Gray v. Wingfield et al
Plaintiff: James Joseph Brian Gray
Defendant: Sgt. Lawerence, Officer Eric Wingfield, Cpt. Martha Dukes, Chief Nelson and Eugene Sapp
Case Number: 6:2019cv00063
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 8/8/2019. (ca)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by James Joseph Brian Gray. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(ca)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by James Joseph Brian Gray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit D)REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(ca)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT by Prisoner James Joseph Brian Gray to collection of fees. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by James Joseph Brian Gray. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement, #2 Envelope)(ca)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 8/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 7/17/2019. (ca)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Inmate Account Statement by James Joseph Brian Gray. (loh)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Joseph Brian Gray. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(loh)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Joseph Brian Gray.(loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Wingfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Lawerence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Eric Wingfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpt. Martha Dukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Sapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Joseph Brian Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?