Lewis v. United States Of America et al
Plaintiff: James Edward Lewis
Defendant: S. Martin, Daniel Deleon, Lt. M. Allen, P.A. Aremu Bolaji, K. Fanton, United States Of America, Lt. Fanton and J Forsyth
Case Number: 2:2019cv00079
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing fee payment received, Amount $11.90, Receipt BWK008694. (ca)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of James Edward Lewis. The Court has assessed an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $11.90. A copy of this Order and a copy of the Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account shall be served upon the parties and Plaintiff's current custodian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/17/2019. (csr)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by James Edward Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Note, #2 Supplement, #3 Envelope). (csr)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT by Prisoner James Edward Lewis to collection of fees. (Attachments #1 Envelope). (csr)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/8/2019. (csr)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing Plaintiff to complete, sign and return both the Prisoner Trust Account Statement and the Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account to the Clerk by August 7, 2019. Plaintiff advised of PLRA procedures. If Plaintiff fails to respond to this Order, the Court will dismiss Plaintiff's case without prejudice for failure to prosecute and follow this Court's Orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/8/2019. (csr)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by James Edward Lewis. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(evk)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Submitted. (evk)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Inmate Account Statement by James Edward Lewis. (evk)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Edward Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(evk)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Edward Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Exhibit A - Medical Records, #3 Exhibit B - Tort Claim of Ordinary Medical Negligence, #4 Exhibit C - Support Infliction of Intentional Emotional Distress, #5 Exhibit D - Claim #3, #6 Exhibit E - Retaliation Claim Against Lt. Allen, #7 Exhibit G and H - Preliminary Injunction Relief TRO, #8 Remedies Exhausted - Original Tort Claim)(evk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. United States Of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Deleon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. M. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.A. Aremu Bolaji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Fanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Fanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?