Wilson v. HH Savannah, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Wilson
Defendant: Hyatt Corporation, Hyatt Hotels Corporation and HH Savannah, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00217
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/8/2020. Discovery due by 3/3/2021. Motions due by 4/2/2021. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 12/14/2020. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 1/12/2021. Status Report due by 3/18/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/22/20. (Attachments: #1 Civil Trial Information, #2 Notice) (wwp)
October 21, 2020 Filing 31 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Martin, Sean)
October 21, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #31 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (wwp)
October 9, 2020 Filing 30 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by HH Savannah, LLC.(Martin, Sean)
October 9, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Hyatt Corporation.(Martin, Sean)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. HH Savannah, LLC answer due 10/9/2020; Hyatt Corporation answer due 10/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/05/2020. (JH)
October 1, 2020 Filing 27 ******* MOTION to Withdraw and for Substitution of Counsel for Defendants by HH Savannah, LLC, Hyatt Corporation. Responses due by 10/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Martin, Sean)
October 1, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Amended Complaint , #27 MOTION to Withdraw and for Substitution of Counsel for Defendants. (wwp)
September 30, 2020 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Amended Complaint by HH Savannah, LLC, Hyatt Corporation, Hyatt Hotels Corporation. Responses due by 10/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Martin, Sean)
September 14, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Norman Marshall Sawyer, Jr on behalf of Kelly Wilson (Sawyer, Norman)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 09/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (JH)
September 10, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Transferal of Action. (JH)
September 10, 2020 Filing 22 Case transfer in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:20-cv-00643. Case transferred electronically
June 29, 2020 Filing 21 TRANSFER to the District of Southern District of Georgia - Savannah Division. (AG)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia, Savannah Division. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/26/2020. (JWW)
June 23, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint , or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Kelly Wilson. (Kezemides, George)
June 19, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by Kelly Wilson identifying Corporate Parent Hyatt Hotels Corporation, Corporate Parent Highland Hospitality Corporation for Kelly Wilson. (Kezemides, George)
June 19, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by HH Savannah, LLC, Hyatt Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Hyatt Hotels Corporation for Hyatt Corporation; Corporate Parent Highland Hospitality Corporation for HH Savannah, LLC. (Arias, Chance)
June 19, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by HH Savannah, LLC, Hyatt Corporation. Related case(s): no (Arias, Chance)
June 19, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kelly Wilson. Related case(s): No (Kezemides, George)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint , or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue. Response due by 7/2/2020. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/19/2020. (CCB)
June 19, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Kezemides, George)
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint , or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue by HH Savannah, LLC, Hyatt Corporation. (Arias, Chance)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to amended complaint on or before June 12, 2020. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/9/2020. (CCB)
June 9, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by HH Savannah, LLC, Hyatt Hotels Corporation. (Arias, Chance)
May 26, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Kelly Wilson.(Kezemides, George)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. No response to the motion to dismiss was filed, which means it is deemed unopposed under the Local Rules. There is no proper venue alleged. Residence of the plaintiff does not yield venue. Likewise, there is no apparent personal jurisdiction over defendant. This was a slip and fall at a hotel in Georgia. The defendant is not domiciled in this District. Plaintiff may have leave to file an amended complaint within ten days, but counsel should note that if there is no true venue in this District (see 28 U.S.C. 1391(b)), and if there is no personal jurisdiction against this defendant, plaintiff may have to respond to the costs/fees of this suit. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 5/26/2020. (Jung, William)
May 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Chance C. Arias on behalf of Hyatt Hotels Corporation. (Arias, Chance)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Chance C. Arias on behalf of HH Savannah, LLC. (Arias, Chance)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by HH Savannah, LLC, Hyatt Hotels Corporation. (Arias, Chance)
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to HH Savannah, LLC, Hyatt Hotels Corporation. (TDC)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2.Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/23/2020. (SAO)
March 20, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:20-cv-643-T-02JSS. (SJB)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HH Savannah, LLC, Hyatt Hotels Corporation with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16614284) filed by Kelly Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Kezemides, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. HH Savannah, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyatt Corporation
Represented By: Chance C. Arias
Represented By: Sean William Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyatt Hotels Corporation
Represented By: Chance C. Arias
Represented By: Sean William Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HH Savannah, LLC
Represented By: Chance C. Arias
Represented By: Sean William Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Wilson
Represented By: George Christos Kezemides
Represented By: Norman Marshall Sawyer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?