DURU v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
Plaintiff: ROSE ADANMA DURU
Defendant: ERIC BRENNEN, SOUTHEAST PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, MARK S. ZEMELMAN, ATLANTA BEHAVIORAL CARE, BANK OF AMERICA FINANCIAL INSTITUTION, KERRY KOHNEN, HENRY J. KAISER, SAINT JOSEPHS HOSPITAL, KAISER FAMILY FOUNDATION, HEIDI H. HARISSON, DEPARTMENT OF LABOR - STATE OF GEORGIA, SCOTT YOUNG, UNITED HEALTHCARE OF TEXAS, STATE OF GEORGIA, COBB COUNTY, GEORGIA, ANTHONY A. BARUTTA, RICHARDSON POLICE DEPARTMENT, KATHY LANCASTER, GEOFFREY S. SEWELL, CHRISTOPHER IVERSON, KROGER GROCERY CHAIN, ARTHUR M. SOUTHAM, KAISER PERMANENTE, KROGER PHARMACY, KAREN MITCHELL, MARTHA WILBUR, GARY D. WEICHBRODT, KAREN, U.S. CIVIL CASE ADMINISTRATORS, KIM KAISER, DONNA LYNNE, ROBERT SCHREINER, ANGELA D. CAESAR, MARIO HERNANDEZ, JEFFREY KLOPPER, BENJAMIN K. CHU, MILLER, HURON CONSULTING GROUP, CHRIS GRANT, HENRIETTA KING, METRO CARE SERVICES PSYCHIATRY, DORIS PORTER-BANKS, SCHREINER, LAWRENCE CARVER, KITTY, HHS, JANA S. BAKER, REED PITRE, RAYMOND J. BAXTER, EDGAR, CMS, KAISER PERMANENTE GEORGIA, DOJ-HHS, ENRIQUE GALURA, MICHAEL F. DOHERTY, CHUCK COLUMBUS, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, GREGORY A. ADAMS, PATRICK T. COURNEYA, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, KAISER PERMENANTE NATIONAL EXECUTIVES LEADERSHIP TEAM, METRO CARE SERVICES PHARMACY, OGLETREE, DEAKINS, NASH, SMOAK, AND STEWART, P.C., KAISER PERMANENTE GEORGIA PHARMACIES, BERNARD J. TYSON, EXECUTIVE MEDICAL DIRECTOR, KATHLEEN PFIEFER, RICHARD D. DANIELS and SAINT JOSEPH'S HOSPITAL
Case Number: 1:2017cv01547
Filed: August 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Change of Address by ROSE ADANMA DURU. (tth)
December 3, 2018 Filing 50 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- ROSE ADANMA DURU; Motion to Have Three United States Court Judges to Recuse Themselves from Plaintiff's Case. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/3/2018. (zmd)
July 2, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Change of Address by ROSE ADANMA DURU (ztd)
February 27, 2018 Filing 48 MANDATE of USCA as to #41 Notice of Appeal, filed by ROSE ADANMA DURU ; USCA Case Number 17-5253. (Attachments: #1 USCA Order)(td)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion #46 , it is hereby ORDERED that the claims against all Defendants are DISMISSED; and it is further ORDERED that the motions to dismiss filed by Gary Weichbrodt #27 and Metrocare Services #33 are GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/31/2018. (lcrdm2, )
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OPINION: The Court will sua sponte DISMISS the claims against all Defendants and will GRANT the motions to dismiss filed by Gary Weichbrodt #27 and Metrocare Services #33 . Because no claims remain in this action, the Court will DISMISS this case without prejudice. A separate Order #47 will issue. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/31/2018. (lcrdm2, )
January 9, 2018 Filing 45 Mail Returned as Undeliverable: Sent to ROSE ADANMA DURU; Type of Document Returned: Copies of the Minute Order, #34 Order, and #35 Order filed on 10/21/2017; Resent at New Address: 1822 Young Street, Dallas, TX 75201. (kt)
January 9, 2018 Filing 44 Mail Returned as Undeliverable: Sent to ROSE ADANMA DURU; Type of Document Returned: A copy of the #28 Order, filed on 10/6/2017; Resent at New Address: 1822 Young Street, Dallas, TX 75201. (kt)
January 9, 2018 Filing 43 Mail Returned as Undeliverable: Sent to ROSE ADANMA DURU; Type of Document Returned: A copy of the Minute Order, filed on 9/28/2017; Resent at New Address: 1822 Young Street, Dallas, TX 75201. (kt)
November 13, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file a brief in opposition to Defendant Metro Care Services's motion to dismiss #33 on or 12/8/2017; Plaintiff shall cause process to be served upon Defendants, and cause proof of service to be filed with the Court on or before 12/8/2017; Plaintiff shall, for each Defendant served, show cause why that Defendant should not be dismissed for lack of personal jurisdiction on or before 12/8/2017. (kt)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: On October 21, 2017, the Court entered an Order directing Plaintiff to cause proof of service to be filed with the Court and to show cause why each served Defendant should not be dismissed for lack of personal jurisdiction. See Dkt. #35 . The Clerk of Court mailed a copy of that Order to Plaintiff on October 23, 2017. Minute Entry (Oct. 23, 2017). On that same day, Duru notified the Court of her change of address. Dkt. #36 . Because Duru may not have received the Court's Order before moving to her current address, it is hereby ORDERED that the deadlines specified in the Court's Order, Dkt. #35 , are hereby VACATED and RESET to December 8, 2017. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Minute Order to Plaintiff at her updated address. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/13/2017. (lcrdm2, )
