IN RE: Ethicon Physiomesh Flexible Composite Hernia Mesh Products Liability Litigation
Plaintiff: Robert Gentry, Elizabeth Brady, Michelle Ayala, Marca Rottnek, WILLIAM POLLARD, Shawn Sweeney, Mary Burney, Darrell Burthe, George W. Lind, Jennifer Milam, Victor P. Sanders, Ronnie Burl, Thomas Hinton, Alvaro Garza, Patricia Burthe, Mary Miller, Vanessa Williams, Carla Nichols, Larry Slice, Robert B. Carrillo, Zenia Fortson, Arezoo King, Sonia Stephens, Bilyana Barakova, Teresa Drummond, Debra E. Webster, Heather Gallagher, Kyle Macneney, Gene Miller, Daniel R. Ryder, Robert Burdge, Donald Yount, Irene Fisher, Joseph Wass, Larry Jordan, Ginger Mettler, Ronne White, Valeri Barakova, Joanne Quinn, Billiot Chandelle, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Heather Haug, Henry Lee Brown, Erick Keefer, Annie Jewell, Diana Blom, Sherri Thomas, Patricia Miller, Tadd Jackman, Ronald P. Keller, Sharon Scott, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Sherrie Stump, Dora V McNeill, Paula D. Andrews, Tina Burr, Brandi Conary, George Holloway, Frederick R. Basile, Terry Henderson, Jennifer Stone, Carmen Garcia, Stephen Bush, Leon Williams, Stephanie Delmore, Dane Gallivan, Martin Garcia, Edward Grzunov, Tina Vicari, Gabrielle Cox, Glenn Kaylor, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Michael R. Lucas, Shannon Perkins, Daisy Yount, Rhiannon Flair, Shannon Talkington, David Ramey, Teresa Tiller, David A. Sunter, Robert Mead, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Joseph Barris, Emily Walker, John H. Lenox, Terry Bohanan, Brandon Latimer, Michael Rivet, David MIddleton Carr, Marilyn Owens, Lydia Edwards, Reginald Knighten, MARY P JOHNSON, Linda Aird, Crystal Barnes, Lori Dickson, Errol Jewell, Leslie Adams, Police Officer David King, Donna Adams, Martha Conner, Charles Racine, John H. Simmons, Maura Alvarado, Bill Tedford, JO ANN LAX, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Richard Sears, Lizzey Annett, Carol Dailey, Linda O'Bannon, Carlos Sanders, Rebecca Dirks, Linda Loraine, Lillian Graham, Michael Elinson, Nancy Shelton, Marcelle Grzunov, Collin G. Ward, Vincent Mettler, John Guerra, Donna Helton, Ray F. Milam, Sarah Ann Gilman, IDA J. DRAKE, John Oberg, Billy Ray Stephens, Eldon Foux, Matreia Gentry, John Haug, Larry Perkins, Clint Levack, Marvin Franklin, John M. Thomas, Valerie Sundberg, Deborah Lucas, Peggy D. Ward, William Stanley Edwards, Esteban Pagan, Corenth Owens, Shetia Steward, Alison Keefer, Doreen Worrell, Priscilla Vela, Robert Hodge, Kathy Edwards, David Watring, Chad Hixon, James Creahan, James Porter, Mary Kaylor, Krystahl Davis, Melinda Rall, Kevin Rader, Eddie Shelton, Katharine Hixon, Jacqueline Barris, Connie Franklin, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr., Jay Johnson, Patricia Mead, Edith J. Carr, Matthew Huff, Mary Nimmons, Gary Goodson, Patricia Wright, Gail Fraser, Charmaine Porter, Laura Lutz, Robert Asplin, William Blom, Diana Jane Picolla, Marilyn Macneney, NATALIA ELINSON, Linda K. McKee, Linda J. Davis, Dawn Marie Greene, Augustine Dillard, Theresa S. Ballard, Dena Falini, Jeffery Peter Falini and Ciera Williams
Defendant: Does 1 - 50, Ethicon, Inc., Covidien, LP and Johnson & Johnson
Not Classified By Court: Exponent Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017md02782
Filed: June 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Office: Atlanta Office
County: Fulton
Presiding Judge: Richard W Story
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 528 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Prof Dr. Med Bernd Klosterhalfen filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Gage, William)
February 11, 2020 Filing 527 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rich Hutchinson filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Theresa S. Ballard, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Augustine Dillard, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Exponent Inc., Dena Falini, Jeffery Peter Falini, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Dawn Marie Greene, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Ciera Williams, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Orent, Jonathan)
February 11, 2020 Filing 526 First NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. David H. Berger filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Theresa S. Ballard, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Augustine Dillard, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Exponent Inc., Dena Falini, Jeffery Peter Falini, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Dawn Marie Greene, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Ciera Williams, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Orent, Jonathan)
February 11, 2020 Filing 525 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rich Hutchinson filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Theresa S. Ballard, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Augustine Dillard, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Exponent Inc., Dena Falini, Jeffery Peter Falini, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Dawn Marie Greene, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Ciera Williams, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Orent, Jonathan)
February 7, 2020 Filing 524 First NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rich Hutchinson filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Theresa S. Ballard, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Augustine Dillard, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Exponent Inc., Dena Falini, Jeffery Peter Falini, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Dawn Marie Greene, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Ciera Williams, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Orent, Jonathan)
February 7, 2020 Filing 523 NOTICE by Exponent Inc. re #519 Notice to Take Deposition,,,,,,,,,,,, Objection to Deposition Notice and Document Request (Allen, Jefferson)
February 7, 2020 Filing 522 NOTICE by Exponent Inc. re #520 Affidavit of Service Objection to Subpoena (Allen, Jefferson)
February 6, 2020 Filing 521 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bruce Crookes, MD, FACS filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Gage, William)
February 3, 2020 Filing 520 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action, as to Exponent, Inc.. (Garrard, Henry)
February 3, 2020 Filing 519 First NOTICE to Take Deposition of STEVEN B. MACLEAN, PHD filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Theresa S. Ballard, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Covidien, LP, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Augustine Dillard, Rebecca Dirks, Does 1 - 50, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Ethicon, Inc., Dena Falini, Jeffery Peter Falini, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Dawn Marie Greene, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Johnson & Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Ciera Williams, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Orent, Jonathan)
January 30, 2020 Filing 518 NOTICE by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Michelle Ayala, Theresa S. Ballard, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Augustine Dillard, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Dena Falini, Jeffery Peter Falini, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Dawn Marie Greene, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Ciera Williams, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
January 29, 2020 Filing 517 First NOTICE to Take Deposition of SHELBY THAMES filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Theresa S. Ballard, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Covidien, LP, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Augustine Dillard, Rebecca Dirks, Does 1 - 50, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Ethicon, Inc., Dena Falini, Jeffery Peter Falini, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Dawn Marie Greene, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Johnson & Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Ciera Williams, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Orent, Jonathan)
January 28, 2020 Filing 516 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of DAVID ZABEL, MD filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Theresa S. Ballard, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Covidien, LP, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Augustine Dillard, Rebecca Dirks, Does 1 - 50, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Ethicon, Inc., Dena Falini, Jeffery Peter Falini, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Dawn Marie Greene, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Johnson & Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Ciera Williams, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Orent, Jonathan)
January 28, 2020 Filing 515 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry G. Garrard, III on behalf of Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Michelle Ayala, Theresa S. Ballard, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Covidien, LP, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Augustine Dillard, Rebecca Dirks, Does 1 - 50, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Ethicon, Inc., Dena Falini, Jeffery Peter Falini, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Dawn Marie Greene, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Johnson & Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Ciera Williams, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
January 23, 2020 Filing 514 First NOTICE to Take Deposition of David Zabel, M.D. filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Theresa S. Ballard, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Covidien, LP, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Augustine Dillard, Rebecca Dirks, Does 1 - 50, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Ethicon, Inc., Dena Falini, Jeffery Peter Falini, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Dawn Marie Greene, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Johnson & Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Ciera Williams, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Orent, Jonathan)
January 22, 2020 Filing 513 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bruce Crookes, M.D., F.A.C.S. filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Gage, William)
January 21, 2020 Filing 512 TRANSCRIPT of the Status Conference Hearing Proceedings held on January 8, 2020, before Judge Richard W. Story. Court Reporter/Transcriber Amanda Lohnaas. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/11/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
January 17, 2020 Filing 511 RESPONSE re #508 Notice to Take Deposition of Bryan Brown, Ph.D. filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Michelle Ayala, Theresa S. Ballard, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Covidien, LP, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Augustine Dillard, Rebecca Dirks, Does 1 - 50, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Ethicon, Inc., Dena Falini, Jeffery Peter Falini, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Dawn Marie Greene, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Johnson & Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Ciera Williams, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount. (Garrard, Patrick)
January 17, 2020 Filing 510 First NOTICE to Take Deposition of T. PAUL MACE, MD filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Theresa S. Ballard, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Covidien, LP, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Augustine Dillard, Rebecca Dirks, Does 1 - 50, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Ethicon, Inc., Dena Falini, Jeffery Peter Falini, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Dawn Marie Greene, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Johnson & Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Ciera Williams, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Orent, Jonathan)
January 17, 2020 Filing 509 First NOTICE to Take Deposition of GUY VOELLER, MD filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Theresa S. Ballard, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Covidien, LP, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Augustine Dillard, Rebecca Dirks, Does 1 - 50, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Ethicon, Inc., Dena Falini, Jeffery Peter Falini, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Dawn Marie Greene, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Johnson & Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Ciera Williams, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Orent, Jonathan)
January 16, 2020 Filing 508 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bryan Brown, Ph.D. filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Gage, William)
January 15, 2020 Filing 506 RESPONSE re #502 Notice to Take Deposition Hobart W. Harris, M.D., MPH, F.A.C.S. filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Michelle Ayala, Theresa S. Ballard, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Covidien, LP, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Augustine Dillard, Rebecca Dirks, Does 1 - 50, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Ethicon, Inc., Dena Falini, Jeffery Peter Falini, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Dawn Marie Greene, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Johnson & Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Ciera Williams, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount. (Garrard, Henry)
January 14, 2020 Filing 505 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Prof Dr. Med Bernd Klosterhalfen filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Gage, William)
January 8, 2020 Filing 507 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Story: Status Conference held on 1/8/2020. The Court heard a report as to the New Jersey litigation. Counsel presented an updated report of scheduled expert depositions. An update regarding supplemental disclosure order (PPO No. 17) was given. The Court and counsel discussed PPO 19, the manner and form of submission ofmemorandum in support of proposed trial, order of selection of plaintiffs for trial and the possible timing of trial. The Court noted that pretrial deadlines will be addressed at the next status conference on February 26th. (Court Reporter Amanda Lohnaas)(sk)
January 8, 2020 Filing 504 RESPONSE re #501 Notice to Take Deposition,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER ALLOWING cell phones, laptop computes and other electronic devices IN THE COURTROOM on Wednesday, January 8, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. for authorized attendees of the MDL Status Conference. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 01/08/20. (sk)
January 7, 2020 Filing 502 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Hobart W. Harris, M.D., MPH, F.A.C.S. filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Gage, William)
January 6, 2020 Filing 501 First NOTICE to Take Deposition of REYNALDO LIBROJO filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Theresa S. Ballard, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Covidien, LP, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Augustine Dillard, Rebecca Dirks, Does 1 - 50, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Ethicon, Inc., Dena Falini, Jeffery Peter Falini, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Dawn Marie Greene, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Johnson & Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Ciera Williams, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Orent, Jonathan)
January 2, 2020 Filing 500 OBJECTION re #499 Notice to Take Deposition Eric M. Pauli, M.D. by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Michelle Ayala, Theresa S. Ballard, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Covidien, LP, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Augustine Dillard, Rebecca Dirks, Does 1 - 50, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Ethicon, Inc., Dena Falini, Jeffery Peter Falini, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Dawn Marie Greene, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Johnson & Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Ciera Williams, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount. (Garrard, Henry)
December 28, 2019 Filing 499 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Eric M. Pauli, M.D., F.A.C.S. filed by Johnson & Johnson (Gage, William)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 498 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 19 - (Amended Proposed Discovery, Scheduling, and Case Management Order. Initial Discovery Pool). Expert Discovery for the Trial Pool Cases shall be completed by 2/28/2020. By February 24, 2020, each side shall submit to the Court, outside of the ECF system, a memorandum in support of their proposed manner of trial, order of selection of plaintiffs for trial, and timing of trial(s). By March 2, 2020, the parties may submit a response to the opposing party's memorandum regarding the proposed manner of trial and order of cases for trial, and timing of trial(s). Dispositive or Daubert motions shall be filed in each of the Trial Cases by April 3, 2020. Responses shall be filed by April 22, 2020. Replies shall be filed by April 30, 2020. The Court will set the first trial for July 20, 2020. (For details, see order) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/16/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
December 11, 2019 Filing 497 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-61 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (bdb)
December 9, 2019 Filing 496 RESPONSE re #492 Notice to Take Deposition Dr. Sean B. Orenstein filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Michelle Ayala, Theresa S. Ballard, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Covidien, LP, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Augustine Dillard, Rebecca Dirks, Does 1 - 50, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Ethicon, Inc., Dena Falini, Jeffery Peter Falini, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Dawn Marie Greene, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Johnson & Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Ciera Williams, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount. (Garrard, Henry)
December 9, 2019 Filing 495 RESPONSE re #493 Notice to Take Deposition Dr. Kevin C. Petersen filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Michelle Ayala, Theresa S. Ballard, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Covidien, LP, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Augustine Dillard, Rebecca Dirks, Does 1 - 50, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Ethicon, Inc., Dena Falini, Jeffery Peter Falini, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Dawn Marie Greene, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Johnson & Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Ciera Williams, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount. (Garrard, Henry)
December 5, 2019 Filing 494 RESPONSE re #488 Notice to Take Deposition OF DR. BRYAN BROWN, PH.D. filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Michelle Ayala, Theresa S. Ballard, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Covidien, LP, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Augustine Dillard, Rebecca Dirks, Does 1 - 50, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Ethicon, Inc., Dena Falini, Jeffery Peter Falini, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Dawn Marie Greene, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Johnson & Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Ciera Williams, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount. (Garrard, Henry)
November 26, 2019 Filing 493 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kevin C. Petersen, M.D. filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Gage, William)
November 26, 2019 Filing 492 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sean B. Orenstein, M.D. filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Gage, William)
November 22, 2019 Filing 490 NOTICE of Appearance by Raquel Lucas on behalf of Johnson & Johnson (Lucas, Raquel)
November 22, 2019 Filing 489 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Cohen on behalf of Johnson & Johnson (Cohen, David)
November 21, 2019 Filing 488 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bryan Brown, PhD filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Gage, William)
November 21, 2019 Filing 487 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Stephen J. Ferzoco, M.D., F.A.C.S. filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Gage, William)
November 14, 2019 Filing 486 TRANSCRIPT of the Status Conference Hearing Proceedings held on November 5, 2019, before Judge Richard W. Story. Court Reporter/Transcriber Amanda Lohnaas. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/5/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/16/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
November 5, 2019 Filing 491 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Story: Status Conference held on 11/5/2019. The Court heard updates and discussed deadlines. The next conference is set for Wednesday, January 8, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Amanda Lohnaas)(sk)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ORDER ALLOWING cell phones, laptop computes and other electronic devices IN THE COURTROOM on Tuesday, November 5, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. for authorized attendees of the MDL Status Conference. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/04/19. (copies delivered to CSO security station)(sk)
October 29, 2019 Notification of Docket Correction re 484 Third Party Complaint. MDL Short Form Complaint incorrectly filed in lead case. Attorney notified to re-file. Docket entry security updated. (sk)
October 21, 2019 Filing 483 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Johnson & Johnson's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Fifth Request for Production by Johnson & Johnson.(Rumanek, S.)
