Smith v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Keisha Smith
Defendant: United States Of America
Case Number: 4:2018cv00233
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
0 Judge: James E Graham
1 Judge: William T Moore
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Leithart, Otto)
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Heath Statkus on behalf of United States Of America (Statkus, Shannon)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Otto Woelke Leithart on behalf of United States Of America (Leithart, Otto)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 GENERAL ORDER: Report of 26(f) Planning Meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 10/25/18. (Attachments: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (jrb)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Keisha Smith. Amendment to #4 Affidavit of Service on Managing Agent, Mrs. Rooates. (Lasky, Jeffrey)
October 15, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: United States Of America answer due 12/9/2018. (loh)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint with attachments served on Managing Agent, Mrs. Roberts on 10/10/2018, filed by Keisha Smith. (Lasky, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States Of America. (trb)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Keisha Smith. (Lasky, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2460841. (trb)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Of America, filed by Keisha Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(trb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keisha Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey Wayne Lasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?