Porter v. Shumake et al
Plaintiff: Rontravious Porter
Defendant: Ronnie Shumake, Dottson, Sapp and Cambell
Case Number: 6:2015cv00113
Filed: September 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Statesboro Office
County: Bulloch
Presiding Judge: R. Stan Baker
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER adopting 58 Report and Recommendations; granting 55 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint; and denying Plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. The Court further directs the Clerk of Court to enter an appropriate judgment of dismissal and close this case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 07/25/2017. (thb)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court GRANT Defendants' unopposed 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment, DISMISS Plaintiff's 1 Complaint, DIRECT the Clerk to CLOSE this case, and DENY Plaintiff leave to proceed in f orma pauperis on appeal. The Court ORDERS any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered (Objections to R&R due by 5/26/2017). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 5/12/2017. (ca)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER adopting 49 Report and Recommendations, dismissing without prejudice Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Cambell and Dottson, and dismissing as moot 43 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 03/06/2017. (thb)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff claims against Defendant Cambell and Defendant Dottson. Additionally, I RECOMMEND the Court DISMISS AS MOOT Defendant Cambell's re 43 MOTI ON to Dismiss, 1 Complaint. The Court ORDERS any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered (Objections to R&R due by 2/8/2017). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 1/25/2017. (ca)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file any response in opposition to Defendants' 43 MOTION to Dismiss or to inform the Court of his decision not to oppose within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is hereby instructed to attach a copy of Fed.R.Civ.P. 41 and 12 to the copy of this Order that is served on the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 12/30/2016. (ca)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER adopting re 26 Report and Recommendations. Therefore, dismissing 18 Plaintiffs deliberate indifference to health and safety claims, and dismissing without prejudice Plaintiffs claims for compensatory and punitive damages. However, the Court Denies Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Eighth Amendment excessive force and failure to intervene claims 13 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 7/18/16. (cmr)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER adopting 21 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation as the opinion of the Court; and denying Plaintiff's 18 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 6/30/2016. (jah)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 18 Motion to Strike Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 4/22/2016. (csr)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER adopting the 9 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation as the opinion of the Court; dismissing Plaintiff's claims against Defendants in their official capacities; and determining that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant in their individual capacities shall proceed. Signed by Judge J. Randal Hall on 02/17/2016. (jah)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DISMISS Plaintiff's claims against Defendants in their official capacities re: 1 Complaint filed by Rontravious Porter. Any party seeking to object to this Report and Recomm endation is ordered to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 1/27/2016). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 1/13/2016. (csr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Shumake et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rontravious Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Shumake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dottson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?