October 21, 2019 Filing 482 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Ethicon, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Fifth Request for Production by Ethicon, Inc..(Rumanek, S.)
October 21, 2019 Filing 481 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Johnson & Johnson's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Third Interrogatories by Johnson & Johnson.(Rumanek, S.)
October 21, 2019 Filing 480 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Ethicon Inc's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Third Interrogatories by Ethicon, Inc..(Rumanek, S.)
October 16, 2019 Filing 479 NOTICE of Appearance by Rosemarie Riddell Bogdan on behalf of Ciera Williams (Attachments: #1 Consent to Change Attorney)(Bogdan, Rosemarie)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 478 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 18 - (Amended Proposed Discovery, Scheduling, and Case Management Order - Initial Discovery Pool) (See order for details) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/23/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
September 23, 2019 Filing 477 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiffs' Third Interrogatories to Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon, Inc. by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Theresa S. Ballard, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Augustine Dillard, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Dena Falini, Jeffery Peter Falini, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Dawn Marie Greene, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount.(Garrard, Henry)
September 23, 2019 Filing 476 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiffs' Fifth Request for Production of Documents to Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon, Inc. by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Theresa S. Ballard, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Augustine Dillard, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Dena Falini, Jeffery Peter Falini, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Dawn Marie Greene, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount.(Garrard, Henry)
September 16, 2019 Filing 475 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Rule 26 Expert Disclosures by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson.(Jackson, G.)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 474 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 17 - SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURES - Plaintiffs shall serve completed Supplemental Disclosures as described in this Order by November 15, 2019. For cases filed or transferred after the date of this Order, Supplemental Disclosures shall be served within forty-five (45) days of the filing of the Complaint or the transfer of the case into this MDL. See order for all materials to be included in Supplemental Discovery. Other than as set forth within this order, no other extensions will be granted unless agreed to by all parties. If a Plaintiff fails to cure the deficiency within the Cure Period, Defendants may file a motion to show good cause why the case should not be subject to a sanctions order from the Court. This motion may be filed without leave of Court and without any need for further efforts to meet-and-confer. Plaintiffs shall thereafter have 10 days to file a Response to the Motion. Defendants may file a Reply brief within 7 days of Plaintiffs' Response. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to file a copy of this Order in 1:17-MD-02782-RWS and it shall apply to each related case. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/16/2019. (See order for further details) Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
August 2, 2019 Filing 473 FILED IN ERROR-SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson with Jury Demand filed by Jeffery Peter Falini, Dena Falini. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nations, Howard) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 8/6/2019-Counsel refiled new case number 1:19-cv-3507-RWS (bdb).
July 29, 2019 Filing 472 TRANSCRIPT of the Status Conference Hearing Proceedings held on July 11, 2019, before Judge Richard W. Story. Court Reporter/Transcriber Amanda Lohnaas. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/19/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
July 11, 2019 Filing 471 Minute Entryfor proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Story: Status Conference held on 7/11/2019. The next scheduled conference is set for Thursday, September 26, 2019. (Court Reporter Amanda Lohnaas)(sk)
July 10, 2019 Filing 470 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Clark on behalf of Dawn Marie Greene (Clark, Brittany)
July 10, 2019 Filing 469 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Clark on behalf of Augustine Dillard (Clark, Brittany)
July 10, 2019 Filing 468 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Clark on behalf of Theresa S. Ballard (Clark, Brittany)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on Thursday, July 11, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 07/09/19. (sk)
June 29, 2019 Filing 466 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiffs' Amended First Request for Admissions to Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon Inc. by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount.(Garrard, Henry)
June 28, 2019 Filing 465 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiffs' Third Request for Admission to Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon, Inc. by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount.(Garrard, Henry)
June 28, 2019 Filing 464 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiffs' Second Request for Admission to Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon, Inc. by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount.(Garrard, Henry)
June 27, 2019 Filing 463 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiffs' First Request for Admission to Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon, Inc. by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount.(Garrard, Henry)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 462 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 16 (Amended Proposed Discovery, Scheduling, and Case Management Order Initial Discovery Pool) Daubert Motions due by January 10, 2020. Responses shall be filed by January 31, 2020. Replies shall be filed by February 14, 2020. Court will set first trial for April 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 6/20/2019. (See order for details) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 6/20/2019. (Filed in New MDL Cases)(bdb)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 461 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 16. (Amended Proposed Discovery, Scheduling, and Case Management Order Initial Discovery Pool). Daubert Motions due by January 10, 2020. Responses shall be filed by January 31, 2020. Replies shall be filed by February 14, 2020. Court will set first trial for April 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 6/20/2019. (See order for details) Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
June 18, 2019 Filing 460 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Story: Telephone Conference held on 6/18/2019. Counsel discussed scheduling matters with the Court. (sk)
June 17, 2019 Filing 459 OBJECTION re #458 Notice to Take Deposition,,,,,,,,,,, by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.)
June 14, 2019 Filing 458 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of 30(b)(6) Designee filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
June 11, 2019 Filing 457 Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' #456 Second Amended Notice to Take Deposition of Korey Phillips filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.) Modified on 6/12/2019 to correct docket text (adg).
June 6, 2019 Filing 456 Second Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Korey Phillips filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
May 13, 2019 Filing 455 RESPONSE re #451 Notice to Take Deposition of Larry Johnson filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.)
May 13, 2019 Filing 454 RESPONSE re #450 Notice to Take Deposition of Goran Ribaric filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.)
May 13, 2019 Filing 453 RESPONSE re #449 Notice to Take Deposition of Rubin Sheng filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.)
May 10, 2019 Filing 452 NOTICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Trial Pool Cases (Swearingen, Travis)
May 7, 2019 Filing 451 Second NOTICE to Take Deposition of Larry Johnson filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
May 6, 2019 Filing 450 Second NOTICE to Take Deposition of Goran Ribaric filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
May 6, 2019 Filing 449 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rubin Sheng filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
April 30, 2019 Filing 448 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Story: Status Conference held on 4/30/2019. The Court heard an update on the following issues: scheduled company depositions, status of the New Jersey Physiomesh MCL, and cases selected for the trial pool. An updated witness deposition chart was reviewed. Future conference dates have been confirmed as: Thursday, June 13, Thursday, July 11, Thursday, August 22, and Thursday, September 26. (Court Reporter Amanda Lohnaas)(sk)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN COURTROOM 303 on Tuesday, April 30, 2019 at 1:00 PM. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 04/26/19. (sk)
April 23, 2019 Filing 446 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-56 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (jdb)
March 27, 2019 Filing 445 RESPONSE re #439 Notice to Take Deposition, Defendants' Objections and Responses To Plaintiff's Notice To Take Video Deposition of Designee(s) of Defendants Pursuant To Fed. R. CIV.P.30(b)(6) filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.)
March 27, 2019 Filing 444 RESPONSE re #440 Notice to Take Deposition, Defendants' Objections and Responses To Take Deposition of Korey Phillips filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.)
March 27, 2019 Filing 443 RESPONSE re #441 Notice to Take Deposition, Defendants' Objections and Responses To Take Deposition of Goran Ribaric filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.)
March 26, 2019 Filing 442 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-55 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (btql)
March 20, 2019 Filing 441 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Goran Ribaric filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
March 20, 2019 Filing 440 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Korey Phillips filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
March 20, 2019 Filing 439 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Designee(s) of Defendants Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
March 20, 2019 Filing 438 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-54 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (btql)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 437 REVISED ORDER Regarding Communications With Plaintiffs' Treating Physicians for Purposes of Retaining Expert Witnesses. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 3/8/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(btql)
March 5, 2019 Filing 436 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-53 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (btql)
February 28, 2019 Filing 435 RESPONSE re #430 Notice to Take Deposition Defendants' Objections and Response to Plaintiffs' Notice To Take Deposition of Jeffrey Rauso filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Rumanek, S.)
February 27, 2019 Filing 434 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Larry Johnson filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
February 26, 2019 Filing 433 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/20/18 (Status Conf), before Judge Richard W. Story. Court Reporter/Transcriber Amanda Lohnaas, Telephone number 404-215-1546. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/19/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (pjm)
February 26, 2019 Filing 432 RESPONSE re #428 Notice to Take Deposition,,,,,,,,,,, Defendants' Objections and Responses To Plaintiffs' Notice of Take Deposition of Larry Johnson filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.)
February 21, 2019 Filing 430 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jeffrey Rauso filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM 2105 on Wednesday, February 20, 2019 at 1:00 PM. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 02/19/19. (sk)
February 19, 2019 Filing 428 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Larry Johnson filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
February 8, 2019 Submission of #424 MOTION to Revise Order Regarding Communications With Plaintiffs' Treating Physicians for Purposes of Retaining Expert Witnesses #289 Order on Motion to Exclude, Order on Motion for Protective Order to District Judge Richard W. Story. (btql)
February 6, 2019 Filing 427 REPLY in Support re #424 MOTION to Revise Order Regarding Communications With Plainitffs' Treating Physicians for Purposes of Retaining Expert Witnesses #289 Order on Motion to Exclude,,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,, filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) Modified on 2/8/2019 to correct docket text (btql).
January 23, 2019 Filing 426 RESPONSE in Opposition re #424 MOTION to Revise Order Regarding Communications With Plainitffs' Treating Physicians for Purposes of Retaining Expert Witnesses #289 Order on Motion to Exclude,,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,, Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Revise Order Regarding Communications With Plaintiffs' Treating Physicians for Purposes of Retaining Expert Witnesses filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Michelle Ayala, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount. (Garrard, Henry)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 425 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 15 (Amended Proposed Discovery, Scheduling, and Case Management Order-Initial Discovery Pool). Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 1/17/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(btql)
January 16, 2019 Filing 424 MOTION to Revise Order Regarding Communications With Plaintiffs' Treating Physicians for Purposes of Retaining Expert Witnesses #289 Order on Motion to Exclude, Order on Motion for Protective Order, with Brief In Support by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Gage, William)
January 16, 2019 Filing 423 NOTICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson re #418 Notice to Take Deposition, Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Notice to Take Deposition of Niels-Derrek Schmitz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Global Production Documents)(Gage, William)
January 14, 2019 Filing 422 RESPONSE re #417 Notice to Take Deposition, Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Notice to Take Video Deposition of Designee(s) of Defendants filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.)
January 14, 2019 Filing 421 RESPONSE re #416 Notice to Take Deposition, Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Notice to Take Video Deposition of Designee(s) of Defendants filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.)
January 14, 2019 Filing 420 RESPONSE re #415 Notice to Take Deposition, Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Notice to Take Deposition of Niels-Derrek Schmitz filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.)
