State of West Virginia, et al v. EPA, et al
Petitioner: State of West Virginia, State of Texas, State of Alabama, Arizona Corporation Commission, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, Attorney General Bill Schuette for the People, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Utah, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming
Respondent: Environmental Protection Agency, Regina A. McCarthy, Administrator, United States Environmental Protection Agency, E. Scott Pruitt, Administrator, United States Environmental Protection Agency and Andrew Wheeler, Administrator, United States Environmental Protection Agency
Intervenor: American Wind Energy Association, Advanced Energy Economy, American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Sierra Club, Peabody Energy Corporation, Solar Energy Industries Association, State of New York, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Broward County, Florida, Nextera Energy, Inc., Calpine Corporation, City of Austin, doing business as Austin Energy, City of Seattle, National Grid Generation, LLC, Pacific Gas and Electric Company, Dixon Bros., Inc., Nelson Brothers, Inc., Wesco International, Inc., Norfolk Southern Corporation, Joy Global Inc., Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition, West Virginia Highlands Conservancy, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Coal River Mountain Watch, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, New York Power Authority, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, Southern California Edison Company and City of Los Angeles Department of Water and Power
Amicus Curiae: William D. Ruckelshaus, William K. Reilly, Philip Zoebisch, Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law, National League of Cities, Ann Arbor, MI; Arlington County, VA; Aurora, IL; Bellingham, WA; Berkeley, CA; Bloomington, IN; Boise, ID; Boston, MA; Carmel, IN; Chapel Hill, NC; Clarkston, GA; Cutler Bay, FL; Elgin, IL; Eugene, OR; Evanston, IL; Fort Co, United States Conference of Mayors, Baltimore, MD, Coral Gables, FL, Grand Rapids, MI, Houston, TX, Jersey City, NJ, Los Angeles, CA, Minneapolis, MN, Pinecrest, FL, Portland, OR, Providence, RI, Salt Lake City, UT, San Francisco, CA, West Palm Beach, FL, Boulder County, CO, Municipal Electric Authority of Georgia, American Thoracic Society, American Medical Association, American College of Preventive Medicine, American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, Pacific Legal Foundation, Texas Public Policy Foundation, Morning Star Packing Company, Merit Oil Company, Loggers Association of Northern California, Norman R. Brown, Service Employees International Union, Members of Congress, Sen. Mitch McConnell, Sen. James M. Inhofe, Sen. Lamar Alexander, Sen. John Barrasso, Sen. Roy Blunt, Sen. John Boozman, Sen. Shelly Moore Capito, Sen. Bill Cassidy, Sen. Dan Coats, Sen. John Cornyn, Sen. Michael D. Crapo, Sen. T, Adobe, Inc., State and Local Business Associations, Texas Association of Business, Pennsylvania Chamber of Business and Industry, Ohio Chamber of Commerce, Alaska Chamber of Commerce, Arizona Chamber of Commerce and Industry, Arkansas State Chamber of Commerce/As, Madeleine K. Albright, 60Plus Association, Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc., Joseph S. D'Aleo, State of Nevada, Consumers' Research, Landmark Legal Foundation, Former State Public Utility Commissioners, Congressman Kevin Cramer, David Armstrong, Randall Bynum, Charles Davidson, Jeff Davis, Mark David Goss, Robert Hix, Terry Jarrett, Larry Landis, Jon McKinney, Carl Miller, Polly Page, Anthony Rachal III, Dr, Amazon.com, Inc., Harold H. Doiron, American Academy of Pediatrics, Don J. Easterbrook, American Public Health Association, Theodore R. Eck, American Sustainable Business Council, Gordon J. Fulks, Apple Inc., William M. Gray, Leon Billings, Hispanic Leadership Fund, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Craig D. Idso, William J. Burn, Richard A. Keen, Catholic Climate Covenant, Anthony P. Lupo, Citizens Utility Board, National Black Chamber of Commerce, Climate Scientists, Thomas P. Sheahen, Consumers Union, S. Fred Singer, Current Members of Congress and Bi-partisan Former Members of Congress, James P. Wallace, III, Dominion Resources, Inc., George T. Wolff, Former State Officials, Google Inc., Grid Experts, Ikea North America Services, LLC, Thomas C. Jorling, Mars, Inc., Microsoft Corp., National Association for Medical Direction of Respiratory Care, National Medical Association, Leon E. Panetta, Public Citizen, Inc., South Carolina Small Business Chamber of Commerce and Union of Concerned Scientists
Case Number: 15-1363
Filed: October 23, 2015
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2023 NOTICE [2007239] to substitute attorney Benjamin M. Flowers substituted by Mathura J. Sridharan filed by State of Ohio in 15-1363 [Service Date: 07/11/2023 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Sridharan, Mathura) [Entered: 07/11/2023 11:35 AM]
October 31, 2022 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--REPORT [1971454] filed by EPA in 15-1472, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488 abeyance status is the matter is subject to review by EPA [Service Date: 10/31/2022 ] [15-1472, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] --[Edited 11/01/2022 by LMF] (Kaplan, David) [Entered: 10/31/2022 09:25 PM]
September 23, 2022 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1965806] filed by Travis S. Jordan on behalf of Petitioner State of Wyoming. [15-1363] (Jordan, Travis) [Entered: 09/23/2022 12:44 PM]
September 21, 2022 NOTICE [1965438] to withdraw attorney Jill Heeringa Van Noord who represented Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393 filed by Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393 [Service Date: 09/21/2022 ] [15-1393, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Van Noord, Jill) [Entered: 09/21/2022 07:03 PM]
May 25, 2021 NOTICE [1900076] to substitute attorney Kyle D. Hawkins substituted by Judd E. Stone II filed by State of Texas [Service Date: 05/25/2021 ] [15-1363] (Stone, Judd) [Entered: 05/25/2021 03:58 PM]
December 31, 2019 NOTICE [1822253] to withdraw attorney Keith Joseph Miller who represented Arizona Corporation Commission in 15-1363 filed by Arizona Corporation Commission [Service Date: 12/31/2019 ] [15-1363] (Miller, Keith) [Entered: 12/31/2019 04:40 PM]
September 17, 2019 MANDATE ISSUED to EPA. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] [Entered: 09/17/2019 03:43 PM]
September 17, 2019 PER CURIAM ORDER, En Banc, [1806952] filed granting motions to dismiss petitions as moot [ # 1799127-2 ] [ # 1797267-2 ] [ # 1798600-2 ]. Dismissing as moot the pending motions [ # 1671347-2 ] [ # 1671332-2 ] [ # 1670187-2 ] [ # 1668960-2 ] [ # 1668937-2 ] [ # 1668932-2 ] [ # 1668929-2 ] [ # 1663046-2 ] [ # 1668952-2 ] [ # 1668921-2 ] [ # 1668936-2 ] [ # 1663047-2 ]. The Clerk is directed to issue the mandateforthwith in these cases. Before Judges: Garland*, Henderson, Rogers, Tatel, Griffith, Srinivasan, Millett, Pillard, Wilkins, Katsas*, and Rao* (*Chief Judge Garland and Circuit Judges Katsas and Rao did not participate in this matter). [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] [Entered: 09/17/2019 03:32 PM]
September 3, 2019 REPORT [1804553] filed by Regina A. McCarthy, EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, Gina McCarthy, EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, Catherine McCabe, EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 abeyance status is final rule has been published, and motions to dismiss petitions for review have been filed [Service Date: 09/03/2019 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 09/03/2019 09:19 AM]
August 28, 2019 NOTICE [1804056] change of address filed by State of North Dakota in 15-1380, 17-1014 [Service Date: 08/28/2019 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Seby, Paul) [Entered: 08/28/2019 01:22 PM]
August 23, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1803385] filed by Anne E. Minard on behalf of Movant-Intervenor for Respondent State of New Mexico in 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023. [17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023] (Minard, Anne) [Entered: 08/23/2019 11:28 AM]
August 16, 2019 NOTICE [1802566] to substitute attorney Lawrence S. Robbins; Jennifer S. Windom substituted by Jeffery Dennis filed by Advanced Energy Economy in 15-1363 [Service Date: 08/16/2019 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Robbins, Lawrence) [Entered: 08/16/2019 02:29 PM]
August 14, 2019 NOTICE [1802224] to substitute attorney Katharine G. Shirey substituted by Christopher H. Reitz & Emily C. Nelson filed by State of Washington in 17-1014 [Service Date: 08/14/2019 ] [17-1014, 15-1363] (Reitz, Christopher) [Entered: 08/14/2019 04:46 PM]
August 13, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1801968] filed by Peter Surdo on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent State of Minnesota in 15-1363, Movant-Intervenor for Respondent State of Minnesota in 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023. [15-1363, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023] (Surdo, Peter) [Entered: 08/13/2019 03:12 PM]
August 2, 2019 REPORT [1800467] filed by EPA, E. Scott Pruitt, Andrew Wheeler and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, EPA, E. Scott Pruitt and Andrew Wheeler in 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 abeyance status is final rule has been published, and motions to dismiss petitions for review have been filed [Service Date: 08/02/2019 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 08/02/2019 12:59 PM]
August 1, 2019 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1800293] to motion [ # 1799127-2 ] filed by American Lung Association, Broward County, Florida, Center for Biological Diversity, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, Conservation Law Foundation, DC, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363 [Service Date: 08/01/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 159 words. [15-1363, 15-1488, 15-1483, 15-1477, 15-1475, 15-1474, 15-1472, 15-1470, 15-1464, 15-1459, 15-1451, 15-1442, 15-1432, 15-1422, 15-1418, 15-1413, 15-1410, 15-1409, 15-1398, 15-1393, 15-1386, 15-1383, 15-1382, 15-1380, 15-1379, 15-1378, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1375, 15-1374, 15-1373, 15-1372, 15-1371, 15-1370, 15-1368, 15-1367, 15-1366, 15-1365, 15-1364] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 08/01/2019 03:22 PM]
August 1, 2019 REPLY [1800343] filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming and Dixon Bros., Inc., Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition, Joy Global Inc., Nelson Brothers, Inc., Norfolk Southern Corporation, Peabody Energy Corporation and Wesco International, Inc. in 15-1363, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 15-1365, Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366, National Mining Association in 15-1367, American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372, Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374, United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375, Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc., Western Farmers Electric Cooperative and Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1376, Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379, State of North Dakota in 15-1380, American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382, Association of American Railroads in 15-1383, Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393, Energy & Environment Legal Institute in 15-1398, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality, Mississippi Public Service Commission and State of Mississippi in 15-1409, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 15-1410, Entergy Corporation in 15-1413, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418, West Virginia Coal Association in 15-1422, Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC and Newmont USA Limited in 15-1432, Kansas City Board of Public Utilities in 15-1442, Coteau Properties Company, Coyote Creek Mining Company, Falkirk Mining Company, Mississippi Lignite Mining Company, NODAK Energy Services, LLC, North American Coal Royalty Company, Otter Creek Mining Company, LLC, Sabine Mining Company and The North American Coal Corporation in 15-1451, Indiana Utility Group in 15-1459, Louisiana Public Service Commission in 15-1464, GenOn Mid-Atlantic, LLC, Indian River Power LLC, Louisiana Generating LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Chalk Point LLC, NRG Power Midwest LP, NRG Rema LLC, NRG Texas Power LLC, NRG Wholesale Generation LP and Vienna Power LLC in 15-1470, Prairie State Generating Company LLC in 15-1472, Minnesota Power in 15-1474, Denbury Onshore, LLC in 15-1475, Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions, Klaus J. Christoph, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Samuel R. Damewood, Caterine C. Dellin, Independence Institute, Joseph W. Luquire, Lisa R. Markham, Patrick T. Peterson, Rio Grande Foundation, Kristi Rosenquist and Sutherland Institute in 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association in 17-1020, State of Alabama, State of Arizona Corporation Commission, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality, State of Mississippi Public Service Commission, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia and State of Wyoming in 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, Peabody Energy Corporation in 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc. and Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc. in 17-1068, 17-1081, Basin Electric Power Cooperative in 17-1091, 17-1092 to response [ # 1799095-2 ] [Service Date: 08/01/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 506 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Wood, Allison) [Entered: 08/01/2019 06:52 PM]
July 31, 2019 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT [1799877] to motion to dismiss case as moot [ # 1799127-2 ] filed by Andrew Wheeler and EPA in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 [Service Date: 07/31/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 115 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Carlisle, Benjamin) [Entered: 07/31/2019 09:31 AM]
July 25, 2019 MOTION [1799127] to dismiss case as moot (Response to Motion served by hand due on 08/05/2019). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 08/05/2019) filed by Local Government Coalition for Renewable Energy in 15-1483 (Service Date: 07/25/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 239 Words. [15-1363, 15-1483] (DuBoff, Scott) [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:57 PM]
July 25, 2019 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1799095] to motion to dismiss case as moot [ # 1797267-2 ], motion to dismiss case as moot [ # 1798600-2 ] filed by American Lung Association, Broward County, Florida, Center for Biological Diversity, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, Conservation Law Foundation, DC, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363, American Lung Association, Broward County, Florida, Center for Biological Diversity, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, Conservation Law Foundation, DC, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keeper of the Mountain Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, The Ohio Environmental Council and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 17-1014, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota and State of New Mexico in 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023 [Service Date: 07/25/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 984 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:03 PM]
July 24, 2019 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT [1798780] to motion to dismiss case as moot [ # 1798600-2 ] filed by EPA in 17-1014, Andrew Wheeler and EPA in 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 [Service Date: 07/24/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 117 words. [17-1014, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Carlisle, Benjamin) [Entered: 07/24/2019 01:00 PM]
July 23, 2019 CORRECTED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1798582] filed by Anne E. Minard on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent State of New Mexico. [15-1363] (Minard, Anne) [Entered: 07/23/2019 03:07 PM]
July 23, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1798547] filed by Anne E. Minard on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent State of New Mexico. [15-1363] (Minard, Anne) [Entered: 07/23/2019 01:40 PM]
July 23, 2019 MOTION [1798600] to dismiss case as moot (Response to Motion served by hand due on 08/02/2019). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 08/02/2019) filed by State of North Dakota in 17-1014, Murray Energy Corporation in 17-1015, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 17-1018, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 17-1019, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association in 17-1020, State of Alabama, State of Arizona Corporation Commission, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality, State of Mississippi Public Service Commission, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia and State of Wyoming in 17-1022, National Association of Home Builders in 17-1023, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 17-1031, Peabody Energy Corporation in 17-1035, Entergy Corporation in 17-1037, National Mining Association in 17-1061, Westar Energy, Inc. in 17-1062, Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC and Newmont USA Limited in 17-1063, East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc. and Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc. in 17-1068, NorthWestern Corporation in 17-1081, Basin Electric Power Cooperative in 17-1091, Denbury Onshore, LLC in 17-1092 (Service Date: 07/23/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 293 words. [17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Wood, Allison) [Entered: 07/23/2019 04:21 PM]
July 17, 2019 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT [1797703] to motion [ # 1797267-2 ] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 [Service Date: 07/17/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 241 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Carlisle, Benjamin) [Entered: 07/17/2019 03:04 PM]
July 16, 2019 Amended STATEMENT with Disclosure Listing[1797487] filed by GenOn Mid-Atlantic, LLC, Indian River Power LLC, Louisiana Generating LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Chalk Point LLC, NRG Power Midwest LP, NRG Rema LLC, NRG Texas Power LLC, NRG Wholesale Generation LP and Vienna Power LLC in 15-1470 [Service Date: 07/16/2019 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092]--[Edited 07/17/2019 by AH--MODIFIED EVENT] (Zidlicky, Paul) [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:24 PM]
July 15, 2019 MOTION [1797267] to dismiss case as moot (Response to Motion served by hand due on 07/25/2019). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 07/25/2019) filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wyoming and Dixon Bros., Inc., Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition, Joy Global Inc., Nelson Brothers, Inc., Norfolk Southern Corporation, Peabody Energy Corporation and Wesco International, Inc. in 15-1363, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 15-1365, Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366, National Mining Association in 15-1367, American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372, Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374, United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375, Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc., Western Farmers Electric Cooperative and Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1376, Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379, State of North Dakota in 15-1380, American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382, Association of American Railroads in 15-1383, Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393, Energy & Environment Legal Institute in 15-1398, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality, Mississippi Public Service Commission and State of Mississippi in 15-1409, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 15-1410, Entergy Corporation in 15-1413, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418, West Virginia Coal Association in 15-1422, Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC and Newmont USA Limited in 15-1432, Kansas City Board of Public Utilities in 15-1442, Coteau Properties Company, Coyote Creek Mining Company, Falkirk Mining Company, Mississippi Lignite Mining Company, NODAK Energy Services, LLC, North American Coal Royalty Company, Otter Creek Mining Company, LLC, Sabine Mining Company and The North American Coal Corporation in 15-1451, Indiana Utility Group in 15-1459, Louisiana Public Service Commission in 15-1464, GenOn Mid-Atlantic, LLC, Indian River Power LLC, Louisiana Generating LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Chalk Point LLC, NRG Power Midwest LP, NRG Rema LLC, NRG Texas Power LLC, NRG Wholesale Generation LP and Vienna Power LLC in 15-1470, Prairie State Generating Company LLC in 15-1472, Minnesota Power in 15-1474, Denbury Onshore, LLC in 15-1475, Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions, Klaus J. Christoph, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Samuel R. Damewood, Caterine C. Dellin, Independence Institute, Joseph W. Luquire, Lisa R. Markham, Patrick T. Peterson, Rio Grande Foundation, Kristi Rosenquist and Sutherland Institute in 15-1488 (Service Date: 07/15/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 269 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Wood, Allison) [Entered: 07/15/2019 07:32 PM]
July 10, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1796620] filed by Daniel W. Bell on behalf of Petitioner State of Florida in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Bell, Daniel) [Entered: 07/10/2019 01:38 PM]
July 10, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1796648] filed by Megan H. Berge and co-counsel Evan A. Young on behalf of Petitioner Entergy Corporation in 15-1413, Petitioner Western Farmers Electric Cooperative in 15-1376, Petitioner Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, Petitioner NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, Petitioner National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379, 17-1023, 17-1037, 17-1062, 17-1081. [15-1413, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Berge, Megan) [Entered: 07/10/2019 02:59 PM]
July 10, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1796636] filed by Edmund G. LaCour Jr. on behalf of Petitioner State of Alabama. [15-1363] (LaCour, Edmund) [Entered: 07/10/2019 02:42 PM]
July 10, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1796660] filed by Lindsay S. See, Solicitor General and co-counsel Thomas T. Lampman, Assistant Solicitor General on behalf of Petitioner State of West Virginia in 15-1363, 17-1022. [15-1363, 17-1022] (Lampman, Thomas) [Entered: 07/10/2019 03:27 PM]
July 10, 2019 NOTICE [1796665] to withdraw attorney Zachary Aaron Viglianco who represented State of West Virginia in 15-1363 and State of West Virginia in 17-1022 filed by State of West Virginia in 15-1363, 17-1022 [Service Date: 07/10/2019 ] [15-1363, 17-1022] (Lampman, Thomas) [Entered: 07/10/2019 03:35 PM]
July 3, 2019 REPORT [1795699] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 abeyance status is awaiting publication of final rule [Service Date: 07/03/2019 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 07/03/2019 01:20 PM]
July 3, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1795810] filed by Steven C. Kilpatrick on behalf of Petitioner State of Wisconsin. [15-1363] (Kilpatrick, Steven) [Entered: 07/03/2019 05:25 PM]
July 2, 2019 NOTICE [1795511] to withdraw attorney Bryan Charles Clark who represented State of Kansas in 15-1363 filed by State of Kansas [Service Date: 07/02/2019 ] [15-1363] (Clark, Bryan) [Entered: 07/02/2019 02:39 PM]
June 20, 2019 REPORT [1793657] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 abeyance status is Final rule signed. [Service Date: 06/20/2019 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 06/20/2019 10:56 AM]
June 19, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1793608] filed by Matthew Cochenour on behalf of Petitioner State of Montana in 15-1363, 17-1022. [15-1363, 17-1022] (Cochenour, Matthew) [Entered: 06/19/2019 06:31 PM]
June 19, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1793479] filed by Meghan E. Greenfield and co-counsel Benjamin Carlisle on behalf of Respondents Andrew Wheeler and EPA in 15-1363, Respondent EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Greenfield, Meghan) [Entered: 06/19/2019 10:34 AM]
June 10, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1791818] filed by Erin Chapman on behalf of Petitioner Denbury Onshore, LLC in 17-1092. [17-1014, 17-1092] (Chapman, Erin) [Entered: 06/10/2019 11:06 AM]
June 5, 2019 NOTICE [1791093] to withdraw attorney , to substitute attorney Max Hollister Kieley substituted by Stacey W. Person filed by State of Minnesota in 15-1363, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023 [Service Date: 06/05/2019 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Person, Stacey) [Entered: 06/05/2019 11:08 AM]
June 5, 2019 REPORT [1791253] filed by Andrew Wheeler, E. Scott Pruitt, Regina A. McCarthy and EPA in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, Andrew Wheeler, E. Scott Pruitt, Gina McCarthy and EPA in 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, Andrew Wheeler, E. Scott Pruitt, Catherine McCabe and EPA in 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 abeyance status is awaiting decision of agency [Service Date: 06/05/2019 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Kolman, Chloe) [Entered: 06/05/2019 03:49 PM]
May 30, 2019 NOTICE [1790225] to withdraw attorney Mark L. Walters who represented Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition in 15-1363 filed by Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition [Service Date: 05/30/2019 ] [15-1363] (Walters, Mark) [Entered: 05/30/2019 03:06 PM]
May 17, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1788418] filed by Benjamin M. Flowers and co-counsel Cameron F. Simmons on behalf of Petitioner State of Ohio. [15-1363] (Simmons, Cameron) [Entered: 05/17/2019 05:23 PM]
May 17, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1788287] filed granting the motion of the State of Nevada to withdraw as amicus in case [ # 1788037-2 ] in 15-1363, granting motion of petitioner Energy-Intensive Manufacturers Working Group on Greenhouse Gas Regulation in 15-1477 to withdraw as petitioner [ # 1787753-2 ]. The Clerk is directed to note the docket accordingly [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] [Entered: 05/17/2019 11:47 AM]
May 15, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1788037] to terminate party filed by State of Nevada [Service Date: 05/15/2019 ] Length Certification: 131 Words. [15-1363] (Stern, Heidi) [Entered: 05/15/2019 07:24 PM]
May 14, 2019 MOTION [1787753] to terminate party filed by Energy-Intensive Manufacturers' Working Group on Greenhouse Gas Regulation in 15-1477 (Service Date: 05/14/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: This document complies with the type-volume limitation of Fed. R. App. P. 27(d)(2)(A) because, including the title and excluding the parts of the document exempted by Fed. R. App. P. 32(f), this document contains 84 words.. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (McMackin, John) [Entered: 05/14/2019 01:21 PM]
May 14, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1787783] filed by Heidi Parry Stern on behalf of Amicus Curiae for Petitioner State of Nevada. [15-1363] (Stern, Heidi) [Entered: 05/14/2019 02:21 PM]
May 9, 2019 NOTICE [1787218] to withdraw attorney Tauna Marie Szymanski who represented American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370 filed by American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group [Service Date: 05/09/2019 ] [15-1370] (Wood, Allison) [Entered: 05/09/2019 09:29 PM]
May 9, 2019 NOTICE [1787219] to withdraw attorney Tauna Marie Szymanski who represented Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373 filed by Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. [Service Date: 05/09/2019 ] [15-1373] (Wood, Allison) [Entered: 05/09/2019 09:32 PM]
May 9, 2019 NOTICE [1787220] to withdraw attorney Tauna Marie Szymanski who represented Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374 filed by Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. [Service Date: 05/09/2019 ] [15-1374] (Wood, Allison) [Entered: 05/09/2019 09:34 PM]
May 7, 2019 NOTICE [1786465] to withdraw attorney Valerie Layne Green who represented Mississippi Public Service Commission in 15-1409, to substitute attorney Valerie L. Green substituted by John A. Sheehan filed by Mississippi Public Service Commission in 15-1409 [Service Date: 05/07/2019 ] [15-1363, 15-1409] (Booth, William) [Entered: 05/07/2019 11:51 AM]
May 6, 2019 REPORT [1786225] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 abeyance status is awaiting decision of agency [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 05/06/2019 03:13 PM]
May 2, 2019 NOTICE [1785618] to substitute attorney Gerald D. Reid substituted by Mary M. Sauer, Laura E. Jensen filed by State of Maine [Service Date: 05/02/2019 ] [15-1363] (Jensen, Laura) [Entered: 05/02/2019 10:18 AM]
May 1, 2019 LETTER [1785506] to change party information filed by State of Texas in 15-1363, 17-1022 [Service Date: 05/01/2019 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Bennett, Lisa) [Entered: 05/01/2019 03:01 PM]
April 11, 2019 NOTICE [1782451] to withdraw attorney Jeffrey Bossert Clark Sr. who represented Consumers' Research in 15-1363 filed by Consumers' Research and State of Nevada [Service Date: 04/11/2019 ] [15-1363] (Hicks, George) [Entered: 04/11/2019 02:46 PM]
April 10, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1782076] filed by Sarah Adkins on behalf of Petitioner Commonwealth of Kentucky. [15-1363] (Adkins, Sarah) [Entered: 04/10/2019 10:49 AM]
April 5, 2019 PER CURIAM ORDER, En Banc, [1781428] filed upon consideration of respondents status report filed March 11, 2019 [ # 1776963-2 ], which includes a request to continue to hold these consolidated cases in abeyance, and the opposition to the request, it is ORDERED that these consolidated cases remain in abeyance for 60 days from the date of this order. EPA is directed to file status reports at 30-day intervals beginning 30 days from the date of this order. Before Judges: Garland*, Henderson, Rogers, Tatel, Griffith, Srinivasan, Millett, Pillard, Wilkins, Katsas* and Rao*. * Chief Judge Garland and Circuit Judges Katsas and Rao did not participate in this matter. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] [Entered: 04/05/2019 03:48 PM]
April 2, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1780627] filed by Lindsay S. See and co-counsel Zachary A. Viglianco on behalf of Petitioner State of West Virginia in 15-1363, 17-1022. [15-1363, 15-1371, 15-1386, 17-1022] (See, Lindsay) [Entered: 04/02/2019 11:23 AM]
March 20, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1778592] filed by Oramel H. Skinner on behalf of Petitioner Arizona Corporation Commission in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Skinner, Oramel) [Entered: 03/20/2019 07:22 PM]
March 20, 2019 NOTICE [1778593] to substitute attorney Dominic Emil Draye substituted by Oramel H. Skinner filed by Arizona Corporation Commission in 15-1363 [Service Date: 03/20/2019 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Skinner, Oramel) [Entered: 03/20/2019 07:24 PM]
March 14, 2019 JOINT NOTICE [1777694] Opposing EPA request for additional abeyance until completion of rulemaking filed by American Lung Association, Broward County, Florida, Center for Biological Diversity, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, Conservation Law Foundation, DC, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363, The Ohio Environmental Council in 17-1014 [Service Date: 03/14/2019 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 03/14/2019 05:11 PM]
March 11, 2019 REPORT [1776963] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 abeyance status is awaiting decision of agency [Service Date: 03/11/2019 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:16 PM]
March 8, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1776726] filed granting motion to terminate party in case [ # 1774399-2 ] in 15-1363, 15-1371 Gulf Power Company in 15-1371 and Gulf Power Company in 17-1031. The Clerk is directed to note the docket to reflect the withdrawal of Gulf Power Company as a petitioner in these consolidated cases. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] [Entered: 03/08/2019 01:23 PM]
March 5, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1776162] filed by Benjamin M. Flowers on behalf of Petitioner State of Ohio in 15-1363, 17-1022. [15-1363, 17-1022] (Flowers, Benjamin) [Entered: 03/05/2019 03:45 PM]
March 4, 2019 NOTICE [1775930] to withdraw attorney Jordan E. Pratt who represented State of Florida in 15-1363 filed by State of Florida [Service Date: 03/04/2019 ] [15-1363] (Pratt, Jordan) [Entered: 03/04/2019 08:53 PM]
February 22, 2019 MOTION [1774399] to terminate party filed by Gulf Power Company in 15-1371 (Service Date: 02/22/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 64 words.. [15-1363, 15-1371] (Alves, James) [Entered: 02/22/2019 10:40 AM]
February 8, 2019 REPORT [1772575] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 abeyance status is awaiting decision of agency [Service Date: 02/08/2019 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 02/08/2019 12:44 PM]
January 30, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1771087] filed granting the motion to withdraw party [ # 1770373-2 ] withdrawing as party the State of Colorado in 15-1363. The Clerk is directed to note the docket to reflect the withdrawal of the State of Colorado as a petitioner in these consolidated cases. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] [Entered: 01/30/2019 02:57 PM]
January 26, 2019 MOTION [1770373] to withdraw as party (Response to Motion served by hand due on 02/05/2019) filed by State of Colorado (Service Date: 01/26/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 58 Words. [15-1363] (Roper, Glenn) [Entered: 01/26/2019 12:47 PM]
January 24, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1769953] filed granting respondents' motion to extend time to file its status report [ # 1768652-2 ]; Respondents are directed to file the next status report within 14 days of the date that appropriations are restored and the Department of Justice attorneys are permitted to resume their usual civil litigation functions. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] [Entered: 01/24/2019 10:19 AM]
January 24, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1770010] filed by Vera Pardee on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Sierra Club. [15-1363] (Pardee, Vera) [Entered: 01/24/2019 12:41 PM]
January 23, 2019 CLERK'S ORDER [1769883] filed granting the motion to withdraw party [ # 1769123-2 ], withdrawing as party State of Michigan in 15-1363. The Clerk is directed to note the docket to reflect the withdrawal of the State of Michigan as a petitioner in these consolidated cases. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] [Entered: 01/23/2019 05:23 PM]
January 18, 2019 NOTICE [1769070] to withdraw attorney Karl Roy Moor who represented Georgia Power Company in 15-1371 filed by Georgia Power Company in 15-1371, 17-1031 [Service Date: 01/18/2019 ] [15-1371, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Campbell, Margaret) [Entered: 01/18/2019 11:02 AM]
January 18, 2019 NOTICE [1769099] to withdraw attorney Karl Roy Moor who represented Alabama Power Company in 15-1371, Steven George McKinney who represented Alabama Power Company in 15-1371 filed by Alabama Power Company in 15-1371 [Service Date: 01/18/2019 ] [15-1371, 15-1363] (Moore, C.) [Entered: 01/18/2019 11:42 AM]
January 18, 2019 MOTION [1769123] to withdraw case (Response to Motion served by hand due on 01/28/2019). (Response to Motion served by mail due on 01/28/2019) filed by State of Michigan (Service Date: 01/18/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 66 words. [15-1363] (Gordon, Neil) [Entered: 01/18/2019 12:14 PM]
January 18, 2019 NOTICE [1769044] to withdraw attorney Karl Roy Moor who represented Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, Ben H. Stone who represented Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, Terese T. Wyly who represented Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371 filed by Mississippi Power Company [Service Date: 01/18/2019 ] [15-1371] (Pettis, Michael) [Entered: 01/18/2019 10:24 AM]
January 17, 2019 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1768852] filed by M. Brant Pettis on behalf of Petitioner Mississippi Power Company. [15-1371] (Pettis, Michael) [Entered: 01/17/2019 12:04 PM]
January 16, 2019 MOTION [1768652] to extend time to file report filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 (Service Date: 01/16/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 559 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 01/16/2019 02:12 PM]
January 16, 2019 NOTICE [1768699] to withdraw attorney Karl Roy Moor who represented Gulf Power Company in 15-1371 filed by Gulf Power Company in 15-1371 [Service Date: 01/16/2019 ] [15-1371, 15-1363] (Alves, James) [Entered: 01/16/2019 03:39 PM]
January 16, 2019 NOTICE [1768702] to substitute attorney Jeffrey Alan Stone substituted by James Steven Alves filed by Gulf Power Company in 17-1031 [Service Date: 01/16/2019 ] [17-1031, 15-1363] (Alves, James) [Entered: 01/16/2019 03:43 PM]
January 10, 2019 NOTICE [1767904] to withdraw attorney Peter S. Glaser who represented National Mining Association in 15-1367 and National Mining Association in 17-1061 filed by National Mining Association in 15-1367, 17-1061 [Service Date: 01/10/2019 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (McGuffey, Carroll) [Entered: 01/10/2019 02:36 PM]
January 8, 2019 NOTICE [1767526] to withdraw attorney Amanda Shafer Berman who represented EPA in 15-1363 filed by EPA in 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 [Service Date: 01/08/2019 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Berman, Amanda) [Entered: 01/08/2019 05:29 PM]
December 31, 2018 NOTICE [1766406] to substitute attorney Misha Tseytlin and Delanie M. Breuer substituted by Luke N. Berg filed by State of Wisconsin in 15-1363, 17-1022 [Service Date: 12/31/2018 ] [15-1363, 17-1022] (Berg, Luke) [Entered: 12/31/2018 11:47 AM]
December 31, 2018 NOTICE [1766417] to withdraw attorney William M. Bumpers who represented Entergy Corporation in 15-1413 filed by Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379, Entergy Corporation in 15-1413, 17-1023, 17-1037, 17-1062, 17-1081 [Service Date: 12/31/2018 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Berge, Megan) [Entered: 12/31/2018 12:08 PM]
December 21, 2018 PER CURIAM ORDER [1765562] filed Upon consideration of the status reports filed August 24, 2018 and August 27, 2018, that include requests to continue holding these consolidated cases in abeyance, and the opposition to the continued abeyance; and the motion of intervenor-respondents to decide the merits of the case, the oppositions thereto, and the reply, it is ORDERED that these consolidated cases remain in abeyance for 60 days from the date of this order. EPA is directed to continue to file status reports at 30-day intervals beginning 30 days from the date of this order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to decide the case on the merits be deniedf [ # 1748706-2 ]. Before Judges: Garland,* Henderson, Rogers, Tatel, Griffith, Srinivasan, Millett, Pillard, Wilkins, and Katsas.*. * Chief Judge Garland and Circuit Judge Katsas did not participate in this matter. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] [Entered: 12/21/2018 04:28 PM]
