Blanton v. The State
Petitioner: Eric Mitchell Blanton
Respondent: The State
Case Number: 4:2016cv00213
Filed: August 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Appling
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 JUDGMENT entered dismissing Blanton's 2254 petition. (loh)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS dismissing without prejudice 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Eric Mitchell Blanton. Objections to R&R due by 3/10/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 2/24/17. (jlm)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying 20 Motion to invoke 18 USC 3006A(a)(2)(B). The Court again DIRECTS the Clerk to send Blanton a § 2254 form. Blanton must place within his prisons mail system a fully completed (this means he must answer all questions) § 2254 form (the Clerk shall enclose a fresh form with this Order to him) within 30 days of the date this Order is served or face a recommendation of dismissal of this case for noncompliance. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 1/27/17. (jlm)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.; denying 7 Motion to Invoke; denying 14 Motion to Invoke 28 U.S.C. § 2254(b)(1)(B); denying 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 1/6/17. (loh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blanton v. The State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Mitchell Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?