January 10, 2019 Filing 419 RESPONSE Defendants' Objections and Responses re #413 Notice to Take Deposition of Goran Ribaric filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.) Modified on 1/11/2019 to edit text (btql).
January 9, 2019 Filing 418 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rubin Sheng filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
January 7, 2019 Filing 417 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Designee(s) (Registries) of Defendants Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
January 7, 2019 Filing 416 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Designee(s) (Market Withdrawal) of Defendants Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
January 7, 2019 Filing 415 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Niels-Derrek Schmitz filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
January 3, 2019 Filing 413 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Goran Ribaric filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Mary Burney, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Krystahl Davis, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Gail Fraser, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Shetia Steward, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Teresa Tiller, Priscilla Vela, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
December 21, 2018 Filing 412 TRANSCRIPT of the Status Conference Hearing Proceedings held on December 18, 2018, before Judge Richard W. Story. Court Reporter/Transcriber Amanda Lohnaas, Telephone number 404-215-1546. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/11/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
December 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #408 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Jerry Kittner (1:18-cv-01729-RWS) pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (btql)
December 18, 2018 Filing 414 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Story: Status Conference held on 12/18/2018. Counsel updated the Court as to the deposition schedule. The Court will enter the Order regarding production of Physiomesh exemplars. The Court discussed with Counsel scheduling of physician deposition scheduling. The Court heard an report on the status of the New Jersey Physiomesh MCL and the ongoing coordination efforts. The Court and Counsel discussed the process for resolving issues regarding the Court's Order Governing Defendants' Retention of Treating Physicians as Expert Witnesses. (Court Reporter Amanda Lohnaas)(sk)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER regarding the scheduling of the depositions of plaintiffs and physicians in the Initial Discovery Pool. See Order for further details. As a result of the foregoing and with consent of counsel for the parties, Practice and Procedure Order No. 13 [Doc. No. 392] is hereby amended so as to extend each of the pending deadlines stated therein by 60 days. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/18/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(btql)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER regarding production of Ethicon PHYSIOMESH Flexible Composite Mesh exemplars. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/18/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(btql)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on Tuesday, December 18, 2018 at 1:00 PM. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/17/18. (certified copies delivered to USM/CSO desk)(sk)
December 17, 2018 Filing 408 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.)
November 27, 2018 Filing 407 NOTICE of Change of Address for Matthew R. McCarley, counsel for Priscilla Vela (McCarley, Matthew)
November 19, 2018 Filing 406 TRANSCRIPT of the Status Conference Hearing Proceedings held on November 13, 2018, before Judge Richard W. Story. Court Reporter/Transcriber Nicholas A. Marrone, Telephone number 404-215-1486. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
November 14, 2018 Filing 404 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #394 Certificate of Service Johnson and Johnson's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Requests for Admissions by Johnson & Johnson.(Rumanek, S.)
November 14, 2018 Filing 403 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #394 Certificate of Service Ethicon, Inc,'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Requests for Admissions by Ethicon, Inc..(Rumanek, S.)
November 13, 2018 Filing 405 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Story: Status Conference held on 11/13/2018. Counsel updated the Court thatthe company depositions were proceeding and as of today, ten depositions were completed. All physician depositions have been scheduled. A proposed order and status report will be forwarded to the Court by December 3rd. The Court discussed the status of the New Jersey Physiomesh MCL and the coordination opportunities between the two Courts. Counsel discussed the process for resolving issue relating to the Court's Order Governing Defendants' Retentionof Treating Physicians as Expert Witnesses. Counsel will provide aproposed order and further discuss the issue at the next regularlyscheduled conference on Tuesday, December 18,2018. (Court Reporter Nicolas Marrone)(sk)
November 12, 2018 Filing 402 NOTICE of Appearance by Calle Mendenhall on behalf of Stephen Bush, Shannon Perkins, Bill Tedford, Teresa Tiller, Mary Burney, Gail Fraser, Krystahl Davis, Shetia Steward (Mendenhall, Calle)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on Tuesday, November 13, 2018 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/08/18. (certified copies delivered to USM/CSO desk) (sk)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 400 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 14. STIPULATION and ORDER GOVERNING TRANSLATION OF FOREIGN LANGUAGE DOCUMENTS. (See Order for details) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/6/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
November 5, 2018 Filing 399 NOTICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson re #378 Notice (Other) AMENDED NOTICE OF INITIAL DISCOVERY POOL CASES (Rumanek, S.)
October 31, 2018 Filing 397 RESPONSE re #380 Notice to Take Deposition,,,,,,,,,, Defendants' Amended Objections And Responses To Plaintiffs' Notice To Take Deposition Of Lars Fuchte filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.)
October 24, 2018 Filing 396 RESPONSE re #393 Notice to Take Deposition,,,,,,,,,,, Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Notice to Take Deposition of Korey Phillips filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.)
October 19, 2018 Filing 395 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/9/18 (Status Conf), before Judge Richard W. Story. Court Reporter/Transcriber Amanda Lohnaas, Telephone number 404-215-1546. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript) (pjm)
October 19, 2018 Filing 394 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Requests for Admission by Plaintiffs.(Migliori, Donald) Modified on 10/25/2018 to edit text. (aaq).
October 17, 2018 Filing 393 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Korey Phillips filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Zenia Fortson, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Migliori, Donald)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 392 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 13. Amended Proposed Discovery, Scheduling, and Case Management Order -- Initial Discovery Pool. All expert discovery for the Trial Pool Cases shall be completed by August 15, 2019. By July 15, 2019, each side shall submit to the Court, outside of the ECF system, a memorandum in support of their proposed manner of trial, order of selection of plaintiffs for trial, and timing oftrial(s). By July 22, 2019, the parties may submit a response to the opposing party's memorandum regarding the proposed manner of trial and order of cases for trial, and timing of trial(s). On or before July 29, 2019, the Court shall determine the manner of trial, the order of selection of plaintiffs for trial, and timing of trial(s). Motions: Dispositive or Daubert motions shall be filed by in each of the Trial Cases by August 28, 2019. Responses shall be filed by September 16, 2019. Replies shall be filed by September 26, 2019. The Court will set the first trial for December 2, 2019. (For complete details, see order) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 10/9/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
October 9, 2018 Filing 398 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Story: Status Conference held on 10/9/2018.The Court heard updates and reports from Counsel as to the following issues: Corporate deposition scheduling, initial discovery pool plaintiff and physician deposition scheduling, changes to the initial discovery pool, 75-day extension and Scheduling Order dates. Stipulation regarding the production of exemplar devices, and the Status of New Jersey Physiomesh MCL and the coordination efforts. The Court discussed with the parties the Order Governing Defendants' Retention of Treating Physicians asExpert Witnesses. The Court concluded the conference by discussing dates of upcoming status conferences. (Court Reporter Amanda Lohnaas)(sk)
October 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on Tuesday, October 9, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 2105. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 10/05/18. (certified copies to USM/CSO security desk)(sk)
September 11, 2018 Filing 390 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Story: Telephone Conference held on 9/11/2018. The Court discussed an extension of time. A consent motion will be filed and an order will follow. (Court Reporter Amanda Lohnaas)(sk)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER: With Consent of counsel for the parties, Practice and Procedure Order No. 7 ( #297 in 1:17-md-02782-RWS Scheduling Order) is hereby amended so as to extend each of the pending deadlines stated therein by 75 days. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 09/11/18. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(sk)
September 7, 2018 Filing 388 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis Mulvihill on behalf of Zenia Fortson (Mulvihill, Dennis)
September 5, 2018 Filing 387 RESPONSE re #373 Notice to Take Deposition,,,,,,,,,, of Boris Batke filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.)
September 5, 2018 Filing 386 RESPONSE re #379 Notice to Take Deposition,,,,,,,,,, of Axel Arnaud filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rumanek, S.)
September 5, 2018 Filing 385 RESPONSE re #380 Notice to Take Deposition,,,,,,,,,, of Lars Fuchte filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rumanek, S.)
September 5, 2018 Filing 384 RESPONSE re #381 Notice to Take Deposition,,,,,,,,,, of Luciana Giustizieri filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rumanek, S.)
August 29, 2018 Filing 382 TRANSCRIPT of the Status Conference Hearing Proceedings held on August 16, 2018, before Judge Richard W. Story. Court Reporter/Transcriber Amanda Lohnaas, Telephone number 404-215-1546. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/1/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
August 22, 2018 Filing 381 First NOTICE to Take Deposition of Luciana Giustizieri filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Migliori, Donald)
August 22, 2018 Filing 380 First NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lars Fuchte filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Migliori, Donald)
August 22, 2018 Filing 379 First NOTICE to Take Deposition of Axel Arnaud filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Migliori, Donald)
August 21, 2018 Filing 378 NOTICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Initial Discovery Pool Cases (Rumanek, S.)
August 20, 2018 Filing 377 OBJECTION re #373 Notice to Take Deposition,,,,,,,,,, of Boris Batke by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rumanek, S.)
August 20, 2018 Filing 376 RESPONSE re #373 Notice to Take Deposition,,,,,,,,,, of Boris Batke filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rumanek, S.)
August 16, 2018 Filing 383 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Story: Status Conference held on 8/16/2018.The Court discussed with Counsel the status of depositions. Counsel provided the Court an update as to the schedule of depositions and the initial discovery pool. The Court requested that an updated list of the discovery pool cases be placed on the docket. A discussion of expert witnesses as treating physicians was heard and the Court would like for counsel to meet and confer and present an updated proposed order. The Court andcounsel reviewed the issues related to the timing of Defendants' DFS-relatedproduction of documents and the impact on physician depositions and deadlines. (Court Reporter Amanda Lohnaas)(sk)
August 15, 2018 Filing 375 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-45 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (bdb)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER ALLOWING Personal Electronic Devices IN THE COURTROOM on Thursday, August 16, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 08/14/18. (certified copies provided to USM/CSO)(sk) Modified on 8/14/2018 to correct time of hearing (sk).
August 13, 2018 Filing 373 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Boris Batke filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
August 3, 2018 Filing 372 RESPONSE re #371 Notice to Take Deposition,,,,,,,,,, of Michael Cardinale filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rumanek, S.)
July 27, 2018 Filing 371 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael Cardinale filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
July 25, 2018 Filing 370 Certified CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-44 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (bdb)
July 18, 2018 Filing 369 OBJECTION re #367 Notice to Take Deposition,,,,,,,,,, of Lynn McRoy by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.)
July 16, 2018 Filing 368 OBJECTION re #362 Notice to Take Deposition,,,,,,,,,, of Martin Chomiak by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.)
July 11, 2018 Filing 367 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lynn McRoy filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
July 10, 2018 Filing 366 TRANSCRIPT of the Status Conference Hearing Proceedings held on June 27, 2018, before Judge Richard W. Story. Court Reporter/Transcriber Amanda Lohnaas, Telephone number 404-215-1546. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/31/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
July 10, 2018 Filing 365 TRANSCRIPT of the Status Conference Hearing Proceedings held on January 11, 2018, before Judge Richard W. Story. Court Reporter/Transcriber Amanda Lohnaas, Telephone number 404-215-1546. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/31/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
July 10, 2018 Filing 364 TRANSCRIPT of the Status Conference Hearing Proceedings held on December 7, 2017, before Judge Richard W. Story. Court Reporter/Transcriber Amanda Lohnaas, Telephone number 404-215-1546. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/31/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
July 9, 2018 Filing 363 TRANSCRIPT of Ex Parte Proceedings held on June 27, 2018, before Judge Richard W. Story. Court Reporter/Transcriber Amanda Lohnaas, Telephone number 404-215-1546. FILED UNDER SEAL (bdb) (bdb).
July 9, 2018 Filing 362 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Martin Chomiak filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the transcript of the ex parte conference with Plaintiffs' counsel that occurred following the June 27, 2018, status conference be filed UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 07/06/2018. (dgr)
July 5, 2018 Filing 359 OBJECTION re #356 Notice to Take Deposition,,,,,,,,,, of Jeffrey Hammond by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.)
July 3, 2018 Filing 358 NOTICE Of Filing by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson re #352 Notice to Take Deposition,,,,,,,,,, Objections and Responses to (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Rumanek, S.)
July 3, 2018 Filing 357 NOTICE Of Filing by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson re #355 Notice to Take Deposition,,,,,,,,,,, Objections and Responses to (Rumanek, S.)
June 28, 2018 Filing 356 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jeffrey Hammond filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
June 28, 2018 Filing 355 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Designee of Defendants Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
June 27, 2018 Filing 360 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Story: Status Conference held on 6/27/2018. The Court and Counsel discussed depositions and the schedule of depositions, second selection of cases for initial discovery, federal/state coordination of Non-MDL Physiomesh matters, multiple plaintiff filers. Counsel provided an update as to various motions to dismiss. At the conclusion of the Status Conference, the Court met with Plaintiffs Counsel to discuss the proposed common benefit order. The Court will review the proposed order. (Court Reporter Amanda Lohnaas)(sk)
June 27, 2018 Filing 354 OBJECTION re #351 Notice to Take Deposition of Lynn McRoy by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Rumanek, S.)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER ALLOWING Personal Electronic Devices IN THE COURTROOM on Wednesday, June 27, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 06/26/18. (certified copies provided to USM/CSO)(sk)
June 26, 2018 Filing 352 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Martin Chomiak filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
June 26, 2018 Filing 351 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lynn McRoy filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
June 21, 2018 Filing 350 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Ethicon's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Request for Production of Documents; and J&J's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson.(Rumanek, S.)