December 21, 2018 REPORT [1765440] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 abeyance status is awaiting decision of agency [Service Date: 12/21/2018 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 12/21/2018 12:56 PM]
November 28, 2018 NOTICE [1761969] to withdraw attorney Vera P. Pardee who represented Center for Biological Diversity in 15-1363 and Center for Biological Diversity in 17-1014 filed by Center for Biological Diversity in 15-1363, 17-1014 [Service Date: 11/28/2018 ] [15-1363, 17-1014] (Crystal, Howard) [Entered: 11/28/2018 05:23 PM]
November 21, 2018 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1761076] filed by Clare Lakewood on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Center for Biological Diversity. [15-1363] (Lakewood, Clare) [Entered: 11/21/2018 02:59 PM]
November 21, 2018 REPORT [1761135] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 abeyance status is awaiting decision of agency [Service Date: 11/21/2018 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 11/21/2018 04:29 PM]
October 24, 2018 REPORT [1756867] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 abeyance status is awaiting decision of agency [Service Date: 10/24/2018 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 10/24/2018 01:26 PM]
September 24, 2018 REPORT [1752326] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 abeyance status is awaiting decision of agency [Service Date: 09/24/2018 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 09/24/2018 03:00 PM]
September 21, 2018 JOINT REPLY [1751996] filed by American Lung Association, Broward County, Florida, Center for Biological Diversity, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, Conservation Law Foundation, DC, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363 to response [ # 1750684-2 ] [Service Date: 09/21/2018 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2,595 words. [15-1363, 15-1488, 15-1483, 15-1477, 15-1475, 15-1474, 15-1472, 15-1470, 15-1464, 15-1459, 15-1451, 15-1442, 15-1432, 15-1422, 15-1418, 15-1413, 15-1410, 15-1409, 15-1398, 15-1393, 15-1386, 15-1383, 15-1382, 15-1380, 15-1379, 15-1378, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1375, 15-1374, 15-1373, 15-1372, 15-1371, 15-1370, 15-1368, 15-1367, 15-1366, 15-1365, 15-1364] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 09/21/2018 02:17 PM]
September 20, 2018 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1751835] filed by Glenn E. Roper on behalf of Petitioner State of Colorado. [15-1363] (Roper, Glenn) [Entered: 09/20/2018 03:58 PM]
September 20, 2018 NOTICE [1751833] to substitute attorney Frederick R. Yarger substituted by Glenn E. Roper filed by State of Colorado [Service Date: 09/20/2018 ] [15-1363] (Yarger, Frederick) [Entered: 09/20/2018 03:55 PM]
September 14, 2018 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1750741] to motion for other relief [ # 1748706-2 ] filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, State of Wyoming and Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition, Joy Global Inc., Nelson Brothers, Inc., Norfolk Southern Corporation, Peabody Energy Corporation and Wesco International, Inc. in 15-1363, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 15-1365, Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366, National Mining Association in 15-1367, American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372, Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374, United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375, Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc., Western Farmers Electric Cooperative and Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1376, Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379, State of North Dakota in 15-1380, American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382, Association of American Railroads in 15-1383, Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393, Energy & Environment Legal Institute in 15-1398, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality, Mississippi Public Service Commission and State of Mississippi in 15-1409, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 15-1410, Entergy Corporation in 15-1413, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418, West Virginia Coal Association in 15-1422, Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC and Newmont USA Limited in 15-1432, Kansas City Board of Public Utilities in 15-1442, Coteau Properties Company, Coyote Creek Mining Company, Falkirk Mining Company, Mississippi Lignite Mining Company, NODAK Energy Services, LLC, North American Coal Royalty Company, Otter Creek Mining Company, LLC, Sabine Mining Company and The North American Coal Corporation in 15-1451, Indiana Utility Group in 15-1459, Louisiana Public Service Commission in 15-1464, GenOn Mid-Atlantic, LLC, Indian River Power LLC, Louisiana Generating LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Chalk Point LLC, NRG Power Midwest LP, NRG Rema LLC, NRG Texas Power LLC, NRG Wholesale Generation LP and Vienna Power LLC in 15-1470, Prairie State Generating Company LLC in 15-1472, Minnesota Power in 15-1474, Denbury Onshore, LLC in 15-1475, Energy-Intensive Manufacturers' Working Group on Greenhouse Gas Regulation in 15-1477, Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions, Klaus J. Christoph, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Samuel R. Damewood, Caterine C. Dellin, Independence Institute, Joseph W. Luquire, Lisa R. Markham, Patrick T. Peterson, Rio Grande Foundation, Kristi Rosenquist and Sutherland Institute in 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association in 17-1020, State of Alabama, State of Arizona Corporation Commission, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality, State of Mississippi Public Service Commission, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc. and Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc. in 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1092 [Service Date: 09/14/2018 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2,965 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Wood, Allison) [Entered: 09/14/2018 03:54 PM]
September 14, 2018 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1750684] to motion [ # 1748706-2 ] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 [Service Date: 09/14/2018 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 3548 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 09/14/2018 01:24 PM]
September 13, 2018 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1750380] filed by Shay Dvoretzky and co-counsel Charles T. Wehland on behalf of Intervenor for Petitioner Peabody Energy Corporation in 15-1363, Petitioner Peabody Energy Corporation in 17-1035. [15-1363, 17-1035] (Dvoretzky, Shay) [Entered: 09/13/2018 10:51 AM]
September 12, 2018 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1750269] filed by Kyle D. Hawkins on behalf of Petitioner State of Texas in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1378] (Hawkins, Kyle) [Entered: 09/12/2018 04:42 PM]
September 11, 2018 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1750017] filed by Jordan Pratt on behalf of Petitioner State of Florida. [15-1363] (Pratt, Jordan) [Entered: 09/11/2018 02:12 PM]
September 10, 2018 NOTICE [1749688] to substitute attorney Sarah Hawkins Warren substituted by Andrew A. Pinson filed by State of Georgia in 15-1363, 17-1022 [Service Date: 09/10/2018 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Pinson, Andrew) [Entered: 09/10/2018 10:19 AM]
September 6, 2018 NOTICE [1749362] to withdraw attorney Spencer Brimmer Bowman who represented State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality in 15-1363 filed by State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality [Service Date: 09/06/2018 ] [15-1363] (Goudeau, Charlotte) [Entered: 09/06/2018 06:10 PM]
September 4, 2018 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to reports [ # 1747298-2 ] [ # 1747382-2 ] and JOINT MOTION [1748706] to Deny Requests for Further Abeyance and Decide the Merits of Case filed by American Lung Association, Broward County, Florida, Center for Biological Diversity, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, Conservation Law Foundation, DC, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363 (Service Date: 09/04/2018 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 4,353. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092]--[Edited 09/05/2018 by SHA] (Lusignan, Brian) [Entered: 09/04/2018 01:18 PM]
August 29, 2018 NOTICE [1747956] to withdraw attorney Jonathan S Massey who represented Dixon Bros., Inc. in 15-1363 filed by Dixon Bros., Inc., Nelson Brothers, Inc., Wesco International, Inc., Norfolk Southern Corporation, Joy Global Inc. and Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition in 15-1363 [Service Date: 08/29/2018 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Massey, Jonathan) [Entered: 08/29/2018 12:29 PM]
August 27, 2018 REPORT [1747660] filed by State of North Dakota in 15-1380, 17-1014 abeyance status is Abeyance status is awaiting decision of the Court. [Service Date: 08/27/2018 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Seby, Paul) [Entered: 08/27/2018 05:32 PM]
August 24, 2018 REPORT [1747298] filed by EPA and Andrew Wheeler in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 abeyance status is awaiting decision of agency [Service Date: 08/24/2018 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 08/24/2018 02:01 PM]
August 24, 2018 JOINT REPORT [1747382] filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin, State of Wyoming and Dixon Bros., Inc., Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition, Joy Global Inc., Nelson Brothers, Inc., Norfolk Southern Corporation, Peabody Energy Corporation and Wesco International, Inc. in 15-1363, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 15-1365, Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366, National Mining Association in 15-1367, American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372, Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374, United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375, Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc., Western Farmers Electric Cooperative and Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1376, Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379, American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382, Association of American Railroads in 15-1383, Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393, Energy & Environment Legal Institute in 15-1398, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality, Mississippi Public Service Commission and State of Mississippi in 15-1409, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 15-1410, Entergy Corporation in 15-1413, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418, West Virginia Coal Association in 15-1422, Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC and Newmont USA Limited in 15-1432, Kansas City Board of Public Utilities in 15-1442, Coteau Properties Company, Coyote Creek Mining Company, Falkirk Mining Company, Mississippi Lignite Mining Company, NODAK Energy Services, LLC, North American Coal Royalty Company, Otter Creek Mining Company, LLC, Sabine Mining Company and The North American Coal Corporation in 15-1451, Indiana Utility Group in 15-1459, Louisiana Public Service Commission in 15-1464, GenOn Mid-Atlantic, LLC, Indian River Power LLC, Louisiana Generating LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Chalk Point LLC, NRG Power Midwest LP, NRG Rema LLC, NRG Texas Power LLC, NRG Wholesale Generation LP and Vienna Power LLC in 15-1470, Prairie State Generating Company LLC in 15-1472, Minnesota Power in 15-1474, Denbury Onshore, LLC in 15-1475, Energy-Intensive Manufacturers' Working Group on Greenhouse Gas Regulation in 15-1477, Local Government Coalition for Renewable Energy in 15-1483, Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions, Klaus J. Christoph, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Samuel R. Damewood, Caterine C. Dellin, Independence Institute, Joseph W. Luquire, Lisa R. Markham, Patrick T. Peterson, Rio Grande Foundation, Kristi Rosenquist and Sutherland Institute in 15-1488, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association in 17-1020, State of Alabama, State of Arizona Corporation Commission, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality, State of Mississippi Public Service Commission, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, Peabody Energy Corporation in 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc. and Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc. in 17-1068, 17-1081, Basin Electric Power Cooperative in 17-1091, 17-1092 abeyance status is awaiting decision of agency [Service Date: 08/24/2018 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Wood, Allison) [Entered: 08/24/2018 04:29 PM]
August 23, 2018 NOTICE [1747162] to withdraw attorney Laurence H. Tribe who represented Dixon Bros., Inc., Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition, Joy Global Inc., Nelson Brothers, Inc., Norfolk Southern Corporation and Wesco International, Inc. in 15-1363 filed by Dixon Bros., Inc., Nelson Brothers, Inc., Wesco International, Inc., Norfolk Southern Corporation, Joy Global Inc. and Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition [Service Date: 08/23/2018 ] [15-1363] (Duncan, Tristan) [Entered: 08/23/2018 05:16 PM]
August 22, 2018 NOTICE [1746823] to withdraw attorney Tristan Layle Duncan who represented Peabody Energy Corporation in 15-1363, Thomas James Grever who represented Peabody Energy Corporation in 15-1363, Laurence H. Tribe who represented Peabody Energy Corporation in 15-1363 filed by Peabody Energy Corporation [Service Date: 08/22/2018 ] [15-1363] (Duncan, Tristan) [Entered: 08/22/2018 12:44 PM]
August 17, 2018 NOTICE [1746174] to withdraw attorney Daniel Noah Lerman who represented Advanced Energy Economy in 15-1363 filed by Advanced Energy Economy in 15-1363 [Service Date: 08/17/2018 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Lerman, Daniel) [Entered: 08/17/2018 12:23 PM]
July 26, 2018 REPORT [1742722] filed by EPA in 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 abeyance status is awaiting decision of agency [Service Date: 07/26/2018 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 07/26/2018 03:29 PM]
June 28, 2018 NOTICE [1738150] to withdraw attorney Michael Anthony Petrino who represented Consumers' Research in 15-1363 filed by Consumers' Research and State of Nevada [Service Date: 06/28/2018 ] [15-1363] (Hicks, George) [Entered: 06/28/2018 11:06 AM]
June 28, 2018 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1738144] filed by George Hicks on behalf of Amici Curiae for Petitioner Consumers' Research and State of Nevada. [15-1363] (Hicks, George) [Entered: 06/28/2018 10:30 AM]
June 28, 2018 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1738182] filed by Lindsay S. See, Solicitor General on behalf of Petitioner State of West Virginia. [15-1363] (See, Lindsay) [Entered: 06/28/2018 12:18 PM]
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order PER CURIAM ORDER, En Banc, [1737735] filed, on the courts own motion, that these consolidated cases remain in abeyance for 60 days from the date of this order. EPA is directed to continue to file status reports at 30-day intervals beginning 30 days from the date of this order. Before Judges: Garland,* Henderson, Rogers, Tatel,** Griffith, Kavanaugh, Srinivasan, Millett, Pillard, Wilkins** and Katsas*. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Chief Judge Garland and Circuit Judge Katsas did not participate in this matter) (A statement by Circuit Judge Tatel, joined by Circuit Judge Millett, concurring in the order granting further abeyance, is attached) (A statement by Circuit Judge Wilkins, joined by Circuit Judge Millett, is attached.) [Entered: 06/26/2018 11:11 AM]
June 12, 2018 AMENDED STATEMENT [1735657] with Disclosure Listing filed by Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386 [Service Date: 06/12/2018 ] [15-1386, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Gidiere, Philip) [Entered: 06/12/2018 05:50 PM]
June 1, 2018 REPORT [1733943] filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 abeyance status is awaiting decision of agency [Service Date: 06/01/2018 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 06/01/2018 02:09 PM]
May 9, 2018 JOINT NOTICE [1730160] Opposing Request for Further Abeyance of Litigation As Requested in EPA's May 2, 2018 Status Report filed by American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Ohio Environmental Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363 [Service Date: 05/09/2018 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 05/09/2018 03:01 PM]
May 9, 2018 JOINT NOTICE [1730134] Opposing EPA's Request for Additional Abeyance of Litigation Until Completion of Rulemaking as Set Forth in May 2, 2018 Status Report filed by Broward County, Florida, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington in 15-1363 [Service Date: 05/09/2018 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 05/09/2018 01:16 PM]
May 2, 2018 REPORT [1729161] filed by EPA, Regina A. McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, EPA, Gina McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, EPA, Catherine McCabe and E. Scott Pruitt in 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 abeyance status is awaiting decision of agency [Service Date: 05/02/2018 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Kolman, Chloe) [Entered: 05/02/2018 02:43 PM]
April 26, 2018 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1728387] filed by Gerald T. Karr and co-counsel Daniel I. Rottenberg on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent State of Illinois in 15-1363, Movant-Intervenor for Respondent State of Illinois in 17-1014. [15-1363, 17-1014] (Rottenberg, Daniel) [Entered: 04/26/2018 05:18 PM]
April 2, 2018 REPORT [1724762] filed by EPA, Regina A. McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, EPA, Gina McCarthy and E. Scott Pruitt in 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, EPA and Catherine McCabe in 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 abeyance status is awaiting decision of agency [Service Date: 04/02/2018 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Kolman, Chloe) [Entered: 04/02/2018 04:23 PM]
March 5, 2018 NOTICE [1720596] to withdraw attorney filed by State of West Virginia in 15-1363, 17-1022 [Service Date: 03/05/2018 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Martin, Paul) [Entered: 03/05/2018 01:12 PM]
March 5, 2018 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1720553] filed by Paul Anthony Martin, Chief Deputy Attorney General on behalf of Petitioner State of West Virginia in 15-1363, 17-1022. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Martin, Paul) [Entered: 03/05/2018 11:01 AM]
March 1, 2018 PER CURIAM ORDER, En Banc, [1720228] filed It is ORDERED, on the courts own motion, that these consolidated cases remain in abeyance for 60 days from the date of this order. EPA is directed to continue to file status reports at 30-day intervals beginning 30 days from the date of this order. Before Judges: Garland*, Henderson, Rogers, Tatel, Griffith, Kavanaugh, Srinivasan, Millett, Pillard, Wilkins, and Katsas*. * Chief Judge Garland and Circuit Judge Katsas did not participate in this matter. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] [Entered: 03/01/2018 01:34 PM]
March 1, 2018 CLERK'S ORDER [1720190] filed granting the motion of the State of New Jersey to withdraw as petitioner [ # 1715477-2 ] The Clerk is directed to note the docket accordingly. [15-1363] [Entered: 03/01/2018 11:39 AM]
February 9, 2018 REPORT [1717268] filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 abeyance status is awaiting decision of agency [Service Date: 02/09/2018 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 02/09/2018 11:18 AM]
January 30, 2018 MOTION [1715477] to terminate party filed by State of New Jersey (Service Date: 01/30/2018 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 64 Words. [15-1363] (Kinney, Robert) [Entered: 01/30/2018 01:44 PM]
January 17, 2018 RESPONSE [1713256] to report regarding abeyance status [ # 1712376-2 ] filed by Center for Biological Diversity, American Lung Association, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keeper of the Mountain Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club, The Ohio Environmental Council and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 17-1014 [Service Date: 01/17/2018 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1580 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092]--[Edited 01/18/2018 by SHA-Document Type and Text Modified by Clerk's Office] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 01/17/2018 01:49 PM]
January 17, 2018 JOINT RESPONSE [1713215] to report regarding abeyance status [ # 1712376-2 ] filed by Broward County, Florida, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington in 15-1363 [Service Date: 01/17/2018 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 699 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 01/18/2018 by SHA-Document Type and Text Modified by Clerk's Office] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 01/17/2018 12:08 PM]
January 10, 2018 REPORT [1712376] filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 abeyance status is Awaiting decision of agency [Service Date: 01/10/2018 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 01/10/2018 02:23 PM]
December 11, 2017 REPORT [1708422] filed by EPA, E. Scott Pruitt and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, EPA, E. Scott Pruitt and Gina McCarthy in 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, EPA and Catherine McCabe in 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 abeyance status is awaiting decision of agency [Service Date: 12/11/2017 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Kolman, Chloe) [Entered: 12/11/2017 06:06 PM]
December 11, 2017 NOTICE [1708353] to substitute attorney Jonathan L. Williams substituted by Amit Agarwal filed by State of Florida [Service Date: 12/11/2017 ] [15-1363] (Williams, Jonathan) [Entered: 12/11/2017 03:13 PM]
November 9, 2017 PER CURIAM ORDER, En Banc, [1703889] filed It is ORDERED, on the courts own motion, that these consolidated cases remain in abeyance for 60 days from the date of this order. EPA is directed to continue to file status reports at 30-day intervals beginning 30 days from the date of this order. Before Judges: Garland*, Henderson, Rogers, Tatel, Griffith, Kavanaugh, Srinivasan, Millett, Pillard, and Wilkins. * Chief Judge Garland did not participate in this matter. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] [Entered: 11/09/2017 04:33 PM]
November 2, 2017 NOTICE [1702666] to withdraw attorney filed by Nextera Energy, Inc. in 15-1363 [Service Date: 11/02/2017 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Olson, Jessica) [Entered: 11/02/2017 10:47 AM]
October 27, 2017 NOTICE [1701697] to withdraw attorney Thomas Michael Johnson Jr. who represented State of West Virginia in 17-1022 filed by State of West Virginia in 17-1022 [Service Date: 10/27/2017 ] [17-1022, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Peterson, Erica) [Entered: 10/27/2017 09:03 AM]
October 27, 2017 NOTICE [1701693] to withdraw attorney Thomas Michael Johnson Jr. who represented State of West Virginia in 15-1363 filed by State of West Virginia in 15-1363 [Service Date: 10/27/2017 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Peterson, Erica) [Entered: 10/27/2017 08:56 AM]
October 23, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1700776] filed by Erica N. Peterson on behalf of Petitioner State of West Virginia in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Peterson, Erica) [Entered: 10/23/2017 10:44 AM]
October 17, 2017 RESPONSE [1699441] to report [ # 1698068-2 ] filed by American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363 [Service Date: 10/17/2017 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092]--[Edited 10/17/2017 by AH] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 10/17/2017 10:06 AM]
October 17, 2017 JOINT RESPONSE [1699425] to report [ # 1698068-2 ] filed by Broward County, Florida, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington in 15-1363 [Service Date: 10/17/2017 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092]--[Edited 10/17/2017 by AH] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 10/17/2017 09:51 AM]
October 10, 2017 REPORT [1698068] filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1464, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1472, 15-1488, 15-1470, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1014, EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 17-1015, EPA and Catherine McCabe in 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 abeyance status is awaiting final decision of agency [Service Date: 10/10/2017 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Kolman, Chloe) [Entered: 10/10/2017 05:36 PM]
October 5, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1697038] filed by Samuel R. Flynn on behalf of Petitioner Commonwealth of Kentucky. [15-1363] (Flynn, Samuel) [Entered: 10/05/2017 09:13 AM]
September 7, 2017 REPORT [1691900] filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1464, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1472, 15-1488, 15-1470, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1014, EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 17-1015, EPA and Catherine McCabe in 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 abeyance status is awaiting decision of agency [Service Date: 09/01/2017 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Kolman, Chloe) [Entered: 09/07/2017 02:32 PM]
August 25, 2017 NOTICE [1690305] to withdraw attorney Leslie Couvillion who represented National Association of Home Builders in 17-1023 filed by National Association of Home Builders in 17-1023 [Service Date: 08/25/2017 ] [17-1023, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Couvillion, Leslie) [Entered: 08/25/2017 06:29 PM]
August 25, 2017 NOTICE [1690295] to withdraw attorney Wendlene M. Lavey who represented Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366 filed by Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366 [Service Date: 08/25/2017 ] [15-1366, 15-1363] (Lavey, Wendlene) [Entered: 08/25/2017 04:34 PM]
August 25, 2017 NOTICE [1690306] to withdraw attorney Leslie Couvillion who represented Entergy Corporation in 17-1037 filed by Entergy Corporation in 17-1037 [Service Date: 08/25/2017 ] [17-1037, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Couvillion, Leslie) [Entered: 08/25/2017 06:32 PM]
August 25, 2017 NOTICE [1690297] to withdraw attorney Wendlene M. Lavey who represented Murray Energy Corporation in 17-1015 filed by Murray Energy Corporation in 17-1015 [Service Date: 08/25/2017 ] [17-1015, 17-1014] (Lavey, Wendlene) [Entered: 08/25/2017 04:44 PM]
August 25, 2017 NOTICE [1690308] to withdraw attorney Leslie Couvillion who represented Westar Energy, Inc. in 17-1062 filed by Westar Energy, Inc. in 17-1062 [Service Date: 08/25/2017 ] [17-1062, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Couvillion, Leslie) [Entered: 08/25/2017 06:35 PM]
August 25, 2017 NOTICE [1690309] to withdraw attorney Leslie Couvillion who represented NorthWestern Corporation in 17-1081 filed by NorthWestern Corporation in 17-1081 [Service Date: 08/25/2017 ] [17-1081, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Couvillion, Leslie) [Entered: 08/25/2017 06:37 PM]
August 17, 2017 NOTICE [1689146] to withdraw attorney Elbert Lin who represented State of West Virginia in 15-1363 filed by State of West Virginia in 15-1363 [Service Date: 08/17/2017 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 08/17/2017 10:16 AM]
August 17, 2017 NOTICE [1689154] to withdraw attorney filed by State of West Virginia in 17-1022 [Service Date: 08/17/2017 ] [17-1022, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 08/17/2017 10:31 AM]
August 15, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1688846] filed by Thomas M. Johnson, Jr. on behalf of Petitioner State of West Virginia in 17-1022. [17-1022, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Johnson, Thomas) [Entered: 08/15/2017 02:14 PM]
August 15, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1688840] filed by Thomas M. Johnson, Jr. on behalf of Petitioner State of West Virginia in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Johnson, Thomas) [Entered: 08/15/2017 01:59 PM]
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order PER CURIAM ORDER, En Banc, [1687838] filed it is ORDERED, on the courts own motion, that these consolidated cases remain in abeyance for 60 days from the date of this order. EPA is directed to continue to file status reports at 30-day intervals beginning 30 days from the date of this order. Before Judges: Garland*, Henderson, Rogers, Tatel**, Brown, Griffith, Kavanaugh, Srinivasan, Millett**, Pillard, and Wilkins. * Chief Judge Garland did not participate in this matter. A statement by Circuit Judges Tatel and Millett, concurring in granting further abeyance is attached. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] [Entered: 08/08/2017 03:40 PM]
August 3, 2017 NOTICE [1687202] to withdraw attorney Elizabeth Anne Morrisseau who represented State of Wyoming in 15-1363 filed by State of Wyoming in 15-1363 [Service Date: 08/03/2017 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Morrisseau, Elizabeth) [Entered: 08/03/2017 02:47 PM]
August 3, 2017 NOTICE [1687195] Response to Respondent's Status Report filed by American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363 [Service Date: 08/03/2017 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 08/03/2017 02:15 PM]
July 31, 2017 REPORT [1686504] filed abeyance status : awaiting decision of agency filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1464, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1472, 15-1488, 15-1470, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1014, EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 17-1015, EPA and Catherine McCabe in 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 [Service Date: 07/31/2017 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Kolman, Chloe) [Entered: 07/31/2017 11:21 AM]
July 27, 2017 NOTICE [1686174] to withdraw attorney Robert David Cheren who represented Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366 filed by Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366 [Service Date: 07/27/2017 ] [15-1366, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Lavey, Wendlene) [Entered: 07/27/2017 02:52 PM]
July 27, 2017 NOTICE [1686184] to withdraw attorney Robert David Cheren who represented Murray Energy Corporation in 17-1015 filed by Murray Energy Corporation in 17-1015 [Service Date: 07/27/2017 ] [17-1015, 17-1014, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Lavey, Wendlene) [Entered: 07/27/2017 03:14 PM]
July 10, 2017 NOTICE [1683266] to withdraw attorney Sheldon Gilbert who represented Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 15-1382 and Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute in 17-1014 filed by American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382, American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Foundry Society, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 17-1014 [Service Date: 07/10/2017 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Keisler, Peter) [Entered: 07/10/2017 02:35 PM]
July 7, 2017 NOTICE [1683092] to withdraw attorney Joel Franklin Visser who represented Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 15-1382 and Portland Cement Association, National Oilseed Processors Association, National Lime Association, Lignite Energy Council, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Brick Industry Association, American Wood Council, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Foundry Society and American Chemistry Council in 17-1014 filed by American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382, American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Foundry Society, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 17-1014 [Service Date: 07/07/2017 ] [15-1382, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Keisler, Peter) [Entered: 07/07/2017 07:58 PM]
June 30, 2017 NOTICE [1682290] to withdraw attorney Geoffrey K. Barnes filed by Murray Energy Corporation (Service Date: 06/29/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 50. [15-1366] (Barnes, Geoffrey) [Entered: 06/30/2017 04:05 PM]
June 30, 2017 NOTICE [1682298]filed to withdraw attorney Geoffrey K. Barnes (Response to Motion served by mail due on 07/10/2017) filed by Murray Energy Corporation (Service Date: 06/29/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 58. [17-1015]--[Edited 07/06/2017 by LMF] (Barnes, Geoffrey) [Entered: 06/30/2017 04:20 PM]
June 29, 2017 NOTICE [1682040] to withdraw attorney Steven Beuregard Jones who represented State of Louisiana in 15-1363 filed by State of Louisiana [Service Date: 06/29/2017 ] [15-1363] (Vorhoff, Harry) [Entered: 06/29/2017 04:19 PM]
June 29, 2017 REPORT [1681936] filed abeyance status : awaiting completion of EPA review filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1464, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1472, 15-1488, 15-1470, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1014, EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 17-1015, EPA and Catherine McCabe in 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092 [Service Date: 06/29/2017 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Kolman, Chloe) [Entered: 06/29/2017 12:42 PM]
June 27, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1681555] filed by Elizabeth B. Murrill and co-counsel Harry J. Vorhoff on behalf of Petitioner State of Louisiana. [15-1363] (Vorhoff, Harry) [Entered: 06/27/2017 02:30 PM]
June 21, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1680621] filed by David S. Frankel on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent State of New York in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Frankel, David) [Entered: 06/21/2017 10:42 AM]
June 16, 2017 NOTICE [1680025] Response to EPA's Supplemental Status Report filed by American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363 [Service Date: 06/16/2017 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 06/16/2017 12:48 PM]
June 15, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1679895] filed by Steven M. Sullivan, Assistant Attorney General on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent State of Maryland in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Sullivan, Steven) [Entered: 06/15/2017 06:25 PM]
June 15, 2017 NOTICE [1679896] to withdraw attorney Thiruvendran Vignarajah who represented State of Maryland in 15-1363 filed by State of Maryland in 17-1015 [Service Date: 06/15/2017 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Sullivan, Steven) [Entered: 06/15/2017 06:41 PM]
June 12, 2017 REPORT [1679311] filed abeyance status : Awaiting completion of EPA review filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1464, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1472, 15-1488, 15-1470 [Service Date: 06/12/2017 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 06/12/2017 05:45 PM]
May 30, 2017 REPORT [1677307] filed abeyance status : Awaiting completion of EPA review filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1464, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1472, 15-1488, 15-1470 [Service Date: 05/30/2017 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 05/30/2017 04:46 PM]
May 15, 2017 INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF [1675194] filed by Advanced Energy Economy, American Wind Energy Association and Solar Energy Industries Association in 15-1363 [Service Date: 05/15/2017 ] Length of Brief: 759 Words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Robbins, Lawrence) [Entered: 05/15/2017 01:09 PM]
May 15, 2017 NOTICE [1675181] to withdraw attorney Paul Joseph Ray who represented Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 15-1382 filed by American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382 [Service Date: 05/15/2017 ] [15-1382, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Keisler, Peter) [Entered: 05/15/2017 12:38 PM]
May 15, 2017 INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF [1675202] filed by American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363 [Service Date: 05/15/2017 ] Length of Brief: 3887. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 05/15/2017 01:41 PM]
May 15, 2017 INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF [1675185] filed by Calpine Corporation, City of Austin, City of Los Angeles Department of Water and Power, City of Seattle, National Grid Generation, LLC, New York Power Authority, Pacific Gas and Electric Company, Sacramento Municipal Utility District and Southern California Edison Company in 15-1363 [Service Date: 05/15/2017 ] Length of Brief: 1,176 Words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 05/15/2017 12:44 PM]
May 15, 2017 RESPONDENT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF [1675243] filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1464, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1472, 15-1488, 15-1470 [Service Date: 05/15/2017 ] Length of Brief: 1,577. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 05/15/2017 03:09 PM]
May 15, 2017 JOINT PETITIONER SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF [1675250] filed by Dixon Bros., Inc., Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition, Joy Global Inc., Nelson Brothers, Inc., Norfolk Southern Corporation, Peabody Energy Corporation, Wesco International, Inc. and Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 15-1363, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 15-1365, Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366, National Mining Association in 15-1367, American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372, Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374, United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375, Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc., Western Farmers Electric Cooperative and Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1376, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382, Association of American Railroads in 15-1383, National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379, State of North Dakota in 15-1380, Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393, Energy & Environment Legal Institute in 15-1398, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality, Mississippi Public Service Commission and State of Mississippi in 15-1409, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 15-1410, Entergy Corporation in 15-1413, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418, West Virginia Coal Association in 15-1422, Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC and Newmont USA Limited in 15-1432, Kansas City Board of Public Utilities in 15-1442, Coteau Properties Company, Coyote Creek Mining Company, Falkirk Mining Company, Mississippi Lignite Mining Company, NODAK Energy Services, LLC, North American Coal Royalty Company, Otter Creek Mining Company, LLC, Sabine Mining Company and The North American Coal Corporation in 15-1451, Indiana Utility Group in 15-1459, Energy-Intensive Manufacturers' Working Group on Greenhouse Gas Regulation in 15-1477, Louisiana Public Service Commission in 15-1464, Minnesota Power in 15-1474, Denbury Onshore, LLC in 15-1475, Prairie State Generating Company LLC in 15-1472, Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions, Klaus J. Christoph, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Samuel R. Damewood, Caterine C. Dellin, Independence Institute, Joseph W. Luquire, Lisa R. Markham, Patrick T. Peterson, Rio Grande Foundation, Kristi Rosenquist and Sutherland Institute in 15-1488, GenOn Mid-Atlantic, LLC, Indian River Power LLC, Louisiana Generating LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Chalk Point LLC, NRG Power Midwest LP, NRG Rema LLC, NRG Texas Power LLC, NRG Wholesale Generation LP and Vienna Power LLC in 15-1470 [Service Date: 05/15/2017 ] Length of Brief: 2,306 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 05/15/2017 03:30 PM]
May 15, 2017 INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF [1675252] filed by Broward County, Florida, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington in 15-1363 [Service Date: 05/15/2017 ] Length of Brief: 3,648. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Costello, Morgan) [Entered: 05/15/2017 03:45 PM]
April 28, 2017 PER CURIAM ORDER, En Banc, [1673071] filed that EPA's motion to hold the cases in abeyance be granted to the extent that these consolidated cases be held in abeyance for 60 days from the date of this order. EPA is directed to file status reports at 30-day intervals beginning 30 days from the date of this order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties file supplemental briefs addressing whether these consolidated cases should be remanded to the agency rather than held in abeyance. The supplemental briefs are due at 4:00 p.m. on May 15, 2017, and may not exceed 3,900 words if produced using a computer or 15 pages if typewritten or handwritten. To the extent possible, the parties are to file jointly. The court looks with extreme disfavor upon duplicative submissions. The parties are to hand-deliver 30 paper copies of their submission to the court by the time and date due. It is FURTHER ORDERED that consideration of the motions to sever and consolidate be deferred pending further order of the court. Before Judges: Garland,* Henderson, Rogers, Tatel, Brown, Griffith, Kavanaugh, Srinivasan, Millett, Pillard and Wilkins. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Chief Judge Garland did not participate in this matter) [Entered: 04/28/2017 10:32 AM]
April 27, 2017 RESPONSE [1672993] to motion to sever issue [ # 1671347-2 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1671347-3 ], motion to sever issue [ # 1671332-2 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1671332-3 ] filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 15-1363, 15-1393, EPA in 15-1475 [Service Date: 04/27/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 289 words. [15-1363, 15-1393, 15-1475] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 04/27/2017 04:43 PM]
April 27, 2017 RESPONSE [1672992] to motion to sever issue [ # 1671347-2 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1671347-3 ], motion to sever issue [ # 1671332-2 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1671332-3 ] filed by EPA in 17-1014, 17-1091, 17-1092 [Service Date: 04/27/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 289 words. [17-1014, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 04/27/2017 04:41 PM]
April 24, 2017 REPLY IN SUPPORT [1672418] to motion to sever issue [ # 1670187-2 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1670187-3 ] filed by State of North Dakota in 17-1014, 15-1380 [Service Date: 04/24/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1354 words. [17-1014, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Seby, Paul) [Entered: 04/24/2017 04:32 PM]
April 24, 2017 CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1672422] for response [ # 1672418-2 ] filed by State of North Dakota in 17-1014, 15-1380. [17-1014, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Seby, Paul) [Entered: 04/24/2017 04:57 PM]
April 20, 2017 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1671985] filed by Denbury Onshore, LLC [Service Date: 04/20/2017 ] [17-1092] (Stetson, Catherine) [Entered: 04/20/2017 02:05 PM]
April 20, 2017 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1671983] filed by Denbury Onshore, LLC [Service Date: 04/20/2017 ] [17-1092] (Stetson, Catherine) [Entered: 04/20/2017 02:04 PM]
April 18, 2017 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1671604] to motion to sever issue [ # 1671347-2 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1671347-3 ], motion to sever issue [ # 1671332-2 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1671332-3 ] filed by American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keeper of the Mountain Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club, The Ohio Environmental Council and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy [Service Date: 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 182 words. [17-1014] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 04/18/2017 02:45 PM]
April 18, 2017 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1671599] to motion to sever issue [ # 1671347-2 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1671347-3 ], motion to sever issue [ # 1671332-2 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1671332-3 ] filed by American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363 [Service Date: 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 182 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 04/18/2017 02:43 PM]
April 17, 2017 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1671309] to motion to sever issue [ # 1670187-2 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1670187-3 ] filed by Broward County, Florida, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington [Service Date: 04/17/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 394. [17-1014] (Costello, Morgan) [Entered: 04/17/2017 02:01 PM]
April 17, 2017 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1671307] to motion to sever issue [ # 1670187-2 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1670187-3 ] filed by Broward County, Florida, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington [Service Date: 04/17/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 394. [15-1363] (Costello, Morgan) [Entered: 04/17/2017 01:56 PM]
April 17, 2017 MOTION [1671332] to sever issue (Response to Motion served by mail due on 04/27/2017), to consolidate cases (Response to Motion served by mail due on 04/27/2017) filed by Denbury Onshore, LLC in 17-1092 (Service Date: 04/17/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 764. [17-1092, 15-1363, 17-1014] (Stetson, Catherine) [Entered: 04/17/2017 02:48 PM]
April 17, 2017 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1671336] filed by Basin Electric Power Cooperative in 17-1091 [Service Date: 04/17/2017 ] [17-1091, 17-1014] (Gomez, Christina) [Entered: 04/17/2017 03:02 PM]
April 17, 2017 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1671334] filed by Basin Electric Power Cooperative [Service Date: 04/17/2017 ] [17-1091] (Gomez, Christina) [Entered: 04/17/2017 02:57 PM]
April 17, 2017 MOTION [1671347] to sever issue (Response to Motion served by mail due on 04/27/2017), to consolidate cases (Response to Motion served by mail due on 04/27/2017) filed by Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393 (Service Date: 04/17/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 694 words. [15-1393, 15-1363, 17-1014] (Gomez, Christina) [Entered: 04/17/2017 03:15 PM]
April 14, 2017 REPLY [1671082] filed by National Association of Home Builders in 17-1023 to response [ # 1670438-2 ], [ # 1670437-2 ], [ # 1670227-2 ], [ # 1670225-2 ], [ # 1670118-2 ], [ # 1670114-2 ] [Service Date: 04/14/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1,247 words.. [17-1023, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Couvillion, Leslie) [Entered: 04/14/2017 09:28 AM]
April 14, 2017 REPLY [1671083] filed by National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379 to response [ # 1670438-2 ], [ # 1670437-2 ], [ # 1670227-2 ], [ # 1670225-2 ], [ # 1670118-2 ], [ # 1670114-2 ] [Service Date: 04/14/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1,247 words.. [15-1379, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Couvillion, Leslie) [Entered: 04/14/2017 09:30 AM]
April 14, 2017 JOINT REPLY [1671196] filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 15-1363, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality and Mississippi Public Service Commission in 15-1409, State of Alabama, State of Arizona Corporation Commission, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality, State of Mississippi Public Service Commission, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 17-1022 to response [ # 1670227-2 ], [ # 1670225-2 ], [ # 1670118-2 ], [ # 1670114-2 ] [Service Date: 04/14/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1,251 words. [17-1014, 15-1363, 15-1409, 17-1022] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 04/14/2017 04:32 PM]
April 13, 2017 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1670904] filed by NorthWestern Corporation in 17-1081 [Service Date: 04/13/2017 ] [17-1081, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Couvillion, Leslie) [Entered: 04/13/2017 10:43 AM]
April 13, 2017 JOINT REPLY [1671066] filed by Entergy Corporation in 17-1037, Westar Energy, Inc. in 17-1062, NorthWestern Corporation in 17-1081 to response [ # 1670437-2 ], [ # 1670227-2 ], [ # 1670118-2 ], [ # 1670225-2 ], [ # 1670114-2 ], [ # 1670438-2 ] [Service Date: 04/13/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1,162 words. [17-1014, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Couvillion, Leslie) [Entered: 04/13/2017 05:39 PM]
April 13, 2017 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1670903] filed by NorthWestern Corporation in 17-1081 [Service Date: 04/13/2017 ] [17-1081, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Couvillion, Leslie) [Entered: 04/13/2017 10:41 AM]
April 13, 2017 JOINT REPLY [1671067] filed by Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, Entergy Corporation in 15-1413 to response [ # 1670437-2 ], [ # 1670438-2 ], [ # 1670227-2 ], [ # 1670225-2 ], [ # 1670118-2 ], [ # 1670114-2 ] [Service Date: 04/13/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1,162 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Couvillion, Leslie) [Entered: 04/13/2017 05:46 PM]
April 12, 2017 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1670850] for motion to sever issue [ # 1670187-2 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1670187-3 ] filed by State of North Dakota in 17-1014. [17-1014, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Stouck, Jerry) [Entered: 04/12/2017 05:14 PM]
April 12, 2017 REPLY [1670856] filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1464, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1472, 15-1488, 15-1470 to response [ # 1669699-2 ], [ # 1669770-2 ], [ # 1669885-2 ], [ # 1669984-2 ], [ # 1669985-2 ], [ # 1669991-2 ] [Service Date: 04/12/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2134 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 04/12/2017 07:39 PM]
April 12, 2017 REPLY [1670858] filed by EPA to response [ # 1669771-2 ] [Service Date: 04/12/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1,451 words. [17-1014] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 04/12/2017 08:42 PM]
April 11, 2017 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1670623] to motion to sever issue [ # 1670187-2 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1670187-3 ] filed by American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363 [Service Date: 04/11/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 360. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 04/11/2017 05:27 PM]
April 11, 2017 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1670624] to motion to sever issue [ # 1670187-2 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1670187-3 ] filed by American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keeper of the Mountain Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club, The Ohio Environmental Council and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy [Service Date: 04/11/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 360 words. [17-1014] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 04/11/2017 05:30 PM]
April 10, 2017 JOINT RESPONSE IN SUPPORT [1670432] to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1668936-2 ] filed by American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Foundry Society, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 17-1014, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 17-1018, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 17-1019, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association in 17-1020, Murray Energy Corporation in 17-1015, State of Alabama, State of Arizona Corporation Commission, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality, State of Mississippi Public Service Commission, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 17-1022, National Association of Home Builders in 17-1023, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 17-1031, Peabody Energy Corporation in 17-1035, Entergy Corporation in 17-1037, National Mining Association in 17-1061, Westar Energy, Inc. in 17-1062, Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC and Newmont USA Limited in 17-1063, East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc. and Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc. in 17-1068, NorthWestern Corporation in 17-1081, Basin Electric Power Cooperative in 17-1091, Denbury Onshore, LLC in 17-1092 [Service Date: 04/10/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 662 Words. [17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Szymanski, Tauna) [Entered: 04/10/2017 05:21 PM]
April 10, 2017 RESPONSE [1670437] to motion to sever issue [ # 1670187-2 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1670187-3 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1668952-2 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1668929-2 ], motion to sever issue [ # 1668929-3 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1668921-2 ] filed by EPA [Service Date: 04/10/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 421. [17-1014] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 04/10/2017 08:47 PM]
April 10, 2017 RESPONSE [1670438] to motion to sever issue [ # 1670187-2 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1670187-3 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1668960-2 ], motion to sever issue [ # 1668960-3 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1668932-2 ], motion to sever issue [ # 1668932-3 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1668937-2 ], motion to sever issue [ # 1668937-3 ] filed by EPA in 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1464, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1472, 15-1488, 15-1470 [Service Date: 04/10/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 421. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 04/10/2017 09:05 PM]
April 7, 2017 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1670114] to motion to consolidate [ # 1668937-2 ], motion to sever issue [ # 1668937-3 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1668932-2 ], motion to sever issue [ # 1668932-3 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1668960-2 ], motion to sever issue [ # 1668960-3 ] filed by Broward County, Florida, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington [Service Date: 04/07/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1,570. [15-1363] (Costello, Morgan) [Entered: 04/07/2017 01:36 PM]
April 7, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1670068] filed by Howard M. Crystal on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Center for Biological Diversity in 15-1363. [15-1363, 17-1014] (Crystal, Howard) [Entered: 04/07/2017 11:55 AM]
April 7, 2017 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1670118] to motion to consolidate [ # 1668952-2 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1668929-2 ], motion to sever issue [ # 1668929-3 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1668921-2 ] filed by Broward County, Florida, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington [Service Date: 04/07/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1,570. [17-1014] (Costello, Morgan) [Entered: 04/07/2017 01:40 PM]
April 7, 2017 MOTION [1670187] to sever issue (Response to Motion served by mail due on 04/17/2017), to consolidate cases (Response to Motion served by mail due on 04/17/2017) filed by State of North Dakota in 17-1014 (Service Date: 04/07/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 2,113 words. [17-1014, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Seby, Paul) [Entered: 04/07/2017 04:15 PM]
April 7, 2017 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1670227] to motion to consolidate [ # 1668952-2 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1668929-2 ], motion to sever issue [ # 1668929-3 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1668921-2 ] filed by American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keeper of the Mountain Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club, The Ohio Environmental Council and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy [Service Date: 04/07/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2201. [17-1014] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 04/07/2017 07:51 PM]
April 7, 2017 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1670225] to motion to consolidate [ # 1668960-2 ], motion to sever issue [ # 1668960-3 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1668937-2 ], motion to sever issue [ # 1668937-3 ], motion to consolidate [ # 1668921-2 ] filed by American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363 [Service Date: 04/07/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2201 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 04/07/2017 07:47 PM]
April 6, 2017 SUPPLEMENT [1669789] to response [ # 1669770-2 ] filed by American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363 [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 04/06/2017 09:37 AM]
April 6, 2017 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1669885] to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1668274-2 ] filed by Advanced Energy Economy in 15-1363 [Service Date: 04/05/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 732 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Robbins, Lawrence) [Entered: 04/06/2017 01:42 PM]
April 6, 2017 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT [1669984] to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1668274-2 ] filed by Dixon Bros., Inc., Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition, Joy Global Inc., Nelson Brothers, Inc., Norfolk Southern Corporation, Peabody Energy Corporation, Wesco International, Inc. and Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of Ohio, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 15-1363, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 15-1365, Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366, National Mining Association in 15-1367, American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372, Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374, United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375, Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc., Western Farmers Electric Cooperative and Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1376, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382, Association of American Railroads in 15-1383, National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379, State of North Dakota in 15-1380, Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393, Energy & Environment Legal Institute in 15-1398, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality, Mississippi Public Service Commission and State of Mississippi in 15-1409, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 15-1410, Entergy Corporation in 15-1413, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418, West Virginia Coal Association in 15-1422, Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC and Newmont USA Limited in 15-1432, Kansas City Board of Public Utilities in 15-1442, Coteau Properties Company, Coyote Creek Mining Company, Falkirk Mining Company, Mississippi Lignite Mining Company, NODAK Energy Services, LLC, North American Coal Royalty Company, Otter Creek Mining Company, LLC and Sabine Mining Company in 15-1451, Indiana Utility Group in 15-1459, Energy-Intensive Manufacturers' Working Group on Greenhouse Gas Regulation in 15-1477, Louisiana Public Service Commission in 15-1464, Minnesota Power in 15-1474, Denbury Onshore, LLC in 15-1475, Prairie State Generating Company LLC in 15-1472, Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions, Klaus J. Christoph, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Samuel R. Damewood, Caterine C. Dellin, Independence Institute, Joseph W. Luquire, Lisa R. Markham, Patrick T. Peterson, Rio Grande Foundation, Kristi Rosenquist and Sutherland Institute in 15-1488, GenOn Mid-Atlantic, LLC, Indian River Power LLC, Louisiana Generating LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Chalk Point LLC, NRG Power Midwest LP, NRG Rema LLC, NRG Texas Power LLC, NRG Wholesale Generation LP and Vienna Power LLC in 15-1470, Utility Air Regulatory Group in 17-1018, 17-1019, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association in 17-1020, American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Foundry Society, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association, Portland Cement Association and State of North Dakota in 17-1014, 17-1015, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of Ohio, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, Peabody Energy Corporation in 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc. and Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc. in 17-1068, 17-1081, Basin Electric Power Cooperative in 17-1091, 17-1092 [Service Date: 04/06/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 10 Pages. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Keisler, Peter) [Entered: 04/06/2017 05:30 PM]
April 6, 2017 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1669985] to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1668274-2 ] filed by American Wind Energy Association and Solar Energy Industries Association in 15-1363 [Service Date: 04/06/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1233 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Grace, Eugene) [Entered: 04/06/2017 06:03 PM]
April 6, 2017 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1669991] to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1668936-2 ] filed by Calpine Corporation, City of Austin, City of Los Angeles Department of Water and Power, City of Seattle, National Grid Generation, LLC, New York Power Authority, Pacific Gas and Electric Company, Sacramento Municipal Utility District and Southern California Edison Company in 15-1363 [Service Date: 04/06/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1,465 Words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 04/06/2017 06:45 PM]
April 5, 2017 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1669699] to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1668274-2 ] filed by Broward County, Florida, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington in 15-1363, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota and State of New Mexico in 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1022, 17-1023 [Service Date: 04/05/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 4,447 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Lusignan, Brian) [Entered: 04/05/2017 03:14 PM]
April 5, 2017 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1669644] filed by East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc. and Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc. in 17-1068 [Service Date: 04/05/2017 ] [17-1068, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Belcher, Joshua) [Entered: 04/05/2017 01:13 PM]
April 5, 2017 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1669643] filed by East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc. and Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc. in 17-1068 [Service Date: 04/05/2017 ] [17-1068, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Belcher, Joshua) [Entered: 04/05/2017 01:11 PM]
April 5, 2017 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1669759] to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1668274-2 ] filed by American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council and Sierra Club in 15-1363 [Service Date: 04/05/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 5151 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 04/05/2017 05:15 PM]
April 5, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1669766] filed by on behalf of Petitioner State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality. [15-1363] (Goudeau, Charlotte) [Entered: 04/05/2017 05:38 PM]
April 5, 2017 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1669771] to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1668936-2 ] filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keeper of the Mountain Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club, The Ohio Environmental Council and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy [Service Date: 04/05/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1219 words. [17-1014] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 04/05/2017 07:09 PM]
April 5, 2017 CORRECTED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1669770] to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1668274-2 ] filed by American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Ohio Environmental Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363, American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keeper of the Mountain Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition and Sierra Club in 17-1014 [Service Date: 04/05/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 5148 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068, 17-1081, 17-1091, 17-1092] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 04/05/2017 07:02 PM]
March 31, 2017 MOTION [1668937] to sever and consolidate cases (Response to Motion served by mail due on 04/10/2017) filed by National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379 (Service Date: 03/31/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 691 words. [15-1379, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[RELIEF ADDED--Edited 04/03/2017 by LMC] (Couvillion, Leslie) [Entered: 03/31/2017 04:51 PM]
March 31, 2017 JOINT MOTION [1668960] to sever and consolidate cases (Response to Motion served by mail due on 04/10/2017) filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 15-1363, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality and Mississippi Public Service Commission in 15-1409 (Service Date: 03/31/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 978 words. [15-1363, 15-1409]--[RELIEF ADDED--Edited 04/03/2017 by LMC] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 03/31/2017 06:09 PM]
March 31, 2017 JOINT MOTION [1668932] to consolidate and sever cases filed by Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, Entergy Corporation in 15-1413 (Service Date: 03/31/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 760 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 04/03/2017 by AH] (Couvillion, Leslie) [Entered: 03/31/2017 04:43 PM]
March 31, 2017 NOTICE [1668979] to withdraw attorney Bethany Aryn Davis Noll who represented State of New York in 15-1363 filed by State of New York [Service Date: 03/31/2017 ] [15-1363] (Davis Noll, Bethany) [Entered: 03/31/2017 11:28 PM]
March 28, 2017 MOTION [1668274] to hold case in abeyance (Response to Motion served by mail due on 04/07/2017) filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1464, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1472, 15-1488, 15-1470 (Service Date: 03/28/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 1950 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 03/28/2017 09:30 PM]
March 23, 2017 NOTICE [1667519] to withdraw attorney Roger Romulus Martella Jr. who represented Portland Cement Association, National Oilseed Processors Association, National Lime Association, National Federation of Independent Business, National Association of Manufacturers, Lignite Energy Council, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Brick Industry Association, American Wood Council, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Foundry Society, American Forest & Paper Association, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute and American Chemistry Council in 15-1382 filed by American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382 [Service Date: 03/23/2017 ] [15-1382, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Keisler, Peter) [Entered: 03/23/2017 03:19 PM]
March 22, 2017 NOTICE [1667319] to withdraw attorney Jeffrey Heath Wood who represented Members of Congress in 15-1363 filed by Members of Congress in 15-1363 [Service Date: 03/22/2017 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Wood, Jeffrey) [Entered: 03/22/2017 02:52 PM]
March 20, 2017 JOINT REPLY [1666891] filed by American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418 to response [ # 1665820-2 ], [ # 1665788-2 ], [ # 1665695-2 ], [ # 1664771-2 ], [ # 1664526-2 ], [ # 1663907-2 ] [Service Date: 03/20/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2,059 words. [15-1363, 15-1370, 15-1418] (Wood, Allison) [Entered: 03/20/2017 07:54 PM]
March 13, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1665657] filed by Richard Umoff on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Solar Energy Industries Association in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Umoff, Richard) [Entered: 03/13/2017 12:06 PM]
March 13, 2017 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1665695] to motion to consolidate [ # 1663046-2 ] filed by Calpine Corporation, City of Austin, City of Los Angeles Department of Water and Power, City of Seattle, National Grid Generation, LLC, New York Power Authority, Pacific Gas and Electric Company, Sacramento Municipal Utility District and Southern California Edison Company in 15-1363 [Service Date: 03/13/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 494 Words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 03/13/2017 01:04 PM]
March 13, 2017 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1665788] to motion to consolidate [ # 1663046-2 ] filed by Broward County, Florida, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington in 15-1363 [Service Date: 03/13/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1,102 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Lusignan, Brian) [Entered: 03/13/2017 04:18 PM]
March 13, 2017 RESPONSE [1665820] to motion to consolidate [ # 1663046-2 ] filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1464, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1472, 15-1488, 15-1470 [Service Date: 03/13/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 209 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Kolman, Chloe) [Entered: 03/13/2017 07:29 PM]
March 8, 2017 PER CURIAM ORDER, En Banc, [1665076] filed granting respondents' motion to extend time to respond to motion to sever and consolidate [ # 1663751-2 ], granting the motion of petitioners UARG, et al., to extend time to file a reply [ # 1664274-2 ]. Any response is now due by March 13, 2017, and any reply is now due by March 20, 2017. Before Judges: Garland,* Henderson, Rogers, Tatel, Brown, Griffith, Kavanaugh, Srinivasan, Millett, Pillard and Wilkins. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488, 17-1014, 17-1015, 17-1018, 17-1019, 17-1020, 17-1022, 17-1023, 17-1031, 17-1035, 17-1037, 17-1061, 17-1062, 17-1063, 17-1068] (Chief Judge Garland did not participate in this matter) [Entered: 03/08/2017 06:04 PM]
March 7, 2017 PER CURIAM ORDER, En Banc, [1664748] filed granting motion of petitioner State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality to withdraw as petitioner [ # 1662760-2 ] in 15-1363, The Clerk is directed to note the docket accordingly. Before Judges: Henderson, Rogers, Tatel, Brown, Griffith, Kavanaugh, Srinivasan, Millett, Pillard and Wilkins. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] [Entered: 03/07/2017 12:22 PM]
March 7, 2017 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1664771] to motion to consolidate [ # 1663046-2 ] filed by American Wind Energy Association and Solar Energy Industries Association [Service Date: 03/07/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 486. [15-1363] (Grace, Eugene) [Entered: 03/07/2017 01:44 PM]
March 6, 2017 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1664526] to motion to consolidate [ # 1663046-2 ] filed by Advanced Energy Economy in 15-1363 [Service Date: 03/06/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 229 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Robbins, Lawrence) [Entered: 03/06/2017 02:30 PM]
March 3, 2017 MOTION [1664274] to extend time to file reply to 03/20/2017. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 03/13/2017) filed by American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418 (Service Date: 03/03/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 431 words. [15-1363, 15-1370, 15-1418] (Wood, Allison) [Entered: 03/03/2017 04:01 PM]
March 3, 2017 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1664284] to motion to extend time [ # 1664274-2 ], motion to extend time [ # 1663751-2 ] filed by American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363 [Service Date: 03/03/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 120 words.. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 03/03/2017 04:17 PM]
March 3, 2017 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1664204] for response [ # 1663907-2 ] filed by American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 03/03/2017 12:50 PM]
March 3, 2017 CORRECTED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1664326] to motion to extend time [ # 1664274-2 ], motion to extend time [ # 1663751-2 ] filed by American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363 [Service Date: 03/03/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 120 words.. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 03/03/2017 05:14 PM]
March 2, 2017 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1663907] to motion to consolidate [ # 1663046-2 ] filed by American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363 [Service Date: 03/02/2017 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 2308 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 03/02/2017 02:26 PM]
March 1, 2017 MOTION [1663751] to extend time to file response to 03/13/2017. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 03/13/2017) filed by EPA and E. Scott Pruitt in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1370, 15-1418 (Service Date: 03/01/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 384 Words. [15-1363, 15-1370, 15-1418] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 03/01/2017 07:44 PM]
February 28, 2017 NOTICE [1663452] To Amend Case Caption filed by State of Oklahoma in 15-1364 (Service Date: 02/28/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 76 Words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Eubanks, P.) [Entered: 02/28/2017 04:36 PM]
February 27, 2017 NOTICE [1663127] to substitute attorney Andrew J. Meyers substituted by Mark A. Journey filed by Broward County, Florida in 15-1363 [Service Date: 02/27/2017 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Journey, Mark) [Entered: 02/27/2017 11:37 AM]
February 27, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1663139] filed by Mark A. Journey on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Broward County, Florida in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Journey, Mark) [Entered: 02/27/2017 11:56 AM]
February 24, 2017 JOINT MOTION [1663046] to consolidate cases (Response to Motion served by mail due on 03/06/2017) filed by American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418 (Service Date: 02/24/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 1,756 words. [15-1363, 15-1370, 15-1418] (Wood, Allison) [Entered: 02/24/2017 05:21 PM]
February 24, 2017 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1663048] filed by American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370 [Service Date: 02/24/2017 ] [15-1370, 15-1363] (Wood, Allison) [Entered: 02/24/2017 05:28 PM]
February 24, 2017 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1663049] filed by LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418 [Service Date: 02/24/2017 ] [15-1418, 15-1363] (Murdock, Eric) [Entered: 02/24/2017 05:33 PM]
February 23, 2017 MOTION [1662760] Withdrawal of petitioner from petition (Response to Motion served by mail due on 03/06/2017) filed by State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality (Service Date: 02/23/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 70 Words. [15-1363] (Bernstein, Marc) [Entered: 02/23/2017 03:23 PM]
February 23, 2017 NOTICE [1662772] to withdraw attorney Sam Hayes who represented State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality in 15-1363 filed by State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality [Service Date: 02/23/2017 ] [15-1363] (Bernstein, Marc) [Entered: 02/23/2017 03:54 PM]
February 23, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1662757] filed by Marc Bernstein and co-counsel Amy Bircher, Brenda Menard, and Scott Conklin on behalf of Petitioner State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality. [15-1363] (Bernstein, Marc) [Entered: 02/23/2017 03:13 PM]
February 21, 2017 NOTICE [1662244] to substitute party State of Oklahoma, ex rel. E. Scott Pruitt, in his official capacity as Attorney General of Oklahoma for State of Oklahoma, ex rel. Michael J. Hunter, in his official capacity as Attorney General of Oklahoma filed by State of Oklahoma in 15-1364 (Service Date: 02/21/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 02/21/2017 by SHA - Modified Type of Document] (Eubanks, P.) [Entered: 02/21/2017 02:13 PM]
February 13, 2017 MOTION [1661026] to withdraw attorney Patrick R. Wyrick (Response to Motion served by mail due on 02/23/2017) filed by Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364 (Service Date: 02/13/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 104 Words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Wyrick, Patrick) [Entered: 02/13/2017 04:25 PM]
February 9, 2017 NOTICE [1660491] to withdraw attorney Brian Joseph Murray who represented The North American Coal Corporation, Sabine Mining Company, Otter Creek Mining Company, LLC, North American Coal Royalty Company, NODAK Energy Services, LLC, Mississippi Lignite Mining Company, Falkirk Mining Company, Coyote Creek Mining Company and Coteau Properties Company in 15-1451 filed by Coteau Properties Company, Coyote Creek Mining Company, Falkirk Mining Company, Mississippi Lignite Mining Company, NODAK Energy Services, LLC, North American Coal Royalty Company, Otter Creek Mining Company, LLC, Sabine Mining Company and The North American Coal Corporation [Service Date: 02/09/2017 ] [15-1451] (Fortson, Alina) [Entered: 02/09/2017 06:03 PM]
February 1, 2017 NOTICE [1658892] filed filed by Arizona Corporation Commission [Service Date: 02/01/2017 ] [15-1363] (Miller, Keith) [Entered: 02/01/2017 07:12 PM]
January 30, 2017 CLERK'S ORDER [1658249] filed granting motion to withdraw attorney [ # 1654496-2 ] in 15-1363 John Andrew Hirth who represented State of Missouri in 15-1363 and granting motion to substitute attorney [ # 1655560-2 ] in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Accursio, John) [Entered: 01/30/2017 03:34 PM]
January 30, 2017 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1658145] filed by D. John Sauer on behalf of Petitioner State of Missouri. [15-1363] (Sauer, Dean) [Entered: 01/30/2017 12:26 PM]
January 23, 2017 NOTICE [1656946] filed to withdraw attorney James Van Carson who represented Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366 filed by Murray Energy Corporation [Service Date: 01/23/2017 ] [15-1366] (Carson, James) [Entered: 01/23/2017 05:34 PM]
January 18, 2017 NOTICE [1656543] filed to withdraw attorney Garrison W. Kaufman who represented Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393, Lawrence E. Volmert who represented Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393 filed by Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393 [Service Date: 01/18/2017 ] [15-1393, 15-1363] (Gomez, Christina) [Entered: 01/18/2017 05:08 PM]
January 13, 2017 LETTER [1655927] filed pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities filed by State of Texas and State of West Virginia in 15-1363, Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366, National Mining Association in 15-1367, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374, United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375, Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., Sunflower Electric Power Corporation and Western Farmers Electric Cooperative in 15-1376, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers and Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 15-1382, National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 15-1410, Entergy Corporation in 15-1413, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418, Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC and Newmont USA Limited in 15-1432, Coteau Properties Company, Coyote Creek Mining Company, Falkirk Mining Company, Mississippi Lignite Mining Company, NODAK Energy Services, LLC, North American Coal Royalty Company, Otter Creek Mining Company, LLC, Sabine Mining Company and The North American Coal Corporation in 15-1451, Indiana Utility Group in 15-1459, Denbury Onshore, LLC in 15-1475, Prairie State Generating Company LLC in 15-1472, Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions, Klaus J. Christoph, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Samuel R. Damewood, Caterine C. Dellin, Independence Institute, Joseph W. Luquire, Lisa R. Markham, Patrick T. Peterson, Rio Grande Foundation, Kristi Rosenquist and Sutherland Institute in 15-1488 [Service Date: 01/13/2017 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Lorenzen, Thomas) [Entered: 01/13/2017 06:20 PM]
January 12, 2017 LETTER [1655632] filed pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities filed by EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363 [Service Date: 01/12/2017 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 01/12/2017 05:22 PM]
January 12, 2017 MOTION [1655560] to substitute attorney Thomas M. Fisher for Timothy J. Junk (Response to Motion served by mail due on 01/23/2017) filed by State of Indiana (Service Date: 01/12/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 66 Words. [15-1363] (Fisher, Thomas) [Entered: 01/12/2017 02:19 PM]
January 6, 2017 MOTION [1654496] to withdraw attorney J. Andrew Hirth (Response to Motion served by mail due on 01/17/2017) filed by State of Missouri (Service Date: 01/06/2017 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 19 words. [15-1363] (Hirth, John) [Entered: 01/06/2017 01:37 PM]
January 4, 2017 NOTICE [1654047] filed to withdraw attorney Britt C. Grant who represented State of Georgia in 15-1363 filed by State of Georgia [Service Date: 01/04/2017 ] [15-1363] (Warren, Sarah) [Entered: 01/04/2017 02:53 PM]
December 30, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1653502] filed by Sarah Hawkins Warren on behalf of Petitioner State of Georgia. [15-1363] (Warren, Sarah) [Entered: 12/30/2016 11:27 AM]
December 16, 2016 NOTICE [1651430] filed to terminate attorney filed by Louisiana Public Service Commission in 15-1464 [Service Date: 12/16/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1464] (Pietras, Lesley) [Entered: 12/16/2016 02:52 PM]
December 13, 2016 NOTICE [1650936] filed to withdraw attorney Michael James McGrady who represented State of Wyoming in 15-1363 filed by State of Wyoming [Service Date: 12/13/2016 ] [15-1363] (McGrady, Michael) [Entered: 12/13/2016 05:57 PM]
November 17, 2016 LETTER [1646699] filed pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities filed by National Mining Association in 15-1367 [Service Date: 11/17/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 11/17/2016 04:43 PM]
November 14, 2016 FINAL REVISED TRANSCRIPT [1646159] of oral argument [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] [Entered: 11/15/2016 02:42 PM]
November 10, 2016 RESPONSE [1645648] filed to letter Rule 28j authorities [ # 1643743-2 ], letter [ # 1643743-3 ] filed by American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363 [Service Date: 11/10/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 11/10/2016 11:46 PM]
November 7, 2016 RESPONSE [1644919] filed to letter Rule 28j authorities [ # 1643743-2 ], letter [ # 1643743-3 ] filed by EPA in 15-1367 [Service Date: 11/07/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 11/07/2016 03:05 PM]
October 31, 2016 LETTER [1643743] filed pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities filed by National Mining Association in 15-1367 [Service Date: 10/31/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 10/31/2016 04:08 PM]
October 24, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1642432] filed by Lead counsel has already filed entry of appearance and co-counsel Erica N. Peterson on behalf of Petitioner State of West Virginia. [15-1363] (Peterson, Erica) [Entered: 10/24/2016 12:10 PM]
October 12, 2016 NOTICE [1640633] filed to terminate attorney filed by Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation and Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1376 [Service Date: 10/12/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Lorenzen, Thomas) [Entered: 10/12/2016 04:36 PM]
October 11, 2016 TRANSCRIPT [1640958] of oral argument [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] [Entered: 10/13/2016 04:38 PM]
October 6, 2016 NOTICE [1639861] filed filed by Broward County, Florida, City of Austin, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of Los Angeles Department of Water and Power, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of Seattle, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington [Service Date: 10/06/2016 ] [15-1363] (Meckenstock, Margaret) [Entered: 10/06/2016 08:30 PM]
September 29, 2016 NOTICE [1638448] filed to withdraw attorney Jonathan Zak Ritchie who represented State of West Virginia in 15-1363 filed by State of West Virginia [Service Date: 09/29/2016 ] [15-1363] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 09/29/2016 04:17 PM]
September 28, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1638287] filed by Donald Trahan and co-counsel Spencer B. Bowman on behalf of Petitioner State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality. [15-1363] (Bowman, Spencer) [Entered: 09/28/2016 05:49 PM]
September 27, 2016 ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Henderson, Rogers, Tatel, Brown, Griffith, Kavanaugh, Srinivasan, Millett, Pillard and Wilkins. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] [Entered: 09/27/2016 09:42 AM]
September 26, 2016 CORRECTED LETTER [1637586] filed regarding oral argument matter [Letter Regarding Oral Argument Materials] filed by State of Wisconsin [Service Date: 09/26/2016 ] [15-1363] (Tseytlin, Misha) [Entered: 09/26/2016 10:21 AM]
September 26, 2016 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--LETTER [1637581] filed regarding oral argument matter [Letter Regarding Oral Argument Materials] filed by State of Wisconsin [Service Date: 09/26/2016 ] [15-1363]--[Edited 09/26/2016 by JJA] (Tseytlin, Misha) [Entered: 09/26/2016 10:13 AM]
September 26, 2016 LETTER [1637720] filed pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of California and State of New York [Service Date: 09/26/2016 ] [15-1363] (Meckenstock, Margaret) [Entered: 09/26/2016 02:02 PM]
September 23, 2016 LETTER [1637396] filed pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 15-1363, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality, Mississippi Public Service Commission and State of Mississippi in 15-1409, Louisiana Public Service Commission in 15-1464 [Service Date: 09/23/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1409, 15-1464] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 09/23/2016 12:22 PM]
September 22, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1637028] filed that the Clerk is directed to notify the parties that the en banc court assigned to hear this case will consist of all active Circuit Judges except Chief Judge Garland, who will not participate in this matter [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] [Entered: 09/22/2016 10:33 AM]
September 22, 2016 JOINT LETTER [1637241] filed regarding oral argument matter [Courtesy notice regarding division of issues in Argument Segment I.] filed by State of West Virginia in 15-1363, American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382 [Service Date: 09/22/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1382] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 09/22/2016 05:17 PM]
September 13, 2016 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Norman L. Rave, Jr., on behalf of Respondents EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363, Respondent EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, Respondents EPA and Gina McCarthy in 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1464, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1472, 15-1488, 15-1470 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Rave, Norman) [Entered: 09/13/2016 11:34 AM]
September 13, 2016 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Brian H. Lynk, on behalf of Respondents EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Lynk, Brian) [Entered: 09/13/2016 11:52 AM]
September 13, 2016 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Elbert Lin, on behalf of Petitioner State of West Virginia (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [15-1363] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 09/13/2016 11:35 AM]
September 13, 2016 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Eric Hostetler, on behalf of Respondents EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 09/13/2016 11:32 AM]
September 13, 2016 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Sean H. Donahue, on behalf of Intervenors for Respondent American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 09/13/2016 10:50 AM]
September 13, 2016 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Laurence H. Tribe, on behalf of Intervenor for Petitioner Peabody Energy Corporation (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [15-1363] (Duncan, Tristan) [Entered: 09/13/2016 12:04 PM]
September 13, 2016 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Misha Tseytlin, on behalf of Petitioner State of Wisconsin (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [15-1363] (Tseytlin, Misha) [Entered: 09/13/2016 10:38 AM]
September 13, 2016 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, David B. Rivkin, Jr., on behalf of Petitioners Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [15-1363, 15-1364] (Rivkin, David) [Entered: 09/13/2016 11:04 AM]
September 13, 2016 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Michael J. Myers, on behalf of Intervenors for Respondent Broward County, Florida, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [15-1363] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 09/13/2016 11:06 AM]
September 13, 2016 NOTICE [1635470] filed to substitute attorney Matthew H. Frederick substituted by J. Campbell Barker filed by State of Texas [Service Date: 09/13/2016 ] [15-1363] (Keller, Scott) [Entered: 09/13/2016 02:04 PM]
September 13, 2016 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Allison D. Wood, on behalf of Petitioners American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Petitioner Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Petitioner Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Wood, Allison) [Entered: 09/13/2016 04:21 PM]
September 13, 2016 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Thomas A. Lorenzen, on behalf of Petitioners Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc., Western Farmers Electric Cooperative and Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1376 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Lorenzen, Thomas) [Entered: 09/13/2016 05:03 PM]
September 13, 2016 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Kevin Poloncarz, on behalf of Intervenors for Respondent Calpine Corporation, City of Austin, City of Los Angeles Department of Water and Power, City of Seattle, National Grid Generation, LLC, New York Power Authority, Pacific Gas and Electric Company, Sacramento Municipal Utility District and Southern California Edison Company in 15-1363 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 09/13/2016 07:38 PM]
September 13, 2016 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, F. William Brownell, on behalf of Petitioners American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Petitioner LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Brownell, F.) [Entered: 09/13/2016 04:13 PM]
September 13, 2016 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Peter D. Keisler, on behalf of Petitioners American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Keisler, Peter) [Entered: 09/13/2016 03:20 PM]
September 13, 2016 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Amanda Shafer Berman, on behalf of Respondents EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Berman, Amanda) [Entered: 09/13/2016 12:37 PM]
September 13, 2016 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, John Campbell Barker, on behalf of Petitioner State of Texas in 15-1363 (For Internal Use Only: Form is restricted to protect counsel's personal contact information) . [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Keller, Scott) [Entered: 09/13/2016 02:11 PM]
September 13, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1635498] filed by J. Campbell Barker on behalf of Petitioner State of Texas. [15-1363] (Barker, J.) [Entered: 09/13/2016 03:05 PM]
September 6, 2016 NOTICE [1634030] filed Notice of Substitution of Counsel for Oral Argument filed by EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, EPA and Gina McCarthy in 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1464, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1472, 15-1488, 15-1470 [Service Date: 09/06/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Rave, Norman) [Entered: 09/06/2016 04:20 PM]
August 25, 2016 RESPONSE [1631983] filed to letter Rule 28j authorities [ # 1630966-2 ], letter [ # 1630966-3 ] filed by Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions, Klaus J. Christoph, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Samuel R. Damewood, Caterine C. Dellin, Independence Institute, Joseph W. Luquire, Lisa R. Markham, Patrick T. Peterson, Rio Grande Foundation, Kristi Rosenquist and Sutherland Institute in 15-1488 [Service Date: 08/25/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1488, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483] (Gustafson, Adam) [Entered: 08/25/2016 10:18 AM]
August 19, 2016 RESPONSE [1631221] filed by American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363 to letter Rule 28j authorities [ # 1629224-2 ], letter [ # 1629224-3 ] [Service Date: 08/19/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 08/19/2016 12:46 PM]
August 17, 2016 RESPONSE [1630924] filed by EPA in 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1464, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1472, 15-1488, 15-1470 to letter Rule 28j authorities [ # 1629224-2 ], letter [ # 1629224-3 ] [Service Date: 08/17/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 08/17/2016 03:36 PM]
August 17, 2016 LETTER [1630966] filed by EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363 pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 08/17/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Lynk, Brian) [Entered: 08/17/2016 05:20 PM]
August 17, 2016 PER CURIAM ORDER, En Banc, [1630735] filed allocating oral argument time - (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS); directing parties to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney by 09/13/2016. Before Judges: Garland,* Henderson, Rogers, Tatel, Brown, Griffith, Kavanaugh, Srinivasan, Millett, Pillard* and Wilkins. (Chief Judge Garland and Circuit Judge Pillard did not participate in this matter) [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] [Entered: 08/17/2016 10:10 AM]
August 16, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1630655] filed by Paul M. Seby and co-counsel Jerry Stouck on behalf of Petitioner State of North Dakota in 15-1380. [15-1380, 15-1363] (Stouck, Jerry) [Entered: 08/16/2016 03:38 PM]
August 8, 2016 LETTER [1629224] filed by American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382 pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 08/08/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Keisler, Peter) [Entered: 08/08/2016 05:23 PM]
August 2, 2016 RESPONSE [1628322] filed by EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363 to letter Rule 28j authorities [ # 1627204-2 ], letter [ # 1627204-3 ] [Service Date: 08/02/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 08/02/2016 03:53 PM]
August 2, 2016 RESPONSE [1628324] filed by EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363 to letter Rule 28j authorities [ # 1627298-2 ], letter [ # 1627298-3 ] [Service Date: 08/02/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 08/02/2016 03:54 PM]
July 27, 2016 JOINT LETTER [1627204] filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 15-1363, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364, State of North Dakota in 15-1380, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality, Mississippi Public Service Commission and State of Mississippi in 15-1409, Louisiana Public Service Commission in 15-1464 pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 07/27/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1380, 15-1409, 15-1464] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 07/27/2016 11:45 AM]
July 27, 2016 LETTER [1627298] filed by Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions, Klaus J. Christoph, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Samuel R. Damewood, Caterine C. Dellin, Independence Institute, Joseph W. Luquire, Lisa R. Markham, Patrick T. Peterson, Rio Grande Foundation, Kristi Rosenquist and Sutherland Institute in 15-1488 pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 07/27/2016 ] [15-1488, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483] (Gustafson, Adam) [Entered: 07/27/2016 03:05 PM]
July 11, 2016 ERRATA [1623888] filed by EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363 to Appellee/Respondent final brief [ # 1609995-2 ] . Reason for errata: Error in Final EPA Brief at n.42. [Service Date: 07/11/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 07/11/2016 10:40 AM]
June 29, 2016 NOTICE [1622359] filed by American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368 to withdraw attorney Sandra Snyder who represented American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368 [Service Date: 06/29/2016 ] [15-1368, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Holmstead, Jeffrey) [Entered: 06/29/2016 04:27 PM]
June 7, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1617567] filed granting the motion of amicus curiae Climate Scientists for leave to submit additional paper copies out of time. [ # 1616410-2 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] [Entered: 06/07/2016 03:46 PM]
June 2, 2016 MOTION [1616410] filed by Climate Scientists in 15-1363 [Service Date: 06/02/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 06/16/2016) [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 06/03/2016 by MLG] (Tai, Stephanie) [Entered: 06/02/2016 11:05 PM]
May 23, 2016 PER CURIAM ORDER, En Banc, [1614547] filed Upon consideration of petitioners unopposed motion to clarify order, it is [ # 1614059-2 ] ORDERED that the number of paper copies of the 13-volume joint appendix to be provided the court be reduced from 25 to 14. In addition, the parties must provide 10 text-searchable compact disks of the 13-volume joint appendix. Both the 14 paper copies and the 10 compact disks are due on June 1, 2016. Before Judges: Garland, *Henderson, Rogers, Tatel, Brown, Griffith, Kavanaugh, Srinivasan, Millett, Pillard,* and Wilkins. * Chief Judge Garland and Circuit Judge Pillard did not participate in this matter. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] [Entered: 05/23/2016 01:46 PM]
May 19, 2016 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1614059] filed by National Mining Association in 15-1367 to clarify En Banc order ,En Banc order to reschedule oral argument,En Banc order regarding briefing schedule [1614059-2] [Service Date: 05/19/2016 ] Pages: 1-10. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 05/19/2016 12:40 PM]
May 16, 2016 PER CURIAM ORDER, En Banc, [1613489] filed, on the court's own motion, that these cases, currently scheduled for oral argument on June 2, 2016, be rescheduled for oral argument before the en banc court on Tuesday, September 27, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties and amici curiae provide 25 additional paper copies of all final briefs and appendices to the court by June 1, 2016. Before Judges: Garland,* Henderson, Rogers, Tatel, Brown, Griffith, Kavanaugh, Srinivasan, Millett, Pillard,* and Wilkins. A separate order will issue regarding allocation of oral argument time. (Chief Judge Garland and Circuit Judge Pillard did not participate in these matters) [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] [Entered: 05/16/2016 04:54 PM]
May 11, 2016 NOTICE [1612798] filed by Grid Experts to withdraw attorney Megan M Herzog who represented Grid Experts in 15-1363 [Service Date: 05/11/2016 ] [15-1363] (Horowitz, Cara) [Entered: 05/11/2016 02:14 PM]
April 28, 2016 PER CURIAM ORDER [1610837] filed granting petitioners' and respondents' unopposed motions for leave to file supplemental appendices [ # 1610049-2 ] [ # 1609855-2 ]; The Clerk is directed to file the lodged appendices [ # 1610051-2 ] [ # 1609857-2 ]. Before Judges: Henderson, Rogers and Srinivasan. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] [Entered: 04/28/2016 11:02 AM]
April 28, 2016 JOINT RESPONSE [1610992] filed by EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1464, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1472, 15-1488, 15-1470 to letter oral argument format [ # 1605918-2 ] [Service Date: 04/28/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 04/28/2016 05:23 PM]
April 28, 2016 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged appendix [ # 1610051-2 ], appendix [ # 1609857-2 ] is filed [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] [Entered: 04/28/2016 11:08 AM]
April 28, 2016 RESPONSE [1610998] filed by Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions, Klaus J. Christoph, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Samuel R. Damewood, Caterine C. Dellin, Independence Institute, Joseph W. Luquire, Lisa R. Markham, Patrick T. Peterson, Rio Grande Foundation, Kristi Rosenquist and Sutherland Institute in 15-1488 to letter oral argument format [ # 1605918-2 ] [Service Date: 04/28/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1488, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483] (Gustafson, Adam) [Entered: 04/28/2016 06:58 PM]
April 28, 2016 JOINT RESPONSE [1610994] filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 15-1363, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 15-1365, Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366, National Mining Association in 15-1367, American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372, Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374, United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375, Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc., Western Farmers Electric Cooperative and Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1376, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382, Association of American Railroads in 15-1383, National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379, State of North Dakota in 15-1380, Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393, Energy & Environment Legal Institute in 15-1398, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality, Mississippi Public Service Commission and State of Mississippi in 15-1409, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 15-1410, Entergy Corporation in 15-1413, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418, West Virginia Coal Association in 15-1422, Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC and Newmont USA Limited in 15-1432, The Kansas City Board of Public Utilities-- Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, Kansas in 15-1442, Coteau Properties Company, Coyote Creek Mining Company, Falkirk Mining Company, Mississippi Lignite Mining Company, NODAK Energy Services, LLC, North American Coal Royalty Company, Otter Creek Mining Company, LLC, Sabine Mining Company and The North American Coal Corporation in 15-1451, Indiana Utility Group in 15-1459, Energy-Intensive Manufacturers' Working Group on Greenhouse Gas Regulation in 15-1477, Local Government Coalition for Renewable Energy in 15-1483, Louisiana Public Service Commission in 15-1464, Minnesota Power in 15-1474, Denbury Onshore, LLC in 15-1475, Prairie State Generating Company LLC in 15-1472, Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions, Klaus J. Christoph, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Samuel R. Damewood, Caterine C. Dellin, Independence Institute, Joseph W. Luquire, Lisa R. Markham, Patrick T. Peterson, Rio Grande Foundation, Kristi Rosenquist and Sutherland Institute in 15-1488, GenOn Mid-Atlantic, LLC, Indian River Power LLC, Louisiana Generating LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Chalk Point LLC, NRG Power Midwest LP, NRG Rema LLC, NRG Texas Power LLC, NRG Wholesale Generation LP and Vienna Power LLC in 15-1470 to letter oral argument format [ # 1605918-2 ] [Service Date: 04/28/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 04/28/2016 06:21 PM]
April 25, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1610258] filed granting motion to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1606869-2 ], [ # 1606848-2 ], [ # 1606845-2 ], [ # 1606810-2 ], [ # 1606770-2 ], [ # 1606723-2 ], [ # 1606701-2 ], [ # 1606696-2 ], [ # 1606690-2 ], [ # 1606651-2 ], [ # 1606089-2 ], [ # 1605906-2 ], [ # 1605880-2 ] in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Accursio, John) [Entered: 04/25/2016 12:29 PM]
April 25, 2016 RESPONSE [1610521] filed by Philip Zoebisch (in 15-1363) to letter concerning proposed oral argument formats [ # 1605918-2 ] [Service Date: 04/23/2016 by US Mail] Pages: 1-10. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] [Entered: 04/26/2016 02:20 PM]
April 22, 2016 RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1609995] filed by EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, EPA and Gina McCarthy in 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1464, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1472, 15-1488, 15-1470 [Service Date: 04/22/2016 ] Length of Brief: 41,961. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 04/22/2016 01:57 PM]
April 22, 2016 INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1610004] filed by American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy [Service Date: 04/22/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6194 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Longstreth, Benjamin) [Entered: 04/22/2016 02:18 PM]
April 22, 2016 SEPARATE STATUTORY ADDENDUM [1609997] filed by EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, EPA and Gina McCarthy in 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1464, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1472, 15-1488, 15-1470 to Appellee/Respondent final brief [ # 1609995-2 ] [Service Date:04/22/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 04/22/2016 02:01 PM]
April 22, 2016 ERRATA [1609994] filed by EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, EPA and Gina McCarthy in 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1464, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1472, 15-1488, 15-1470 to Appellee/Respondent brief [ # 1605911-2 ] . Reason for errata: Typographical Errors. [Service Date: 04/22/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 04/22/2016 01:54 PM]
April 22, 2016 JOINT INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1609958] filed by Advanced Energy Economy, American Wind Energy Association and Solar Energy Industries Association [Service Date: 04/22/2016 ] Length of Brief: 3,687. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Lerman, Daniel) [Entered: 04/22/2016 12:11 PM]
April 22, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1610006] filed by Joseph A. Newberg, II on behalf of Petitioner Commonwealth of Kentucky. [15-1363] (Newberg, Joseph) [Entered: 04/22/2016 02:19 PM]
April 22, 2016 AMICUS FOR PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1609882] filed by Former State Public Utility Commissioners in 15-1363 [Service Date: 04/22/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Gifford, Raymond) [Entered: 04/22/2016 09:45 AM]
April 22, 2016 JOINT INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1609980] filed by Calpine Corporation, City of Austin, City of Los Angeles Department of Water and Power, City of Seattle, National Grid Generation, LLC, New York Power Authority, Pacific Gas and Electric Company, Sacramento Municipal Utility District and Southern California Edison Company [Service Date: 04/22/2016 ] Length of Brief: 3,174 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 04/22/2016 12:58 PM]
April 22, 2016 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1609981] filed by Grid Experts in 15-1377 [Service Date: 04/22/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6992 Words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Herzog, Megan) [Entered: 04/22/2016 12:58 PM]
April 22, 2016 JOINT PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1610010] filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 15-1363, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 15-1365, Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366, National Mining Association in 15-1367, American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372, Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374, United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375, Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc., Western Farmers Electric Cooperative and Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1376, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382, Association of American Railroads in 15-1383, National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379, State of North Dakota in 15-1380, Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393, Energy & Environment Legal Institute in 15-1398, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality, Mississippi Public Service Commission and State of Mississippi in 15-1409, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 15-1410, Entergy Corporation in 15-1413, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418, West Virginia Coal Association in 15-1422, Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC and Newmont USA Limited in 15-1432, The Kansas City Board of Public Utilities-- Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, Kansas in 15-1442, Coteau Properties Company, Coyote Creek Mining Company, Falkirk Mining Company, Mississippi Lignite Mining Company, NODAK Energy Services, LLC, North American Coal Royalty Company, Otter Creek Mining Company, LLC, Sabine Mining Company and The North American Coal Corporation in 15-1451, Indiana Utility Group in 15-1459, Energy-Intensive Manufacturers' Working Group on Greenhouse Gas Regulation in 15-1477, Louisiana Public Service Commission in 15-1464, Minnesota Power in 15-1474, Denbury Onshore, LLC in 15-1475, Prairie State Generating Company LLC in 15-1472, Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions, Klaus J. Christoph, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Samuel R. Damewood, Caterine C. Dellin, Independence Institute, Joseph W. Luquire, Lisa R. Markham, Patrick T. Peterson, Rio Grande Foundation, Kristi Rosenquist and Sutherland Institute in 15-1488, GenOn Mid-Atlantic, LLC, Indian River Power LLC, Louisiana Generating LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Chalk Point LLC, NRG Power Midwest LP, NRG Rema LLC, NRG Texas Power LLC, NRG Wholesale Generation LP and Vienna Power LLC in 15-1470 [Service Date: 04/22/2016 ] Length of Brief: 21,613. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1488] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 04/22/2016 02:47 PM]
April 22, 2016 JOINT PETITIONER FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1610062] filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 15-1363, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 15-1365, Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366, American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372, Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374, United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375, Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc., Western Farmers Electric Cooperative and Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1376, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 15-1382, Association of American Railroads in 15-1383, National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379, State of North Dakota in 15-1380, Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality, Mississippi Public Service Commission and State of Mississippi in 15-1409, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 15-1410, Entergy Corporation in 15-1413, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418, West Virginia Coal Association in 15-1422, Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC and Newmont USA Limited in 15-1432, The Kansas City Board of Public Utilities-- Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, Kansas in 15-1442, Coteau Properties Company, Coyote Creek Mining Company, Falkirk Mining Company, Mississippi Lignite Mining Company, NODAK Energy Services, LLC, North American Coal Royalty Company, Otter Creek Mining Company, LLC, Sabine Mining Company and The North American Coal Corporation in 15-1451, Indiana Utility Group in 15-1459, Energy-Intensive Manufacturers' Working Group on Greenhouse Gas Regulation in 15-1477, Local Government Coalition for Renewable Energy in 15-1483, Louisiana Public Service Commission in 15-1464, Minnesota Power in 15-1474, Denbury Onshore, LLC in 15-1475, Prairie State Generating Company LLC in 15-1472, Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions, Klaus J. Christoph, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Samuel R. Damewood, Caterine C. Dellin, Independence Institute, Joseph W. Luquire, Lisa R. Markham, Patrick T. Peterson, Rio Grande Foundation, Kristi Rosenquist and Sutherland Institute in 15-1488, GenOn Mid-Atlantic, LLC, Indian River Power LLC, Louisiana Generating LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Chalk Point LLC, NRG Power Midwest LP, NRG Rema LLC, NRG Texas Power LLC, NRG Wholesale Generation LP and Vienna Power LLC in 15-1470 [Service Date: 04/22/2016 ] Length of Brief: 8,481 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Lorenzen, Thomas) [Entered: 04/22/2016 04:03 PM]
April 22, 2016 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1610092] filed by Madeleine K. Albright, William J. Burn and Leon E. Panetta [Service Date: 04/22/2016 ] Length of Brief: 2,742. [15-1363] (Frederick, David) [Entered: 04/22/2016 04:55 PM]
April 22, 2016 AMICUS FOR PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1610125] filed by Consumers' Research in 15-1363 [Service Date: 04/22/2016 ] Length of Brief: 5,651 Words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Petrino, Michael) [Entered: 04/22/2016 08:26 PM]
April 22, 2016 SEPARATE STATUTORY ADDENDUM [1610057] filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 15-1363, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 15-1365, Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366, American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372, Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374, United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375, Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc., Western Farmers Electric Cooperative and Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1376, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, Association of American Railroads in 15-1383, National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379, State of North Dakota in 15-1380, Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality, Mississippi Public Service Commission and State of Mississippi in 15-1409, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 15-1410, Entergy Corporation in 15-1413, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418, West Virginia Coal Association in 15-1422, Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC and Newmont USA Limited in 15-1432, The Kansas City Board of Public Utilities-- Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, Kansas in 15-1442, Coteau Properties Company, Coyote Creek Mining Company, Falkirk Mining Company, Mississippi Lignite Mining Company, NODAK Energy Services, LLC, North American Coal Royalty Company, Otter Creek Mining Company, LLC, Sabine Mining Company and The North American Coal Corporation in 15-1451, Indiana Utility Group in 15-1459, Energy-Intensive Manufacturers' Working Group on Greenhouse Gas Regulation in 15-1477, Local Government Coalition for Renewable Energy in 15-1483, Louisiana Public Service Commission in 15-1464, Minnesota Power in 15-1474, Denbury Onshore, LLC in 15-1475, Prairie State Generating Company LLC in 15-1472, Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions, Klaus J. Christoph, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Samuel R. Damewood, Caterine C. Dellin, Independence Institute, Joseph W. Luquire, Lisa R. Markham, Patrick T. Peterson, Rio Grande Foundation, Kristi Rosenquist and Sutherland Institute in 15-1488, GenOn Mid-Atlantic, LLC, Indian River Power LLC, Louisiana Generating LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Chalk Point LLC, NRG Power Midwest LP, NRG Rema LLC, NRG Texas Power LLC, NRG Wholesale Generation LP and Vienna Power LLC in 15-1470 to Appellant/Petitioner final brief [ # 1610031-2 ] [Service Date:04/22/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Lorenzen, Thomas) [Entered: 04/22/2016 03:57 PM]
April 22, 2016 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX [1610051] filed by National Mining Association in 15-1367. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date:04/22/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1367] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 04/22/2016 03:53 PM]
April 22, 2016 JOINT PETITIONER FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1610012] filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 15-1363, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 15-1365, Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366, National Mining Association in 15-1367, American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372, Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374, United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375, Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc., Western Farmers Electric Cooperative and Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1376, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382, Association of American Railroads in 15-1383, National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379, State of North Dakota in 15-1380, Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393, Energy & Environment Legal Institute in 15-1398, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality, Mississippi Public Service Commission and State of Mississippi in 15-1409, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 15-1410, Entergy Corporation in 15-1413, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418, West Virginia Coal Association in 15-1422, Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC and Newmont USA Limited in 15-1432, The Kansas City Board of Public Utilities-- Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, Kansas in 15-1442, Coteau Properties Company, Coyote Creek Mining Company, Falkirk Mining Company, Mississippi Lignite Mining Company, NODAK Energy Services, LLC, North American Coal Royalty Company, Otter Creek Mining Company, LLC, Sabine Mining Company and The North American Coal Corporation in 15-1451, Indiana Utility Group in 15-1459, Energy-Intensive Manufacturers' Working Group on Greenhouse Gas Regulation in 15-1477, Louisiana Public Service Commission in 15-1464, Minnesota Power in 15-1474, Denbury Onshore, LLC in 15-1475, Prairie State Generating Company LLC in 15-1472, Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions, Klaus J. Christoph, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Samuel R. Damewood, Caterine C. Dellin, Independence Institute, Joseph W. Luquire, Lisa R. Markham, Patrick T. Peterson, Rio Grande Foundation, Kristi Rosenquist and Sutherland Institute in 15-1488, GenOn Mid-Atlantic, LLC, Indian River Power LLC, Louisiana Generating LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Chalk Point LLC, NRG Power Midwest LP, NRG Rema LLC, NRG Texas Power LLC, NRG Wholesale Generation LP and Vienna Power LLC in 15-1470 [Service Date: 04/22/2016 ] Length of Brief: 12,449. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1488] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 04/22/2016 02:51 PM]
April 22, 2016 JOINT INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1610024] filed by Broward County, Florida, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington [Service Date: 04/22/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6,740 words. [15-1363] (Davis Noll, Bethany) [Entered: 04/22/2016 03:30 PM]
April 22, 2016 JOINT PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1610031] filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 15-1363, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 15-1365, Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366, American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372, Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374, United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375, Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc., Western Farmers Electric Cooperative and Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1376, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, Association of American Railroads in 15-1383, National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379, State of North Dakota in 15-1380, Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality, Mississippi Public Service Commission and State of Mississippi in 15-1409, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 15-1410, Entergy Corporation in 15-1413, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418, West Virginia Coal Association in 15-1422, Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC and Newmont USA Limited in 15-1432, The Kansas City Board of Public Utilities-- Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, Kansas in 15-1442, Coteau Properties Company, Coyote Creek Mining Company, Falkirk Mining Company, Mississippi Lignite Mining Company, NODAK Energy Services, LLC, Otter Creek Mining Company, LLC, Sabine Mining Company and The North American Coal Corporation in 15-1451, Indiana Utility Group in 15-1459, Energy-Intensive Manufacturers' Working Group on Greenhouse Gas Regulation in 15-1477, Local Government Coalition for Renewable Energy in 15-1483, Louisiana Public Service Commission in 15-1464, Minnesota Power in 15-1474, Denbury Onshore, LLC in 15-1475, Prairie State Generating Company LLC in 15-1472, Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions, Klaus J. Christoph, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Samuel R. Damewood, Caterine C. Dellin, Independence Institute, Joseph W. Luquire, Lisa R. Markham, Patrick T. Peterson, Rio Grande Foundation, Kristi Rosenquist and Sutherland Institute in 15-1488, GenOn Mid-Atlantic, LLC, Indian River Power LLC, Louisiana Generating LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Chalk Point LLC, NRG Power Midwest LP, NRG Rema LLC, NRG Texas Power LLC, NRG Wholesale Generation LP and Vienna Power LLC in 15-1470 [Service Date: 04/22/2016 ] Length of Brief: 19,732 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Lorenzen, Thomas) [Entered: 04/22/2016 03:39 PM]
April 22, 2016 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1610049] filed by National Mining Association in 15-1367 for leave to file appendix Pages: 1-10. [15-1363, 15-1367] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 04/22/2016 03:51 PM]
April 21, 2016 INTERVENOR FOR PETITIONER FINAL BRIEF [1609820] filed by Dixon Bros., Inc., Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition, Joy Global Inc., Nelson Brothers, Inc., Norfolk Southern Corporation, Peabody Energy Corporation and Wesco International, Inc. [Service Date: 04/21/2016 ] Length of Brief: 9,998. [15-1363] (Duncan, Tristan) [Entered: 04/21/2016 03:58 PM]
April 21, 2016 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1609855] filed by EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363 for leave to file appendix [Service Date: 04/21/2016 ] Pages: 1-10. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 04/21/2016 05:39 PM]
April 21, 2016 INTERVENOR FOR PETITIONER FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1609821] filed by Dixon Bros., Inc., Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition, Joy Global Inc., Nelson Brothers, Inc., Norfolk Southern Corporation, Peabody Energy Corporation and Wesco International, Inc. [Service Date: 04/21/2016 ] Length of Brief: 4,988. [15-1363] (Duncan, Tristan) [Entered: 04/21/2016 04:00 PM]
April 21, 2016 SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX [1609857] LODGED by EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date:04/21/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 04/21/2016 05:46 PM]
April 20, 2016 AMICUS FOR PETITIONER BRIEF [1609643] filed by Norman R. Brown, Loggers Association of Northern California, Merit Oil Company, Morning Star Packing Company, Pacific Legal Foundation and Texas Public Policy Foundation [Service Date: 04/20/2016 ] Length of Brief: This brief complies with the type-volume limitation of Fed. R. App. P. 32(a)(7)(B) because: this brief contains 6734 words, excluding the parts of the brief exempted by Fed. R. App. P. 32(a)(7)(B)(iii).. [15-1363] (Hadzi-Antich, Theodore) [Entered: 04/20/2016 05:13 PM]
April 18, 2016 JOINT APPENDIX [1609226] filed by National Mining Association in 15-1367. [Volumes: 13] [Service Date: 04/18/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1367] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 04/18/2016 02:49 PM]
April 18, 2016 ERRATA [1609304] filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 15-1363, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 15-1365, Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366, American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372, Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374, United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375, Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc., Western Farmers Electric Cooperative and Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1376, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, Association of American Railroads in 15-1383, National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379, State of North Dakota in 15-1380, Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality, Mississippi Public Service Commission and State of Mississippi in 15-1409, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 15-1410, Entergy Corporation in 15-1413, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418, West Virginia Coal Association in 15-1422, Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC and Newmont USA Limited in 15-1432, The Kansas City Board of Public Utilities-- Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, Kansas in 15-1442, Coteau Properties Company, Coyote Creek Mining Company, Falkirk Mining Company, Mississippi Lignite Mining Company, NODAK Energy Services, LLC, North American Coal Royalty Company, Otter Creek Mining Company, LLC, Sabine Mining Company and The North American Coal Corporation in 15-1451, Indiana Utility Group in 15-1459, Energy-Intensive Manufacturers' Working Group on Greenhouse Gas Regulation in 15-1477, Local Government Coalition for Renewable Energy in 15-1483, Louisiana Public Service Commission in 15-1464, Minnesota Power in 15-1474, Denbury Onshore, LLC in 15-1475, Prairie State Generating Company LLC in 15-1472, Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions, Klaus J. Christoph, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Samuel R. Damewood, Caterine C. Dellin, Independence Institute, Joseph W. Luquire, Lisa R. Markham, Patrick T. Peterson, Rio Grande Foundation, Kristi Rosenquist and Sutherland Institute in 15-1488, GenOn Mid-Atlantic, LLC, Indian River Power LLC, Louisiana Generating LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Chalk Point LLC, NRG Power Midwest LP, NRG Rema LLC, NRG Texas Power LLC, NRG Wholesale Generation LP and Vienna Power LLC in 15-1470 to Appellant/Petitioner brief [ # 1599898-2 ] . Reason for errata: Corrected Table of Authorities; citations and page numbers inadvertently omitted.. [Service Date: 04/18/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Lorenzen, Thomas) [Entered: 04/18/2016 06:34 PM]
April 15, 2016 INTERVENOR FOR PETITIONER REPLY BRIEF [1608977] filed by Dixon Bros., Inc., Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition, Joy Global Inc., Nelson Brothers, Inc., Norfolk Southern Corporation, Peabody Energy Corporation and Wesco International, Inc. [Service Date: 04/15/2016 ] Length of Brief: 4,997 Words. [15-1363] (Duncan, Tristan) [Entered: 04/15/2016 01:00 PM]
April 15, 2016 JOINT PETITIONER REPLY BRIEF [1608991] filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 15-1363, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 15-1365, Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366, National Mining Association in 15-1367, American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372, Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374, United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375, Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc., Western Farmers Electric Cooperative and Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1376, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382, Association of American Railroads in 15-1383, National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379, State of North Dakota in 15-1380, Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393, Energy & Environment Legal Institute in 15-1398, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality, Mississippi Public Service Commission and State of Mississippi in 15-1409, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 15-1410, Entergy Corporation in 15-1413, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418, West Virginia Coal Association in 15-1422, Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC and Newmont USA Limited in 15-1432, The Kansas City Board of Public Utilities-- Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, Kansas in 15-1442, Coteau Properties Company, Coyote Creek Mining Company, Falkirk Mining Company, Mississippi Lignite Mining Company, NODAK Energy Services, LLC, North American Coal Royalty Company, Otter Creek Mining Company, LLC, Sabine Mining Company and The North American Coal Corporation in 15-1451, Indiana Utility Group in 15-1459, Energy-Intensive Manufacturers' Working Group on Greenhouse Gas Regulation in 15-1477, Louisiana Public Service Commission in 15-1464, Minnesota Power in 15-1474, Denbury Onshore, LLC in 15-1475, Prairie State Generating Company LLC in 15-1472, Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions, Klaus J. Christoph, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Samuel R. Damewood, Caterine C. Dellin, Independence Institute, Joseph W. Luquire, Lisa R. Markham, Patrick T. Peterson, Rio Grande Foundation, Kristi Rosenquist and Sutherland Institute in 15-1488, GenOn Mid-Atlantic, LLC, Indian River Power LLC, Louisiana Generating LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Chalk Point LLC, NRG Power Midwest LP, NRG Rema LLC, NRG Texas Power LLC, NRG Wholesale Generation LP and Vienna Power LLC in 15-1470 [Service Date: 04/15/2016 ] Length of Brief: 12,450 Words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1488] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 04/15/2016 01:58 PM]
April 15, 2016 PETITIONER REPLY BRIEF [1608992] filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 15-1363, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 15-1365, Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366, American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372, Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374, United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375, Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc., Western Farmers Electric Cooperative and Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1376, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 15-1382, Association of American Railroads in 15-1383, National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379, State of North Dakota in 15-1380, Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality, Mississippi Public Service Commission and State of Mississippi in 15-1409, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 15-1410, Entergy Corporation in 15-1413, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418, West Virginia Coal Association in 15-1422, Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC and Newmont USA Limited in 15-1432, The Kansas City Board of Public Utilities-- Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, Kansas in 15-1442, Coteau Properties Company, Coyote Creek Mining Company, Falkirk Mining Company, Mississippi Lignite Mining Company, NODAK Energy Services, LLC, North American Coal Royalty Company, Otter Creek Mining Company, LLC, Sabine Mining Company and The North American Coal Corporation in 15-1451, Indiana Utility Group in 15-1459, Energy-Intensive Manufacturers' Working Group on Greenhouse Gas Regulation in 15-1477, Local Government Coalition for Renewable Energy in 15-1483, Louisiana Public Service Commission in 15-1464, Minnesota Power in 15-1474, Denbury Onshore, LLC in 15-1475, Prairie State Generating Company LLC in 15-1472, Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions, Klaus J. Christoph, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Samuel R. Damewood, Caterine C. Dellin, Independence Institute, Joseph W. Luquire, Lisa R. Markham, Patrick T. Peterson, Rio Grande Foundation, Kristi Rosenquist and Sutherland Institute in 15-1488, GenOn Mid-Atlantic, LLC, Indian River Power LLC, Louisiana Generating LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Chalk Point LLC, NRG Power Midwest LP, NRG Rema LLC, NRG Texas Power LLC, NRG Wholesale Generation LP and Vienna Power LLC in 15-1470 [Service Date: 04/15/2016 ] Length of Brief: 8,468 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Lorenzen, Thomas) [Entered: 04/15/2016 02:22 PM]
April 5, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1607385] filed by Patrick Parenteau and co-counsel Kelsey M. Eggert (Appearance by Law Student); Brittany E. Wright (Appearance by Law Student) on behalf of Movant-Amicus Curiae for Respondent Former State Officials in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Parenteau, Patrick) [Entered: 04/05/2016 04:09 PM]
April 5, 2016 PER CURIAM ORDER [1607271] filed granting petitioners' unopposed motion clarify or amend orders. The paper copies of the joint appendix are now due by April 20, 2016. [ # 1606322-2 ] Before Judges: Henderson, Rogers and Srinivasan. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] [Entered: 04/05/2016 11:55 AM]
April 1, 2016 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1606875] filed by Madeleine K. Albright, William J. Burn and Leon E. Panetta in 15-1470 [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] Length of Brief: 2,742 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Frederick, David) [Entered: 04/01/2016 04:29 PM]
April 1, 2016 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1606876] filed by Adobe, Inc., Mars, Incorporated, IKEA North America Services LLC, and Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc. [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] Length of Brief: 5,218 Words. [15-1363] (Muys, Jerome) [Entered: 04/01/2016 04:29 PM]
April 1, 2016 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1606887] filed by Service Employees International Union in 15-1363 [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] Length of Brief: 5110 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Gerni, Renee) [Entered: 04/01/2016 05:27 PM]
April 1, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1606869] filed by Adobe, Inc., Mars, Incorporated, Ikea North America Services LLC and Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc. to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] [15-1363]--[Edited 04/04/2016 by JJA] (Muys, Jerome) [Entered: 04/01/2016 04:23 PM]
April 1, 2016 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1606852] filed by Catholic Climate Covenant, et al. [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] Length of Brief: 5,471 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Zinn, Matthew) [Entered: 04/01/2016 03:52 PM]
April 1, 2016 NOTICE [1606706] filed by Baltimore, MD, Boulder County, CO, Coral Gables, FL, Grand Rapids, MI, Houston, TX, Jersey City, NJ, Los Angeles, CA, Minneapolis, MN, National League of Cities, Pinecrest, FL, Portland, OR, Providence, RI, Salt Lake City, UT, San Francisco, CA, United States Conference of Mayors and West Palm Beach, FL advising of their support of respondent [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] [15-1363] (Burger, Michael) [Entered: 04/01/2016 10:11 AM]
April 1, 2016 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1606708] filed by Baltimore, MD, Boulder County, CO, Coral Gables, FL, Grand Rapids, MI, Houston, TX, Jersey City, NJ, Los Angeles, CA, Minneapolis, MN, National League of Cities, Pinecrest, FL, Portland, OR, Providence, RI, Salt Lake City, UT, San Francisco, CA and West Palm Beach, FL [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6,950 words. [15-1363] (Burger, Michael) [Entered: 04/01/2016 10:15 AM]
April 1, 2016 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1606711] filed by American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, American College of Preventive Medicine, American Medical Association and American Thoracic Society in 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1464, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1472, 15-1488, 15-1470 American Academy of Pediatrics; National Medical Association; National Association for Medical Direction of Respiratory Care; American Public Health Association [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6,771 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Fox, Sarah) [Entered: 04/01/2016 10:24 AM]
April 1, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1606723] filed by Citizens Utility Board, Consumers Union, and Public Citizen, Inc. to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] MOTION [1606723] filed by Public Citizen, Inc., Consumers Union and Citizens Utility Board in 15-1363 to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 04/04/2016 by JJA] (Gupta, Deepak) [Entered: 04/01/2016 10:47 AM]
April 1, 2016 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1606705] filed by Leon G. Billings / Thomas C. Jorling [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6,075 words. [15-1363]--[Edited 04/01/2016 by JJA] (Warren, Charles) [Entered: 04/01/2016 10:11 AM]
April 1, 2016 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1606704] filed by Union of Concerned Scientists in 15-1470 [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] Length of Brief: 5,795 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Goho, Shaun) [Entered: 04/01/2016 10:10 AM]
April 1, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1606690] filed by AMAZON.COM, INC., APPLE INC., GOOGLE INC., AND MICROSOFT CORP. to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 04/04/2016 by JJA] (Willen, Brian) [Entered: 04/01/2016 09:37 AM]
April 1, 2016 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1606691] filed by AMAZON.COM, INC., APPLE INC., GOOGLE INC., AND MICROSOFT CORP. [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] Length of Brief: 4,647. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Willen, Brian) [Entered: 04/01/2016 09:41 AM]
April 1, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1606696] filed by American Academy of Pediatrics; National Medical Association; National Association for Medical Direction of Respiratory Care; American Public Health Association to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 04/04/2016 by JJA] (Fox, Sarah) [Entered: 04/01/2016 10:00 AM]
April 1, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1606701] filed by Leon G. Billings / Thomas C. Jorling to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] [15-1363]--[Edited 04/04/2016 by JJA] (Warren, Charles) [Entered: 04/01/2016 10:08 AM]
April 1, 2016 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT FINAL BRIEF [1606724] filed by Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law in 15-1363, 15-1377 [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6,986 Words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Revesz, Richard) [Entered: 04/01/2016 10:58 AM]
April 1, 2016 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1606654] filed by Grid Experts in 15-1363 [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6,987 Words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Herzog, Megan) [Entered: 04/01/2016 04:38 AM]
April 1, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1606810] filed by Madeleine K. Albright, Leon A. Panetta and William J. Burns to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 04/01/2016 by JJA] (Frederick, David) [Entered: 04/01/2016 02:21 PM]
April 1, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1606845] filed by Catholic Climate Covenant, et al. to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Attached] [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 04/04/2016 by JJA] (Zinn, Matthew) [Entered: 04/01/2016 03:38 PM]
April 1, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER-- CORRECTED MOTION [1606848] filed by Dominion Resources, Inc. to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 04/01/2016 by JJA] (Vieth, Robert) [Entered: 04/01/2016 03:45 PM]
April 1, 2016 CORRECTED AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1606746] filed by Former State Energy and Environmental Officials [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6086 Words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Parenteau, Patrick) [Entered: 04/01/2016 12:13 PM]
April 1, 2016 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1606807] filed by Sustainable Business Organizations [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] Length of Brief: 5,853 words. [15-1363] (Harvey, Stephen) [Entered: 04/01/2016 02:13 PM]
April 1, 2016 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1606847] filed by Citizens Utility Board, Consumers Union, and Public Citizen, Inc. [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] Length of Brief: 7,101 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Gupta, Deepak) [Entered: 04/01/2016 03:39 PM]
April 1, 2016 NOTICE [1606805] filed by U.S. Black Chambers, Inc., et al. of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Harvey, Stephen) [Entered: 04/01/2016 02:05 PM]
April 1, 2016 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--MOTION [1606771] filed by Dominion Resources, Inc. to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 04/01/2016 by JJA] (Vieth, Robert) [Entered: 04/01/2016 01:00 PM]
April 1, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1606770] filed by Climate scientists to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 04/04/2016 by JJA] (Tai, Stephanie) [Entered: 04/01/2016 12:43 PM]
April 1, 2016 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1606778] filed by Dominion Resources, Inc. [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] Length of Brief: 4,522 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Vieth, Robert) [Entered: 04/01/2016 01:07 PM]
April 1, 2016 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1606774] filed Climate Scientists. [Service Date: 04/01/2016 ] Length of Brief: 5863 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 06/02/2016 by JJA] (Tai, Stephanie) [Entered: 04/01/2016 01:04 PM]
March 31, 2016 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1606565] filed by Former State Energy and Environmental Officials [Service Date: 03/31/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6071 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 04/05/2016 by JJA] (Parenteau, Patrick) [Entered: 03/31/2016 02:25 PM]
March 31, 2016 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1606561] filed by William K. Reilly and William D. Ruckelshaus in 15-1363 [Service Date: 03/31/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6954 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Lazarus, Richard) [Entered: 03/31/2016 02:15 PM]
March 31, 2016 AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1606652] filed by Current Members of Congress & Bipartisan Former Members of Congress [Service Date: 03/31/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6,993 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Wydra, Elizabeth) [Entered: 03/31/2016 06:20 PM]
March 31, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1606651] filed by Current Members of Congress & Bipartisan Former Members of Congress to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 03/31/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 04/04/2016 by JJA] (Wydra, Elizabeth) [Entered: 03/31/2016 06:16 PM]
March 30, 2016 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1606322] filed by National Mining Association in 15-1367 to clarify Complex Panel order , Complex Panel order ,Complex Panel order regarding briefing schedule [1606322-2] [Service Date: 03/30/2016 ] Pages: 1-10. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 03/30/2016 02:55 PM]
March 29, 2016 JOINT INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1606054] filed by Advanced Energy Economy, American Wind Energy Association and Solar Energy Industries Association [Service Date: 03/29/2016 ] Length of Brief: 3,692 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Bernetich, John) [Entered: 03/29/2016 02:04 PM]
March 29, 2016 JOINT INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1606073] filed by Calpine Corporation, City of Austin, City of Los Angeles Department of Water and Power, City of Seattle, National Grid Generation, LLC, New York Power Authority, Pacific Gas and Electric Company, Sacramento Municipal Utility District and Southern California Edison Company [Service Date: 03/29/2016 ] Length of Brief: 3,174 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 03/29/2016 02:29 PM]
March 29, 2016 JOINT INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1606037] filed by Broward County, Florida, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington [Service Date: 03/29/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6,786 words. [15-1363] (Davis Noll, Bethany) [Entered: 03/29/2016 01:20 PM]
March 29, 2016 INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT BRIEF [1606130] filed by American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy [Service Date: 03/29/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6,195 words.. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Longstreth, Benjamin) [Entered: 03/29/2016 04:33 PM]
March 29, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1606089] filed by GRID EXPERTS BENJAMIN F. HOBBS, BRENDAN KIRBY, KENNETH J. LUTZ, JAMES D. MCCALLEY, & BRIAN PARSONS to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 03/29/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 03/31/2016 by JJA] (Herzog, Megan) [Entered: 03/29/2016 03:08 PM]
March 28, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1605906] filed by Union of Concerned Scientists to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 03/28/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 03/31/2016 by JJA] (Goho, Shaun) [Entered: 03/28/2016 03:35 PM]
March 28, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1605880] filed by Former State Environmental and Energy Officials to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 03/28/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 04/04/2016 by JJA] (Parenteau, Patrick) [Entered: 03/28/2016 02:10 PM]
March 28, 2016 RESPONDENT BRIEF [1605911] filed by EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, EPA and Gina McCarthy in 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1464, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1472, 15-1488, 15-1470 [Service Date: 03/28/2016 ] Length of Brief: 41,949. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 03/28/2016 03:55 PM]
March 28, 2016 SEPARATE STATUTORY ADDENDUM [1605913] filed by EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363 to Appellee/Respondent brief [ # 1605911-2 ] [Service Date:03/28/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 03/28/2016 04:02 PM]
March 28, 2016 LETTER [1605918] sent directing parties to submit proposed oral argument formats by 04/28/2016. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] [Entered: 03/28/2016 04:05 PM]
March 23, 2016 PER CURIAM ORDER [1605274] filed granting the motion of petitioners Competitive Enterprise Institute, et al. for leave to file an addendum to petitioners' brief [ # 1599901-2 ] Before Judges: Henderson, Rogers and Srinivasan. [15-1363, 15-1488] [Entered: 03/23/2016 10:30 AM]
March 23, 2016 PER CURIAM ORDER [1605317] filed granting the notice of intent of Members of Congress to file a brief as amicus curiae [ # 1600246-2 ]. The Clerk is directed to file the lodged brief. Before Judges: Henderson, Rogers and Srinivasan. [15-1363] [Entered: 03/23/2016 11:26 AM]
March 23, 2016 PER CURIAM ORDER [1605436] filed, on the courts own motion, that the parties and amici curiae file 6 paper copies of their initial briefs. Paper copies of initial briefs that have already been filed in electronic format only are to be hand delivered to the court on or before March 30, 2016. Paper copies of initial briefs that are due March 28, 2016 through April 15, 2016 are to be hand delivered to the court on the date due. [ # 1595922-3 ] Before Judges: Henderson, Rogers and Srinivasan. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] [Entered: 03/23/2016 04:15 PM]
March 22, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1605216] filed by Christina F. Gomez and co-counsel Patrick R. Day, Lawrence E. Volmert, Garrison W. Kaufman, Jill H. Van Noord, Emily C. Schilling on behalf of Petitioner Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393. [15-1393, 15-1363] (Gomez, Christina) [Entered: 03/22/2016 05:49 PM]
March 21, 2016 PER CURIAM ORDER [1604966] filed denying petitioner Energy & Environment Legal Institute's motion for leave to file a separate supplement to petitioners' brief [ # 1599886-2 ] in 15-1398. The Clerk is directed to note the docket accordingly. Before Judges: Henderson, Rogers and Srinivasan. [15-1363, 15-1398] [Entered: 03/21/2016 03:48 PM]
March 17, 2016 NOTICE [1604548] filed by Prairie State Generating Company LLC in 15-1472 to withdraw attorney Raghav Murali who represented Prairie State Generating Company LLC in 15-1472 [Service Date: 03/17/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1472] (Antoniolli, Amy) [Entered: 03/17/2016 04:29 PM]
March 14, 2016 NOTICE [1603962] filed by State of Florida to withdraw attorney Allen C. Winsor who represented State of Florida in 15-1363 [Service Date: 03/14/2016 ] [15-1363] (Williams, Jonathan) [Entered: 03/14/2016 09:42 PM]
March 9, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1603231] filed granting motion to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1600448-2 ] [ # 1600446-2 ], [ # 1600435-2 ], [ # 1600327-2 ], [ # 1600160-2 ], [ # 1599913-2 ], [ # 1599833-2 ], [ # 1599359-2 ] in 15-1363; The Clerk is directed to file the lodged Amicus brief [ # 1600450-2 ], [ # 1600447-2 ], [ # 1600441-2 ], [ # 1600382-2 ], [ # 1600328-2 ], [ # 1600166-2 ], [ # 1600088-2 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] [Entered: 03/09/2016 03:28 PM]
March 8, 2016 NOTICE [1602853] filed by State of New Jersey to substitute attorney Robert J. Kinney substituted by John R. Renella [Service Date: 03/08/2016 ] [15-1363] (Kelly, Matthew) [Entered: 03/08/2016 11:29 AM]
March 1, 2016 REPLY [1601719] filed by Energy & Environment Legal Institute to response [ # 1600731-2 ] [Service Date: 03/01/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1398] (Mandelbaum, Chaim) [Entered: 03/01/2016 06:26 PM]
March 1, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1601694] filed by Mary Jo woods on behalf of Petitioner State of Mississippi in 15-1409. [15-1409, 15-1363] (Woods, Mary) [Entered: 03/01/2016 04:19 PM]
February 26, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1601101] filed by Dominic E. Draye and co-counsel Keith J. Miller on behalf of Petitioner Arizona Corporation Commission in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Miller, Keith) [Entered: 02/26/2016 02:49 PM]
February 25, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1600721] filed by Eric G. Hostetler and co-counsel Jon M. Lipshultz on behalf of Respondents EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363, Respondent EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, Respondents EPA and Gina McCarthy in 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1464, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1472, 15-1488, 15-1470. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Lipshultz, Jon) [Entered: 02/25/2016 09:37 AM]
February 25, 2016 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1600731] filed by EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1398 to motion for leave to file [ # 1599886-2 ] [Service Date: 02/25/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1363, 15-1398] (Lipshultz, Jon) [Entered: 02/25/2016 10:13 AM]
February 23, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1600327] filed by Former State Public Utility Commissioners to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 02/23/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Gifford, Raymond) [Entered: 02/23/2016 02:04 PM]
February 23, 2016 MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--AMICUS FOR PETITIONER BRIEF [1600328] filed by Former State Public Utility Commissioners. [Service Date: 02/23/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6,908 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 02/23/2016 by JJA] (Gifford, Raymond) [Entered: 02/23/2016 02:11 PM]
February 23, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--AMICUS FOR PETITIONER BRIEF [1600275] filed by Pedernales Electric Cooperative, Inc. [Service Date: 02/23/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6,592 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 03/22/2016 by LMC] (Cosson, David) [Entered: 02/23/2016 11:22 AM]
February 23, 2016 AMICUS FOR PETITIONER BRIEF [1600213] filed by Municipal Electric Authority of Georgia in 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1464, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1472, 15-1488, 15-1470 [Service Date: 02/23/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6,739 Words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Simon, Jennifer) [Entered: 02/23/2016 08:44 AM]
February 23, 2016 AMICUS FOR PETITIONER BRIEF [1600382] filed by 60Plus Association and Hispanic Leadership Fund in 15-1363 60Plus Association, Federalism in Action, Hispanic Leadership Fund, Independent Womens Forum, National Taxpayers Union, and Taxpayers Protection Alliance [Service Date: 02/23/2016 ] Length of Brief: 3,521 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Cecere, Joseph) [Entered: 02/23/2016 04:09 PM]
February 23, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--NOTICE [1600246] filed by Members of Congress of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 02/23/2016 ] [15-1363]--[Edited 02/23/2016 by JJA] (Haden, Ed) [Entered: 02/23/2016 10:13 AM]
February 23, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--AMICUS FOR PETITIONER BRIEF [1600258] filed by Members of Congress [Service Date: 02/23/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6,100 Words. [15-1363]--[Edited 03/22/2016 by LMC] (Haden, Ed) [Entered: 02/23/2016 10:24 AM]
February 23, 2016 INTERVENOR FOR PETITIONER BRIEF [1600380] filed by Dixon Bros., Inc., Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition, Joy Global Inc., Nelson Brothers, Inc., Norfolk Southern Corporation, Peabody Energy Corporation and Wesco International, Inc. [Service Date: 02/23/2016 ] Length of Brief: 9,995 words. [15-1363] (Duncan, Tristan) [Entered: 02/23/2016 03:57 PM]
February 23, 2016 MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--AMICUS FOR PETITIONER BRIEF [1600447] filed by 166 State and Local Business Associations [Service Date: 02/23/2016 ] Length of Brief: 5041. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Consovoy, William) [Entered: 02/23/2016 07:52 PM]
February 23, 2016 AMICUS FOR PETITIONER BRIEF [1600421] filed by Loggers Association of Northern California, Merit Oil Company, Morning Star Packing Company, Pacific Legal Foundation and Texas Public Policy Foundation in 15-1363, Norman R. Brown, Loggers Association of Northern California, Merit Oil Company, Morning Star Packing Company, Pacific Legal Foundation and Texas Public Policy Foundation in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1464, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1472, 15-1488, 15-1470 [Service Date: 02/23/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6,693 Words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Hadzi-Antich, Theodore) [Entered: 02/23/2016 05:10 PM]
