Harpo v. Intermark Management Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Wihly Harpo
Defendant: Ramone Lamkin, Sierra Doe, Vera L. Butler, Donyell Porter, Robert W. Hunter, III, Mario Doe, Intermark Management Corporation, Bo Storey, Jacob T. Hayes, Carletta Sims-Brown, Leah Salazar, Abbey Beasley, All Others and William Austin Pruitt
Case Number: 1:2021cv00087
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
2 Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's #10 MOTION for Entry of Default; denying Plaintiff's #12 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default Exclusively per Defendant Intermark. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 07/20/2021. (jlh)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 07/20/2021. (thb)
July 20, 2021 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS to deny Plaintiff's #9 MOTION for Relief from Unconstitutional State Court Injunction and #6 MOTION Relief Per immediate Housing Accommodations to Mitigate Homelessness from Subject Trespass and Multiple Wrongful Evictions. Objections to R&R due by 8/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 07/20/2021. (jlh) Modified on 7/20/2021 (thb).
July 16, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default Exclusively per Defendant Intermark, by Wihly Harpo. (jlh)
July 16, 2021 Motions No Longer Referred: #10 MOTION for Entry of Default (pts)
July 14, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to All Others, Vera L. Butler, Robert W. Hunter, III, Ramone Lamkin, Donyell Porter, Leah Salazar, and Carletta Sims-Brown. (jlh)
July 9, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default by Wihly Harpo. (Attachment: #1 Affidavit and Brief in Support.) REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (jlh) Modified on 7/12/2021 (jlh).
June 21, 2021 Filing 9 Emergency MOTION for Relief from Unconstitutional State Court Injunction, by Wihly Harpo. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (jlh) Modified on 6/22/2021 (jlh).
June 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Statutory Service of Process by Wihly Harpo. (jlh)
June 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Past Actions by Wihly Harpo. (jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2021: #1 Signature Page) (jlh).
June 17, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #6 MOTION Relief Per immediate Housing Accommodations to Mitigate Homelessness from Subject Trespass and Multiple Wrongful Evictions (lcw)
June 7, 2021 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION for Relief Per Immediate Housing Accommodations to Mitigate Homelessness from Subject Trespass and Multiple Wrongful Evictions, filed by Wihly Harpo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits). (csr)
June 7, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Abbey Beasley, Sierra Doe, Jacob T. Hayes, Intermark Management Corporation, and William Austin Pruitt. (csr)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps recused. The Clerk of Court is directed to forward a copy of this Order to the assigned District Judge for reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 6/7/2021. (ca)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 Supplement to #1 Complaint filed by Wihly Harpo. (csr)
June 3, 2021 Filing fee: $402.00, receipt number BWK010837. (jlh)
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wihly Harpo. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(jlh) Modified on 6/3/2021 (jlh).
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by Wihly Harpo.(jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harpo v. Intermark Management Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramone Lamkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vera L. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donyell Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Hunter, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intermark Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bo Storey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob T. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carletta Sims-Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leah Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbey Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Others
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Austin Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wihly Harpo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?