American Builders & Contractors Supply, Co., Inc. v. First Infinity Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States Of America, ABC Supply Co. and American Builders & Contractors Supply, Co., Inc.
Defendant: First Infinity Construction, Inc., Bernard Queen, Jr. and United States Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00111
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1352
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 07/11/19. (sff)
July 11, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2638245, Fee Amount $200. (wwp)
July 10, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2638245, Fee Amount $200, by First Infinity Construction, Inc., Bernard Queen, Jr, United States Fire Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order of Admission)(Bowen, Charles)
July 9, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Fire Insurance Company re #16 Litigants' Bill of Rights, #12 Answer to Complaint, #13 Disclosure Statement Local Rule 7.1.1 (Bowen, Charles)
July 9, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bernard Queen, Jr re #11 Answer to Complaint, #15 Litigants' Bill of Rights, #13 Disclosure Statement Local Rule 7.1.1 (Bowen, Charles)
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by First Infinity Construction, Inc. re #13 Disclosure Statement Local Rule 7.1.1, #14 Litigants' Bill of Rights, #10 Answer to Complaint (Bowen, Charles)
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 Litigants' Bill of Rights by United States Fire Insurance Company. (Bowen, Charles)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Bernard Queen, Jr. (Bowen, Charles)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 Litigants' Bill of Rights by First Infinity Construction, Inc.. (Bowen, Charles)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by First Infinity Construction, Inc., Bernard Queen, Jr, United States Fire Insurance Company. (Bowen, Charles)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by United States Fire Insurance Company.(Bowen, Charles)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Bernard Queen, Jr.(Bowen, Charles)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by First Infinity Construction, Inc..(Bowen, Charles)
June 21, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: First Infinity Construction, Inc. answer due 7/9/2019; Bernard Queen, Jr answer due 7/9/2019; United States Fire Insurance Company answer due 7/9/2019. (wwp)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for extension of time to file answer. Defendants date to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is July 9, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/21/19. (wwp)
June 21, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Certificate of Service. (wwp)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Certificate of Service by American Builders & Contractors Supply, Co., Inc.. Responses due by 7/4/2019. (Hays, James)
June 20, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to July 9. (wwp)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to July 9 by American Builders & Contractors Supply, Co., Inc. Responses due by 7/4/2019. (Hays, James) Modified on 6/20/2019 (wwp).
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Builders & Contractors Supply, Co., Inc.. United States Fire Insurance Company served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Hays, James)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Builders & Contractors Supply, Co., Inc. (Hays, James)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (evk)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (evk)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 05/15/2019. (evk)
May 15, 2019 Filing fee:$ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2603788. (evk)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States Of America against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(evk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Builders & Contractors Supply, Co., Inc. v. First Infinity Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: James W. Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABC Supply Co.
Represented By: James W. Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Builders & Contractors Supply, Co., Inc.
Represented By: James W. Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Infinity Construction, Inc.
Represented By: C. Adam Carvin
Represented By: Charles J. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Queen, Jr.
Represented By: C. Adam Carvin
Represented By: Charles J. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: C. Adam Carvin
Represented By: Charles J. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?