Gonzalez v. United States Of America
Petitioner: Fernando Vidal Gonzalez
Respondent: United States Of America and Tracy Johns
Case Number: 5:2020cv00034
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Dismiss . (MG)
May 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Tracy Johns. Responses due by 5/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Bryan Erickson w attachs)(Leithart, Otto)
May 4, 2020 Set Deadlines: Tracy Johns answer/response due 5/14/2020. (ca)
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 U.S. Marshal Return as to Tracy Johns on 4/23/2020, signed by Spikes. (ca)
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 U.S. Marshal Return as to U.S. Attorney for the SDGA on 4/23/2020, signed by Rosa Oates. (ca)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing USMS Service of Process re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Fernando Vidal Gonzalez upon (1) the Attorney General of the United States; (2) the named Respondent; and (3) the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney for the Southern District of Georgia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 04/02/2020. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Forms) (MG)
March 27, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number BWK009174. (csr)
March 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 4/8/2020 re: #2 Deficiency Notice. (csr)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 Deficiency Notice re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filing fee has not been paid. (csr)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Fernando Vidal Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Envelope). (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fernando Vidal Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tracy Johns
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?