Drake v. ACCC Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: E.V. Drake
Defendant: Ed Kinkeade, Kastina Kastl, Vicki Ogden, Carl Ginsberg, Warren Lloyd Vavra, ACCC Insurance Company, Payne Mitchell Law Group LLC, Martin Hoffman, Maria Quiroz, David Bradley, Mark Pittman, Mary Lou Robinson, Valerie E. Ertz, Reed O'Connor, Ewing Werlein, Jr., Jeff Rose, Jeffrey C, Manske, James L. Dennis, William Tapscott, Jr., John Burton, Autohaus LLC, State Commission on Judicial Conduct, Trey Harlin P.C., Law Office of James Monte Stanley, Lora Livingston, Scot Graydon, Vanessa Gilmore, William Ken Tapscott, Jr., Amy Clark Meachum, Kenneth Molberg, State Farm General Insurance Company, Melissa Goodwin, Tilton & Tilton LLP, Scott Field, Mike Hrabal, Lynn Hughes, Paul Raleeh, Velva L. Price, State Ethics Commission, Travis County, Richard Schell, Eric Moye, Timothy Sulak, Caroline M. Craven, Seana Willing, Scott Jenkins, Charles Ramsay, Harold Liller, Edith B. Clement, Orlinda Naranjo, Alfred H. Bennett, Dallas County, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Gena Slaughter, Steven Wolens, Office of Texas Attorney General, Leslie H. Southwick, George Hanks, Jr., Jack Henry Ikenaga, Jr., Nathan L. Hecht, Jeffrey L. Cureton, Jane Boyle, Sim Lake, Carl E. Stewart, State of Texas, Tarrant County, Stephen A. Higginson, Brandy Austin Attorney At Law PLLC, Higier Allen & Lautin, Kastl Law Firm, Jack Wiener, Carolyn Wright, Greg Abbott, Terry R. Means, Sidney A. Fitzwater, David L. Horan, Edith Jones, Wayne Salvant, Blake Hawthorne, John R. Burton, Law Office of James M. Stanley, John R. Burton, PC and James M. Stanley
Interested Party: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv00098
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Brunswick Office
County: Glynn
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
2 Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 58 Mail Returned as Undeliverable Return to Sender - Not deliverable as addressed - Unable to forward. #54 Order dated 3/7/2019. Mail sent to E.V. Drake. (csr)
March 19, 2019 Filing 57 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #55 MOTION to Dismiss (Affidavits of Judge Carl Stewart and Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr.) filed by Alfred H. Bennett, Jane Boyle, David Bradley, Edith B. Clement, Caroline M. Craven, Jeffrey L. Cureton, James L. Dennis, Sidney A. Fitzwater, Vanessa Gilmore, George Hanks, Jr, Stephen A. Higginson, David L. Horan, Edith Jones, Ed Kinkeade, Sim Lake, Jeffrey C, Manske, Terry R. Means, Reed O'Connor, Mary Lou Robinson, Richard Schell, Leslie H. Southwick, Carl E. Stewart, Ewing Werlein, Jr, Jack Wiener. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit S, #2 Exhibit T)(Statkus, Shannon)
March 12, 2019 Filing 56 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Defendant Mary Lou Robinson by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Statkus, Shannon)
March 11, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss by Alfred H. Bennett, Jane Boyle, David Bradley, Edith B. Clement, Caroline M. Craven, Jeffrey L. Cureton, James L. Dennis, Sidney A. Fitzwater, Vanessa Gilmore, George Hanks, Jr, Stephen A. Higginson, David L. Horan, Lynn Hughes, Edith Jones, Ed Kinkeade, Sim Lake, Jeffrey C, Manske, Terry R. Means, Reed O'Connor, Mary Lou Robinson, Richard Schell, Leslie H. Southwick, Carl E. Stewart, Ewing Werlein, Jr, Jack Wiener. Responses due by 3/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(Statkus, Shannon)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff E.V. Drake has ten (10) days from the date of this Order to show good cause why he has not effected service on the above-named defendants. Drake's failure to comply with the Court's Order will result in dismissal of his claims against those defendants. Show Cause Response due by 3/17/2019. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 3/7/2019. (csr)
February 25, 2019 Filing 53 Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Return to sender - Not deliverable as addressed - Unable to forward. 46 NEF dated 2/4/19. Mail sent to E. V. Drake. (csr)
February 25, 2019 Filing 52 Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Return to sender - Not deliverable as addressed - Unable to forward. #43 Order dated 1/11/19. Mail sent to E. V. Drake. (csr)
February 25, 2019 Filing 51 Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Return to sender - Not deliverable as addressed - Unable to forward. #1 Order dated 11/5/2018. Mail sent to E. V. Drake. (csr)
February 25, 2019 Filing 50 Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Return to sender - Not deliverable as addressed - Unable to forward. 29 NEF dated 11/30/18. Mail sent to E.V. Drake. (csr)
February 15, 2019 Filing 49 Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Return to sender - Not deliverable as addressed - Unable to forward. #40 Order dated 12/26/2018. Mail sent to E. V. Drake. (csr)
February 7, 2019 Filing 48 Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Return to sender - Not deliverable as addressed - Unable to forward. Summonses issued on 8/23/18. Mail sent to E.V. Drake. (csr)
February 5, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Sanctions by ACCC Insurance Company. Responses due by 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendants Motion for Sanctions)(Atkinson, David) Modified on 2/5/2019 (csr).
February 4, 2019 Filing 46 Stay lifted due to appropriations. (See MC 119-002, Docs. 1, 3.)
February 4, 2019 Filing 45 Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Return to Sender - Unable to Forward. Mail sent to E.V. Drake. (Attachments: Copies of the following documents: #1 Complaint, #2 Issued Summonses, #3 Receipt, #4 Rule 26 Instruction Order). (csr)
January 30, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Heath Statkus on behalf of Alfred H. Bennett, Jane Boyle, David Bradley, Jeffrey L. Cureton, Sidney A. Fitzwater, Vanessa Gilmore, George Hanks, Jr, David L. Horan, Lynn Hughes, Ed Kinkeade, Sim Lake, Terry R. Means, Reed O'Connor, and Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Statkus, Shannon) Modified on 1/30/2019 (csr).
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying as moot #32 Motion for Leave to be Excused from Georgia Federal Court Local Rule 83.4(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 1/11/2019. (csr)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Patrick T. Pope. Daniel Hamilton has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on December 28, 2018. (edd)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anthony J. Nelson. Daniel Hamilton has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on December 28, 2018. (edd)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Temporary Stay. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 12/26/18. (slt)
December 26, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION to Stay (due to lapse in appropriations) by Edith B. Clement, Caroline M. Craven, James L. Dennis, Stephen A. Higginson, Edith Jones, Jeffrey C, Manske, Richard Schell, Leslie H. Southwick, Carl E. Stewart, Jack Wiener. Responses due by 1/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Statkus, Shannon)
December 20, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (slt)
December 20, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anthony J. Nelson. (slt)
December 20, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss by Scott Jenkins, Lora Livingston, Velva L. Price, Travis County, Warren Lloyd Vavra. Responses due by 1/3/2019. (Hamilton, Daniel)
December 20, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Patrick Pope Receipt Number 113J-2505445, Fee Amount $200, by Scott Jenkins, Lora Livingston, Velva L. Price, Travis County, Warren Lloyd Vavra. Responses due by 1/3/2019. (Hamilton, Daniel)
December 20, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anthony J. Nelson Receipt Number 113J-2505425, Fee Amount $200, by Scott Jenkins, Lora Livingston, Velva L. Price, Travis County, Warren Lloyd Vavra. Responses due by 1/3/2019. (Hamilton, Daniel)
December 19, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE by Scott Jenkins, Lora Livingston, Velva L. Price, Travis County, Warren Lloyd Vavra Of Special Appearance (Hamilton, Daniel)
December 17, 2018 Filing 34 Brief in Support re #33 MOTION to Dismiss filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Cave, Maren)
December 17, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Responses due by 12/31/2018. (Cave, Maren)
December 13, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to be Excused from Georgia Federal Court Local Rule 83.4(b), filed by Scott Jenkins, Lora Livingston, Velva L. Price, Travis County and Warren Lloyd Vavra. Responses due by 12/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Letter, #4 Envelope). REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (csr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2018: #5 Proposed Order) (csr).
December 7, 2018 Filing 31 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by ACCC Insurance Company. Responses due by 12/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dimiss, #2 Affidavit of Jack Henry Ikenaga, #3 Affidavit of Maria Quiroz)(Atkinson, David) Modified on 12/7/2018 (csr).
December 4, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Heath Statkus on behalf of Edith B. Clement, Caroline M. Craven, James L. Dennis, Stephen A. Higginson, Edith Jones, Jeffrey C, Manske, Richard Schell, Leslie H. Southwick, Carl E. Stewart, Jack Wiener (Statkus, Shannon)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by M. Keith Ogle. Emily Hancock has entered an appearance in this case and vouches she will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as required by this Court's Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on November 30, 2018. (edd)
November 29, 2018 Filing 28 RESPONSE to #16 MOTION to Continue, MOTION to Stay, and MOTION for An In-Camera Review of Exhibits filed by E.V. Drake; #24 Response to Motions, filed by Orlinda Naranjo, Blake Hawthorne, Melissa Goodwin, Steven Wolens, Seana Willing, Amy Clark Meachum, Jeff Rose, State Ethics Commission, Nathan L. Hecht, Carolyn Wright, State Commission on Judicial Conduct, Valerie E. Ertz, Timothy Sulak, Carl Ginsberg, Greg Abbott, Scot Graydon, Harold Liller, Scott Field, Mark Pittman, Charles Ramsay, Office of Texas Attorney General, Wayne Salvant filed by Law Office of James Monte Stanley, John R. Burton, Law Office of James M. Stanley, John R. Burton, PC, John Burton, and James M. Stanley. (Smith, David) Modified on 11/29/2018 (csr).
November 29, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Requested by M. Keith Ogle, Esquire. (csr)
November 29, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss by Mike Hrabal, Tarrant County. Responses due by 12/13/2018. (Hancock, Emily)
November 29, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2491679, Fee Amount $200, by Mike Hrabal, Tarrant County. Responses due by 12/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hancock, Emily)
November 28, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Rose Hancock on behalf of Mike Hrabal, Tarrant County. (Hancock, Emily) Modified on 11/29/2018 (csr).
November 27, 2018 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Continue, MOTION to Stay, and MOTION for An In-Camera Review of Exhibits, filed by Greg Abbott, Valerie E. Ertz, Scott Field, Carl Ginsberg, Melissa Goodwin, Scot Graydon, Blake Hawthorne, Nathan L. Hecht, Harold Liller, Amy Clark Meachum, Orlinda Naranjo, Office of Texas Attorney General, Mark Pittman, Charles Ramsay, Jeff Rose, Wayne Salvant, State Commission on Judicial Conduct, State Ethics Commission, Timothy Sulak, Seana Willing, Steven Wolens, Carolyn Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Varela, Enrique) Modified on 11/27/2018 (csr).
November 27, 2018 Filing 23 *******Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss filed by Greg Abbott, Valerie E. Ertz, Scott Field, Carl Ginsberg, Melissa Goodwin, Scot Graydon, Blake Hawthorne, Nathan L. Hecht, Harold Liller, Amy Clark Meachum, Orlinda Naranjo, Office of Texas Attorney General, Mark Pittman, Charles Ramsay, Jeff Rose, Wayne Salvant, State Commission on Judicial Conduct, State Ethics Commission, Timothy Sulak, Seana Willing, Steven Wolens, and Carolyn Wright re: #17 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 12/11/2018. (Varela, Enrique) Modified on 11/27/2018 (csr).
November 16, 2018 Filing 22 Statement of Interest and Motion to Dismiss filed by United States of America. (Statkus, Shannon). Responses due 11/30/18. Modified on 3/5/2019 (csr).
November 15, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by John Burton, Law Office of James Monte Stanley. Responses due by 11/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Briefs, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Smith, David)
November 14, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint for Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Trey Harlin P.C. Responses due by 11/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David Lloyd Harlin, III)(Newcomb, William) Modified on 11/14/2018 (csr).
November 14, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Otto Woelke Leithart on behalf of United States of America. (Leithart, Otto) Modified on 11/14/2018 (csr).
November 14, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Heath Statkus on behalf of United States of America. (Statkus, Shannon) Modified on 11/14/2018 (csr).
November 13, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, filed by Greg Abbott, Scott Field, Carl Ginsberg, Melissa Goodwin, Scot Graydon, Blake Hawthorne, Nathan L. Hecht, Harold Liller, Amy Clark Meachum, Orlinda Naranjo, Office of Texas Attorney General, Mark Pittman, Jeff Rose, Wayne Salvant, State Commission on Judicial Conduct, State Ethics Commission, Timothy Sulak, Seana Willing, Steven Wolens, Carolyn Wright. Responses due by 11/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Varela, Enrique) Modified on 11/14/2018 (csr).
November 13, 2018 Filing 16 Plaintiff's Expedited Emergency MOTION to Continue; MOTION to Stay, and MOTION for An In-Camera Review of Exhibits, filed by E.V. Drake. Responses due by 11/27/2018. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (csr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2018: #2 Letter) (csr).
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Enrique M. Varela. Jason Naunas has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as required by this Court's Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on November 13, 2018. (edd)
November 12, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company waiver sent on 10/18/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Cave, Maren)
November 12, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State Farm General Insurance Company. State Farm General Insurance Company waiver sent on 10/18/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Cave, Maren)
November 12, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Maren R. Cave on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Cave, Maren)
November 12, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Maren R. Cave on behalf of State Farm General Insurance Company (Cave, Maren)
November 9, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (slt)
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2478616, Fee Amount $200, by Enrique M. Varela. Responses due by 11/21/2018. (Naunas, Jason)
November 7, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Naunas on behalf of Greg Abbott, Scott Field, Carl Ginsberg, Melissa Goodwin, Scot Graydon, Blake Hawthorne, Nathan L. Hecht, Harold Liller, Eric Moye, Mark Pittman, Jeff Rose, Wayne Salvant, State Ethics Commission, Carolyn Wright (Naunas, Jason)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Reissued as to George Hanks, Jr. (Attachments: Summons Reissued as to #1 Timothy Sulak, #2 Velva L. Price). (csr)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Ed Kinkeade. (Attachments: Summons Issued as to #1 William Tapscott Jr., #2 Amy Clark Meachum, #3 Alfred H. Bennett, #4 Lynn Hughes, #5 Sim Lake, #6 Ewing Werlein, Jr., #7 Mary Lou Robinson, #8 Terry R. Means, #9 Jeffrey L. Cureton, #10 Eric Moye, #11 Mike Hrabal, #12 Scott Jenkins, #13 Nathan L. Hecht, #14 Sidney A. Fitzwater, #15 Attorney General of Texas, #16 Paul Raleeh). (csr)
September 5, 2018 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro pursuant to standing Order in 1:18-mc-12. Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker no longer assigned to the case. (csr)
August 31, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Recusal of Judge Lisa G. Wood by E.V. Drake. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Envelope)(slt)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Greg Abbott, David Bradley, John Burton, Edith B. Clement, Caroline M. Craven, Dallas County, James L. Dennis, Scott Field, Melissa Goodwin, George Hanks, Jr, Stephen A. Higginson, Martin Hoffman, Edith Jones, Harold Liller, Jeffrey C, Manske, Orlinda Naranjo, Jeff Rose, Gena Slaughter, Leslie H. Southwick, State Commission on Judicial Conduct, State of Texas, Carl E. Stewart, Timothy Sulak, Tarrant County, Travis County, Jack Wiener, Steven Wolens, and Carolyn Wright. (Attachments: Summons Issued as to: #1 Carl E. Stewart, #2 Caroline M. Carven, #3 Carolyn Wright, #4 Dallas County, #5 David J. Bradley, #6 Edith B. Clement, #7 Edith Jones, #8 Gena Slaughter, #9 George Hanks, #10 Greg Abbott, #11 Harold Liller, #12 Jack Wiener, #13 James L. Dennis, #14 Jeff Rose, #15 Jeffrey C. Manske, #16 John R. Burton, PC, #17 Leslie H. Southwick, #18 Martin Hoffman, #19 Melissa Goodwin, #20 Orlinda Naranjo, #21 Scott Field, #22 State Commission on Judicial Conduct, #23 State of Texas, #24 Stephen A. Higginson, #25 Tarrant County, #26 Texas Ethics Commission, #27 Tim Sulak, and #28 Travis County). (csr)
August 23, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Submitted. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope). (csr)
August 16, 2018 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number: BWK007971. (csr)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Brandy Austin Attorney At Law PLLC, Carl Ginsberg, Scot Graydon, Higier Allen & Lautin, Kastl Law Firm, Jack Henry Ikenaga, Jr, Kastina Kastl, Law Office of James Monte Stanley, Lora Livingston, Kenneth Molberg, Payne Mitchell Law Group LLC, Mark Pittman, Velva L. Price, Charles Ramsay, Wayne Salvant, State Farm General Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Tilton & Tilton LLP, Trey Harlin P.C., Warren Lloyd Vavra, and Seana Willing. (csr)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 8/16/2018. (csr)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by E.V. Drake. $400.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number: BWK007971. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Receipt). (csr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/16/2018: #6 Envelope) (csr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drake v. ACCC Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Kinkeade
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kastina Kastl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Ginsberg
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Represented By: Jason Naunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Lloyd Vavra
Represented By: Anthony J. Nelson
Represented By: Daniel W. Hamilton
Represented By: Patrick T. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACCC Insurance Company
Represented By: David M. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payne Mitchell Law Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Quiroz
Represented By: David M. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bradley
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Pittman
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Represented By: Jason Naunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Lou Robinson
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie E. Ertz
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed O'Connor
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ewing Werlein, Jr.
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Rose
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Represented By: Jason Naunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey C, Manske
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Dennis
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Tapscott, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Burton
Represented By: David R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autohaus LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Commission on Judicial Conduct
Represented By: Jason Naunas
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trey Harlin P.C.
Represented By: William D. Newcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of James Monte Stanley
Represented By: David R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lora Livingston
Represented By: Anthony J. Nelson
Represented By: Daniel W. Hamilton
Represented By: Patrick T. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scot Graydon
Represented By: Jason Naunas
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Gilmore
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Ken Tapscott, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Clark Meachum
Represented By: Jason Naunas
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Molberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm General Insurance Company
Represented By: Maren R. Cave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Goodwin
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Represented By: Jason Naunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tilton & Tilton LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Field
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Represented By: Jason Naunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Hrabal
Represented By: M. Keith Ogle
Represented By: Emily Rose Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Hughes
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Raleeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velva L. Price
Represented By: Anthony J. Nelson
Represented By: Daniel W. Hamilton
Represented By: Patrick T. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Ethics Commission
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Represented By: Jason Naunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis County
Represented By: Anthony J. Nelson
Represented By: Daniel W. Hamilton
Represented By: Patrick T. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Schell
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Moye
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Represented By: Jason Naunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Sulak
Represented By: Jason Naunas
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline M. Craven
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seana Willing
Represented By: Jason Naunas
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Jenkins
Represented By: Anthony J. Nelson
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Represented By: Daniel W. Hamilton
Represented By: Patrick T. Pope
Represented By: Jason Naunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Ramsay
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Liller
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Represented By: Jason Naunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edith B. Clement
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlinda Naranjo
Represented By: Jason Naunas
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred H. Bennett
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Maren R. Cave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gena Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Wolens
Represented By: Jason Naunas
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Texas Attorney General
Represented By: Jason Naunas
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie H. Southwick
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Hanks, Jr.
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Henry Ikenaga, Jr.
Represented By: David M. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan L. Hecht
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Represented By: Jason Naunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey L. Cureton
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Boyle
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sim Lake
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl E. Stewart
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarrant County
Represented By: M. Keith Ogle
Represented By: Emily Rose Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen A. Higginson
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandy Austin Attorney At Law PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Higier Allen & Lautin, Kastl Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Wiener
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Wright
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Represented By: Jason Naunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Abbott
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Represented By: Jason Naunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry R. Means
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidney A. Fitzwater
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Horan
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edith Jones
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Salvant
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Represented By: Jason Naunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Hawthorne
Represented By: Enrique M. Varela
Represented By: Jason Naunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Burton
Represented By: David R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of James M. Stanley
Represented By: David R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Burton, PC
Represented By: David R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Stanley
Represented By: David R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.V. Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States of America
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?