The State of Georgia et al v. Biden et al
Plaintiff: The State of Georgia, The State of Alabama, The State of Idaho, The State of Kansas, The State of South Carolina, The State of Utah, The State of West Virginia, Brian P. Kemp, Kay Ivey, Brad Little, Henry McMaster, The Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Gary W. Black, Alabama Department of Agriculture and Industries, Alabama Department of Public Health;, Alabama Department of Rehabilitation Services;, Idaho State Board of Education and Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc.
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, United States Office of Personnel Management, Kiran Ahuja, Office of Management and Budget, Shalanda Young, General Services Administration, Robin Carnahan, Jeffrey Zients, L. Eric Patterson, James M. Murray, Administrator Deanne Criswell, Rochelle Walensky, United States Department of Defense, Lloyd Austin, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Xavier Becerra, National Institutes of Health, Francis S. Collins, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Denis McDonough, National Science Foundation, Sethuraman Panchanathan, United States Department of Commerce, Gina Raimondo, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, Bill Nelson, United States Department of Transportation, Richard Chavez, The United States Department of Energy and Jennifer Granholm
Not Yet Classified: Associated Builders and Contractors of Georgia, Inc.
Amicus Curiae: American Medical Association
Case Number: 1:2021cv00163
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
2 Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge R. Stan Baker: Motion Hearing re Defendants' #97 , #102 Motions to Stay held on 12/21/2021. (Court Reporter Victoria Root.) (SAV ANX.) (pmh)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd Austin, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden, Robin Carnahan, Richard Chavez, Francis S. Collins, Deanne Criswell, General Services Administration, Jennifer Granholm, Denis McDonough, James M. Murray, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Institutes of Health, National Science Foundation, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Sethuraman Panchanathan, L. Eric Patterson, Gina Raimondo, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, The United States Department of Energy, United States Department of Commerce, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Transportation, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Office of Personnel Management, Rochelle Walensky, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients for proceedings held on 12/3/2021 before Judge R. Stanley Baker.. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER denying in part and Reserves Ruling in Part Defendants' #97 Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal and For Immediate Administrative Stay. The Court Denies as Withdrawn Defendants' requests to stay the Court's preliminary injunction pending appeal and to narrow the scope of the preliminary injunction, and the Court Reserves Ruling on Defendants' request for clarification. Pursuant to the parties' agreement, Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants' request for clarification on or before January 7, 2022, and Defendants shall file any reply brief on or before January 14, 2022. The Court Grants Defendants' Unopposed #102 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal. Except as to the aforementioned request for clarification, all deadlines and proceedings in this case are Stayed until further order of the Court. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 12/23/2021. (csr)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to: Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants' request for clarification due by 1/7/2022 re: #105 Order. (csr)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER of USCA Granting the "Motion For Leave To File Brief Of American Medical Association, American College Of Physicians, American Academy Of Family Physicians, American Academy Of Pediatrics, American Academy Of Allergy, Asthma & Immunology, American College Of Chest Physicians, American College Of Medical Genetics And Genomics, American Geriatrics Society, American Medical Women's Association, American Psychiatric Association, American Society For Clinical Pathology, American Society Of Hematology, American Thoracic Society, Society Of Interventional Radiology, And American Lung Association As Amici Curiae In Support Of Defendants-Appellants' Motion For Stay Of The District Court's December 7, 2021 Order Pending Appeal." (csr)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER of USCA re #96 denying motion to stay preliminary injunction pending appeal and setting the case for oral argument. (csr) Modified on 12/21/2021 (JH).
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #102 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal. The Motion Hearing is set for 12/21/2021 10:00 AM and will be held telephonically in RSB Chambers before District Judge R. Stan Baker. (*Dial-in information for the call provided to counsel of record via email. pmh)NOTICE of Court's Public Teleconference Line. For public access to this hearing, please dial 888-684-8852, and enter the call access code: 9717475.