June 17, 2018 Filing 349 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lynn McRoy filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
June 11, 2018 Filing 348 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-43 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (bdb)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 346 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 12 and Updated Plaintiff Profile Form Order. (See order for details.) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 06/04/18. (Attachments: #1 Updated Plaintiff Profile Form)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(aaq)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 345 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 11. PATHOLOGY PROTOCOL FOR PRESERVATION AND TESTING OF EXPLANTS AND TISSUE SAMPLES TAKEN FROM PLAINTIFFS. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to file a copy of this Order in 1:17-MD-02782-RWS and it shall apply to each member related care previously transferred to, removed to, or filed in this Court. In cases subsequently filed in this Court, it shall be the responsibility of the parties to review and abide by all pretrial orders previously entered by the Court. The orders may be assessed through the CM/ECF system and the Court's website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/17md2782. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 5/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
May 24, 2018 Filing 347 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Story: Status Conference held on 5/24/2018. The Court held a Status Conference. Topics of discussion for thesession were: Pathology Protocol Order entry, Translation of foreign-languagedocuments produced by Defendants, Update on Non-MDL Physiomesh matters and federal/state coordination, an Update on cases selection for initial discovery pool. The Court discussed upcoming conference dates: June 27, August 9, September 13, and October 9. At the conclusion of the conference, the Court met with Plaintiffs Counsel to discuss the proposed common benefit order. (sk)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER ALLOWING Personal Electronic Devices IN THE COURTROOM on Thursday, May 24, 2018 at 10:30 A.M. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 05/22/18. (certified copies provided to USM/CSO)(sk)
May 22, 2018 Filing 343 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE PLAINTIFFS FOURTH REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANTS JOHNSON & JOHNSON AND ETHICON, INC. by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Brandi Conary, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount.(Garrard, Henry)
May 18, 2018 Filing 342 OBJECTION re #338 Notice to Take Deposition,,,,,,,,,, of Stephen Wohlert by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.)
May 18, 2018 Filing 341 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Ethicon's Objections and Responses to Third Requests for Production and J&J's Objections and Responses to Third Request for Production by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson.(Rumanek, S.)
May 18, 2018 Notification of Docket Correction re 340 Amended Complaint. Attorney notified to file the Amended Short Form Complaint in civil action 1:18-cv-653, Conary v. Ethicon, Inc. et al. Docket entry and document security updated. (sk)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 339 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 10 - Plaintiff Fact Sheet and Defendant Fact Sheet. (See order for details) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 5/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Fact Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendants' Fact Sheet)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
May 11, 2018 Filing 338 Third NOTICE to Take Deposition of Stephen Wohlert filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
May 9, 2018 Filing 337 OBJECTION re #333 Notice to Take Deposition of Designee(s) of Defendants Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(6) by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.)
May 9, 2018 Filing 336 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-41 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (bdb)
May 8, 2018 Filing 335 RESPONSE re #331 Notice to Take Deposition of Stephen Wohlert filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rumanek, S.)
May 7, 2018 Filing 334 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES to Plaintiffs' #324 Second Amended Notice to Take Deposition of Jeffrey Hammond filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Bates Numbered Documents)(Rumanek, S.) Modified to accurately reflect entry on 5/8/2018 (bdb).
May 2, 2018 Filing 333 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Designee of Defendants Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
May 2, 2018 Filing 332 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Ethicon's Responses to Second Interrogatories (and verification page); Ethicon's Responses to Second Requests for Production; J&J's Responses to Second Interrogatories (and verification page); and J&J's Responses to Second Requests for Production by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson.(Rumanek, S.)
May 1, 2018 Filing 331 Second NOTICE to Take Deposition of Stephen Wohlert filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 330 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 9 and Updated Plaintiff Profile Form Order. (See order for details) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 4/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
April 30, 2018 Filing 329 OBJECTIONS and RESPONSES re #321 Notice to Take Deposition of Designee(s) of Defendants Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.)
April 30, 2018 Filing 326 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Stephen Wohlert filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
April 30, 2018 Filing 325 NOTICE Of Filing by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Michelle Ayala, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount re #324 Notice to Take Deposition,,,,,,,,,, of Jeffrey Hammond (Garrard, Henry)
April 30, 2018 Filing 324 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jeffrey Hammond filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
April 30, 2018 Filing 323 OBJECTIONS and RESPONSES re #320 Notice to Take Deposition of Jeffrey Hammond filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.)
April 26, 2018 Filing 322 OBJECTION re #318 Notice to Take Deposition of Stephen Wohlert by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.)
April 23, 2018 Filing 321 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Designee of Defendants Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Garrard, Henry)
April 23, 2018 Filing 320 Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jeffrey Hammond filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Garrard, Henry)
April 19, 2018 Filing 319 TRANSCRIPT of the Status Conference Hearing Proceedings held on April 12, 2018, before Judge Richard W. Story. Court Reporter/Transcriber Amanda Lohnaas, Telephone number 404-215-1546. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
April 19, 2018 Filing 318 First NOTICE to Take Deposition of Stephen Wohlert filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Migliori, Donald)
April 18, 2018 Filing 317 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiffs' Third Request for Production of Documents to Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon, Inc. by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount.(Garrard, Henry)
April 18, 2018 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to G. Brian Jackson for Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson re certified copies of #315 Order, #316 Order. (sk)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER/Commission to Take Deposition Pursuant to Article 17 of the Hague Convention of 18 March 1970 on the Taking of Evidence Abroad in Civil or Commercial Matters. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 04/12/18. (sk)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER/Request for Permission Pursuant to Article 17 of the Hague Convention of 18 March 1970 on the Taking of Evidence Abroad in Civil or Commercial Matters. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 04/12/18. (Attachments: #1 Addendum A, #2 Addendum B)(sk)
April 16, 2018 Filing 314 First NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jeffrey Hammond filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Migliori, Donald)
April 16, 2018 Filing 313 OBJECTIONS and RESPONSES re #311 Notice to Take Deposition of Meng Chen filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.) Modified to accurately reflect entry on 4/17/2018 (bdb).
April 12, 2018 Filing 328 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Story: Status Conference held on 4/12/2018. The Court met with plaintiff's counsel in chambers for a discussion concerning attorney fees. (sk)
April 12, 2018 Filing 327 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Story: Status Conference held on 4/12/2018. Areas of discussion for the conference were as follows: Defendant & Plaintiff Fact Sheet, Pathology Protocol, Plaintiff Profile Forms, Written Discovery updates, Non-MDL Physiomesh matters updates. Pending Motions to Dismiss regarding failure to file Short Form Complaintsand Plaintiff Profile Forms, Deposition of Axel Amaud, Deposition of Joerg Holste, Attorney Fees, and procedure for case l:18-cv-1468. The Court heard arguments from counsel on the various topics. (Court Reporter Amanda Lohnaas)(sk)
April 12, 2018 Filing 312 NOTICE Of Filing Notice of Appearance of Chad R. Hutchinson by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Jackson, G.)
April 10, 2018 Filing 311 First NOTICE to Take Deposition of Meng Chen filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount (Migliori, Donald)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER ALLOWING Personal Electronic Devices in the Courtroom and Chambers on April 12, 2018 at 2:00 P.M. (certified copies provided to USM/CSO) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 04/09/18. (sk)
April 2, 2018 Filing 309 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #298 Certificate of Service,,,,,,,,,,, #299 Certificate of Service,,,,,,,,,,, Responses to Plaintiffs First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson.(Rumanek, S.)
April 2, 2018 Filing 308 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE PLAINTIFFS SECOND INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANTS JOHNSON & JOHNSON AND ETHICON, INC. by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount.(Garrard, Henry)
April 2, 2018 Filing 307 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE PLAINTIFFS SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANTS JOHNSON & JOHNSON AND ETHICON, INC. by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount.(Garrard, Henry)
March 28, 2018 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #306 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(i) as to Michelle Ayala ONLY without prejudice. (bdb)
March 27, 2018 Filing 306 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Michelle Ayala ONLY. (Flaherty, Yvonne) Modified on 3/27/2018 to correct text of docket entry (sk).
March 12, 2018 Filing 305 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Story: Status Conference held on 3/12/2018. The Court discussed pending issues with counsel. The Court approved and will enter Practice and Procedure Order No. 8 -Records Collection. Counsel provided the Court with updates on Plaintiff Profile Form Submissions to date and Short-Form Complaint filing deficiencies. Plaintiffs' counsel to follow-up with non-compliant parties. Counsel informed the Court of updates scheduled for the next monthly conference which will include Pathology Protocol and Plaintiff & Defendant Fact Sheet Filing.Counsel will also provide a status report as to written discovery during the April conference. The Court explained expectations and procedures for the handling of discovery and deposition issues. The following dates were selected for future scheduling conferences to be held in Atlanta: Thursday, April 12, Thursday, May 24 and June 27. (sk)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 304 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 8 - RECORDS COLLECTION. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to file a copy of this Order in 1:17-MD-02782-RWS and it shall apply to each member related care previously transferred to, removed to, or filed in this Court. In cases subsequently filed in this Court, it shall be the responsibility of the parties to review and abide by all pretrial orders previously entered by the Court. The orders may be assessed through the CM/ECF system and the Court's website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/17md2782. (See order for details) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 3/12/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
March 9, 2018 Filing 303 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-38 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (bdb)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER ALLOWING Personal Electronic Devices in the Courtroom and Chambers on March 12, 2018 at 2:00 P.M. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 03/08/18. (certified copies provided to USM/CSO) (sk)
March 5, 2018 Filing 301 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-37 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (bdb)
March 2, 2018 Filing 300 NOTICE of Change of Address for Arthur Mark Handel, counsel for Heather Haug, John Haug (Handel, Arthur)
January 24, 2018 Filing 299 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Michelle Ayala, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount Plaintiffs First Interrogatories to Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon, Inc (Garrard, Henry)
January 24, 2018 Filing 298 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Donna Adams, Leslie Adams, Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Michelle Ayala, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Billiot Chandelle, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount Plaintiffs First Request for Production of Documents to Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon, Inc (Garrard, Henry)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 297 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 7. (Proposed Discovery, Scheduling, and Case Management Order - Initial Discovery Pool) (See order for details) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 1/19/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 296 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 6. Plaintiff Profile Form. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to file a copy of this Order in 1:17-MD-02782-RWS and it shall apply to each member related care previously transferred to, removed to, or filed in this Court. In cases subsequently filed in this Court, it shall be the responsibility of the parties to review and abide by all pretrial orders previously entered by the Court. The orders may be assessed through the CM/ECF system and the Court's website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/17md2782. (See order for details) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 1/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff Profile Form)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)Modified on 1/18/2018 (jdb).
January 16, 2018 Filing 295 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-33 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (bdb)
January 11, 2018 Filing 294 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Story: Status Conference held on 1/11/2018. The Court discussed pending issues with counsel. The Court approved and will enter today the First Amended Confidentiality and Protective Order. Discussion continued concerning a Scheduling Order and the parties' submission deadlines. Counsel discussed theirproposed case management orders, random selection process for bellwether cases, and corporate discovery. The parties will submit a mutually agreed upon proposed order adopting the final plaintiff profile form tomorrow. The following dates are set for upcoming conferences to be held in Atlanta: Thursday, February 8th and Monday, March 12th. (Court Reporter Amanda Lohnaas)(sk)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 293 FIRST AMENDED CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. (See order for details) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 1/11/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb) Modified on 1/18/2018 (jdb).
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER ALLOWING Personal Electronic Equipment IN THE GAINESVILLE COURTROOM on Thursday, January 11, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 01/10/18. (copy forwarded to USM/CSO)(sk)
December 19, 2017 Filing 290 TRANSCRIPT of the Scheduling Conference Hearing Proceedings held on August 1, 2017, before Judge Richard W. Story. Court Reporter/Transcriber Amanda Lohnaas, Telephone number 404-215-1546. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/19/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER REGARDING COMMUNICATIONS WITH PLAINTIFFS' TREATING PHYSICIANS AND LIMITS ON CORPORATE GENERAL LIABILITY WITNESSES granting in part and denying in part (271) Plaintiffs' Motion to Preclude Defendants' Ex Parte Communications with Plaintiffs' Treating Physicians for Purposes of Retaining Expert Witnesses; granting in part and denying in part (272) Defendants' Motion for a Protective Order Regarding Contacts with Treating Physicians and and Denying Defendants' request for limitations on corporate general liability witnesses. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/12/2017. (Attached Exhibit A - Memorandum to Doctors) (see order for details) Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to remove counsel of record for defendants. (See Order for all counsel) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/8/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
December 7, 2017 Filing 291 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Story: Status Conference held on 12/7/2017.The Court discussed with counsel all pending motions: #271 Plaintiffs' Motion to Preclude Defendants' Ex Parte Communications with Plaintiffs' Treating Physicians for Purposes of Retaining Expert Witnesses; #272 Defendants' Motion for a Protective OrderRegarding Contacts with Treating Physicians; and the Proposed Order directing the Clerk to remove counsel of record for defendants. The following dates are set for upcoming status conferences: Thursday, January 11 (in Gainesville); Thursday, February 8 (in Atlanta); and Monday, March 12 (in Atlanta). (Court Reporter Amanda Lohnaas)(sk)
December 7, 2017 Remark: Certified copies of #287 Order Allowing Audio/Visual Equipment in the Courtroom delivered to USM/CSO. (sk)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on December 7, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. Attendees at the Multi-District Litigation Status Conference to be held in Courtroom 2015 of the U. S. Courthouse in Atlanta, Georgia, on Thursday, December 7,2017, are authorized to bring cell phones, laptop computers, and any personal electronic devices into the courthouse for the purpose of participating in the conference to be held at 2:00 p.m. Saidequipment is subject to inspection by the Court Security Officers of the United States Marshal's Service. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/07/17. (sk)
December 7, 2017 Submission of #280 Ex Parte MOTION to Exclude Defendant Ex Parte Communication. Submitted to District Judge Richard W. Story. (bdb)
December 1, 2017 Filing 286 AMENDED COMPLAINT Short form against All Defendants with Jury Demand, filed by Billiot Chandelle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Orent, Jonathan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
December 1, 2017 Filing 285 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand, filed by Leslie Adams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Orent, Jonathan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 12/1/2017 to edit filer information. (aaq).
