Price et al v. Federal Bureau Of Prisons et al
Plaintiff: Ricky Price, Kevin Conway, Anthony Williams, Shandall Thomas and Thomas Houser
Defendant: Russell Heisner, Zaida Ndife, Federal Bureau Of Prisons, Michael Carvajal and Mary Beth Pence
Case Number: 1:2021cv00542
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Houser, Shandall Thomas, Ricky Price, Anthony Williams as to Mary Beth Pence served on 3/4/2021, answer due 5/3/2021 (Bennett, Camille)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE by Thomas Houser, Ricky Price, Shandall Thomas, Anthony Williams to MOTION by Defendants Michael Carvajal, Federal Bureau Of Prisons, Russell Heisner, Zaida NdifeMOTION TO DEFER CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING #16 (Bennett, Camille)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs OF FILING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Conway Declaration Signature Page)(Bennett, Camille)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE by Thomas Houser, Ricky Price, Shandall Thomas, Anthony Williams re amended complaint #20 NOTICE OF FILING (Bennett, Camille)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED complaint by Ricky Price, Shandall Thomas, Thomas Houser, Anthony Williams against Michael Carvajal, Federal Bureau Of Prisons, Russell Heisner, Mary Beth Pence and terminating Kevin Conway and Zaida Ndife (Bennett, Camille)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Mary Beth Pence (cp, )
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DESIGNATION of Jonathan C. Haile as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Michael Carvajal, Federal Bureau Of Prisons, Russell Heisner, Zaida Ndife (Haile, Jonathan)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 DECLARATION of AMY STANDEFER-MALOTT regarding motion for miscellaneous relief #16 (Haile, Jonathan)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by Michael Carvajal, Federal Bureau Of Prisons, Russell Heisner, Zaida Ndife in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #16 (Haile, Jonathan)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION by Defendants Michael Carvajal, Federal Bureau Of Prisons, Russell Heisner, Zaida NdifeMOTION TO DEFER CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING (Haile, Jonathan)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricky Price, Kevin Conway as to All Defendants (Bennett, Camille)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricky Price, Kevin Conway as to All Defendants (Bennett, Camille)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Ricky Price, Kevin Conway as to Zaida Ndife. (Bennett, Camille)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricky Price, Kevin Conway as to Russell Heisner served on 2/9/2021, answer due 4/12/2021 (Bennett, Camille)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricky Price, Kevin Conway as to Michael Carvajal served on 2/12/2021, answer due 4/13/2021 (Bennett, Camille)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricky Price, Kevin Conway as to Federal Bureau Of Prisons served on 2/9/2021, answer due 4/12/2021 (Bennett, Camille)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file excess pages #7 is granted. Briefing schedule set as to Plaintiff's Motion to certify class #6 . Responses due by 3/8/2021; Replies due by 3/22/2021. Status hearing set for 5/4/2021 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (lk, )
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kevin Conway, Ricky Price by Emily Hirsch (Hirsch, Emily)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiffs Kevin Conway, Ricky Price for leave to file excess pages in support of class certification (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' Proposed Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion for Class Certification)(Bennett, Camille)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiffs Kevin Conway, Ricky Price to certify class (Bennett, Camille)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Michael Carvajal, Federal Bureau Of Prisons, Russell Heisner, Zaida Ndife, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (jmk, )
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kevin Conway, Ricky Price by Allyson M. Bain (Bain, Allyson)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kevin Conway, Ricky Price by Nusrat Jahan Choudhury (Choudhury, Nusrat)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kevin Conway, Ricky Price by Camille E. Bennett (Bennett, Camille)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bennett, Camille)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF) filed by Ricky Price, Kevin Conway; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17880379.(Bennett, Camille)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey I. Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jmk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price et al v. Federal Bureau Of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Heisner
Represented By: Jonathan C. Haile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zaida Ndife
Represented By: Jonathan C. Haile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau Of Prisons
Represented By: Jonathan C. Haile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Carvajal
Represented By: Jonathan C. Haile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Beth Pence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Price
Represented By: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Represented By: Camille E. Bennett
Represented By: Allyson M. Bain
Represented By: Emily Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Conway
Represented By: Nusrat Jahan Choudhury
Represented By: Camille E. Bennett
Represented By: Allyson M. Bain
Represented By: Emily Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Williams
Represented By: Camille E. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shandall Thomas
Represented By: Camille E. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Houser
Represented By: Camille E. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?