By: Mike Hunter
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Represented By: Alan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA
Represented By: Marty J. Jackley
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Represented By: Patrick Morrisey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PHIL BRYANT, Governor of the State of Mississippi
Represented By: Scott Allen Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN CIVIL RIGHTS UNION
Represented By: Kenneth Alan Klukowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE
Represented By: Matthew R. Clark
Represented By: Andrew J. Ekonomou
Represented By: Francis J. Manion
Represented By: Colby M. May Esq.
Represented By: Craig Littleton Parshall
Represented By: Stuart J. Roth
Represented By: Jay Alan Sekulow
Represented By: Jordan Adam Sekulow
Represented By: Benjamin Paul Sisney
Represented By: Geoffrey R. Surtees
Represented By: Edward Lawrence White
Represented By: Erik M. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: IMMIGRATION REFORM LAW INSTITUTE
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Hajec
Represented By: Michael Meriwether Hethmon
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Hohenstein
Represented By: Mark S. Venenzia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: U. S. JUSTICE FOUNDATION
Represented By: Joseph W. Miller
Represented By: Jeremiah L. Morgan
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Olson
Represented By: William Jeffery Olson
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITIZENS UNITED
Represented By: Michael Boos
Represented By: Jeremiah L. Morgan
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Olson
Represented By: William Jeffery Olson
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITIZENS UNITED FOUNDATION
Represented By: Michael Boos
Represented By: Jeremiah L. Morgan
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Olson
Represented By: William Jeffery Olson
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ENGLISH FIRST FOUNDATION
Represented By: Jeremiah L. Morgan
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Olson
Represented By: William Jeffery Olson
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ENGLISH FIRST
Represented By: Jeremiah L. Morgan
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Olson
Represented By: William Jeffery Olson
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PUBLIC ADVOCATE OF THE UNITED STATES
Represented By: Jeremiah L. Morgan
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Olson
Represented By: William Jeffery Olson
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION
Represented By: Jeremiah L. Morgan
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Olson
Represented By: William Jeffery Olson
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Jeremiah L. Morgan
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Olson
Represented By: William Jeffery Olson
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CONSERVATIVE LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND
Represented By: Jeremiah L. Morgan
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Olson
Represented By: William Jeffery Olson
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: U. S. BORDER CONTROL FOUNDATION
Represented By: Jeremiah L. Morgan
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Olson
Represented By: William Jeffery Olson
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: POLICY ANALYSIS CENTER
Represented By: Jeremiah L. Morgan
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Olson
Represented By: William Jeffery Olson
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOUTHEASTERN LEGAL FOUNDATION
Represented By: William Spencer Consovoy
Represented By: Kimberly S. Hermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: VICTOR WILLIAMS
Represented By: Victor Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INTERFAITH COALITION
Represented By: Michael Baker
Represented By: Kathryn Bi
Represented By: Kevin B. Collins
Represented By: Robert D. Fram
Represented By: Alexandra P. Grayner
Represented By: Andrew Guy
Represented By: Ligia M. Markman
Represented By: Karun Tilak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES
Represented By: Erica L. Ross
Represented By: Lindsay Claire Harrison
Represented By: Tassity Shardae Johnson
Represented By: Thomas John Perrelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: T.A.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA
Represented By: Trevor Stephen Cox
Represented By: Mark Rankin Herring
Represented By: Matthew Robert McGuire
Represented By: Stuart Alan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MARYLAND
Represented By: Brian E. Frosh Esq.