December 1, 2017 Filing 284 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand, filed by Donna Adams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Orent, Jonathan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
November 28, 2017 Submission of #272 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Contacts With Treating Physicians. submitted to District Judge Richard W. Story. (bdb)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 283 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 5 - DEPOSITION PROTOCOL. All depositions except for expert witness depositions. (See order for details) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/27/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
November 27, 2017 Submission of #271 Ex Parte MOTION to Exclude Ex Parte Communications with Treating Phyicians, submitted to District Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
November 20, 2017 Filing 282 RESPONSE re #280 Ex Parte MOTION to Exclude Defendant Ex Parte Communication With Plaintiffs' Treating Physicians for Retaining Expert Witnesses filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William)
November 17, 2017 Filing 281 RESPONSE in Opposition re #272 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Contacts With Treating Physicians --SURREPLY filed by Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Michelle Ayala, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Garrard, Henry)
November 14, 2017 Filing 280 Reply in Support of #271 Motion to Preclude Defendants' Ex Parte Communications with Treating Physicians for purposes of retaining expert witnesses by Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Michelle Ayala, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Migliori, Donald) Modified on 12/27/2017 to correct event type and docket text (sk). (sk).
November 14, 2017 Filing 279 REPLY BRIEF re #272 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Contacts With Treating Physicians filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gage, William)
November 13, 2017 Filing 278 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-28 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (bdb)
November 9, 2017 Notification of Docket Correction re: #277 Order on Motion for Protective Order. Docket corrected to reflect CONFIDENTIALITY and PROTECTIVE ORDER Governing all Hard Copy and Electronic Documents and Information. #272 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Contacts With Treating Physicians by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson reopened. (Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.)(sk)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 277 CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER Governing Hard Copy and Electronic Documents and Information. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/9/2017 with Exhibit A (Agreement). (See order for details) Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb) Modified on 11/9/2017 to correct docket text (sk).
November 8, 2017 Filing 276 RESPONSE re #271 Ex Parte MOTION to Exclude Ex Parte Communications with Treating Phyicians filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gage, William)
November 8, 2017 Filing 275 RESPONSE in Opposition re #272 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Contacts With Treating Physicians filed by Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Michelle Ayala, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Garrard, Henry)
November 1, 2017 Filing 272 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Contacts With Treating Physicians with Brief In Support by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gage, William)
November 1, 2017 Filing 271 Ex Parte MOTION to Exclude Ex Parte Communications with Treating Phyicians with Brief In Support by Linda Aird, Maura Alvarado, Paula D. Andrews, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Michelle Ayala, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris, Frederick R. Basile, Diana Blom, William Blom, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Martha Conner, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Heather Gallagher, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, Edward Grzunov, Marcelle Grzunov, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, Robert Hodge, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, John H. Lenox, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Linda Loraine, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Ginger Mettler, Vincent Mettler, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Esteban Pagan, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Charmaine Porter, James Porter, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Kevin Rader, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Michael Rivet, Marca Rottnek, Daniel R. Ryder, Carlos Sanders, Victor P. Sanders, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, John H. Simmons, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Sherrie Stump, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, Joseph Wass, David Watring, Debra E. Webster, Ronne White, Leon Williams, Vanessa Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright, Daisy Yount, Donald Yount. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Migliori, Donald)
October 26, 2017 Filing 274 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Story: Telephone Conference held on 10/26/2017. The Court and Counseldiscussed upcoming motions and briefings regarding several issues. The status conference scheduled for November is cancelled. (sk)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER granting (18) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by McKee. Attorney Michael Alexander Prieto terminated in case 1:17-cv-02394-RWS. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 10/23/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS, 1:17-cv-02394-RWS(bdb)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 269 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 4 - PROTECTIVE ORDER. 1. As agreed upon by the parties. Plaintiffs' counsel in the above-captioned litigation ("Physiomesh MDL") are permitted to use the documents that were produced by Defendants Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson in the In re: Ethicon, Inc., Pelvic Repair System Products Liability Litigation ("Ethicon Pelvic Mesh MDL") in accordance with the Stipulation of Amendment to Protective Order entered in the Ethicon Pelvic Mesh MDL, dated October 16, 2017, and attached hereto as Exhibit A. 2. Until a protective order is entered in the Physiomesh MDL, the use of said documents in this action will be subject to the terms of the Protective Order entered in the Ethicon Pelvic Mesh MDL, attached hereto as Exhibit B. Upon entry of a Protective Order in the Physiomesh MDL, the use of said documents in this action will be subject to the terms of the Protective Order entered in this action. It is Defendants' position that they do not concede that the documents produced in the Ethicon Pelvic Mesh MDL are relevant or would otherwise be admissible in the Physiomesh MDL. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 10/23/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER GOVERNING ESI (Electronically Stored Information) PRODUCTION. It is ORDERED that the Stipulation attached as Exhibit A applies to plaintiffs, Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon, Inc. in all actions that are or become a part of MDL 2782, until further order of the court. The court DIRECTS the Clerk to file a copy of this order in 1:17-md-02782, and it shall apply to each member related case previously transferred to, removed to, or filed in this district. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 10/13/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
October 11, 2017 Filing 273 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Story: Status Conference held on 10/11/2017. The Court and leadership counsel discussed the MDL link on the court's website, electronic case filing & management, order governing the production of electronically stored information,confidentiality/protective order, privilege protocol & log, upcomingbriefings and future issues requiring oral argument hearings. The nextMDL Status Conference will be held on November 16th. (sk)
October 6, 2017 Filing 267 Master ANSWER to COMPLAINT with Jury Demand to #239 Master Long Form Complaint by Johnson & Johnson.(Gage, William) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 6, 2017 Filing 266 Master ANSWER to COMPLAINT with Jury Demand to #239 Master Long Form Complaint by Ethicon, Inc..(Gage, William) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
October 5, 2017 Filing 265 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Samberg on behalf of Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Dora V McNeill (Samberg, Peter)
September 27, 2017 Filing 263 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dora V McNeill. Johnson & Johnson waiver mailed on 8/24/2017, answer due 10/23/2017. (Migliori, Donald)
September 27, 2017 Filing 262 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dora V McNeill. Ethicon, Inc. waiver mailed on 8/24/2017, answer due 10/23/2017. (Migliori, Donald)
September 27, 2017 Filing 261 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald A. Migliori on behalf of Dora V McNeill (Migliori, Donald)
September 22, 2017 Filing 260 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Samberg on behalf of All Plaintiffs.(bdb)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 259 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 3 re ( #219 in 1:17-md-02782-RWS) Order. APPROVAL OF SHORT FORM COMPLAINT; FILING OF SHORT FORM COMPLAINTS. A Short Form Complaint may not be filed in the Master Docket. Instead, the Short Form Complaint must be filed only in the individual member action docket. Although the parties should continue to identify MDL 2782 as a related case at the time of filing, the clerk's office is directed not to file individual complaints on the MDL Master Docket unless expressly directed to do so by the Court. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/19/2017. (with Exhibit A - SHORT FORM COMPLAINT) Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
September 20, 2017 Filing 258 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by James Porter, Charmaine Porter. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 113E-7393844.) (DIRECT FILE MDL Case Arizona) (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3638-RWS) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 19, 2017 Filing 264 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Story: Status Conference held on 9/19/2017. The court held a status conference concerning the Ethicon Physiomesh Flexible Composite Hernia Mesh Product Liability Litigation. The Court and leadership counsel discussed short formcomplaint filing, case and docket management, proposed protective order, deposition protocol and expert witnesses. The Court will work with systems personnel to develop an MDL link on the Court's internet website. The next Status Conference will be held in the Gainesville Division on October 11th @ 2:00 p.m. (sk)
September 19, 2017 Filing 257 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kevin Rader. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 113E-7392812.) (DIRECT FILE MDL Nevada) (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3631-RWS) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 19, 2017 Filing 256 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jacqueline Barris, Joseph Barris. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3629-RWS) SNY 1:17-cv-06682-JPO. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 18, 2017 Filing 255 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Victor P. Sanders. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3617-RWS) SC (Florence) 4:17-cv-2395-MDL.(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 18, 2017 Filing 254 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Esteban Pagan. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3606-RWS) SNY 1:17-cv-06681-RJS. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 18, 2017 Filing 253 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Joseph Wass. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3605-RWS) SNY 1:17-cv-06667-AT.(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 14, 2017 Filing 252 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Marcelle Grzunov, Edward Grzunov. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 113E-7383318.) (DIRECT FILE MDL Case New York) (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3554-RWS) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 14, 2017 Filing 251 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Michael Rivet. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 113E-7381762.) (DIRECT MDL Case Colorado) (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3535-RWS) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 13, 2017 Filing 250 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Robert Hodge. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 113E-7379971.) DIRECT FILE MDL Case North Carolina (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3517-RWS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 13, 2017 Filing 248 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Ronne White. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 113E-7378696.) DIRECT FILE MDL Case Tennessee (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3511-RWS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 13, 2017 Filing 247 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by John H. Lenox. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 113E-7377551.) (DIRECT FILE MDL Case WNY) Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3506-RWS) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 13, 2017 Filing 246 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT with Jury demand filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson and against Marca Rottnek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition) (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3488-RWS) MOE 4:17-cv-2337-DDN.(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 13, 2017 Filing 245 Certified Copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-22 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (bdb)
September 13, 2017 Filing 244 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Maura Alvarado. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3464-RWS) WTX - El Paso 3:!7-cv-262. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 12, 2017 Filing 249 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Paula D. Andrews. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 113E-7376129.) (DIRECT FILE MDL Case Michigan) (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3491-RWS) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 7, 2017 Filing 243 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Vanessa Williams. (DIRECT FILE MDL - 1:17-cv-3418-RWS Virginia) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 7, 2017 Filing 242 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Carlos Sanders. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3411-RWS) SMS Jackson 3:17-cv00700-DPJ-FKB.(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 6, 2017 Filing 241 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Michelle Ayala. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3410-RWS) MA 1:17-cv-11571-MPK.(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 6, 2017 Filing 240 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-21 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (bdb)
September 6, 2017 Filing 239 LONG FORM COMPLAINT re #219 Order, Plaintiffs' Master Long Form Complaint filed by Linda Aird, Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Crystal Barnes, Frederick R. Basile, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, Darrell Burthe, Patricia Burthe, Stephen Bush, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Gabrielle Cox, James Creahan, IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE, Carol Dailey, Linda J. Davis, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Dane Gallivan, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Tadd Jackman, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Larry Jordan, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Arezoo King, David King, Reginald Knighten, JO ANN LAX, Brandon Latimer, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Dora V McNeill, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, John Oberg, Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens, WILLIAM POLLARD, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, Melinda Rall, David Ramey, Daniel R. Ryder, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Jennifer Stone, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, Bill Tedford, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, David Watring, Leon Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright. (Garrard, Henry) Modified on 10/11/2017 (bdb).