November 3, 2017 USCA Case Number 17-5253 for #41 Notice of Appeal, filed by ROSE ADANMA DURU. (zrdj)
October 31, 2017 Filing 42 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court re #41 Notice of Appeal. (td)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to Order on Motion for Default Judgment,,, by ROSE ADANMA DURU. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. "Let this be filed" signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/30/2017 (td) Modified on 11/1/2017 to docket text (jf).
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: For the reasons stated in the Court's Order #35 , Plaintiffs' motions for default judgment (Dkt. 37; Dkt. 38; Dkt. 39; Dkt. 40) are hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/27/2017. (lcrdm2, )
October 23, 2017 Filing 36 NOTICE of Change of Address by ROSE ADANMA DURU (td)
October 23, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file a brief in opposition to Defendant Metro Care Services's motion to dismiss #33 on or 11/6/2017; Plaintiff shall cause process to be served upon Defendants, and cause proof of service to be filed with the Court on or before 11/9/2017; Plaintiff shall, for each Defendant served, show cause why that Defendant should not be dismissed for lack of personal jurisdiction on or before 11/9/2017. (kt)
October 21, 2017 Filing 40 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Civil Case Administrators for the District of Columbia, U.S. District Court Clerk for the District of Columbia, Angela D. Caesar, and Department of Justice by ROSE ADANMA DURU "LET IT BE FILED" by Judge Randolph D. Moss (td)
October 21, 2017 Filing 39 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Karen Mitchell and DOJ for the Northern District of Texas by ROSE ADANMA DURU "LET IT BE FILED" by Judge Randolph D. Moss (td)
October 21, 2017 Filing 38 MOTION for Default Judgment as to United States Postal Service by ROSE ADANMA DURU "LET IT BE FILED" by Judge Randolph D. Moss (td)
October 21, 2017 Filing 37 MOTION for Default Judgment as to DOJ/HHS Northern District of Atlanta Georgia; HHS/Agent Miller; HHS/RN Kitty by ROSE ADANMA DURU; "LET IT BE FILED" by Judge Randolph D. Moss (td)
October 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall (1) cause process to be served upon Defendants; and (2) cause proof of service to be filed with the Court on or before November 9, 2017. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall, for each Defendant served, show cause why that Defendant should not be dismissed for lack of personal jurisdiction on or before November 9, 2017. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motions for default judgment (Dkt. 9; Dkt. 10; Dkt. 11; Dkt. 12; Dkt. 13; Dkt. 14; Dkt. 15; Dkt. 16; Dkt. 17; Dkt. 18; Dkt. 19; Dkt. 20; Dkt. 21; Dkt. 22; Dkt. 23; Dkt. 24; Dkt. 25; Dkt. 26) are DENIED. See document for details. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at her address of record. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/21/2017. (lcrdm2)
October 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a brief in opposition to Defendant Metro Care Services's motion to dismiss #33 on or November 6, 2017. If she does not file a response within the time provided, the Court may treat the motion as conceded, rule on Defendant's motion based on Defendant's arguments alone, or dismiss the complaint for failure to prosecute. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/21/2017. (lcrdm2, )
October 21, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Joel Geary's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #32 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. Joel Geary may appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/21/2017. (lcrdm2, )