Represented By: Steven Marshall Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Benjamin G. Shatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF CONNECTICUT
Represented By: George Jepsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF DELAWARE
Represented By: Matthew Denn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF IOWA
Represented By: Thomas J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MAINE
Represented By: Janet T. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Maura Healey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NEW MEXICO
Represented By: Hector Balderas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Eric T. Schneiderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Josh Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF RHODE ISLAND
Represented By: Peter F. Kilmartin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF OREGON
Represented By: Ellen F. Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF VERMONT
Represented By: Thomas J. Donovan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF WASHINGTON
Represented By: Robert W. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Karl Anthony Racine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN-ARAB ANTI-DISCRIMINATION COMMITTEE
Represented By: Yolanda Cher Rondon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY OF CHICAGO
Represented By: Nick Kahlon
Represented By: Eliberty Lopez
Represented By: Brian Neff
Represented By: Ryan P. Poscablo
Represented By: Edward Nathan Siskel
Represented By: Benna Ruth Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BEND THE ARC
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Rothschild
Represented By: Gillian Gillers
Represented By: Bradley Girard
Represented By: Kristi Lee Graunke
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Carmen N. Longoria-Green
Represented By: Andrew L. Nellis
Represented By: Kelly M. Percival
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOUTHERN POVERTY LAW CENTER
Represented By: Gillian Gillers
Represented By: Bradley Girard
Represented By: Kristi Lee Graunke
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Carmen N. Longoria-Green
Represented By: Andrew L. Nellis
Represented By: Kelly M. Percival
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Rothschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE
Represented By: Gillian Gillers
Represented By: Bradley Girard
Represented By: Kristi Lee Graunke
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Carmen N. Longoria-Green
Represented By: Andrew L. Nellis
Represented By: Kelly M. Percival
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Rothschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY OF LOS ANGELES
Represented By: Michael N. Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Zachary W. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: Sozi Pedro Tulante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY OF AUSTIN
Represented By: Anne L. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JAMES A. DIOSSA, Mayor of Central Falls, Rhode Island
Represented By: Matthew T. Jerzyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY OF GARY
Represented By: Gregory L. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY OF IOWA CITY
Represented By: Eleanor M. Dilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SVANTE L. MYRICK, Mayor of Ithaca
Represented By: Aaron O. Lavine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY OF JERSEY CITY
Represented By: Jeremy Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY OF MADISON
Represented By: Michael P. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY OF MINNEAPOLIS
Represented By: Susan L. Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MONTGOMERY COUNTY
Represented By: Marc Pemble Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY OF OAKLAND
Represented By: Barbara J. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY OF PITTSBURGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WILLIAM PEDUTO, Mayor of Pittsburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY OF PORTLAND
Represented By: Tracy Reeve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY OF PROVIDENCE
Represented By: Jeffrey Dana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JORGE O. ELORZA, Mayor of Providence
Represented By: Jeffrey Dana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY OF ST. LOUIS
Represented By: Michael A. Garvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY OF SAINT PAUL
Represented By: Samuel J. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Represented By: Dennis J. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Represented By: Dennis J. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY OF SAN JOSE
Represented By: Richard Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY OF SANTA MONICA
Represented By: Joseph Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SANTA CLARA COUNTY
Represented By: James R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY OF SEATTLE
Represented By: Peter S. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: VILLAGE OF SKOKIE
Represented By: Michael M. Lorge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY OF SOUTH BEND
Represented By: Cristal Brisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY OF TUSCON
Represented By: Michael Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY OF WEST HOLLYWOOD
Represented By: Michael Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FORMER NATIONAL SECURITY OFFICIALS
Represented By: Harold Hongju Koh
Represented By: John J. Connolly
Represented By: Jonathan Freiman
Represented By: Hope Richardson Metcalf
Represented By: William James Murphy
Represented By: Tahlia Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NEW YORK UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Seth D. Fiur