September 6, 2017 Filing 238 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Linda J. Davis. (Direct File - Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3387-RWS) (ETN) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 5, 2017 Filing 236 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Melinda Rall. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3363-RWS) OR Portland 3:17-cv-1303-BR. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 5, 2017 Filing 235 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by JO ANN LAX. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint) (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3362-RWS) NJ Trenton 3:17-cv-6300-BRM-TJB.(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 5, 2017 Filing 234 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by DIANNE WILLOUGHBY-GUERRA. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3361-RWS) NJ Trenton 3:17-cv-4368-PGS-DEA. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 5, 2017 Filing 233 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Dane Gallivan. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3366-RWS) WNY Buffalo 1:17-cv-826-GWC.(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 5, 2017 Filing 232 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Corenth Owens, Marilyn Owens. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3360-RWS) MFL Orlando 6:17-cv-1536-RBD-KRS.(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 5, 2017 Filing 231 Certified Copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-20 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (bdb)
September 1, 2017 Filing 230 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-19 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (bdb)
August 30, 2017 Filing 229 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Patricia Burthe, Darrell Burthe. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3298-RWS) CCA Santa Ana 8:17-cv-1421-JLS.(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 30, 2017 Filing 228 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Stephen Bush. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3289-RWS) NAL (Northeastern) 5:17-cv-1400-UJH.(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 30, 2017 Filing 227 NOTICE of Appearance by Halli Dee Cohn on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Cohn, Halli)
August 30, 2017 Filing 226 Certified Copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-18 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (bdb)
August 29, 2017 Filing 225 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Larry Jordan. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3268-RWS) Eastern Missouri 1:17cv130-ACL and before that 4:17cv2239.(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 28, 2017 Filing 224 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Linda Aird. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3255-RWS), Western Virginia, Charlottesville, 3:17-cv-58-NKM. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 28, 2017 Filing 223 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Bill Tedford. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3254-RWS), NAL, Southern 2:17-cv-1370-AKK. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 28, 2017 Filing 222 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by John Oberg. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3250-RWS, Utah, Central 2:17-cv-927-TS. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 28, 2017 Filing 221 Certified Copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-17 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (bdb)
August 23, 2017 Filing 220 Certified Copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-16 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (bdb)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 219 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER NO. 2 - MASTER PLEADINGS; DIRECT FILING; SHORT FORM COMPLAINTS; SERVICE OF PROCESS; NAMED PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS and MOTIONS. (See Order for details) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 8/22/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
August 18, 2017 Filing 218 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by James Creahan. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3142-RWS) NYWD 1:17-cv-746-WKS.(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 17, 2017 Filing 217 Certified Copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-15 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (bdb)
August 16, 2017 Filing 216 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Arezoo King, David King. (Civil Action No. 2:17-cv-150-RWS)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER APPOINTING PLAINTIFFS' LEAD AND LIAISON COUNSEL AND PLAINTIFFS' STEERING COMMITTEE. CO-LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS: Henry G. Garrard, III and Donald A. Migliori. LIAISON COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS: Henry G. Garrard, III. PLAINTIFFS' STEERING COMMITTEE: Henry G. Garrard, III, Donald A. Migliori, Karen Beyea-Schroeder, Richard A. Freese, Shelly A. Sanford, Richard W. Schulte, C. Andrew Childers, Douglass A. Kreis, Aimee H. Wagstaff, Peter Samberg, Jayne Conroy and Jon C. Conlin. The duties and responsibilities of Lead and Liaison Counsel and the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee are detailed within this order. Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel, and the PSC shall be entitled to seek reimbursement of fees and costs expended for the common benefit of Plaintiffs at the time and in a manner approved by the Court by separate Order. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 8/16/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER GRANTING Attorney Andrew S. Golub's motion to withdraw as counsel for Sharon Scott. Attorney Andrew S. Golub terminated. Plaintiff will continue to be represented by W. Todd Harvey, Peter H. Burke, and Amanda H. Schafner. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 8/15/2017. (bdb)
August 15, 2017 Filing 213 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jennifer Stone. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3075-RWS) ARK 5:17-cv-197-JLH.(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 15, 2017 Filing 212 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Tadd Jackman. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3074-RWS) AZ 2:17-cv-2508-DMF.(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 15, 2017 Filing 211 Certified Copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-14 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (bdb)
August 15, 2017 Filing 210 Certified Copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-13 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (bdb)
August 15, 2017 Filing 209 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Crystal Barnes. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-3073-RWS) MD 1:17-cv-2174-MJG.(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER on initial case management conference held on 8/1/2017. ( #192 in 1:17-md-02782-RWS) Plaintiffs' Leadership: Plaintiff's Proposed Counsel Organizational Structure is granted. Any additional applications for membership in the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee shall be filed with the Court by not later than August 8, 2017. Defendants' Leadership: Defendants shall submit a proposed order appointing leadership counsel, which order shall address the respective responsibilities of lead and liaison counsel. Stay Order: re ( #151 in 1:17-md-02782-RWS) Order staying all responsive pleading, discovery, disclosure, and other case management obligations, including Defendants' obligations to file initial responsive pleadings and/or answers, shall remain in effect pending further order of the Court. Status Conferences: The Court will hold regular status conferences, approximately every month. Lead and liaison counsel are expected to attend status conferences in person whenever possible. The dates for the remaining status conferences for 2017 shall be as follows: September 12, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. EDT - October 10, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. EDT - November 16, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. EST and December 7, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. EST. (See order for specific details) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 8/3/2017.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER APPOINTING DEFENDANTS' LEAD AND LIAISON COUNSEL. The Court appoints the following attorneys to serve as Co-Lead and Co-Liaison Counsel for Defendants Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson in MDL No. 2782: Co-Lead Counsel for defendants: William M. Gage and G. Brian Jackson. Co-Liaison Counsel for defendants: Jaime L. Theriot and S. Eric Rumanek. The duties and responsibilities are outlined in order. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 8/3/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
August 2, 2017 Filing 206 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaime L. Theriot on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Theriot, Jaime)
August 2, 2017 Filing 205 NOTICE of Appearance by S. Eric Rumanek on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Rumanek, S.)
August 1, 2017 Filing 237 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Story: Scheduling/Status Conference held on 8/1/2017. (Court Reporter Amanda Lohnaas)(sk)
August 1, 2017 Filing 204 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter John Veysey, Jr. on behalf of Ethicon, Inc. (bdb)
August 1, 2017 Filing 203 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Campbell on behalf of Ethicon, Inc. (bdb)
August 1, 2017 Filing 202 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Dora V McNeill. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2897-RWS) SC 4:17-cv-1866.(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 1, 2017 Filing 201 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by IDA J. DRAKE, REGINALD L. DRAKE. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2896-RWS) NJ 3:17-cv-5254-PGS-DEA. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 31, 2017 Filing 200 DISCLOSURE of Affiliated Companies and Associated Counsel re #148 Order filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jackson, G.) Modified to accurately reflect entry on 8/2/2017 (bdb).
July 31, 2017 Filing 199 Proposed Application of Counsel for the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in Addition to Plaintiffs' Proposed Counsel Organizational Structure by Michael R. Lucas re #192 Response , #148 Order 8/1/2017 (Attachments: #1 Brief Application, #2 Exhibit)(Satcher, James) Modified to accurately reflect entry on 8/2/2017 (bdb).
July 31, 2017 Filing 197 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Reginald Knighten. (Civil Action No. 17-cv-2875-RWS) MLA 3:17-cv-464-JJB-EWD.(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 31, 2017 Filing 196 Certified Copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-11 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (bdb)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Peter J. Flowers terminated. Riley L. Burnett, Jr. and Karen Beyea-Schroeder will continue to represent Plaintiff Tina Vicari. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 7/28/2017. (In Case No. 1:17-cv-2343-RWS)(bdb)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER in re: all cases. Agenda and call-in instructions for the August 1, 2017 at 2:00 PM initial case management conference. (See order for details) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 7/27/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
July 26, 2017 Filing 198 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis B. Swearingen on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (bdb)
July 26, 2017 Filing 194 NOTICE of Appearance by Fred E. Bourn, III on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (bdb)
July 26, 2017 Filing 192 RESPONSE re #148 Order Plaintiffs' Proposed Counsel Organizational Structure filed by Lizzey Annett, Robert Asplin, Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Frederick R. Basile, Terry Bohanan, Elizabeth Brady, Henry Lee Brown, Robert Burdge, Ronnie Burl, Tina Burr, David MIddleton Carr, Edith J. Carr, Robert B. Carrillo, Gabrielle Cox, Carol Dailey, Stephanie Delmore, Lori Dickson, Rebecca Dirks, Teresa Drummond, NATALIA ELINSON, Kathy Edwards, Lydia Edwards, William Stanley Edwards, Michael Elinson, Irene Fisher, Rhiannon Flair, Eldon Foux, Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin, Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia, Alvaro Garza, Matreia Gentry, Robert Gentry, Sarah Ann Gilman, Gary Goodson, Lillian Graham, John Guerra, Heather Haug, John Haug, Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr, Donna Helton, Terry Henderson, Thomas Hinton, Chad Hixon, Katharine Hixon, George Holloway, Matthew Huff, MARY P JOHNSON, Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James, Annie Jewell, Errol Jewell, Jay Johnson, Glenn Kaylor, Mary Kaylor, Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer, Ronald P. Keller, Brandon Latimer, Clint Levack, George W. Lind, Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas, Laura Lutz, Kyle Macneney, Marilyn Macneney, Phillip Wayne Maxey, Linda K. McKee, Patricia Mead, Robert Mead, Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam, Gene Miller, Mary Miller, Patricia Miller, Carla Nichols, Mary Nimmons, Linda O'Bannon, WILLIAM POLLARD, Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins, Diana Jane Picolla, Joanne Quinn, Charles Racine, David Ramey, Daniel R. Ryder, Sharon Scott, Richard Sears, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, Larry Slice, Billy Ray Stephens, Sonia Stephens, Valerie Sundberg, David A. Sunter, Shawn Sweeney, Shannon Talkington, John M. Thomas, Sherri Thomas, Tina Vicari, Emily Walker, Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward, David Watring, Leon Williams, Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey, Doreen Worrell, Patricia Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application of Henry G. Garrard, III, #2 Exhibit Application of Donald A. Migliori, #3 Exhibit Application of Karen Beyea-Schroeder, #4 Exhibit Application of Richard Freese, #5 Exhibit Application of Shelly Sanford, #6 Exhibit Application of Richard Schulte, #7 Exhibit Application of C. Andrew Childers, #8 Exhibit Application of Douglass A. Kreis, #9 Exhibit Application of Aimee Wagstaff, #10 Exhibit Application of Peter Samberg, #11 Exhibit Application of Jayne Conroy, #12 Exhibit Application of Jon C. Conlin)(Garrard, Henry) Modified on 7/27/2017 (bdb).
July 20, 2017 Filing 191 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Lydia Edwards. (Civil Action no. 1:17-cv-2747-RWS) NTX 5:17-cv-146-C. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 20, 2017 Filing 190 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Larry Slice. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2739-RWS) SC 3:17-cv-1771-RMG.(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 20, 2017 Filing 189 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Carmen Garcia, Martin Garcia. (Civil Action No. 1:17cv2738-RWS) NJ 3:17-cv-4279-PGS-DEA. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 17, 2017 Filing 188 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Larry Perkins, Shannon Perkins. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2675-RWS) NAL 5:17-cv-1088-HNJ. (Huntsville)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 14, 2017 Filing 187 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson with Jury Demand filed by Alfred George James, Sheri Anne James. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2657-RWS) MFL 3:17-cv-759-BJD-JRK. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 11, 2017 Filing 186 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by WILLIAM POLLARD. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2607-RWS) MGA 5:17-cv-239-CAR.(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 11, 2017 Filing 185 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-8 (Certified) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (bdb)
July 7, 2017 Filing 184 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Leon Williams. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2551-RWS) WLA 3:17-cv-00791-RGJ-KLH. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 6, 2017 Filing 183 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by John Guerra. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2537-RWS) NJ 3:17-cv-4298-PGS-DEA. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 6, 2017 Filing 182 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Errol Jewell, Annie Jewell. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2536-RWS) NJ 3:17-cv4274-PGS-DEA. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 6, 2017 Filing 181 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-7 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Certified Copy). (bdb)
July 6, 2017 Filing 180 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Sharon Scott. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2528-RWS) STX 4:17-cv-01809. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 5, 2017 Filing 179 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Mary Nimmons. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2525-RWS) SC 5:17-cv-01551-JMC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A J&J Authorized Distributor Master List, #2 Exhibit B J&J Press Release, #3 Exhibit C Ethicon 510(k) Summary, #4 Exhibit D Ethicon 510(k) Summary, #5 Exhibit E Urgent Field Safety Notice)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 5, 2017 Filing 178 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson with Jury Demand filed by Jay Johnson. (civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2521-RWS) NTX 3:17-cv-01518-D. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
July 5, 2017 Filing 177 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-6 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 5 cases are transferred to the Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division. (bdb)
July 5, 2017 Filing 176 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-6 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 5 transfer cases. (bdb)
July 3, 2017 Filing 175 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. RTS. Unable to forward. Mail sent to James Beckett Thompson, Jr. re #151 Order and #148 Order. Remailed to updated mailing address. (bdb)
June 30, 2017 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard W. Schulte on behalf of Robert Burdge, Carol Dailey, Teresa Drummond, Valerie Sundberg, Shawn Sweeney. (bdb)
June 30, 2017 Filing 173 RESPONSE re #148 Order JOINT PROPOSED AGENDA FOR INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jackson, G.)