October 18, 2017 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by METRO CARE SERVICES PHARMACY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Seaman, Jeffrey)
October 18, 2017 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joel Geary, :Firm- Vincent Serafino Geary Waddell Jenevein P.C., :Address- 1601 Elm St. Suite 4100 Dallas, TX 75201. Phone No. - 214-979-7451. Fax No. - 214-979-7402 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5165450. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by METRO CARE SERVICES PSYCHIATRY (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Feldman, Howard)
October 18, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard R. Feldman on behalf of METRO CARE SERVICES PSYCHIATRY (Feldman, Howard)
October 18, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Seaman on behalf of METRO CARE SERVICES PSYCHIATRY (Seaman, Jeffrey)
October 17, 2017 Filing 29 RESPONSE re #20 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by GARY D. WEICHBRODT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olszewski, Michael)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a brief in opposition to Defendant Gary Weichbrodt's motion to dismiss #27 on or before October 25, 2017. If she does not file a response within the time provided, the Court may treat the motion as conceded, rule on Defendant's motion based on Defendant's arguments alone, or dismiss the complaint for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/6/2017. (lcrdm2, )
October 6, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Brief in opposition to the #27 motion to dismiss due by 10/25/2017. (kt)
October 4, 2017 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss by GARY D. WEICHBRODT (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Olszewski, Michael)
October 4, 2017 Filing 26 MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendant: Richardson Police Department-Richardson, Texas by ROSE ADANMA DURU (td)
October 4, 2017 Filing 25 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants: Huron Consulting Group-Houston Texas; Huron Consulting Group-Dallas, Texas; Dr. Robert Schreinber; Mrs. Robert Schreiner-wife; Mrs. Schreiner-mother to Dr. Schreiner by ROSE ADANMA DURU (td)
October 4, 2017 Filing 24 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants: Metro Care Services Psychiatry; Metro Care Services & Pharmacy by ROSE ADANMA DURU (td)
October 4, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant: Bank of America Financial Institution by ROSE ADANMA DURU (td)
October 4, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants: St. Joseph's Hospital of Atlanta Georgia; Mr. Eric Brennen by ROSE ADANMA DURU (td)
October 4, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendants: Kroger Grocery Chain Stores; Kroger Pharmacy by ROSE ADANMA DURU (td)
October 4, 2017 Filing 20 MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendant: Dr. Gary Weichbrodt by ROSE ADANMA DURU (td)
October 4, 2017 Filing 19 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants: Kroger Grocery Chain; Kroger Pharmacy by ROSE ADANMA DURU (td)
October 4, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendants: Dr. Jeffrey Klopper; Atlanta Behavioral Care by ROSE ADANMA DURU (td)
October 4, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendants: Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC; Attorney Jana S. Baker; Attorney Heidi H. Harrison by ROSE ADANMA DURU (td)
October 4, 2017 Filing 16 MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendants: Doris Porter-Banks; Katherine Pfiefer; Karen-social worker by ROSE ADANMA DURU (td)
October 4, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendant Dr. Enrique Galura by ROSE ADANMA DURU (td)
October 4, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Dr. Lawrence Carver by ROSE ADANMA DURU (td)
October 4, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendant Kerry Kohnen by ROSE ADANMA DURU (td)
October 4, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendants: Michael F. Doherty; The Southeast Permanente Medical Group; Kaiser Permanente Georgia by ROSE ADANMA DURU (td)
October 4, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendants: Kaiser Permanente Georgia; Kaiser Permanente Georgia Pharmacy; Dr. Robert Schreiner by ROSE ADANMA DURU (td)
