Fields v. State Of Georgia
Plaintiff: Oliver Wendell Fields
Defendant: State Of Georgia
Case Number: 6:2018cv00135
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Referring Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Oliver Wendell Fields. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 2/13/19. (slt)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Oliver Wendell Fields. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(slt)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT by Prisoner Oliver Wendell Fields to collection of fees. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(slt)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 2/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 1/2/19. (slt)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 Inmate Account Statement by Oliver Wendell Fields. (trb)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Oliver Wendell Fields. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(trb)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Of Georgia, filed by Oliver Wendell Fields. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(trb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fields v. State Of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oliver Wendell Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?