June 28, 2017 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Judson Hill, III on behalf of Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova, Lillian Graham, Patricia Miller, Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton, Doreen Worrell. (bdb)
June 27, 2017 Filing 171 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Linda K. McKee. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2394-RWS) SGA 5:17-cv-82-LGW-RSB. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 26, 2017 Filing 172 Mail sent to Richard Schulte re #148 Order RETURNED; Clerk has REMAILED it to the forwarding address listed on envelope. (jkl)
June 26, 2017 NOTICE of Appearance by Josh B. Wages, Patrick Hammond Garrard, Henry G. Garrard, III, James B. Matthews, III on behalf of Bilyana Barakova, Valeri Barakova. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2101-RWS) (bdb)
June 26, 2017 NOTICE of Appearance by Josh B. Wages, Patrick Hammond Garrard, Henry G. Garrard, III, James B. Matthews, III on behalf of Lillian Graham. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2099-RWS) (bdb)
June 26, 2017 NOTICE of Appearance by Josh B. Wages, Patrick Hammond Garrard, Henry G. Garrard, III, James B. Matthews, III on behalf of Doreen Worrell. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2088-RWS) (bdb)
June 26, 2017 NOTICE of Appearance by Josh B. Wages, Patrick Hammond Garrard, Henry G. Garrard, III, James B. Matthews, III on behalf of Patricia Miller. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2085-RWS) (bdb)
June 26, 2017 NOTICE of Appearance by Josh B. Wages, Patrick Hammond Garrard, Henry G. Garrard, III, James B. Matthews, III on behalf of Eddie Shelton, Nancy Shelton. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2081-RWS) (bdb)
June 26, 2017 Filing 170 ANSWER with jury demand to #168 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 4:15-cv-249-RWS)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 26, 2017 Filing 169 ANSWER with jury demand to #168 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil Action No. 4:15-cv-249-RWS) (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 26, 2017 Filing 168 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT with jury demand filed by Deborah Lucas, Michael R. Lucas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A with Complaint, #2 Exhibit B) (Civil Action No. 4:15-cv-249-RWS)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 26, 2017 Filing 167 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jennifer Milam, Ray F. Milam. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2383-RWS) MTN 1:17-cv-50. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 26, 2017 Filing 166 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Rhiannon Flair. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2382-RWS) MTN 3:17-cv-885 (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 23, 2017 Filing 165 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Katharine Hixon, Chad Hixon. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2372-RWS) MN 0:17-cv-1987-DSD-BRT. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 23, 2017 Filing 164 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson with Jury Demandfiled by Kathy Edwards, William Stanley Edwards. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-02324-RWS) (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 23, 2017 Filing 163 ANSWER to #161 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-1764-RWS) Transferred from Judge Totenberg Order dated 6/23/2017(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 23, 2017 Filing 162 ANSWER to #161 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil action No. 1:17-cv-1764-RWS) transferred from Judge Totenberg on 6/23/2017. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 23, 2017 Filing 161 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Donna Helton. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-1764-RWS) Transferred from Judge Totenberg Order dated 6/23/2017. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 22, 2017 Filing 160 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Robert Mead, Patricia Mead. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2352-RWS MPA 3:17-cv-808-MEM. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 22, 2017 Filing 159 Return of Service Executed by Clint Levack. Served on 5/25/2017 on Ethicon, Inc. (bdb)
June 22, 2017 Filing 158 Return of Service Executed by Clint Levack. Served on 5/25/2017 on Johnson & Johnson. (bdb) Modified on 6/23/2017 (bdb).
June 22, 2017 Filing 157 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Tina Vicari. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2343-RWS) NIL 1:17-cv-4071 (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 22, 2017 Clerks Certificate of Mailing re #151 Order on Motion to Stay. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
June 22, 2017 Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson re #148 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE to William M. Gage. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (bdb)
June 22, 2017 Clerks Certificate of Mailing re #148 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER and NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE to all counsel of record which were not emailed. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al. (All cases)(bdb)
June 21, 2017 Filing 155 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Elizabeth Brady, Shannon Talkington. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-02335-RWS) WWA 3:17-cv-5428-RJB. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 21, 2017 Filing 152 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by John M. Thomas. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2334-RWS) WLA 5:17-cv-00702-SMH-MLH (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER in case 4:17-cv-00036-RWS; granting (56) Motion to Stay and to Vacate Future Deadlines and Trial Settings in case 1:17-md-02782-RWS. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties are relieved of any and all currently-imposed pleading, discovery, disclosure, and other case management obligations-whether imposed by statute, rule, or transferor court orderapplicable to cases that have been, are being, or will be transferred to this Court as part of this MDL pending entry of case management orders from this Court. It is further ORDERED that any and all case management deadlines and trial settings for all such cases are VACATED. This Order shall in no way be construed as resurrecting any deadlines that have already relapsed. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 6/21/2017. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER and NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for August 1, 2017 at 02:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2105 before Judge Richard W. Story. Preliminary Reports due July 25, 2017, a brief consolidated written statement indicating their preliminary understanding of the facts involved in the litigation and the critical factual and legal issues. Counsel should include in these statements a list of all pending motions and a list of all related cases pending in state or federal courts and their current status, to the extent known. The statements should be sent to the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Ms. Stacey Kemp at stacey_kemp@gand.uscourts.gov. These statements will not be filed with the Clerk, will not be binding, will not waive claims or defenses, and may not be offered into evidence against a party in later proceedings. Each Defendant is granted an extension of time for responding by motion or answer to the complaint(s) until a date to be set at the conference. Pending the conference, all outstanding disclosure and discovery proceedings are stayed and no further discovery shall be initiated. All orders by transferor courts imposing dates for pleading or discovery are vacated. Later Filed Cases. This Order shall also apply to related cases later filed in, removed to, or transferred to this Court. (See Order for complete details) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 6/21/2017. (bdb)
June 20, 2017 Filing 154 ANSWER to #49 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2191-RWS) ND 3:17-cv-00076. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 20, 2017 Filing 153 ANSWER to #49 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2191-RWS) ND 3:17-cv-00076. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 20, 2017 Filing 147 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson with Jury Demand filed by Ronnie Burl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2315-RWS) ELA 2:17-cv-4739-NJB-JCW (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 20, 2017 Filing 146 ANSWER to #144 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2314-RWS) ELA 2:17-cv-2875-SSV-KWR (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 20, 2017 Filing 145 ANSWER to #144 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2314-RWS) ELA 2:17-cv-2875-SSV-KWR (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 20, 2017 Filing 144 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Alvaro Garza. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2314-RWS) ELA 2:17-cv-2875-SSV-KWR (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 20, 2017 Filing 143 ANSWER to #141 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2313-RWS) ELA 2:17-cv-2869-JTM-MBN (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 20, 2017 Filing 142 ANSWER to #141 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2313-RWS) ELA 2:17-cv-2869-JTM-MBN (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 20, 2017 Filing 141 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Laura Lutz. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2313-RWS) ELA 2:17-cv-2869-JTM-MBN (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 20, 2017 Filing 140 ANSWER to #139 Amended Complaint by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2300-RWS MA 1:17-cv-12278-RGS (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 20, 2017 Filing 139 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson with Jury Demand filed by David Watring. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2300-RWS MA 1:17-cv-12278-RGS (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 19, 2017 Filing 156 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Sonia Stephens, Billy Ray Stephens. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-02289-RWS) (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 19, 2017 Filing 138 ANSWER to #136 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2290-RWS NFL 3:17-cv-344-MCR-EMT (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 19, 2017 Filing 137 ANSWER to #136 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2290-RWS NFL 3:17-cv-344-MCR-EMT (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 19, 2017 Filing 136 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by MARY P JOHNSON. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2290-RWS NFL 3:17-cv-344-MCR-EMT (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 19, 2017 Filing 135 ANSWER to #133 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2275-RWS MTN 3:17-cv-628 (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 19, 2017 Filing 134 ANSWER to #133 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2275-RWS MTN 3:17-cv-628 (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 19, 2017 Filing 133 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Rebecca Dirks. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2275-RWS MTN 3:17-cv-628 (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 16, 2017 Filing 132 ANSWER to #131 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2268-RWS SIL 3:16-cv-368-JPG-RJD (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 16, 2017 Filing 131 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Matthew Huff. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2268-RWS SIL 3:16-cv-368-JPG-RJD (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 15, 2017 Filing 130 ANSWER to #128 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2257-RWS WLA 3:17-cv-679-RGJ-KLH (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 15, 2017 Filing 129 ANSWER to #128 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2257-RWS WLA 3:17-cv-679-RGJ-KLH (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 15, 2017 Filing 128 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Teresa Drummond. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2257-RWS WLA 3:17-cv-679-RGJ-KLH (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 15, 2017 Filing 127 ANSWER to #125 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2256-RWS MFL 5:17-cv-142-BJD-PRL (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 15, 2017 Filing 126 ANSWER to #125 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2256-RWS MFL 5:17-cv-142-BJD-PRL (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 15, 2017 Filing 125 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Collin G. Ward, Peggy D. Ward. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2256-RWS MFL 5:17-cv-142-BJD-PRL (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 15, 2017 Filing 123 ANSWER to #121 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2255-RWS) MFL 5:17-cv-220-JSM-PRL (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 15, 2017 Filing 122 ANSWER to #121 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2255-RWS) MFL 5:17-cv-220-JSM-PRL (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 15, 2017 Filing 121 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Clint Levack. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2255-RWS) MFL 5:17-cv-220-JSM-PRL (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 15, 2017 Filing 120 ANSWER to #118 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2254-RWS) MFL 5:17-cv-224-JSM-PRL (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 15, 2017 Filing 119 ANSWER to #118 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2254-RWS) MFL 5:17-cv-224-JSM-PRL (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 15, 2017 Filing 118 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Lynn Henry Hauman, Jr. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2254-RWS) MFL 5:17cv224-JSM-PRL (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 15, 2017 Filing 117 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Brandon Latimer. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2253-RWS) WLA 5:17-cv-609-SMH-KLH (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 15, 2017 Filing 116 ANSWER to #114 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2252-RWS) WLA 5:17-cv-576-EEF-MLH (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 15, 2017 Filing 115 ANSWER to #114 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2252-RWS) WLA 5:17-cv-576-EEF-MLH (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 15, 2017 Filing 114 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Phillip Wayne Maxey. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2252-RWS) WLA 5:17-cv-576-EEF-MLH (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 15, 2017 Filing 113 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Irene Fisher. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2251-RWS) WLA 5:17-cv-566RGJ-MLH (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 15, 2017 Filing 112 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Eldon Foux. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2250-RWS) WLA 2:17-cv-611PM-KK (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 15, 2017 Filing 111 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Terry Bohanan. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2249-RWS) WLA 1:17-cv-608-DDD-JPM (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 15, 2017 Filing 110 ANSWER to #108 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2238-RWS) MD 1:17-cv-1029-RDB(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 15, 2017 Filing 109 ANSWER to #108 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2238-RWS) MD 1:17-cv-1029-RDB (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 15, 2017 Filing 108 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Charles Racine. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2238-RWS) MD 1:17-cv-1029-RDB (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 15, 2017 Filing 107 ANSWER to #105 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2236-RWS) WTX 6:17-cv-00103-RP-JCM (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 15, 2017 Filing 106 ANSWER to #105 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2236-RWS) WTX 6:17-cv-00103-RP-JCM (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 15, 2017 Filing 105 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Lori Dickson. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2236-RWS) WTX 6:17-cv-00103-RP-JCM (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 15, 2017 Filing 104 ANSWER to #102 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2235-RWS) MN 0:17-cv-750-WMW-TNL(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 15, 2017 Filing 103 ANSWER to #102 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2235-RWS) MN 0:17-cv-750-WMW-TNL (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2017: #1 Main Document - corrected) (bdb).
June 15, 2017 Filing 102 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Carol Dailey. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2235-RWS) MN 0:17-cv-750-WMW-TNL (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 15, 2017 Filing 101 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Tina Burr. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2226-RWS) SOH 3:17-cv-89-WHR (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 174 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Carla Nichols. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2208-RWS ETN 1:17-cv-00137. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson.(bdb)
June 14, 2017 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Johnson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson. (bdb)
June 14, 2017 Filing 100 ANSWER to #98 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2233-RWS) STX 3:17-cv-103(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 14, 2017 Filing 99 ANSWER to #98 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2233-RWS) STX 3:17-cv-103(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 14, 2017 Filing 98 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Frederick R. Basile. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2233-RWS) STX 3:17-cv-103 (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 97 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Gary Goodson. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2232-RWS) SIL 3:17-cv-540-JPG-DGW (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 96 ANSWER to #94 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2231-RWS) CCA 8:17-cv-817-JLS-DFM (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 14, 2017 Filing 95 ANSWER to #94 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2231-RWS) CCA 8:17-cv-817-JLS-DFM(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 14, 2017 Filing 94 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by John Haug, Heather Haug. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2231-RWS) CCA 8:17-cv-817-JLS-DFM (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 93 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Robert Gentry, Matreia Gentry. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2230-RWS) STX 4:17-cv-1463 (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 92 ANSWER to #90 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2229-RWS) WWA 2:17-cv-460-JLR (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 14, 2017 Filing 91 ANSWER to #90 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2229-RWS) WWA 2:17-cv-460-JLR (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 14, 2017 Filing 90 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by George W. Lind. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2229-RWS) WWA 2:17-cv-460-JLR(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 89 ANSWER to #87 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2228-RWS) MFL 8:17cv694-RAL-AAS (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 14, 2017 Filing 88 ANSWER to #87 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2228-RWS) MFL 8:17cv694-RAL-AAS (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 14, 2017 Filing 87 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Diana Jane Picolla. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2228-RWS) MFL 8:17cv694-RAL-AAS (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 86 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Stephanie Delmore. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2227-RWS) MLA 3:17cv293-JJB-RLB (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 85 ANSWER to #83 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2216-RWS). EMO 4:17cv1295 (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 14, 2017 Filing 84 ANSWER to #83 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2216-RWS). EMO 4:17cv1295 (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 14, 2017 Filing 83 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Robert Asplin. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2216-RWS). EMO 4:17cv1295 (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 82 ANSWER to #80 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2215-RWS). WMI 1:17cv275 (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 14, 2017 Filing 81 ANSWER to #80 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2215-RWS). WMI 1:17cv275 (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified to correct party on 6/16/2017 (bdb).