October 4, 2017 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendants: Bernard J. Tyson; Geoff S. Sewell; Gregory A. Sewell; Gregory A. Adams; Benjamin K. Chu; Richard (Dick) D. Daniels; Kathy Lancaster; Donna Lynne; Patrick T. Courneya; Arthur M. Southam; Anthony A. Barutta; Raymond J. Baxter; Chuck Columbus; Chris Grant; Scott Young; Mark S. Zelman; Kaiser Permanente U.S.A by ROSE ADANMA DURU (td)
October 4, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendants: Kaiser Family Foundation; Henry J. Kaiser; Kim Kaiser; Dr. Robert Schreiner; Kerry Kohnen; Henrietta King; Dr. Christopher Iverson; Dr. Edgar; Bernard J. Tyson' Benjamin K. Chu; Patrick T. Courneya; Kaiser Permanente GA; The Southeast Permanente Medical Group by ROSE ADANMA DURU (td)
September 29, 2017 NOTICE OF ERROR re #8 Notice of Proposed Order; emailed to molszewski@hdjn.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. In future, declaration and order should be attached to the motion docket entry, not filed separately. Do not refile. (znmw, )
September 28, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Proposed Order by GARY D. WEICHBRODT re #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kathleen W. Simcoe, :Firm- Owen Gleaton Egan Jones & Sweeney, :Address- 1180 Peachtree St NE St3000 Atlanta GA 303028. Phone No. - 404-688-2600. Fax No. - 404-525-4347 Filing fee (Olszewski, Michael)
September 28, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE by GARY D. WEICHBRODT re #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kathleen W. Simcoe, :Firm- Owen Gleaton Egan Jones & Sweeney, :Address- 1180 Peachtree St NE St3000 Atlanta GA 303028. Phone No. - 404-688-2600. Fax No. - 404-525-4347 Filing fee (Olszewski, Michael)
September 28, 2017 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kathleen W. Simcoe, :Firm- Owen Gleaton Egan Jones & Sweeney, :Address- 1180 Peachtree St NE St3000 Atlanta GA 303028. Phone No. - 404-688-2600. Fax No. - 404-525-4347 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5136593. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GARY D. WEICHBRODT (Olszewski, Michael)
September 28, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Olszewski on behalf of GARY D. WEICHBRODT (Olszewski, Michael)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Kathleen Simcoe's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #6 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. Kathleen Simcoe may appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/28/2017. (lcrdm2, )
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Notice of Non-Suit #4 filed by Plaintiff, it is hereby ORDERED that the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) and the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) are DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/20/2017. (lcrdm2, )
September 18, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Non-Suit by ROSE ADANMA DURU (td)
August 28, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of CMS, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DOJ-HHS, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE (Rogers, Joshua)
August 10, 2017 Summons (9) Issued as to HHS, HENRY J. KAISER, KITTY, KROGER PHARMACY, SCHREINER, ROBERT SCHREINER, UNITED HEALTHCARE OF TEXAS. (zrdj)
August 8, 2017 Summons (56) Issued as to GREGORY A. ADAMS, JANA S. BAKER, BANK OF AMERICA FINANCIAL INSTITUTION, ANTHONY A. BARUTTA, RAYMOND J. BAXTER, ERIC BRENNEN, ANGELA D. CAESAR, LAWRENCE CARVER, BENJAMIN K. CHU, CMS, CHUCK COLUMBUS, PATRICK T. COURNEYA, RICHARD D. DANIELS, MICHAEL F. DOHERTY, ENRIQUE GALURA, CHRIS GRANT, HEIDI H. HARISSON, MARIO HERNANDEZ, HHS, CHRISTOPHER IVERSON, KIM KAISER, KAISER FAMILY FOUNDATION, KAISER PERMANENTE, KAISER PERMANENTE GEORGIA, KAREN, HENRIETTA KING, JEFFREY KLOPPER, KERRY KOHNEN, KROGER GROCERY CHAIN, KROGER PHARMACY, KATHY LANCASTER, DONNA LYNNE, METRO CARE SERVICES PHARMACY, METRO CARE SERVICES PSYCHIATRY, MILLER, KAREN MITCHELL, KATHLEEN PFIEFER, DORIS PORTER-BANKS, RICHARDSON POLICE DEPARTMENT, SAINT JOSEPHS HOSPITAL, ROBERT SCHREINER, GEOFFREY S. SEWELL, ARTHUR M. SOUTHAM, SOUTHEAST PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, BERNARD J. TYSON, U.S. CIVIL CASE ADMINISTRATORS, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, GARY D. WEICHBRODT, MARTHA WILBUR, SCOTT YOUNG, MARK S. ZEMELMAN,COBB COUNTY, GEORGIA,DEPARTMENT OF LABOR - STATE OF GEORGIA,STATE OF GEORGIA,EDGAR, OGLETREE, DEAKINS, NASH, SMOAK, AND STEWART, P.C. (zrdj) Modified to add parties on 8/9/2017 (td).
