Christian v. Toole et al
Plaintiff: |
Ommie Christian |
Defendant: |
Randy Toole, Thomas, Register, Allen, Larry Brewton, Delouche, Fowler and Brooks |
Case Number: |
6:2015cv00038 |
Filed: |
April 10, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia |
Office: |
Statesboro Office |
County: |
Bulloch |
Presiding Judge: |
R. Stan Baker |
Presiding Judge: |
J. Randal Hall |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 20, 2017 |
Filing
60
ORDER ADOPTING 58 Report and Recommendations, GRANTING in part and DISMISSING as moot in part 42 Motion for Summary Judgment, DISMISSING Plaintiff's Complaint in its entirety, DENYING Plaintiff in forma pauperis status on appeal and CLOSING this case. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/20/2017. (maa)
|
February 22, 2017 |
Filing
58
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court GRANT in part and DISMISS as moot in part Defendants' unopposed 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment and DISMISS Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Toole, Thomas, Allen R egister, and Brooks. It is also RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Brewton. Accordingly, it is further RECOMMEDED the Court DIRECT the Clerk of Court to CLOSE this case and DENY Plaintiff in forma pauperis status on appeal. Additionally, the Court dismissed all claims against Defendants Delouche and Fowler on September 20, 2016. Thus the Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to ensure that the record reflects the termination of those two Defendants. Any pa rty seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation is ordered to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 3/8/2017). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 2/22/2017. (csr)
|
September 20, 2016 |
Filing
47
ORDER adopting 9 Report and Recommendations. The Court dismisses Plaintiff's official capacity claims against all Defendants, Plaintiff's claims against Defendants DeLouche and Fowler, his supervisory liability claims, his Eighth Amendment failure-to-protect claims, his state law claims, and any claims arising from a November 1, 2013, incident. Additionally, the Court DENIES Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 09/20/2016. (thb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?