Represented By: Terrance Nolan
Represented By: Steven Obus
Represented By: Tiffany M. Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RODERICK & SOLANGE MACARTHUR JUSTICE CENTER
Represented By: Amir H. Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNIVERSITY PROFESSORS AND HIGHER EDUCATION ASSOCIATIONS
Represented By: Darin Johnson
Represented By: Karla Mari McKanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INTERNATIONAL LAW SCHOLARS
Represented By: Amanda Rebecca Callais
Represented By: Aaron X. Fellmeth
Represented By: Elisabeth Carmel Frost
Represented By: Jonathan L. Hafetz
Represented By: Michelle L. Maley
Represented By: Joseph M. McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NONGOVERNMENTAL ORGANIZATIONS
Represented By: Amanda Rebecca Callais
Represented By: Aaron X. Fellmeth
Represented By: Elisabeth Carmel Frost
Represented By: Jonathan L. Hafetz
Represented By: Michelle L. Maley
Represented By: Joseph M. McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ISMAIL ELSHIKH
Represented By: Alexander B. Bowerman
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: Neal Kumar Katyal
Represented By: Mitchell Pearsall Reich
Represented By: Colleen Roh Sinzdak
Represented By: Thomas Payne Schmidt
Represented By: Sara A. Solow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE
Represented By: Lakendra Barajas
Represented By: Caren Decter
Represented By: Doron F. Ezickson
Represented By: Steven M. Freeman
Represented By: Melissa Garlick
Represented By: Jeremy Goldman
Represented By: John B. Harris
Represented By: Lauren A. Jones
Represented By: Lily Landsman-Roos
Represented By: Michael Lieberman
Represented By: Rayna Lopyan
Represented By: David Edward Mills
Represented By: Alyssa Tami Saunders
Represented By: Jessica Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JEWISH COUNCIL FOR PUBLIC AFFAIRS
Represented By: Lakendra Barajas
Represented By: David Bohm
Represented By: Caren Decter
Represented By: Jeremy Goldman
Represented By: John B. Harris
Represented By: Lily Landsman-Roos
Represented By: Rayna Lopyan
Represented By: David Edward Mills
Represented By: Alyssa Tami Saunders
Represented By: Jessica Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNION FOR REFORM JUDAISM
Represented By: Lakendra Barajas
Represented By: Caren Decter
Represented By: Jeremy Goldman
Represented By: John B. Harris
Represented By: Lily Landsman-Roos
Represented By: Rayna Lopyan
Represented By: David Edward Mills
Represented By: Alyssa Tami Saunders
Represented By: Jessica Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CENTRAL CONFERENCE OF AMERICAN RABBIS
Represented By: Lakendra Barajas
Represented By: Caren Decter
Represented By: Jeremy Goldman
Represented By: John B. Harris
Represented By: Lily Landsman-Roos
Represented By: Rayna Lopyan
Represented By: David Edward Mills
Represented By: Alyssa Tami Saunders
Represented By: Jessica Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WOMEN OF REFORM JUDAISM
Represented By: Lakendra Barajas
Represented By: Caren Decter
Represented By: Jeremy Goldman
Represented By: John B. Harris
Represented By: Lily Landsman-Roos
Represented By: Rayna Lopyan
Represented By: David Edward Mills
Represented By: Alyssa Tami Saunders
Represented By: Jessica Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Linda Ann Klein
Represented By: Arianna Markel
Represented By: Erin J. Morgan
Represented By: Sidney Samuel Rosdeitcher Esq.
Represented By: Jared S. Stein
Represented By: Aidan Synnott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MUSLIM JUSTICE LEAGUE
Represented By: Matthew Bottomly
Represented By: Amy Briggs
Represented By: Sirena Castillo
Represented By: Ketakee Rajiv Kane
Represented By: John McGuinness
Represented By: Benjamin G. Shatz
Represented By: Olufunmilayo Showole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MUSLIM PUBLIC AFFAIRS COUNCIL
Represented By: Matthew Bottomly
Represented By: Amy Briggs
Represented By: Sirena Castillo
Represented By: Ketakee Rajiv Kane
Represented By: John McGuinness
Represented By: Benjamin G. Shatz
Represented By: Olufunmilayo Showole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ISLAMIC CIRCLE OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: Matthew Bottomly
Represented By: Amy Briggs
Represented By: Sirena Castillo
Represented By: Ketakee Rajiv Kane
Represented By: John McGuinness
Represented By: Benjamin G. Shatz
Represented By: Olufunmilayo Showole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COUNCIL ON AMERICAN-ISLAMIC RELATIONS
Represented By: Matthew Bottomly
Represented By: Amy Briggs
Represented By: Sirena Castillo
Represented By: Ketakee Rajiv Kane
Represented By: John McGuinness
Represented By: Benjamin G. Shatz
Represented By: Olufunmilayo Showole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE-ASIAN LAW CAUCUS
Represented By: Matthew Bottomly
Represented By: Amy Briggs
Represented By: Sirena Castillo
Represented By: Ketakee Rajiv Kane
Represented By: John McGuinness
Represented By: Benjamin G. Shatz
Represented By: Olufunmilayo Showole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL IMMIGRANT JUSTICE CENTER
Represented By: Robert N. Hochman
Represented By: Nathaniel C. Love
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASISTA
Represented By: Robert N. Hochman
Represented By: Gail Pendleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICANS FOR IMMIGRANT JUSTICE
Represented By: Robert N. Hochman
Represented By: Jennie Santos-Bourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FUTURES WITHOUT VIOLENCE
Represented By: Robert N. Hochman
Represented By: Linda A. Seabrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NORTH CAROLINA COALITION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE
Represented By: Robert N. Hochman
Represented By: Amily K. McCool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SANCTUARY FOR FAMILIES
