Rice v. Freesemann et al
Plaintiff: Charles Vincent Rice
Defendant: ADA Nancy Greysmith, P.D. Robert Warren Attridge, Jr., District Attorney Meg Daly Heap, Chatham County, Judge Penny Haas Freesemann and State Of Georgia
Case Number: 4:2020cv00212
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Dismissing re #1 COMPLAINT. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to CLOSE this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/16/20. (loh)
September 9, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 9/23/2020. (JH)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (JH)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re Magistrate Assignment. Plaintiff Statement Re Assignment Due on 9/22/2020. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Statement Form) (pts)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 Inmate Account Statement by Charles Vincent Rice. (pts)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles Vincent Rice. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(pts) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/22/2020: #1 Signature Page) (JH).
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Charles Vincent Rice.(pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. Freesemann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADA Nancy Greysmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.D. Robert Warren Attridge, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Attorney Meg Daly Heap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chatham County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Penny Haas Freesemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Vincent Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?