Harvey v. Ashley-Toby et al
Plaintiff: Deryan M. Harvey
Defendant: Sgt. Susan Clayton, Warden Berry, Javaka Johnson, Warden James Deal, Melontae Havior, Warden Annettia L. Ashley-Toby, Joseph Hutchinson and Lt. Angela Spann
Case Number: 6:2020cv00081
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JUDGMENT of dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Order dated 10/6/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 10/6/2020. (csr)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case and enter the appropriate judgment of dismissal. Further, Plaintiff is denied leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 10/06/2020. (MG)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #3 Notice of Filing Fee Deficiency. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to either move to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the filing fee within 14 days of this Order. (Compliance due by 10/1/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 9/17/2020. (ca)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Form AO 240)(pts)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re Magistrate Assignment as to Plaintiff. Plaintiff Statement Re Assignment Due on 9/1/2020. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 8/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Statement) (pts)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Deryan M. Harvey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J)(pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harvey v. Ashley-Toby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Susan Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javaka Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden James Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melontae Havior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Annettia L. Ashley-Toby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Angela Spann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deryan M. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?