Represented By: Robert N. Hochman
Represented By: Carmen Maria Rey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MEMBERS OF CONGRESS
Represented By: Raymond H. Brescia
Represented By: David H. Gans
Represented By: Brianne Jenna Gorod
Represented By: Jason Harrow
Represented By: Peter Karanjia
Represented By: Victor A. Kovner
Represented By: Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Nicole Gina Berner
Represented By: Leo Gertner
Represented By: Claire Prestel
Represented By: Deborah L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY & MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Claire Prestel
Represented By: Judith E. Rivlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS
Represented By: Channing M. Cooper
Represented By: Claire Prestel
Represented By: David John Strom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HISTORY PROFESSORS & SCHOLARS
Represented By: Katherine K. Huang
Represented By: Carlos A. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW
Represented By: Lynne Bernabei
Represented By: Thomas Paul Clancy
Represented By: Ted G. Dane
Represented By: Alan Robert Kabat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS
Represented By: Lynne Bernabei
Represented By: Thomas Paul Clancy
Represented By: Ted G. Dane
Represented By: Alan Robert Kabat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOUTHERN COALITION FOR SOCIAL JUSTICE
Represented By: Lynne Bernabei
Represented By: Thomas Paul Clancy
Represented By: Ted G. Dane
Represented By: Alan Robert Kabat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL CENTER FOR LESBIAN RIGHTS
Represented By: Lynne Bernabei
Represented By: Thomas Paul Clancy
Represented By: Ted G. Dane
Represented By: Alan Robert Kabat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JUDGE DAVID L. BAZELON CENTER FOR MENTAL HEALTH LAW
Represented By: Lynne Bernabei
Represented By: Thomas Paul Clancy
Represented By: Ted G. Dane
Represented By: Alan Robert Kabat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHICAGO LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW
Represented By: Lynne Bernabei
Represented By: Thomas Paul Clancy
Represented By: Ted G. Dane
Represented By: Alan Robert Kabat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MISSISSIPPI CENTER FOR JUSTICE
Represented By: Lynne Bernabei
Represented By: Thomas Paul Clancy
Represented By: Ted G. Dane
Represented By: Alan Robert Kabat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TECHNOLOGY COMPANIES
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes III
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FRED T. KOREMATSU CENTER FOR LAW & EQUALITY
Represented By: Robert Seungchul Chang
Represented By: Martine Elizabeth Cicconi
Represented By: Alice Hsu
Represented By: Robert Alan Johnson
Represented By: Pratik A. Shah
Represented By: Jessica M. Weisel
Represented By: Eric K. Yamamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JAY HIRABAYASHI
Represented By: Robert Seungchul Chang
Represented By: Martine Elizabeth Cicconi
Represented By: Alice Hsu
Represented By: Robert Alan Johnson
Represented By: Pratik A. Shah
Represented By: Jessica M. Weisel
Represented By: Eric K. Yamamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HOLLY YASUI
Represented By: Robert Seungchul Chang
Represented By: Martine Elizabeth Cicconi
Represented By: Alice Hsu
Represented By: Robert Alan Johnson
Represented By: Pratik A. Shah
Represented By: Jessica M. Weisel
Represented By: Eric K. Yamamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KAREN KOREMATSU
Represented By: Robert Seungchul Chang
Represented By: Martine Elizabeth Cicconi
Represented By: Alice Hsu
Represented By: Robert Alan Johnson
Represented By: Pratik A. Shah
Represented By: Jessica M. Weisel
Represented By: Eric K. Yamamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CIVIL RIGHTS ORGANIZATIONS
Represented By: Robert Seungchul Chang
Represented By: Martine Elizabeth Cicconi
Represented By: Alice Hsu
Represented By: Robert Alan Johnson
Represented By: Pratik A. Shah
Represented By: Jessica M. Weisel
Represented By: Eric K. Yamamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL BAR ASSOCIATIONS OF COLOR
Represented By: Robert Seungchul Chang
Represented By: Martine Elizabeth Cicconi
Represented By: Alice Hsu
Represented By: Robert Alan Johnson
Represented By: Pratik A. Shah
Represented By: Jessica M. Weisel
Represented By: Eric K. Yamamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FOUNDATION FOR THE CHILDREN OF IRAN
Represented By: William Brady
Represented By: Joshua M. Daniels
Represented By: Kevin Paul Martin
Represented By: Nicholas K. Mitrokostas
Represented By: Eileen L. Morrison
Represented By: Alicia Rubio-Spring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: IRANIAN ALLIANCES ACROSS BORDERS
Represented By: Kevin Paul Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MASSACHUSETTS TECHNOLOGY LEADERSHIP COUNCIL
Represented By: Kristin M. DeFilipp
Represented By: Christopher Escobedo Hart
Represented By: Michael B. Keating
Represented By: Daniel L. McFadden
Represented By: Gare Alan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EPISCOPAL BISHOPS
Represented By: Lisa Joy Chaiet Rahman
Represented By: Amit D. Ranade
Represented By: Michael Ramsey Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: IMMIGRATION LAW SCHOLARS & CLINICIANS ON STATUTORY CLAIMS
Represented By: Fatma Essam Marouf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FORMER FEDERAL IMMIGRATION & HOMELAND SECURITY OFFICIALS
Represented By: Isra Javed Bhatty
Represented By: Eli Glasser
Represented By: Michael Julian Gottlieb
Represented By: James Wells Harrell
Represented By: Aaron Edgar Nathan
Represented By: Cain Norris
Represented By: Joshua Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers |