Alston v. Pafumi et al
Plaintiff: Ira Alston
Defendant: Pafumi, Sharp, Claudio, Riordan, Sayor, Marquiss, Stewart, Bass, Bader, Bowenman, Wiseman, John Doe, Roston, Colleen, Savoie, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Sanders, D. Little, Powers, Faucher, Quiros and Murphy
Case Number: 3:2009cv01978
Filed: December 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Hartford
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Haight, Jr.
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER denying 382 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/12/2016. (Williams, C)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER denying 268 , 269 , 273 , and 287 Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 05/10/2016. (LaPre, E.)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER denying 227 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 02/04/2016. (LaPre, E.)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 191 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 01/07/2016. (LaPre, E.)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 164 RULING denying 112 Motion to Compel; denying 113 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 113 Motion for Order; denying 114 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 114 Motion for Order; denying 115 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 115 Motion for Clarification; denying 116 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 120 Motion to Compel; denying 120 Motion for Sanctions; denying 121 Motion to Compel; denying 121 Motion for Sanctions; denying 131 Motion; denying 134 Motion for Extens ion of Time; denying 136 Motion for Clarification; denying 137 Motion for Clarification; denying 139 Motion for Extension of Time; denying 142 Motion to Stay; denying 145 Motion to Expedite; denying 149 Motion. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on December 7, 2012. (Caldwell, M.)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 RULING ON PENDING MOTIONS (see attached) granting 92 Motion for Clarification, which clarification is provided herein; granting 92 Motion for Reconsideration, but upon reconsideration, affirming the prior ruling; denying as unnecessary 93 Motion for Extension of Time; denying 98 Motion to Expedite; and denying 99 Motion for a Favorable Ruling. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on September 12, 2011. (Lacedonia, J.)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 RULING (see attached) denying as moot 60 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw; granting in part 61 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time; granting 64 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel responses to the October 25, 2010 discovery requests; denying 75 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel responses to his June 2010 correspondence; granting 76 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss all claims against Defendant Darryl Little, which are hereby dismissed with prejudice; denying 78 Plaintiff& #039;s Motion to Set Aside Order; denying 83 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time; denying as moot 84 Plaintiff's Motion for Emergency Relief; granting in part 88 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall res pond to the October 25, 2010 and December 25, 2010 Requests for Production of Documents within thirty (30) days of this order, which is on or before June 17, 2011. Any motions for summary judgment shall be filed within sixty (60) days of this order, which is on or before July 18, 2011. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on May 18, 2011. (Lacedonia, J.)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 RULING: denying without prejudice to renew at a later time 43 Motion to Depose Inmates. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/5/2011. (Rodko, B.)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 RULING ON PENDING MOTIONS: denying as moot 31 Motion for Protective Order; denying as moot 36 Motion ; denying without prejudice to renew at a later time 37 Motion to Compel; granting 40 Motion for Leave to File; denying as moot 44 Motion to Expedite; denying 45 Motion to Stay; denying 46 Motion ; denying as moot 47 Motion ; denying 50 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 51 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 12/10/2010. (Rodko, B.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alston v. Pafumi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira Alston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pafumi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sayor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowenman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savoie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?