Stanton v. United States Of America
Petitioner: Terrance Gerard Stanton
Respondent: United States Of America
Case Number: 6:2015cv00064
Filed: June 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Bulloch
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER making the 54 USCA Order the Order of this Court. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 02/12/2019. (jlh)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying 51 Motion for Certificate of Appealability; denying as moot 52 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 09/17/2018. (thb)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying 37 Motion for Reconsideration; granting 38 Motion to take notice that his Rule 59(e) motion was timely filed; denying as moot 39 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 5/25/17. (cmr)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER adopting 16 Report and Recommendations, dismissing this case with prejudice, and denying a COA in this case. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 04/11/2017. (thb)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER vacating 21 Order on Report and Recommendation. Movant shall have up to and including April 3, 2017 to file objections to the R&R. No further extensions shall be granted. Objections to R&R due by 4/3/2017. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/17/2017. (thb)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER adopting 16 Report and Recommendations, and dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/13/2017. (thb)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk to serve the United States Attorney with this order and copies of criminal docs. 1124 and 1137. The Court directs the Government to file an answer within sixty days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/9/16. (wwp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanton v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terrance Gerard Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Of America
Represented By: R. Brian Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?