Burgess v. United States Of America
Petitioner: Roosevelt J.L. Burgess
Respondent: United States Of America
Case Number: 4:2016cv00147
Filed: June 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING the Magistrate Judge's 14 Report and Recommendations as the opinion of the Court. Movant's resentencing hearing shall be scheduled forthwith in a subsequent order. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 6/29/2017. (csr)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER VACATING AND REPLACING 5 Order on Motion for Leave to File, 4 Order, 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Roosevelt J.L. Burgess. The Court will hear from the Government within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/6/16. (jlm) Modified on 9/6/2016 (jlm).
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk to submit the 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS with any objections the Honorable Lisa G. Wood on 9/14/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/30/16. (jlm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgess v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roosevelt J.L. Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Of America
Represented By: R. Brian Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?