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd Austin, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden, Robin Carnahan, Richard Chavez, Francis S. Collins, Deanne Criswell, General Services Administration, Jennifer Granholm, Denis McDonough, James M. Murray, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Institutes of Health, National Science Foundation, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Sethuraman Panchanathan, L. Eric Patterson, Gina Raimondo, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, The United States Department of Energy, United States Department of Commerce, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Transportation, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Office of Personnel Management, Rochelle Walensky, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients. Responses due by 12/31/2021. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #102 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal. (JH)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Motions No Longer Referred: #102 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal. (cmr)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief against All Defendants, filed by Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc..(Stine, J.)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 USCA Case Number 21-14269-F for #96 Notice of Appeal.(loh)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #94 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion to Intervene; #96 Notice of Appeal. Other Appeals: No. Judge Appealed: Judge Baker. Court Reporter: Victoria Root. Fee Paid: N/A. Pending COA/IFP: No. (Attachments: #1 Record on Appeal)(slt)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE of Intent to File Opposition to Defendants' Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal and for Immediate Administrative Stay by Alabama Department of Agriculture and Industries, Alabama Department of Public Health;, Alabama Department of Rehabilitation Services;, Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc., Gary W. Black, Idaho State Board of Education, Kay Ivey, Brian P. Kemp, Brad Little, Henry McMaster, The Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, The State of Alabama, The State of Georgia, The State of Idaho, The State of Kansas, The State of South Carolina, The State of Utah, The State of West Virginia re #97 MOTION to Stay re #94 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,, Order on Motion to Intervene,,,,,,,, . (Peeler, Charles)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MOTION to Stay re #94 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,, Order on Motion to Intervene,,,,,,,, by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd Austin, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden, Robin Carnahan, Richard Chavez, Francis S. Collins, Deanne Criswell, General Services Administration, Jennifer Granholm, Denis McDonough, James M. Murray, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Institutes of Health, National Science Foundation, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Sethuraman Panchanathan, L. Eric Patterson, Gina Raimondo, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, The United States Department of Energy, United States Department of Commerce, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Transportation, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Office of Personnel Management, Rochelle Walensky, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients. Responses due by 12/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Decl. of Jason Miller, #2 Exhibit B, Decl. of Jeffrey A. Koses)(Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd Austin, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden, Robin Carnahan, Richard Chavez, Francis S. Collins, Deanne Criswell, General Services Administration, Jennifer Granholm, James M. Murray, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Institutes of Health, National Science Foundation, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Sethuraman Panchanathan, L. Eric Patterson, Gina Raimondo, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, The United States Department of Energy, United States Department of Commerce, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Transportation, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Office of Personnel Management, Rochelle Walensky, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of a Motions Hearing held on December 3, 2021, before Judge R. Stan Baker; Court Reporter: Victoria L. Root, CCR; Telephone Number: (912) 650-4066; Tape Number: FTR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (Transcript Redaction Policy Issued or Click here to view #Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 12/30/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2022. (Root, Victoria)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER denying as moot re #19 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting in part and denying in part re #48 Motion to Intervene; granting re #50 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting re #55 Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court ORDERS that Defendants are ENJOINED, during the pendency of this action or until further order of this Court, from enforcing the vaccine mandate for federal contractors and subcontractors in all covered contracts in any state or territory of the United States of America. The Court ORDERS Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc., to file a revised version of its Complaint within SEVEN (7) DAYS. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 12/7/21. (loh)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 RESPONSE to #92 Notice (Other),,, filed by Jeffrey Zients, National Institutes of Health, Jennifer Granholm, General Services Administration, Lloyd Austin, United States Department of Commerce, Joseph R. Biden, National Science Foundation, United States Department of Health and Human Services, L. Eric Patterson, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, Sethuraman Panchanathan, Richard Chavez, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Office of Management and Budget, Bill Nelson, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Transportation, Deanne Criswell, Gina Raimondo, United States Office of Personnel Management, Denis McDonough, Robin Carnahan, The United States Department of Energy, Francis S. Collins, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, James M. Murray, Shalanda Young, Xavier Becerra, Rochelle Walensky, Kiran Ahuja filed by Associated Builders and Contractors of Georgia, Inc., Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc.. (Stine, J.)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Revised Complaint due by 12/14/2021. (loh)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd Austin, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden, Robin Carnahan, Richard Chavez, Francis S. Collins, Deanne Criswell, General Services Administration, Jennifer Granholm, Denis McDonough, James M. Murray, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Institutes of Health, National Science Foundation, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Sethuraman Panchanathan, L. Eric Patterson, Gina Raimondo, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, The United States Department of Energy, United States Department of Commerce, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Transportation, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Office of Personnel Management, Rochelle Walensky, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients (Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge R. Stan Baker: Motions Hearing held on 12/3/2021 re #48 MOTION to Intervene; #50 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; #55 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Court Reporter Victoria Root.)(STA.) (pmh)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting re #87 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brant M. Laue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 12/3/21. (loh)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #87 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brant M. Laue Receipt Number AGASDC-3239373, Fee Amount $200. (JH)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE of Filing by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd Austin, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden, Robin Carnahan, Richard Chavez, Francis S. Collins, Deanne Criswell, General Services Administration, Jennifer Granholm, Denis McDonough, James M. Murray, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Institutes of Health, National Science Foundation, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Sethuraman Panchanathan, L. Eric Patterson, Gina Raimondo, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, The United States Department of Energy, United States Department of Commerce, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Transportation, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Office of Personnel Management, Rochelle Walensky, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients re #82 Notice of Filing,,, (Amended Exhibit List) (Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE of Filing by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd Austin, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden, Robin Carnahan, Richard Chavez, Francis S. Collins, Deanne Criswell, General Services Administration, Jennifer Granholm, Denis McDonough, James M. Murray, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Institutes of Health, National Science Foundation, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Sethuraman Panchanathan, L. Eric Patterson, Gina Raimondo, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, The United States Department of Energy, United States Department of Commerce, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Transportation, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Office of Personnel Management, Rochelle Walensky, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients re #63 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, #76 Reply to Response to Motion,,, of Declaration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, Decl. of William Blake)(Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brant M. Laue Receipt Number AGASDC-3239373, Fee Amount $200, by The State of Kansas. Responses due by 12/16/2021. (Dunbar, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2021: #1 Signed Application) (JH).
