OH, et al v. Xavier Becerra, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: STATE OF OHIO, STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF ARIZONA, STATE OF ARKANSAS, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF KANSAS, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, STATE OF MISSOURI, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA and STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA
Defendant / Appellee: XAVIER BECERRA, Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services, JESSICA S. MARCELLA, Deputy Assistant Secretary for Population Affairs, in their official capacities, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and OFFICE OF POPULATION AFFAIRS
Amicus Curiae: STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF ALASKA, STATE OF IDAHO, STATE OF LOUISIANA, STATE OF GEORGIA, STATE OF INDIANA, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA, STATE OF TEXAS, PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF MARYLAND, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF VERMONT, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF WISCONSIN, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PRO LIFE OBSTETRICIANS & GYNECOLOGISTS, CHRISTIAN MEDICAL & DENTAL ASSOCIATION, CATHOLIC MEDICAL ASSOCIATION and NATIONAL FAMILY PLANNING & REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 21-4235
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Admin Proc Act/Review
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2022 Filing 47 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers for KY, AL, AZ, AR, FL, KS, MO, NE, OH, OK, SC and WV. Certificate of Service: 02/22/2022. Argument Request: requested. [21-4235] (BMF) [Entered: 02/22/2022 09:19 AM]
February 14, 2022 Filing 46 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant AR by Nicholas J. Bronni. Certificate of Service: 02/14/2022. [21-4235] (NJB) [Entered: 02/14/2022 05:02 PM]
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER filed: Accordingly, the States motion [ # 13 ] is DENIED. Upon consideration, the motions for leave to file amicus briefs [ # 35 ] and to exceed the word limit [ # 21 ], [ # 42 ] and [ # 44 ] are GRANTED. Danny J. Boggs, Circuit Judge; John K. Bush, Circuit Judge and Joan L. Larsen, Circuit Judge (Concurring). (RLB) [Entered: 02/08/2022 03:03 PM]
January 21, 2022 Filing 44 MOTION filed by Mr. John J. Bursch for American Association of Pro Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, Catholic Medical Association and Christian Medical & Dental Association to file oversize brief. Certificate of Service: 01/21/2022. [21-4235] (JJB) [Entered: 01/21/2022 05:49 PM]
January 21, 2022 Filing 43 AMICUS BRIEF in support of appellees' opposition to appellants' motion for injunction pending appeal filed by Robin Summers and Margaret M. Dotzel for National Family Planning & Reproductive Health Association , with parties' consent. Certificate of Service:01/21/2022. [21-4235]--[Edited 01/21/2022 by RLB]--[Edited 01/21/2022 by RLB] (MD) [Entered: 01/21/2022 11:19 AM]
January 21, 2022 Filing 42 MOTION to file AMICUS BRIEF and file oversized amicus brief filed by Robin Summers and Margaret M. Dotzel for National Family Planning & Reproductive Health Association. Certificate of Service: 01/21/2022. [21-4235]--[Edited 01/21/2022 by RLB] (MD) [Entered: 01/21/2022 11:14 AM]
January 21, 2022 Filing 41 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for National Family Planning & Reproductive Health Association by Robin Summers. Certificate of Service: 01/21/2022. [21-4235] (RS) [Entered: 01/21/2022 10:36 AM]
January 21, 2022 Filing 40 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for National Family Planning & Reproductive Health Association by Alyssa M. Howard. Certificate of Service: 01/21/2022. [21-4235] (AH) [Entered: 01/21/2022 10:32 AM]
January 21, 2022 Filing 39 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for National Family Planning & Reproductive Health Association by Casey Trombley-Shapiro Jonas. Certificate of Service: 01/21/2022. [21-4235] (CTJ) [Entered: 01/21/2022 10:28 AM]
January 21, 2022 Filing 38 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for National Family Planning & Reproductive Health Association by Catherine S. Duval. Certificate of Service: 01/21/2022. [21-4235] (CSD) [Entered: 01/21/2022 10:24 AM]
January 21, 2022 Filing 37 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for National Family Planning & Reproductive Health Association by Margaret M. Dotzel. Certificate of Service: 01/21/2022. [21-4235] (MD) [Entered: 01/21/2022 10:15 AM]
January 20, 2022 Filing 36 AMICUS BRIEF in support of appellants' motion for injunction pending appeal filed by The American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, The Christian Medical & Dental Associations, and The Catholic Medical Association , without parties' consent. Certificate of Service:01/20/2022. [21-4235]--[Edited 01/21/2022 by RLB] (JJB) [Entered: 01/20/2022 03:05 PM]
January 20, 2022 Filing 35 MOTION to file AMICUS BRIEF filed by John J. Bursch for The American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, The Christian Medical & Dental Associations, and The Catholic Medical Association. Certificate of Service: 01/20/2022. [21-4235] (JJB) [Entered: 01/20/2022 03:04 PM]
January 20, 2022 Filing 34 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for The American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, The Christian Medical & Dental Associations, and The Catholic Medical Association by Denise M. Harle. Certificate of Service: 01/20/2022. [21-4235] (DH) [Entered: 01/20/2022 03:00 PM]
