Jordan et al v. Rogers State Prison et al
Plaintiff: |
Craig A. Jordan and Rogers State Prison Inmates |
Defendant: |
Rogers State Prison, Clay Tatum, FNU McFarlane, Jennifer Clark and Shelia Holland |
Case Number: |
6:2017cv00029 |
Filed: |
February 17, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia |
Office: |
Statesboro Office |
County: |
Tattnall |
Presiding Judge: |
R. Stan Baker |
Presiding Judge: |
J. Randal Hall |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 25, 2017 |
Filing
28
ORDER ADOPTING 20 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff is Denied leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. This case stands Closed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 07/25/2017. (pts)
|
May 12, 2017 |
Filing
20
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DISMISS Plaintiff's 1 Complaint without prejudice, DISMISS as moot the remaining Motions in this case, (docs. 11, 12, 15, 18), DIRECT the Clerk of Court to CLOSE this case, a nd DENY Plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation is ordered to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 5/26/2017). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 5/12/2017. (csr)
|
March 31, 2017 |
Filing
5
ORDER DEFERRING ruling on Plaintiff's 2 MOTION and DIRECTS Plaintiff to amend his Complaint and to submit the appropriate form on which to move to proceed in forma pauperis within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. The Court DIRE CTS the Clerk of Court to provide Plaintiff with a proper blank prisoner civil rights complaint form. The Court also DIRECTS Plaintiff to complete this form within fourteen (14) days of this Order and to pay special attention to the questions this f orms asks. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to provide Plaintiff with a blank copy of the application to proceed in forma pauperis form. The Court likewise DIRECTS Plaintiff to re-submit his application using that form within fourteen (14) days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 3/31/2017. (csr)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?