February 23, 2016 MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--AMICUS FOR PETITIONER BRIEF [1600450] filed by State of Nevada and Consumers' Research [Service Date: 02/23/2016 ] Length of Brief: 5,621 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Petrino, Michael) [Entered: 02/23/2016 11:02 PM]
February 23, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1600446] filed by 166 State and Local Business Associations to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 02/23/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Consovoy, William) [Entered: 02/23/2016 07:32 PM]
February 23, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1600448] filed by State of Nevada and Consumers' Research to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 02/23/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Petrino, Michael) [Entered: 02/23/2016 10:56 PM]
February 23, 2016 MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--AMICUS FOR PETITIONER BRIEF [1600441] filed by Landmark Legal Foundation [Service Date: 02/23/2016 ] Length of Brief: 3283 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Hutchison, Richard) [Entered: 02/23/2016 05:41 PM]
February 23, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1600435] filed by Landmark Legal Foundation to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Attached] [Service Date: 02/23/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Hutchison, Richard) [Entered: 02/23/2016 05:37 PM]
February 22, 2016 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1600017] filed by GenOn Mid-Atlantic, LLC, Indian River Power LLC, Louisiana Generating LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Chalk Point LLC, NRG Power Midwest LP, NRG Rema LLC, NRG Texas Power LLC, NRG Wholesale Generation LP and Vienna Power LLC in 15-1470 [Service Date: 02/22/2016 ] [15-1470, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Zidlicky, Paul) [Entered: 02/22/2016 01:18 PM]
February 22, 2016 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1600019] filed by GenOn Mid-Atlantic, LLC, Indian River Power LLC, Louisiana Generating LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Chalk Point LLC, NRG Power Midwest LP, NRG Rema LLC, NRG Texas Power LLC, NRG Wholesale Generation LP and Vienna Power LLC in 15-1470 [Service Date: 02/22/2016 ] [15-1470, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Zidlicky, Paul) [Entered: 02/22/2016 01:22 PM]
February 22, 2016 MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--SEPARATE STATUTORY ADDENDUM [1599968] filed by Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions, Klaus J. Christoph, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Samuel R. Damewood, Caterine C. Dellin, Independence Institute, Joseph W. Luquire, Lisa R. Markham, Patrick T. Peterson, Rio Grande Foundation, Kristi Rosenquist and Sutherland Institute in 15-1488 to Appellant/Petitioner briefs [ # 1599889-2 ] [159989-2] [Service Date:02/20/2016 ] [15-1488, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483] (Gustafson, Adam) [Entered: 02/22/2016 11:00 AM]
February 22, 2016 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1599915] filed by Denbury Onshore, LLC in 15-1475 [Service Date: 02/22/2016 ] [15-1475, 15-1363] (Stetson, Catherine) [Entered: 02/22/2016 09:21 AM]
February 22, 2016 STATEMENT [1600022] filed by GenOn Mid-Atlantic, LLC, Indian River Power LLC, Louisiana Generating LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Chalk Point LLC, NRG Power Midwest LP, NRG Rema LLC, NRG Texas Power LLC, NRG Wholesale Generation LP and Vienna Power LLC in 15-1470 with Disclosure Listing [Service Date: 02/22/2016 ] [15-1470, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Zidlicky, Paul) [Entered: 02/22/2016 01:25 PM]
February 22, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1599913] filed by THE 60PLUS ASSOCIATION, THE HISPANIC LEADERSHIP FUND, AND THE NATIONAL BLACK CHAMBER OF COMMERCE to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 02/22/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 02/22/2016 by JJA] (Cecere, Joseph) [Entered: 02/22/2016 09:07 AM]
February 22, 2016 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1599916] filed by Denbury Onshore, LLC in 15-1475 [Service Date: 02/22/2016 ] [15-1475, 15-1363] (Stetson, Catherine) [Entered: 02/22/2016 09:22 AM]
February 22, 2016 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1600154] filed by Local Government Coalition for Renewable Energy [Service Date: 02/22/2016 ] [15-1483] (DuBoff, Scott) [Entered: 02/22/2016 05:15 PM]
February 22, 2016 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1600184] filed by Minnesota Power in 15-1474 [Service Date: 02/22/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1474] (Tenpas, Ronald) [Entered: 02/22/2016 08:00 PM]
February 22, 2016 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1600185] filed by Minnesota Power in 15-1474 [Service Date: 02/22/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1474] (Tenpas, Ronald) [Entered: 02/22/2016 08:05 PM]
February 22, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--AMICUS FOR PETITIONER BRIEF [1600088] filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation [Service Date: 02/22/2016 ] Length of Brief: Word Count Certification for Amicus Brief is 2,182 words.. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 03/22/2016 by LMC] (Hermann, Kimberly) [Entered: 02/22/2016 02:51 PM]
February 22, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--AMICUS FOR PETITIONER BRIEF [1600166] filed by Joseph S. DAleo Dr. Harold H. Doiron Dr. Don J. Easterbrook Dr. Theodore R. Eck Dr. Gordon J. Fulks Dr. William M. Gray Dr. Craig D. Idso Dr. Richard A. Keen Dr. Anthony R. Lupo Dr. Thomas P. Sheahen Dr. S. Fred Singer Dr. James P. Wallace III Jim Wallac [Service Date: 02/22/2016 ] Length of Brief: 6968. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 03/22/2016 by LMC] (MacDougald, Harry) [Entered: 02/22/2016 05:31 PM]
February 22, 2016 MOTION [1600160] filed by Joseph S. DAleo Dr. Harold H. Doiron Dr. Don J. Easterbrook Dr. Theodore R. Eck Dr. Gordon J. Fulks Dr. William M. Gray Dr. Craig D. Idso Dr. Richard A. Keen Dr. Anthony R. Lupo Dr. Thomas P. Sheahen Dr. S. Fred Singer Dr. James P. Wallace III Jim Wallac to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 02/22/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (MacDougald, Harry) [Entered: 02/22/2016 05:23 PM]
February 22, 2016 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1600156] filed by Local Government Coalition for Renewable Energy [Service Date: 02/22/2016 ] [15-1483] (DuBoff, Scott) [Entered: 02/22/2016 05:17 PM]
February 20, 2016 MOTION [1599901] filed by Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions, Klaus J. Christoph, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Samuel R. Damewood, Caterine C. Dellin, Independence Institute, Joseph W. Luquire, Lisa R. Markham, Patrick T. Peterson, Rio Grande Foundation, Kristi Rosenquist and Sutherland Institute in 15-1488 for leave to file supplement (Response to Motion served by mail due on 03/04/2016) [Service Date: 02/20/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1488, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483] (Gustafson, Adam) [Entered: 02/20/2016 07:41 PM]
February 19, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1599833] filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 02/19/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 02/22/2016 by JJA] (Hermann, Kimberly) [Entered: 02/19/2016 03:34 PM]
February 19, 2016 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1599756] filed by Louisiana Public Service Commission in 15-1464 [Service Date: 02/19/2016 ] [15-1464, 15-1363] (Gibson, Monica) [Entered: 02/19/2016 01:08 PM]
February 19, 2016 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1599757] filed by Louisiana Public Service Commission in 15-1464 [Service Date: 02/19/2016 ] [15-1464, 15-1363] (Gibson, Monica) [Entered: 02/19/2016 01:10 PM]
February 19, 2016 MOTION [1599886] filed by Energy & Environment Legal Institute for leave to file brief (Response to Motion served by mail due on 03/03/2016) [Service Date: 02/19/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1398] (Mandelbaum, Chaim) [Entered: 02/19/2016 06:28 PM]
February 19, 2016 [DENIED BY PER CURIAM ORDER ON 3/21/16]- SUPPLEMENT [1599887] to Appellant/Petitioner brief [ # 1599898-2 ], Appellant/Petitioner brief [ # 1599889-2 ] LODGED by Energy & Environment Legal Institute [Service Date: 02/19/2016 ] [15-1398]--[Edited 02/25/2016 by LMC] (Mandelbaum, Chaim) [Entered: 02/19/2016 06:31 PM]
February 19, 2016 JOINT PETITIONER BRIEF [1599898] on procedural and record-based issues filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 15-1363, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 15-1365, Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366, American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372, Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374, United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375, Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc., Western Farmers Electric Cooperative and Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1376, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, Association of American Railroads in 15-1383, National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379, State of North Dakota in 15-1380, Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality, Mississippi Public Service Commission and State of Mississippi in 15-1409, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 15-1410, Entergy Corporation in 15-1413, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418, West Virginia Coal Association in 15-1422, Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC and Newmont USA Limited in 15-1432, The Kansas City Board of Public Utilities-- Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, Kansas in 15-1442, Coteau Properties Company, Coyote Creek Mining Company, Falkirk Mining Company, Mississippi Lignite Mining Company, NODAK Energy Services, LLC, North American Coal Royalty Company, Otter Creek Mining Company, LLC, Sabine Mining Company and The North American Coal Corporation in 15-1451, Indiana Utility Group in 15-1459, Energy-Intensive Manufacturers' Working Group on Greenhouse Gas Regulation in 15-1477, Local Government Coalition for Renewable Energy in 15-1483, Louisiana Public Service Commission in 15-1464, Minnesota Power in 15-1474, Denbury Onshore, LLC in 15-1475, Prairie State Generating Company LLC in 15-1472, Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions, Klaus J. Christoph, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Samuel R. Damewood, Caterine C. Dellin, Independence Institute, Joseph W. Luquire, Lisa R. Markham, Patrick T. Peterson, Rio Grande Foundation, Kristi Rosenquist and Sutherland Institute in 15-1488, GenOn Mid-Atlantic, LLC, Indian River Power LLC, Louisiana Generating LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Chalk Point LLC, NRG Power Midwest LP, NRG Rema LLC, NRG Texas Power LLC, NRG Wholesale Generation LP and Vienna Power LLC in 15-1470 [Service Date: 02/19/2016 ] Length of Brief: 19,723 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 02/26/2016 by JJA] (Lorenzen, Thomas) [Entered: 02/19/2016 11:41 PM]
February 19, 2016 JOINT PETITIONER BRIEF [1599889] on core legal issues filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 15-1363, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 15-1365, Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366, National Mining Association in 15-1367, American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372, Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374, United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375, Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc. and Western Farmers Electric Cooperative in 15-1376, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382, Association of American Railroads in 15-1383, National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379, State of North Dakota in 15-1380, Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393, Energy & Environment Legal Institute in 15-1398, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality, Mississippi Public Service Commission and State of Mississippi in 15-1409, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 15-1410, Entergy Corporation in 15-1413, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418, West Virginia Coal Association in 15-1422, Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC and Newmont USA Limited in 15-1432, The Kansas City Board of Public Utilities-- Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, Kansas in 15-1442, Coteau Properties Company, Coyote Creek Mining Company, Falkirk Mining Company, Mississippi Lignite Mining Company, NODAK Energy Services, LLC, North American Coal Royalty Company, Otter Creek Mining Company, LLC, Sabine Mining Company and The North American Coal Corporation in 15-1451, Indiana Utility Group in 15-1459, Energy-Intensive Manufacturers' Working Group on Greenhouse Gas Regulation in 15-1477, Louisiana Public Service Commission in 15-1464, Minnesota Power in 15-1474, Denbury Onshore, LLC in 15-1475, Prairie State Generating Company LLC in 15-1472, Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions, Klaus J. Christoph, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Samuel R. Damewood, Caterine C. Dellin, Independence Institute, Joseph W. Luquire, Lisa R. Markham, Patrick T. Peterson, Rio Grande Foundation, Kristi Rosenquist and Sutherland Institute in 15-1488, GenOn Mid-Atlantic, LLC, Indian River Power LLC, Louisiana Generating LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Chalk Point LLC, NRG Power Midwest LP, NRG Rema LLC, NRG Texas Power LLC, NRG Wholesale Generation LP and Vienna Power LLC in 15-1470 [Service Date: 02/19/2016 ] Length of Brief: 21,745 words. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1488]--[Edited 02/26/2016 by JJA] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 02/19/2016 06:45 PM]
February 18, 2016 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--MOTION [1599368] filed by American Sustainable Business Council and the South Carolina Small Business Chamber of Commerce to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 01/29/2016 ] [15-1363]--[Edited 02/18/2016 by JJA] (Harvey, Stephen) [Entered: 02/18/2016 11:22 AM]
February 18, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1599359] filed by American Sustaible Buisness Council and The South Carolina Small Business Chamber of Commerce to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Previously Filed] [Service Date: 01/29/2016 ] [15-1363]--[Edited 02/18/2016 by JJA]--[Edited 02/18/2016 by JJA] (Harvey, Stephen) [Entered: 02/18/2016 11:03 AM]
February 12, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1598610] filed granting motion to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1597552-2 ], granting motion to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1597462-2 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] [Entered: 02/12/2016 09:42 AM]
February 5, 2016 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1597390] filed by Energy-Intensive Manufacturers' Working Group on Greenhouse Gas Regulation in 15-1477 [Service Date: 02/05/2016 ] [15-1477, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1483, 15-1488] (McMackin, John) [Entered: 02/05/2016 10:43 AM]
February 5, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1597462] filed by Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 02/05/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 02/08/2016 by JJA] (Hadzi-Antich, Theodore) [Entered: 02/05/2016 12:47 PM]
February 5, 2016 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1597393] filed by Energy-Intensive Manufacturers' Working Group on Greenhouse Gas Regulation in 15-1477 [Service Date: 02/05/2016 ] [15-1477, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1483, 15-1488] (McMackin, John) [Entered: 02/05/2016 10:45 AM]
February 5, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1597552] filed by Service Employees International Union to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 02/05/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 02/08/2016 by JJA] (Gerni, Renee) [Entered: 02/05/2016 03:54 PM]
February 2, 2016 NOTICE [1596721] filed by State of Washington to substitute attorney Leslie R. Seffern substituted by Katharine G. Shirey [Service Date: 02/02/2016 ] [15-1363] (Shirey, Katharine) [Entered: 02/02/2016 01:42 PM]
February 1, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1596496] filed granting motion of Pedernales Electric Cooperative, Inc., to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1591712-2 ] in 15-1376 [15-1363, 15-1376] [Entered: 02/01/2016 03:24 PM]
January 28, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1595857] filed granting motion to amend [ # 1589170-2 ] in 15-1451 [15-1451, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Accursio, John) [Entered: 01/28/2016 01:41 PM]
January 28, 2016 PER CURIAM ORDER [1595922] filed that the following briefing format [ # 1595470-2 ] and schedule will apply in these consolidated cases: PETITIONER Briefs (no more than two briefs, not to exceed a combined total of 42,000 words) due 02/19/2016. Joint Brief for INTERVENOR FOR PETITIONER (not to exceed 10,000 words) due 02/23/2016. AMICUS FOR PETITIONER Brief(s) (each brief not to exceed the word limit set forth in F.R.A.P. 29(d)) due 02/23/2016. RESPONDENT Brief (not to exceed 42,000 words) due on 03/28/2016. Briefs for INTERVENOR FOR RESPONDENT (no more than four briefs, not to exceed a combined total of 20,000 words) due 03/29/2016. Brief(s) for AMICUS FOR RESPONDENT (each brief not to exceed the word limit set forth in F.R.A.P. 29(d)) due 04/01/2016. Reply Briefs for PETITIONER (no more than two briefs, not to exceed a combined total of 21,000 words) due 04/15/2016. Joint Reply Brief for INTERVENORS FOR PETITIONER (not to exceed 5,000 words) due 04/15/2016. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 04/18/2016. Final Briefs due 04/22/2016. Before Judges: Henderson, Rogers and Srinivasan. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] [Entered: 01/28/2016 03:36 PM]
January 27, 2016 AMENDED STATEMENT [1595446] filed by San Miguel Electric Cooperative and South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc. with Disclosure Listing [Service Date: 01/27/2016 ] [15-1376] (Lorenzen, Thomas) [Entered: 01/27/2016 10:05 AM]
January 27, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1595431] filed granting motion of American Thoracic Society, et al., to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1594036-2 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] [Entered: 01/27/2016 09:19 AM]
January 27, 2016 RESPONSE [1595474] filed by EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1464, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1472, 15-1488, 15-1470 to order [ # 1594951-2 ],[ # 1594951-4 ],[ # 1594951-3 ] [Service Date: 01/27/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 21-30. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 01/27/2016 11:14 AM]
January 27, 2016 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1595470] filed by American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine, American College of Preventive Medicine, American Medical Association, American Thoracic Society, Baltimore, MD, Boulder County, CO, Coral Gables, FL, Grand Rapids, MI, Houston, TX, Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law, Jersey City, NJ, Los Angeles, CA, Minneapolis, MN, National League of Cities, Pinecrest, FL, Portland, OR, Providence, RI, William K. Reilly, William D. Ruckelshaus, Salt Lake City, UT, San Francisco, CA, United States Conference of Mayors and West Palm Beach, FL concerning briefing format. Pages: 16-20. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488]--[Edited 02/23/2016 by SA] (Fox, Sarah) [Entered: 01/27/2016 11:12 AM]
January 27, 2016 JOINT RESPONSE [1595492] filed by Dixon Bros., Inc., Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition, Joy Global Inc., Nelson Brothers, Inc., Norfolk Southern Corporation, Peabody Energy Corporation, Wesco International, Inc. and Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 15-1363, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 15-1365, Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366, National Mining Association in 15-1367, American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372, Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374, United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375, Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc., Western Farmers Electric Cooperative and Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1376, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382, Association of American Railroads in 15-1383, National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379, State of North Dakota in 15-1380, Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393, Energy & Environment Legal Institute in 15-1398, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality, Mississippi Public Service Commission and State of Mississippi in 15-1409, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 15-1410, Entergy Corporation in 15-1413, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418, West Virginia Coal Association in 15-1422, Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC and Newmont USA Limited in 15-1432, The Kansas City Board of Public Utilities-- Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, Kansas in 15-1442, The North American Coal Corporation in 15-1451, Indiana Utility Group in 15-1459, Energy-Intensive Manufacturers' Working Group on Greenhouse Gas Regulation in 15-1477, Minnesota Power in 15-1474, Denbury Onshore, LLC in 15-1475, Prairie State Generating Company LLC in 15-1472, Buckeye Institute for Public Policy Solutions, Klaus J. Christoph, Competitive Enterprise Institute, Samuel R. Damewood, Caterine C. Dellin, Independence Institute, Joseph W. Luquire, Lisa R. Markham, Patrick T. Peterson, Rio Grande Foundation, Kristi Rosenquist and Sutherland Institute in 15-1488, GenOn Mid-Atlantic, LLC, Indian River Power LLC, Louisiana Generating LLC, Midwest Generation, LLC, NRG Chalk Point LLC, NRG Power Midwest LP, NRG Rema LLC, NRG Texas Power LLC, NRG Wholesale Generation LP and Vienna Power LLC in 15-1470 to order [ # 1594951-2 ],[ # 1594951-4 ],[ # 1594951-3 ] [Service Date: 01/27/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1488] (Wood, Allison) [Entered: 01/27/2016 11:41 AM]
January 27, 2016 RESPONSE [1595503] filed by Louisiana Public Service Commission in 15-1464 to order [ # 1594951-2 ],[ # 1594951-4 ],[ # 1594951-3 ] [Service Date: 01/27/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1464, 15-1363] (Gibson, Monica) [Entered: 01/27/2016 12:01 PM]
January 27, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1595625] filed by Todd E. Palmer and co-counsel Valerie L. Green, William D. Booth on behalf of Petitioner Mississippi Public Service Commission in 15-1409. [15-1409, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Green, Valerie) [Entered: 01/27/2016 02:59 PM]
January 26, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1595410] filed by Steven B. Beaux Jones on behalf of Petitioner State of Louisiana. [15-1363] (Jones, Steven) [Entered: 01/26/2016 05:34 PM]
January 25, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1595298] filed by Ronald J. Tenpas on behalf of Petitioner Minnesota Power in 15-1474. [15-1474, 15-1363] (Tenpas, Ronald) [Entered: 01/25/2016 02:09 PM]
January 25, 2016 NOTICE [1595344] filed by Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371 to substitute attorney Karl Roy Moor substituted by Stacey Turner [Service Date: 01/25/2016 ] [15-1371, 15-1363] (Moore, C.) [Entered: 01/25/2016 06:18 PM]
January 22, 2016 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1595108] filed by Dixon Bros., Inc., Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition, Joy Global Inc., Nelson Brothers, Inc., Norfolk Southern Corporation, Peabody Energy Corporation and Wesco International, Inc. [Service Date: 01/22/2016 ] [15-1363] (Duncan, Tristan) [Entered: 01/22/2016 11:09 AM]
January 22, 2016 CORRECTED STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1595155] filed by Dixon Bros., Inc., Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition, Joy Global Inc., Nelson Brothers, Inc., Norfolk Southern Corporation, Peabody Energy Corporation and Wesco International, Inc. [Service Date: 01/22/2016 ] [15-1363] (Duncan, Tristan) [Entered: 01/22/2016 01:03 PM]
January 21, 2016 PER CURIAM ORDER [1594951] filed that the motions for stay be denied. FURTHER ORDERED that consideration of these appeals be expedited. FURTHER ORDERED that the motion in No. 15-1418 to sever certain issues and hold them in abeyance be denied. FURTHER ORDERED that by noon on January 27, 2016, the parties submit a proposed format for the briefing of all the issues in these cases, as well as a proposed schedule that ensures that all initial briefs are filed by April 15, 2016, the deferred appendix is filed by April 18, 2016, and the final briefs are filed by April 22, 2016. The parties are reminded that the court looks with extreme disfavor on repetitious submissions, and the parties are encouraged to limit both the number and size of the briefs they propose to file. FURTHER ORDERED that oral argument be scheduled before this panel on June 2, 2016, commencing at 9:30 a.m. The parties should also reserve June 3 in the event argument cannot be concluded on June 2nd. The parties are directed to hand-deliver the paper copies of their submission to the court by the time and date due. Before Judges: Henderson, Rogers and Srinivasan. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488] (Accursio, John) [Entered: 01/21/2016 03:40 PM]
January 21, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1594799] filed consolidating cases 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1472, 15-1488, 15-1470, 15-1464 (Consolidation started 01/21/2016) with 15-1363; directing party to file in 15-1364, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1488 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 02/22/2016. PETITIONER statement of issues due 02/22/2016 [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1478, 15-1479, 15-1483, 15-1485, 15-1488] (Accursio, John) [Entered: 01/21/2016 11:16 AM]
January 19, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1594152] filed by David M. Flannery and co-counsel Kathy G. Becket, Skipp L. Kropp, Stephen L. Miller on behalf of Petitioner Indiana Utility Group. [15-1459] (Flannery, David) [Entered: 01/19/2016 11:20 AM]
January 19, 2016 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1594149] filed by Indiana Utility Group [Service Date: 01/19/2016 ] [15-1459] (Flannery, David) [Entered: 01/19/2016 11:16 AM]
January 19, 2016 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1594147] filed by Indiana Utility Group [Service Date: 01/19/2016 ] [15-1459] (Flannery, David) [Entered: 01/19/2016 11:14 AM]
January 19, 2016 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1594153] to notice [ # 1594152-2 ], statement [ # 1594149-2 ] filed by Indiana Utility Group. [15-1459] (Flannery, David) [Entered: 01/19/2016 11:23 AM]
January 19, 2016 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT [1594342] filed by EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1479, 15-1478, EPA in 15-1485 to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1591586-2 ], motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1591757-2 ], motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1592944-2 ], motion to sever issue [ # 1592944-3 ], motion for other relief [ # 1592944-4 ] [Service Date: 01/19/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1479, 15-1478, 15-1485] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 01/19/2016 03:13 PM]
January 19, 2016 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1594442] filed by American Lung Association, American Wind Energy Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council, Nextera Energy, Inc., Ohio Environmental Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club and Solar Energy Industries Association in 15-1363 to motion to sever issue [ # 1589612-2 ], motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1589612-3 ] [Service Date: 01/19/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1418, 15-1363] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 01/19/2016 08:53 PM]
January 19, 2016 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1594331] filed by EPA in 15-1418 to motion to sever issue [ # 1589612-2 ], motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1589612-3 ] [Service Date: 01/19/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1418, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1478, 15-1479, 15-1483, 15-1485, 15-1488] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 01/19/2016 03:00 PM]
January 19, 2016 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1594443] filed by American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council and Sierra Club in 15-1363 to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1592944-2 ], motion to sever issue [ # 1592944-3 ], motion for other relief [ # 1592944-4 ], motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1591757-2 ], motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 1591586-2 ] [Service Date: 01/19/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1478, 15-1363, 15-1479, 15-1485] (Duffy, James) [Entered: 01/19/2016 09:36 PM]
January 15, 2016 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1593823] filed by The North American Coal Corporation in 15-1451 [Service Date: 01/15/2016 ] [15-1451, 15-1363] (Fortson, Alina) [Entered: 01/15/2016 11:08 AM]
January 15, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1594036] filed by the American Thoracic Society, the American Medical Association, the American College of Preventive Medicine, and the American College of Occupational and Environmental Medicine to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 01/15/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1478, 15-1479, 15-1483, 15-1485, 15-1488]--[Edited 01/19/2016 by JJA] (Fox, Sarah) [Entered: 01/15/2016 04:58 PM]
January 14, 2016 NOTICE [1593687] filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky to withdraw attorney John William Conway who represented Commonwealth of Kentucky in 15-1363 [Service Date: 01/14/2016 ] [15-1363] (Dutton, Gregory) [Entered: 01/14/2016 03:56 PM]
January 13, 2016 NOTICE [1593217] filed by CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372 to substitute attorney Robert A. Manning; Joseph A. Brown substituted by James S. Alves [Service Date: 01/13/2016 ] [15-1372, 15-1363] (Alves, James) [Entered: 01/13/2016 09:54 AM]
January 13, 2016 NOTICE [1593218] filed by Gulf Power Company in 15-1371 to substitute attorney Robert A. Manning; Gary V. Perko substituted by James S. Alves [Service Date: 01/13/2016 ] [15-1371, 15-1363] (Alves, James) [Entered: 01/13/2016 10:02 AM]
January 13, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1593390] filed by Vera P. Pardee and co-counsel Kevin P. Bundy on behalf of Intervenor for Respondent Center for Biological Diversity in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1478, 15-1479, 15-1483, 15-1485, 15-1488] (Bundy, Kevin) [Entered: 01/13/2016 03:26 PM]
January 13, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1593397] filed by Douglas E. Cloud and co-counsel Jennifer A. Simon on behalf of Movant-Amicus Curiae for Petitioner Municipal Electric Authority of Georgia in 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1477, 15-1483, 15-1464, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1472, 15-1478, 15-1485, 15-1479, 15-1488, 15-1470. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1478, 15-1479, 15-1483, 15-1485, 15-1488] (Simon, Jennifer) [Entered: 01/13/2016 03:48 PM]
January 13, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1593404] filed granting motion to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1592854-2 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1478, 15-1479, 15-1483, 15-1485, 15-1488] [Entered: 01/13/2016 04:02 PM]
January 12, 2016 RELIEF ADDED--MOTION [1592944] filed by National Alliance of Forest Owners to forego consolidation or sever issue, and to hold case in abeyance (Response to Motion served by mail due on 01/25/2016) [Service Date: 01/12/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [15-1478]--[Edited 01/12/2016 by LMC] (Webster, Timothy) [Entered: 01/12/2016 09:14 AM]
January 12, 2016 NOTICE [1593148] filed by State of Vermont in 15-1363 to substitute attorney Thea Schwartz substituted by Nicholas F. Persampieri [Service Date: 01/12/2015 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1478, 15-1479, 15-1483, 15-1485, 15-1488] (Persampieri, Nicholas) [Entered: 01/12/2016 05:35 PM]
January 11, 2016 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1592733] filed by The Kansas City Board of Public Utilities-- Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, Kansas in 15-1442 [Service Date: 01/11/2016 ] [15-1442, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1478, 15-1479, 15-1483, 15-1485, 15-1488] (Lane, Dennis) [Entered: 01/11/2016 10:35 AM]
January 11, 2016 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1592735] filed by The Kansas City Board of Public Utilities-- Unified Government of Wyandotte County/Kansas City, Kansas in 15-1442 [Service Date: 01/11/2016 ] [15-1442, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1478, 15-1479, 15-1483, 15-1485, 15-1488] (Lane, Dennis) [Entered: 01/11/2016 10:37 AM]
January 11, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1592788] filed granting motion to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1589943-2 ] in 15-1363, et al. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1478, 15-1479, 15-1483, 15-1485, 15-1488] [Entered: 01/11/2016 12:43 PM]
January 11, 2016 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1592854] filed by Municipal Electric Authority of Georgia to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 01/11/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1478, 15-1479, 15-1483, 15-1485, 15-1488]--[Edited 01/13/2016 by JJA] (Simon, Jennifer) [Entered: 01/11/2016 03:15 PM]
January 11, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1592885] filed granting motions for leave to intervene [ # 1589622-2 ] [ # 1587303-2 ] [ # 1585197-2 ] [ # 1584767-2 ] [ # 1582209-2 ] [ # 1582177-2 ] [ # 1581816-2 ] [ # 1581814-2 ] [ # 1581284-2 ] [ # 1580761-2 ] [ # 1580219-2 ] [ # 1580130-2 ] [ # 1580023-2 ]. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459] [Entered: 01/11/2016 04:36 PM]
January 7, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1592282] filed by J. Andrew Hirth on behalf of Petitioner State of Missouri in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1478, 15-1479, 15-1483, 15-1485, 15-1488] (Hirth, John) [Entered: 01/07/2016 12:06 PM]
January 6, 2016 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged supplemental declaration [ # 1582297-2 ] is filed. [15-1363, 15-1378] [Entered: 01/06/2016 02:56 PM]
January 6, 2016 CLERK'S ORDER [1592082] granting motion for leave to file a supplemental declaration [ # 1582215-2 ]. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1478, 15-1479, 15-1483, 15-1485, 15-1488] [Entered: 01/06/2016 02:53 PM]
January 5, 2016 MOTION [1591757] filed by American Forest & Paper Association, Inc. and American Wood Council to hold case in abeyance (Response to Motion served by mail due on 01/19/2016) [Service Date: 01/05/2016 by US Mail] Pages: 1-10. [15-1485]--[Edited 01/05/2016 by SHA] (Frye, Russell) [Entered: 01/05/2016 08:42 AM]
January 4, 2016 MOTION [1591586] filed by Biogenic CO2 Coalition to hold case in abeyance (Response to Motion served by mail due on 01/19/2016) [Service Date: 01/04/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1479]--[Edited 01/05/2016 by MLG] (Williamson, David) [Entered: 01/04/2016 12:05 PM]
January 4, 2016 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1591632] filed by Jonathan Skinner-Thompson (in addition to previously entered counsel) on behalf of Respondents EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1478, 15-1479, 15-1483, 15-1485, 15-1488] (Skinner-Thompson, Jonathan) [Entered: 01/04/2016 01:20 PM]
January 4, 2016 NOTICE [1591589] filed by State of Wyoming in 15-1363 to change party information [Service Date: 01/04/2016 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1464, 15-1470, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1478, 15-1479, 15-1483, 15-1485, 15-1488] (Petersen, Erik) [Entered: 01/04/2016 12:08 PM]
January 4, 2016 MOTION [1591712] filed by Pedernales Electric Cooperative, Inc. to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 01/04/2016 ] [15-1376] (Cosson, David) [Entered: 01/04/2016 04:17 PM]
December 31, 2015 JOINT REPLY [1591397] filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 15-1363, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364, State of North Dakota in 15-1380, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality in 15-1409 to response [ # 1589896-2 ], [ # 1589874-2 ], [ # 1589819-2 ] [Service Date: 12/31/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1380, 15-1409] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 12/31/2015 11:21 AM]
December 31, 2015 JOINT REPLY [1591448] filed by International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 15-1365, Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366, National Mining Association in 15-1367, American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372, Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374, United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375, Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc., Western Farmers Electric Cooperative and Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1376, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382, Association of American Railroads in 15-1383, National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379, Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393, Energy & Environment Legal Institute in 15-1398, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 15-1410, Entergy Corporation in 15-1413, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418, Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC and Newmont USA Limited in 15-1432 to response [ # 1589819-2 ], [ # 1589874-2 ], [ # 1589896-2 ] [Service Date: 12/13/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1432] (Wood, Allison) [Entered: 12/31/2015 01:58 PM]
December 24, 2015 CERTIFIED COPY [1590588] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1590586-2 ] [15-1488] [Entered: 12/24/2015 10:57 AM]
December 24, 2015 CERTIFIED COPY [1590551] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1590545-2 ] [15-1479] [Entered: 12/24/2015 09:51 AM]
December 23, 2015 JOINT REPLY [1590337] filed by International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 15-1365, Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366, National Mining Association in 15-1367, American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372, Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374, United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375, Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc., Western Farmers Electric Cooperative and Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1376, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382, Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393, Energy & Environment Legal Institute in 15-1398 to response [ # 1587490-2 ], [ # 1587482-2 ], [ # 1587450-2 ], [ # 1587423-2 ], [ # 1586661-2 ] [Service Date: 12/23/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 21-30. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483] (Keisler, Peter) [Entered: 12/23/2015 01:07 PM]
December 23, 2015 CERTIFIED COPY [1590315] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1590308-2 ] [15-1475] [Entered: 12/23/2015 12:07 PM]