January 20, 2022 Filing 33 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for The American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, The Christian Medical & Dental Associations, and The Catholic Medical Association by Mark A. Lippelmann. Certificate of Service: 01/20/2022. [21-4235] (ML) [Entered: 01/20/2022 02:58 PM]
January 20, 2022 Filing 32 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for The American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, The Christian Medical & Dental Associations, and The Catholic Medical Association by John J. Bursch. Certificate of Service: 01/20/2022. [21-4235] (JJB) [Entered: 01/20/2022 02:47 PM]
January 20, 2022 Filing 31 REPLY filed by Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers for KY, AL, AZ, AR, FL, KS, MO, NE, OH, OK, SC and WV regarding Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal Certificate of Service: 01/20/2022. [21-4235] (BMF) [Entered: 01/20/2022 10:05 AM]
January 18, 2022 Filing 30 ***DOCUMENT LOCKED - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE MOTION AND BRIEF AS SEPARATE ENTRIES AND FILE AN APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FORM*** MOTION to file AMICUS BRIEF filed by John J. Bursch for The American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians & Gynecologists, The Christian Medical & Dental Associations, The Catholic Medical Association. Certificate of Service: 01/18/2022. [21-4235]--[Edited 01/19/2022 by RLB] (JJB) [Entered: 01/18/2022 08:19 PM]
January 18, 2022 Filing 29 NOTIFICATION filed by Ms. Laura Etlinger for NY regarding Notification regarding Signature Permission on behalf of amicus parties for the States of California, Colorado, Connecticut, Delaware, Hawaii, Illinois, Maine, Maryland, Massachussets, Michigan, Minnesota, Nevada, New Jersey, New Mexico, North Carolina, Oregon, Pennsylvania, Rhode Island, Vermont, Virginia, Washington, Wisconsin and the District of Columbia. Certificate of Service: 01/18/2022. [21-4235]--[Edited 01/19/2022 by RLB] (LE) [Entered: 01/18/2022 05:59 PM]
January 14, 2022 Filing 28 RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion for injunction pending appeal, [ # 13 ]; previously filed by Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers for OH, AL, AZ, AR, FL, KS, KY, MO, NE, OK, SC and WV. Response from Attorney Ms. Kyle T. Edwards for Appellees Xavier Becerra, HHS, Jessica S. Marcella and Office of Population Affairs. Certificate of Service: 01/14/2022. [21-4235] (KTE) [Entered: 01/14/2022 07:31 PM]
January 14, 2022 Filing 27 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc. by Alan Schoenfeld. Certificate of Service: 01/14/2022. [21-4235] (AES) [Entered: 01/14/2022 06:10 PM]
January 14, 2022 Filing 26 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form [ # 24 ], filed by Mr. Alan Evan Schoenfeld for Planned Parenthood Federation of America is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. Deficiency to be corrected by 01/21/2022. (RLB) [Entered: 01/14/2022 05:55 PM]
January 14, 2022 Filing 25 AMICUS BRIEF in support of appellees' opposition to appellants' motion for injunction pending appeal filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc. , with parties' consent. Certificate of Service:01/14/2022. [21-4235]--[Edited 01/21/2022 by RLB] (AES) [Entered: 01/14/2022 05:37 PM]
January 14, 2022 Filing 24 ***FORM LOCKED - IN EDITABLBE .pdf FORMAT - COUNSEL INSTRUCTED TO REFILE IN A NONMODIFIABLE .pdF FORMAT*** AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc. by Alan Schoenfeld. Certificate of Service: 01/14/2022. [21-4235]--[Edited 01/14/2022 by RLB] (AES) [Entered: 01/14/2022 05:35 PM]
January 14, 2022 Filing 23 AMICUS BRIEF in support of appellees and in opposition to appellants' motion for an injunction pending appeal filed by Laura Etlinger for the States of NY, CA, CO, CT, DE, HI, IL, ME, MD, MA, MI, MN, NV, NJ, NM, NC, OR, PA, RI, VT, VA, WA, WI, and the District of Columbia. , federal/state government. Certificate of Service:01/14/2022. [21-4235] (LE) [Entered: 01/14/2022 03:46 PM]
January 14, 2022 Filing 22 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for New York by Laura Etlinger. Certificate of Service: 01/14/2022. [21-4235] (LE) [Entered: 01/14/2022 03:36 PM]
January 14, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION filed by Mr. Christian Brian Corrigan for AK, GA, ID, IN, LA, MS, MT, SD and TX to file oversize amicus brief in support of appellants' motion for injunction pending appeal. Certificate of Service: 01/14/2022. [21-4235]--[Edited 01/14/2022 by RLB] (CBC) [Entered: 01/14/2022 01:01 PM]
January 14, 2022 Filing 20 NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. Christian Brian Corrigan for amicus State of Montana regarding Notification for Signature Permission on behalf of amicus parties for the States of Alaska, Georgia, Idaho, Indiana, Louisiana, Mississippi, South Dakota, and Texas. Certificate of Service: 01/14/2022. [21-4235]--[Edited 01/14/2022 by RLB] (CBC) [Entered: 01/14/2022 12:48 PM]
January 14, 2022 Filing 19 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for States of Montana by Christian Corrigan. Certificate of Service: 01/14/2022. [21-4235]--[Edited 01/14/2022 by RLB] (CBC) [Entered: 01/14/2022 11:41 AM]
January 13, 2022 Filing 18 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/22/2022;. appellee brief due 03/24/2022; (RLB) [Entered: 01/13/2022 05:22 PM]
