Turner v. Future Ford of Sacramento et al
Plaintiff: Terrance Turner
Defendant: Future Ford of Sacramento, Federal Trade Commission, USSOCOM, FBI, CIA, Secret Service, IRS, SEC, DHS, BATF and NSA
Case Number: 1:2024cv01015
Filed: March 7, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 241 Conspiracy Against Citizen Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2024 Submission of #4 Order to Show Cause to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (jpk)
April 19, 2024 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Terrance Turner. (pdt)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: With respect to each of his pending cases listed above, the undersigned ORDERS Turner by 4/19/2024 to either: (1) PAY the requisite filing fee; or (2) SHOW GOOD CAUSE in writing why he should be granted leave to proceed with the case. More specifically, unless he pays the corresponding filing fee, for each individual case that Turner wishes to pursue in forma pauperis in this Court he is ORDERED to file the following: An affidavit or unsworn declaration under 28 U.S.C. 1746, in which he must: (a) clearly designate the individual case by case number; (b) attest that the complaint has been filed on his own behalf (not as a legal representative) and in good faith; (c) certify whether he has previously raised claims based on the same set of facts in any other case, and if so, identify such case as well as the presiding court and case status or outcome; and (d) describe any facts or circumstances that might justify the Court's granting leave to continue for example, the case involves novel constitutional claims or imminent danger of physical injury. To be clear, no later than the deadline, Turner MUST either pay the filing fee or file a separate affidavit or declaration for each pending case that he wishes to pursue. Turner is forewarned. For each IFP Case, if Turner does not pay the corresponding filing fee or file a satisfactory affidavit or declaration within the time allowed, the undersigned will deny his pending in forma pauperis application for violating both Judge Fish's filing injunction and this Order. And for each Frivolity Case, if Turner does not take the requisite steps within the time allowed, the undersigned will recommend that such case be dismissed. Finally, Turner is advised that the same rules will be applied to any new cases that he files in this Court in the future- that is, he must either pay the filing fee or submit a satisfactory affidavit or declaration to obtain leave to proceed. The Clerk is DIRECTED to docket a copy of this Order in each of Turner's cases included in the caption. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 4/11/2024. c:Financial Office(kng)
April 11, 2024 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Terrance Turner re #4 Order. (kng)
March 21, 2024 Submission of #3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (kng)
March 19, 2024 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Terrance Turner. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, Response, Order to Show Cause)(kng)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DENYING In Forma Pauperis. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed, he is ORDERED to, no later than 4/5/2024, either: (1) pay the full filing fee for this civil action, or (2) complete and file an amended IFP application and affidavit that provides any additional information he feels is necessary to establish his entitlement to proceed IFP in this action. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a blank copy of the IFP application to the mailing address he provided. Plaintiff is ADVISED that the failure either to pay the required filing fee or sufficiently show entitlement to proceed IFP will result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 3/19/2024. (kng)
March 19, 2024 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Terrance Turner re #2 Order. Forms sent to party: Affidavit to Proceed IFP. (kng)
March 11, 2024 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (ajw)
March 7, 2024 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Terrance Turner. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Motion to form leave, #3 Request to waive service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Future Ford of Sacramento et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Future Ford of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Trade Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USSOCOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secret Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BATF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?