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Brief of the American Medical Association as Amicus Curiae in Opposition to Plaintiffs' #55 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (pmh)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Leave to File Brief of the American Medical Association as Amicus Curiae in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Clerk of Court shall file the Brief as a separate entry on the docket. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on December 2, 2021. (pmh)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Witness List by Alabama Department of Agriculture and Industries, Alabama Department of Public Health;, Alabama Department of Rehabilitation Services;, Gary W. Black, Idaho State Board of Education, Kay Ivey, Brian P. Kemp, Brad Little, Henry McMaster, The Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, The State of Alabama, The State of Georgia, The State of Idaho, The State of Kansas, The State of South Carolina, The State of Utah, The State of West Virginia. (Melton, Harold)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Exhibit List for December 3, 2021 Hearing on Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Alabama Department of Agriculture and Industries, Alabama Department of Public Health;, Alabama Department of Rehabilitation Services;, Gary W. Black, Idaho State Board of Education, Kay Ivey, Brian P. Kemp, Brad Little, Henry McMaster, The Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, The State of Alabama, The State of Georgia, The State of Idaho, The State of Kansas, The State of South Carolina, The State of Utah, The State of West Virginia.. (Melton, Harold)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE of Filing by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd Austin, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden, Robin Carnahan, Richard Chavez, Francis S. Collins, Deanne Criswell, General Services Administration, Jennifer Granholm, Denis McDonough, James M. Murray, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Institutes of Health, National Science Foundation, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Sethuraman Panchanathan, L. Eric Patterson, Gina Raimondo, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, The United States Department of Energy, United States Department of Commerce, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Transportation, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Office of Personnel Management, Rochelle Walensky, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients (Exhibit and Witness Lists) (Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE by Associated Builders and Contractors of Georgia, Inc., Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc. Notice of Exhibits and Witnesses (Stine, J.)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford Collins Patrick on behalf of All Defendants (Patrick, Bradford)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #76 Reply to Response to Motion. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. Compliance due by 12/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Application)(thb)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 REPLY to Response to Motion re #50 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and in Brief in Support Thereof filed by Associated Builders and Contractors of Georgia, Inc., Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Milton Graugnard, #2 Exhibit Declaration of James Lynn McKelvey)(Stine, J.)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 REPLY to Response to Motion re #48 MOTION to Intervene filed by Associated Builders and Contractors of Georgia, Inc., Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Milton Graugnard, #2 Exhibit Declaration of James Lynn McKelvey)(Stine, J.)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 REPLY to Response to Motion re #55 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support filed by Alabama Department of Agriculture and Industries, Alabama Department of Public Health;, Alabama Department of Rehabilitation Services;, Gary W. Black, Idaho State Board of Education, Kay Ivey, Brian P. Kemp, Brad Little, Henry McMaster, The Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, The State of Alabama, The State of Georgia, The State of Idaho, The State of Kansas, The State of South Carolina, The State of Utah, The State of West Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Supp Decl of M Shannon, #2 Exhibit 2-Decl of C Donald, #3 Exhibit 3-Supp Decl of J Tincher, #4 Exhibit 4-Decl of G Byrne)(Melton, Harold)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER re 53 Text Order, 51 Text Order on Motion, 41 Text Order on Motion to Expedite, Order on Motion for Hearing. The Court will hold a hearing on all pending motion in this case on Friday, December 3, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. in the Main Courtroom, Statesboro Federal Courthouse, located at 52 N. Main St., Statesboro, Georgia. Public access to this hearing is available via telephone, by dialing 888-684-8852 and entering the call access code: 9717475. Due to physical distancing protocols and general space constraints, occupancy in the courtroom will be limited, and will be available to non-parties (other than testifying witnesses) on a first come, first served basis only, with the doors to the courthouse opening to the public at 8:30 a.m. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 11/30/2021. (ca)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for Attorney Jeffrey B. Dubner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/30/2021. (jlh)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting re #67 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rachel L. Fried. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/30/21. (loh)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for Attorney Jessica Anne Morton. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/30/2021. (jlh)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #70 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro hac vice for attorney Thomas Hydrick. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/30/21. (wwp)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #69 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of the American Medical Association as Amicus Curiae in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction re #55 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support , #68 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jessica Anne Morton Receipt Number AGASDC-3236074, Fee Amount $200, #70 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas T. Hydrick Receipt Number AGASDC-3236198, Fee Amount $200. (thb)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Motion No Longer Referred: #69 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of the American Medical Association as Amicus Curiae in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction re #55 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support. (pmh)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas T. Hydrick Receipt Number AGASDC-3236198, Fee Amount $200, by Henry McMaster, The State of South Carolina. Responses due by 12/13/2021. (Dunbar, Paul)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of the American Medical Association as Amicus Curiae in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction re #55 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support by American Medical Association. Responses due by 12/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Brief of the American Medical Association as Amicus Curiae