August 1, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ROSE ADANMA DURU. Case related to Case No. Nothern District of Dallas Texas 3:14cv3817; 3:14cv1162. (td)
August 1, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GREGORY A. ADAMS, JANA S. BAKER, BANK OF AMERICA FINANCIAL INSTITUTION, ANTHONY A. BARUTTA, RAYMOND J. BAXTER, ERIC BRENNEN, ANGELA D. CAESAR, LAWRENCE CARVER, BENJAMIN K. CHU, CMS, CHUCK COLUMBUS, PATRICK T. COURNEYA, RICHARD D. DANIELS, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, MICHAEL F. DOHERTY, DOJ-HHS, EXECUTIVE MEDICAL DIRECTOR, ENRIQUE GALURA, CHRIS GRANT, HEIDI H. HARISSON, MARIO HERNANDEZ, HHS, HURON CONSULTING GROUP, CHRISTOPHER IVERSON, HENRY J. KAISER, KIM KAISER, KAISER FAMILY FOUNDATION, KAISER PERMANENTE, KAISER PERMANENTE GEORGIA, KAISER PERMANENTE GEORGIA PHARMACIES, KAISER PERMENANTE NATIONAL EXECUTIVES LEADERSHIP TEAM, KAREN, HENRIETTA KING, KITTY, JEFFREY KLOPPER, KERRY KOHNEN, KROGER GROCERY CHAIN, KROGER PHARMACY, KATHY LANCASTER, DONNA LYNNE, METRO CARE SERVICES PHARMACY, METRO CARE SERVICES PSYCHIATRY, MILLER, KAREN MITCHELL, KATHLEEN PFIEFER, REED PITRE, DORIS PORTER-BANKS, RICHARDSON POLICE DEPARTMENT, SAINT JOSEPHS HOSPITAL, SCHREINER, ROBERT SCHREINER, GEOFFREY S. SEWELL, ARTHUR M. SOUTHAM, SOUTHEAST PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, BERNARD J. TYSON, U.S. CIVIL CASE ADMINISTRATORS, UNITED HEALTHCARE OF TEXAS, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, GARY D. WEICHBRODT, MARTHA WILBUR, SCOTT YOUNG, MARK S. ZEMELMAN ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616086375) with Jury Demand filed by ROSE ADANMA DURU. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(td)
August 1, 2017 SUMMONS Not Issued as to All Defendants (td)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DURU v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC BRENNEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHEAST PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK S. ZEMELMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLANTA BEHAVIORAL CARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA FINANCIAL INSTITUTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KERRY KOHNEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENRY J. KAISER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAINT JOSEPHS HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER FAMILY FOUNDATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEIDI H. HARISSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF LABOR - STATE OF GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE OF TEXAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COBB COUNTY, GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY A. BARUTTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARDSON POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHY LANCASTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEOFFREY S. SEWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER IVERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KROGER GROCERY CHAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARTHUR M. SOUTHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER PERMANENTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KROGER PHARMACY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN MITCHELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTHA WILBUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY D. WEICHBRODT
Represented By: Michael Edward Olszewski
Represented By: Kathleen W. Simcoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CIVIL CASE ADMINISTRATORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIM KAISER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONNA LYNNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT SCHREINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGELA D. CAESAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIO HERNANDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY KLOPPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENJAMIN K. CHU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HURON CONSULTING GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS GRANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENRIETTA KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METRO CARE SERVICES PSYCHIATRY
Represented By: Joel Geary
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Seaman
Represented By: Howard R. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DORIS PORTER-BANKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHREINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWRENCE CARVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KITTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANA S. BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REED PITRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAYMOND J. BAXTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDGAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMS
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER PERMANENTE GEORGIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOJ-HHS
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENRIQUE GALURA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL F. DOHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHUCK COLUMBUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY A. ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK T. COURNEYA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Joshua L. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER PERMENANTE NATIONAL EXECUTIVES LEADERSHIP TEAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METRO CARE SERVICES PHARMACY
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Seaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OGLETREE, DEAKINS, NASH, SMOAK, AND STEWART, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER PERMANENTE GEORGIA PHARMACIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERNARD J. TYSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXECUTIVE MEDICAL DIRECTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN PFIEFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD D. DANIELS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAINT JOSEPH'S HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSE ADANMA DURU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?