DAKOTA RESOURCE COUNCIL et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
Plaintiff: DAKOTA RESOURCE COUNCIL, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, LIVING RIVERS, MONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER, SIERRA CLUB, WATERKEEPER ALLIANCE, WESTERN WATERSHEDS PROJECT, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS, RIO GRANDE RIVERKEEPER, CITIZENS FOR A HEALTHY COMMUNITY and LIVING RIVERS & COLORADO RIVERKEEPER
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, DEBRA HAALAND, BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, TRACY STONE-MANNING, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR and U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Not Classified By Court: STATE OF UTAH, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF OKLAHOMA and STATE OF WYOMING
Intervenor Defendant: STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA
Case Number: 1:2022cv01853
Filed: June 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Intervene by STATE OF UTAH, STATE OF MONTANA, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, STATE OF WYOMING. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Holyoak, Melissa)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- PHILIP ZOEBISCH: Final Brief. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "LEAVE TO FILE DENIED. Non-compliant with Local Civil Rule 7(o) regarding amicus briefs." Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/23/2022. (zjm)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the State of North Dakota's Motion to Intervene as a Defendant-Intervenor in this action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a)(2), noting no opposition, and finding good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the #21 Motion to Intervene is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/9/2022. (lccrc1)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Intervene by STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - State of ND Comments on DOI-BL-MT-0000-2021-0006-EA, #3 Exhibit 2 - Comment Submission Confirmation, #4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of L. Helms, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Seby, Paul)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Marie Boronow on behalf of All Defendants (Boronow, Clare)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Luther L. Hajek on behalf of All Defendants (Hajek, Luther)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle James Tisdel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tisdel, Kyle)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- PHILIP ZOEBISCH: Notice This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "LEAVE TO FILE DENIED. Non-compliant with Local Civil Rule 7(o) and premature." Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 07/14/2022. (zjm)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEBRA HAALAND served on 7/7/2022; TRACY STONE-MANNING served on 7/7/2022; U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 7/7/2022; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 7/7/2022 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mailing, #2 Certified Mail Receipts)(Chillcott, Barbara)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/08/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mailing, #2 Certified Mail Receipts)(Chillcott, Barbara)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/8/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mailing, #2 Certified Mail Receipts)(Chillcott, Barbara)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A Hornbein on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hornbein, Melissa)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Chillcott, Barbara)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WESTERN WATERSHEDS PROJECT (Chillcott, Barbara)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WATERKEEPER ALLIANCE (Chillcott, Barbara)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SIERRA CLUB (Chillcott, Barbara)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RIO GRANDE RIVERKEEPER (Chillcott, Barbara)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER (Chillcott, Barbara)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LIVING RIVERS (Chillcott, Barbara)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR A HEALTHY COMMUNITY (Chillcott, Barbara)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Chillcott, Barbara)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DAKOTA RESOURCE COUNCIL (Chillcott, Barbara)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (znmg)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9337397) filed by WATERKEEPER ALLIANCE, LIVING RIVERS, WESTERN WATERSHEDS PROJECT, RIO GRANDE RIVERKEEPER, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS, DAKOTA RESOURCE COUNCIL, MONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER, CITIZENS FOR A HEALTHY COMMUNITY, SIERRA CLUB. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Department of the Interior, #3 Summons Debra Haaland, #4 Summons Bureau of Land Management, #5 Summons Tracy Stone-Manning, #6 Summons United States Attorney District D.C., #7 Summons United States Attorney)(Chillcott, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAKOTA RESOURCE COUNCIL et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAKOTA RESOURCE COUNCIL
Represented By: Barbara L. Chillcott
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: Barbara L. Chillcott
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIVING RIVERS
Represented By: Barbara L. Chillcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTANA ENVIRONMENTAL INFORMATION CENTER
Represented By: Barbara L. Chillcott
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIERRA CLUB
Represented By: Barbara L. Chillcott
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WATERKEEPER ALLIANCE
Represented By: Barbara L. Chillcott
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTERN WATERSHEDS PROJECT
Represented By: Barbara L. Chillcott
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Represented By: Barbara L. Chillcott
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RIO GRANDE RIVERKEEPER
Represented By: Barbara L. Chillcott
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITIZENS FOR A HEALTHY COMMUNITY
Represented By: Barbara L. Chillcott
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIVING RIVERS & COLORADO RIVERKEEPER
Represented By: Kyle James Tisdel
Represented By: Melissa A Hornbein
Represented By: Barbara L. Chillcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBRA HAALAND
Represented By: Clare Marie Boronow
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY STONE-MANNING
Represented By: Clare Marie Boronow
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By: Clare Marie Boronow
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Represented By: Clare Marie Boronow
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: STATE OF UTAH
Represented By: Melissa A. Holyoak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: STATE OF MONTANA
Represented By: Melissa A. Holyoak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: STATE OF OKLAHOMA
Represented By: Melissa A. Holyoak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: STATE OF WYOMING
Represented By: Melissa A. Holyoak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: STATE OF NORTH DAKOTA
Represented By: Paul Martin Seby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?