in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Klorfein, Jarred)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jessica Anne Morton Receipt Number AGASDC-3236074, Fee Amount $200, by American Medical Association. Responses due by 12/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Statement Regarding Prior Appearances, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Klorfein, Jarred)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rachel L. Fried Receipt Number AGASDC-3236064, Fee Amount $200, by American Medical Association. Responses due by 12/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Statement Regarding Prior Appearances, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Klorfein, Jarred)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey B. Dubner Receipt Number AGASDC-3236005, Fee Amount $200, by American Medical Association. Responses due by 12/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Statement Regarding Prior Appearances, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Klorfein, Jarred)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 (Nunc Pro Tunc as of 11/26/2021) ORDER granting #62 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The page limit for Defendants' consolidated response brief is increased by fourteen pages to a total of forty pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/29/2021. (jlh)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting Attorney Lindsay S. See's #56 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/29/2021. (ca)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #62 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. (thb)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #67 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rachel L. Fried Receipt Number AGASDC-3236064, Fee Amount $200,, #66 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey B. Dubner Receipt Number AGASDC-3236005, Fee Amount $200. (thb)
November 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RESPONSE in Opposition re #50 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and in Brief in Support Thereof, #55 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support filed by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd Austin, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden, Robin Carnahan, Richard Chavez, Francis S. Collins, Deanne Criswell, General Services Administration, Jennifer Granholm, Denis McDonough, James M. Murray, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Institutes of Health, National Science Foundation, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Sethuraman Panchanathan, L. Eric Patterson, Gina Raimondo, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, The United States Department of Energy, United States Department of Commerce, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Transportation, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Office of Personnel Management, Rochelle Walensky, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Decl. of Julio Lopez, #2 Exhibit B, Decl. of Howard Price)(Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
November 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd Austin, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden, Robin Carnahan, Richard Chavez, Francis S. Collins, Deanne Criswell, General Services Administration, Jennifer Granholm, Denis McDonough, James M. Murray, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Institutes of Health, National Science Foundation, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Sethuraman Panchanathan, L. Eric Patterson, Gina Raimondo, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, The United States Department of Energy, United States Department of Commerce, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Transportation, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Office of Personnel Management, Rochelle Walensky, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients. Responses due by 12/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
November 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re #48 MOTION to Intervene filed by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd Austin, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden, Robin Carnahan, Richard Chavez, Francis S. Collins, Deanne Criswell, General Services Administration, Jennifer Granholm, Denis McDonough, James M. Murray, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Institutes of Health, National Science Foundation, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Sethuraman Panchanathan, L. Eric Patterson, The United States Department of Energy, United States Department of Commerce, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Transportation, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Office of Personnel Management, Rochelle Walensky, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Filing by The State of West Virginia re #57 Notice (Other) (See, Lindsay)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE by Alabama Department of Agriculture and Industries, Alabama Department of Public Health;, Alabama Department of Rehabilitation Services;, Gary W. Black, Idaho State Board of Education, Kay Ivey, Brian P. Kemp, Brad Little, Henry McMaster, The Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, The State of Alabama, The State of Georgia, The State of Idaho, The State of Kansas, The State of South Carolina, The State of Utah, The State of West Virginia re #50 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and in Brief in Support Thereof, #48 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Consent to Motion to Intervene and Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Melton, Harold)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen J. Jennings on behalf of Associated Builders and Contractors of Georgia, Inc., Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc. (Jennings, Kathleen)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #56 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (slt)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 DEFICIENCY NOTICE re #56 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. After two days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer. (slt)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3233542, Fee Amount $200, by The State of West Virginia. Responses due by 12/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Good Standing Certificate)(See, Lindsay)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance with deficiency notice due by 11/26/2021. (slt)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Amended #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support by Alabama Department of Agriculture and Industries, Alabama Department of Public Health;, Alabama Department of Rehabilitation Services;, Gary W. Black, Idaho State Board of Education, Kay Ivey, Brian P. Kemp, Brad Little, Henry McMaster, The Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, The State of Alabama, The State of Georgia, The State of Idaho, The State of Kansas, The State of South Carolina, The State of Utah, The State of West Virginia. Responses due by 12/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Decl of J Guilbeaut, #2 Exhibit 2-Decl of M Shannon, #3 Exhibit 3-Decl of J Tincher, #4 Exhibit 4-Decl of K Toomey, #5 Exhibit 5-Decl of J Aydelotte, #6 Exhibit 6-Decl of T Lawrence, #7 Exhibit 7-Decl of M Wilde, #8 Exhibit 8-Decl of D Lybecker, #9 Exhibit 9-Decl of F St John, #10 Exhibit 10-Decl N Checketts, #11 Exhibit 11-Decl C Peeler, #12 Exhibit 12-Decl T MacCartney, #13 Exhibit 13-Decl M Amstutz, #14 Exhibit 14-Decl R Pate)(Melton, Harold) Modified on 11/22/2021 (JH).
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief against All Defendants, filed by Alabama Department of Public Health;, Brad Little, The State of Georgia, Brian P. Kemp, The Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Gary W. Black, The State of West Virginia, The State of South Carolina, Alabama Department of Agriculture and Industries, Alabama Department of Rehabilitation Services;, Henry McMaster, The State of Idaho, The State of Utah, The State of Kansas, The State of Alabama, Idaho State Board of Education, Kay Ivey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Executive Order 14042, #2 Exhibit B-First Task Force Guidance, #3 Exhibit C-Current Task Force Guidance, #4 Exhibit D-First OMB Determination, #5 Exhibit E-Second OMB Determination, #6 Exhibit F-FAR Class Deviation, #7 Exhibit G-DOD Class Deviation Memo)(Melton, Harold)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 TEXT ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs and Defendants shall file responses to #48 MOTION to Intervene and Defendants shall file a response to #50 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, all by midnight on November 26, 2021. Proposed Intervenors may file a reply to those responses by midnight on November 30, 2021. This Court will hold a hearing on said motions in conjunction with the previously-scheduled hearing on Plaintiffs' request for injunctive relief on December 3, 2021. Proposed Intervenors shall file with the Court any witness and/or exhibit list, including any joint exhibit list, by close of business on November 30, 2021, and Proposed Intervenors shall exchange with Plaintiffs and Defendants, but not file, any exhibits on or before November 30, 2021. All exhibits shall only be presented in electronic form. Proposed Intervenors shall email Judge Baker's courtroom deputy clerk, by close of business on November 26, 2021, a list of all individuals they request to have attend the hearing in person. Entered by District Judge R. Stan Baker on November 19, 2021. (jrb) Modified on 11/19/2021 (jrb).
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #50 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #48 MOTION to Intervene. Responses due by 11/26/2021. (jrb)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge R. Stan Baker: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 11/18/2021 re #46 Defendants' Emergency Motion to Clarify Scheduling Order in Light of Plaintiffs' Intent to File Amended Complaint and Revised Preliminary Injunction Motion. (Court Reporter Kelly McKee)(SAV-ANX). (en)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TEXT ORDER granting in part Defendants' #46 Emergency Motion to Clarify Scheduling Order in Light of Plaintiffs' Intent to File Amended Complaint and Revised Preliminary Injunction Motion. As indicated during the telephonic hearing held on 11/18/2021, it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file any amended complaint and any amended motion for preliminary injunction by midnight on November 19, 2021. Defendants' Response shall be filed by midnight on November 26, 2021. Plaintiffs may file a Reply by midnight on November 30, 2021. This Court will hold a hearing on Plaintiffs' request for a preliminary injunction on December 3, 2021. Each party shall file a witness and exhibit list, including any joint exhibit list, by close of business on November 30, 2021, and the parties shall exchange, but not file, exhibits on or before November 30, 2021. The parties are reminded that all exhibits shall only be presented in electronic form. Entered by District Judge R. Stan Baker on November 18, 2021. (jrb) Modified on 11/18/2021 to edit text (en).
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and in Brief in Support Thereof by Associated Builders and Contractors of Georgia, Inc., Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc.. Responses due by 12/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Bill Anderson)(Stine, J.)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Brief in Support re #48 MOTION to Intervene filed by Associated Builders and Contractors of Georgia, Inc., Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Bill Anderson)(Stine, J.)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION to Intervene by Associated Builders and Contractors of Georgia, Inc., Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc.. Responses due by 12/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff-Intervenors' Proposed Complaint for Declaratory and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief)(Stine, J.)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re #46 MOTION Defendants' Emergency Motion to Clarify Scheduling Order in Light of Plaintiffs' Intent to File Amended Complaint and Revised Preliminary Injunction Motion re 41 Order on Motion to Expedite,,,, Order on Motion for Hearing,,, < filed by Alabama Department of Agriculture and Industries, Alabama Department of Public Health;, Alabama Department of Rehabilitation Services;, Gary W. Black, Idaho State Board of Education, Kay Ivey, Brian P. Kemp, Brad Little, Henry McMaster, The Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, The State of Alabama, The State of Georgia, The State of Idaho, The State of Kansas, The State of South Carolina, The State of Utah, The State of West Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-COVID-19 Vaccination and Tsting ETS, #2 Exhibit B-Florida v. Nelson Joint Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule)(Peeler, Charles)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Any amended complaint and any amended motion for preliminary injunction due by midnight on November 19, 2021. (jrb)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #46 Defendants' Emergency Motion to Clarify Scheduling Order in Light of Plaintiffs' Intent to File Amended Complaint and Revised Preliminary Injunction Motion. The Motion Hearing is set for 11/18/2021 01:30 PM EST and will be held telephonically in RSB Chambers before District Judge R. Stan Baker. (*Dial-in information for the call provided to counsel of record via email. pmh)For public access to this hearing, please dial 888-684-8852, and enter the call access code: 9717475.
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION Defendants' Emergency Motion to Clarify Scheduling Order in Light of Plaintiffs' Intent to File Amended Complaint and Revised Preliminary Injunction Motion re 41 Order on Motion to Expedite,,,, Order on Motion for Hearing,,, by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd Austin, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden. Responses due by 12/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Josephson, Matthew)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting re #44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William G. Parker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/17/21. (loh)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William G. Parker, Jr. Receipt Number AGASDC-3229130, Fee Amount $200, by Alabama Department of Agriculture and Industries, Alabama Department of Public Health;, Alabama Department of Rehabilitation Services;, Kay Ivey, The State of Alabama. Responses due by 11/30/2021. (Dunbar, Paul)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #44 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William G. Parker, Jr. Receipt Number AGASDC-3229130, Fee Amount $200. (JH)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting re #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for J. Emory Smith, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/15/21. (loh)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying Petitioner Emory Smith, Jr's #38 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. If Petitioner wishes to appear pro hac vice in this case, he must pay the $200.00 filing fee within seven days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/15/2021. (ca)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadline: Compliance re #42 due by 11/22/2021. (ca)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order PRO HAC VICE PAID by James Emory Smith, Jr for The State of South Carolina; Amount $200, Receipt # BWK011321 Date: 11/15/2021. (ca)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TEXT ORDER granting in part Plaintiffs' #23 Emergency Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule and Request for Hearing. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' #19 Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall be filed by close of business on November 19, 2021, and Plaintiffs' Reply to Response shall be filed by close of business on November 26, 2021. Defendants may file a Surreply by close of business on December 1, 2021, and this Court will hold a hearing on December 3, 2021. Each party shall file a witness and exhibit list, including any joint exhibit list, by close of business on November 30, 2021, and the parties shall exchange, but not file, exhibits on or before November 30, 2021. The parties are reminded that all exhibits shall only be presented in electronic form. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on November 12, 2021. (pmh)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge R. Stan Baker: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 11/10/2021 re: Plaintiffs' #23 Emergency Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule and Request for Hearing. (Court Reporter Kelly McKee.)(SAV-ANX) (pmh)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule MOTION for Hearing filed by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd Austin, Xavier Becerra, Joseph R. Biden, Robin Carnahan, Richard Chavez, Francis S. Collins, Deanne Criswell, General Services Administration, Jennifer Granholm, Denis McDonough, James M. Murray, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Institutes of Health, National Science Foundation, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Sethuraman Panchanathan, L. Eric Patterson, Gina Raimondo, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, The United States Department of Energy, United States Department of Commerce, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Transportation, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States Office of Personnel Management, Rochelle Walensky, Shalanda Young, Jeffrey Zients. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James Emory Smith, Jr. re #21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The State of South Carolina. Responses due by 11/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Statement re Cases; Request for fee waiver, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Smith, James) Modified on 11/10/2021 (thb).
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for Attorney Melissa A. Holyoak. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/10/2021. (jlh)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for Attorney W. Scott Zanzig. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/10/2021. (jlh)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael G. Shedd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/10/2021. (maa)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas A. Limehouse, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/10/2021. (maa)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Wm. Grayson Lambert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/10/2021. (maa)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Vinita Andrapalliyal on behalf of All Defendants (Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Allan Josephson on behalf of All Defendants (Josephson, Matthew)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #28 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael G. Shedd Receipt Number AGASDC-3225377, Fee Amount $200,, #30 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wm. Grayson Lambert Receipt Number AGASDC-3225394, Fee Amount $200,, #29 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas A. Limehouse, Jr. Receipt Number AGASDC-3225392, Fee Amount $200,, #25 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice W. Scott Zanzig Receipt Number AGASDC-3225313, Fee Amount $200,, #27 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Melissa A. Holyoak Receipt Number AGASDC-3225343, Fee Amount $200, (pts)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Court's Public Teleconference Line as to the Hearing on Plaintiffs' #23 Emergency Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule and Request for Hearing. The Motion Hearing that is set for 11/10/2021 at 04:00 PM EST will be held telephonically in RSB Chambers before District Judge R. Stan Baker. For public access to this hearing, please dial 888-684-8852, and enter the call access code: 9717475.
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #38 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James Emory Smith, Jr., #21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (thb)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wm. Grayson Lambert Receipt Number AGASDC-3225394, Fee Amount $200, by Henry McMaster, The State of South Carolina. Responses due by 11/23/2021. (Dunbar, Paul)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas A. Limehouse, Jr. Receipt Number AGASDC-3225392, Fee Amount $200, by Henry McMaster, The State of South Carolina. Responses due by 11/23/2021. (Dunbar, Paul)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael G. Shedd Receipt Number AGASDC-3225377, Fee Amount $200, by Henry McMaster, The State of South Carolina. Responses due by 11/23/2021. (Dunbar, Paul)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Melissa A. Holyoak Receipt Number AGASDC-3225343, Fee Amount $200, by The State of Utah. Responses due by 11/23/2021. (Dunbar, Paul)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declaratory and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief, Civil Cover Sheet, Summons, Rule 26 Instruction Order and Rule 26(f) Report, served on Joseph R. Biden in his official capacity as President of the United States of America on November 1, 2021, filed by Alabama Department of Agriculture and Industries, Alabama Department of Public Health;, Alabama Department of Rehabilitation Services;, Gary W. Black, Idaho State Board of Education, Kay Ivey, Brian P. Kemp, Brad Little, Henry McMaster, The Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, The State of Alabama, The State of Georgia, The State of Idaho, The State of Kansas, The State of South Carolina, The State of Utah, The State of West Virginia. (Peeler, Charles)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice W. Scott Zanzig Receipt Number AGASDC-3225313, Fee Amount $200, by Idaho State Board of Education, Brad Little, The State of Idaho. Responses due by 11/23/2021. (Dunbar, Paul)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Vinita Andrapalliyal on behalf of All Defendants (Andrapalliyal, Vinita)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #23 Emergency Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule and Request for Hearing. The Motion Hearing is set for 11/10/2021 at 04:00 PM EST and will be held telephonically in RSB Chambers before District Judge R. Stan Baker. (*Dial-in information for the call provided to counsel of record via email. pmh)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 *******Emergency MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule, MOTION for Hearing by Alabama Department of Agriculture and Industries, Alabama Department of Public Health;, Alabama Department of Rehabilitation Services;, Gary W. Black, Idaho State Board of Education, Kay Ivey, Brian P. Kemp, Brad Little, Henry McMaster, The Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, The State of Alabama, The State of Georgia, The State of Idaho, The State of Kansas, The State of South Carolina, The State of Utah, The State of West Virginia. Responses due by 11/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Peeler, Charles)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Set/Reset Deadlines: After 2 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer. Compliance due by 11/10/2021. (thb)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The State of South Carolina. Responses due by 11/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Smith, James)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting re #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Drew F. Waldbeser. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/8/21. (loh)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support by Alabama Department of Agriculture and Industries, Alabama Department of Public Health;, Alabama Department of Rehabilitation Services;, Gary W. Black, Idaho State Board of Education, Kay Ivey, Brian P. Kemp, Brad Little, Henry McMaster, The Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, The State of Alabama, The State of Georgia, The State of Idaho, The State of Kansas, The State of South Carolina, The State of Utah, The State of West Virginia. Responses due by 11/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Jason Guilbeault, #2 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Michael P. Shannon, #3 Exhibit 3 Declaration of Jill Tincher, #4 Exhibit 4 Declaration of Kathleen E. Toomey, #5 Exhibit 5 Declaration of James B. Aydelotte, #6 Exhibit 6 Declaration of Torrey E. Lowrence, #7 Exhibit 7 Declaration of Jane Elizabeth Burdeshaw, #8 Exhibit 8 Declaration of Matthew K. Wilde, #9 Exhibit 9 Declaration of Donna Lybecker, #10 Exhibit 10 Declaration of Finnis E. St. John IV, #11 Exhibit 11 Declaration of Nathan Checketts, #12 Exhibit 12 Declaration of Charles Peeler, #13 Exhibit 13 Declaration of Catherine Molchan Donald, #14 Exhibit 14 Declaration of Teresa MacCartney, #15 Exhibit 15 Declaration of Margaret A. Amstutz, Ph.D., #16 Exhibit 16 Declaration of Richard Stewart Pate)(Melton, Harold)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Misha Tseytlin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/5/2021. (kjm)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Drew F. Waldbeser Receipt Number AGASDC-3223260, Fee Amount $200, by Gary W. Black, Brian P. Kemp, The Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, The State of Georgia. Responses due by 11/19/2021. (Melton, Harold)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Response re #13 Notice (Other), Set/Reset Deadlines, #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Misha Tseytlin Receipt Number AGASDC-3223061, Fee Amount $200, by Gary W. Black, Brian P. Kemp, The Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, The State of Georgia. Responses due by 11/19/2021. (Peeler, Charles) Modified on 11/5/2021 (pts).
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas A. Wilson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/5/2021. (kjm)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for attorney Edmund G. LaCour Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/5/21. (wwp)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency re #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Misha Tseytlin. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 11/8/2021. (pts)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Misha Tseytlin Receipt Number AGASDC-3223061, Fee Amount $200, by Gary W. Black, Brian P. Kemp, The Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, The State of Georgia. Responses due by 11/19/2021. (Peeler, Charles)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Edmund G. LaCour Jr. Receipt Number AGASDC-3222478, Fee Amount $200, by Alabama Department of Agriculture and Industries, Alabama Department of Public Health;, Alabama Department of Rehabilitation Services;, Kay Ivey, The State of Alabama. Responses due by 11/19/2021. (Dunbar, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2021: #1 Statement Regarding Prior Cases) (JH).
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas A. Wilson Receipt Number AGASDC-3222444, Fee Amount $200, by Alabama Department of Agriculture and Industries, Alabama Department of Public Health;, Alabama Department of Rehabilitation Services;, Kay Ivey, The State of Alabama. Responses due by 11/19/2021. (Dunbar, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2021: #1 Dated Application) (JH). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2021: #2 Statement Regarding Prior Cases) (JH).
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Drew F. Waldbeser Receipt Number AGASDC-3223260, Fee Amount $200, (pts)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Misha Tseytlin Receipt Number AGASDC-3223061, Fee Amount $200. (pts)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Edmund G. LaCour Jr. Receipt Number AGASDC-3222478, Fee Amount $200, #10 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas A. Wilson Receipt Number AGASDC-3222444, Fee Amount $200. (JH)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Motions No Longer Referred: #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Misha Tseytlin Receipt Number AGASDC-3223061, Fee Amount $200, (pts)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/4/2021. (pts)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation and Brief in Support by Alabama Department of Agriculture and Industries, Alabama Department of Public Health;, Alabama Department of Rehabilitation Services;, Gary W. Black, Idaho State Board of Education, Kay Ivey, Brian P. Kemp, Brad Little, Henry McMaster, The Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, The State of Alabama, The State of Georgia, The State of Idaho, The State of Kansas, The State of South Carolina, The State of Utah, The State of West Virginia. Responses due by 11/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peeler, Charles)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E. Peeler on behalf of Gary W. Black, Brian P. Kemp, The Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, The State of Georgia (Peeler, Charles)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation and Brief in Support. (JH)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul H. Dunbar, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dunbar, Paul)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge R. Stan Baker for all further proceedings. Chief Judge J. Randal Hall no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 11/2/21. (loh)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (pts)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Forms) (pts)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alabama Department of Public Health;, Brad Little, The State of Georgia, Brian P. Kemp, The Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, Gary W. Black, The State of West Virginia, The State of South Carolina, Alabama Department of Agriculture and Industries, Alabama Department of Rehabilitation Services;, Henry McMaster, The State of Idaho, The State of Utah, The State of Kansas, The State of Alabama, Idaho State Board of Education, Kay Ivey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(pts)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number AGASDC-3218285. (pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The State of Georgia et al v. Biden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Georgia
Represented By: Harold David Melton
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar, III
Represented By: Misha Tseytlin
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Represented By: Drew F. Waldbeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Alabama
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar, III
Represented By: Edmund Gerard LaCour, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas A. Wilson
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Idaho
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar, III
Represented By: W. Scott Zanzig
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Kansas
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar, III
Represented By: Brant M. Laue
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of South Carolina
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar, III
Represented By: James Emory Smith, Jr
Represented By: Thomas T. Hydrick
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Utah
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar, III
Represented By: Melissa A. Holyoak
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of West Virginia
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar, III
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Represented By: Lindsay S. See
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian P. Kemp
Represented By: Harold David Melton
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar, III
Represented By: Misha Tseytlin
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Represented By: Drew F. Waldbeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kay Ivey
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar, III
Represented By: Edmund Gerard LaCour, Jr.
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Represented By: William G. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Little
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar, III
Represented By: W. Scott Zanzig
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry McMaster
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar, III
Represented By: Michael G. Shedd
Represented By: Thomas A. Limehouse, Jr.
Represented By: Wm. Grayson Lambert
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia
Represented By: Harold David Melton
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar, III
Represented By: Misha Tseytlin
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Represented By: Drew F. Waldbeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary W. Black
Represented By: Harold David Melton
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar, III
Represented By: Misha Tseytlin
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Represented By: Drew F. Waldbeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama Department of Agriculture and Industries
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar, III
Represented By: Edmund Gerard LaCour, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas A. Wilson
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama Department of Public Health;
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar, III
Represented By: Edmund Gerard LaCour, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas A. Wilson
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama Department of Rehabilitation Services;
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar, III
Represented By: Edmund Gerard LaCour, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas A. Wilson
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idaho State Board of Education
Represented By: Paul H. Dunbar, III
Represented By: W. Scott Zanzig
Represented By: Charles E. Peeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Associated Builders and Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: J. Larry Stine
Represented By: Kathleen J. Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safer Federal Workforce Task Force
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Office of Personnel Management
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiran Ahuja
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Management and Budget
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shalanda Young
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Services Administration
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Carnahan
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Zients
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Eric Patterson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Murray
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrator Deanne Criswell
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochelle Walensky
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Defense
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Austin
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Institutes of Health
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis S. Collins
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denis McDonough
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Science Foundation
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sethuraman Panchanathan
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Commerce
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Raimondo
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Aeronautics and Space Administration
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Nelson
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Transportation
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Chavez
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Department of Energy
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Granholm
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Matthew Allan Josephson
Represented By: Vinita Andrapalliyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Associated Builders and Contractors of Georgia, Inc.
Represented By: J. Larry Stine
Represented By: Kathleen J. Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Medical Association
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Dubner
Represented By: Jessica Anne Morton
Represented By: Jarred A. Klorfein
Represented By: Rachel L. Fried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?