Williams v. United States Of America

Petitioner: Mark Damon Williams
Respondent: United States Of America
Case Number: 2:2016cv00098
Filed: June 27, 2016
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Glynn
Referring Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 Motion for Reconsideration re 15 Clerk's Judgment, 14 Order on Report and Recommendations. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 07/13/2018. (thb)
March 29, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 8 Report and Recommendations, dismissing inpart and denying in part Williams' 28 U.S.C. § 2255 Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct his Sentence. The Court dismisses as untimely Williams' claims that are not based on Johnson v. United States, U.S., 135 S. Ct. 2551 (June 26, 2015), and denies Williams' Johnson-based claims on the merits. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to close this case and to enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal. The Court denies Williams in forma pauperis status on appeal and a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/29/2018. (thb)
March 9, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the Magistrate Judge's 8 Report and Recommendation as the opinion of the Court. The Court DISMISSES in part and DENIES in part Williams' 28 U.S.C. § 2255 Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct his Sentence. The Cou rt DISMISSES as untimely Williams' claims that are not based on Johnson v. United States, U.S., 135 S. Ct. 2551 (June 26, 2015), and DENIES Williams' Johnson-based claims on the merits. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to CLOSE this case and enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal. The Court DENIES Williams in forma pauperis status on appeal and a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 3/9/2018. (csr)
February 12, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing as moot 5 Motion for Judicial Notice and dismissing 6 Motion for Status Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 2/12/2018. (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Damon Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Of America
Represented By: R. Brian Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?