January 12, 2022 Filing 17 AMICUS BRIEF in support of appellants' motion for injunction pending appeal filed by State of Montana, State of Alaska, State of Georgia, State of Idaho, State of Indiana, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi, State of South Dakota, and State of Texas , federal/state government. Certificate of Service:01/12/2022. [21-4235]--[Edited 01/14/2022 by RLB] (CBC) [Entered: 01/12/2022 07:09 PM]
January 10, 2022 Filing 16 NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers for KY, AL, AZ, AR, FL, KS, MO, NE, OH, OK, SC and WV regarding Attachments to Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal. Certificate of Service: 01/10/2022. [21-4235] (BMF) [Entered: 01/10/2022 01:12 PM]
January 5, 2022 Filing 15 NOTIFICATION filed by Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers for appellant State of Ohio regarding signature permission on behalf of appellant parties for the States of Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas Florida, Kansas, Missouri, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Carolina, and West Virginia. Certificate of Service: 01/05/2022. [21-4235]--[Edited 01/14/2022 by RLB] (BMF) [Entered: 01/05/2022 03:46 PM]
January 5, 2022 Filing 14 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant SC by Thomas T. Hydrick. Certificate of Service: 01/05/2022. [21-4235] (TTH) [Entered: 01/05/2022 09:48 AM]
January 4, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION filed by Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers for OH for injunction pending appeal. Certificate of Service: 01/04/2022. [21-4235] (BMF) [Entered: 01/04/2022 04:48 PM]
January 4, 2022 Filing 12 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: The appearance form [ # 9 ], filed by Ms. Sylvia May Davis Mailman for OH is deficient for the reason noted on the attached checklist. (RLB) [Entered: 01/04/2022 09:52 AM]
January 4, 2022 Filing 11 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers for Appellant OH.. Certificate of Service: 01/04/2022. [21-4235] (BMF) [Entered: 01/04/2022 08:30 AM]
January 4, 2022 Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is unnecessary for appeal purposes. Filed by Mr. Benjamin Michael Flowers for OH. Certificate of Service: 01/04/2022. [21-4235] (BMF) [Entered: 01/04/2022 08:25 AM]
January 4, 2022 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant OH by Sylvia May Davis Mailman. Certificate of Service: 01/04/2022. [21-4235] (SMM) [Entered: 01/04/2022 08:22 AM]
January 3, 2022 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant KY by Brett R. Nolan. Certificate of Service: 01/03/2022. [21-4235] (BRN) [Entered: 01/03/2022 04:41 PM]
January 3, 2022 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant OH by Stephen P. Carney. Certificate of Service: 01/03/2022. [21-4235] (SPC) [Entered: 01/03/2022 03:24 PM]
January 3, 2022 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant OH by Benjamin M. Flowers. Certificate of Service: 01/03/2022. [21-4235] (BMF) [Entered: 01/03/2022 03:21 PM]
January 3, 2022 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Xavier Becerra, HHS, Jessica S. Marcella and Office of Population Affairs by Courtney L. Dixon. Certificate of Service: 01/03/2022. [21-4235] (CLD) [Entered: 01/03/2022 01:58 PM]
January 3, 2022 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Xavier Becerra, HHS, Jessica S. Marcella and Office of Population Affairs by Abby C. Wright. Certificate of Service: 01/03/2022. [21-4235] (ACW) [Entered: 01/03/2022 01:19 PM]
January 3, 2022 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Xavier Becerra, HHS, Jessica S. Marcella and Office of Population Affairs by Kyle T. Edwards. Certificate of Service: 01/03/2022. [21-4235] (KTE) [Entered: 01/03/2022 01:01 PM]
December 30, 2021 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Robin L. Baker (RLB) [Entered: 12/30/2021 12:21 PM]
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants OH, KY, AL, AZ, AR, FL, KS, MO, NE, OK, SC and WV. Transcript needed: y. (RLB) [Entered: 12/30/2021 12:16 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: OH, et al v. Xavier Becerra, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STATE OF OHIO
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Represented By: Stephen P. Carney
Represented By: Sylvia May Mailman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STATE OF ALABAMA
Represented By: Thomas Alexander Wilson
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STATE OF ARIZONA
Represented By: Kate Blakeley Sawyer
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STATE OF ARKANSAS
Represented By: Vincent M. Wagner
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Represented By: Nicholas J. Bronni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STATE OF FLORIDA
Represented By: Natalie Christmas
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STATE OF KANSAS
Represented By: Kurtis Kenneth Wiard
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY
Represented By: Olivia Flora Amlung
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Represented By: Brett Robert Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STATE OF MISSOURI
Represented By: Dean John Sauer
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STATE OF NEBRASKA
Represented By: James A. Campbell
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STATE OF OKLAHOMA
Represented By: Zachary Paul West
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Thomas T. Hydrick
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA
Represented By: Lindsay Sara See
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: XAVIER BECERRA, Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Alexandra Rachel Saslaw
Represented By: Courtney L. Dixon
Represented By: Kyle T. Edwards
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JESSICA S. MARCELLA, Deputy Assistant Secretary for Population Affairs, in their official capacities
Represented By: Alexandra Rachel Saslaw
Represented By: Courtney L. Dixon
Represented By: Kyle T. Edwards
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Alexandra Rachel Saslaw
Represented By: Courtney L. Dixon
Represented By: Kyle T. Edwards
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OFFICE OF POPULATION AFFAIRS
Represented By: Alexandra Rachel Saslaw
Represented By: Courtney L. Dixon
Represented By: Kyle T. Edwards
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MONTANA
Represented By: Christian Brian Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF ALASKA
Represented By: Christian Brian Corrigan
Represented By: Treg R. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF IDAHO
Represented By: Christian Brian Corrigan
Represented By: Lawrence G. Wasden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF LOUISIANA
Represented By: Christian Brian Corrigan
Represented By: Jeff W. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF GEORGIA
Represented By: Christian Brian Corrigan
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF INDIANA
Represented By: Christian Brian Corrigan
Represented By: Theodore E. Rokita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MISSISSIPPI
Represented By: Christian Brian Corrigan
Represented By: Lynn Fitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF SOUTH DAKOTA
Represented By: Christian Brian Corrigan
Represented By: Jason Ravnsborg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF TEXAS
Represented By: Christian Brian Corrigan
Represented By: Ken Paxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: Alan Evan Schoenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Represented By: Rob Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF COLORADO
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Represented By: Phil Weiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF CONNECTICUT
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Represented By: William Tong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF DELAWARE
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Represented By: Kathleen Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF HAWAII
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Represented By: Holly T. Shikada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Represented By: Kwame Raoul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MAINE
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Represented By: Aaron M. Frey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MARYLAND
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Represented By: Brian E. Frosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Represented By: Maura Healey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MICHIGAN
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Represented By: Dana Nessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MINNESOTA
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Represented By: Keith Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NEVADA
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Represented By: Aaron Darnell Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Represented By: Andrew J. Bruck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NEW MEXICO
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Represented By: Hector Balderas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Represented By: Joshua H. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF OREGON
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Represented By: Ellen F. Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Represented By: Josh Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF RHODE ISLAND
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Represented By: Peter F. Neronha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF VERMONT
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Represented By: Thomas J. Donovan Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Represented By: Mark R. Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF WASHINGTON
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Represented By: Robert W. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF WISCONSIN
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Represented By: Joshua L. Kaul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Laura Etlinger
Represented By: Karl A. Racine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PRO LIFE OBSTETRICIANS & GYNECOLOGISTS
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Represented By: Denise Harle
Represented By: Mark Lippelmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHRISTIAN MEDICAL & DENTAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Represented By: Denise Harle
Represented By: Mark Lippelmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CATHOLIC MEDICAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Represented By: Denise Harle
Represented By: Mark Lippelmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL FAMILY PLANNING & REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Margaret Dotzel
Represented By: Catherine S. Duval
Represented By: Alyssa Howard
Represented By: Cassandra Trombley Shapir Jonas
Represented By: Robin Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?