Howard v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Lori Ann Howard
Defendant: Mark Johnson and Augusta Richmond County Commission
Case Number: 1:2017cv00079
Filed: July 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Augusta Office
County: Richmond
Presiding Judge: Brian K. Epps
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Augusta Richmond County Commission against Lori Ann Howard. This case stands closed. Signed by Unassigned Judge on 03/20/2019. (jlh)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; finding as moot 34 Motion to Compel. All provisions of the prior 31 Scheduling Order not revised herein shall remain in full force and effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/11/2018. (jlh)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying Plaintiff's procedurally improper 25 Motion to Compel. The Court reminds Plaintiff it is her responsibility to know and follow the rules of the federal court.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/09/2017. (jlh)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADOPTING 6 Report and Recommendations and DISMISSING Defendant Johnson from this case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 08/28/2017. (maa)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Ann Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augusta Richmond County Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?