Owens v. Wilcher et al
Plaintiff: Tramaine Owens
Defendant: Sheriff John Wilcher and The State
Case Number: 4:2021cv00295
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to file a new IFP application which applies to all four of his pending cases within 14 days re #4 Order. (Compliance due by 12/14/2021.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/30/2021. (ca)
November 4, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #7 Notice of Filing. After 14 days a notice of noncompliance will be submitted to a judicial officer for possible sanctions, to include dismissal. (loh) Modified on 11/4/2021 (thb).
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing by Tramaine Owens. (loh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2021: #1 Corrected Document) (JH).
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing by Tramaine Owens. (loh)
November 4, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 11/18/2021. (loh)
October 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #3 Order re Magistrate Assignment. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 11/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Party's Statement Regarding Assignment)(thb)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to amend his application within 14 days. The Clerk is DIRECTED to serve with this Order a blank IFP form for Plaintiffs convenience. Failure to comply with this directive will result in a recommendation of dismissal on IFP-deficiency grounds alone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/12/21. (loh)
October 12, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended IFP Application due by 10/26/2021. (loh)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Magistrate Assignment. Plaintiff Statement Re Assignment Due on 10/22/2021. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 10/08/2021. (Attachment: #1 Statement re Assignment Form.) (jlh)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Tramaine Owens. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (jlh)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The State and John Wilcher, filed by Tramaine Owens. (jlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. Wilcher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tramaine Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff John Wilcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?