AIKEN v. PHILPIN et al
Plaintiff: Jay Junior Aiken
Defendant: Sgt. Perry, Sergeant Wilcox, DOCTOR WANTS, Mr. Farrell, NURSE BRENDA BOLDER, ANGELA GLOVER, CASEY WOOD, Clinton Perry, Mark Taylor, SANDRA DUNCON, CHARLES PEATERSON, BRENDA BOLDLE, WARDEN EDWARD TED PHILBIN, LIEUTENANT CHIVES LESTER, COUNSELOR ROBBINSON, Captain Jeff Coleman, IRIS O'BERRY, Joan M Newman, GIBSON HALL, Ware State Prison, COMMISSIONER GREGORY DOZER, Mr. Bray, MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE, Timothy C. Ward, LYNN BILL, BETTY L MCGREW, CHIEF COUNSELOR JUANITA THORPE, JOHN AND OR JANE DOES, MEDICAL DIRECTOR MARRY ALSTON, Officer Williams, WILLIE DENSLEY, CATHY BAKER, SANDY LOY, UNIT MANAGER ANNIE H CODY, LINDA MARTON, Officer Jones, Danny Finn, Timothy Young, WARDEN TED PHILPIN, Billy Nichols, DEXTER SPIKES, LIEUTENANT CASES, Officer Taylor, JACK WILLIAM, SAM D STANLEY, Lester and TAVONDA COLLINS
Case Number: 1:2019cv00191
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Brian K Epps
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 21 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered in accordance with #20 Order. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/4/2019. (maa)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING #18 Report and Recommendations, DISMISSING this case without prejudice as a sanction for Plaintiff's abuse of the judicial process, and CLOSING this civil action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 12/4/2019. (maa)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER directing service of #18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/5/2019. (maa)
November 5, 2019 Filing 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice as a sanction. Objections to R&R due by 11/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/5/2019. (maa)
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE to All Counsel of Record of Transferred Case. (maa)
October 31, 2019 Filing 16 Case transfer in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 5:19-cv-00054. Case transferred electronically
October 30, 2019 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Georgia Southern. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**(Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 11/13/2019.) (vs)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING #14 Report and Recommendations. ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. Plaintiff's claims against Perry, Bolder, Bray, Thorpe, Chives, Hall or Dozier, and Ward are DISMISSED without prejudice, and the Plaintiff's remaining claims against the remaining Defendants SHALL BE TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Georgia. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 10/30/2019. (kat)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying as moot #9 Motion for Extension of Time. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiffs claims against Defendants Warden Clinton Perry, Nurse Brenda Bolder, Counselor Bray, Chief Counselor Juanita Thorpe, Lieutenant Lester Chives, former Georgia Department of Corrections Commissioner Gibson Hall or Gregory Dozier, and Commissioner Timothy C. Ward be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE re #10 Recast Complaint/Petition, filed by JAY JUNIOR AIKEN. Because the remaining defendants are located in the Southern District of Georgia, where the events underlying the remaining claims occurred, it is further RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs remaining claims and pending motions be TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Georgia. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 10-3-19. (jdl) Modified on 10/4/2019 to add docket text (vs).
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Injunction and MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Filed by JAY JUNIOR AIKEN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(vs)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from DAVID W. BUNT, CLERK in response to (11 in 5:19-cv-00054-MTT-MSH) MOTION to Continue, (80 in 5:17-cv-00162-TES-CHW) MOTION to Continue (ans)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Continue Hearing in the matter on Denial access to the Courts Filed by JAY JUNIOR AIKEN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(vs)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 RECAST #1 Complaint,, against MARRY ALSTON, CATHY BAKER, LYNN BILL, BRENDA BOLDLE, CASES, ANNIE H CODY, JEFF COLEMAN, TAVONDA COLLINS, WILLIE DENSLEY, JOHN AND OR JANE DOES, GREGORY DOZER, SANDRA DUNCON, FARRELL, DANNY FINN, ANGELA GLOVER, JONES, LESTER, SANDY LOY, LINDA MARTON, BETTY L MCGREW, JOAN M NEWMAN, BILLY NICHOLS, IRIS O'BERRY, CHARLES PEATERSON, CLINTON PERRY, EDWARD PHILBIN, TED PHILPIN, ROBBINSON, DEXTER SPIKES, SAM D STANLEY, TAYLOR, MARK TAYLOR, JUANITA THORPE, WANTS, WARE STATE PRISON, CHARLES H WEIGLE, WILCOX, JACK WILLIAM, WILLIAMS, CASEY WOOD, TIMOTHY YOUNG by JAY JUNIOR AIKEN (Attachments: #1 Attachments to Complaint, #2 Envelope)(vs)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Recast Complaint in re #7 Order. Filed by JAY JUNIOR AIKEN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(vs)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for a Court Order to allow Plaintiff to use the Main Library Filed by JAY JUNIOR AIKEN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(vs)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to Recast Complaint. ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to forward Plaintiff a copy of this Order along with a 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint form. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 5-14-19. (jdl)
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to allow Petitioner to Continue with Discovery Request Filed by JAY JUNIOR AIKEN. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(vs)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for a Temporary Restraining Order Filed by JAY JUNIOR AIKEN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope). Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(vs)
February 21, 2019 Case REASSIGNED to US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES. US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE no longer assigned to the case. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(vs)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JAY JUNIOR AIKEN (vs)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (vs)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by JAY JUNIOR AIKEN. Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(vs)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARRY ALSTON, CATHY BAKER, LYNN BILL, BRENDA BOLDLE, CASES, ANNIE H CODY, JEFF COLEMAN, TAVONDA COLLINS, WILLIE DENSLEY, JOHN AND OR JANE DOES, GREGORY DOZER, SANDRA DUNCON, FARRELL, DANNY FINN, ANGELA GLOVER, JONES, LESTER, SANDY LOY, LINDA MARTON, BETTY L MCGREW, JOAN M NEWMAN, BILLY NICHOLS, IRIS O'BERRY, CHARLES PEATERSON, CLINTON PERRY, EDWARD PHILBIN, TED PHILPIN, ROBBINSON, DEXTER SPIKES, SAM D STANLEY, TAYLOR, MARK TAYLOR, JUANITA THORPE, WANTS, WARE STATE PRISON, CHARLES H WEIGLE, WILCOX, JACK WILLIAM, WILLIAMS, CASEY WOOD, TIMOTHY YOUNG,filed by JAY JUNIOR AIKEN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AIKEN v. PHILPIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOCTOR WANTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE BRENDA BOLDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGELA GLOVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASEY WOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDRA DUNCON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES PEATERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENDA BOLDLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN EDWARD TED PHILBIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIEUTENANT CHIVES LESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNSELOR ROBBINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Jeff Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRIS O'BERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan M Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIBSON HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ware State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER GREGORY DOZER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Bray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy C. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYNN BILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BETTY L MCGREW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIEF COUNSELOR JUANITA THORPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND OR JANE DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL DIRECTOR MARRY ALSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIE DENSLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHY BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDY LOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIT MANAGER ANNIE H CODY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA MARTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN TED PHILPIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEXTER SPIKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIEUTENANT CASES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACK WILLIAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAM D STANLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAVONDA COLLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Junior Aiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?