June 14, 2017 Filing 80 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Mary Kaylor, Glenn Kaylor. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2215-RWS). WMI 1:17cv275 (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 79 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Valerie Sundberg. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2214-RWS). WAR 4:17cv4014(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 78 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Shawn Sweeney. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2213-RWS). WNY 1:17cv218(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 77 ANSWER to #75 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2212-RWS). NAL 1:17cv526 (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 14, 2017 Filing 76 ANSWER to #75 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2212-RWS). NAL 1:17cv526(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 14, 2017 Filing 75 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Patricia Wright. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2212-RWS). NAL 1:17cv526 (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 74 ANSWER to #72 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2225-RWS). NAL 4:17cv527 (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 14, 2017 Filing 73 ANSWER to #72 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2225-RWS). NAL 4:17cv527 (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 14, 2017 Filing 72 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by George Holloway. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2225-RWS). NAL 4:17cv527 (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 71 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Robert Burdge. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2224-RWS). WTN 2:17-cv-02355 (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 70 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Gene Miller, Mary Miller. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2223-RWS). SIL 3:17cv516(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 69 ANSWER to #67 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2205-RWS. SFL 9:17cv80363. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 14, 2017 Filing 68 ANSWER to #67 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2205-RWS. SFL 9:17cv80363. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 14, 2017 Filing 67 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Michael Elinson, NATALIA ELINSON. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2205-RWS. SFL 9:17cv80363. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 66 ANSWER to #64 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2202-RWS) SFL 2:17cv14140. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 14, 2017 Filing 65 ANSWER to #64 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2202-RWS). SFL 2:17cv14140.(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 14, 2017 Filing 64 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Marilyn Macneney, Kyle Macneney. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2202-RWS. SFL 2:17cv14140. (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 63 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Daniel R. Ryder. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2201-RWS) AZ 2:17-cv-1374.(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 62 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Richard Sears. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2200-RWS) WDKY 4:17cv69 (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 61 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Linda O'Bannon. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2199-RWS) WDKY 4:17cv68(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 60 ANSWER to #59 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2198-RWS) WDKY 3:17cv302) (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 14, 2017 Filing 59 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Terry Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings) (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2198-RWS) WDKY 3:17cv302) (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 58 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Thomas Hinton. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2197-RWS) WDKY - 1:17cv95) (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 57 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Sherri Thomas. (Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2196)- (WDKY - 1:17cv94-GNS) (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 56 MOTION to Stay AND TO VACATE FUTURE DEADLINES AND TRIAL SETTINGS by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, G.)
June 14, 2017 Filing 55 ANSWER to #53 COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action Number 1:17-cv-2195-RWS)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 14, 2017 Filing 54 ANSWER to #53 COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil Action Number 1:17-cv-2195-RWS)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 14, 2017 Filing 53 COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Emily Walker. (Civil Action Number 1:17-cv-2195-RWS) (Attachments: #1 Filing Fee Receipt, #2 Docket Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 52 ANSWER to #50 COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, by Ethicon, Inc. (Civil Action Number 1:17-cv-2192-RWS)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 14, 2017 Filing 51 ANSWER to #50 COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, by Johnson & Johnson. (Civil Action Number 1:17-cv-2192-RWS)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 14, 2017 Filing 50 COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Lizzey Annett. (Civil Action Number 1:17-cv-2192-RWS) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 14, 2017 Filing 49 COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Ronald P. Keller. (Civil Action Number 1:17-cv-2191-RWS) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 13, 2017 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Dye on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Dye, Richard)
June 13, 2017 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Brian Jackson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Jackson, G.)
June 12, 2017 Filing 46 ANSWER to #44 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (17cv2145) (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 12, 2017 Filing 45 ANSWER to #44 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (17cv2145) (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 12, 2017 Filing 44 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by David Ramey. (17cv2145) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 7, 2017 Filing 124 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. to #43 NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2104-RWS) (EDOK Case No. 4:16-cv-00729-JED-PJC) (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 7, 2017 Filing 43 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT (Gabrielle Cox), filed by Ethicon, Inc. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2104-RWS) (EDOK Case No. 4:16-cv-00729-JED-PJC)(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons Served on Ethicon, Inc., #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit and Return of Service filed 11-22-16, #4 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit and Return of Service filed 10-14-16, #5 Exhibit 5 - Docket Sheet)(dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 42 ANSWER to #40 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2101-RWS) (CO Case No. 1:17-cv-543-RBJ) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 41 ANSWER to #40 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2101-RWS) (CO Case No. 1:17-cv-543-RBJ) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 40 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Valeri Barakova, Bilyana Barakova. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2101-RWS) (CO Case No. 1:17-cv-543-RBJ)(dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 39 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Alison Keefer, Erick Keefer. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2100-RWS)(CO Case No. 1:17-cv-603-MEH)(dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 38 ANSWER to #36 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2099-RWS)(MDFL Case No. 3:17-cv-229-MMH-JRK) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 37 ANSWER to #36 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2099-RWS)(MDFL Case No. 3:17-cv-229-MMH-JRK) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 36 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Lillian Graham against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2099-RWS)(MDFL Case No. 3:17-cv-229-MMH-JRK) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 35 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Lillian Graham. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2099-RWS)(MDFL Case No. 3:17-cv-229-MMH-JRK)(dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 34 ANSWER to #32 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2088-RWS)(SDIL Case No. 3:17-cv-172) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 33 ANSWER to #32 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2088-RWS)(SDIL Case No. 3:17-cv-172) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 32 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Doreen Worrell. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2088-RWS)(SDIL Case No. 3:17-cv-172) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 31 ANSWER to #29 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2087-RWS)(MDFL Case No. 8:17-cv-113-T-24-TGW) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 30 ANSWER to #29 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2087-RWS)(MDFL Case No. 8:17-cv-113-T-24-TGW) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 29 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by David A. Sunter. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2087-RWS)(MDFL Case No. 8:17-cv-113-T-24-TGW) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 28 ANSWER to #26 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2086-RWS)(MDFL Case No. 8:16-cv-3502-JDW-JSS) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 27 ANSWER to #26 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2086-RWS)(MDFL Case No. 8:16-cv-3502-JDW-JSS) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 26 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Sarah Ann Gilman. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2086-RWS)(MDFL Case No. 8:16-cv-3502-JDW-JSS) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 25 ANSWER to #23 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2085-RWS) (MDFL Case No. 8:17-cv-396-T-33-JSS) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 24 ANSWER to #23 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2085-RWS) (MDFL Case No. 8:17-cv-396-T-33-JSS) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 23 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Patricia Miller. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2085-RWS) (MDFL Case No. 8:17-cv-396-T-33-JSS)(dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 22 ANSWER to #20 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2084-RWS) (MDFL Case No. 6:17-cv-393-ORL-31-KRS) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 21 ANSWER to #20 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (NDGA Case No. 1:17-cv-2084-RWS) (MDFL Case No. 6:17-cv-393-ORL-KRS)(dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 20 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Edith J. Carr, David Middleton Carr. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2084-RWS) (MDFL Case No. 6:17-cv-393-ORL-31-KRS) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 19 ANSWER to #17 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2083-RWS) (MDFL Case No. 6:16-cv-1663-ORL-40DAB) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 18 ANSWER to #17 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2083-RWS) (MDFL Case No. 6:16-cv-1663-ORL-40DAB) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 17 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Joanne Quinn. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2083-RWS) (MDFL Case No. 6:16-cv-1663-ORL-40DAB)(dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 16 ANSWER to #14 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2082-RWS)(EDKY Case No. 7:17-cv-0037-ART) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 15 ANSWER to #14 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2082-RWS)(EDKY Case No. 7:17-cv-0037-ART) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 14 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Robert B. Carrillo. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2082-RWS)(EDKY Case No. 7:17-cv-0037-ART) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 13 ANSWER to #11 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2081-RWS) (SC Case No. 2:17-cv-614-RMG)(dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 12 ANSWER to #11 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2081-RWS) (SC Case No. 2:17-cv-614-RMG) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 11 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Nancy Shelton, Eddie Shelton. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2081-RWS) (SC Case No. 2:17-cv-614-RMG) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 10 ANSWER to #8 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2080-RWS)(MDGA Case No. 4:17-cv-31-CDL) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 9 ANSWER to #8 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2080-RWS) (MDGA Case No. 4:17-cv-31-CDL)(dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 7, 2017 Filing 8 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Connie Franklin, Marvin Franklin. (NDGA Civil Action No. 1:17-cv-2080-RWS)(MDGA Case No. 4:17-cv-31-CDL) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 2, 2017 Filing 7 ANSWER to #5 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (NDGA Civil Action No. 4:17-cv-40-RWS) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 2, 2017 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (NDGA Civil Action No. 4:17-cv-40-RWS)(dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 2, 2017 Filing 5 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Jeffrey Leyton Winfrey. (NDGA Civil Action No. 4:17-cv-40-RWS)(dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 2, 2017 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson. (NDGA Civil Action No. 4:17-cv-36-RWS) (dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 2, 2017 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. (NDGA Civil Action No. 4:17-cv-36-RWS)(dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 2, 2017 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Henry Lee Brown. (NDGA Civil Action No. 4:17-cv-36-RWS)(dfb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 6/20/2017. (dfb)
June 2, 2017 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 that the actions listed on Schedule A are transferred to the Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division. (dfb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: Ethicon Physiomesh Flexible Composite Hernia Mesh Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gentry
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Justin Ryan Goodman
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Brady
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Charles T. Paglialunga
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Ayala
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Kimberly Dougherty
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Yvonne M. Flaherty
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marca Rottnek
Represented By: James G. Onder
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: William Wylie Blair
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Gerardo L. Guerra
Represented By: Michael J. Quillin
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM POLLARD
Represented By: Josh B. Wages
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Richard W. Schulte
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Sweeney
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: David B. Krangle
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Andres F. Alonso
Represented By: Richard W. Schulte
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Burney
Represented By: Calle Mendenhall
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Burthe
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George W. Lind
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Michael G. Daly, Jr.
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Martin D. McLean
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Milam
Represented By: R. Christopher Gilreath
Represented By: Douglass A. Kreis
Represented By: Nathan Charles Bess
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Daniel James Thornburgh
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor P. Sanders
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Joseph Jakob Kennedy
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Burl
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Lauren E. Godshall
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Betsy J. Barnes
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Hinton
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Liz J. Shepherd
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Gary Steve Logsdon
Represented By: Tyler S. Thompson
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvaro Garza
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Lauren E. Godshall
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Betsy J. Barnes
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Burthe
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Miller
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Richard W. Schulte
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Williams
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Represented By: Josh B. Wages
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Patrick Hammond Garrard
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Andrew Judson Hill, III
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: James B. Matthews, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Nichols
Represented By: R. Christopher Gilreath
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Richard W. Schulte
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Slice
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Fred Thompson, III
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert B. Carrillo
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Represented By: Josh B. Wages
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Patrick Hammond Garrard
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Andrew Judson Hill, III
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Gary Steve Logsdon
Represented By: James B. Matthews, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zenia Fortson
Represented By: Dennis Mulvihill
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arezoo King
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Represented By: Josh B. Wages
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Patrick Hammond Garrard
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Andrew Judson Hill, III
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: James B. Matthews, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Stephens
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Charles Andrew Childers
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Michael Brandon Smith
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bilyana Barakova
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Represented By: Josh B. Wages
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Patrick Hammond Garrard
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Andrew Judson Hill, III
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Aimee Hall Wagstaff
Represented By: James B. Matthews, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Drummond
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Maria B. Glorioso
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Richard W. Schulte
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra E. Webster
Represented By: Kelsey Louise Stokes
Represented By: George M. Fleming
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Gregory Donald Brown
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Gallagher
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Macneney
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Anna Yarovich Lenchus
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Miller
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Richard W. Schulte
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel R. Ryder
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Shelly Sanford
Represented By: Ryan Ladd Thompson
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Burdge
Represented By: R. Christopher Gilreath
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Richard W. Schulte
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Yount
Represented By: A. Layne Stackhouse
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Fisher
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Lauren E. Godshall
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Betsy J. Barnes
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Wass
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Jordan
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: William Wylie Blair
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginger Mettler
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard W. Schulte
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronne White
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Douglas Harry Sanders
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Randi Kassan
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valeri Barakova
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Represented By: Josh B. Wages
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Patrick Hammond Garrard
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Andrew Judson Hill, III
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Aimee Hall Wagstaff
Represented By: James B. Matthews, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Quinn
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Anna Yarovich Lenchus
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billiot Chandelle
Represented By: Jonathan D. Orent
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred George James
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Joseph A. Osborne
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Jennifer L. Orendi
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Anne James
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Joseph A. Osborne
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Jennifer L. Orendi
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Haug
Represented By: Jayne Conroy
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Represented By: Peter Samberg
Represented By: Arthur Mark Handel
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | <