Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company v. Fennell et al

Petitioner: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Respondent: Michael Barnes, Robert Jonathan Willis and Brian Fennell
Case Number: 2:2018cv00134
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
0 Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
1 Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Service by Publication of Respondent Robert Willis. (slt)
December 27, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Service by Publication of Respondent Robert Willis by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. Responses due by 1/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Melissa Bailey)(Bailey, Melissa)
December 14, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company as to Robert Jonathan Willis. (Bailey, Melissa)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Brian Fennell. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/4/18. (slt)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk as to Respondent Brian Fennell by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. Responses due by 12/18/2018. (Bailey, Melissa)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Bailey, Melissa)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. Brian Fennell served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Bailey, Melissa) Modified on 12/4/2018 (slt).
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. Michael Barnes served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (Bailey, Melissa)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Michael Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(slt)
November 1, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2475504. (csr)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Michael Barnes. (Attachments: Summons Issued as to: #1 Brian Fennell, #2 Robert Jonathan Willis). (csr)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/1/2018. (csr)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Michael Barnes, Brian Fennell, Robert Jonathan Willis, filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. $400.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number: 113J-2475504. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company v. Fennell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Jonathan Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Fennell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Melissa Lottie Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?