DGBJSH Family Properties, LLC et al
Plaintiff: DGBJSH Family Properties, LLC
Defendant: Kathy Reaves
Not Yet Classified: David Miller
Case Number: 1:2019cv00113
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 22 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #20 Judgment sent to Kathy Reaves on 9/5/19. (maa)
September 11, 2019 Filing 21 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #19 Order sent to Kathy Reaves on 9/4/2019. (maa)
September 5, 2019 Filing 20 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/5/2019. (pts)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #18 Motion for Hearing; granting #11 Motion to Remand to State Court; denying #11 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting #12 Motion to Expedite. The Clerk is directed to Remand this action to the Magistrate Court of Richmond County, Georgia. This case stands closed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 9/4/2019. (pts)
September 3, 2019 Filing 18 *******Emergency MOTION for Hearing re #12 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand Renewed, MOTION to Expedite and request for hearing by DGBJSH Family Properties, LLC. Responses due by 9/17/2019. (McAdams, Isaac)
September 3, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #16 MOTION for Protective Order. (maa)
August 30, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by DGBJSH Family Properties, LLC Regarding Rule 26(f) Report (McAdams, Isaac)
August 30, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Protective Order by DGBJSH Family Properties, LLC. Responses due by 9/13/2019. (McAdams, Isaac)
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Unable to Forward/Attempted Not Known. Mail sent to Kathy Reaves on 7/30/2019. (maa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Unable to Forward. #13 Order sent to Kathy Reaves on 8/1/19. (maa)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 08/01/2019. (maa) Modified on 8/5/2019 (maa).
July 31, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred: #12 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand, #11 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION Remand, Attorney Fees, Other Relief. (maa)
July 31, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand, #11 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION Remand, Attorney Fees, Other Relief. (maa)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand by DGBJSH Family Properties, LLC. Responses due by 8/13/2019. (McAdams, Isaac)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 *******Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court , MOTION for Attorney Fees , MOTION Remand, Attorney Fees, Other Relief by DGBJSH Family Properties, LLC. Responses due by 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(McAdams, Isaac)
July 30, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #1 (pts)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 7/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms for CV Case Filings) (pts)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Transfer. (pts)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 Case transfer in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-02775. Case transferred electronically
July 30, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman terminated from case. (tmf)
July 30, 2019 NEF regenerated for the #7 Order. (aaq)
July 30, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kathy Reaves re #7 Order. Mailed to 915B Flythe Dr, Augusta, GA 30904. (tmf)
July 30, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kathy Reaves re #7 Order. (tmf)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 The Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART Plaintiff's motion #4 and transfers this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia, Augusta Division, for further proceedings. The Court renders no opinion as to whether Defendant is entitled to proceed in forma pauperis or whether she may remove the state court action to federal court. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned Magistrate Judge and to close this case.Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 7/29/2019. (tmf) Modified on 7/30/2019 to edit text(tmf).
July 25, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kathy Reaves, 915B Flythe Dr, Augusta, GA 30904 re #5 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. (tmf)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Marked: Forward time exp, rtn to send, 915B Flythe Dr, Augusta, GA 30904. Mail sent to Kathy Reaves re #5 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. (tmf)
July 16, 2019 Submission of #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court or in the Alternative, Transfer and Other Appropriate Relief MOTION to Transfer Case, #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (adg)
July 16, 2019 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kathy Reaves re #5 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. (adg)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. The Clerk is DIRECTED to change the Nature of Suit to 230 Rent Lease & Ejectment. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/16/2019. (adg)
July 16, 2019 Submission of #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court or in the Alternative, Transfer and Other Appropriate Relief MOTION to Transfer Case, to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (adg)
June 24, 2019 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court or in the Alternative, Transfer and Other Appropriate Relief with Brief In Support by DGBJSH Family Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Dispossess Action Notice of Trial, Notice of Appearance; Amendment and Substitution of Party, #2 Exhibit Ex B Chapter 13 case Order Dismissing with 180-day refiling bar, #3 Exhibit Ex C Chapter 7 case Order Dismissing for bad faith with 180-day refiling bar, #4 Exhibit Ex D Dispossess Action Notice of Trial, #5 Exhibit Ex E Second Chapter 7 case Order Dismissing for Failure to Pay filing fees, #6 Exhibit Ex F Judge Alan J. Bravermans United States Magistrate Judges Order and Final Report and Recommendation in Ferreira v. Reaves, Civil Action No.: 1:17-cv-00722-LMM-AJB, Northern District of Georgia, #7 Affidavit Ex G Affidavit of Isaac J. McAdams in Support of Plaintiffs Request for Attorney Fees)(McAdams, Isaac) . Added MOTION to Transfer Case on 6/21/2019 (tmf).
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by DGBJSH Family Properties, LLC. (McAdams, Isaac)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Isaac John McAdams on behalf of DGBJSH Family Properties, LLC (McAdams, Isaac)
June 20, 2019 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (eop)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Kathy Reaves. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DGBJSH Family Properties, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: David Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DGBJSH Family Properties, LLC
Represented By: Isaac J. McAdams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Reaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?