United States Of America et al v. Renessenz, LLC
Plaintiff: The State of Georgia and United States Of America
Defendant: Renessenz, LLC
Case Number: 2:2014cv00185
Filed: December 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Glynn
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker-MJ
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re: #4 Order on Motion to Enter Consent Decree, this case is hereby closed. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 2/3/2016. (csr)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Enter Proposed Consent Decree. It is hereby Ordered that the Proposed Consent Decree between Plaintiffs and Defendant shall be entered by the Court in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 3/9/2015. (csr)
March 6, 2015 Filing 3 MOTION to Enter Consent Decree by United States Of America. Responses due by 3/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Memo In Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Bueno, Edgar)
February 5, 2015 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker pursuant to standing Order in MC215-3. Magistrate Judge James E. Graham no longer assigned to the case. (csr)
January 2, 2015 Filing 2 NOTICE by United States Of America Lodging of Consent Decree (Attachments: #1 Consent Decree)(Bueno, Edgar)
December 31, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Renessenz, LLC filed by United States Of America, The State of Georgia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America et al v. Renessenz, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Georgia
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Monyak
Represented By: Edgar Dennis Bueno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Gabriel Allen
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Monyak
Represented By: Sam Hirsch
Represented By: Edgar Dennis Bueno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renessenz, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?