December 23, 2015 UNOPPOSED MOTION [1590272] filed by EPA to extend time to file response to 01/19/2016. [Service Date: 12/23/2015 ] Pages: 1-10. [15-1418] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 12/23/2015 11:10 AM]
December 23, 2015 REPLY [1590357] filed by Peabody Energy Corporation in 15-1363 to response [ # 1586661-2 ], [ # 1587423-2 ], [ # 1587450-2 ], [ # 1587482-2 ], [ # 1587490-2 ] [Service Date: 12/23/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1483] (Duncan, Tristan) [Entered: 12/23/2015 01:36 PM]
December 23, 2015 JOINT REPLY [1590286] filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 15-1363, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364, State of North Dakota in 15-1380, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality in 15-1409 to response [ # 1586661-2 ], [ # 1587423-2 ], [ # 1587450-2 ], [ # 1587482-2 ], [ # 1587490-2 ] [Service Date: 12/23/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 21-30. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1380, 15-1409] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 12/23/2015 11:33 AM]
December 23, 2015 MODIFIED DOCKET TEXT--SUPPLEMENT [1590457] to reply [ # 1590337-2 ] filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 15-1382 to response [ # 1587490-2 ], [ # 1587482-2 ], [ # 1587450-2 ], [ # 1587423-2 ], [ # 1586661-2 ] [Service Date: 12/23/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459, 15-1472, 15-1474, 15-1475, 15-1477, 15-1478, 15-1483] --[Edited 12/23/2015 by KRM] (Keisler, Peter) [Entered: 12/23/2015 03:59 PM]
December 23, 2015 CERTIFIED COPY [1590414] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1590411-2 ] [15-1472] [Entered: 12/23/2015 02:53 PM]
December 23, 2015 CERTIFIED COPY [1590446] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1590435-2 ] [15-1478] [Entered: 12/23/2015 03:34 PM]
December 22, 2015 AMENDED PETITION [1590118] filed by Petitioner Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality Review of EPA Final Rule - Amended Petition. [Service Date: 12/22/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1409] (Hodges, Donna) [Entered: 12/22/2015 03:28 PM]
December 22, 2015 MOTION [1589943] filed by NATIONAL LEAGUE OF CITIES; U.S. CONFERENCE OF MAYORS; BALTIMORE, MD; CORAL GABLES, FL; GRAND RAPIDS, MI; HOUSTON, TX; JERSEY CITY, NJ; LOS ANGELES, CA; MINNEAPOLIS, MN; PINECREST, FL; PORTLAND, OR; PROVIDENCE, RI; SALT LAKE CITY, UT; SAN FRANCISCO, CA to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 12/22/2015 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459] (Burger, Michael) [Entered: 12/22/2015 09:32 AM]
December 22, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1590124] filed by Jack Conway and co-counsel Gregory T. Dutton on behalf of Petitioner Commonwealth of Kentucky. [15-1363] (Dutton, Gregory) [Entered: 12/22/2015 03:39 PM]
December 22, 2015 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1590150] filed by Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC and Newmont USA Limited in 15-1432 [Service Date: 12/22/2015 ] [15-1363, 15-1432] (Emrich, Andrew) [Entered: 12/22/2015 04:20 PM]
December 22, 2015 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1590149] filed by Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC and Newmont USA Limited in 15-1432 [Service Date: 12/22/2015 ] [15-1363, 15-1432] (Emrich, Andrew) [Entered: 12/22/2015 04:17 PM]
December 22, 2015 FIRST CLASS MAIL RETURNED [1590206] marked "Return To Sender - Insufficient Address - Unable To Forward". Mail had been sent to Attorney Bill Spears for Petitioner Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc.. [15-1376] [Entered: 12/23/2015 08:59 AM]
December 21, 2015 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1589819] filed by EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459 to motion concerning briefing format [ # 1587531-2 ], motion to expedite case [ # 1587531-3 ] [Service Date: 12/21/2015 by US Mail, Email, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459] (Rave, Norman) [Entered: 12/21/2015 03:37 PM]
December 21, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1589836] filed by Misha Tseytlin and co-counsel Brad D. Schimel Andrew Cook Delanie Breuer on behalf of Petitioner State of Wisconsin in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459] (Tseytlin, Misha) [Entered: 12/21/2015 03:50 PM]
December 21, 2015 CERTIFIED INDEX TO RECORD [1589852] filed by EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459 [Service Date: 12/21/2015 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459] (Rave, Norman) [Entered: 12/21/2015 04:11 PM]
December 21, 2015 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1589874] filed by Advanced Energy Economy, American Lung Association, American Wind Energy Association, Broward County, Florida, Center for Biological Diversity, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, Conservation Law Foundation, DC, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club, Solar Energy Industries Association, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363 to motion concerning briefing format [ # 1587531-2 ], motion to expedite case [ # 1587531-3 ] [Service Date: 12/21/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 12/21/2015 07:02 PM]
December 21, 2015 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1589896] filed by Calpine Corporation, City of Austin, City of Los Angeles, Department of Water and Power, City of Seattle, National Grid Generation, LLC, Nextera Energy, Inc. and Pacific Gas and Electric Company in 15-1363, New York Power Authority, Sacramento Municipal Utility District and Southern California Edison Company in 15-1409 to motion concerning briefing format [ # 1587531-2 ], motion to expedite case [ # 1587531-3 ] [Service Date: 12/21/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 12/21/2015 08:29 PM]
December 18, 2015 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589506] filed by CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1372, 15-1363] (Manning, Robert) [Entered: 12/18/2015 03:16 PM]
December 18, 2015 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1589508] filed by American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1368, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459] (Holmstead, Jeffrey) [Entered: 12/18/2015 03:17 PM]
December 18, 2015 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1589510] filed by CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1372, 15-1363] (Manning, Robert) [Entered: 12/18/2015 03:18 PM]
December 18, 2015 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589505] filed by American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1368, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459] (Holmstead, Jeffrey) [Entered: 12/18/2015 03:15 PM]
December 18, 2015 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1589457] filed by American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1382, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459] (Keisler, Peter) [Entered: 12/18/2015 01:51 PM]
December 18, 2015 STATEMENT [1589452] filed by American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382 with Disclosure Listing [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1382, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459] (Keisler, Peter) [Entered: 12/18/2015 01:42 PM]
December 18, 2015 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589511] filed by Entergy Corporation in 15-1413 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1413, 15-1363] (Berge, Megan) [Entered: 12/18/2015 03:18 PM]
December 18, 2015 CORRECTED DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589493] filed by Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1409] (Hodges, Donna) [Entered: 12/18/2015 02:47 PM]
December 18, 2015 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1589516] filed by Entergy Corporation in 15-1413 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1413, 15-1363] (Berge, Megan) [Entered: 12/18/2015 03:21 PM]
December 18, 2015 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1589527] filed by Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1363, 15-1393] (Gomez, Christina) [Entered: 12/18/2015 03:25 PM]
December 18, 2015 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589528] filed by NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1378, 15-1363] (Berge, Megan) [Entered: 12/18/2015 03:26 PM]
December 18, 2015 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589523] filed by Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1363, 15-1393] (Gomez, Christina) [Entered: 12/18/2015 03:24 PM]
December 18, 2015 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1589522] filed by National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1379, 15-1363] (Berge, Megan) [Entered: 12/18/2015 03:24 PM]
December 18, 2015 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589448] filed by American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1382, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459] (Keisler, Peter) [Entered: 12/18/2015 01:33 PM]
December 18, 2015 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589519] filed by National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1379, 15-1363] (Berge, Megan) [Entered: 12/18/2015 03:23 PM]
December 18, 2015 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589512] filed by Murray Energy Corporation [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1366] (Barnes, Geoffrey) [Entered: 12/18/2015 03:19 PM]
December 18, 2015 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1589304] filed by Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1364, 15-1363] (Rivkin, David) [Entered: 12/18/2015 09:40 AM]
December 18, 2015 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589303] filed by Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1364, 15-1363] (Rivkin, David) [Entered: 12/18/2015 09:39 AM]
December 18, 2015 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1589531] filed by NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1378, 15-1363] (Berge, Megan) [Entered: 12/18/2015 03:27 PM]
December 18, 2015 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589296] filed by United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1375, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459] (Trisko, Eugene) [Entered: 12/18/2015 09:08 AM]
December 18, 2015 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1589292] filed by United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1375, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459] (Trisko, Eugene) [Entered: 12/18/2015 09:03 AM]
December 18, 2015 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1589290] filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 15-1410 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1410, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459] (Trisko, Eugene) [Entered: 12/18/2015 08:55 AM]
December 18, 2015 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589291] filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 15-1410 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1410, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459] (Trisko, Eugene) [Entered: 12/18/2015 08:58 AM]
December 18, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER [1589385] filed granting motion to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1589260-2 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459] [Entered: 12/18/2015 11:09 AM]
December 18, 2015 JOINT DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589415] filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1363] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 12/18/2015 11:53 AM]
December 18, 2015 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1589433] filed by National Mining Association in 15-1367 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1367, 15-1363] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 12/18/2015 12:32 PM]
December 18, 2015 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589444] filed by Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc. and Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1376] (Lorenzen, Thomas) [Entered: 12/18/2015 01:06 PM]
December 18, 2015 JOINT STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1589425] filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [15-1363] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 12/18/2015 12:00 PM]
December 18, 2015 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589421] filed by National Mining Association [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1367] (Glaser, Peter) [Entered: 12/18/2015 11:59 AM]
December 18, 2015 JOINT STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1589417] filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 15-1363, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality in 15-1409 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1363, 15-1409] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 12/18/2015 11:56 AM]
December 18, 2015 JOINT CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1589420] filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1363] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 12/18/2015 11:58 AM]
December 18, 2015 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1589446] filed by Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc. and Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1376] (Lorenzen, Thomas) [Entered: 12/18/2015 01:09 PM]
December 18, 2015 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589568] filed by Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1386, 15-1363] (Gidiere, Philip) [Entered: 12/18/2015 04:11 PM]
December 18, 2015 CORRECTED SUPPLEMENT [1589588] to response [ # 1587490-2 ] filed by American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459] (Longstreth, Benjamin) [Entered: 12/18/2015 04:28 PM]
December 18, 2015 JOINT STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1589590] filed by American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1370, 15-1363, 15-1373, 15-1374] (Wood, Allison) [Entered: 12/18/2015 04:28 PM]
December 18, 2015 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589587] filed by Energy & Environment Legal Institute in 15-1398 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1398, 15-1363] (Mandelbaum, Chaim) [Entered: 12/18/2015 04:27 PM]
December 18, 2015 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589585] filed by Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1374, 15-1363] (Wood, Allison) [Entered: 12/18/2015 04:26 PM]
December 18, 2015 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589582] filed by American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1370, 15-1363] (Wood, Allison) [Entered: 12/18/2015 04:23 PM]
December 18, 2015 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589583] filed by Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1373, 15-1363] (Wood, Allison) [Entered: 12/18/2015 04:24 PM]
December 18, 2015 CORRECTED STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1589593] filed by Energy & Environment Legal Institute in 15-1398 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1398, 15-1363] (Mandelbaum, Chaim) [Entered: 12/18/2015 04:40 PM]
December 18, 2015 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1589594] filed by West Virginia Coal Association in 15-1422 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1363, 15-1422] (McLusky, Robert) [Entered: 12/18/2015 04:41 PM]
December 18, 2015 MOTION [1589612] filed by LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418 to sever issue (Response to Motion served by mail due on 12/31/2015), to hold case in abeyance (Response to Motion served by mail due on 12/31/2015) [Service Date: 12/18/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1418, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459] (Murdock, Eric) [Entered: 12/18/2015 05:35 PM]
December 18, 2015 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1589622] filed by the City of Los Angeles, by and through its Department of Water and Power, for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1432, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459]--[Edited 12/21/2015 by MLG] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 12/18/2015 06:32 PM]
December 18, 2015 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1589605] filed by LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1418, 15-1363] (Murdock, Eric) [Entered: 12/18/2015 05:05 PM]
December 18, 2015 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589604] filed by LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1418, 15-1363] (Murdock, Eric) [Entered: 12/18/2015 05:02 PM]
December 18, 2015 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589601] filed by Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1371, 15-1363] (Moore, C.) [Entered: 12/18/2015 04:56 PM]
December 18, 2015 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1589603] filed by Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1371, 15-1363] (Moore, C.) [Entered: 12/18/2015 04:58 PM]
December 18, 2015 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1589570] filed by State of North Dakota in 15-1380 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1380, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459] (Seby, Paul) [Entered: 12/18/2015 04:11 PM]
December 18, 2015 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1589589] filed by Energy & Environment Legal Institute in 15-1398 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1398, 15-1363]--[Edited 12/21/2015 by MLG] (Mandelbaum, Chaim) [Entered: 12/18/2015 04:28 PM]
December 18, 2015 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1589549] filed by Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1366, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459] (Barnes, Geoffrey) [Entered: 12/18/2015 03:45 PM]
December 18, 2015 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1589551] filed by Association of American Railroads in 15-1383 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1383, 15-1363] (Kirmayer, Kathryn) [Entered: 12/18/2015 03:49 PM]
December 18, 2015 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589546] filed by West Virginia Coal Association in 15-1422 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1422, 15-1363] (McLusky, Robert) [Entered: 12/18/2015 03:41 PM]
December 18, 2015 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1589540] filed by Western Farmers Electric Cooperative in 15-1376 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1376, 15-1363] (Berge, Megan) [Entered: 12/18/2015 03:32 PM]
December 18, 2015 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1589536] filed by Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1377, 15-1363] (Berge, Megan) [Entered: 12/18/2015 03:30 PM]
December 18, 2015 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589535] filed by Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1377, 15-1363] (Berge, Megan) [Entered: 12/18/2015 03:30 PM]
December 18, 2015 STATEMENT [1589553] filed by Association of American Railroads in 15-1383 with Disclosure Listing [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1383, 15-1363] (Kirmayer, Kathryn) [Entered: 12/18/2015 03:55 PM]
December 18, 2015 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589539] filed by Western Farmers Electric Cooperative in 15-1376 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1376, 15-1363] (Berge, Megan) [Entered: 12/18/2015 03:31 PM]
December 18, 2015 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1589565] filed by Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1386, 15-1363] (Gidiere, Philip) [Entered: 12/18/2015 04:09 PM]
December 18, 2015 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1589566] filed by State of North Dakota in 15-1380 [Service Date: 12/15/2015 ] [15-1380, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459] (Seby, Paul) [Entered: 12/18/2015 04:10 PM]
December 18, 2015 JOINT STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1589557] filed by State of North Dakota in 15-1380 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [15-1380, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459] (Seby, Paul) [Entered: 12/18/2015 04:02 PM]
December 18, 2015 SUPPLEMENT [1589564] to statement [ # 1589560-2 ] filed by State of North Dakota in 15-1380 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1380, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459] (Seby, Paul) [Entered: 12/18/2015 04:08 PM]
December 18, 2015 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589560] filed by State of North Dakota in 15-1380 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1380, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459] (Seby, Paul) [Entered: 12/18/2015 04:05 PM]
December 18, 2015 DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589558] filed by Association of American Railroads in 15-1383 [Service Date: 12/18/2015 ] [15-1383, 15-1363] (Kirmayer, Kathryn) [Entered: 12/18/2015 04:04 PM]
December 17, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER [1589131] filed consolidating cases 15-1459 (Consolidation started 12/17/2015) with 15-1363. Directing party to file in 15-1459 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 01/19/2016. PETITIONER statement of issues due 01/19/2016 [15-1459, 15-1363] [Entered: 12/17/2015 10:54 AM]
December 17, 2015 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged Amicus brief [ # 1587006-2 ] is filed [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451] [Entered: 12/17/2015 10:29 AM]
December 17, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER [1589115] filed granting motion to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1587005-2 ] in 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432; the Clerk is directed to file Amicus brief [ # 1587006-2 ] in 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432 [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451] [Entered: 12/17/2015 10:23 AM]
December 17, 2015 MOTION [1589170] filed by The North American Coal Corporation for leave to amend petition (Response to Motion served by mail due on 12/31/2015) [Service Date: 12/17/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1451] (Wehland, Charles) [Entered: 12/17/2015 12:39 PM]
December 17, 2015 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--DOCKETING STATEMENT [1589254] filed by Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality [Service Date: 12/17/2015 ] [15-1409]--[Edited 12/21/2015 by MLG] (Hodges, Donna) [Entered: 12/17/2015 05:17 PM]
December 17, 2015 MOTION [1589260] filed by Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 12/17/2015 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442, 15-1451, 15-1459]--[Edited 12/18/2015 by AY] (Revesz, Richard) [Entered: 12/17/2015 11:51 PM]
December 16, 2015 FIRST CLASS MAIL RETURNED [1588761] marked "Return To Sender - Attempted Not Known - Unable To Forward". Mail had been sent to Attorney Patrick Burchette for Petitioners Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc. and Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc.. [15-1376] [Entered: 12/16/2015 07:00 AM]
December 16, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER [1588889] filed consolidating cases; directing party to file in 15-1451 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 01/15/2016. PETITIONER statement of issues due 01/15/2016 [15-1363, 15-1451] (Accursio, John) [Entered: 12/16/2015 11:43 AM]
December 16, 2015 STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1588930] filed by International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 15-1365 [Service Date: 12/16/2015 ] [15-1365, 15-1363] (Trisko, Eugene) [Entered: 12/16/2015 12:31 PM]
December 15, 2015 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DECLARATION [1588734] filed by Calpine Corporation in 15-1363 [Service Date: 12/15/2015 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442]--[Edited 12/16/2015 by MLG] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 12/15/2015 05:16 PM]
December 14, 2015 ERRATA [1588325] to supplement [ # 1587530-2 ] filed by Advanced Energy Economy, American Lung Association, American Wind Energy Association, Broward County, Florida, Calpine Corporation, Center for Biological Diversity, City of Austin, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of Seattle, City of South Miami, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, Conservation Law Foundation, DC, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, National Grid Generation, LLC, Natural Resources Defense Council, Nextera Energy, Inc., Ohio Environmental Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Pacific Gas and Electric Company, Sierra Club, Solar Energy Industries Association, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363, New York Power Authority, Sacramento Municipal Utility District and Southern California Edison Company in 15-1409 [Service Date: 12/14/2015 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432, 15-1442]--[Edited 12/15/2015 by MLG] (Longstreth, Benjamin) [Entered: 12/14/2015 12:18 PM]
December 11, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER [1588131] filed consolidating cases 15-1442 (Consolidation started 12/11/2015) with 15-1363 [15-1442, 15-1363] [Entered: 12/11/2015 12:24 PM]
December 11, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER [1588134] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 01/11/2016. PETITIONER statement of issues due 01/11/2016 [15-1442] [Entered: 12/11/2015 12:28 PM]
December 11, 2015 FIRST CLASS MAIL RETURNED [1588474] marked "Return To Sender - Insufficient Address - Unable To Forward". Mail had been sent to Attorney Bill Spears for Petitioner Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc.. [15-1376] [Entered: 12/15/2015 08:43 AM]
December 11, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1588149] filed by Scott A. Keller and co-counsel Lisa A. Bennett on behalf of Petitioner State of Texas. [15-1363] (Bennett, Lisa) [Entered: 12/11/2015 12:48 PM]
December 10, 2015 NOTICE [1587988] filed by State of West Virginia to withdraw attorney Misha Tseytlin who represented State of West Virginia in 15-1363 [Service Date: 12/10/2015 ] [15-1363] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 12/10/2015 04:37 PM]
December 8, 2015 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1587482] filed by Advanced Energy Economy, American Wind Energy Association and Solar Energy Industries Association in 15-1363 to motion to stay case [ # 1582159-2 ] [Service Date: 12/08/2015 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 1-10. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432] (Lerman, Daniel) [Entered: 12/08/2015 03:40 PM]
December 8, 2015 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1587423] filed by Calpine Corporation, City of Austin, City of Seattle, National Grid Generation, LLC, Nextera Energy, Inc. and Pacific Gas and Electric Company in 15-1363 to motion to stay case [ # 1579999-2 ], motion to expedite case [ # 1579999-3 ], motion to stay case [ # 1580014-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1580004-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1580020-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1580577-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1580920-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1582159-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1582195-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1582333-3 ], motion temporary restraining order [ # 1582333-2 ] [Service Date: 12/08/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 12/08/2015 12:43 PM]
December 8, 2015 LETTER [1587329] sent regarding attorney membership to Mr. Joshua Lawrence Belcher for Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., South Mississippi Electric Power Association and Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc.. Application for Admission due 01/07/2016. [15-1376] [Entered: 12/08/2015 09:32 AM]
December 8, 2015 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1587490] filed by American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363 to motion to stay case [ # 1582195-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1582159-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1580920-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1580577-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1580020-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1579999-2 ], motion to expedite case [ # 1579999-3 ], motion to stay case [ # 1580004-2 ] [Service Date: 12/08/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 21-30. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432] (Longstreth, Benjamin) [Entered: 12/08/2015 03:49 PM]
December 8, 2015 JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1587450] filed by Broward County, Florida, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington to motion to stay case [ # 1579999-2 ], motion to expedite case [ # 1579999-3 ], motion to stay case [ # 1580577-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1580920-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1582159-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1582195-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1582333-3 ], motion temporary restraining order [ # 1582333-2 ] [Service Date: 12/08/2015 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 21-30. [15-1363] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 12/08/2015 02:14 PM]
December 8, 2015 JOINT CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1587532] filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 15-1363, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 15-1365, Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366, National Mining Association in 15-1367, American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372, Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374, United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375, Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc., Western Farmers Electric Cooperative and Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1376, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382, Association of American Railroads in 15-1383, National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379, State of North Dakota in 15-1380, Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393, Energy & Environment Legal Institute in 15-1398, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality in 15-1409, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 15-1410, Entergy Corporation in 15-1413, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418, Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC and Newmont USA Limited in 15-1432 [Service Date: 12/08/2015 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1432] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 12/08/2015 05:34 PM]
December 8, 2015 SUPPLEMENT [1587530] to response [ # 1587490-2 ], response [ # 1587482-2 ], response [ # 1587450-2 ], response [ # 1587423-2 ] filed by Advanced Energy Economy, American Lung Association, American Wind Energy Association, Broward County, Florida, Calpine Corporation, Center for Biological Diversity, City of Austin, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of Seattle, City of South Miami, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Coal River Mountain Watch, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, Conservation Law Foundation, DC, Environmental Defense Fund, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, National Grid Generation, LLC, Natural Resources Defense Council, Nextera Energy, Inc., Ohio Environmental Council, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Pacific Gas and Electric Company, Sierra Club, Solar Energy Industries Association, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy in 15-1363, American Public Power Association in 15-1370, American Forest & Paper Association and Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in 15-1382, New York Power Authority, Sacramento Municipal Utility District and Southern California Edison Company in 15-1409 [Service Date: 12/08/2015 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432] (Longstreth, Benjamin) [Entered: 12/08/2015 05:12 PM]
December 8, 2015 JOINT MOTION [1587531] filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 15-1363, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 15-1365, Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366, National Mining Association in 15-1367, American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372, Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374, United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375, Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc., Western Farmers Electric Cooperative and Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1376, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382, Association of American Railroads in 15-1383, National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379, State of North Dakota in 15-1380, Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393, Energy & Environment Legal Institute in 15-1398, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality in 15-1409, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 15-1410, Entergy Corporation in 15-1413, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418, Newmont Nevada Energy Investment, LLC and Newmont USA Limited in 15-1432 concerning briefing format (Response to Motion served by mail due on 12/21/2015), to expedite case. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 12/21/2015) [Service Date: 12/08/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1432] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 12/08/2015 05:28 PM]
December 8, 2015 FIRST CLASS MAIL RETURNED [1588014] marked "Return To Sender - Attempted Not Known - Unable To Forward". Mail had been sent to Attorney Patrick Burchette for Petitioners Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc. and Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc.. [15-1376] [Entered: 12/11/2015 08:32 AM]
December 7, 2015 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1587303] filed by Southern California Edison Company, Sacramento Municipal Utility District and New York Power Authority in 15-1409 for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 12/07/2015 ] [15-1409, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432]--[Edited 12/08/2015 by LMC] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 12/07/2015 07:06 PM]
December 4, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER [1586898] filed granting motion to participate as amicus curiae [ # 1586532-2 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432] [Entered: 12/04/2015 03:08 PM]
December 4, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1586809] filed by Erik Petersen on behalf of Petitioner State of Wyoming in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432] (Petersen, Erik) [Entered: 12/04/2015 10:32 AM]
December 4, 2015 NOTICE [1586905] filed by East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc. and South Mississippi Electric Power Association in 15-1376 to substitute attorney Emily L. Seidman substituted by Joshua L. Belcher [Service Date: 12/04/2015 ] [15-1363, 15-1376] (Holloway, John) [Entered: 12/04/2015 03:36 PM]
December 3, 2015 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1586532] filed by Former EPA Administrators William D. Ruckelshaus and William K. Reilly to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 12/03/2015 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432] (Lazarus, Richard) [Entered: 12/03/2015 10:49 AM]
December 3, 2015 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1586661] filed by EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363 to motion to stay case [ # 1582195-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1582333-3 ], motion temporary restraining order [ # 1582333-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1582159-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1580920-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1580577-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1580020-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1579999-2 ], motion to expedite case [ # 1579999-3 ], motion to stay case [ # 1580004-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1580014-2 ] [Service Date: 12/03/2015 by CM/ECF NDA, Email, US Mail] Pages: Exceeds Limits. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 12/03/2015 03:09 PM]
December 2, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1586279] filed by DALE SCHOWENGERDT on behalf of Petitioner State of Montana. [15-1363] (Schowengerdt, Dale) [Entered: 12/02/2015 10:44 AM]
December 1, 2015 AMICUS FOR PETITIONER BRIEF [1587006] LODGED by Philip Zoebisch in cases15-1363, et al. [Service Date: 11/24/2015] Length of Brief: Pages: 11. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432] [Entered: 12/07/2015 08:53 AM]
December 1, 2015 MOTION [1587005] filed by Philip Zoebisch in 15-1363 to participate as amicus curiae. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 12/14/2015) [Service Date: 12/01/2015 by Clerk] Pages: 1-10. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432] [Entered: 12/07/2015 08:50 AM]
November 30, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1585850] filed by Mark L. Walters and co-counsel Michael J. Nasi on behalf of Movant-Intervenor for Petitioner Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition in 15-1363. [15-1376, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432] (Walters, Mark) [Entered: 11/30/2015 04:31 PM]
November 30, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1585851] filed by D. Bryan Hughes on behalf of Movant-Intervenor for Petitioner Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition in 15-1363. [15-1376, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432] (Walters, Mark) [Entered: 11/30/2015 04:33 PM]
November 30, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER [1585786] filed granting motion to extend time [ # 1585273-2 ] in 15-1363; granting motion to coordinate deadlines [ # 1584760-2 ] in 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418; granting motion to withdraw document [ # 1581464-2 ] in 15-1363, 15-1393; withdrawing motion for other relief [ # 1580915-2 ] in 15-1393; initial submissions not yet filed and procedural motions in these cases are now due 12/18/2015. Dispositive motions and the certified index to the record are now due 12/28/2015. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422, 15-1432] [Entered: 11/30/2015 02:52 PM]
November 25, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER [1585591] filed consolidating cases 15-1432 (Consolidation started 11/25/2015) with 15-1363. directing party to file in 15-1432 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 12/28/2015. PETITIONER statement of issues due 12/28/2015 [15-1363, 15-1432] [Entered: 11/25/2015 04:07 PM]
November 24, 2015 MOTION [1585273] filed by Coal River Mountain Watch, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy to extend time to file motion to 11/24/2015 at 05:00 pm. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 12/07/2015) [Service Date: 11/24/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [15-1363] (DePaulo, William) [Entered: 11/24/2015 03:36 PM]
November 24, 2015 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1585197] filed by Keepers of the Mountains Foundation, Mon Valley Clean Air Coalition, Kanawha Forest Coalition, Coal River Mountain Watch, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition and West Virginia Highlands Conservancy for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 11/24/2015 ] [15-1363]--[Edited 11/24/2015 by LMC] (DePaulo, William) [Entered: 11/24/2015 01:31 PM]
November 23, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1584963] filed by Maureen A. Scott and co-counsel Janice Alward Janet Wagner on behalf of Petitioner Arizona Corporation Commission in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418, 15-1422] (Scott, Maureen) [Entered: 11/23/2015 02:31 PM]
November 20, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1584610] filed by Matthew L. Gooch on behalf of Movant-Intervenor for Respondent Commonwealth of Virginia. [15-1363] (Gooch, Matthew) [Entered: 11/20/2015 11:34 AM]
November 20, 2015 JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1584760] filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 15-1363, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 15-1365, Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366, National Mining Association in 15-1367, American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372, Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374, United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375, Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc., Western Farmers Electric Cooperative and Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1376, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382, Association of American Railroads in 15-1383, National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379, State of North Dakota in 15-1380, Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386, Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393, Energy & Environment Legal Institute in 15-1398, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality in 15-1409, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, AFL-CIO in 15-1410, Entergy Corporation in 15-1413, LG&E and KU Energy LLC in 15-1418 Unopposed Joint Motion of Petitioners to Coordinate Deadlines. [Service Date: 11/20/2015 ] Pages: 1-10. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413, 15-1418] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 11/20/2015 04:46 PM]
November 20, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER [1584721] filed consolidating case 15-1422 (Consolidation started 11/20/2015) with 15-1363; directing party to file in 15-1422 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 12/21/2015. PETITIONER statement of issues due 12/21/2015 [15-1363, 15-1422] [Entered: 11/20/2015 03:53 PM]
November 20, 2015 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1584767] filed by Dixon Bros.,Inc.; Nelson Brothers, Inc.; WESCO International, Inc.; Norfolk Southern Corp.; Joy Global Inc.; and Gulf Coast Lignite Coalition for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 11/20/2015] [15-1363]--[Edited 11/23/2015 by KRM] (Duncan, Tristan) [Entered: 11/20/2015 05:51 PM]
November 18, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER [1584080] filed consolidating cases 15-1418 (Consolidation started 11/18/2015) with 15-1363. Directing party to file in 15-1418 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 12/18/2015. PETITIONER statement of issues due 12/18/2015 [15-1418, 15-1363] [Entered: 11/18/2015 09:59 AM]
November 18, 2015 CERTIFIED COPY [1584089] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1584069-2 ] [15-1418] [Entered: 11/18/2015 10:06 AM]
November 17, 2015 NOTICE [1584030] filed by Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. and Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. to substitute attorney Bill Spears and Steven J. Oberg substituted by Thomas Lorenzen, Daniel Wolff, and Sherrie Armstrong [Service Date: 11/17/2015 ] [15-1376] (Armstrong, Sherrie) [Entered: 11/17/2015 05:52 PM]
November 17, 2015 PER CURIAM ORDER [1583948] granting EPA's motion to amend page limitations for its consolidated response and respondent-intervenors' motion to increase page limit for their responses [ # 1583200-2 ] [ # 1583191-2 ]. EPAs consolidated response to the motions for stay may not exceed 70 pages. Respondent-intervenors responses to the motions for stay may not exceed a total of 50 pages, to be allocated as respondent-intervenors see fit. The replies in support of the motions for stay may not exceed a total of 60 pages, to be allocated as stay movants see fit. The schedule established in the courts orders of October 29, 2015, remains in effect. Before Judges: Tatel, Griffith and Millett. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410, 15-1413] [Entered: 11/17/2015 12:33 PM]
November 16, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1583806] filed by Bethany A. Davis Noll on behalf of Movant-Intervenor for Respondent State of New York. [15-1363] (Davis Noll, Bethany) [Entered: 11/16/2015 03:29 PM]
November 13, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER [1583626] filed vacating November 12, 2015 scheduling order [ # 1583276-2 ] in 15-1413. Consolidating case 15-1413 (Consolidation started 11/13/2015) with 15-1363, et al. Directing petitioner in 15-1413 to file initial submissions: docketing statement and statement of issues due 12/14/2015. [15-1363, 15-1413] [Entered: 11/13/2015 05:22 PM]
November 12, 2015 MOTION [1583191] filed by EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410 to amend page limitation, set forth in October 29, 2015, order, for EPA's consolidated response to motions for stay of rule under review. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/30/2015) [Service Date: 11/12/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 11/12/2015 11:54 AM]
November 12, 2015 JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1583200] filed by Broward County, Florida, City of Boulder, City of Chicago, City of New York, City of Philadelphia, City of South Miami, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Virginia, DC, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Hampshire, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont and State of Washington in 15-1363 Increase Page Limits Set Forth in October 29, 2015 Order for Respondent-Intervenors' Responses to Stay Motions. [Service Date: 11/12/2015 ] Pages: 16-20. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410] (Lusignan, Brian) [Entered: 11/12/2015 12:16 PM]
November 10, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1582878] filed by Lead counsel have already filed entries of appearance and co-counsel Andres J. Restrepo on behalf of Movant-Intervenor for Respondent Sierra Club. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410]--[Edited 11/10/2015 by AY] (Restrepo, Andres) [Entered: 11/10/2015 11:39 AM]
November 10, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1582887] filed by Lee Rudofsky and co-counsel Jamie L. Ewing on behalf of Petitioner State of Arkansas. [15-1363] (Ewing, Jamie) [Entered: 11/10/2015 11:55 AM]
November 10, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1583060] filed by Dominic E. Draye and co-counsel John R. Lopez IV; Keith J. Miller on behalf of Petitioner Arizona Corporation Commission in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409, 15-1410] (Draye, Dominic) [Entered: 11/10/2015 05:17 PM]
November 9, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1582548] filed by Robert J. Kinney and co-counsel Matthew T. Kelly John E. Doyle on behalf of Petitioner State of New Jersey. [15-1363] (Kinney, Robert) [Entered: 11/09/2015 10:18 AM]
November 9, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER [1582679] filed consolidating cases 15-1363 (Consolidation started 11/09/2015) with 15-1410; directing party to file in 15-1410 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 12/09/2015. PETITIONER statement of issues due 12/09/2015 [15-1363, 15-1410] [Entered: 11/09/2015 03:26 PM]
November 9, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1582612] filed by Richard E. Ayres and co-counsel Jessica L. Olson, John H. Bernetich on behalf of Movant-Intervenor for Respondent Nextera Energy, Inc.. [15-1363] (Bernetich, John) [Entered: 11/09/2015 01:46 PM]
November 9, 2015 NOTICE [1582706] filed by Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393 Notice Identifying Liaison Counsel. [Service Date: 11/09/2015 ] [15-1363, 15-1393] (Schilling, Emily) [Entered: 11/09/2015 04:00 PM]
November 6, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1582416] filed by Joanne Spalding and co-counsel Howard I. Fox, David S. Baron, Timothy D. Ballo on behalf of Movant-Intervenor for Respondent Sierra Club in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1399, 15-1409] (Fox, Howard) [Entered: 11/06/2015 03:11 PM]
November 6, 2015 [ORDER VACATED BY ORDER ON 11/06/15] CLERK'S ORDER [1582409] filed consolidating cases 15-1399 (Consolidation started 11/06/2015) with 15-1363. Directing party to file in 15-1399 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 12/07/2015. PETITIONER statement of issues due 12/07/2015 [15-1363, 15-1399]--[Edited 11/06/2015 by MLG] [Entered: 11/06/2015 02:52 PM]
November 6, 2015 RELIEF REPLACED-- CORRECTED MOTION [1582333] filed by Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality in 15-1409 to stay case (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/19/2015) [Service Date: 11/06/2015 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 21-30. [15-1409, 15-1363]--[Edited 11/06/2015 by LMC] (Hodges, Donna) [Entered: 11/06/2015 10:48 AM]
November 6, 2015 JOINT NOTICE [1582426] filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 15-1363, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364, State of North Dakota in 15-1380, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality in 15-1409 Notice Identifying Liaison Counsel. [Service Date: 11/06/2015 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1380, 15-1409] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 11/06/2015 03:22 PM]
November 6, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER [1582431] filed vacating Clerk order [ # 1582409-4 ] [15-1363] [Entered: 11/06/2015 03:32 PM]
November 6, 2015 NOTICE [1582490] filed by Peabody Energy Corporation in 15-1363, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 15-1365, Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366, National Mining Association in 15-1367, American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368, American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370, Alabama Power Company, Georgia Power Company, Gulf Power Company and Mississippi Power Company in 15-1371, CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372, Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374, United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375, Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, Arizona Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Brazos Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, Deseret Generation & Transmission Co-operative, Inc., East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., East Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northeast Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Rushmore Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Sam Rayburn G&T Electric Cooperative, Inc., San Miguel Electric Cooperative, Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., South Mississippi Electric Power Association, South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation, Tex-La Electric Cooperative of Texas, Inc., Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc., Wabash Valley Power Association, Inc., Western Farmers Electric Cooperative and Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1376, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378, American Chemistry Council, American Coke and Coal Chemicals Institute, American Forest & Paper Association, American Foundry Society, American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Iron and Steel Institute, American Wood Council, Brick Industry Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Electricity Consumers Resource Council, Lignite Energy Council, National Association of Manufacturers, National Federation of Independent Business, National Lime Association, National Oilseed Processors Association and Portland Cement Association in 15-1382, Association of American Railroads in 15-1383, National Association of Home Builders in 15-1379, Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386 Notice Identifying Liaison Counsel. [Service Date: 11/06/2015 ] [15-1363, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386] (Wood, Allison) [Entered: 11/06/2015 04:40 PM]
November 6, 2015 CORRECTED NOTICE [1582433] filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming in 15-1363, Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364, State of North Dakota in 15-1380, Mississippi Department of Environmental Quality in 15-1409 Corrected Joint Notice Identifying Liaison Counsel. [Service Date: 11/06/2015 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1380, 15-1409] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 11/06/2015 03:33 PM]
November 5, 2015 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1582209] filed by Calpine Corporation, The City of Austin d/b/a Austin Energy, the City of Seattle, by and through its City Light Department, National Grid Generation, LLC and Pacific Gas and Electric Company for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 11/05/2015 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398]--[Edited 11/10/2015 by KRM] (Poloncarz, Kevin) [Entered: 11/05/2015 03:33 PM]
November 5, 2015 MOTION [1582195] filed by Peabody Energy Corporation to stay underlying order in case (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/19/2015) [Service Date: 11/04/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 21-30. [15-1363] (Duncan, Tristan) [Entered: 11/05/2015 02:59 PM]
November 5, 2015 MOTION [1582159] filed by Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393 to stay underlying order in case (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/19/2015) [Service Date: 11/05/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 21-30. [15-1363, 15-1393] (Gomez, Christina) [Entered: 11/05/2015 01:37 PM]
November 5, 2015 MOTION [1582215] filed by NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378 for leave to file supplement (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/19/2015) [Service Date: 11/05/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1378, 15-1363] (Berge, Megan) [Entered: 11/05/2015 03:47 PM]
November 5, 2015 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1582177] filed by NextEra Energy, Inc. for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 11/05/2015] [15-1363]--[Edited 11/09/2015 by KRM] (Olson, Jessica) [Entered: 11/05/2015 02:10 PM]
November 5, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1582140] filed by Christina F. Gomez and co-counsel Patrick R. Day, Lawrence E. Volmert on behalf of Petitioner Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393. [15-1393, 15-1363] (Gomez, Christina) [Entered: 11/05/2015 12:50 PM]
November 5, 2015 LETTER [1582235] sent regarding attorney membership to William F. Cooper for State of Hawaii, Debra S. Kalish for City of Boulder, Jacob Larson for State of Iowa, Mr. Thomas Frank Pepe for City of South Miami, Thiruvendran Vignarajah for State of Maryland and Mr. Luther J. Strange, III for State of Alabama. Application for Admission due 12/07/2015. [15-1363] [Entered: 11/05/2015 04:26 PM]
November 5, 2015 MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--SUPPLEMENT [1582297] to motion to stay case [ # 1580014-2 ] filed by NorthWestern Corporation [Service Date: 11/05/2015 ] [15-1378] [Entered: 11/06/2015 09:39 AM]
November 5, 2015 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT [1582259] filed by Energy & Environment Legal Institute in 15-1398 to motion to stay case [ # 1580920-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1580020-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1580014-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1580004-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1579999-2 ], motion to expedite case [ # 1579999-3 ], motion to stay case [ # 1580577-2 ] [Service Date: 11/05/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [15-1398, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1409] (Mandelbaum, Chaim) [Entered: 11/05/2015 06:41 PM]
November 5, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER [1582239] filed consolidating cases 15-1409 (Consolidation started 11/05/2015) with 15-1363; directing party to file in 15-1409 initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 12/07/2015. PETITIONER statement of issues due 12/07/2015 [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398, 15-1409] [Entered: 11/05/2015 04:35 PM]
November 4, 2015 MODIFIED PARTY FILER-- CORRECTED MOTION [1581816] filed by State of New York, et al. for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 11/04/2015] [15-1363]--[Edited 11/05/2015 by KRM] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 11/04/2015 10:30 AM]
November 4, 2015 JOINT MOTION [1581814] filed by State of New York, et al. for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 11/04/2015 ] [15-1363] (Myers, Michael) [Entered: 11/04/2015 10:20 AM]
November 4, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1581864] filed by Ann Brewster Weeks and co-counsel James Patrick Duffy on behalf of Movant-Intervenors for Respondent American Lung Association, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation and Ohio Environmental Council. [15-1363] (Duffy, James) [Entered: 11/04/2015 11:34 AM]
November 2, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1581472] filed by Richard E. Ayres and co-counsel Jessica L. Olson, John H. Bernetich on behalf of Movant-Intervenor for Respondent Solar Energy Industries Association in 15-1393. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393] (Bernetich, John) [Entered: 11/02/2015 01:41 PM]
November 2, 2015 MOTION [1581464] filed by Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1393 to withdraw motion (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/16/2015) [Service Date: 11/02/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1363, 15-1393] (Gomez, Christina) [Entered: 11/02/2015 01:27 PM]
November 2, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER [1581514] filed consolidating cases 15-1398 (Consolidation started 11/02/2015) with 15-1363 [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393, 15-1398] [Entered: 11/02/2015 02:57 PM]
October 30, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1581172] filed by Sam M. Hayes on behalf of Petitioner State of North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393] (Hayes, Sam) [Entered: 10/30/2015 02:37 PM]
October 30, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1581096] filed by Tristan L. Duncan on behalf of Movant-Intervenor for Petitioner Peabody Energy Corporation. [15-1363] (Duncan, Tristan) [Entered: 10/30/2015 12:25 PM]
October 30, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1581069] filed by Britt C. Grant on behalf of Petitioner State of Georgia in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393] (Grant, Britt) [Entered: 10/30/2015 11:48 AM]
October 30, 2015 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT [1581256] filed by Big Brown Lignite Company, LLC, Big Brown Power Company, LLC, Luminant Big Brown Mining Company, LLC, Luminant Generation Company, LLC, Luminant Mining Company, LLC, Oak Grove Management Company, LLC and Sandow Power Company, LLC in 15-1386 to motion to stay case [ # 1580920-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1580577-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1580020-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1580014-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1580004-2 ], motion to stay case [ # 1579999-2 ], motion to expedite case [ # 1579999-3 ] [Service Date: 10/30/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1386, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1367, 15-1370, 15-1380, 15-1382] (Gidiere, Philip) [Entered: 10/30/2015 04:06 PM]
October 30, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1581052] filed by Henry V. Nickel on behalf of Petitioners American Public Power Association and Utility Air Regulatory Group in 15-1370. [15-1370, 15-1363] (Nickel, Henry) [Entered: 10/30/2015 11:34 AM]
October 30, 2015 MOTION [1581860] filed by Philip Zoebisch to participate as amicus curiae. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/19/2015) [Service Date: 11/04/2015 by CM/ECF NDA, Clerk] Pages: 1-10. [15-1366] (Accursio, John) [Entered: 11/04/2015 11:25 AM]
October 30, 2015 DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1581270] filed by Attorney General Brad Schimel and co-counsel Delanie Breuer, Andrew Cook on behalf of Petitioner State of Wisconsin. [15-1363]--[Edited 11/03/2015 by KRM] (Breuer, Delanie) [Entered: 10/30/2015 04:34 PM]
October 30, 2015 CORRECTED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1581287] filed by Delanie Breuer on behalf of Petitioner State of Wisconsin. [15-1363] (Breuer, Delanie) [Entered: 10/30/2015 05:13 PM]
October 30, 2015 MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--AMICUS FOR PETITIONER BRIEF [1581863] filed by Philip Zoebisch [Service Date: 11/04/2015 ] [15-1366]--[Edited 11/04/2015 by JJA] (Accursio, John) [Entered: 11/04/2015 11:31 AM]
October 30, 2015 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1581284] filed by Solar Energy Industries Association for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 10/30/2015 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393]--[Edited 11/02/2015 by JJA] (Olson, Jessica) [Entered: 10/30/2015 05:03 PM]
October 29, 2015 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--MOTION [1580761] filed by Peabody Energy Corp. for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 10/29/2015] [15-1363]--[Edited 10/30/2015 by KRM] (Duncan, Tristan) [Entered: 10/29/2015 12:03 PM]
October 29, 2015 PER CURIAM ORDER [1580781] It is ORDERED that petitioners identify lead or liaison counsel for appropriate groups of petitioners within 10 days of the date of this order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the following format and schedule apply to the briefing of stay motions in these cases: ANY ADDITIONAL MOTIONS FOR STAY (not to exceed 20 pages) due 11/05/2015. EPA'S CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE TO MOTIONS FOR STAY (not to exceed 50 pages) due 12/03/2015. RESPONDENT-INTERVENORS' RESPONSES TO MOTIONS FOR STAY (not to exceed a total of 32 pages, allocated as respondent-intervenors see fit) due 12/08/2015. REPLIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS FOR STAY (not to exceed a total of 41 pages, allocated as stay movants see fit) due 12/23/2015. Before Judges: Brown, Srinivasan and Wilkins. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386] [Entered: 10/29/2015 01:19 PM]
October 29, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1580745] filed by Donald J Trahan and co-counsel Elliott B Vega Herman Robinson on behalf of Petitioner State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality. [15-1363] (Trahan, Donald) [Entered: 10/29/2015 11:47 AM]
October 29, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1580831] filed by Paul Clayton Eubanks on behalf of Petitioner State of Oklahoma in 15-1364. [15-1364, 15-1363, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386] (Eubanks, P.) [Entered: 10/29/2015 03:01 PM]
October 29, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1580637] filed by Steven C. Kohl and co-counsel Gaetan Gerville-Reache on behalf of Petitioner Wolverine Power Supply Cooperative, Inc.. [15-1376] (Gerville-Reache, Gaetan) [Entered: 10/29/2015 07:37 AM]
October 29, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1580675] filed by James Kaste and co-counsel Michael J. McGrady and Elizabeth Morrisseau on behalf of Petitioner State of Wyoming in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386] (Morrisseau, Elizabeth) [Entered: 10/29/2015 10:20 AM]
October 29, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER [1580865] directing that all submissions for which deadlines were established in the per curiam order issued this date are due at 4:00 p.m. on the date specified in the order. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393] [Entered: 10/29/2015 03:34 PM]
October 29, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER [1580833] filed consolidating case 15-1393 (Consolidation started 10/29/2015) with case Nos.15-1363, et al. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393] [Entered: 10/29/2015 03:03 PM]
October 29, 2015 MOTION [1580920] filed by State of North Dakota in 15-1380 to stay underlying order in case (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/12/2015) [Service Date: 10/29/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [15-1380, 15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393] (Seby, Paul) [Entered: 10/29/2015 11:18 PM]
October 29, 2015 MOTION [1580915] filed by Basin Electric Power Cooperative, Inc. Request for Reconsideration of Court's Scheduling Order & Response to EPA Motion. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/12/2015) [Service Date: 10/29/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [15-1393] (WITHDRAWN BY CLERK ORDER ON 11/30/15)--[Edited 11/30/2015 by AY] (Gomez, Christina) [Entered: 10/29/2015 07:09 PM]
October 29, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER [1580895] filed directing petitioners to file initial submissions: docketing statements due 11/30/2015, joint certificate as to parties, etc. due 11/30/2015, statements of issues due 11/30/2015, joint deferred appendix statement due 11/30/2015, procedural motions due 11/30/2015, and dispositive motions due 12/14/2015. Directing respondents to file initial submissions: certified index to record due 12/14/2015. procedural motions due 11/30/2015, and dispositive motions due 12/14/2015 [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386, 15-1393] [Entered: 10/29/2015 04:33 PM]
October 28, 2015 MOTION [1580465] filed by EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, EPA and Gina McCarthy in 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386 Motion to Establish Consolidated Briefing Schedule Encompassing All Motions for Stay of Agency Rule and Request for Designation of Liaison Counsel. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/12/2015) [Service Date: 10/28/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 10/28/2015 11:59 AM]
October 28, 2015 CORRECTED MOTION [1580505] filed by EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363, EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1386 Corrected Motion to Establish Consolidated Briefing Schedule Encompassing All Motions for Stay of Agency Rule and Request for Designation of Liaison Counsel. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/12/2015) [Service Date: 10/28/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 11-15. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386] (Hostetler, Eric) [Entered: 10/28/2015 12:40 PM]
October 28, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1580504] filed by Megan K. Terrell on behalf of Petitioner State of Louisiana. [15-1363] (Terrell, Megan) [Entered: 10/28/2015 12:38 PM]
October 28, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1580454] filed by James R. Layton and co-counsel J. Andrew Hirth on behalf of Petitioner State of Missouri. [15-1363] (Layton, James) [Entered: 10/28/2015 11:44 AM]
October 28, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1580429] filed by Jeffrey A. Chanay and co-counsel Bryan C. Clark on behalf of Petitioner State of Kansas in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386] (Clark, Bryan) [Entered: 10/28/2015 10:47 AM]
October 28, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1580403] filed by Elbert Lin and co-counsel Misha Tseytlin, J. Zak Ritchie on behalf of Petitioner State of West Virginia. [15-1363] (Lin, Elbert) [Entered: 10/28/2015 09:09 AM]
October 28, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1580509] filed by Christopher L. Bell on behalf of Petitioner Golden Spread Electric Cooperative, Inc.. [15-1376] (Bell, Christopher) [Entered: 10/28/2015 12:43 PM]
October 28, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1580440] filed by Mark L. Walters and co-counsel Michael J. Nasi on behalf of Petitioners San Miguel Electric Cooperative and South Texas Electric Cooperative, Inc. in 15-1376. [15-1376, 15-1363] (Walters, Mark) [Entered: 10/28/2015 11:23 AM]
October 28, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1580433] filed by Sean H. Donahue and co-counsel Tomas Carbonell Vickie Patton Martha Roberts on behalf of Movant-Intervenor for Respondent Environmental Defense Fund in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386] (Donahue, Sean) [Entered: 10/28/2015 11:15 AM]
October 28, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1580623] filed by David Doniger and co-counsel Selena Kyle and Jared Knicley on behalf of Movant-Intervenor for Respondent Natural Resources Defense Council in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386] (Knicley, Jared) [Entered: 10/28/2015 05:15 PM]
October 28, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1580629] filed by Frederick R. Yarger on behalf of Petitioner State of Colorado in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386] (Yarger, Frederick) [Entered: 10/28/2015 05:43 PM]
October 28, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1580514] filed by Steven R. Blair on behalf of Petitioner State of South Dakota. [15-1363] (Blair, Steven) [Entered: 10/28/2015 12:56 PM]
October 28, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1580620] filed by James Emory Smith, Jr. on behalf of Petitioner State of South Carolina. [15-1363] (Smith, James) [Entered: 10/28/2015 04:47 PM]
October 28, 2015 MOTION [1580577] filed by Oklahoma Department of Environmental Quality and State of Oklahoma in 15-1364 for stay. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/12/2015) [Service Date: 10/28/2015 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [15-1364, 15-1363] (Rivkin, David) [Entered: 10/28/2015 03:20 PM]
October 28, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1580515] filed by Scott A. Keller and co-counsel Lisa A. Bennett on behalf of Petitioner State of Texas. [15-1363] (Keller, Scott) [Entered: 10/28/2015 12:57 PM]
October 28, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1580539] filed by Eric E. Murphy on behalf of Petitioner State of Ohio. [15-1363] (Murphy, Eric) [Entered: 10/28/2015 02:04 PM]
October 28, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1580543] filed by Allen Winsor and co-counsel Jonathan A. Glogau and Jonathan L. Williams on behalf of Petitioner State of Florida. [15-1363] (Williams, Jonathan) [Entered: 10/28/2015 02:08 PM]
October 27, 2015 MOTION [1580219] filed by American Lung Association, Center for Biological Diversity, Clean Air Council, Clean Wisconsin, Conservation Law Foundation, Environmental Defense Fund, Natural Resources Defense Council, Ohio Environmental Council, and Sierra Club for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 10/27/2015 ] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386] --[Edited 10/28/2015 by KRM] (Longstreth, Benjamin) [Entered: 10/27/2015 01:21 PM]
October 27, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1580347] filed by Justin D. Lavene on behalf of Petitioner State of Nebraska in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386] (Lavene, Justin) [Entered: 10/27/2015 04:14 PM]
October 27, 2015 MOTION [1580130] filed by Advanced Energy Economy for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 10/27/2015] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386]--[Edited 10/27/2015 by KRM] (Robbins, Lawrence) [Entered: 10/27/2015 10:31 AM]
October 27, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1580369] filed by Thomas A. Lorenzen and co-counsel Daniel W. Wolff and Sherrie A. Armstrong on behalf of Petitioners Big Rivers Electric Corporation, Buckeye Power, Inc., Central Montana Electric Power Cooperative, Central Power Electric Cooperative, Inc., Corn Belt Power Cooperative, Dairyland Power Cooperative, East River Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., Georgia Transmission Corporation, Kansas Electric Power Cooperative, Inc., National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, North Carolina Electric Membership Corporation, Northwest Iowa Power Cooperative, Oglethorpe Power Corporation, Powersouth Energy Cooperative, Prairie Power, Inc., Seminole Electric Cooperative, Inc., SIPC, Sunflower Electric Power Corporation and Upper Missouri G. & T. Electric Cooperative, Inc.. [15-1376] (Armstrong, Sherrie) [Entered: 10/27/2015 05:21 PM]
October 27, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1580374] filed by John M. Holoway III and co-counsel Emily L. Seidman on behalf of Petitioners East Kentucky Power Cooperative, Inc., Hoosier Energy Rural Electric Cooperative, Inc., Minnkota Power Cooperative, Inc. and South Mississippi Electric Power Association in 15-1376. [15-1376, 15-1363] (Holloway, John) [Entered: 10/27/2015 06:51 PM]
October 26, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER [1580026] filed consolidating case Nos. 15-1364, et al. (Consolidation stated 10/23/2015) with 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383] [Entered: 10/26/2015 03:26 PM]
October 26, 2015 MOTION [1580023] filed by American Wind Energy Association for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 10/26/2015 ] [15-1363] (Grace, Eugene) [Entered: 10/26/2015 03:21 PM]
October 26, 2015 CLERK'S ORDER [1580046] filed consolidating case 15-1386 (Consolidation started 10/26/2015) with 15-1363, et al. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386] [Entered: 10/26/2015 04:08 PM]
October 26, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1580029] filed by Eric G. Hostetler and co-counsel Norman L. Rave, Jr.; Amanda Shafer Berman; Brian H. Lynk; Chloe H. Kolman on behalf of Respondents EPA and Regina A. McCarthy in 15-1363, Respondent EPA in 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, Respondents EPA and Gina McCarthy in 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1377, 15-1376, 15-1378, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1379, 15-1380. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383] (Kolman, Chloe) [Entered: 10/26/2015 03:47 PM]
October 26, 2015 CERTIFIED COPY [1580052] of Petitions for Review sent to respondent [ # 1579671-2 ], [ # 1579683-2 ], [ # 1579688-2 ], [ # 1579693-2 ], [ # 1579748-2 ], [ # 1579754-2 ], [ # 1579769-2 ], [ # 1579773-2 ], [ # 1579777-2 ], [ # 1579784-2 ], [ # 1579788-2 ], [ # 1579794-2 ], [ # 1579867-2 ], [ # 1579898-2 ], [ # 1579875-2 ], [ # 1579899-2 ], [ # 1579905-2 ], [ # 1579941-2 ], [ # 1579947-2 ], [ # 1580041-2 ]. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386] [Entered: 10/26/2015 04:19 PM]
October 26, 2015 LETTER [1580065] sent regarding attorney membership to Parker Douglas, Sam Hayes, Dale Schowengerdt, Patrick Burchette, Steven J. Oberg, and Bill Spears. Applications for Admission due 11/25/2015. [15-1363, 15-1376] [Entered: 10/26/2015 04:56 PM]
October 26, 2015 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1580060] filed by Aaron D. Lindstrom and co-counsel Neil D. Gordon on behalf of Petitioner State of Michigan in 15-1363. [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383, 15-1386] (Gordon, Neil) [Entered: 10/26/2015 04:37 PM]
October 23, 2015 UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1579989] submitted by petitioner State of West Virginia, et al. [Service Date: 10/23/2015] [15-1363, 15-1364, 15-1365, 15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378, 15-1379, 15-1380, 15-1382, 15-1383] [Entered: 10/26/2015 02:30 PM]
October 23, 2015 PETITION FOR REVIEW [1579671] filed by Arizona Corporation Commission, Commonwealth of Kentucky, North Carolina Department of Environmental Quality, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Colorado, State of Florida, State of Georgia, State of Indiana, State of Kansas, State of Louisiana, State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality, State of Michigan, State of Missouri, State of Montana, State of Nebraska, State of New Jersey, State of Ohio, State of South Carolina, State of South Dakota, State of Texas, State of Utah, State of West Virginia, State of Wisconsin and State of Wyoming of a decision by federal agency [Service Date: 10/23/2015 ] Disclosure Statement: Not Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [15-1363] [Entered: 10/23/2015 03:33 PM]
October 23, 2015 MOTION [1579999] filed by State of West Virginia, et al. for stay and for expedited consideration of petition for review (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/05/2015) [Service Date: 10/23/2015 by Email] Pages: 16-20. [15-1363] [Entered: 10/26/2015 02:39 PM]
October 23, 2015 MOTION [1580020] filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. for stay (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/05/2015) [Service Date: 10/23/2015 by Email] Pages: 16-20. [15-1382] [Entered: 10/26/2015 03:02 PM]
October 23, 2015 PETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [15-1363] [Entered: 10/23/2015 03:30 PM]
October 23, 2015 MOTION [1580014] filed by International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO in 15-1365, Utility Air Regulatory Group, et al. in 15-1370, Alabama Power Company, et al. in 15-1371, CO2 Task Force of the Florida Electric Power Coordinating Group, Inc. in 15-1372, Montana-Dakota Utilities Co. in 15-1373, Tri-State Generation and Transmission Association, Inc. in 15-1374, United Mine Workers of America in 15-1375, National Rural Electric Cooperative Association, et al. in 15-1376, Westar Energy, Inc. in 15-1377, NorthWestern Corporation in 15-1378 for stay (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/05/2015) [Service Date: 10/23/2015 by Email] Pages: 16-20. [15-1365, 15-1370, 15-1371, 15-1372, 15-1373, 15-1374, 15-1375, 15-1376, 15-1377, 15-1378] [Entered: 10/26/2015 02:55 PM]
October 23, 2015 MOTION [1580004] filed by Murray Energy Corporation in 15-1366, National Mining Association in 15-1367, American Coalition for Clean Coal Electricity in 15-1368 for stay (Response to Motion served by mail due on 11/05/2015) [Service Date: 10/23/2015 by Email] Pages: 16-20. [15-1366, 15-1367, 15-1368] [Entered: 10/26/2015 02:43 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: State of West Virginia, et al v. EPA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of West Virginia
Represented By: Patrick J. Morrisey
Represented By: Lindsay S. See
Represented By: Thomas T. Lampman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Texas
Represented By: Judd Edward Stone II
Represented By: Lisa Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Alabama
Represented By: Luther J. Strange III
Represented By: Andrew Lynn Brasher
Represented By: Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arizona Corporation Commission
Represented By: Oramel H. Skinner III
Represented By: Janet F. Wagner
Represented By: Janice M. Alward
Represented By: Maureen A. Scott Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Arkansas
Represented By: Jamie Leigh Ewing
Represented By: Lee Philip Rudofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Florida
Represented By: Daniel Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Georgia
Represented By: Andrew Alan Pinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Indiana
Represented By: Thomas M. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Kansas
Represented By: Jeffrey Allyn Chanay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Newberg II
Represented By: Gregory T. Dutton
Represented By: Sarah Adkins
Represented By: Samuel Robert Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Elizabeth Baker Murrill Esquire
Represented By: Megan K. Terrell Esquire
Represented By: Harry James Vorhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: State of Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality
Represented By: Charlotte Marie Goudeau
Represented By: Courtney Burdette
Represented By: Herman Robinson
Represented By: Elliott Bee Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance